Parker et al v. Alfa Laval Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: David Parker and Sharon Parker
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company, BW/IP International Incorporated, Pfizer Incorporated, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Ford Motor Company, Mack Trucks Incorporated, William Powell Company, Warren Pumps LLC, Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated, NAPA, John Crane Incorporated, Elliott Company, Morse Tec LLC, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Sherwin-Williams Company, SPX Corporation, General Electric Company, Holley Performance Products Incorporated, Honeywell International Incorporated, Benjamin Moore & Company, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated, Viad Corporation, RT Vanderbilt Holding Company Incorporated, DCO LLC, IMO Industries Incorporated, Armstrong International Incorporated, Viacomcbs Incorporated, Tuthill Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, Alfa Laval Incorporated, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, National Automotive Parts Association LLC, FMC Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals LLC, DAP Products Incorported, AutoZone Incorporated, Hennessy Industries Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Caterpillar Incorporated, Dunn-Edwards Corporation, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Hopeman Brothers Incorporated, Elliott Company formerly known as Elliott Turbomachinery Company doing business as Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Viacom Incorporated, Northern Fire Apparatus Company, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Dana Companies LLC, Atwood & Morrill, Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated doing business as Northrop Grummon Ship Systems Incorporated doing business as Newport News Shipbuilding and Dry Dock Company, Allied-Signal Incorporated, CBS Corporation, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated sued individually and formerly doing business as Northrop Grummon Ship Systems Incorporated, Dial Corporation and National Automotive Parts Association
Case Number: 4:2020cv00172
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Referring Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER GRANTING the Parties' #172 Joint Motion to Amend the Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order. Discovery due 12/3/2021; Dispositive motions due 6/24/2022; Proposed Pretrial Order due 7/29/2022; Joint Settlement Status Report due 3/31/2022, and every 90 days(See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 12/8/20.(BAC)
December 4, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Maraz, Thomas)
December 4, 2020 Filing 173 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Holley Performance Products Incorporated. (Stowers, Russell)
December 3, 2020 Filing 172 Joint MOTION Amend the Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order filed on October 22, 2020 [Dkt. 163-1] re: #163 Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Order)(Hellbusch, Ronald)
November 24, 2020 Filing 171 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant AutoZone Incorporated. (Romano, Carol)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER pursuant to #168 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED this action against Hennessy, only, and all claims against Hennessy, only, are dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 11/23/20. (BAC)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER pursuant to #167 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED that all claims against RT Vanderbilt Holding Company Incorporated, only, by and relating to David Parker and Sharon Parker are dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 11/23/20.(BAC)
November 18, 2020 Filing 168 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC by Hennessy Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(O'Daniel, David)
November 3, 2020 Filing 167 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by RT Vanderbilt Holding Company Incorporated, Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Dismiss Defendant R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company)(Hellbusch, Ronald)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDERED: This case is subject to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (MIDP) implemented by General Order 17-08. The parties must comply with the requirements of the MIDP and need not make the initial disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a). Counsel shall submit to the Court a brief Joint Settlement Status Report on or before March 31, 2022, and every 90 days thereafter. The deadline for final supplementation MIDP responses and the completion of all fact discovery, including answers to interrogatories, production of documents, depositions, and requests for admissions, and discovery by subpoena is November 19, 2021. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before May 27, 2022. Counsel shall file a proposed Joint Pretrial Order on or before July 1, 2022, unless dispositive motions are filed. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 10/27/2020. (See Order for complete details) (ARC)
