Angela Lockhart et al v. County of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Faustino Del Valle, Karen Mickle, Naomi Cabrera, David J. Roldan, David Haney, Donald F. Surber, Stan W Leach, Frank Carillo, Frank G Castro, Vince Edward Wilson, Felicia R. Price, Anthony L. Lubina, Edgar D Manalang, James C Bolander, Allen Makorow, Gregory Michael Schell, David J. Moser, Jeffrey Cross, John L. Rodriguez, James A Rodela, Michael Shapiro, Julie Valencia, Ernest T. Griffin, Jorge Ramirez, Brian A. Espinosa, Jose De La Cruz, Robert F. Galarneau, Patrick Gomez, Joshua C. Morris, Bruce V. Haar, Karen L Ruiz, Joel J. Petersen, Laura M. Teel, Randall Slate, Janelle Thompson, George Martinez, Michael Carnakis, Charlene Edwards, John O Houchens, Jr., Jarlath J. Dedario, Michael Forne, Alfredo Macias, Patricia L. Serpan, Lawrence E. Zimmerman, Orlando Atencio, Robert William Maas, Jack J. Keath, Jr., David Loomis, Jessica Triay, Samuel Taylor, Deborah D. Nava, Ty M. Sylvester, William Asplin, Thomas C. Wagner, David G Ramirez, Monty Buckallen, Michael Fields, Davy Todd Clark, Heidy Villasenor, George Prado, John Hudson, Makini M. Sims, Steven A. Stroble, Jr., Denise T. Steuer, Francisco E. Juarez, Daniel Nathan, James R. Goodrich, Jr., Robert Maas, Paul Kaser, Robert A Lopez, Lazaro Olmos, Seigen Roberts, Son Bui, Adriana Mejia, Eric C. Leibrich, Joseph Bernas, James Rodela, Sheryle Bird, Craig L Johnson, James T. Morrow, Linda Wills, Daniel L. Andrews, Tina McCoy, Arlene M Moore, Gary D. Laws, Neill M. Murchison, Martin Anthony Villa, Delbert Moore, David J. Lopez, Adriana Covell, Stephen Vaughan, Paul Greve, Wende Killian, Frank P. Cross, Gail Scorza, Cesar Ortega, David Gonzales, -, Scott L. Carter, Matthew W. Reichmann, Frank Matillo, Jr., Diana M Vanecek, Darren D Brown, Jeffrey A. Greene, Bill Chupinghong, Edward G. Everett, Darryl E. Bonsall, Angela Lockhart, Michael J. Westfall, Diane Leon, James Thomas Laman, Frank Deogracias, Chris Christopher, Delbert B Moore, Justin Serafin Martin, Theodore Knott, Eunice Auner, James Matsuoka, Leo Vasquez, Barbara Ann Connors, Nicholas Vallozzi, Anthony A. Pitillo, Manuel L Ruiz, Jr., Dale R. Johnson, Antonio Hernandez, Paul Lombardo, Debra Shelton-Love, Brandon Seibert, Robert Castillo, Jacob Gubran, Jorge Lopez, Frank Espinoza, Jr., Alfred P. Alvarez, Micheline Garfin, Roy L. Grayson, Brian Cunningham, Michael Melikidse, Glen Williams, Jesus Alvarez Lopez, Sean G. Levingston, Leobardo Trujillo, Rodolfo E. Barrios, Arthur Christopher Velasquez, Theodore R. Baljet, Arthur Cruz, Gregory Anton, Fred B. Keelin, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Annadennise Wollenzier, Richard S. Kennedy, Joyce L. Macheca, David Wesley Brown, Moses Checa, Mark Campbell, Joseph Esqueda, Kelly Simon, Jason J. Rivas, Shannon L. Endara, Lee Warren, Francine Villicana, Kevin House, Cynthia Kamalyan, Dick Miller, Richard Doray, Richard A. Stevenson, Eric Williams, John Apostol, Nancy McGauley, Dean Omura, Hiram Komoto, Robert M. Kinsey, Glyn Morgan, Grant Oberle, Bruce R. Yoell, Richard J. Orosco, Michael A Ruiz, James L McGuffin, Eduardo Salazar, Steven F. Hemner, Lawrence R. Martindale, Joseph M Koch, Gerardo Lucio, Mario Martinez, John Lopata, James J Delgado, Scott C. Mason, Eric R. Taylor, Floyd T. Caler, Frank Higuera, Larry A. Arellano, Timothy M McDermott, Jr., John A. Nemeth, James B. Dow, Lorraine Rocco, Kari Bandy, Casey J. McMichael, Darren Williams, Robin Ritter, Virginia Sanchez, Robert N. Carr, Ray Davidson, Alex Galindo, Rafael A. Valadez, Patricia Madrigal, Donald J. Fitzpatrick, Matthew Seier, Lee Yalowiec, Demetra Thomas, Michael Cerecedes, Bonnie Jones, Christopher Bronowime, Anthony Ponce, Edmund J. Anderson, Christopher A. Galassi, Ronald J. Greene, Tyler Maxwell, Joseph G. Gonzaque, Rochonne D. Rose, Yung-Hua Hsu and Frank W. McGuire
Defendant: County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca and Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Petitioner: Pierre B Nadeau
Interested Party: Michael Ascolese and Bruce Vallerand
Intervenor: ALADS
Case Number: 2:2007cv01680
Filed: March 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2014 Filing 712 JUDGMENT RE: APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Court has carefully reviewed the concurrently filed Stipulation Re Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice and the settlement agreement attached as Exhibit "A" to the Stipulation ("Settlement Agreement"). The Settlement Agreement, which is incorporated herein by reference, is approved as fair, reasonable and just in all aspects to Plaintiffs Patrick Gomez, Leobardo Trujillo and James Rodela and the Parties shall perform the Settlement Agreement in accordance with its terms. The Court expressly reserves jurisdiction with respect to this action for the purposes of enforcing the Settlement Agreement; and, This action is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jy)
June 4, 2014 Filing 711 STIPULATION for Settlement Agreement Approval and Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment Re: Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal With Prejudice)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER TO VACATE PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, re Stipulation to Vacate, #709 . Upon consideration of the Stipulation to Vacate the Trial and Pre-Trial Dates entered into between Plaintiffs PATRICK GOMEZ, LEOBARDO TRUJILLO AND JAMES RODELA and Defendants COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES and LEE BACA through their counsel of record, the Court orders all pre-trial and trial dates vacated. This order is without prejudice to a party requesting a re-setting of trial and pre-trial dates (with the exception of discovery cut-off dates) upon a showing of good cause. (ca)
February 21, 2014 Filing 709 STIPULATION to Vacate Trial and Pre-Trial Dates filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 4, 2014 Filing 708 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Judge George H. King: Counsel of record, plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo, along with the appropriate representatives are present. Court conducts settlement conference in chambers. Case has SETTLED in its entirety, subject to the approval of the appropriate entities. Terms and conditions of settlement placed on the record. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (kti)
February 3, 2014 Filing 707 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: Settlement Conference hearing RESET 2/4/2014 AT 10:00 AM before Chief Judge George H. King. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 706 MINUTES: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court conducts a in chambers Telephonic Status Conference with counsel for plaintiff only. Having heard from counsel, Court sets a IN-PERSON Settlement Conference on FEBRUARY 4, 2014AT 9:00A.M. Counsel responsible for the conduct and trial of the above action SHALL appear, along with plaintiff, defendant AND/OR an authorized presentative who has FULL authority to settle IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge George H. King Court Reporter: N/R. (ir)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 705 MINUTES: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: The above matter is on the Court's calendar for telephonic status conference. Court conducts conference with counsel for plaintiff only regarding settlement. Having heard from counsel, Court sets the above matter for Further Telephone Status Conference on January 21, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge George H. King Court Reporter: N/R. (ir)
December 4, 2013 Filing 704 MINUTES OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference held before Judge George H. King: Parties make their appearances. Court conducts settlement conference with the parties in chambers. Court sets a Telephonic Status Conference for January 6, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall contact the court clerk to confirm the date and time. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (shb)
December 2, 2013 Filing 703 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles of Defendants County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca's Confidential Settlement Statement. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 25, 2013 Filing 702 SCHEDULING NOTICE RE: Settlement Conference ADVANCED to 12/4/2013 09:00 AM before Chief Judge George H. King. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 701 AMENDED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE HEARING AND TRIAL DATES by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Having reviewed and considered the Joint Stipulation re Hearing and Trial Dates submitted by the parties, the Court hereby orders as follows: 1. Settlement Conference before the Hon. George H. King December 5,2013 at 9:00 a.m. 2. Motion In Limine Hearing/Pre-trial Conference March 4, 2014 at 12:00 p.m. 3. Trial April 22, 2014 at 9:00 a.m., #700 . IT IS SO ORDERED. (ca)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE HEARING AND TRIAL DATES by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, re Stipulation for Hearing, #697 . Having reviewed and considered the Joint Stipulation re Hearing and Trial Dates submitted by the parties, the Court hereby orders as follows: 1. Settlement Conference before the Hon. George H. King December 5, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. 2. Motion In Limine Hearing/Pre-trial Conference February 4, 2014 at 12:00 p.m. 3. Trial April 22, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (ca)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 699 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. King: Settlement Conference set for 12/5/2013 09:00 AM before Judge George H. King. (rne)
November 5, 2013 Filing 698 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re [Proposed] Order re Joint Stipulation re Hearing and Trial Dates re Stipulation for Hearing, #697 (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2013 Filing 697 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #696 filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Hearing and Trial Dates)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 695 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The following hearings set before Judge Audrey B. Collins, Final Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing set 10/07/2013 and the Jury Trial set 11/05/2013 are VACATED by Linda Williams Relief Courtroom Deputy. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 696 MINUTE ORDER RE: Defendants' Motion in Limine Nos. 1 through 7 (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: The parties have consented to have the magistrate judge preside over all future proceedings in the case. The parties are requested to meet and confer and agree to a date for a hearing on the motions in limine/pre-trial conference, settlement conference with Judge King and trial with Judge Walsh, #694 . (ca)
October 2, 2013 Filing 694 CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 12-01 is approved by Judge Audrey B. Collins and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. Case number will now read CV07-01680 PJW. (at)
September 26, 2013 Filing 693 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge re Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, #669 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Consent to Proceed Before A United States Magistrate Judge)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 19, 2013 Filing 692 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. Settlement conference held. Agreement is not reached at this time. Counsel agree to confer further and are directed to contact the court clerk to schedule additional settlement proceedings if it appears that continued discussion with the court could assist in resolution of this case. (gr)
September 16, 2013 Filing 691 DECLARATION re MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of Other FLSA Lawsuits and Grievances Filed Against The County of Los Angeles and/or Sheriff Lee Baca ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #683 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Reference To or Evidence of Claims Not in the Second Amended Complaint or That Have Already Been Dismissed ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #681 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of an Alleged "Unwritten Rule" Requiring Overtime Work Without Compensation ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #685 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of The FBI's Ongoing Investigation Into The Los Angeles County Jail System ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #687 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any and All Evidence Outside the Statute of Limitations ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #679 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Witnesses and Evidence Not Previously Disclosed ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof #677 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of Other Lawsuits, Grievances or Complaints Against the County or Sheriff Lee Baca That Are Unrelated to Plaintiffs' Overtime Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #689 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 690 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of Other Lawsuits, Grievances or Complaints Against the County or Sheriff Lee Baca That Are Unrelated to Plaintiffs' Overtime Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #689 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 689 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of Other Lawsuits, Grievances or Complaints Against the County or Sheriff Lee Baca That Are Unrelated to Plaintiffs' Overtime Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 688 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of The FBI's Ongoing Investigation Into The Los Angeles County Jail System ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #687 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 687 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of The FBI's Ongoing Investigation Into The Los Angeles County Jail System ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 686 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of an Alleged "Unwritten Rule" Requiring Overtime Work Without Compensation ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #685 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 685 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of an Alleged "Unwritten Rule" Requiring Overtime Work Without Compensation ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 684 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of Other FLSA Lawsuits and Grievances Filed Against The County of Los Angeles and/or Sheriff Lee Baca ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #683 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 683 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Any and All Evidence of Other FLSA Lawsuits and Grievances Filed Against The County of Los Angeles and/or Sheriff Lee Baca ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 682 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Reference To or Evidence of Claims Not in the Second Amended Complaint or That Have Already Been Dismissed ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #681 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 681 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Reference To or Evidence of Claims Not in the Second Amended Complaint or That Have Already Been Dismissed ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 680 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any and All Evidence Outside the Statute of Limitations ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #679 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 679 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any and All Evidence Outside the Statute of Limitations ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 678 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Witnesses and Evidence Not Previously Disclosed ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof #677 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 677 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Witnesses and Evidence Not Previously Disclosed ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 676 DECLARATION of Geoffrey S. Sheldon Re: Pre-Trial Documents filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 675 JOINT Exhibit List for Trial filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles.. