Kimpel, et al v. Williams, et al
Plaintiff: Michael L Kimpel, David G Ross, Luke W Magee, Jennifer Lawrence, Roger Ruggero, Denos P Amarantus, Victor M Pacheco, Max M Rede, Song Suh, Jeff Quinton, Alicia Wolin, Emmett Badar, Guy Juneau, Jimmy Render, Lorena Walsh, Floro Pinzon, Andrew K Dorcas, Ronald Vencill, Tarek Ismail, Richard Violano, Phillip Evans, Joshua Y Cho, Luis Hernandez, Marty Feinmark, Brian E Millan, Ken Thatcher, Mario Ontiveros, George Villalobos, Don Westfall and Geno P Colello
Defendant: Willie Williams, Does 1 through 25, inclusive and City of Los Angeles
Case Number: 2:1993cv03441
Filed: June 11, 1993
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert N Block
Referring Judge: George H King
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2000. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2000 Filing 7323 NOTICE of document filed under seal - withheld from case file. (lk)
April 17, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7322 CORRECTED DISBURSEMENT ORDER by Judge George H. King. The orig disbursement Ord omitted the calculations of the 1st two pltfs, Richard Honorato Abad and James Salvatore Abbate. The corrected Disbursement Ord is fi herewith under Seal as Exh "A". The Crt hereby Ords: 1. Each listed Kimpel Late Pay Class Member shall receive the follow amts in accord with this corrected Disbursement Order. (lk)
April 5, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7320 ORDER by Judge George H. King that pltfs req for dism of the duplicate opt-in-forms for class members: Melissa J HOrnby, Jim Rossum Jr., Elizabeth Pinell, Helen Lloyd-Dunkin, Arthur Duran, Curtis Woodle, Lauro R Larrinua, Javier E BOrrego, Richard Byrd, Adrienne Collins, Virgil A County, Carlos Quintero, LaNita Elias, Jorge Torres, Jose L Torres, Heriberto Gamboa, Timothy Schey, Ruben Cardena, Candice Cobarrubias, Roger Lee Corso, Gloria A Esquivel, Richard J Flores, Alfonso GUtierrez, David Keortge, Jon Kirkpatrick. Glenn McNeill, James M Norton, Edward Allen Pape, Paul A Porras Jr., Francisco D Reese, Asher Silkey, Brian T Schmider, David A Swanson, and Robert W Timm is hereby GRANTED. (ENt 4/10/00) (lk)
April 4, 2000 Filing 7319 SECOND REQUEST by plaintiffs for dismissal of duplicate OPT-IN Forms; Lodged propsd order (jp)
April 4, 2000 Filing 7318 STIPULATED JUDGMENT by Judge George H. King that the crt approves the terms of the settlement agreement & release as fair; consistent with said settlement agreement & release this actin is dismissed with prejudice provided however that the crt will retain juis for purpose of enforcing compliacne with the terms of the settlemnt agreement & release & this final order & jgm terminating case (MD JS-6) (ENT 4/5/00) ntc sent (bg)
April 4, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7317 STIPULATION and ORDER extending the date to prepare a written itemization for each Huff class member to 4/7/00 by Judge George H. King (bp)
March 30, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7315 MINUTES: taking exparte motion to seal contents of disbursement order [7310-1] off calendar, taking motion for ex parte orders [7265-1] off calendar, taking motion to exclude based upon dfts' discov violations [7252-1] off calendar, taking exparte motion for order shortening time [7250-1] off calendar, taking motion in limine to exclude all lay & expert testimony re 29 CFR 778.106 [7226-1] off calendar, taking motion in limine [7225-1] off calendar, taking motion in limine [7222-1] off calendar pending finalization of settlement by Judge George H. King CR: none (lk)
March 28, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7321 ORDER that pla's request for approval of sttlmt ntc for the Kimpel classes is hereby approved by Judge George H. King (bp) Modified on 04/12/2000
March 28, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7311 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge George H. King for Late-Filing of Huff Settlement Class Opt-Ins llow members of the LAPD are eligible to join the Huff Settlement Class: 1. Victor M Pacheco 2. Jennifer Lawrence 3. Tarek Ismail 4. Andrew K Dorcas 5. Brian E Millan 6. Denos P Amarantus 7. Joshua Y Cho 8. Geno P Colello 9. Mario Ontiveros 10. Max M Rede 11. David G Ross 12. Jimmy Render. (lk)
March 27, 2000 Filing 7310 EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by plaintiff to seal contents of disbursement order Lodged propsd ord (bp)
March 23, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7314 MINUTES: Crt states on the record having read & considered the objs & hearing fromthe parties, fnds as stated on the record that the objs are overruled. The crt further fnds that the proposed settlement as written is fair & adequate & it is ordered that the settlement as written of the respective class meembers is approved by Judge George H. King CR: David Salyer (bg)
March 17, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7308 ORDER by Judge George H. King . Pltfs req for dism of the consent to join actn form for class members Jesus Castillo fi 3/13/00, and Eldred L Day, fi 3/9/00 is hereby granted: granting request [7307-1] (lk)
March 16, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7309 ORDER by Judge George H. King approving stlmnt ntc for Huff Settlement Class; granting request [7300-1] (lk)
March 16, 2000 LODGED/PROPOSED ORDER submitted by plaintiff for request [7307-1] .(FWD TO CRD) (twdb)
March 16, 2000 Filing 7307 REQUEST by plaintiff for dism of duplicate OPT-IN forms (twdb)
March 14, 2000 Filing 7316 REQUEST by plaintiff Phillip Evans et al forapproval of stlmnt ntc for Hugg Settlement Class. Ldg Prop Order. (lk)
March 7, 2000 Filing 7306 LETTER from David D Young req join Huff lawsuit (lc)
March 7, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7305 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER ltr, not in pldg format, lacking name, address, not judges cpy, no title page be fld by Judge George H. King (lc) Modified on 03/13/2000
March 3, 2000 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED; (Propsd) Ord for dism w/o prej of unidentifiable class members ldg by plfs on 2/22/00 (rrey)
March 3, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7304 ORDER FOR CERTIFICATION OF CLASS ACTION PURS TO 29 U.S.C. SECTION 216(b) & APPT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES: The Crt appoints Emmett Badar & Michael Huff as respective class representatives. by Judge George H. King (ENT 3/6/00), SEND COPIES & NTC (pj)
March 3, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7303 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL W/O PREJ OF UNIDENTIFIABLE CLASS MEMBERS: The Crt orders that dismissal w/o prej of all individuals who had an illegible and/or unintelligible consent to join form which was fld with the Crt in the Kimpel v. Williams actn. Said consent to join forms are attached here to as Exh A, B & C. by Judge George H. King (ENT 3/6/00), send copies & ntc (pj)
February 29, 2000 Filing 7302 DECLARATION of Michael C Huff by plaintiffs (ir)
February 29, 2000 Filing 7301 DECLARATION of Emmett Badar by plaintiffs (ir)
February 29, 2000 Filing 7300 Supplemental REQUEST by plaintiff for approval of settlement notice in Huff v Parks only (bg)
February 22, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 7298 ORDER by Judge George H. King for appointment of class counsel. The Court appoints Gregory G Petersen as Class Counsel in the Hugg and Kimpel litigation; granting request [7294-1] (lk)
February 22, 2000 Filing 7297 MEMORANDUM OF P & IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs' of joint application for certification of class action & appointment of class representatives. (bp)
February 22, 2000 Filing 7296 REQUEST by plaintiffs' for approval of settlement notice (bp)
February 17, 2000 Filing 7295 DECLARATION of Gregory G. Petersen in suppt of appointment as class cnsl by plaintiffs' (bp)
February 17, 2000 Filing 7294 REQUEST by plaintiff for appointment of class cnsl; lodged propsd ord. (bp)
February 15, 2000 Filing 7299 MINUTES: ; settlement conference held by Judge George H. King CR: none (lk)
February 15, 2000 Filing 7293 NOTICE by plaintiffs of rejection of sttlmnt & req for trial setting conf (jag)
January 25, 2000 Filing 7292 REPLY by plaintiffs to the resp to pltfs Ntc of fail to reach stlmnt and req for stat conf re [7290-1] (lk)
January 21, 2000 Filing 7291 RESPONSE by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie Williams to notice of failure to reach sttlmnt & req for stat conf [7290-1] (jag)
January 21, 2000 Filing 7290 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO REACH STTLMNT & req for stat conf by plaintiffs (rrey)
January 10, 2000 Filing 7289 MINUTES: Prelinimary settlement approval hrg. Hearing held in chambers. Cnsl to cont the CRD to set future date and time to return for furth proceed by Judge George H. King CR: none (lk)
January 7, 2000 Filing 7288 MINUTES: The above matter set on the crt's calendar for today is continued to 1/10/00 @ 1:30 pm by Judge George H. King CR: N/P (seal)
December 14, 1999 Filing 7287 MINUTES: The crt sets a settlement conference for 1:30 1/17/00 by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (bp)
December 8, 1999 Filing 7286 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by George Villalobs [1-1] (lc)
December 3, 1999 Filing 7284 CONSENT by Ken Thatcher to action [1-1] (jp)
December 1, 1999 Filing 7285 MINUTES: ; settlement conference held , ;further settlement conference 9:30 12/14/99 by Judge George H. King CR: (bg)
November 24, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 7283 MINUTES: Upon the Crts own mot, it is ordered that the fur ; settlement conference is CONT 9:00 12/1/99 by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
November 10, 1999 Filing 7282 MINUTES: settlement conf held; settlement conference cont to 9:00 11/24/99 by Judge George H. King CR: none (lk)
November 3, 1999 Filing 7281 MINUTES: settlement conference held; settlement conference cont to 9:00 11/10/99 by Judge George H. King CR: none (lk)
November 1, 1999 Filing 7280 MINUTES: On Crt own motion, ; settlement conference cont to 11:00 11/3/99 by Judge George H. King CR: none (lk)
October 6, 1999 Filing 7278 MINUTES (In Chambers): The crt cont sttlmnt conf for 9:30 am on 10/20/99 , cnsl shall appear on date & time specified by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
October 1, 1999 Filing 7277 NOTICE OF CHANGE Of FIRM NAME filed by atty Peter Jay Brown for defendant Willie Williams, Brian Patrick Walter for defendant Willie Williams (lk)
September 14, 1999 Filing 7276 MINUTES (In Chambers): The crt cont sttlmnt conf for 9:30 am on 10/5/99 by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
September 8, 1999 Filing 7275 MINUTES: The crt further sched sttlmnt conf for 9:30 am on 9/15/99 by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
September 3, 1999 Filing 7274 AUTH RE STTLMNT OF CLASS ACTNS UNDER 29 USC SEC 216(b) by pfls (app)
August 10, 1999 Filing 7273 MINUTES: The crt further sched sttlmnt conf for 9:30 am on 9/8/99 by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
July 29, 1999 Filing 7272 REPLY by plfs to objection of the special master's ord re dfts' waiver of the atty-client & work product privileges [7242-1]; decl of Delores Giacometto (app)
July 27, 1999 Filing 7271 MINUTES (In Chambers): The crt cont sttlmnt conf for 1:00 pm on 8/10/99 by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
July 23, 1999 Filing 7269 PROOF OF SVC by plfts on 7/22/99 of Ntc of Mot & Mot for Ex Parte Ord(s); Decl of H Ernie Nishii in Suppt of Plfs' Mot to Compel Working Papers Subpoenaed; Decl of Delores Giacometto in Suppt of Plfs' Mot to Compel Working Papers Subpoenaed; P/A in Suppt of Plfs Ex Parte Appl for Ord to Compel Working Papers Subpoenaed docs faxed Kristine Kwong (app)
July 23, 1999 Filing 7268 DECLARATION of H Ernie Nishii by plfsin suppt of motion for ex parte orders [7265-1] to compel working papers subpoenaed (app)
July 23, 1999 Filing 7267 P/A IN SUPPORT by plfs of motion for ex parte orders [7265-1] to compel working papers subpoenaed (app)
July 23, 1999 Filing 7266 DECLARATION of Delores Giacometto by plfs in suppt of motion for ex parte orders [7265-1] (app)
July 23, 1999 Filing 7265 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plfs for ex parte orders ; motion hearing set for 9:00 am on 7/23/99 (app)
July 22, 1999 Filing 7270 MINUTES (In Chambers): The crt sched a further sttlmnt conf for 9:00 am on 8/6/99 by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
July 16, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 7263 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge George H. King, It is ord that plf Michel R Moore is hereby dism from this mtr w/o prej (ENT 07/20/99) (app)
July 13, 1999 Filing 7264 MINUTES: The crt sched further sttlmnt conf for 10:00 am on 7/22/99 by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
June 30, 1999 Filing 7262 MINUTES: Crt further sched sttlmnt conf for 10:00 am on 7/13/99 by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
June 8, 1999 Filing 7261 MINUTES: Cnsl directed to contact Crtroom Deputy Clk to set further sttlmnt conf wk of 6/14/99 or 6/21/99 if crt is not engaged in trial by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
May 21, 1999 Filing 7260 MINUTES (In Chambers): Stat Conf Held re stat of case, cnsl is directed to contact crt NLT 5/26/99 to advise crt if ptys are going to proceed forward by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
May 21, 1999 Filing 7259 MINUTES: Stat Conf Held The crt met w/cnsl for stat conf concerning iss in the case by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (app)
May 12, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 7258 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge George H. King, It is or that ptys shall serve their respective dislcosures, incl written rpts on 5/18/99 (app)
May 3, 1999 Filing 7257 MINUTES: stat conf held , crt met w/cnsl concerning mgt of the remainder of the case & other mtrs by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (cc to al cnsl) (app)
April 29, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 7256 ORDER by Discovery Venetta S. Tassopulos, The crt GRANTS ex parte motion to amend plfs' motion to compel &/or exclude atty-client communications based upon dfts discov [7246-1] (app)
April 29, 1999 Filing 7255 PROOF OF SERVICE by dfts Los Angeles City of and Willie Williams on 4/27/99 of Stip re Expert Wit Disclosures; Ord by faxing Ernie Nishii (app)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7254 REPLY by plaintiffs to opp to motion for protective order prohibiting individualized discov upon unnamed plfs [7243-1]; Decl of Delores Giacometto (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7253 OPPOSITION by plaintiffs to motion for a prot ord to stay the depo of Mayor Richard Riordan; Decl of Steven L Rader (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7252 MOTION by plaintiffs to exclude based upon dfts' discov violations (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7251 P&A'S IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of exparte motion for order shortening time [7250-1] (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7250 EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by plaintiffs for order shortening time (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7249 REPLY BRIEF by plaintiffs (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7248 STATEMENT of ISSUES by plaintiffs (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7247 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of exparte motion to amend plfs' motion to compel &/or exclude atty-client communications based upon dfts discov violations [7246-1] (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7246 EX PARTE APPLICATION & MOTION filed by plaintiffs to amend plfs' motion to compel &/or exclude atty-client communications based upon dfts discov violations (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7245 DECLARATION of DELORES GIACOMETTO by plaintiffs in suppt of motion for protective order prohibiting individualized discov upon unnamed plfs [7243-1] (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7244 NOTICE OF motion for protective order prohibiting individualized discov upon unnamed plfs [7243-1] filed by plaintiffs (jag)
April 27, 1999 Filing 7243 MOTION by plaintiffs for protective order prohibiting individualized discov upon unnamed plfs (jag)
April 26, 1999 Filing 7242 OBJECTIONS by defendants to special master's ord re dfts' waiver of the atty-client, work product privileges; Decl of Peter J Brown (jag)
April 23, 1999 Filing 7241 REPLY by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie Williams to opp to motion for a prot ord to stay the depo of Mayor Richard Riordan (jag)
April 19, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 7240 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge George H. King tht expert disclosures shall be made purs to the procedure outlined in Rule 26(a)(2) of the FRCP; The parties shall serve their respective disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2)(B) including written reports by mail on 5/12/99 (bg)
April 7, 1999 Filing 7237 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by plaintiffs withdrawing motion for summary adjudication of dfts' violation of 29 USC 207(k) [7231-1] (jag)
April 6, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 7239 MINUTES: On 3/31/99, ptys ldgd a joint stp re discov & P/T dates for the trial on the willfulness & good faith set for 3/23/99. Crt accepts the stip & orders as follows: Ptys sh designate any expert witnesses & exchange expert witness rpts nlt 4/21/99. Discov sh be cut off on 7/5/99. All discov disputes sh be resolved by the DCO date. All motions in limine sh be fld by 8/5/99 & sh be ntcd for hrg in accordance w/ LR. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