October 27, 2020 Filing 165 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Raner C. Collins: Scheduling Conference held on 10/27/2020. The Court adopts all dates and deadlines collectively proposed by counsel. Formal Scheduling Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearances by Jordan Blumenfield-James and Dev Kumar Sethi for the Plaintiff with Mr. Blumenfield-James addressing the Court. Telephonic appearances by Jamie Gill Santos, William Lee Thorpe, John Charles Hendricks, Kathleen L. Beiermeister, Carol Marie Romano, Elan Shai Mizrahi, Larry Jay Crown, Chelsea Leah Gulinson, Lauren Ann Crawford, Thomaz A. Maraz, Ronald Lyle Hellbusch, Shawn Michael Petri, Heather Neubauer, J. Steven Sparks, Vincent Richard Miner, Richard Wayne Mear, Victoria Renee Kelly, Brett L. Foster, Dan R. Larsen, Daniel Geary Roberts, Jeremy Arian Lite, Brian M. Roth, David L. ODaniel, Kara Brasovan Kaplan, Russel Bernard Stowers, Alexandra Brisky Cunningham, Esther Linkey Sivak, James Lawrence Williams, Claudia Carla Ionescu, Jeremy Carl Warren, Jason James Boblick, Thomas J. Shorall, Jr., Patricia Waterkotte, Adam Thomas Reich, Stephen M. Bressler, Amanda Emily Heitz and William Francis Auther for the Defendants with Mr. Hendricks addressing the Court on behalf of all Defendants. (Court Reporter Erica McQuillen.) Hearing held 10:34 AM to 10:39 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SSG)
October 22, 2020 Filing 164 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Holley Performance Products Incorporated. (Stowers, Russell)
October 22, 2020 Filing 163 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Case Management Report filed by Defendants Armstrong International Incorporated, Benjamin Moore & Company, DAP Products Incorported, IMO Industries Incorporated, Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
October 16, 2020 Filing 162 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Sherwin-Williams Company . (Cieniawski, Brian)
October 12, 2020 Filing 161 NOTICE re: Defendant John Crane Inc.'s First Supplemental Notice of Additional Non-Parties at Fault by John Crane Incorporated re: #129 Notice (Other) . (Williams, James)
October 12, 2020 Filing 160 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Tuthill Corporation . (Waterkotte, Patricia)
October 9, 2020 Filing 159 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by William Powell Company . (Shorall, Thomas)
October 9, 2020 Filing 158 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Morse Tec LLC . (Shorall, Thomas)
October 9, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC . (Shorall, Thomas)
October 9, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Shorall, Jr on behalf of Morse Tec LLC, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, William Powell Company. (Shorall, Thomas)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER pursuant to #153 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Viacom CBS Corporation are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 10/8/20.(BAC)
October 7, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant AutoZone Incorporated. (Resnick, Mitchell)
October 7, 2020 Filing 153 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Viacomcbs Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reich, Adam)
October 7, 2020 Filing 152 NOTICE re: PLAINTIFFS DISCLOSURE OF BANKRUPTCY FILINGS PURSUANT TO ARS 12-782 by David Parker, Sharon Parker . (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 151 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by Pfizer Incorporated re: #149 Notice (Other) . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
October 5, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Caterpillar Incorporated, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, Hopeman Brothers Incorporated, SPX Corporation re: #136 Notice (Other), #135 Notice (Other), #131 Notice (Other), #130 Notice (Other), #132 Notice (Other), #129 Notice (Other), #134 Notice (Other), #137 Notice (Other), #138 Notice (Other) . (Crown, Larry)
October 5, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Parties at Fault and Joinder in Notices of Non-Parties at Fault by Pfizer Incorporated . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
October 5, 2020 Filing 148 Joinder re: #136 Notice (Other), #135 Notice (Other), #131 Notice (Other), #130 Notice (Other), #132 Notice (Other), #129 Notice (Other), #134 Notice (Other), #137 Notice (Other), #138 Notice (Other) by Defendant Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. filed by Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
October 5, 2020 Filing 147 Joinder re: #136 Notice (Other), #135 Notice (Other), #131 Notice (Other), #130 Notice (Other), #132 Notice (Other), #129 Notice (Other), #134 Notice (Other), #137 Notice (Other), #138 Notice (Other) by Defendant DCO LLC. filed by DCO LLC. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
October 5, 2020 Filing 146 Joinder re: #132 Notice (Other), #137 Notice (Other), #136 Notice (Other), #135 Notice (Other), #131 Notice (Other), #130 Notice (Other), #129 Notice (Other), #134 Notice (Other), #138 Notice (Other) by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
October 2, 2020 Filing 145 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Maraz, Thomas)
October 2, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE re: of Non-Parties at Fault by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust . (Mear, Richard)
October 2, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE re: of Non-Parties at Fault by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Vellumoid). (Mear, Richard)
October 2, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE re: of Non-Parties at Fault by Genuine Parts Company . (Mear, Richard)
October 1, 2020 Filing 141 *JOINDER in Notices of Nonparties at Fault by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated . (Heitz, Amanda) *Modified to correct event type on 10/2/2020 (BAC).
