Armstrong v. Ryan et al
Petitioner: |
Shad Daniel Armstrong |
Respondent: |
Charles L Ryan and James O'Neal |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00358 |
Filed: |
August 5, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Tucson Division Office |
County: |
Pinal |
Presiding Judge: |
Rosemary Marquez |
Nature of Suit: |
Death Penalty |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 4, 2024 |
Filing
189
ORDER granting Armstrong's Motion for Temporary Stay and Abeyance. (Doc. 162 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED authorizing Armstrong's federal habeas counsel, the Federal Public Defender for the Central District of California, to represent him in state postconviction proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Armstrong to file: (a) a notice with the state PCR court within 30 days raising his Cruz claim; and (b) a status report in this case showing he has filed his Cruz not ice in state court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Armstrong to file notice with the Court or move for other appropriate relief within 30 days of the conclusion of the state court proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part the Victims' motion for relief (Doc. 183 ) pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3771. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/1/2024. (MCO)
|
July 3, 2023 |
Filing
152
ORDERED that Petitioner's 150 Motion to Defer Ruling for Ninety Days is granted. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 6/30/2023. (ARC)
|
March 19, 2019 |
Filing
144
ORDER denying 126 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/18/2019. (BAR)
|
February 14, 2019 |
Filing
123
ORDERED that Armstrong's motion for access to his relatives (Doc. 92 ) is granted to the extent the Court recognizes that A.R.S. § 13-4433 does not apply to these federal habeas proceedings directly or through the adoption of its specific limitations under the federal CVRA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent's oral motion to stay this order for seven days pending the filing of a petition for writ of mandamus is granted. Absent any further stay, this Order shall go into effect on February 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 2/14/2019. (MCO)
|
June 4, 2018 |
Filing
91
ORDER granting 83 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Order to Show Cause and 85 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Evidentiary Development. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file Petitioner's propos ed motions lodged at Documents 84 and 86 in the Court's electronic docket, and to enter Document 86 as a "Notice of Request for Evidentiary Development" in the Court's electronic docket. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 6/4/2018. (SIB)
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing
68
ORDER denying 58 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 9/7/2017. (See Order for details) (DPS)
|
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
55
ORDER denying 28 Petitioner's motion to stay and abey his mixed petition pending exhaustion in state court. Petitioner shall file a reply to Respondents' Answer to his Petitioner for Writ of Habeas Corpus no later than May 31, 2017. Any notice of a request for evidentiary hearing shall be filed no later than July 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/27/2017. (See attached Order for details) (KEP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?