April 6, 1999 Filing 7238 MINUTES: Telephone stat conf is held. ; status conf is set on 9:30 4/28/99 ; Cnsl sh appear for an informal stat conf to discuss a case management plant for efficiently resolving the remaining issues in th case. Plf's hearing re motion for summary adjudication of dfts' violation of 29 USC 207(k) [7231-1] is taken OFF CALENDAR. Plfs may rentc their mot t/ the LR subsequent to the 4/28/99 stat conf. Nothing in this ord sh affect the timetable specified in the Crt 4/6/99 ord re discov & P/T dates. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
April 6, 1999 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED stmt of U/F & concl of law (jag)
April 6, 1999 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED (propsd) ord granting motion for summ adj of dfts (jag)
April 6, 1999 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED joint stip of ptys purs to Crt's ord re discov & P/T dates (jag)
March 25, 1999 Filing 7234 DECLARATION of Terri N Schallenkamp by plfs in suppt of motion for summary adjudication of dfts' violation of 29 USC [7231-1] (app)
March 25, 1999 Filing 7233 DECLARATION of Teresa J Akune by plfs in suppt of motion for summary adjudication of dfts' violation of 29 USC 207(k) [7231-1] (app)
March 25, 1999 Filing 7232 NOTICE OF motion for summary adjudication of dfts' violation of 29 USC 207(k) [7231-1] by plfs; memo of P/A (app)
March 25, 1999 Filing 7231 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plfs for summary adjudication of dfts' violation of 29 USC 207(k) ; memo of P/A; declas of Theresa J Akune and Terri N Schallenkamp; motion hearing set for 9:30 am on 5/19/99; Lodged Ord (app)
March 22, 1999 Filing 7236 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 3/19/99 (weap)
March 22, 1999 Filing 7235 RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 3/19/99 (Re: ) CR: Heather Pitvorec (weap)
March 19, 1999 Filing 7230 MINUTES: pretrial conference held , crt ord(s) cnsl to meet & confer & stip NLT close of bus on 3/24/99 re DCO, date for filing mot(s) in limine and hrg date on mot(s) in limine, crt will set PTC & trial dates after resolution of mot(s) in limine, the crt vacates jury trial by Judge George H. King CR: Heather Pitvorec (cc to all cnsl) (app)
March 19, 1999 Filing 7229 EXHIBITS IN SUPPT OF mot(s) in limine [7222-1] & [7225-1] and RESPONSE to mot in limine to exclude all lay & expert testimony re 29 CFR 778.106 [7226-1]; decl of Edward P Zappia (app)
March 19, 1999 Filing 7228 RESPONSE by dfts Willie Williams and Los Angeles City of to motion in limine to exclude all lay & expert testimony re CFR 778.106 [7226-1] (app)
March 19, 1999 Filing 7227 OPPOSITION by plfs to motion in limine [7225-1] (app)
March 19, 1999 Filing 7226 MOTION by plfs in limine to exclude all lay & expert testimony re 29 CFR 778.106 (app) Modified on 03/23/1999
March 19, 1999 Filing 7225 MOTIONS by dfts Willie Williams and Los Angeles City of in limine (app)
March 15, 1999 Filing 7224 VOIR DIRE by dfts Willie Wiliams & Los Angeles City of (app)
March 15, 1999 Filing 7223 EXHIBITS by plfs to motion in limine [7222-1] (app)
March 15, 1999 Filing 7222 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by dfts Willie Williams and Los Angeles City of in limine ; memo of P/A; decl of Edward P Zappia; exh(s) (app)
March 15, 1999 Filing 7220 PROPSD VOIR DIRE by plfs (app)
March 12, 1999 Filing 7221 MINUTES: Telephonic Stat Conf Held , the crt sched jury trial for 9:30 am on 3/23/99 & pretrial conference for 4:00 pm on 3/22/99 , crt inquires if the ptys are ready to proceed to trial, as the crt indicate in its ord of 12/22/98, which would be @ the 1st trial date of 3/23/99, ntc of mot inlimine shall be filed in the form of a discov mot, in the format of a jnt brief, pursuant to LR 7.15.2, NLT 3/15/99, further no crs mot(s) shall be filed, cnsl propsd void dire NLT 3/15/99, courtesy cpys of all filings shall be delivered to chambers NLT noon on 3/15//99,(see min ord for further details & iss) by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (cc to all cnsl) (app)
March 4, 1999 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED stip fr stat conf (lc)
February 3, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 7219 MEMO & ORDER by Judge George H. King, The plain meaning of unpaid overtime compensation as used in 216(b) incl CTO w/held in violation of 207(o)(5), we reject dfts' interpretation of 216(b) & conclude that liquidated damages are available as remedy for violations of 207(o)(5) (ENT 02/04/99) mld cpys & ntc to ptys (app)
January 26, 1999 Filing 7218 NOTICE OF ERRATA by plf correcting trial brief [7217-1] (app)
January 21, 1999 Filing 7217 TRIAL BRIEFS by plfs (app)
January 21, 1999 Filing 7216 TRIAL BRIEFS by dfts Willie Williams & Los Angeles City of (app)
December 22, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 7215 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge George H. King, Douglas R Smith is dism from this matter w/o prej (app)
December 22, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 7214 MINUTES: On 12/21/98 Crt held a telephone stat conf w/ the ptys to determine the current stat of sttlmnt discussions. Ptys indicated that sttlmnt cont to elude them & that they were unlikely to sttle until after the crt ruled on the pending iss of whether liquidated damages are available. Crt orders plfs to send by mail w/in 5 days hereof a copy of the transcr of the hrgs on comp time off remedys held on 10/26/98 & both ptys to have trial br prepared w/in 30 days; both ptys to be prepared to go to trial at the 1st trial date after 3/23/99. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
December 1, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 7213 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge George H. King that plf Jennifer Bennett is hereby dism from this matter w/out prej. (ENT 12/3/98). (jag)
December 1, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 7212 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge George H. King that plf Charles Mealey is hereby dism from this matter w/out prej. (ENT 12/3/98). (jag)
November 30, 1998 Filing 7210 REQUEST by plaintiffs for jury trial on dfts willful violation of the FLSA; late pay provision & Crt trial on dfts affirmative defense of good faith (jag)
November 23, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 7211 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge George H. King, The crt defer issuance of its ruling on the remedies to the plfs for violations til 12/15/98, to foster further sttlmnt discussions (app)
November 17, 1998 Filing 7209 THEORIES OF LIABILITY re cto & REPLY by plf to dfts' brief re a Mag Judge (app)
November 17, 1998 Filing 7208 RESPONSE by plf to brief r4e the availability of effective remedies for violations of the FLSA Compensatory time off provisions [7207-1] (app)
November 10, 1998 Filing 7207 BRIEF by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie Williams re the availability of effective remedies for violations of the FLSA compensatory time off provisions (jag)
November 6, 1998 Filing 7205 POSITION RE ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL JUDGE by defendants Los Angeles City of and Willie Williams (sv)
October 28, 1998 Filing 7203 MINUTES: The crt grants dfts exparte appl to continue hrg on dfts' brief why they shld be permitted to assert addtl facts in supprt of their asserted good faith defense [7156-1], finding the exparte motion to stay payment of sanctions pending hrg on objs [7156-2] moot & that the brief adressing the appropriate remedy for violation of FLSA's Standard Governing Employee use of CTO is under submission, crt ord plfs to decide if they want to file a mot for sum adj as to theories 1 & 2 as discussed & identified at hrg w/in 14 days hereof (see min ord for further details & iss) by Judge George H. King CR: Magda Flores (app)
October 26, 1998 Filing 7204 MINUTES: The crt cont hearing on dft's exparte appl to continue hrg on dfts' brief why they shld be permitted to assert addtl in supprt of their asserted good faith defense [7156-1] & mot addressing appropriate remedy for violation of FLSA's Standards Governing Emplyee use of CTO to 10/28/98 @ 2pm by Judge George H. King CR: John Turman (app)
October 16, 1998 Filing 7202 MINUTES: On the Crt's own mot the sched hrg on dft's mot to assert addtl facts to suppt good faith defense & mot to determine remedies available for violation of FLSA's CTO provision, calendared for 10/19/98 is cont to 10/16/98 @ 9:30am. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
October 16, 1998 Filing 7201 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of response to objections [7197-1] (jag)
October 16, 1998 Filing 7200 REPLY by plaintiffs to fur resp to calculations of late payment for plf Maksimuk (jag)
October 16, 1998 Filing 7199 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of response to objections [7198-1] (jag)
October 16, 1998 Filing 7198 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to objections to ind plfs in selections 21-25 (jag)
October 16, 1998 Filing 7197 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to objections to ind plfs in selections 26-40 (jag)
October 13, 1998 Filing 7196 REQUEST by plfs for judicial ntc (app)
September 30, 1998 Filing 7195 JOINT STATUS REPORT by dfts & plfss re stat of sttlmnt discussions (app)
September 10, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 7194 MINUTES: Telephonic Stat conf is held. Crt orders that after conferring w/ the City of LA City Council on 9/15/98 as to sttlmnt possibilities, defense cnsl sh notify the Crt clk & plf's cnsl of the results nlt 9/16/98. If the City Council approves sttlmnt discussions, the ptys sh immediately begin sttlmnt discussions. Ptys sh fi a joint stat rpt nlt 9/30/98. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
September 4, 1998 Filing 7193 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to dfts' objections to ind plfs in selection 16-20 (jag)
September 4, 1998 Filing 7192 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to objections to ind plfs in selections 11-15 (jag)
August 31, 1998 Filing 7191 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to dfts' objections to ind plfs in selections 6-10 (jag)
August 26, 1998 Filing 7190 REQUEST by plfs Phillip Evans, Luis Hernandez, Luke W Magee, Emmett Badar, Richard Violano, Don Westfall, Guy Juneau, Floro Pinzon, Song Suh, Alicia Wolin, Jeff Quinton, Ronald Vencill, Marty Feinmark, Michael L Kimpel & Lorena Walsh, Roger Ruggero to set stat conf (app)
August 13, 1998 Filing 7189 NOTICE by plaintiffs re 8/17/98 hrg (jag)
July 31, 1998 Filing 7187 MINUTES: taken off calendar hearing re minutes [7172-2] IN COURT HEARING recalendared for 9:30 8/17/98 by Judge George H. King N/A (cc to all cnsl) (app)
July 30, 1998 Filing 7188 MINUTES: recalendared miscellaneous hearing [7173-1] to 8/3/98 at 9:30 am by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (cc to all cnsl) (app)
July 27, 1998 Filing 7186 RESPONSE by defendant Willie Williams, defendant Los Angeles City of to plfs' position on the available remedies for the alleged comp time off violations [7172-2] (dhl)
July 27, 1998 Filing 7185 REPLY by plaintiffs to dfts' position re available remedies for comp time off violations [7172-2] (dhl)
July 13, 1998 Filing 7184 JOINT BRIEF by defendants & plaintiffs on the available remedies for compensatory time off violations [7172-1] (app)
July 13, 1998 Filing 7183 RESPONSE by dfts Willie Williams & Los Angeles City of to plfs' evid & obj to dfts' addtl facts in support of dfts good faith def [7173-1] (app) Modified on 08/11/1998
July 13, 1998 Filing 7182 JOINT STATEMENT summarizing plfs' fur discov needs should the crt grant dfts' request to assert addtl facts re: dfts' good faith defense. (dhl)
July 6, 1998 LODGED (1) vol transcript submitted by plaintiffs (FWD TO CRD) (dhl) Modified on 07/08/1998
July 6, 1998 Filing 7181 NOTICE by plaintiffs of lodging of a certified cpy of the Statement Under Oath of: James E McNair dtd 3/4/98. (dhl)
July 6, 1998 Filing 7180 Exhs in suppt by plaintiffs in suppt of plfs' evid & objs to dfts' addtl facts in suppt of dfts' good faith defense; decls of Gordon Lawler; Chester D Spencer, & Edward P Zappia (re: dfts' mot to assert addtl facts in suppt of their good faith defense). (dhl)
July 6, 1998 Filing 7179 Evidence & objections by plaintiffs to dfts' addtl facts in suppt of dfts' good faith defense; decls of Gordon Lawler; Chester D Spencer, & Edward P Zappia (re: dfts' mot to assert addl facts in suppt of their good faith defense). (dhl)
July 6, 1998 Filing 7178 DECLARATION of Steven L Rader by plaintiffs in suppt of plfs' opp to dfts' mot to assert addtl facts in suppt of their good faith defense. (dhl)
July 6, 1998 Filing 7177 DECLARATION of Hank Hernandez by plaintiffs re: opp to dfts' mot to assert addtl facts in suppt of dfts' good faith defense. (dhl)
July 6, 1998 Filing 7176 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauchenburg by plaintiffs in suppt of plfs' opp to dfts' mot to assert addtl facts in suppt of their good faith defense. (dhl)
June 30, 1998 Filing 7175 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of resp to opp to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 5 [6986-1], motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 4 [6982-1], motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 3 [6978-1], motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 2 [6974-1] (jag)
June 30, 1998 Filing 7174 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to opp to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 5 [6986-1], to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 4 [6982-1], to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 3 [6978-1], to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 2 [6974-1] (jag)
June 29, 1998 Filing 7173 ADDITIONAL FACTS in suppt of dfts' good faith defense; decl of Gordon Lawler, Chester D Spencer & Edward P Zappia (jag)
June 24, 1998 Filing 7172 MINUTES: Plf's hearing re motion to bifurcate trial [7073-1] & motion appt spec master to determine issues pertaining to comp time off [7073-2] is taken OFF CALENDAR. The MO issd on 6/15/98 is hereby modified as follows: dfts sh file the factual summary as descrived by the Crt in the 6/15 MO by 6/29/98. See doc for addtl details. Purs to the Crt's instructions, the ptys are directed to meet & confer by 7/13/98, fi a joint br addressing the remedy for violation of FLSA's standards. An ; IN COURT HEARING RE: violation of FLSA's standards is set on 8/3/98 by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
June 22, 1998 Filing 7171 MINUTES RE PLF'S MOT TO BIFURCATE AND APPT SPECIAL MASTER: Fur stat conf is necessary. Mr Petersen and Mr Brown are ord personally to be present. Cnsl shall meet to arrange a time for conf consistent w/ crt's avail, as set forth in chambers, and shall advise the crt by Judge George H. King CR: none present (kh)
June 16, 1998 Filing 7170 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 6/15/98 (ghap)
June 16, 1998 Filing 7169 RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 6/15/98 (Re: ) CR: Mark Schweitzer (ghap)
June 16, 1998 Filing 7167 DECLARATION of DOUG FARROW by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie Williams in suppt of opp to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 5 [6986-1], motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 4 [6982-1], motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 3 [6978-1], motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 2 [6974-1] (jag)
June 16, 1998 Filing 7166 OPPOSITION by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie Williams to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 5 [6986-1], motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 4 [6982-1], motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 3 [6978-1], motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 2 [6974-1] (jag)
June 16, 1998 Filing 7165 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBERG by plaintiffs in suppt of resp to opp to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 1 [6970-1] (jag)
June 16, 1998 Filing 7164 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to opp to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 1 [6970-1] (jag)
June 15, 1998 Filing 7168 MINUTES: dfts req to assert additional facts in suppt of their good faith defense; purs to the crts ord at the 6-15-98 hrging, dfts shall set forth in detail all facts underlying their prospd addition to the good faith defense by 6-29-98; w/in plfs fur discv needs should the crt gr file a jnt stmt summarizing the necessary discv w/in 2 days after such meeting; by 6-29-98, plfs shall submit evid (e.g. discv resp, transc) to suppt their contention tht dfts previously misled plfs and the crt by asserting tht their good faith defense would not rely on fact or events occuring bf the filing of this suit; courtesy cpys of all docs shall be deliverd to chambers on the date of filing by Judge George H. King CR: Mark Schweitzer (ab)
June 15, 1998 Filing 7163 REPLY by plaintiffs to memo of P&A in opp to motion to bifurcate trial [7073-1], motion appt spec master to determine issues pertaining to comp time off [7073-2] (jag)
June 10, 1998 Filing 7162 MINUTES: This matter is before the Crt on dfts' objections to the Spec Mstr's 4/28/98 ord which awarded plfs their attys' fees clmd purs to a previous award by the Spec Mstr. Dfts' objections are overruled. The Spec Mstr's ord is not clearly erroneous, contrary to law or an abuse of discretion. It is affirmed. Dfts req to reduce the fee award on the basis of a calculation error is hereby GRANTED. The total fees awarded will be reduced from $8,820.50 to $8,765.50. Dfts sh pay such sum to plfs. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a. (ENT 6/12/98). (jag)