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 674 Witness List filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles.. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2013 Filing 673 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 672 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pending before the Court are Defendant County of Los Angeles ("County") and Lee Baca's (collectively, "Defendants") Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication ("Motions," docket nos. 643, 649, and 653) filed on June 14, 2013. Plaintiffs Patrick Gomez ("Gomez"), Leobardo Trujillo ("Trujillo"), and James Rodela ("Rodela") filed Oppositions and the County filed Replies. The Court took the Motions under submission. Upon review of all the briefs, all of the evidence, the relevant cases, and the record, the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Motions, as follows. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the Motions as follows: GRANTS summary adjudication for Defendants as to Plaintiff Trujillo's claim for compensation for uninterrupted meal breaks. GRANTS summary adjudication for Defendants as to the partial overtime exemption set forth in 29 U.S.C. 207(k) ("7(k) exemption"), specifically, the Court finds that the County is entitled to the 7(k) exemption, that Plaintiffs are not alleging that Defendants failed to pay minimum wage, and that insofar as Plaintiffs now seek to pursue a "pure gap time" claim, such a claim not cognizable under the FLSA. The Motions are DENIED in all other respects. (see document for further details) (bm)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 671 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TAKING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court finds the County's three Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (docket nos. 643,649, and 653) appropriate for resolution without oral argument and therefore VACATES the hearing set for September 9, 2013. See Fed.R.Civ.P.78, Local Rule 7-15. Motions are now UNDER SUBMISSION. (bp)
July 31, 2013 Filing 670 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Agreement is not reached at this time. A continued settlement conference is scheduled for September 19, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. following hearing on Defendant's pending motions for summary judgment. (dt)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Joint Stipulation to Continue,,,,, #668 , NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. the Court hereby orders as follows: The current hearing date on Defendants' pending motions for summary judgment/partial summary judgment, the Final Pretrial Conference and the Trial Date be continued to the following: 1. MSJ Hearing Date September 9, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. 2. Final Pretrial Conference October 7, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. 3. Trial November 5, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. 4. All dates that flow from the Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates shall also be continued in accordance with the Local Rules and/or the Courts Civil Jury Trial Order (Dkt. No. 616). (MSJ Motion continued for hearing on 9/9/2013 at 10:00 AM; Final Pretrial Conference continued to 10/7/2013 at 10:00 AM; Jury Trial continued to 11/5/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.) (lw)
July 16, 2013 Filing 668 Joint STIPULATION to Continue MSJ Hearing Date, Final Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Date from August 19, 2013 (MSJ Hearing Date); August 12, 2013 (Final Pre-Trial Conference); and September 10, 2013 (Trial Date) to September 9, 2013 (MSJ Hearing Date); October 8, 2013 (Final Pre-Trial Conference); and November 5, 2013 (Trial Date) Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #667 , Order,, #616 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #649 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patrick Gomez's Claims #643 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #653 filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon In Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue MSJ Hearing Date, Final Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Date, #2 Proposed Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Continue MSJ Hearing Date, Final Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Date)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 667 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS CONTINUING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Due to calendar congestion, the Court hereby CONTINUES the hearings on the three pending Motions for Summary Judgment (docket nos. 643, 649, and 653) from July 15 and July 22 to MONDAY AUGUST 19, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (bm)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 666 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. This matter having been referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle for settlement conference by U.S. District Judge Audrey B. Collins, IT IS ORDERED that a settlement conference shall be held in the chambers of Judge Woehrle on July 31, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. Room 640, 6th Floor of the Roybal Courthouse, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA. The conference should be attended by persons with meaningful authority to negotiate and agree to a settlement of the case. The parties shall submit settlement conference statements directly to Judge Woehrles chambers not later than three (3) court days before the conference. These statements are to be exchanged with opposing counsel. The statements shall not be filed in the court record. #615 [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] (gr)
July 8, 2013 Filing 665 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Offered in Plaintiff James Rodela's Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #653 (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 8, 2013 Filing 664 REPLY In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #653 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon In Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 8, 2013 Filing 663 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Offered in Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #649 (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 8, 2013 Filing 662 REPLY In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #649 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 1, 2013 Filing 661 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Offered in Plaintiff Patrick Gomez' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patrick Gomez's Claims #643 or In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Patrick Gomez' Claims filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 1, 2013 Filing 660 REPLY In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patrick Gomez's Claims #643 or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Patrick Gomez' Claims filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon In Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Patrick Gomez' Claims)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 28, 2013 Filing 659 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #653 filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Gomez, James Rodela, Leobardo Trujillo. (Attachments: #1 Appendix PLAINTIFFS APPENDIX OF EVIDENTIARY SUPPORT RE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 Supplement PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF JAMES RODELA)(Thomas, Russell)
June 26, 2013 Filing 658 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #649 filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Gomez, James Rodela, Leobardo Trujillo. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF LEOBARDO TRUJILLO, #3 Appendix PLAINTIFFS APPENDIX OF EVIDENTIARY SUPPORT RE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Thomas, Russell)
June 17, 2013 Filing 657 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patrick Gomez's Claims #643 Filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Gomez and filed by Plaintiffs James Rodela, Leobardo Trujillo. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Opposition to Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Plaintiff Patrick Gomez)(Thomas, Russell)
June 14, 2013 Filing 656 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Order re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #653 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, For Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 14, 2013 Filing 655 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #653 filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 14, 2013 Filing 654 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #653 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, For Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 14, 2013 Filing 653 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff James Rodela's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (part 1 of 6), #2 Appendix (part 2 of 6), #3 Appendix (part 3 of 6), #4 Appendix (part 4 of 6), #5 Appendix (part 5 of 6), #6 Appendix (part 6 of 6))(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 14, 2013 Filing 652 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Order re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #649 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, For Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Claims)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 14, 2013 Filing 651 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #649 filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 14, 2013 Filing 650 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #649 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, For Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Claims)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 14, 2013 Filing 649 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo's Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (part 1 of 6), #2 Appendix (part 2 of 6), #3 Appendix (part 3 of 6), #4 Appendix (part 4 of 6), #5 Appendix (part 5 of 6), #6 Appendix (part 6 of 6))(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER ON EXPARTE APPLICATION OFPLAINTIFFS TO RESCHEDULE HEARING DATE - NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT - by Judge Audrey B. Collins: This matter is before this Court upon the Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for rescheduling of hearing date in connection with Defendants Motion for SummaryJudgment. Having considered the moving papers and the previous Orders of this Court, now IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs is granted; and ** -- Plaintiffs' Opposition is due filed by Monday, June 17,2013; -- Defendants' Reply is due filed by Monday, July 1, 2013; --- Hearing on the motion is continued to Monday, July 15, 2013 at 10:00 a.m.** re: #646 Ex Parte Application to Reschedule. Motion continued for hearing from 7/1/2013 to 7/15/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (lw)
June 10, 2013 Filing 647 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants on Patrick Gomez's Claims #646 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Geoff Sheldon)(Palagi, Jennifer)
June 7, 2013 Filing 646 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants on Patrick Gomez's Claims filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Gomez, James Rodela, Leobardo Trujillo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Russell)
June 4, 2013 Filing 645 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attachment 1: Request for Judicial Notice #644 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Requests-For Judicial Notice. Other error(s) with document(s): A Request for Judicial Notice should be e-filed as a separate stand-alone document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
June 3, 2013 Filing 644 Amendment to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patrick Gomez's Claims #643 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Palagi, Jennifer)
June 3, 2013 Filing 643 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patrick Gomez's Claims filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 7/1/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Notice of Lodging Uncontroverted facts, #7 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #8 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order, #9 Proposed ORder)(Palagi, Jennifer)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 642 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: denying #625 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part #639 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing. The Court vacates the currently scheduled May 21,2013 hearing date and hereby rules on the motion for sanctions without oral argument. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
May 9, 2013 Filing 641 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to 5/13/13 or sooner re: Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodel #639 filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Gomez, James Rodela, Leobardo Trujillo. (Thomas, Russell)
May 7, 2013 Filing 640 NOTICE OF LODGING [PROPOSED] ORDER re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to 5/13/13 or sooner re: Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodel #639 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 7, 2013 Filing 639 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to 5/13/13 or sooner re: Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodela (Documents 625 and 636) filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 2, 2013 Filing 638 DECLARATION of Russell J. Thomas, Jr. In Opposition To MOTION for Sanctions Terminating Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel The Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodela #625 filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Gomez, James Rodela, Leobardo Trujillo. (Thomas, Russell)
April 24, 2013 Filing 636 Amendment to MOTION for Sanctions Terminating Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel The Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodela #625 Amending Motion Hearing Date from May 7, 2013 to May 21, 2013 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 24, 2013 Filing 635 Pursuant to the rules of the Court all proposed orders to be sent to the Judge's generic e-mail box in word or word perfect format for processing. The Court has not received the proposed order for document 624 e-filed 4/19/13. Counsel to send for processing by A. Bridges, Court Clerk to Judge Audrey B. Collins THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS GAIL SCORZA, ANGELA LOCKHART, AND DELBERT MOORE WITH PREJUDICE [F.R.C.P. 41 (a)(2)] by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #624 : Having reviewed the Stipulation to Dismiss GAIL SCORZA, ANGELA LOCKHART, AND DELBERT MOORE with prejudice, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: GAIL SCORZA, ANGELA LOCKHART, AND DELBERT MOORE are dismissed with prejudice. (bm)
April 22, 2013 Filing 634 Amendment to MOTION for Sanctions Terminating Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel The Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodela #625 Amending Motion Hearing Date from May 6, 2013 to May 7, 2013 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER by Clerk of Court; The Hearing request pertaining to the Motion for Sanctions should be scheduled for a Tuesday. #631 (gr) (Main Document 633 replaced on 4/22/2013) (gr).