September 30, 2020 Filing 140 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Notice of Service of Mandatory Discovery Responses filed by Defendant Pfizer Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
September 30, 2020 Filing 139 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Response to Mandatory Discovery filed by Defendant Pfizer Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
September 30, 2020 Filing 138 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Viad Corporation . (Sparks, J)
September 30, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Honeywell International Incorporated . (Sparks, J)
September 30, 2020 Filing 136 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Elliott Company . (Sparks, J)
September 30, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Dunn-Edwards Corporation . (Sparks, J)
September 28, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Hennessy Industries Incorporated . (O'Daniel, David)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDERED that a Case Management Conference is set for 10/27/2020 at 10:30 AM. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least twenty-one (21) days before the Case Management Conference. At this meeting, the parties shall develop a Joint Case Management Report. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report with the Court no later than five (5) days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 9/28/2020. (See Order for complete details)(ARC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE re: of Non Parties at Fault by Mack Trucks Incorporated . (Ionescu, Claudia)
September 23, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE re: First Supplemental Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Ford Motor Company . (Larsen, Dan)
September 22, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE re: of Non-Parties at Fault by Ford Motor Company . (Larsen, Dan)
September 21, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE re: Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by John Crane Incorporated . (Williams, James)
August 3, 2020 Filing 128 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Automotive Parts Association LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joshua M. Conway In Support of Defendant National Automotive Parts Association's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Mear, Richard)
July 23, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brian M Roth on behalf of Defendant Hennessy Industries Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 22, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Benjamin Moore & Company. (Hendricks, John)
July 21, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant DAP Products Incorported. (Hendricks, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by National Automotive Parts Association filed by David Parker, Sharon Parker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David Parker, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James iso Plaintiffs' Opposition, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 124 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tuthill Corporation. (Waterkotte, Patricia)
July 14, 2020 Filing 123 ANSWER to Complaint by Tuthill Corporation.(Waterkotte, Patricia)
July 13, 2020 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #103 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Holley Performance Products Incorporated. (Stowers, Russell)
July 10, 2020 Filing 121 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Morse Tec LLC. (Boblick, Jason)
July 10, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
July 10, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC. (Boblick, Jason)
July 10, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Heather Neubauer on behalf of Defendant DAP Products Incorported. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 7, 2020 Filing 118 *AMENDED Corporate Disclosure Statement by Genuine Parts Company. Amendment to #38 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Mear, Richard) *Modified to correct event type on 7/8/2020 (BAC).
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER pursuant to Parties #115 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs' claims as to Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear their own fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court shall docket accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 7/7/20.(BAC)
July 6, 2020 Filing 116 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Automotive Parts Association LLC. (Mear, Richard)
July 6, 2020 Filing 115 STIPULATION of Dismissal of INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY by David Parker, Sharon Parker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 6, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorneys Todd J Ohlms and Ryan Blackney removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 26, 2020 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #103 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by David Parker, Sharon Parker. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 23, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Sherwin-Williams Company. (Cieniawski, Brian)
June 17, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by National Automotive Parts Association LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Whitney Swingle in Support of National Automotive Parts Association's Motion to Dismiss)(Mear, Richard)
June 16, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant IMO Industries Incorporated. (Hendricks, John)
June 16, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Hendricks on behalf of IMO Industries Incorporated. (Hendricks, John)
