Gray v. Obama et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gray
Defendant: Rod Jay Rosenstein, John Owen Brennan, Uso Asonye, Robert S Mueller, III, Kyle R Freeny, Ryan Dickey, Adam Bennett Schiff, Brian M Richardson, Adam Jed, Greg Donald Andres, Unknown Parties, Scott AC Meisler, Barack Hussein Obama, II, Jeannie Hae Rhee, Aaron SJ Zelinsky, Michael R Dreeben, Andrew A Weissman, James L Quarles, III, Cable News Network Incorporated, Aaron M Zebley, MSNBC, Robert Hunter Biden, Nancy Patricia Pelosi, James Robert Clapper, Jr., Lawrence Rush Atkinson, Brandon L Van Grack, Andrew D Goldstein, Elizabeth B Prelogar, Charles Ellis Schumer, Joseph Robinette Biden, Jr., Hillary Diane Rodham Clinton, Nellie Ohr, Bruce Ohr, Peter Strozk, Andrew McCabe and James Comey
Case Number: 4:2020cv00254
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER This Court acknowledges Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal. (Doc. #14 ). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the above-captioned case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case file and docket accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 8/14/2020. (DLC)
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Jennifer Gray. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MYE)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Rod Rosenstein on 7/8/20. (MYE)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jennifer Gray: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Rod Rosenstein, Brian Richardson, Brandon Van Grack, Elizabeth Prelogar, Ryan Dickey, Kyle R. Freeny, Uso Asonye, on 6/30/20. (MYE)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for Damages by Plaintiff Jennifer Gray. (MYE)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Reissued in paper form and provided to Plaintiff by placing on top of Clerk's Office drop box as to Defendant(s): Barack Hussein Obama, II, Hillary Diane Rodham Clinton, Joseph Robinette Biden, Jr, James Robert Clapper, Jr, Rod Jay Rosenstein, Robert S Mueller, III, Nancy Patricia Pelosi, Charles Ellis Schumer, Andrew D Goldstein, Greg Donald Andres, James L Quarles, III, Jeannie Hae Rhee, Aaron M Zebley, Elizabeth B Prelogar, Michael R Dreeben, Andrew A Weissman, Lawrence Rush Atkinson, Aaron SJ Zelinsky, Uso Asonye, Scott AC Meisler, Brandon L Van Grack, Ryan Dickey, James Comey and Peter Strozk. (REM, ) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jennifer Gray: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Aaron M. Zebley and Adam Jed on 6/30/20. (MYE)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued in paper form and provided to Plaintiff by placing on top of Clerk's Office drop box as to Defendants: Adam Bennett Schiff, Nancy Patricia Pelosi, Charles Ellis Schumer, William Barr, Attorney General of United States and Michael Bailey, United States District Attorney (REM)This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Reissued in paper form and provided to Plaintiff by placing on top of Clerk's Office drop box as to Barack Hussein Obama,II, Hillary Diane Rodham Clinton, Joseph Robinette Biden, Jr, Robert Hunter Biden, James Robert Clapper, Jr, John Owen Brennan, Rod Jay Rosenstein, James Comey, Andrew McCabe and Peter Strozk. (REM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued in paper form and mailed to plaintiff as to defendants: Barack Hussein Obama,II, Hillary Diane Rodham Clinton, Joseph Robinette Biden, Jr, Robert Hunter Biden, James Robert Clapper, Jr, John Owen Brennan, Rod Jay Rosenstein, Cable News Network Incorporated, Robert S Mueller, III, Andrew D Goldstein, Greg Donald Andres, James L Quarles, III, Jeannie Hae Rhee, Aaron M Zebley, Elizabeth B Prelogar, Michael R Dreeben, Andrew A Weissman, Lawrence Rush Atkinson, Aaron SJ Zelinsky, Adam Jed, Uso Asonye, Scott AC Meisler, Kyle R Freeny, Brandon L Van Grack, Ryan Dickey, Brian M Richardson, James Comey, Andrew McCabe, Peter Strozk and Bruce Ohr. (REM)This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barack Hussein Obama, II, Hillary Diane Rodham Clinton, Joseph Robinette Biden, Jr, Robert Hunter Biden, James Robert Clapper, Jr, John Owen Brennan, Rod Jay Rosenstein, Cable News Network Incorporated, MSNBC, Robert S Mueller, III, Adam Bennett Schiff, Nancy Patricia Pelosi, Charles Ellis Schumer, Andrew D Goldstein, Greg Donald Andres, James L Quarles, III, Jeannie Hae Rhee, Aaron M Zebley, Elizabeth B Prelogar, Michael R Dreeben, Andrew A Weissman, Lawrence Rush Atkinson, Aaron SJ Zelinsky, Adam Jed, Uso Asonye, Scott AC Meisler, Kyle R Freeny, Brandon L Van Grack, Ryan Dickey, Brian M Richardson, James Comey, Andrew McCabe, Peter Strozk, Bruce Ohr, Nellie Ohr, and Unknown Parties filed by Jennifer Gray.(MYE)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MYE)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00254-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00 filed by Jennifer Gray.(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Obama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Jay Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Owen Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uso Asonye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S Mueller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle R Freeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bennett Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian M Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Jed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Donald Andres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott AC Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Hussein Obama, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Hae Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron SJ Zelinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R Dreeben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew A Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Quarles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable News Network Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron M Zebley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSNBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hunter Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Patricia Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robert Clapper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Rush Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon L Van Grack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew D Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth B Prelogar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ellis Schumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Robinette Biden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary Diane Rodham Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nellie Ohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Ohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Strozk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Comey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?