April 19, 2013 Filing 632 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document, #631 . The following error(s) was found: Request for Motion regarding Sanctions should be scheduled for a Tuesday. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gr)
April 19, 2013 Filing 631 NOTICE OF LODGING [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF JAMES RODELA, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JAMES RODELA re MOTION for Sanctions Terminating Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel The Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodela #625 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 19, 2013 Filing 630 OBJECTIONS to Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, #628 filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Gomez, James Rodela, Leobardo Trujillo. (Thomas, Russell)
April 19, 2013 Filing 628 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Sanctions Terminating Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel The Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodela #625 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 19, 2013 Filing 627 DECLARATION of Geoffrey S. Sheldon In Support of MOTION for Sanctions Terminating Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel The Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodela #625 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 19, 2013 Filing 626 DECLARATION of Elizabeth T. Arce In Support of MOTION for Sanctions Terminating Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel The Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodela #625 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 19, 2013 Filing 625 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Terminating Plaintiff James Rodela, or Alternatively, Defendants' Motion to Compel The Deposition of Plaintiff James Rodela filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 19, 2013 Filing 624 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Delbert B Moore, Delbert Moore, Gail Scorza filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Delbert Moore, Gail Scorza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Russell)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Joint Stipulation to Continue Non-Exerpt Discovery and Expert Discovery and Law and Motion Cut-off Dates #623 , Court hereby orders that the current non-expert discovery, expertdiscovery, and law and motion cut-off dates be continued to the following dates:1. Non-expert discovery cut-off date May 22, 2013; 2. Expert discovery cut-off date May 29, 2013; 3. Law and Motion cut-off date JUNE 14, 2013; 4. HEARING JULY 22, 2013 AT 10:00 A.M.; (NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT) (lw)
April 9, 2013 Filing 623 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to May 22, 2013 filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Palagi, Jennifer)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER REGARDING JOINDER OF LEOBARDO TRUJILLO, JAMES RODELA AND DELBERT MOORE AS PLAINTIFFS by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation for Joinder, #621 : Pursuant to the stipulation of the Parties filed on January 2013, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby orders: 1. Leobard Trujillo, James Rodela and Delbert Moore shall be joined as Plaintiffs in this lawsuit; 2. Defendants reserve the right to file motions including, but not limited to, motions for summary judgment as to each individual Plaintiffs claims and motions to sever to try their claims separately. (bm)
January 29, 2013 Filing 621 STIPULATION for Joinder in Notice (Other) #605 , Notice (Other) #596 , Notice (Other) #601 of Leobardo Trujillo, James Rodela and Delbert Moore as Plaintiffs filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arce, Elizabeth)
January 11, 2013 Filing 620 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gregory G Petersen counsel for Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. Filed by Plaintiff Gregory G. Petersen (Petersen, Gregory)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 619 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Audrey B. Collins denying #612 Motion to Strike: The Court finds the Motion appropriate for resolution without oral argument and therefore VACATES the hearing set for January 14, 2013. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78, Local Rule 7-15. For the following reasons, the Motion is DENIED. (see document for further details) If the parties cannot stipulate to the joinder of Trujillo, Rodela, and Moore, in order to expedite this matter and minimize prejudice to Defendants, the Court ORDERS that a Motion to Join Trujillo, Rodela, and Moore must be filed no later than Monday January 28, 2013, for hearing February 25, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. The sole purpose of the motion would be to seek the joinder of these three former plaintiffs. The statute of limitations is hereby FURTHER TOLLED only as to Trujillo, Rodela, and Moore through January 28, 2013 to allow the motion for joinder to be filed, or to allow Trujillo, Rodela, and Moore to file separate lawsuits. If a joinder motion is filed, the statute of limitations shall continue to be tolled until the motion is decided. This order does not further toll the statute of limitations as to any other former plaintiff or as to any other claims. (bm)
December 31, 2012 Filing 618 REPLY in support of MOTION to Strike Leobardo Trujillo, James Rodela and Delbert Moore's Notices of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff or, in the alternative, to Dismiss Them #612 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Arce, Elizabeth)
December 24, 2012 Filing 617 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Leobardo Trujillo, James Rodela and Delbert Moore's Notices of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff or, in the alternative, to Dismiss Them #612 filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Thomas, Russell)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 616 CIVIL JURY TRIAL ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The above matter is set for trial before the Honorable Audrey B. Collins, Courtroom 680, Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES: 1. The Court orders the following dates: a. Cut-off date for filing motions to join other parties or amend the pleadings is February 25, 2013. b. Discovery cut-off is April 22. 2013. c. Cut-off date for motions to be filed is Monday, May 13, 2013. d. Final Pretrial Conference is set for Monday, August 12, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. e. Trial is set for Tuesday, September 10, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Audrey B. Collins. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for Settlement Conference. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than June 24, 2013. (bm)
December 10, 2012 Filing 614 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Case called. Counsel makes appearances. Scheduling Conference held. The Court sets the following dates: Add Claims/Parties Cut-Off: February 25, 2013; Discovery Cut-Off: fact April 22, 2013, expert April 29, 2013, rebuttal May 13, 2013, expert discovery cut-off June 3, 2013; Law and Motion Cut-Off: May 13, 2013, opposition May 20, 2013, reply May 27, 2013; Hearing Date: June 17, 2013 at 10:00 a.m.; Final Pre Trial Conference: August 12, 2013 at 10:00 a.m., trial counsel to be present; Jury Trial: September 10, 2013 at 8:30 a.m, estimated 5 days. Counsel are reminded of the requirements of Local Rule 16-15. Court acknowledges parties have agreed upon ADR procedure no. 1, before the Magistrate Judge. Court signs Order/Referral to ADR Pilot Program in open Court. The ADR proceeding to be completed no later than June 24, 2013. Court and counsel discuss discovery issues, depositions, and opt in parties. Counsel ORDERED to meet and confer to resolve all matters at hand. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm)
December 7, 2012 Filing 613 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Strike Leobardo Trujillo, James Rodela and Delbert Moore's Notices of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff or, in the alternative, to Dismiss Them #612 filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. (Arce, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2012 Filing 612 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Leobardo Trujillo, James Rodela and Delbert Moore's Notices of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff or, in the alternative, to Dismiss Them filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce in support of Motion to Strike Leobardo Trujillo, James Rodela and Delbert Moore's Notices of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff or, in the alternative, to Dismiss Them)(Arce, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2012 Filing 611 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Joint Report Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(F) and Court Order Dated November 14, 2012 ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles.. (Arce, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 610 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SETTING RULE 26 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The deadline for class members to become party plaintiffs has expired. The Court has received a number of notices from individual plaintiffs declaring their intent to become party plaintiffs. A Rule 26 scheduling conference is necessary to move forward with the case. The Court therefore SETS a Rule 26 scheduling conference for Monday, December 10, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. The parties are to submit a Rule 26 Joint Report in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 and Local Rule 26-1. (bm)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #603 Request to Substitute Attorney. The Court hereby orders that the request of: Gail Scorza, Plaintiff, to substitute Russell J. Thomas, Jr., who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Gregory G. Petersen. (bm)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #604 Request to Substitute Attorney. The Court hereby orders that the request of: Angela Lockhart, Plaintiff, to substitute Russell J. Thomas, Jr., who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Gregory G. Petersen. (bm)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #602 Request to Substitute Attorney. The Court hereby orders that the request of: Patrick Gomez, Plaintiff, to substitute Russell J. Thomas, Jr., who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Gregory G. Peterson. (bm)
November 8, 2012 Filing 606 DECLARATION of Gregory P. Nelson SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Gregory P. Nelson Regarding Service of Notice of Court Order Decertifying the Collective Action and Dismissing All Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2012 Filing 605 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Delbert B Moore. (Thomas, Russell)
November 1, 2012 Filing 604 First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Russel J. Thomas in place of attorney Gregory G. Petersen and Gregory G. Petersen, A Law Corporation, et al filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
November 1, 2012 Filing 603 First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Russel J. Thomas, Jr. in place of attorney Gregory G. Petersen and Gregory G. Petersen, A Law Corporation, et al filed by Plaintiff Gail Scorza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
November 1, 2012 Filing 602 First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Russel J. Thomas, Jr. in place of attorney Gregory G. Petersen and Gregory G. Petersen, A Law Corporation, et al filed by Plaintiff Patrick Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
November 1, 2012 Filing 601 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff James A Rodela. (Thomas, Russell)
November 1, 2012 Filing 600 DECLARATION of Gregory P. Nelson re Declaration (non-motion) #595 Supplemental Declaration of Gregory P. Nelson Regarding Service of Notice of Court Order Decertifying the Collective Action and Dismissing All Opt-in Plaintiffs filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Arce, Elizabeth)
October 31, 2012 Filing 599 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Patrick Gomez. Related to Docket Entry No. 594 (Thomas, Russell)
October 31, 2012 Filing 598 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Thomas, Russell)
October 31, 2012 Filing 597 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Gail Scorza. (Thomas, Russell)
October 31, 2012 Filing 596 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo. (Thomas, Russell)
October 5, 2012 Filing 595 DECLARATION of Gregory P. Nelson Re Service of Notice of Court Order Decertifying the Collective Action and Dismissing All Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 594 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: NOTICE TO OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court has reviewed the parties proposed notices to the opt-in plaintiffs informing them that these cases have been decertified and advising them of their rights. The Court APPROVES the joint proposed notice for Ascolese (Exhibit A) and the County'sproposed notice for Lockhart (Exhibit B). To ensure that the dismissed plaintiffs have enough time to decide whether to pursue individual cases, the Court ORDERS that the plaintiffs shall have an additional month, until November 5, 2012, to file their own individual lawsuits. The parties are ORDERED to mail these notices as expeditiously as practicable. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 17, 2012 Filing 593 REPORT of Joint Report Regarding Dissemination of Notice to All Opt-In Plaintiffs of Decertification Order Pursuant to Court's Order Dated August 6, 2012 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Arce, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #574 Motion to Certify: Based on the foregoing, the Court finds that the opt-in Plaintiffs are not in fact similarly situated to the named Plaintiffs with regard to their off-the-clock claims. The Court therefore GRANTS Defendants Motion to Decertify Collective Action, and decertifies the action. The opt-in class members are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. At Plaintiffs' request, the named Plaintiffs are also DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court tolls the statute of limitations for 60 days from the date of this Order. During this time, Plaintiffs will have an opportunity to pursue their individual claims. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 6, 2012 Filing 591 MINUTES OF MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP RULE 41 (a)(2) DOCUMENT 188 (ED CV 08-1267); MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION DOCUMENT 193 (ED CV 08-1267/DOCUMENT 574 (CV 07-1680) Hearing held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Matter called. Tentative orders given to counsel. Court and counsel confer regarding tentative. Court hears oral arguments. The Court having heard from counsel, will maintain Court's tentative orders, altering wording in one of the tentative in open Court. Court and counsel discuss addresses for notification. Counsel ORDERED to meet and confer by no later than August 10, 2012 to discuss issues at hand. Joint report due August 17, 2012 to include how the notification will go out and who and when they will be sent out. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (bm)
July 25, 2012 Filing 590 Counsel hereby notified that the case number should be indicated as CV 07-1680 ABC (CWx); mandatory courtesy copies was received on document 589 e-filed by Geoffrey Sheldon, Esq. and the case read ED CV 07-1680 ABC (CWx) which is incorrect this is not a riverside case; please adhere to the rules and policy of the Court ensuring that the case number is correct on e-filed documents by A. Bridges, Court Clerk to Chief Judge Audrey B. Collins. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 23, 2012 Filing 589 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. correcting Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #588 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon In Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Decertify Collective Action (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 20, 2012 Filing 588 REPLY in support of MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #574 to Lockhart Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Decertify the Collective Action filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Evidence in support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Decertify Collective Action)(Arce, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2012 Filing 587 Counsel must adhere to the rules and procedures of the Court when submitting mandatory courtesy copies; you must include the PDF header at the top of the document which includes the case number, Judge's initials, date it was e-filed and the document number; the notice of electronic filing should be attached to the back of the document; these things were not included when we received document 568 e-filed by Gregory G. Peterson, Esq, the Court will accept the document; please adhere to the rules for future mandatory copies being delivered by A. Bridges, Court Clerk to Chief Judge Judge Audrey B. Collins THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 17, 2012 Filing 586 OPPOSITION In opposition to re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #574 filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Petersen, Gregory)
June 15, 2012 Filing 585 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Re: Case Status Per Magistrate's May 15, 2012 Order filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Yee, Theodore)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting #557 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: The Court finds thismatter appropriate for resolution without oral argument and VACATES the hearing set for June 18, 2012. See Local Rule 7-15. For the reasons set forth below, the Court GRANTS the Motion (see document for further details). Based on the foregoing, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' claim under the FLSA for compensation for time spent donning, doffing, maintaining and cleaning their uniforms and equipment is hereby DISMISSED. (bm)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 583 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins GRANTING #580 Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on Motions: Pending before the Court is the Lockhart Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue the Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Decertify (docket no. 574). Upon review of the Application and Defendants' Opposition, the Court finds good cause to continue the hearing. The hearing is hereby CONTINUED to Monday August 6, 2012, at 10:00 a.m.. To preserve Court and party resources, and to ensure all interrelated issued are considered together, the Court also hereby CONTINUES the hearings in Ascolese on Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss (docket no. 188) and Defendants' Motion to Decertify (docket no. 193) to the same day, Monday August 6, 2012. (bm)