June 8, 1998 Filing 7161 MINUTES: The hrg on dft's req for permission to assert addtl facts supptng their good faith defense, originally sched for 6/8/98 was taken off calendar by the Crt. This mot is hereby recalendared for 6/15/98 @ 9:30am. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
June 8, 1998 Filing 7160 MEMORANDUM OF P/A by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie Williams in opposition to motion to bifurcate trial [7033-1]; and request for special master reference (et)
June 4, 1998 Filing 7159 Declaration of H. Ernie Nishii in opposition by plaintiff to exparte motion to continue hrg on dfts' brief why they shld be permitted to assert addtl facts in supprt of their asserted good faith defense [7156-1], exparte motion to stay payment of sanctions pending hrg on objs [7156-2] (et)
June 4, 1998 Filing 7158 OPPOSITION by plaintiff(s) to exparte motion to continue hrg on dfts' brief why they shld be permitted to assert addtl facts in supprt of their asserted good faith defense [7156-1], exparte motion to stay payment of sanctions pending hrg on objs [7156-2] (et)
June 4, 1998 Filing 7157 DECLARATION of Brian P. Walter by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie Williams re exparte motion to continue hrg on dfts' brief why they shld be permitted to assert addtl facts in supprt of their asserted good faith defense [7156-1], exparte motion to stay payment of sanctions pending hrg on objs [7156-2] (et)
June 4, 1998 Filing 7156 EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie Williams to continue hrg on dfts' brief why they shld be permitted to assert addtl facts in supprt of their asserted good faith defense , and to stay payment of sanctions pending hrg on objs ; declr of Brian P. Walter Lodged Ord (et)
June 2, 1998 Filing 7155 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants of opp to mot to adjudicate late payment of overtime clms of selection 1, decl of Brian P Walter, Wray Hollemon & Rick Pell in suppt of opp, decl of Rose Hyland; served upon Gregory Peterson & Spec Mstr Tassopulos on 6/2/98 by mail (jag)
June 2, 1998 Filing 7154 DECLARATION of ROSE HYLAND by defendants (jag)
June 2, 1998 Filing 7153 DECLARATION of RICK PELL by defendants in suppt of opp to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 1 [6970-1] (jag)
June 2, 1998 Filing 7152 DECLARATION of WRAY HOLLEMON by defendants in suppt of opp to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 1 [6970-1] (jag)
June 2, 1998 Filing 7151 DECLARATION of BRIAN P WALTER by defendants in suppt of opp to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 1 [6970-1] (jag)
June 2, 1998 Filing 7150 OPPOSITION by defendants to motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 1 [6970-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7149 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adj late payment overtime clms of selection 33 (plfs 1-100); motion hearing set for 9:00 6/24/98 (app)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7148 EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 41 [7145-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7147 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 41 [7145-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7146 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 41 [7145-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7145 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 41 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/24/98 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7144 EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 40 [7141-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7143 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 40 [7141-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7142 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 40 [7141-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7141 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 40 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/24/98 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7140 EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 39 [7137-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7139 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 39 [7137-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7138 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 39 [7137-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7137 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 39 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/24/98 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7136 EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 38 [7133-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7135 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 38 [7133-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7134 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 38 [7133-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7133 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 38 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/24/98 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7132 EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 37 [7129-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7131 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 37 [7129-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7130 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 37 [7129-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7129 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 37 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/24/98 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7128 EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 36 [7125-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7127 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 36 [7125-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7126 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 36 [7125-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7125 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 36 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/24/98 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7124 EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 35 [7121-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7123 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 35 [7121-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7122 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 35 [7121-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7121 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 35 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/24/98 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7120 EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 34 [7117-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7119 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 34 [7117-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7118 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 34 [7117-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7117 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 34 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/24/98 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7116 PLF'S EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 33 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7115 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 33 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7114 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of mot to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 33 (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7113 AMENDED EXHIBITS to motion adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 25 [7052-1] (jag)
June 1, 1998 Filing 7112 REPLY by defendants to plfs' opp to objections to the memo & ord of the Spec Mstr re: determination of the reasonable hourly rates & reasonable no of hours for plfs' clm for attys' fees awarded by the 2/23/98 ord (jag)
May 27, 1998 Filing 7111 CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff on 5/26/98 of ntc and mot to adj late pymt overttime clsm of selection 31 (lc)
May 27, 1998 Filing 7110 CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Michael L Kimpel on 5/26/98 of ntc and mot to adjud late pymt overtime clms of selection 32 (lc)
May 26, 1998 Filing 7108 MINUTES: On the Crt's own mot, the hrg on dfts' req for permission to assert addtl facts supptng their good faith defense, currently sched for 6/1/98, is hereby taken off calendar & recalandared for 6/8/98 @ 9:30am. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
May 22, 1998 Filing 7107 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to opp to Special Master's meo & ord re determinatio of reasonable hourly rates & reasonable number of hours for plfs' clms for attys' fees awarded by the 2/23/98 ord (jag)
May 22, 1998 Filing 7106 EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 32 [7103-1] (jag)
May 22, 1998 Filing 7105 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 32 [7103-1] (jag)
May 22, 1998 Filing 7104 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 32 [7103-1] (jag)
May 22, 1998 Filing 7103 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 32 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (jag)
May 22, 1998 Filing 7102 EXHIBITS to motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 31 [7099-1] (jag)
May 22, 1998 Filing 7101 DECLARATION of LAUREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 31 [7099-1] (jag)
May 22, 1998 Filing 7100 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 31 [7099-1] (jag) Modified on 05/28/1998
May 22, 1998 Filing 7099 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 31 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (jag)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7109 DECLARATION of H Ernie Nishii by plaintiff re motion to bifurcate trial [7033-1] (lc)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7082 Exhibits by plaintiff to motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 30 [7079-1] (lc)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7081 DECLARATION of Lauren Rauscenburg by plaintiff re motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 30 [7079-1] (lc)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7080 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 30 [7079-1] (lc)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7079 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 30 6/10/98 9:00 bf Spec Master (lc)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7078 Exhibits by plaintiff to motion to adudicate late pymt overtime dism of selection 29 [7075-1] (lc)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7077 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion to adudicate late pymt overtime dism of selection 29 [7075-1] (lc)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7076 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to adudicate late pymt overtime dism of selection 29 [7075-1] (lc)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7075 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adudicate late pymt overtime dism of selection 29 6/10/98 9:00 bf Spec Master (lc)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7074 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to bifurcate trial [7073-1], motion appt spec master to determine issues pertaining to comp time off [7073-2] (lc)
May 21, 1998 Filing 7073 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to bifurcate trial , and appt spec master to determine issues pertaining to comp time off ; motion hearing set for 9:30 6/22/98 Lodged ord (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7072 Exhibits by plaintiff to motion adjudicate late pymt of overtime clms of selection 28 [7069-1] (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7071 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late pymt of overtime clms of selection 28 [7069-1] (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7070 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late pymt of overtime clms of selection 28 [7069-1] (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7069 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late pymt of overtime clms of selection 28 bf Spec Master 6/10/98 9:00 (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7068 Exhibits by plaintiff to motion adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 27 [7065-1] (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7067 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 27 [7065-1] (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7066 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 27 [7065-1] (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7065 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 27 bf Spec Master 6/10/98 9:00 (lc) Modified on 05/20/1998
May 19, 1998 Filing 7064 Exhibits by plaintiff to motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 26 [7061-1] (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7063 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 26 [7061-1] (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7062 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 26 [7061-1] (lc)
May 19, 1998 Filing 7061 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 26 bf Spec Master 6/10/98 9:00 (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7093 REPLY BRIEF by defendants Los Angeles City, Willie Williams on why they should be permitted to assert addtl facts in suppt of their asserted good faith defense [6480-1] (rm)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7055 Exhibits by plaintiff to motion adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 25 [7052-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7054 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 25 [7052-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7053 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 25 [7052-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7052 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 25 bf Spec Master 6/10/98 9:00 (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7051 Exhibits by plaintiff to motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 24 [7048-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7050 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 24 [7048-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7049 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 24 [7048-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7048 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 24 bf Spec Master on 6/10/98 9:00 (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7047 Exhibits by plaintiff to motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 23 [7044-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7046 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 23 [7044-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7045 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 23 [7044-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7044 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 23 bf Spec Master on 6/10/98 9:00 (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7043 Exhibits by plaintiff to motion for adjudicate late pymt overtime clsm of selection 22 [7040-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7042 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion for adjudicate late pymt overtime clsm of selection 22 [7040-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7041 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion for adjudicate late pymt overtime clsm of selection 22 [7040-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7040 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff for adjudicate late pymt overtime clsm of selection 22 bf Spec Master on 6/10/98 9:00 (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7039 Exhibits by plaintiff to motion to adjudicate late pymt overtme clms of selection 21 [7036-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7038 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion to adjudicate late pymt overtme clms of selection 21 [7036-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7037 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to adjudicate late pymt overtme clms of selection 21 [7036-1] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7036 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adjudicate late pymt overtme clms of selection 21 bf Spec Master 6/10/98 9:00 (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7035 DECLARATION of H Ernie Nishii by plaintiff re motion to bifurcate trial [7033-1], motion assign spec master to detemine issues pertaining to comp time off [7033-2] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7034 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to bifurcate trial [7033-1], motion assign spec master to detemine issues pertaining to comp time off [7033-2] (lc)
May 18, 1998 Filing 7033 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to bifurcate trial , and assign spec master to detemine issues pertaining to comp time off ; motion hearing set for 9:30 6/8/98 (lc)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7098 MEMORANDUM OF PA IN SUPPORT by plfs of motion to adj late pymt overtime clms of selection 17 [7058-1], (plfs 1-100) (app) Modified on 05/29/1998