June 16, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Tuthill Corporation. (Waterkotte, Patricia)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING #54 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint, #81 Stipulation of Dismissal, #82 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS ORDERED the deadline for Defendant Sherwin Williams Company, Incorporated to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 5/22/20. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, and Alfa Laval Incorporated are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear their own fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court shall docket accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 6/15/20.(BAC)
June 12, 2020 Filing 107 DECLARATION of Counsel re: #103 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Holley Performance Products Incorporated. (Stowers, Russell)
June 12, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
June 12, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Hendricks on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
June 12, 2020 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Holley Performance Products Incorporated. (Stowers, Russell)
June 12, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Holley Performance Products Incorporated. (Stowers, Russell)
June 10, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
June 9, 2020 Filing 101 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International Incorporated. (Hendricks, John)
June 9, 2020 Filing 100 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Armstrong International Incorporated.(Hendricks, John)
June 9, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
June 9, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
June 9, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant DCO LLC. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
June 9, 2020 Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Benjamin Moore & Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Benjamin Moore & Company. (Hendricks, John)
June 9, 2020 Filing 95 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Benjamin Moore & Company.(Hendricks, John)
June 8, 2020 Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dunn-Edwards Corporation. (Sparks, J)
June 8, 2020 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dunn-Edwards Corporation.(Sparks, J)
June 5, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
June 4, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Heitz, Amanda)
June 2, 2020 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hennessy Industries Incorporated. (O'Daniel, David)
June 2, 2020 Filing 88 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand ANSWER OF HENNESSY INDUSTRIES TO COMPLAINT by Hennessy Industries Incorporated.(O'Daniel, David)
June 2, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Heather Neubauer on behalf of Defendants DAP Products Incorported, IMO Industries Incorporated, and Warren Pumps LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 2, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant BW/IP International Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
June 2, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Caterpillar Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
June 1, 2020 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DCO LLC identifying Other Affiliate Enstar Holdings (US) LLC, Other Affiliate Dana Companies, LLC, Other Affiliate Enstar USA, Inc. for DCO LLC. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
June 1, 2020 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vanderbilt Minerals LLC identifying Other Affiliate R.T. Vanderbilt Holding Company, Inc. for Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
June 1, 2020 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc., Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
June 1, 2020 Filing 82 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thorpe, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 81 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thorpe, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, LLCS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ITS INITIAL RESPONSES TO MANDATORY INITIAL DISCOVERY PILOT PROJECT (MDIP) filed by Defendant Hennessy Industries Incorporated. (O'Daniel, David)
May 29, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs David Parker, Sharon Parker. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Mear, Richard)
May 28, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Mear, Richard)
May 28, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Mear, Richard)
May 28, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jordan Blumenfeld-James on behalf of Plaintiffs David Parker and Sharon Parker. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 28, 2020 Filing 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPX Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
May 28, 2020 Filing 74 Separate ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand (Plaintiff's Original Complaint) by SPX Corporation.(Crown, Larry)
May 28, 2020 Filing 73 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Crown, Larry) *Modified on 5/28/2020 to reflect document filed with incorrect case number (KAH).
May 28, 2020 Filing 72 Separate ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand (Plaintiff's Original Complaint) by FMC Corporation.(Crown, Larry)
May 28, 2020 Filing 71 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Crown, Larry) *Modified on 5/28/2020 to reflect document filed with incorrect case number and to reflect correct filer(KAH).