June 11, 2012 Filing 582 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from July 2, 2012 10:00 a.m. to August 6, 2012 10:00 a.m. Re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #574 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from July 2, 2012 10:00 a.m. to August 6, 2012 10:00 a.m. Re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #574 #580 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application To Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion To Decertify)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 11, 2012 Filing 581 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information #579 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Notices-Change of Attorney Information (G-06). Other error(s) with document(s): Docket entry text does not match caption of attached document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
June 8, 2012 Filing 580 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from July 2, 2012 10:00 a.m. to August 6, 2012 10:00 a.m. Re: MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #574 filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen In Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Decertify, #2 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
June 8, 2012 Filing 579 NOTICE of Disassociation of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
June 4, 2012 Filing 578 EXHIBIT Part 4 of 4 to MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #574 Appendix of Evidence In Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 4, 2012 Filing 577 EXHIBIT Part 3 of 4 to MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #574 Appendix of Evidence In Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 4, 2012 Filing 576 EXHIBIT Part 2 of 4 to MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #574 Appendix of Evidence In Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 4, 2012 Filing 575 EXHIBIT Part 1 of 4 to MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action #574 Appendix of Evidence In Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 4, 2012 Filing 574 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Decertify Collective Action filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 7/2/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 573 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [DOCUMENTS 165/557] by Judge Audrey B. Collins: On the Court's own motion, the above matter, noticed for hearing on June 11, 2012 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby continued to June 18, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel to appear on new date and time specified. (bm)
May 29, 2012 Filing 572 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. correcting Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #567 (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 25, 2012 Filing 571 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims #557 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 25, 2012 Filing 570 REPLY Defendants' Response To Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact In Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims #557 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 25, 2012 Filing 569 REPLY Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes In Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims #557 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 25, 2012 Filing 568 Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence Filed; and Declaration of Gary G. Goyette in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re: MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims #557 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 25, 2012 Filing 567 REPLY MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims #557 Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon In Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Gregory P. Nelson In Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 21, 2012 Filing 566 JOINDER in MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims #557 to Ascolese Plaintiffs' (USDC Case No. 08-CV-1267) Opposition and Related Filings filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law; Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in Response to Defendant's Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law and In support of Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2012 Filing 565 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #563 Re Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 18, 2012 Filing 564 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims #557 filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Defendants Request for Judicial Notice in support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 18, 2012 Filing 563 Opposition in support of re: MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims #557 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to continue Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 17, 2012 Filing 562 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Joinder to Ex Parte Application to Plaintiffs in Related Case (Ascolese CV08-1267-Docket Nos. 170 & 171) for Stay of Defendant's Partial MSJ filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Joinder to Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs in Related Case (Ascolese-CV08-1267) to Stay Defendant's Partial MSJ)(Petersen, Gregory)
May 16, 2012 Filing 561 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Judicial Notice #559 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Requests-For Judicial Notice. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 560 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: granting #555 Ex Parte Application to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Discovery cut-off 8/30/2012.**SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
May 14, 2012 Filing 559 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims #557 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 14, 2012 Filing 558 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims #557 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 14, 2012 Filing 557 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Donning and Doffing Claims ( Motion set for hearing on 6/11/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.) filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Evidence in support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Re Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 8, 2012 Filing 556 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 8/30/2012 #555 filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
May 7, 2012 Filing 555 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 8/30/2012 filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in support of Defendans' Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending the Deposition Completion Deadline and, or in the alternative, Scheduling a Further Discovery Conference with the Court, Part 1, #2 Declaration Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon, Part 2, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 11, 2012 Filing 554 NOTICE disassociation of counsel filed by plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Barge, Rene)
February 15, 2012 Filing 553 DECLARATION of Ignacio Somoano Supplemental Declaration of Ignacio Somoano Regarding Service of Notice of Court Order to Ascolese and Lockhart Collective Action Members filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Arce, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2012 Filing 552 DECLARATION of Ignacio Somoano Regarding Service of Notice of Court Order to Ascolese and Lockhart Collective Action Members filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Arce, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, #550 . **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
January 4, 2012 Filing 550 Joint STIPULATION to Amend filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Revised Notice to Lockhart Collective Action Members Randomly Selected for Deposition)(Arce, Elizabeth)
December 29, 2011 Filing 549 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Rene L Barge counsel for Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. Filed by plaintiff Rene L. Barge (Barge, Rene)
December 28, 2011 Filing 548 NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING YOUR OBLIGATION TO BE DEPOSED. (lmh)
December 28, 2011 Filing 547 NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING YOUR OBLIGATION TO BE DEPOSED. (lmh)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Having reviewed the Joint Report filed by the Parties on December 23, 2011, the Court hereby orders: 1. The Court grants the Parties request to stay all discovery until January 31, 2012 pending settlement discussions. If additional time for this stay is needed to facilitate settlement discussions, the Parties may mutually request to the Court that the stay be continued until February 29, 2012, with the associated dates specified herein adjusted accordingly. If a settlement is not reached, then the Parties agree to meet and confer regarding the discovery after the expiration of the stay on January 31, 2012. re Notice of Lodging #545 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lmh)
December 23, 2011 Filing 545 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order Regarding Discovery re Order,,,, #542 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery)(Arce, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2011 Filing 544 Joint Status Report Pursuant to the Court's December 13, 2011 Order filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles re: Order,,,, #542 (Arce, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2011 Filing 543 NOTICE OF LODGING filed OF PROPOSED NOTICES REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' OBLIGATION TO BE DEPOSED re Order,,,, #542 (Attachments: #1 Lockhart - [Proposed] Notice of Court Order Regarding Your Obligation to be Deposed, #2 Ascolese - [Proposed] Notice of Court Order Regarding Your Obligation to be Deposed)(Arce, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Having reviewed the Joint Report filed by the parties on December 7, 2011, and after hearing oral argument from the parties regarding a proposed plan regarding discovery, the Court hereby orders: 1. Regarding the Lockhart case, counsel for the parties are to meet and confer over an alternate discovery plan. Following the meet and confer, counsel are to file a joint report with the Court regarding the plan on or before December 23, 2011. 2. Regarding the Ascolese case, the Court grants the parties request to stay the depositions of the 54 remaining representative sample plaintiffs until January 31, 2012 pending settlement discussions. If additional time for this stay is needed to facilitate settlement discussions, Defendants counsel and the Ascolese plaintiffs counsel may mutually request to the Court that the stay be continued until February 29, 2012, with the associated dates specified herein adjusted accordingly. If a settlement is not reached, Defendants shall have 90 days from the expiration of the stay to complete the depositions. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lmh)
December 12, 2011 Filing 540 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Hearing #539 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery)(Arce, Elizabeth)
December 8, 2011 Filing 541 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Telephonic discovery conference held. Court and counsel confer regarding status of case and of discovery in both actions. Based on rulings made on the record, counsel for Defendants is to submit a proposed order regarding further discovery proceedings. Court Recorder: CS 12-8-11. (lmh)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 539 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle:, ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle Set hearings( Discovery Hearing set for 12/9/2011 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle.)**SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
December 7, 2011 Filing 538 STATUS REPORT [Joint] Pursuant to Court's November 8, 2011 Order filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Arce, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 536 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, The call-in information for the telephonic discovery conference scheduled to take place on Thursday, December 8, 2011 at 2:00 p.m., is listed below: Call-in Number: 213-894-0800, Meeting ID: 7002#, User Password: 0357#. If you have any problems connecting to this call, please contact Donna Thomas at 213-894-6825. (lmh)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re #534 . Plaintiff David Loomis is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter with prejudice. (ir)
November 9, 2011 Filing 534 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff David Loomis filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Stipulation of Dismissal for David Loomis)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 8, 2011 Filing 535 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Telephonic discovery conference held. Court and counsel confer regarding status and scheduling of representative depositions. A further telephonic conference is set for December 8, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. The court clerk will provide call-in information for the conference. Counsel are to meet and confer in advance of the conference and are to file a joint status report on or before December 7, 2011. Court Recorder: CS 11-8-11. (lmh)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 533 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Due to calendar conflicts, the telephonic discovery conference continued to November 1, 2011 is now moved and scheduled to take place on Tuesday, november 8, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 532 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, The telephonic discovery conference scheduled for October 26, 2011 is continued and now scheduled to take place on Tuesday, November 1, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. The call-in information for the telephonic conference is listed below: Call-in Number: 213-894-0800, Meeting ID: 7002#, User Password: 7615#. If you have any problems connecting to this call, please contact Donna Thomas at 213-894-6825. (lmh)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 531 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Counsel are notified of the call-in-information for the Telephonic Conference scheduled to take place on Wednesday, October 26, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. The call-in information for the hearing is listed below: Call-in Number: 213-894-0800, Meeting ID: 7002#, User Password: 6123#. If you have any problems connecting to this call, please contact Donna Thomas at 213-894-6825. (lmh)
September 27, 2011 Filing 530 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Telephonic Discovery Conference held. Court and counsel confer regarding scheduling of representative depositions. A further telephonic discovery conference is set for Wednesday, October 26, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. Court Recorder: CS 9-27-11. (lmh)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: The call-in information for the 9/27/11 telephonic conference is attahched. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
August 30, 2011 Filing 528 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Telephonic discovery conference held. Court and counsel confer regarding scheduling of representative depositions. A further telephonic discovery conference is set for September 27, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. Court Recorder: CS 8-30-11. (lmh)
August 1, 2011 Filing 527 NOTICE of Unavailabilty of Counsel filed by plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Barge, Rene)
July 14, 2011 Filing 526 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Katherine J Odenbreit attorney for Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. Changing firm name to BARGE, PETERSEN & ODENBREIT, LLP and address to 18301 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 330, Irvine, CA 92612. Filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
July 6, 2011 Filing 525 MINUTES OF Telephone Discovery Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Discovery conference held. A further telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for Tuesday, August 30, 2011 at 2:00 p.m.. The call-in information is listed below: Call-in Number: 213-894-0800, Meeting ID: 7002#, User Password: 7160#. If you have any problems connecting to this call, please contact Donna Thomas at 213-894-6825. Court Recorder: CS 7-6-11. (lmh)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, The Court having reviewed the parties Stipulation re Cut-Off Date for Completing Sixty (60) Plaintiffs Depositions, and good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Defendants shall have until December 31, 2011, to complete the depositions of sixty (60) Plaintiffs identified in the Courts May 26, 2011 Order. This Order is without prejudice to the parties requesting more time to complete these depositions upon a showing of good cause. re Stipulation for Order, #523 (lmh)
June 28, 2011 Filing 523 Joint STIPULATION for Order Setting Cut-Off Date for Completing Sixty (60) Plaintiffs' Depositions filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation re Cut-Off Date for Completing Sixty (60) Plaintiffs' Depositions)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 522 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Counsel are notified that the telephonic discovery conference scheduled for June 27, 2011 is continued and now scheduled for Wednesday, July 6, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. The call-in information is listed below: Call-in Number: 213-894-0800, Meeting ID: 7002#, User Password: 6420#. If you have any problems connecting to this call, please contact Donna Thomas at 213-894-6825. (lmh)
May 26, 2011 Filing 521 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Discovery conference held telephonically. Court and counsel confer regarding status of discovery. A further telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for June 27, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. The call-in information is listed below: Call-in Number: 213-894-0800, Meeting ID: 7002#, User Password: 2222#. If you have any problems connecting to this call, please contact Donna Thomas at 213-894-6825. Court Recorder: CS 5-26-11. (lmh)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 520 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Pursuant to the Order re: Depositions of Plaintiffs and Random Sampling, the names of the plaintiffs selected for deposition and the names of the alternate deponents from each category are contained are as follows. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lmh)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 519 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Parties are notified that the status conference scheduled for Thursday, May 26, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. is now set to take place telephonically before the Honorable Carla M. Woehrle. The call-in information is listed below: Call-in Number: 213-894-0800, Meeting ID: 1112#, User Password: 5632#. If you have any problems connecting to this call, please contact Donna Thomas at 213-894-6825. (lmh)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 518 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Parties are notified that the status conference scheduled for Friday, May 13, 2011 is continued and now scheduled to take place on Thursday, May 26, 2011 at 2:00 pm, in courtroom 640 of the Roybal Courthouse before the Honorable Carla M. Woehrle. (lmh)