May 15, 1998 Filing 7097 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 20 [7060-1] (plfs 1-100) (app)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7096 EXHIBITS by plaintiffs to motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 20 [7060-1] (Plf 1-100) (ak)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7095 EXHIBITS by plaintiffs to motion to Adjudicate Late Payment Overtime Claims of Selection 18 [7057-1] (ak)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7094 MEMORANDUM OF PA IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to Adjudicate Late Payment Overtime Claims of Selection 18 [7057-1] (Plfs 1-100) (ak)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7092 EXHIBITS by plaintiffs to motion to Adjudicate Late Payment Overtime Claims of Selection 16 [7056-1] (rm)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7091 EXHIBITS by plaintiffs to motion to adj late pymt overtime clms of selection 17 [7058-1] (rm)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7090 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff in supp of motion to Adjudicate Late Payment Overtime Claims of Selection 16 [7056-1] (Plaintiffs 1-100) (app) Modified on 05/27/1998
May 15, 1998 Filing 7089 MEMORANDUM OF PA by plaintiffs in suppt of motion to Adjudicate Late Payment Overtime Claims of Selection 16 [7056-1] (Plfs 1-100) (ak)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7088 Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff in supp of motion to adj late pymt of overtime claims of selection 19 [7059-1] (app)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7087 EXHIBITS by plaintiff to motion to adj late pymt of overtime claims of selection 19 [7059-1] (plfs 1-100) (app)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7086 DECLARATION of Lauren K. Rauschenburg by plaintiff in support of motion to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection [7060-1] (rm)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7085 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion to adj late pymt of overtime claims of selection 19 [7059-1] (rm)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7084 DECLARATION of Lauren K. Rauschenburg by plaintiffs in support of motion to adj late pymt overtime clms of selection 17 [7058-1] (rm)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7083 DECLARATION of Lauren K. Rauschenburg by plaintiffs in support of motion to Adjudicate Late Payment Overtime Claims of Selection 18 [7057-1] (rm)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7059 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adj late pymt of overtime claims of selection 19 (plfs 1-100); motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (rm)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7060 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plfs to adjudicate late pymt overtime clms of selection 20 , (plfs 1-100); motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (app)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7056 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to Adjudicate Late Payment Overtime Claims of Selection 16 , [Plfs 1-100 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (ak)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7057 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to Adjudicate Late Payment Overtime Claims of Selection 18 , [Plfs 1-100] ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (ak)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7058 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plfs to adj late pymt overtime clms of selection 17 (plfs 1-100); motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (rm)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7032 OBJECTIONS to memo andord of Special master re dtemrinaiton of reasonable hrly rates and number of hrs fr plfs' clm for atty fees awarded by 2/23/98 order by defendant Willie NMI Williams, defendant Los Angeles City of (lc)
May 15, 1998 Filing 7031 NTC OF OBJECTIONS to special master ord of 4/18/98 by defendant Willie NMI Williams, defendant Los Angeles City of (lc)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7030 Exhs by plaintiffs to motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selections 11 [7027-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7029 DECLARATION of Lauren K. Rauschenburg by plaintiffs in supprt to motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selections 11 [7027-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7028 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selections 11 [7027-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7027 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selections 11 (plfs 1-100) ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7026 Exhs by plaintiffs to motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 15 [7023-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7025 DECLARATION of Lauren K. Rauschenburg by plaintiffs in supprt to motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 15 [7023-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7024 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 15 [7023-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7023 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 15 (plfs 1-100); motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7022 Exhs by plaintiffs to motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selction 14 [7019-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7021 DECLARATION of Lauren K. Rauschenburg by plaintiffs in supprt motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selction 14 [7019-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7020 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selction 14 [7019-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7019 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selction 14 (plfs 1-100) ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7018 Exhs by plaintiffs to motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 13 [7015-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7017 DECLARATION of Lauren K. Rauschenburg by plaintiffs in supprt to motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 13 [7015-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7016 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 13 [7015-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7015 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 13 (plfs 1-100) ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7014 Exhs by plaintiffs to motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 12 [7011-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7013 DECLARATION of Lauren K. Rauschenburg by plaintiffs in supprt re motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 12 [7011-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7012 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiffs of motion to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 12 [7011-1] (pbap)
May 14, 1998 Filing 7011 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff to adj late pymnt overtime claims of selection 12 (1-100) ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/10/98 (pbap)
May 13, 1998 Filing 7010 NOTICE of lodging of depo transcripts by plaintiff (pbap)
May 13, 1998 Filing 7009 EXHIBITS (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 7008 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 10 [7006-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 7007 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 10 [7006-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 7006 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 10 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/3/98 (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 7005 EXHIBITS (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 7004 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 9 [7002-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 7003 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 9 [7002-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 7002 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 9 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/3/98 (dmjr) Modified on 05/14/1998
May 13, 1998 Filing 7001 EXHIBITS (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 7000 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 8 [6998-1] (dmjr) Modified on 05/14/1998
May 13, 1998 Filing 6999 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 8 [6998-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6998 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 8 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/3/98 (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6997 EXHIBITS (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6996 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 7 [6994-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6995 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 7 [6994-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6994 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 7 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/3/98 (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6993 EXHIBITS (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6992 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 6 [6990-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6991 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 6 [6990-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6990 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 6 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/3/98 (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6989 EXHIBITS (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6988 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 5 [6986-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6987 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 5 [6986-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6986 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 5 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/3/98 (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6985 EXHIBITS (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6984 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 4 [6982-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6983 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 4 [6982-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6982 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 4 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/3/98 (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6981 EXHIBITS (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6980 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 3 [6978-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6979 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 3 [6978-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6978 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late payment overtime clms selection 3 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/3/98 Lodged ord (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6977 EXHIBITS (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6976 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 2 [6974-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6975 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 2 [6974-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6974 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 2 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/3/98 (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6973 EXHIBITS (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6972 DECLARATION of Lauren K Rauschenburg by plaintiff re motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 1 [6970-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6971 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 1 [6970-1] (dmjr)
May 13, 1998 Filing 6970 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff adjudicate late payment overtime clms of selection 1 ; motion hearing set for 9:00 6/3/98 (dmjr)
May 7, 1998 Filing 6969 MINUTES: Pla's ex parte appl for relief from the limitation of local rule 3.10 is DENIED. Their req for addtl ti to oppose dfts' req to assert addtl facts in supp of their good faith defense is GRANTED. [6965-1] by Judge George H. King CR: N/A (bp)
May 7, 1998 Filing 6968 AMENDED OPPOSITION to why dfts should be permitted to assert addtl facts in supp of their asserted good faith defense by Luis Hernandez, plaintiff Luke W Magee, plaintiff Emmett Badar (bp)
May 6, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 6964 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER that the document is not to be fld, but instead rejected & returned to cnsl (pla's opp to dft's addtl facts) memo exceeds the 25 page limit by Judge George H. King (bp)
May 6, 1998 Filing 6963 OPPOSITION by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams to pla's ex parte appl for relief from local rule 3.10 or in the alt relief for ext of ti to fl amd opp (bp)
May 5, 1998 Filing 6967 DECLARATION of Terri N. Schallenkamp by plaintiff Phillip Evans, plaintiff Luis Hernandez, plaintiff Luke W Magee, plaintiff Emmett Badar re exparte motion for order for relief form local rule 3.10 [6965-1] (bp)
May 5, 1998 Filing 6966 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff Phillip Evans, plaintiff Luis Hernandez, plaintiff Luke W Magee, plaintiff Emmett Badar of exparte motion for order for relief form local rule 3.10 [6965-1] (bp)
May 5, 1998 Filing 6965 EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Phillip Evans, plaintiff Luis Hernandez, plaintiff Luke W Magee, plaintiff Emmett Badar for order for relief form local rule 3.10 Lodged prop amd opp (bp)
April 27, 1998 Filing 6962 REPLY by plaintiffs to stmt re the Rogers, Davies & Dagnesses calculations (jag)
April 15, 1998 Filing 6961 DECLARATION of H ERNIE NISHII by plaintiffs in suppt of reply to op to plfs' decl re: hours spent in preparing resp to dfts' objections to plfs' hourly rate [6960-1] (jag)
April 15, 1998 Filing 6960 REPLY by plaintiffs to opp to plfs' decl re: hours spent in preparing resp to dfts' objections to hourly rate (jag)
April 13, 1998 Filing 6959 DECLARATION of ROBERT CRAMER by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams (jag)
April 13, 1998 Filing 6958 BRIEF by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams on why they should be permitted to assert addtl facts in suppt of their asserted good faith defense (jag)
March 31, 1998 Filing 6957 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 3/25/98 (weap)
March 31, 1998 Filing 6956 RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 3/25/98 (Re: ) CR: David Salyer (weap)
March 25, 1998 Filing 6955 MINUTES: ; status conf held . Crt sets the following sched re why the Crt should now permit dfts to now assert a enw component of their good faith defense; Mot for relief may be fld by dfts by 4/13/98, plfs to resp by 5/4/98 & dfts to reply by 5/11/98, hrg to be held on 5/18/98 @ 9:30am. by Judge George H. King CR: David Salyer (jag)
March 24, 1998 Filing 6954 REPLY by plaintiffs to response to exparte motion to set stat conf [6948-1] (jag)
March 24, 1998 Filing 6953 DECLARATION of H ERNIE NISHII by plaintiffs in reply to resp to exparte motion to set stat conf [6948-1] (jag)
March 20, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 6952 ORDER by Judge George H. King; It is ordered that a ; status conf is set on 3/25/98 ; pretrial conference on 8/3/98 ; jury trial set on 9/14/98 ; Stat conf is to set a hrg date for plfs' mot for summ adj of applicable limitations period, etal (jag)
March 19, 1998 Filing 6951 RESPONSE by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams to exparte motion to set stat conf [6948-1] (jag)
March 18, 1998 Filing 6950 DECLARATION of GREGORY G PETERSEN by plaintiffs (jag)
March 18, 1998 Filing 6949 DECLARATION of STEVEN L RADER by plaintiffs re exparte notice to set stat conf [6948-1] (jag)
March 18, 1998 LODGED/PROPOSED ORDER submitted by plaintiff for exparte motion to set stat conf [6948-1] .(FWD TO CRD) (jag)
March 18, 1998 Filing 6948 EX PARTE REQUEST filed by plaintiffs to set stat conf (jag)
March 10, 1998 Filing 6947 DECLARATION of H ERNIE NISHII by plaintiffs re hours spent in preparing resp to dfts' objections to plfs' hourly rate (jag)
March 10, 1998 Filing 6946 DECLARATION of LARRY J ROBERTS by plaintiffs re hours spent in preparing resp to dfts' objections to plfs' hourly rate (jag)
February 26, 1998 Filing 6945 CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs of Robert Cramer & Peter J Brown on 2/25/98 by mail (jag)
February 26, 1998 Filing 6944 NOTICE OF ERRATA by plaintiffs (jag)
February 10, 1998 Filing 6943 CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs of memo oflaw in reply to dfts' opp to plfs' req atty-fee rates; served upon Peter J Brown on 2/9/98 by mail (jag)
February 9, 1998 Filing 6941 DECLARATIONS of ENRIQUE HERNANDEZ, GREGORY PETERSEN, STANLEY FLEISHMAN, DENNIS HARLEY, EUGENE BOGGS, DAVID CLARE, JOHN DALY, PETER FERGUSON, STEVEN RADER, SUSAN WILSON, H ERNIE NISHII, FREDERICK WHITNEY & LAUREN RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of mot for atty fees & expenses (jag)
February 9, 1998 Filing 6940 MEMO OF LAW IN REPLY by plaintiffs to opp to plfs' req atty fee rates (jag)
February 2, 1998 Filing 6942 MINUTES: Stat conf is held re: the ptys choice of LR 23 proc. Fur ; status conf set on 2/17/98 . Cnsl will be notified of the time by the Clk. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
January 30, 1998 Filing 6939 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 1/26/98 (ghap)
January 30, 1998 Filing 6938 RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 1/26/98 (Re: ) CR: David Salyer (ghap)
January 26, 1998 Filing 6937 MINUTES: This matter comes before the crt on the Special Master's rpt re dfts' compliance w/ 29 CFR Sect 778.106. Crt fully considered the br pertaining to this matter & heard oral argument. For the reasons set forth on the record in open Crt, Crt finds that dfts are not entitled to rely upon the exception in sect 778.106 as a matter of law. by Judge George H. King CR: David Salyer (jag)
January 21, 1998 Filing 6936 REQUEST by plaintiffs for clarification of special master's ord re: stmt of costs (jag)
