West v. Schriro, et al

Petitioner: Thomas Paul West
Respondent: Ernest Trujillo and Dora Schriro
Case Number: 4:1998cv00218
Filed: May 6, 1998
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 149 MOTION Request for Authorization for Habeas Counsel to Conduct State-Court Litigation. By issuance of this order, the Court does not purport to encourage, approve, or convey any position with respect to the merits of the proposed litigation.. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 7/12/2011.(JKM)
October 20, 2008 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 135 Motion for Indication Whether Court Would Consider Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 10/17/08.(SSU, )
October 8, 2008 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Ptn's Motion seeking leave to file a Rule 60(b) Motion to 10/20/08. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 10/7/08.(JEMB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Schriro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Paul West
Represented By: Timothy Michael Gabrielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ernest Trujillo
Represented By: Donna Jeanne Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora Schriro
Represented By: Donna Jeanne Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?