April 8, 2011 Filing 517 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. (Arce, Elizabeth)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Having reviewed the Joint Report filed by the parties on January 24, 2011 and after hearing oral argument from the parties regarding a proposed plan and for representative sampling discovery of collective action members, the Court hereby orders: 1. Discovery of the collective action plaintiffs shall be conducted using a representative sample to be selected from a combined pool of Ascolese and Lockhart Plaintiffs. 2. Defendants shall depose a total of 60 Plaintiffs. These Plaintiffs shall consist of 15 Plaintiffs from each of the following categories of deputy job duties to be randomly selected by the Court: (1) patrol; (2) court services; (3) custody; and (4) other. Defendants shall complete the depositions of the randomly selected Plaintiffs by July 8, 2011. The depositions shall be taken in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 30(d)(1) and shall not otherwise be limited in scope. re Notice (Other), Notice (Other) #514 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lmh)
March 14, 2011 Filing 514 NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Order Regarding Depositions of Plaintiffs and Random Sampling filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Depositions of Plaintiffs and Random Sampling)(Arce, Elizabeth)
March 7, 2011 Filing 516 MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Discovery conference held. Court makes rulings regarding procedures for random sampling discovery. Counsel to submit proposed order, agreed as to form. A further discovery conference is scheduled for May 13, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. Court Recorder: CS 3-7-11. (lmh)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Parties are notified that the discovery conference scheduled for Monday, February 28, 2011 is continued and now scheduled to take place on Monday, March 7, 2011 at 2:00 pm, in courtroom 640 of the Roybal Courthouse before the Honorable Carla M. Woehrle. (lmh)
February 22, 2011 Filing 512 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Court Approved Notification of Conditionally Certified Collective Action Claims re Order, #510 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Court Approved Notification of Conditionally Certified Collective Action Claims)(Gibbons, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2011 Filing 511 NOTICE filed by Interested Party Michael Ascolese. Filing of Proposed Court Approved Notification of Conditionally Certified Collective Action Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Approved Notification of Conditionally Certified Collective Action Claims)(Gibbons, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF OFF-THE-CLOCK CLAIMS FOR COLLECTIVE ACTION PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Based on the foregoing, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' 216(b) Motion and conditionally certifies the proposed collective action for purposes of notifying proposed class members of the pendency of the suit. (see document for further details) (bm)
February 7, 2011 Filing 509 MINUTES OF MOTION BY PLAINTIFFS' TO CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY THE CLASS FOR OFF-THE-CLOCK CLAIMS UNDER 29 USC 216(b) DOCUMENT #90 held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Matter called. Tentative given to counsel. Court and plaintiff's counsel confer regarding tentative. Plaintiffs counsel submit to tentative ruling. The Court having heard from counsel, will maintain tentative. The Court signs tentative order in open Court, which reflects the ruling of the above motion. The Court dismisses the claim with respect to compensatory time off in open Court. Court and counsel confer regarding notification of claims. The Court having heard from counsel, orders plaintiff counsel to notify the Court Clerk regarding notification by the end of business day. Counsel for plaintiff to e-file official notification to the Court by no later than February 14, 2011. Any opposition to notice will be due no later than February 17, 2011. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm)
February 1, 2011 Filing 508 NOTICE of Continuance of Status Conference,, #506 reset to 2/28/2011 at 2:00 p.m. (Barge, Rene)
January 24, 2011 Filing 507 JOINT STATUS REPORT of PURSUANT TO COURT'S JANUARY 5, 2011 ORDER filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Arce, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 506 MINUTES: CONTINUED JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE: Case called and counsel present. Also appearing telephonically is counsel John McCaslin. Court and counsel confer regarding status of case. Court and counsel confer. Plaintiffs Michael Ascolese Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Robert Connor, Abel Jimenez, Neal Levang, Frank Rothe, Matt Taylor and Motion to Certify the Class remains set for hearing on February 7, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. The Court is informed of the discovery hearing held before Magistrate Judge Woehrle on January 5, 2011 and the next scheduled date for the continued discovery hearing will be January 25,2011 with joint report due January 24, 2011 IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (ir)
January 5, 2011 Filing 505 MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Discovery conference held. After discussion with counsel as to discovery status, court orders that counsel meet and confer regarding a proposed plan and procedures for representative sampling discovery of class members. A further discovery conference is scheduled for January 25, 2011, at 1:00 p.m. By January 24, 2011, counsel are to file with the court a joint report regarding the meet and confer. Court Recorder: CS 1-5-11. (lmh)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins: denying #490 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Based on the foregoing, the Court hereby DENIES Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (see document for further details). (bm)
December 23, 2010 Filing 503 REPLY in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) #490 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Objection to Declaration of Rene L. Barge in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes and Additional Material Facts and Evidence in Support of their Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Arce, Elizabeth)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Parties are notified that due to scheduling conflicts, the discovery conference scheduled for Thursday, December 16, 2010 is continued and now scheduled to take place on Wednesday, January 5, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., in courtroom 640 of the Roybal Courthouse before the Honorable Carla M. Woehrle. (lmh)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, WHEREAS, on December 1, 2010, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle held a status conference in the above-referenced related actions and, having reviewed the Joint Statement filed by the parties and hearing oral argument regarding coordination of discovery for these related actions, and finding good cause therefore, HEREBY ORDERS: 1. That plaintiffs counsel in the Lockhart and Ascolese actions be added on the proof of service for all discovery matters for each case, including but not limited to Requests for Production of Documents, Requests for Admissions, Special and Form Interrogatories, and Deposition Notices, whether served by defendants or plaintiffs, and including all responses thereto, copies of all documents produced by defendant in response to document requests (excluding any plaintiff-specific documents, such as those contained in the personnel files of any plaintiffs in either case and payroll records of plaintiffs in either case and interrogatory responses that would reveal information contained in such documents). re: Notice (Other) #499 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lmh)
December 13, 2010 Filing 500 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) #490 filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Barge in Support of Plaintiff Lockharts' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes and Additional Material Facts and Evidence in Support of their Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Plaintiffs' Objections to Evidence Submitted By Defendants in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Barge, Rene)
December 9, 2010 Filing 499 NOTICE DECLARATION OF RENE L. BARGE FOR SUBMISSION OF [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DISCOVERY IN RELATED CASES filed by PLAINTIFF Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Coordination of Discovery in Related Cases)(Barge, Rene)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 498 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Parties are notified that the start time for the December 16, 2010 discovery conference, scheduled to start at 3:00 pm, is changed and now set to start at 1:00 pm, in courtroom 640 of the Roybal Courthouse before the Honorable Carla M. Woehrle. (lmh)
December 1, 2010 Filing 497 MINUTES OF Discovery Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Discovery conference held in above referenced case and in related case No. EDCV08-1267. Court and counsel confer regarding status of pending discovery, motions and proposals for coordination of discovery. Court makes rulings regarding coordination and pending discovery responses as stated on record; counsel for Plaintiffs to prepare a proposed order. A continued conference is scheduled for December 16, 2010, at 3:00 p.m. Court Recorder: CS 12-1-10. (lmh)
November 30, 2010 Filing 495 STATEMENT Joint Statement re Discovery Plan for Related Cases filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Barge, Rene)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Continue #493 : Having considered all the papers submitted by the parties in connection with the parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Court hereby orders as follows: 1) The hearing on Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment, presently set for December 20, 2010, at 10:00 a.m., will be continued to January 10, 2011 at 10:00 a.m.; 2) Plaintiffs' opposition papers shall be filed and served on or before December 13, 2010, rather than the time limits prescribed in Local Rule 7-9; and 3) Defendants' reply papers shall be filed and served on December 27, 2010. (bm)
November 24, 2010 Filing 493 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Motion for Partial Summary Judgment from December 20, 2010 to January 10, 2011 Re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) #490 filed by Defendants Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 18, 2010 Filing 492 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) #490 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 18, 2010 Filing 491 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) #490 filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 18, 2010 Filing 490 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' donning and doffing claims and Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense regarding Partial Overtime Ememption Under 29 U.S.C. 207(k) filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Lee Baca(individually), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 12/20/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lieutenant Gregory P. Nelson, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #3 Compendium of California Authorities, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 17, 2010 Filing 496 MINUTES OF Discovery Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Discovery conference held in above referenced case and in related case No. EDCV08-1267. Court and counsel confer regarding status of pending discovery. Counsel are directed to meet and confer further. A continued conference is scheduled for December 1, 2010, at 3:00 p.m. By noon on November 30, 2010, counsel are to file a joint report regarding a proposal for coordination of discovery in the related actions. Court Recorder: CS 11-17-10. (lmh)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Parties are notified that a discovery conference is scheduled to take place on Wednesday, November 17, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 640 of the Roybal Courthouse before the Honorable Carla M. Woehrle. (lmh)
November 2, 2010 Filing 487 MINUTES OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Matter called. Court and counsel confer regarding status of case. The Court having heard from counsel, vacates pretrial and trial dates previously set in the above cases. Court and counsel discuss discovery. The Court hereby ORDERS counsel for both cases to Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle with respect to discovery issues. Counsel to contact Court clerk to Magistrate Judge Woehrle to retrieve a date. Counsel reports to the Court that settlement will be explored. Oral request for extension of time for expert discovery, presented to the Court by counsel for ED CV 08-1267. The Court GRANTS extension of time to January 10, 2011. Court and counsel discuss motion for summary judgment. Court acknowledges from counsel that a motion for partial summary judgment will be brought forth to the Court. The Court ORDERS counsel of ED CV 08-1267, to e-file order of dismissal for parties that will opting out of case no later than November 16, 2010. The Court continues the further status conference to January 10, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., counsel ordered to appear on date and time specified.. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm)
November 1, 2010 Filing 489 AMENDED MINUTES #487 : FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE: Matter called. Court and counsel confer regarding status of case. The Court having heard from counsel, vacates pretrial and trial dates previously set in the above cases. Court and counsel discuss discovery. The Court hereby ORDERS counsel for both cases to Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle with respect to discovery issues. Counsel to contact Court clerk to Magistrate Judge Woehrle to retrieve a date. Counsel reports to the Court that settlement will be explored. Oral request for extension of time for expert discovery, presented to the Court by counsel for ED CV 08-1267. The Court GRANTS extension of time to January 10, 2011. Court and counsel discuss motion for summary judgment. Court acknowledges from counsel that a motion for partial summary judgment will be brought forth tothe Court. The Court ORDERS counsel of ED CV 08-1267, to e-file order of dismissal for parties that will opting out of case no later than November 16, 2010. The Court continues the further status conference to January 10, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., counsel ordered to appear on date and time specified IT IS SO ORDERED Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
October 26, 2010 Filing 486 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) PURSUANT TO COURT'S JULY 26, 2010 ORDER filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Audrey B. Collins, This action is dismissed without prejudice as to Plaintiffs Paul and Cynthia Lombardo. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that judgment be entered dismissing this action, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the orders of this court. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lmh)
July 26, 2010 Filing 484 MINUTES OF Joint Status Conference held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Status Conference set for 11/1/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.The Court hereby sets a Further Joint Status Conference in both cases for November 1, 2010 at 10:00 am. A Joint Status Report is due October 26, 2010 with mandatory chambers copies to be delivered directly to chambers.IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: katherine stride. (yl)
July 20, 2010 Filing 483 STATUS REPORT (Joint) Pursuant to Court's June 21, 2010 Order filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 13, 2010 Filing 482 JOINT STATUS REPORT REPORT filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Arce, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2010 Filing 481 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff John O Houchens, Jr (Petersen, Gregory)
June 30, 2010 Filing 480 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action re: Craig Johnson filed by Plaintiff Craig L Johnson (Petersen, Gregory)
June 30, 2010 Filing 479 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action re Mark Campbell filed by Plaintiff Mark Campbell (Petersen, Gregory)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Defendants motion to compel is granted in part and denied in part as follows: The court finds that Defendants are not entitled to propound the instant individualized written discovery requests to all of the opt-in plaintiffs in this collective action; rather, discovery from the opt-in plaintiffs at this time is properly limited to a reasonable and representative sample. This appears to be the better view in light of the purposes of the FLSA collective action provision, as well as concerns of fairness and economy. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) #417 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories; #417 Motion to Produce; #424 Supplemental Motion to Joint Stipulation; #433 Ex Parte Application to Strike (lmh) Modified on 7/15/2010 (lmh).
June 21, 2010 Filing 477 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERECE held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Cases called. Counsel states appearances on the record. Court discuss future order that will be issued by the Magistrate Judge in ED CV 08-1267. Court and counsel confer regarding the status of both cases. The STAY is hereby lifted as to ED CV 08-1267. Court acknowledges all paper work received in both cases. Upon the request of counsel to have separate hearings on both cases is hereby DENIED. Court explains the logistics as to the denial in open Court. Counsel ORDERED to meet and confer with respect to settlement and future dates. Joint report to be e-filed in both cases by no later than July 20, 2010. The Court hereby sets a further status conference for both cases to be heard July 26, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Court and counsel will discuss case management issues at next hearing. Court discusses the motion to certify class action e-filed in ED CV 08-1267 on February 4, 2009 (Document#33). The Court having considered the above pending motion hereby STRIKES the motion due to the time frame that the motion was e-filed. The Court will allow counsel to bring forth a new motion for class certification. The motion to be e-filed by no later than July 12, 2010, opposition due July 26, 2010, the reply is due August 2, 2010. The hearing to be set for August 23, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel reminded that pursuant to the rules of the Court the motion should be e-filed 28 days before the motion hearing date. Court and counsel confer regarding the number of opt-in and outs as listed in the joint report. The Court having heard from counsel, ORDERS counsel to meet and confer to determine the correct numbers. Counsel further ordered to bring all disclosures within 30 days from the date of this order. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm)