January 16, 1998 Filing 6934 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams of objections to rpt of Special Mstr; served upon Venetta S Tassopulos, by mail on 12/22/97 (jag)
January 14, 1998 Filing 6935 MINUTES: Stipulation re: assignment of related cases to Judge w/ Lower-Numbered Case is DENIED. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
January 14, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 6933 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge George H. King re: assignment of related cases to Judge w/ lower-numbered case is DENIED (jag)
January 14, 1998 Filing 6932 NOTICE by plaintiffs of non-opp to plfs' stmt of costs (jag)
January 12, 1998 Filing 6931 DECLARATION of ROBERT CRAMER by defendants (jag)
January 9, 1998 Filing 6930 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to dfts' objections to rpt of Sp Mstr (jag)
January 9, 1998 Filing 6929 EXHIBITS I, J & K to plfs' resp to dfts' objections to rpt of Special Mstr (jag)
January 9, 1998 Filing 6928 EXHIBITS D, E, F, G & H to plfs' resp to dfts' objections to rpt of Special Mstr (jag)
January 9, 1998 Filing 6927 EXHIBITS A, B & C to plfs' resp to dfts' obj to Rpt of Special Master (jag)
January 5, 1998 Filing 6926 STATEMENT of COSTS by plaintiffs expended as a result of dfts' cnsls re-assertion of the advice of cnsl defense purs MO of 12/19/97 (jag)
January 5, 1998 Filing 6925 STATEMENT of COSTS by plaintiffs expended purs to 2nd mot to compel plfs' req to produce set 5 (jag)
January 3, 1998 Filing 7206 MINUTES: IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. King. Crt ords dft to subm a brf stating in 7 pgs or less its position and auth as to viol of 29:207(o)(5) has effective remedy. Dft sh hand serve its brf on pla w/n 7 dys hereof. Pla sh have 7 dys from date of service to file a resp which sh not exceed 7 pgs. CR: B Herrera. (sv)
December 31, 1997 Filing 6924 DECLARATION of H ERNIE NISHII by plaintiffs in suppt of plfs' reply to Robert Cramer's decl (jag)
December 31, 1997 Filing 6923 REPLY by plaintiffs to decl of Robert Cramer (jag)
December 30, 1997 Filing 6921 STATEMENT of COSTS by plaintiffs in support of plfs mot to compel depos [5706-1] (jag)
December 29, 1997 Filing 6922 MEMORANDUM & ORDER by Special Master Venetta S Tassopulos; It is ordered on the Spec Mstr's previously set for 1/5/98 is cont to 1/26/98 @ 9:30am. Plfs are granted to & including 1/9/97 to file a reply to the obj. (jag)
December 23, 1997 Filing 6920 REPLY by plaintiffs to resp to plfs' req for fur discov (jag)
December 22, 1997 Filing 6918 OBJECTIONS by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams to rpt of Special Master (jag)
December 19, 1997 Filing 6919 MINUTES: Since matters relating to possible fee awards indiscov procdgs are pending before the Spec Master, the determination of fees & costs awardable as a result of the crt's 11/18/97 MO is hereby referred to the Spec Master. Judge Tassopulos is hereby auth to determine the reasonable hourly rates of plfs' attys. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
December 18, 1997 Filing 6917 REQUEST by plaintiffs for fur discov re dfts new payroll system & verification of calculations performed by KPMG Peat Marwick (jag)
December 18, 1997 Filing 6916 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to rpt of Special Master re the iss of dfts' compliance w/ respect to the payment of overtime to the plfs (jag)
December 11, 1997 Filing 6848 ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams of non-opp to attys' fees award; served upon Ernie Nishii, on 12/10/97, by mail (jag)
December 10, 1997 Filing 6847 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER re the iss of dfts' compliance w/ resp to the payment of overtime to the plfs (jag)
December 10, 1997 Filing 6846 NOTICE by special master Venetta S Tassopulos of filing of report (jag)
December 9, 1997 Filing 6915 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Robert A Lopez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 9, 1997 Filing 6829 DECLARATION of CRAIG W MURREL by plaintiffs re analysis of certain overtime calculations (jag)
December 9, 1997 Filing 6828 STATEMENT of COSTS by plaintiffs of H Ernie Nishii in suppt of plfs mot ot compel depo of the person that the City should have designated as the one who believed in good faith (jag)
December 9, 1997 Filing 6827 STATEMENT of COSTS by plaintiffs of H Ernie Nishii in suppt of plfs mot to compel depo of Wray Holleman (jag)
December 9, 1997 Filing 6826 STATEMENT of COSTS by plaintiffs of H Ernie Nishii in suppt of plfs mot to compel depo of Louis Ybarra (jag)
December 9, 1997 Filing 6825 DECLARATION of LAREN K RAUSCHENBURG by plaintiffs in suppt of req for OSC [6824-1] (jag)
December 9, 1997 Filing 6824 REQUEST by plaintiffs for ord to show cause for production of all underlying data re: 1st group of 100 plfs & award for monetary sanctions (jag)
December 9, 1997 Filing 6823 NOTICE by plaintiffs of costs associated w/ dfts' discov failure & req for judicial ntc (jag)
December 5, 1997 Filing 6808 STATEMENT of COSTS by plaintiffs of H Ernie Nishii in suppt of mot to compel fur resp to 1st set of interrogs [5709-1] (jag)
December 5, 1997 Filing 6807 STATEMENT of COSTS by plaintiffs of H Ernie Nishii in suppt of plfs' 9th req for production of docs (jag)
December 3, 1997 Filing 6733 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Bryan Lium joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 2, 1997 Filing 6906 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Belinda Townsend joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 2, 1997 Filing 6905 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Sam Scott Salazar joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6914 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daniel Mendoza joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6913 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Terri L Utley joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6912 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kenneth W Schmidt joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6911 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Francene Monger joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6910 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Susana L Salinaz joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6909 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Sherry McKinney joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6908 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Scott M Mazone joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6907 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Timothy James Meicher joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6710 DECLARATION of H ERNIE NISHII by plaintiffs in suppt of plfs' mot to strike dfts ans [6382-1] & for attys fees & costs [6382-2] (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6709 DECLARATION of GREGORY G PETERSEN by plaintiffs re attys' fees & costs (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6708 REQUEST by plaintiffs for costs for dft cnsl's late assertion of the "advice of cnsl" defense (jag)
December 1, 1997 Filing 6707 NOTICE by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams of NON-OPPOSITION to attys' fee award (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6904 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Patricia Suarez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6903 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Martin Pinedo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6902 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Edward NMI Perez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6901 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant William A Parmelee joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6900 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daryl Leon Maxwell joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6899 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Joseph Jamal Pollack joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6898 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ira W Putnam joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6897 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant George Sumptor joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6896 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Mario Valdez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6895 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steven W Brazner joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6894 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James A Deurmeier joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6893 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Mary Cindy Gomez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6892 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jose D Hurtado joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6891 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Bernadette C Kilgore joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6890 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Randy J Lack joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6889 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ronald NMI Lopez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6888 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Joe Dyer III joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6887 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Gregorio R De La Rosa joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6886 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard E Crotsley joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6885 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Arturo Covarrubias joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6883 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Louis Zorrilla joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6882 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Martha Rodriguez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6881 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Joy Haro joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6880 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant David W Herrick joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6879 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Phillip Bobo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6878 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Willie C Carter joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6877 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Marie Parrell joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6876 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Paul Stalker joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6875 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael L Williams joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6874 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Rebecca Zufall joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6873 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James R Flickinger joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6872 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Nethanial Warthon Jr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6870 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ray A Webb joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6869 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Hugo Angel Trujillo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6868 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ritchie Tejerina joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6867 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steven J Flores joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6866 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kenneth G Roa joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6865 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Leland G Sands joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6864 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ernest NMI Allen joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6863 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Susan L Miller joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6862 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael Windsor joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6861 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Mercedes Hallock joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6860 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant William Kipp joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6859 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard A Gutierrez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6858 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daniel H Gonzalez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6857 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Vickie Frelow joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6856 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant John Munguia joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6855 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jesse James Ivey joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6854 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steven P Howe joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6853 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Andrew S Hallock joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6852 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Timothy Gallick joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6851 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Evangelyn Nathan joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6850 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Marjan Mobasser joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6849 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard L Monfils joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6845 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Carlos Mercado joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6844 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Anthony E Macklin joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6843 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Scott Kennedy joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6842 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Stephen Ray Kehoe joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6841 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Tonya Johnson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6840 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Hinson L Jackson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6839 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Stephanie Paglialonga joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6702 REQUEST by plaintiffs for judicial ntc (jag)
November 26, 1997 Filing 6701 PLAINTIFFS' SUMMARY of oral arguments presented at hrg on 11/19/97 (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6884 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Todd E Clease joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6838 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Gilbert Ortiz Jr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6837 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Victor Romo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6836 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Horacio Marco joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6835 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Gail Russell joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6834 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant George Ryan joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6833 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Alma Skefich joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6832 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Edwin L Spurling joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6831 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Mario Valdez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6830 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michelle Nelson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6822 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Meredith R Swisher joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6821 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Irene Martinez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6820 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael Talavera joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6819 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jose Luis Martinez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6818 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Javier Montenegro joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6817 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Henry Leal joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6816 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Karl Holmstrom joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6815 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Peter G Grupp joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6814 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Reina L Frazier joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6813 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James P Farris joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6812 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard Charles Dulgerian joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6811 