May 28, 2020 Filing 70 Separate ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand (Plaintiff's Original Complaint) by Caterpillar Incorporated.(Crown, Larry)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant Crane's #7 Administrative Motion is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE cases 4:20-cv-174 and 4:20-cv-175. Defendants Huntington Ingalls, Incorporated and Alfa Laval, Incorporated shall refile their Motions to Dismiss under case number 4:20-cv-172 within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 5/27/20. Associated Cases: 4:20-cv-00172-RCC, 4:20-cv-00174-RCC, 4:20-cv-00175-RCC (BAC)
May 26, 2020 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Trane Technologies plc for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 22, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Larsen, Dan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 66 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Sherwin-Williams Company. (Cieniawski, Brian)
May 22, 2020 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sherwin-Williams Company. (Cieniawski, Brian)
May 22, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal (Plaintiffs' Original Complaint) by Sherwin-Williams Company.(Cieniawski, Brian)
May 22, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant John Crane Incorporated. (Williams, James)
May 22, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Maraz, Thomas)
May 22, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ronald Lyle Hellbusch on behalf of Defendants Union Carbide Corporation and Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 21, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mack Trucks Incorporated. (Ionescu, Claudia)
May 21, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant General Electric Company. (Roberts, Daniel)
May 19, 2020 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hopeman Brothers Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
May 19, 2020 Filing 58 Separate ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand (Plaintiff's Original Complaint) by Hopeman Brothers Incorporated.(Crown, Larry)
May 19, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia V Waterkotte on behalf of Tuthill Corporation. (Waterkotte, Patricia)
May 18, 2020 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Mear, Richard)
May 18, 2020 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Mear, Richard)
May 18, 2020 Filing 54 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Sherwin-Williams Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cieniawski, Brian)
May 15, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by David Parker, Sharon Parker. Party Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated terminated. (Sethi, Dev)
May 15, 2020 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
May 15, 2020 Filing 51 Separate ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand (Plaintiff's Original Complaint) by Flowserve US Incorporated.(Crown, Larry)
May 14, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Jay Crown on behalf of Caterpillar Incorporated, FMC Corporation, SPX Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
May 14, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorney Jordan Blumenfeld-James as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by William Lee Thorpe on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated. (Thorpe, William)
May 12, 2020 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
May 11, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by David Parker, Sharon Parker. Party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company terminated. (Sethi, Dev)
May 11, 2020 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BW/IP International Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP International Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
May 11, 2020 Filing 45 Separate ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand (Plaintiff's Original Complaint) by BW/IP International Incorporated.(Crown, Larry)
May 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alexandra Brisky Cunningham on behalf of Defendant Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 8, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation.(Petri, Shawn)
May 8, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Vanderbilt Minerals LLC.(Petri, Shawn)
May 8, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DCO LLC.(Petri, Shawn)
May 7, 2020 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Genuine Parts Company identifying Corporate Parent Genuine Parts Company for Genuine Parts Company. (Mear, Richard)
May 6, 2020 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Roberts, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Maraz, Thomas)
May 5, 2020 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Heitz, Amanda)
May 5, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated.(Heitz, Amanda)
May 5, 2020 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mack Trucks Incorporated. (Warren, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE re: Service by Elliott Company re: #4 Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) . (Sparks, J)
May 4, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Elliott Company.(Sparks, J)
May 1, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE re: Notice of Filing by John Crane Incorporated Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Notice of Filing Notice of Removal and Answer in Case 4:20-CV-00175-DCB. (Williams, James)
May 1, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viad Corporation. (Sparks, J)
May 1, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane Incorporated. (Williams, James)
May 1, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC for IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 1, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Viad Corporation.(Sparks, J)
April 30, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to Senior Judge Raner C Collins. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-00172-TUC-RCC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 30, 2020 Filing 26 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 30, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Honeywell International Incorporated.(Sparks, J)
April 30, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
April 30, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAP Products Incorported. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO Industries Incorporated.(Hendricks, John)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps LLC.(Hendricks, John)
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps LLC identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DAP Products Incorported.(Hendricks, John)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Thorpe, William)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Alfa Laval Incorporated . (Thorpe, William)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Thorpe, William)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated . (Thorpe, William)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Larsen, Dan)
April 29, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Dan R Larsen on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Transfer Related Case Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by John Crane Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: 4:20-cv-00172-JR, 4:20-cv-00174-DTF, 4:20-cv-00175-DCB) (Williams, James)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Joinder re: #1 Notice of Removal (filed by Elliott Company) by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joinder in Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Joinder in Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Joinder in Removal, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration, #5 Exhibit B - F to Declaration, #6 Exhibit G to Declaration, #7 Exhibit H to Declaration, #8 Exhibit I to Declaration, #9 Exhibit J - M to Declaration, #10 Exhibit N to Declaration, #11 Exhibit O to Declaration, #12 Exhibit P to Declaration, #13 Exhibit Q to Declaration, #14 Exhibit R - S to Declaration, #15 Exhibit T - V to Declaration, #16 Exhibit D to Joinder in Removal)(Hendricks, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AutoZone Incorporated, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Ford Motor Company, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Mack Trucks Incorporated. (DLC)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18207962. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-172-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (DLC)