June 15, 2010 Filing 476 STATUS REPORT JOINT-PURSUANT TO COURT'S 3/29/10 ORDER filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Odenbreit Dec in Support of Plaintiffs Portion Joint Statement)(Odenbreit, Katherine)
May 21, 2010 Filing 475 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Edmund J. Anderson (Petersen, Gregory)
May 21, 2010 Filing 474 Consent to Join Action (re: Ty M. Sylvester) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
May 21, 2010 Filing 473 Consent to Join Action (re: Daniel L. Andrews) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
May 19, 2010 Filing 472 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Movant Pierre B Nadeau (Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2010 Filing 470 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff David J. Moser (Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2010 Filing 469 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Darryl E. Bonsall (Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2010 Filing 468 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Form Opting out re Plaintiff Daryl E. Bonsall #466 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Docket entry text indicates that another named plaintiff (David J. Moser), is opting-out. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 18, 2010 Filing 467 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Anthony Ponce (Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2010 Filing 466 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff David J. Moser (Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2010 Filing 465 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff David G Ramirez (Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2010 Filing 464 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Gregory Anton (Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2010 Filing 463 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff John Lopata (Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2010 Filing 462 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Randall Slate (Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2010 Filing 461 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Ronald J. Greene (Petersen, Gregory)
May 18, 2010 Filing 460 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Son Bui (Petersen, Gregory)
May 10, 2010 Filing 458 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Davy Todd Clark (Petersen, Gregory)
May 10, 2010 Filing 457 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Bruce R. Yoell (Petersen, Gregory)
May 10, 2010 Filing 456 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Donald J. Fitzpatrick (Petersen, Gregory)
May 10, 2010 Filing 455 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Arthur Cruz (Petersen, Gregory)
May 10, 2010 Filing 454 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Barbara Ann Connors (Petersen, Gregory)
May 10, 2010 Filing 453 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Anthony A. Pitillo (Petersen, Gregory)
May 10, 2010 Filing 452 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Adriana Covell (Petersen, Gregory)
May 10, 2010 Filing 451 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Gary D. Laws (Petersen, Gregory)
May 10, 2010 Filing 450 Form Opting-Out of Lockhart Certified FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Timothy M McDermott, Jr (Petersen, Gregory)
April 15, 2010 Filing 449 MINUTES of Judge Audrey B. Collins: ORDER RE: NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS (In Chambers): On March 29, 2010, the Court ordered that Plaintiffs counsel in these two cases meet and confer on notices to be sent to those Plaintiffs with overlapping claims in both cases. (March 29, 2010 Order (Docket #444).) Plaintiffs counsel was unable to come to an agreement on a notice, and submitted competing proposals. Having reviewed the proposals, the Court hereby approves the attached notice, as well as the attached opt-out forms. As mentioned in the notice, Plaintiffs will have until June 1, 2010 to mail the opt-out forms should they wish to be withdrawn from either or both cases. Plaintiffs counsel SHALL contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk within 3 days to make arrangements to obtain court-stamped envelopes in which the notices will be sent (See document for further details) (ir)
April 8, 2010 Filing 448 DECLARATION re Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, #444 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon Re: Completion of Mailing Letters to 15 Lockhart Plaintiffs Pursuant to Court's March 29, 2010 Order filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Palagi, Jennifer)
April 5, 2010 Filing 447 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Lockhart Plaintiffs re Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, #444 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Odenbreit)(Odenbreit, Katherine)
April 5, 2010 Filing 446 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Ascolese Plaintiffs' re Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, #444 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Notice to the Dual Opt-In Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit Proposed Withdrawal of Consent to Opt-In to Collective FLSA Action)(Gibbons, Elizabeth)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MINUTES: STATUS CONFERENCE: The case is called and counsel present. Also present are Plaintiffs counsel in case CV 08-1267 Association for Los Angeles Deputy Sheriffs, et al -vs- County of Los Angeles, et al. The Court andPlaintiffs counsel Mr. Peterson and Odenbreit confer regarding Mandatory chambers copies not provided to the Court as previously ordered. The Court discharges its Order to Show Cause issued March 25, 2010 (doc. # 440). The Court and counsel confer regarding the Courts Tentative Order regarding Case Management. The Court hereby sets a Further Joint Status Conference in both cases for June 21, 2010 at 10:00 am. A Joint Status Report is due June 15, 2010 with mandatory chambers copies to be delivered directly to chambers.The Court has issued a further order regarding the details and deadlines of todays discussion IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (ir)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER RE; CASE MANAGEMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins, (PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) The parties appeared before the Court at a status conference to discuss case management issues. Plaintiffs' counsel from Lockhart and Ascolese are ORDERED to meet and confer and no later than April 5, 2010 to submit either a joint proposed notice to be sent to these Plaintiffs or their own proposed notices. The Plaintiffs shall have 40 days to respond once the Court has approved a notice and it has been sent out. Court hereby discharges the 3/23/10 and 3/25/10 orders to show case. (Docs # 438, 440). The Court accepts the completed signature pages now provided for Eunice Auner, Brian Cunningham, Paul Kaser, Mario Martinez and Heidy Villasenor. The Court hereby sets a further Status Conference for 6/21/2010 at 10:00 a.m.. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 6/15/2010.re Minutes of In Chambers Order #440 , Minutes of In Chambers Order #438 , Response #439 , Minutes of In Chambers Order #420 (lw)
March 26, 2010 Filing 443 DECLARATION of Jennifer K. Palagi re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, #440 , Response (non-motion), Response (non-motion) #441 [in reply to plaintiffs' response] filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Palagi, Jennifer)
March 26, 2010 Filing 442 Notice of Filing of Declarations From Ascolese / Lockhart Dual Opt In Plaintiffs (Gibbons, Elizabeth)
March 26, 2010 Filing 441 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhartto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, #440 to Further OSC Re: Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Petersen in Support of Response to Court's OSC Re Sanctions, #2 Declaration of Katherine J Odenbreit In Response to Court's OSC Re Sanctions, #3 Declaration of Jeffrey Leonard In Support of Response to Court's OSC Re Sanctions)(Petersen, Gregory)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MINUTES: FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (In Chambers); Gregory Petersen is further ORDERED to show cause in writing no later than March 26, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. why he should not be sanctioned personally in an amount up to $1000. Mandatory chambers copies of that response shall be submitted no later than March 26, 2010at 4:00 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collin. (ir)
March 24, 2010 Filing 439 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhartto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set Deadlines,,,,,, #438 Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Supplement Consent to Join Action (Eunice Auner), #2 Supplement Consent to Join Action (Brian Cunningham), #3 Supplement Consent to Join Action (Paul Kaser), #4 Supplement Consent to Join Action (Mario Martinez), #5 Supplement Consent to Join Action (Heidy Villasenor))(Petersen, Gregory)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Audrey B. Collins:On March 1, 2010, the Court issued a minute order addressing, inter alia, the absence ofsignature pages for the opt-in notices of five employees. March 1, 2010 Minute Order (Docket # 420).The Court stated that "Plaintiffs' counsel is ORDERED within 10 days to either (1) properly file the signature pages of these five employees or (2) file a notice with the Court that the employees never completed the signature pages." Id. at 3 (emphasis in original). From the Courts review of the Docket, it does not appear that Plaintiffs counsel has filed either. Accordingly, Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to show cause in writing no later than March 24, 2010 why the Court should not impose sanctions. re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #420 Show Cause Response due by 3/24/2010.) (lw)
March 23, 2010 Filing 437 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #417 Supplemental filed by Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Palagi, Jennifer)
March 22, 2010 Filing 436 OPPOSITION to First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' RequeFirst EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' RequeFirst EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' RequeFirst EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Reque #433 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Palagi in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application)(Palagi, Jennifer)
March 22, 2010 Filing 435 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL OPT-IN RESPONSES re: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #417 filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Barge, Rene)
March 22, 2010 Filing 434 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Geoffrey S Sheldon counsel for Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles.Ann D. Wu is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
March 19, 2010 Filing 433 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #417 of all opt-in plaintiffs or in the alternative for relief under Rule60(b) to file a late Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike Defendant's Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration Petersen in upport of Plaintiffs' Ex ParteApplicaiton to Strike Defendant's Motion to Compel)(Barge, Rene)
March 18, 2010 Filing 432 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: The hearing set for March 23, 2010, is ordered off-calendar, and the motions' are taken under submission for decision without oral argument. (SEE MINUTE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (vm)
March 16, 2010 Filing 431 AMENDED ANSWER and Defendants' First Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint to Amended Complaint, 10 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Palagi, Jennifer)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins. Good cause appearing therefore, the Court hereby grants the Joint Stipulation of the parties regarding leave to amend Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #426 as follows: Defendant may file the first amended answer to Plaintiffs second amended complaint, attached to the joint stipulation as Exhibit "A", to add the seventeenth, eighteenth and nineteenth affirmative defenses, i.e., highly compensated employee, executive, and administrative exemptions defenses. (jp)
March 15, 2010 Filing 429 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Oldenbreit in Support of Lockhart Plaintiffs' Position, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth Gibbons in Support of Asclose Plaintiffs' Position, #3 Declaration of Admund Anderson in Support of Ascolese Plaintiffs' Position, #4 Declaration of Clark in Support of Ascolses Plaintiffs' Position)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
March 15, 2010 Filing 428 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Errata #427 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion)-Errata. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
March 15, 2010 Filing 427 NOTICE Of Errata To Plaintiffs' Supplement To Joint Statement Re: Defendant's Motion To Compel Responses To Discovery filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Katherine J. Odenbreit In Support Of Errata To Plaintiffs' Supplemental Joint Statement Re: Defendant's Motion To Compel Discovery)(Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 12, 2010 Filing 426 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Leave to Amend Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re: Leave to Amend Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(Palagi, Jennifer)
March 11, 2010 Filing 425 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities Pursuant to Local Rule 37-2.3 In Opposition to Defendants' Position Set Forth in Joint Stipulation #424 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Palagi, Jennifer)
March 9, 2010 Filing 424 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Supplemental MOTION to Supplement Joint Stipulation Re: Defendants' Motion to Compel All Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses To The County's Interrogatories (Set One) And Requests For Production Of Documents (Set One) re MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #417 Pursuant to Local Rule 37-2.3 filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart. Motion set for hearing on 3/23/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 9, 2010 Filing 423 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine J Odenbreit on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 9, 2010 Filing 422 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. correcting Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #421 (Palagi, Jennifer)
March 9, 2010 Filing 421 REPLY Defendants' Reply Re: Plaintiffs' Failure to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs Paul and Cynthia Lombardo #415 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #417 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer K. Palagi In Support of Reply Re: Plaintiffs' Failure to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel all Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to the County's Interrogatories (Set One) and Requests For Production of Documents (Set One) and Request for Sanctions)(Palagi, Jennifer)
March 1, 2010 Filing 420 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER Re: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE #394 held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pending before the Court is Defendants' motion to strike. Mot. (Docket # 394). Plaintiffs filed an opposition and Defendants filed a reply. Opp'n (Docket # 409); Reply (Docket # 413). The Court finds the matter appropriate for resolution without oral argument, Local Rule 7-15, and VACATES the hearing scheduled for March 8, 2010. Having considered the materials submitted by the parties and the case file, the Court rules as follows. Since Defendants filed their motion, Ascolese has been transferred to this Court. Hence, the relevant circumstances have changed. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS counsel in this case and in Ascolese to submit a joint status report regarding how the Court should handle the overlapping claims in both cases no later than March 15, 2010, and appear at a status conference on March 29, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Defendants shall notify the Ascolese Plaintiffs' counsel of this Order as soon as practicable. The Court will rule on the motion following that appearance and further briefing, if necessary. Defendants also challenge the consent forms filed by five Plaintiffs because they were "unsigned." The Court cannot determine whether the consents were signed because the signature pages (whether signed or not) were omitted from the filed documents for these Plaintiffs. See Defs.' Ex. 5. Hence, it appears that the problem may be a technical filing error by Plaintiffs' counsel. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' counsel is ORDERED within 10 days to either (1) properly file the signature pages of these five employees or (2) file a notice with the Court that the employees never completed the signature pages. In the case of the latter, Defendants may renew their motion. For the reasons stated above, Defendants motion to strike is DENIED without prejudice. (see document for further details) (bm)
February 23, 2010 Filing 419 NOTICE filed by Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Of Defendants' Motion to Compel all Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to the County's Interrogatories (Set One) and Requests for Production of Documents (Set One; Request for Sanctions (Palagi, Jennifer)
February 23, 2010 Filing 418 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel all Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to the County's Interrogatories (Set One) and Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) filed by Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Palagi, Jennifer)