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ted E Dukeslaw joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6810 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard NMI Davis joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6809 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Lucien Daigle joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6806 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kenneth Crawford joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6805 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Christian R Cooper joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6804 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Orlando Chandler joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6803 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Felipe Campos joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6802 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Criselda Aguilar joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6801 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daniel M Andrews joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6800 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Lawrence Raymond Monterastelli joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6799 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Lawrence L Molinar joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6798 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Alma D Mercado joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6797 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Shawn Massey joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6796 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James E West Jr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6795 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Albert J Martinez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6794 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant John S Madden joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6793 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Gregory MacDonald joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6792 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kevin Lowe joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6791 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Cruz N Lopez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6790 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Warren D Spayth joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6789 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Gerald W Mimms joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6788 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James E Moore joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6787 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Roger E Mora joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6786 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Margaret NMI Moss joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6785 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Melissa Munson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6784 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Frank Murillo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 25, 1997 Filing 6682 SUMMARY OF ARGUMENT made to the special master re the iss of dfts' compliance w/ respect to the payment of overtime to the plfs (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6783 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steve Uhrig joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6782 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Stephen Meagher joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6781 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant William NMI Casey joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6780 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Sandra Infante joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6779 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Judith Lynn Barham joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6778 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Bourbon M Quijano joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6777 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Robert J Baker joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6776 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Juan Sanchez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6775 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Dennis Burkman joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6774 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daniel Kern joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6773 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James Cabral joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6772 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Cliff Humphris joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6771 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Margaret M Hennessy joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6770 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Sergio G Guzman joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6769 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Mark Griego joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6768 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steven D Fisher joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6767 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Russell Graybill joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6766 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daniel Ruiz joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6765 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard A McCauley, defendant Los Angeles City of joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6764 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Louis Anthony Ferreira joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6763 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Terence H Klafke joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6762 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Crescynthia O Shrader joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6761 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant William Simonoff joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6760 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Brad M Baird joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6759 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Rodolfo Alaniz joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6757 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Elbert Ray Smith joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6756 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ranferi Sandoval joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6755 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Nina V Sandoval joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6754 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James NMI Thompson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6753 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Rosa A Torres joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6752 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Frank Z Droy joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6751 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James Galbraith II joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6750 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jason G Thompson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6749 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Stuart Guidry joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6748 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Lawrence A Mudgett joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6747 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Chavonne Benjamin joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6746 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kim Chang joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6745 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Charles Dickinson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6744 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Roland E Drollin joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6743 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Charles Duplessis joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6742 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Gilbert E Freeze Jr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6741 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Manuel H Garcia joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6740 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James N Gordon joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6739 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard NMI Elliott joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6738 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steve Fahrney joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6737 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant David W Herrick joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6736 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Danny C Contreras joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6735 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kristopher S Kiltz joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6734 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Javier Lara Jr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6732 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Terence Smith joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6731 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Troy Castillo joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6730 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Bernardino Herrera joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6729 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Ronald B Eckert joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6728 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Ignacio Rojas joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6727 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Alejandro Vargas Jr joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6726 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant David R Shearman joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6725 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Timothy Marrs joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6724 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Stephen M Diaz joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6723 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Michael Mack joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6722 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Michael Paul Cognata joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6721 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Alexander D Chan joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6720 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Cecelia M Dixon joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6719 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Robert A Sorrentino joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6718 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant David Sigler joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6717 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant David E Williams joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6716 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Deborah Sue Ginther joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6715 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Linda Peace joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6714 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Jonathan Sugar joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6713 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Carlos D Sanchez joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6712 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Peter B Sanchez joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6711 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Frank L Spangler joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6706 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Terence Smith joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6705 JOINDER by defendant Robert Schlesinger joining complaint [1-1] (dcap)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6704 JOINDER by defendant Richard K Larimer joining complaint [1-1] (dcap)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6703 JOINDER by defendant Tim Lai joining complaint [1-1] (dcap)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6700 CONSENT TO JOINT ACTN by movant Luis M Alarcon joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6699 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Dennis Osmanson joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6698 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Javier Nunez joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6697 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant James A Miller joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6696 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Ann McGren joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6695 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Edward Maytorena joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6694 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Raul T LaRiva joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6693 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Jose L Martinez joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6692 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Cesario L Reyes joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6691 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Edward Rocha joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6690 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Danny Roman joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6689 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Dean M Cain joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6688 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Bernard Pulliam joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6687 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN Mark NMI Allen joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6686 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Kennon Anderson joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6685 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Lori A Lee joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6684 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Zoltan Mako joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6683 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTN by movant Carlos Martinez Sr joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6681 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Lamar Bell joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6680 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Linda Baldwin joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6679 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steve Bailey III joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6678 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jahna L Beard joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6677 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Tod Henry joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6676 CONSENT TO JOINT by movant Katherine Puckett joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 24, 1997 Filing 6675 CONSENT TO JOIN by movant James H Quinlan joining complaint [1-1] (bp)
November 21, 1997 Filing 6674 ERRATA by plaintiffs to response to dfts' supplementary memo of p&a in opp to 3rd 20 pltfs' presentation of actual hours worked under the FLSA & Liquidated damages due for late payment [6660-1] (bg)
November 21, 1997 Filing 6673 DECLARATION of Robert Cramer by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams (bg)
November 21, 1997 Filing 6672 NOTICE of lodging by plaintiffs (bg)
November 19, 1997 Filing 6669 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to opp to motion for costs for the depo of councilmember John Ferraro [6086-1], motion request for sanctions [6086-2] (jag)
November 18, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 6671 MINUTES: Dft's req to cont plfs' mot for S/J of the applicable limitations period is MOOT given the stay of procdgs ordered herein. Dfts' req to cont the depos is MOOT given the stay. Crt emphasizes that plfs will be provided an opportunity to depose relevant witnesses if & when the "advice of cnsl" defense becorms relevant. DFts' req for an ord precluding plfs from deposing Wray Hollemon is DENIED. This depo may proceed at this present time despite the crt's stay of all other discov. by Judge George H. King CR: n/a (jag)