April 22, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by AutoZone Incorporated, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust/former Vellumoid Division, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust/Felt Products Manufacturing Company, Ford Motor Company, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, and Mack Trucks Incorporated. (Originals filed in Pima County Superior Court between 4/3-4/15/2020)(DLC)
April 22, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule102(A) Fastar Certificate upon Viad Corporation on 3/20/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule102(A) Fastar Certificate upon RT Vanderbilt Holding Company Incorporated, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, Morse Tec LLC, IMO Industries Incorporated, Warren Pumps LLC, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Tuthill Corporation, DAP Products, Viacomcbs Incorporated, Holley-Performance Products Incorporated, BW/IP International Incorporated, Hennessy Industries Incorporated, Elliott Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated on 3/24/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule102(A) Fastar Certificate upon William Powell on 3/26/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule102(A) Fastar Certificate upon Vanderbilt Minerals LLC on 3/27/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule102(A) Fastar Certificate upon Sherwin-Williams Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Honeywell International Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, SPX Corporation, Pfizer Incorporated, Mack Trucks Incorporated, John Crane Incorporated, Genuine Parts Company, General Electric Company, Ford Motor Company, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, Benjamin Moore & Company, Dunn-Edwards Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Alfa Laval Incorporated, Caterpillar Incorporated, Autozone Incorporated on 3/25/2020. (Originals filed in Pima Superior Court on 4/6/2020)Proof of Service for Armstrong International Incorporated on 3/30/2020.Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon DCO LLC and Hopeman Brothers Incorporated on 3/26/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Fastar Certificate upon National Automotive Parts Association LLC on 3/30/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon Weir Avlves & Controls USA Incorporated on 4/3/2020. (Originals filed in Pima Superior Court on 4/20/2020) (DLC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. *Modified on 4/23/2020 to edit text(DLC).
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elliott Company. (Sparks, J) (DLC)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20201347. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18207962 filed by Elliott Company. (Sparks, J) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet part 2, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Declaration of J Steven Sparks)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker et al v. Alfa Laval Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International Incorporated
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Incorporated
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Dan R Larsen
Represented By: Brett L Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Warren
Represented By: Claudia Carla Ionescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Heather Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Alexandra Brisky Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPA
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Incorporated
Represented By: James Lawrence Williams
Represented By: Esther Linkey Sivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Vincent Richard Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Alexandra Brisky Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwin-Williams Company
Represented By: Brian Edward Cieniawski
Represented By: William W Drury, Jr.
Represented By: John Anthony Klecan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Daniel Geary Roberts
Represented By: Jeremy Arian Lite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holley Performance Products Incorporated
Represented By: Russell Bernard Stowers
Represented By: Ryan W Blackney
Represented By: Todd Ohlms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Moore & Company
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Thomas A Maraz
Represented By: Chelsea L Gulinson
Represented By: Lauren Ann Crawford
Represented By: Chelsea Leah Gulinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated
Represented By: Amanda Emily Heitz
Represented By: William Francis Auther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RT Vanderbilt Holding Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO LLC
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Heather Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Incorporated
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacomcbs Incorporated
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Represented By: Adam Thomas Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuthill Corporation
Represented By: Patricia V Waterkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Incorporated
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Incorporated
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association LLC
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Minerals LLC
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP Products Incorported
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Heather Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Incorporated
Represented By: Carol Marie Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Kara Brasovan Kaplan
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Represented By: Brian M Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Incorporated
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn-Edwards Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Vincent Richard Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Incorporated
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company formerly known as Elliott Turbomachinery Company doing business as Elliott Turbomachinery Company
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Vincent Richard Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Company
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Vincent Richard Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Incorporated
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Represented By: Adam Thomas Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Fire Apparatus Company
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Represented By: Adam Thomas Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill
Represented By: Amanda Emily Heitz
Represented By: William Francis Auther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated doing business as Northrop Grummon Ship Systems Incorporated doing business as Newport News Shipbuilding and Dry Dock Company
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Alexandra Brisky Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Represented By: Adam Thomas Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated sued individually and formerly doing business as Northrop Grummon Ship Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Alexandra Brisky Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dial Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Parker
Represented By: Dev Kumar Sethi
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Parker
Represented By: Dev Kumar Sethi
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?