February 23, 2010 Filing 417 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca, MOTION to Produce Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) filed by Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 3/23/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer K. Palagi in Support of Defendants' Motion To Compel All Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to the County's Interrogatories (Set One) and Requests for Production of Documents (Set One), #2 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer K. Palagi and Request for Sanctions Re: Plaintiffs' Failure to Timely Provide Portion of Joint Stipulation Re: Defendants' Motion to Compel All Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to the County's Interrogatories (Set One) and Request for Production of Documents (Set One), #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re: Defendants' Motion to Compel all Opt-in Plaintiffs' Responses to the County's Interrogatories (Set One) and Requests for Production of Documents (Set One))(Palagi, Jennifer)
February 23, 2010 Filing 416 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs Paul and Cynthia Lombardo #415 filed by Defendants Lee Baca, County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Oliver Yee in Support of Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against Paul and Cynthia Lombardo, #2 Declaration of T. Oliver Yee Regarding Failure to Timely Provide Opposing Party's Portion of Joint Stipulation Re Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against Paul and Cynthia Lombardo, #3 Proposed Order Re Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Paul and Cynthia Lombardo)(Yee, Theodore)
February 23, 2010 Filing 415 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs Paul and Cynthia Lombardo filed by Defendants Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 3/23/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Yee, Theodore)
February 22, 2010 Filing 414 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (Supplemental) In Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Defendants, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES and LEE BACA Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), County of Los Angeles. (Palagi, Jennifer)
February 22, 2010 Filing 413 REPLY Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike Opt-In Plaintiffs MOTION to Strike Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #394 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer K. Palagi In Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike Opt-In-Plaintiffs)(Palagi, Jennifer)
February 9, 2010 Filing 412 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error was found: Title page is missing. Incorrect event used. Correct event is Service documents : Service of Subsequent document filings - Proof of service (subsequent document). RE: Motion Related Document, #410 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (ir)
February 9, 2010 Filing 411 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error was found: Document should be linked to appropriate motion. RE: MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #409 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (ir)
February 8, 2010 Filing 410 Proof of Service opposition to defts mtn to strike opt in pltffs re MOTION to Strike Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #394 filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Pearlman, Marshall)
February 8, 2010 Filing 409 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration mmp dec in opp to defts mtn to strike opt in ptffs, #2 Exhibit Ex A to mmp dec, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to mmp dec)(Pearlman, Marshall)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION TO CONTINUE (1) THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE; AND (2) ALL PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES by Judge Audrey B. Collins: NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. Good cause appearing therefore, the Court hereby grants the joint application of the parties to continue (1) all dates set forth in the Court's briefing schedule on Defendants' Motion to Strike; and (2) all pretrial and trial dates and sets the following new schedule: February 8, 2010: Deadline for Plaintiffs to file opposition to Motion to Strike. February 22, 2010: Deadline for Defendants to file reply to Motion to Strike. March 8, 2010: Hearing on Motion to Strike at 10:00 a.m. August 20, 2010: Discovery cut-off date. August 30, 2010: Deadline to file class decertification motion. September 13, 2010: Deadline to file opposition to decertification motion. September 27, 2010: Deadline to file reply to decertification motion. October 18, 2010: Hearing on decertification motion at 10:00 a.m. November 1, 2010: Motion cut-off date including deadline to file summary judgment motions. Novmeber 22, 2010: Deadline to file opposition to summary judgemnt motions. December 6, 2010: Deadline to file reply to summary judgment motions. December 20, 2010: Hearing on summary judgment motions at 10:00 a.m. January 24, 2011: Final Pretrial Conference at 10:00 a.m. February 8, 2011: Jury Trial at 8:30 a.m. (bm)
January 22, 2010 Filing 407 Joint STIPULATION to Continue The Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Strike; and (2) All Pretrial and Trial Dates filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Application to Continue (1) The Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Strike; and (2) All Pretrial and Trial Dates)(Arce, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2010 Filing 406 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Plaintiffs' motion #390 is granted. Within fourteen days, Defendants are to provide personal contact information for each of the opt-in plaintiffs who responded to the court-ordered notice by providing a signed consent to join the action. Any such personal contact information is to be redacted from any document publicly filed in this action. Plaintiffs request for sanctions is denied without prejudice. Tape #: CS 1/12/10. (pcl)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Audrey B. Collins, ORDERING Ex Parte Request for Accomodations by Persons with Disabilities and Ex Parte Application for Order Sealing Request for Accomodation; [Proposed] Order; submitted by Plaintiffs received on 1/6/10 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Pursuant to GO 08-02, Case is Designated for Electronic Filing. (bm)
January 6, 2010 Filing 404 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart of Ex Parte Request for Accommodations by Persons with Disabilities and Ex Parte Application for Order Sealing Request for Accommodation; [Proposed] Order andRequest for Accommodations by Persons with Disabilities and Response. (Petersen, Gregory)
December 30, 2009 Filing 403 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #390 previously scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on January 5, 2010, is hereby CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on January 12, 2010, in Courtroom 640 of the Roybal Federal Building. (es)
December 22, 2009 Filing 402 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Contact information re opt-in plaintiffs #390 Supplemental filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Oliver Yee In Support of Defendants' Supplemental Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Contact Information Re Opt-In Plaintiffs)(Yee, Theodore)
December 21, 2009 Filing 401 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER Re: BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pending before the Court is Defendants' motion to strike. (Docket # 394). That motion was noticed for January 4, 2010, which is closed to motions. Accordingly, the Court instructed the parties to file a stipulation with a new briefing schedule and hearing date. (Docket # 396). The parties have now filed that stipulation and the Court adopts the schedule outlined therein: (1) Plaintiffs' opposition shall be filed no later than January 25, 2010; (2) Defendants' reply shall be filed no later than February 8, 2010; and (3) the hearing shall be scheduled for February 22, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. The parties also jointly request that the Court revisit its Scheduling Order in light of various discovery disputes. In particular, the parties request that the Court vacate the pretrial and trial dates, and set a status conference. The request is not properly before the Court. The discovery cut-off is not set until March 1, 2010. (See Docket # 130). If the parties seek to extend the discovery cut-off and change other dates already set by Court order, they need to file either (1) a stipulation with new proposed dates and a sufficient explanation as to why adopting the proposed dates is appropriate, or (2) a motion to amend the scheduling order. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 18, 2009 Filing 400 NOTICE OF LODGING filed By Defendants County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca re Miscellaneous Document #398 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re: Joint Stipulation Re: Response to Court's December 15, 2009 Order and Request for Status Conference)(Palagi, Jennifer)
December 18, 2009 Filing 399 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Joint Stipulation #398 . Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Stipulations-Order. Proposed order was not submitted as a separate attachment to the Stipulation. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
December 17, 2009 Filing 398 Joint Stipulation Re: Response to Court's December 15, 2009 Order and Request for Status Conference (Palagi, Jennifer)
December 15, 2009 Filing 397 MINUTES OF granting in part and denying in part #259 Motion to Enforce; Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Plaintiff Orosco is to provide supplemental interogatory responses within five days of the date of this order. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS**Court Recorder: CS 12-15-09. (dt)
December 15, 2009 Filing 396 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER Re: HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pending before the Court is Defendants' motion to strike. (Docket # 394). That motion was noticed for January 4, 2010, which is closed to motions. The Court also recognizes that the proposed hearing date would require the parties to file briefs during the holidays. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer on a new hearing date and briefing schedule. The Court further informs the parties that any schedule should include two weeks between the filing of the reply and the scheduled hearing date. A proposed briefing schedule and hearing date should be filed no later than December 17, 2009. (bm)
December 15, 2009 Filing 395 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Motion to Strike #394 . Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Hearing is noticed for a date that is closed on the court's calendar. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
December 14, 2009 Filing 394 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually). Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re: Defendants' Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Actions, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Palagi In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action, #3 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3.1 to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3.2 to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4.1 to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 4.2 to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Consents to Join Action)(Palagi, Jennifer)
December 11, 2009 Filing 393 DECLARATION of T. OLIVER YEE (SUPPLEMENTAL) IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST TO PROCEED WITH HEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #392 , Status Report, #376 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca. (Yee, Theodore)
December 8, 2009 Filing 392 Declaration of Marshall Pearlman in Opposition to Defendants' Status Report and Request to Proceed with Hearing Defendants' Motion to Enforce Compliance with Discovery Order in opposition to re: MOTION to Enforce COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,980.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #259 filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chi D. Tran in Opposition to Defendants' Status Report and Request to Proceed with Hearing Defendants' Motion to Enforce Compliance with Discovery Order)(Pearlman, Marshall)
December 8, 2009 Filing 391 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Contact information re opt-in plaintiffs #390 filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marshall Pearlman in Support of Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of T. Oliver Yee in Support of Joint Stipulation)(Pearlman, Marshall)
December 8, 2009 Filing 390 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Contact information re opt-in plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. Motion set for hearing on 1/5/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Pearlman, Marshall)
December 1, 2009 Filing 389 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Enforce Compliance with Discovery Order and Request for Sanctions #259 is hereby CONTINUED from December 3, 2009, at 10:00 a.m., to December 15, 2009, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 640 of the Roybal Courthouse. (pcl)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR ASSIGNMENT TO LOWER-NUMBERED CASE by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Notice of Related Case(s) #383 : Having reviewed all of the materials submitted and the case file, the Court hereby DENIES Plaintiffs' request. Plaintiffs' request is untimely. Indeed, because of Plaintiffs' counsel's delay, a transfer of Ascolese and Vallerand would hinderrather than promotejudicial efficiency. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' request is DENIED. (see document for further details) (bm)
November 24, 2009 Filing 387 REPLY Reply in Opposition Declaration of Marshall Pearlman in Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Case filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Pearlman, Marshall)
November 23, 2009 Filing 386 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #383 filed by Interested Party Michael Ascolese. (Shinee, Richard)
November 23, 2009 Filing 385 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Theodore Oliver Yee counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca (Yee, Theodore)
November 20, 2009 Filing 384 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually). Re: Notice of Related Case(s) #383 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Oliver Yee in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Case for Assignment to Lower-Numbered Case)(Yee, Theodore)
November 16, 2009 Filing 383 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. Notice of Related Case(s): ED CV-1267 SGL (MAN) (Pearlman, Marshall)
November 6, 2009 Filing 382 Consent to Join Action - Alex Galindo filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
November 6, 2009 Filing 381 Consent to Join Action - Jessica Triay filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
November 6, 2009 Filing 380 Consent to Join Action - Joseph Bernas filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
November 6, 2009 Filing 379 Consent to Join Action - Tina McCoy filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
November 6, 2009 Filing 378 Consent to Join Action - Arthur Christopher Velasquez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
November 6, 2009 Filing 377 Consent to Join Action - Nicholas Vallozzi filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 27, 2009 Filing 376 STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST TO PROCEED WITH HEARING RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Oliver Yee in Support of Defendants' Status Report and Request to Proceed with Hearing Defendants' Motion to Enforce Compliance with Discovery Order)(Yee, Theodore)
October 13, 2009 Filing 375 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically filed documents: The document is stricken and counsel to file an amended or corrected document by attorney has e-filed corrected document. Corrected documents were e-filed 10/23/09 RE: Miscellaneous Document #356 , Miscellaneous Document #357 , Miscellaneous Document #358 , Miscellaneous Document #359 , Miscellaneous Document #360 . (ir) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2009: #1 Main Document) (ab).
October 13, 2009 Filing 374 Consent to Join Action - Christopher Bronowime filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 13, 2009 Filing 373 Consent to Join Action - Seigen Roberts (previously misfiled under Dkt No. 360 - Monty Buckallen) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 13, 2009 Filing 372 Consent to Join Action - Monty Buckallen (previously misfiled under Dkt No. 359 - John Rodriguez) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 13, 2009 Filing 371 Consent to Join Action - John Rodriguez - (previously misfiled under Dkt No. 358 - Dale R. Johnson) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 13, 2009 Filing 370 Consent to Join Action - Dale R. Johnson (previously misfiled under Dkt No. 357 - Michael Carnakis filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 13, 2009 Filing 369 Consent to Join Action - Michael Carnakis (previously misfiled under Dkt No. 356 - Bruce Haar) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 13, 2009 Filing 368 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Consents to Join Action #356 , #357 , #358 , #359 , #360 . Docket entry text does not match caption of attached documents. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
October 12, 2009 Filing 367 Consent to Join Action - Jeffrey Cross filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 12, 2009 Filing 366 Consent to Join Action - Theodore Knott filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 12, 2009 Filing 365 Consent to Join Action - Samuel Taylor filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 9, 2009 Filing 364 Consent to Join Action - Bruce V. Haar filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 9, 2009 Filing 363 Consent to Join Action - Gregory Michael Schell filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 9, 2009 Filing 362 Consent to Join Action - Orlando Atencio filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 9, 2009 Filing 361 Consent to Join Action - James Matsuoka filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 9, 2009 Filing 360 Consent to Join Action - Monty Buckallen filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory) **STRICKEN pursuant to Response by Court on 10/13/09**Modified on 10/14/2009 (ir).
October 9, 2009 Filing 359 Consent to Join Action - John L. Rodriguez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory) **STRICKEN pursuant to Response filed by Court on 10/13/09**Modified on 10/14/2009 (ir).
October 9, 2009 Filing 358 Consent to Join Action - Dale R. Johnson filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory) **STRICKEN pursuant to Response filed 10/13/09**Modified on 10/14/2009 (ir).
October 9, 2009 Filing 357 Consent to Join Action - Michael Carnakis filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory) **STRICKEN pursuant to Response filed 10/13/09** Modified on 10/14/2009 (ir).
October 9, 2009 Filing 356 Consent to Join Action - Bruce V. Haar filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory) **STRICKEN pursuant to Response filed 10/13/09**Modified on 10/14/2009 (ir).