November 18, 1997 Filing 6668 AMENDED DECLARATION of KIP JONES by plaintiffs (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6670 REPLY by plaintiffs to opp to motion for summary adjudication of applicable limitations period [6482-1] (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6667 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to dfts' memo of P&A re the reasonableness of its police overtime acctng system (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6666 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to dfts' suppl memo of P&A in opp to 2nd 20 plfs' presentation of actual hours worked under the FLSA & liquidated damages due for late payment (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6665 NOTICE by plaintiffs of failure to pay sanctions ordered on 10/9/97 (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6664 NOTICE by plaintiffs of failure to timely provide payroll records & req for preclusion (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6663 NOTICE by plaintiffs of failure of depos purs Special Masters orders (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6662 NOTICE by plaintiffs of failure to pay sanctions ordered on 10/9/97 (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6661 DECLARATION of H ERNIE NISHII by plaintiffs (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6660 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to dfts' suppl memo of P&A in opp to 3rd 20 plfs' presentation of actual hours worked under the FLSA & liquidated damages due for late payment (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6659 NOTICE by plaintiffs of ldgng of depo transc (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6658 DECLARATION of STEVEN L RADER by plaintiffs (jag)
November 17, 1997 Filing 6657 REPLY by plaintiffs to dfts objections to report of Special Master re: striking dfs advice of cnsl defense; Decl of H Ernie Nishii (jag)
November 14, 1997 Filing 6656 DECLARATION of H ERNIE NISHII by plaintiffs in suppt of opp to ex parte applications [6655-1] (jag)
November 14, 1997 Filing 6655 OPPOSITION by plaintiffs to ex parte appl for protective ord [6590-1], to ex parte appl to cont various discov related matters, etc [6589-1], [6589-2], [6589-3] (jag)
November 13, 1997 Filing 6592 DECLARATION of H ERNIE NISHII by plaintiffs in suppt of reply to opp to mot to compel [6591-1] (jag)
November 13, 1997 Filing 6591 REPLY by plaintiffs to opp to motion to compel depo of Louis Ybarra [5954-1], motion to compel depo of Wray Hollemon [5951-1], motion to compel depo [5957-1], motion to compel production of docs, responses to interrogs [5709-1], motion to compel depos [5706-1], motion to compel fur prod of docs & resp to interrogs [5058-1] (jag)
November 13, 1997 LODGED/PROPOSED ORDER submitted by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams for exparte motion for protective order [6590-1] .(FWD TO CRD) (jag)
November 13, 1997 Filing 6590 EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams for protective order ; Decl of Edward B Reitkopp (jag)
November 13, 1997 LODGED/PROPOSED ORDER submitted by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams for exparte motion for 1 month stay of discov [6589-1], for exparte motion continuation of conference [6589-2], for exparte motion continuation of plfs' summ adj motion [6589-3] .(FWD TO CRD) (jag)
November 13, 1997 Filing 6589 EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams for 1 month stay of discov , continuation of conference , and continuation of plfs' summ adj motion ; Decl of Peter J Brown & Edward Reitkopp (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6654 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Derek Campbell joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6653 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Nadine Arango-Badgerow joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6652 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael Amado joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6651 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ernest NMI Allen joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6650 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Mary C Gomez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6649 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Stepanie Diaz joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6648 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Saul Diaz joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6647 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Otha B Davis joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6646 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jing Chao joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6645 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Juan C Campos joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6644 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kevin G Murphy joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6643 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kinard S Moffatt joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6642 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant William Meares joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6641 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jose A Leyba joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6640 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard Lorimer joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6639 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Randy J Lack joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6638 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daniel P Howard joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6637 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Melissa J Hornby joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6636 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Sergio V Hernandez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6635 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Karen Guillermo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6634 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Lisa M Seguin joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6633 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jesse J Sanchez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6632 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Philip James Ruiz joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6631 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steven B Ramirez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6630 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kim Peterson-Pope joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6629 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Victor Escobedo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6628 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Robert NMI Deamer joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6627 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jaime Chacon joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6626 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Gregory R Winslow joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6625 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Theodore Williams joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6624 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant John X Vach Jr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6623 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Vincent Taylor joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6622 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Thomas A Stiles joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6621 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Paul Stalker joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6620 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael Robert Solis joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6619 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Robert M Norman joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6618 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Barri Moore joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6617 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Linda M Lowande joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6616 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Christopher R Landry joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6615 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Christopher J Kunz joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6614 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James P Kelley joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6613 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard E Harper joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6612 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Harold J Hau joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6611 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Abraham Flores Jr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6610 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Garrett Fitzgerald joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6609 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Wallace W Wall joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6608 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Donald E Thompson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6607 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daniel Schmidt joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6606 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant John M Ray joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6605 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ronald James Orosco joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6541 AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs of addendum to plfs' req for ord to show cause re preclusion of advice of cnsl defense; served upon Robert Cramer, on 11/7/97, by mail (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6538 OPPOSITION by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams to motion for costs for the depo of councilmember John Ferraro [6086-1], motion request for sanctions [6086-2] (jag)
November 12, 1997 Filing 6537 NOTICE by plaintiffs of failure to timely file underlying docs for 1st group of 100 plfs & rq for ord for determination based upon plfs' presentation of data (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6604 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Louis Morgan Vince joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6603 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Robert Vargas joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6602 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michelle Johnson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6601 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steven E LaRoche joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6600 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Curtis Lawson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6599 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Glen Hornby joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6598 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Cindy Brining joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6597 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Lisa Governo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6596 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant E K Ellis joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6595 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Geoffrey Tavares joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6594 REPORT by special master Venetta S Tassopulos re plfs' req for ord to show cause re: preclusion of advise of cnsl defense (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6593 NOTICE by special master Venetta S Tassopulos of filing of report (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6588 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Charles G Roper joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6587 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Melchor J Vergara joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6586 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Mark W Reed joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6585 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard Munguia joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6584 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ana Finell joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6583 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard Lee Record joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6582 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Robert Pulley joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6581 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jesse Anthony Soltero joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6580 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Barbara Hodgin joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6579 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Thomas Eiman joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6578 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant John David Costa joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6577 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jimmie C Barlow joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6576 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James J Cerniglia joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6575 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Rita G Benefield joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6574 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant John P Morena joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6573 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant David Millan joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6572 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Heidi Llanes joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6571 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ernest T Matsumoto joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6570 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Theresa M Stanford joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6569 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Terry M Segraves joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6568 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Charles F Robinson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6567 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Arthur C Reich joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6566 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael A Porter joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6565 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Douglas Bowler joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6564 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Teresa L Anderson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6563 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael Arteaga joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6562 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Mike E Peters joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6561 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Garold W Newton II joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6560 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Theresa Yolanda Lopez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6559 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael H Linder joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6558 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Shawn R Wehr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6557 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Gregory Wells joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6556 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Earl H Wright joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6555 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James R Hays Jr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6554 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jose Yearwood joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6553 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Sheila Harris joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6552 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Weston Eugene Hadley joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6551 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Bradley David Kolfschoten joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6550 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Carl M Henderson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6549 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Frank Marquez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6548 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jesse Williams Jr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6547 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Joseph A Vege joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6546 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Brian C Mack joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6545 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Sam Layton joining complaint [1-1] (jag) Modified on 11/13/1997
November 10, 1997 Filing 6544 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard Thomas Blankenship joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6543 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Justin Bergmann joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6542 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ignacio Mendez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6540 STATEMENT of GENUINE ISSUES by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams in opp to stmt of undisputed facts (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6539 OPPOSITION by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams to motion for summary adjudication of applicable limitations period [6482-1]; Decl of Amerika Tagaloa (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6530 SUPPL MEMORANDUM by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams in opposition to 2nd 20 plfs' presentation of actual hours worked under the FLSA & liquidated damages due for late payment thereof; Decl of Robert Cramer (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6529 SUPPL MEMORANDUM by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams in opposition to 3rd 20 plfs' presentation of actual hours worked under the FLSA & liquidated damages due for late payment thereof; decl of Robert Cramer (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6528 MEMORANDUM by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams re the reasonableness of its police overtime accntg system; Decl of Amerika Tagaloa & Rose Hyland (jag)
November 10, 1997 Filing 6527 NOTICE by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams of change of time of hrg on dfts' mot for summ adj of the issues of the City's good faith & of the proper measure for calculation of any liquidated damages (jag)
November 7, 1997 Filing 6526 BRIEF by plaintiffs in suppt of req for OSC as to why dfts should not be precluded from assertion of "advice of cnsl" to justify or excuse their actns or alleged omissions (jag)
November 7, 1997 Filing 6525 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION of Counsel for defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams by attorney Peter Jay Brown, Brian Patrick Walter (jag)
November 7, 1997 Filing 6524 ADDENDUM by plaintiffs to req for OSC re: preclusion of advice of cnsl defense (jag)
November 6, 1997 Filing 6502 2nd SET OF SUPPL EXHIBITS to memo of P&A in opp to 4th 20 plfs' presentation of actual hours worked under the FLSA & liquidated damages due for late payment thereof (jag)
November 6, 1997 Filing 6501 REQUEST by plaintiffs for orders to show cause precluding dfts' assertion of advice of cnsl to justify or excuse their actns or alleged omissions (jag)
November 5, 1997 Filing 6523 DECLARATION of H ERNIE NISHII by plaintiffs in supp of plfs'mot to compel plfs' 9th req for production of docs to the dfts' City of LA (jag)
November 5, 1997 Filing 6522 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of motion to compel plfs' 9th req for production of docs to the dfts' City of LA [6521-1] (jag)
November 5, 1997 Filing 6521 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to compel plfs' 9th req for production of docs to the dfts' City of LA ; motion hearing set for 9:00 11/26/97; Req for sanctions (jag)
November 5, 1997 Filing 6485 OPPOSITION by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams to motion to compel depo of Louis Ybarra [5954-1], motion req for docs [5954-2], motion to compel depo of Wray Hollemon [5951-1], motion req for docs [5951-2], motion to compel depo [5957-1], motion req for docs of the City's official, that the city should have designated as the one who believed in good faith [5957-2], motion to compel production of docs, responses to interrogs [5709-1], motion to compel depos [5706-1], motion req of doc of Olivia John, Shirley Tan, Cleveland Haines & Fran Hickman [5706-2], motion to compel fur prod of docs & resp to interrogs [5058-1], motion to compel produc of docs [3881-1]; Decl of Brian P Walter (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6758 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Havley D Smith joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6536 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Eloise Jones joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6535 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Luis Jose Hernandez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6534 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant David T Grimes joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6533 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Paola Kreefft joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6532 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael C Lopez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6531 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Harold Hills joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6520 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Neal B May joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6519 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Tracy McClanahan joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6518 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ronny C Mosley joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6517 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James C Murawski joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6516 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kevin Erik Puebla joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6515 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Monica Quijano joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6514 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ronald E Rawson II joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6513 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Elizabeth Sandoval joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6512 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Money L Scott joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6511 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Gary W Stromlund joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6510 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Thomas R Toutant joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6509 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Robert A Trulik joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6508 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Dean P Watts joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6507 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant James A Kuklok joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6506 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Manuel Andujo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6505 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Shawn Anderson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6504 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Charlie Davis joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6503 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Patrick Ellis joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6500 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Siage Bruce Hosea joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6499 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Larry Jackson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6498 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Darryl Little joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6497 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ronald Moody joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6496 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Scott Padin joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6495 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard Spackman joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6494 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Mark Pursel joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6493 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant George Angulo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6492 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Joseph S Anzallo joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6491 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael H Brandt joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6490 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Edwin Dominguez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6489 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant John P Eum joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6488 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Lionel M Garcia Jr joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 4, 1997 Filing 6487 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Cynthia A Gonzales joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
November 3, 1997 Filing 6486 MEMORANDUM by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams in support of motion for summary adjudication of the issues of the City's good faith & of the proper measure for calculation of any liquidated damages [6480-1] (jag)
November 3, 1997 Filing 6484 NOTICE by plaintiffs of ldgng of depo transc of William R Moran (jag)
November 3, 1997 Filing 6483 DECLARATION of STEVEN L RADER by plaintiffs in suppt of plfs' mot for Summ Adj [6482-1], [6481-1] (jag)
November 3, 1997 Filing 6482 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs for summary adjudication of applicable limitations period ; motion hearing set for 9:30 11/24/97 (jag)
November 3, 1997 Filing 6481 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs for summary adjudication of applicable limitations period ; motion hearing set for 9:30 11/24/97 (jag)
November 3, 1997 Filing 6480 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Los Angeles City of, defendant Willie NMI Williams for summary adjudication of the issues of the City's good faith & of the proper measure for calculation of any liquidated damages ; motion hearing set for 10:00 12/8/97 (jag)
November 3, 1997 LODGED stmt of undisputed facts submitted by plaintiffs (FWD TO CRD) (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6479 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daniel J Riehl joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6478 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Les Wyeth joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6477 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Alfred P Corso joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6476 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steven D Cooper joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6475 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant John M Collard joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6474 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Danny Chao joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6473 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Matt Blake joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6472 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kenneth Wayne Baxter joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6471 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Douglas Dingman joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6470 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Robert A Kirk joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6469 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Isabel Valdovinos joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6468 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant William N Todd joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6467 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard D Swisher joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6466 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard Suviate joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6465 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daniel J Slater joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6464 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ronald J Sanchez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6463 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Mario Rios joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6462 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael H Rafter joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6461 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jeffri K Norat joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6460 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant George H Mejia joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6459 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Peter P Malanznik III joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6458 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Thayer Lake joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6457 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTIOn by movant Kenneth Lew joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6456 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Lusine Victoria Kroyan joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6455 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Charles NMI Johnson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6454 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Marla Kiley joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6453 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Rosalind Iians joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6452 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kathleen E Hardy joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6451 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Laura Gerritsen joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6450 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Loren Farrell joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6449 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant William C Driver joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6448 CoNsEnT tO jOiN aCtIoN by movant Gary Dubois joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6447 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jaime Cortes joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6446 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Richard NMI Henry joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6445 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Robert R Quesada joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6444 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Kevin NMI Scott joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6443 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael Snowden joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6442 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Paul Thurman joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6441 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Phillip A Walters joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6440 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Lin Hom joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6439 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Dominic F Boykin joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6438 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Gustavo Chacon joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6437 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jennifer Hickman joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6436 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Robert NMI Lee joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6435 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Jerry Padilla joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6434 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Sean M Karmody joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6433 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Edward Yee joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6403 EXHIBIT "A" to decl of H Ernie Nishii re the next 100 plgs (jag)
October 31, 1997 Filing 6402 DECLARATION of H ERNIE NISHII by plaintiffs re the next 100 plfs (jag)
October 30, 1997 Filing 6384 DECLARATION of H ERNIE HISHII by plaintiffs in suppt of plfs' mot to str dfs' ans, sanctions, & attys' fees & costs (jag)
October 30, 1997 Filing 6383 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of motion to strike dfts ans & enter a dflt agnst dfts [6382-1], of motion sanctions, atty's fees & costs [6382-2] (jag)
October 30, 1997 Filing 6382 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs to strike dfts ans & enter a dflt agnst dfts , sanctions, atty's fees & costs ; motion hearing set for 9:00 11/19/97 (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6385 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Albert V Abolos joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6359 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Michael J Marsolek joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6358 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Steven V Hillmann joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6357 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Leon W Washington joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6356 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Daniel Martin joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6355 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Belinda Robinson joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6354 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Sharon L Horan joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6353 CONSNENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Matthew M Stewart joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6352 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Maria H Cardenas joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6351 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Flor Rodriguez joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997 Filing 6350 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION by movant Ericka M Long joining complaint [1-1] (jag)
October 29, 1997