October 9, 2009 Filing 355 Consent to Join Action - Matthew W. Reichmann filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 9, 2009 Filing 354 Consent to Join Action - Robin Ritter filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 9, 2009 Filing 353 Consent to Join Action - Thomas C. Wagner filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
October 9, 2009 Filing 352 Consent to Join Action - Brian A. Espinosa filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 351 Consent to Join Action - Diane Leon filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 350 Consent to Join Action - Rafael A. Valadez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 349 Consent to Join Action - Jorge Lopez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 348 Consent to Join Action - Steven F. Hemmer filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 347 Consent to Join Action - Sean G. Levingston filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 346 Consent to Join Action - Eduardo Salazar filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 345 Consent to Join Action - Moses Checa filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 344 Consent to Join Action - Matthew Seier filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 343 Consent to Join Action - Neill M. Murchison filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 342 Consent to Join Action - Jeffrey A. Greene filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 341 Consent to Join Action - Lee Warren filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 340 Consent to Join Action - Leo Vasquez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 339 Consent to Join Action - Frank Carrillo filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 338 Consent to Join Action - David J. Lopez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 337 Consent to Join Action - Franisco E. Juarez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 336 Consent to Join Action - Annadennise Wollenzier filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 335 Consent to Join Action - Robert William Maas filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 334 Consent to Join Action - Makini M. Sims filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 333 Consent to Join Action - Ernest T. Griffin filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 332 Consent to Join Action - Larry A. Arellano filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 331 Consent to Join Action - Theodor R. Baljet filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 330 Consent to Join Action - Kevin House filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 329 Consent to Join Action - Donald F. Surber filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 328 Consent to Join Action - Joshua C. Morris filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 327 Consent to Join Action - Christopher A. Galassi filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 326 Consent to Join Action - Kelly Simon filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 325 Consent to Join Action - Michael Forne filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 324 Consent to Join Action - Donald J. Fitzpatrick filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 323 Consent to Join Action - Jose De La Cruz filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 322 Consent to Join Action - Bill Chupinghong filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 321 Consent to Join Action - Robert N. Carr filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 320 Consent to Join Action - Vince Wilson filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle,Continuing the hearing on Defendants' motion to enforce the Court's December 11, 2008 discovery order to: Discovery Hearing set for 12/3/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle.**SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07 and General Order 08-05. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 07-01680 ABC (CWx). (rn)
September 18, 2009 Filing 317 DECLARATION of Ann D. Wu IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Enforce COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,980.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #259 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wu, Ann)
September 18, 2009 Filing 316 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE MALFUNCTION OF SCANNED DOCUMENT filed by DEFENDANTS County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wu, Ann)
September 17, 2009 Filing 315 Joint STIPULATION to Continue HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,980.00 from 9/24/09 to 12/3/09 Re: Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #260 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #261 , MOTION to Enforce COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,980.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #259 filed by DEFENDANTS County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wu, Ann)
September 17, 2009 Filing 314 DECLARATION of ANN D. WU IN SUPPORT OF STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Enforce COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,980.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #259 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wu, Ann)
September 17, 2009 Filing 313 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Enforce COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,980.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #259 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Wu, Ann)
September 17, 2009 Filing 312 NOTICE Notice of Unavailability of Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 311 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Consent to Join Action (Angela Lockhart) #264 . Party is already on the docket represented by same counsel. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
September 10, 2009 Filing 310 Consent to Join Action - Joel J. Petersen filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 309 Consent to Join Action - Dick Miller filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 308 Consent to Join Action - Linda Wills filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 307 Consent to Join Action - Julie Valencia filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 306 Consent to Join Action - Rodolfo E. Barrios filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 305 Consent to Join Action - Felicia R. Price filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 304 Consent to Join Action - Jarlath J. Dedario filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 303 Consent to Join Action - Chris Christopher filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 302 Consent to Join Action - Adriana Mejia filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 301 Consent to Join Action - Darren Williams filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 300 Consent to Join Action - Jason J. Rivas filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 299 Consent to Join Action - Grant Oberle filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 298 Consent to Join Action - Anthony L. Lubina filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2009 Filing 297 Consent to Join Action - Mark Campbell filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 296 Consent to Join Action - Laurence E. Zimmerman filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 295 Consent to Join Action - Lorraine Rocco filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 294 Consent to Join Action - Lawrence R. Martindale filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 293 Consent to Join Action - George Prado filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 292 Consent to Join Action - Cesar Ortega filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 291 Consent to Join Action - Patricia L. Serpan filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 290 Consent to Join Action - William Asplin filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 289 Consent to Join Action - Ricahrd Doray filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 288 Consent to Join Action - Robert M. Kinsey filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 287 Consent to Join Action - Deborah D. Nava filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 286 Consent to Join Action - Dean Omura filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 285 Consent to Join Action - Anthony Ponce filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 284 Consent to Join Action - Michael Melikidse filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 283 Consent to Join Action - Paul Kaser filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 282 Consent to Join Action - Antonio Hernandez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 281 Consent to Join Action - Barbara AnnConnors filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 280 Consent to Join Action - Michael Cerecedes filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 279 Consent to Join Action - Robert Maas filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 278 Consent to Join Action - Scott L. Carter filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 277 Consent to Join Action - Jorge Ramirez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 276 Consent to Join Action - Lazaro Olmos filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 275 Consent to Join Action - Virginia Sanchez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 274 Consent to Join Action - Alfredo Macias filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 273 Consent to Join Action - Brandon Seibert filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 272 Consent to Join Action - Michael Shapiro filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 271 Consent to Join Action - Denise T. Steuer filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 270 Consent to Join Action - John Apostol filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 269 Consent to Join Action - Patricia Madrigal filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 268 Consent to Join Action - Michael Fields filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 267 Consent to Join Action - Floyd T. Caler filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 266 Consent to Join Action - Sheryle Bird filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 265 Consent to Join Action - Karen Mickle filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 264 Consent to Join Action - Angela Lockhart filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 263 Consent to Join Action - Shannon L. Endara filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
September 9, 2009 Filing 262 Consent to Join Action - Lee Yalowiec filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 31, 2009 Filing 261 DECLARATION of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in Support of MOTION to Enforce COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,980.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #259 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Wu, Ann)
August 31, 2009 Filing 260 DECLARATION of Ann D. Wu in Support of MOTION to Enforce COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,980.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #259 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 thru 11)(Wu, Ann)
August 31, 2009 Filing 259 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,980.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 9/24/2009 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wu, Ann)
August 26, 2009 Filing 258 Consent to Join Action - Micheline Garfin filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 257 Consent to Join Action - David Wesley Brown filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 256 Consent to Join Action - Frank P. Cross filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 255 Consent to Join Action - Faustino Del Valle filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 254 Consent to Join Action - Ronald J. Greene filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 253 Consent to Join Action - Bonnie Jones filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 252 Consent to Join Action - Richard S. Kennedy filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 251 Consent to Join Action - Eric C. Leibrich filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 250 Consent to Join Action - Jesus Alvarez Lopez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 249 Consent to Join Action - Casey J. McMichael filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 248 Consent to Join Action - Eric R. Taylor filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 247 Consent to Join Action - Francine Villicana filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 246 Consent to Join Action - James C. Bolander filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 245 Consent to Join Action - Robert F. Galarneau filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 244 Consent to Join Action - Wende Killian filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 243 Consent to Join Action - Allen Makorow filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 242 Consent to Join Action - James T Morrow filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 241 Consent to Join Action - Frank W. McGuire filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 26, 2009 Filing 240 Consent to Join Action - Joseph G. Gonzaque filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 25, 2009 Filing 239 Consent to Join Action - Laura M. Teel filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 238 Consent to Join Action - Darrel D. Brown filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 237 Consent to Join Action - Frank G. Castro filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 236 Consent to Join Action - David Gonzales filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 235 Consent to Join Action - John O. Houchens, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 234 Consent to Join Action - Stan W. Leach filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 233 Consent to Join Action - James L. McGuffin filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 232 Consent to Join Action - Arlene M. Moore filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 231 Consent to Join Action - Delbert B. Moore filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 230 Consent to Join Action - James A. Rodela filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 229 Consent to Join Action - Kari Bandy filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 228 Consent to Join Action - Ray Davidson filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 227 Consent to Join Action - Robert A. Lopez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 226 Consent to Join Action - Demetra Thomas filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 225 Consent to Join Action - Karen L. Ruiz filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 224 Consent to Join Actin - Michael A. Ruiz filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 223 Consent to Join Action - Daniel Nathan filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 222 Consent to Join Action - Randall Slate filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 221 Consent to Join Action - Craig L. Johnson filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 220 Consent to Join Action - Timothy M. McDermott, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 219 Consent to Join Action - James J. Delgado filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 218 Consent to Join Action - Charlene Edwards filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 217 Consent to Join Action - Jacob Gubran filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 216 Consent to Join Action - Joseph M. Koch filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 215 Consent to Join Action - Edgar D. Manalang filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 214 Consent to Join Action - Cynthia Kamalyan filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 213 Consent to Join Action - Son Bui filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 212 Consent to Join Action - Robert Castillo filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 211 Consent to Join Action - Hiram Komoto filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 210 Consent to Join Action - Paul Greve filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 209 Consent to Join Action - Gerardo Lucio filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 208 Consent to Join Action - Eric Williams filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 207 Consent to Join Action - Arthur Cruz filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 206 Consent to Join Action - Heidy Villasenor filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 205 Consent to Join Action - Joseph Esqueda filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 204 Consent to Join Action - Naomi Cabrera filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 203 Consent to Join Action - Eunice Auner filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 202 Consent to Join Action - Martin Anthony Villa filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 201 Consent to Join Action - Diana M. Vanecek filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 200 Consent to Join Action - Manuel L. Ruiz, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 199 Consent to Join Action - Pierre B. Nadeau filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 198 Consent to Join Action - Brian Cunningham filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 197 Consent to Join Action - David G. Ramirez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 196 Consent to Join Action - Janelle Thompson filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 195 Consent to Join Action - James Thomas Laman filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 194 Consent to Join Action - Mario Martinez filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 19, 2009 Filing 193 Consent to Join Action - Glyn Morgan filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 192 Consent to Join Action (Frank Matillo, Jr.) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 191 Consent to Join Action (Scott C. Mason) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 190 Consent to Join Action (Michael J. Westfall) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 189 Consent to Join Action (David J. Roldan) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 188 Consent to Join Action (Davy Todd Clark) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 187 Consent to Join Action (Roy L. Grayson) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 186 Consent to Join Action (Joyce L. Macheca) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 185 Consent to Join Action (Daryl E. Bonsall) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 184 Consent to Join Action (Jack J. Keath, Jr.) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 183 Consent to Join Action (James R. Goodrich, Jr.) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 182 Consent to Join Action (Richard A. Stevenson) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 181 Consent to Join Action (Tyler Maxwell) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 180 Consent to Join Action (Debra Shelton-Love) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 18, 2009 Filing 179 Consent to Join Action (Frank Higuera) filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 178 Consent to Join Action (David J. Moser) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 177 Consent to Join Action (Gregory Anton) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 176 Consent to Join Action (Frank Espinoza, Jr.) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 175 Consent to Join Action (Bruce R. Yoell) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 174 Consent to Join Action (Gary D. Laws) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 173 Consent to Join Action (Justin Serafin Martin) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 172 Consent to Join Action (James B. Dow) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 171 Consent to Join Action (Anthony A. Pitillo) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 170 Consent to Join Action (Edward G. Everett) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 169 Consent to Join Action (Edmund J. Anderson) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 168 Consent to Join Action (Rochonne D. Rose) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 167 Consent to Join Action (Adriana Covell) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 166 Consent to Join Action (George Martinez) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 165 Consent to Join Action (Fred B. Keelin) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2009 Filing 164 DECLARATION of Lieutenant Shaun J. Mathers Re: Completion of Mailing of Collective Action Notice filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca. (Palagi, Jennifer)
August 12, 2009 Filing 163 Consent to Join Action (John Hudson) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 162 Consent to Join Action (Alfred P. Alvarez) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 161 Consent to Join Action (John Lopata) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 160 Consent to Join Action (Glen Williams) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 159 Consent to Join Action (John A. Nemeth) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 158 Consent to Join Action (Stephen Vaughan) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 157 Consent to Join Action (David Loomis) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 156 Consent to Join Action (Yung-Hua Hsu) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 155 Consent to Join Action (David Haney) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 154 Consent to Join Action (Steven A. Stroble, Jr.) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 153 Consent to Join Action (Nancy McGauley) filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Frank Deogracias, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
August 6, 2009 Filing 152 EX PARTE APPLICATION OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR LOS ANGELES DEPUTY SHERIFFS TO INTERVENE FOR THE PURPOSE OF OPPOSING THE COURT'S ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF NAMES AND HOME ADDRESSES OF ALADS MEMBERS; DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH J GIBBONS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by intervenor ALADS. Lodged Proposed Order. (bm)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins denying as moot #142 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE RELEASE OF PEACE OFFICERS PERSONAL INFORMATION: Given the Court's ruling that the information will not be provided to a third-party administrator, ALADS's application is DENIED as moot. The Court also received nearly identical filings from the plaintiffs in Ascolese, et al., v. County of Los Angeles, et al. (CV 08-1267 SGL (MANx)) and Vallerand, et al., v. County of Los Angeles, et al. (CV 08-5057 JFW (VBKx)). (Docket # 137, 138). These "ex parte notices" assert that the Ascolese and Vallerand plaintiffs support the officers' ex parte application. To the extent these notices seek any sort of relief, they are DENIED as moot for the reasons stated above. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 6, 2009 Filing 150 Objection In Opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene for the Purpose of Opposing Court's Order Requiring Release of Names and Home Addresses of ALADS Members #142 filed by Plaintiffs Leobardo Trujillo, Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Petersen, Gregory)
August 5, 2009 Filing 149 DECLARATION of Gregory G. Petersen In Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Stay of Release of Peace Officer's Personal Information #136 Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen Regarding the Representation of Counsel Gary Goyette filed by Plaintiffs Leobardo Trujillo, Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Petersen, Gregory)
August 5, 2009 Filing 148 DECLARATION of Gary G. Goyette in Support of Ex Parte Reply filed by Interested Party Bruce Vallerand. (Goyette, Gary)
August 5, 2009 Filing 147 REPLY filed by Interested Party Bruce Vallerand (Goyette, Gary)
August 5, 2009 Filing 146 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: EX PARTE APPLICATION #142 . Proposed order was not submitted as a separate attachment to the Ex Parte Application. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
August 4, 2009 Filing 145 NOTICE Notice of Errata Re Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pro Se Real Parties in Interest's Ex Parte Application for Emergency Order Staying the Release of Peace Officers' Personal Information filed by Plaintiffs Leobardo Trujillo, Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Petersen, Gregory)
August 4, 2009 Filing 144 DECLARATION of Gregory G. Petersen In Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Stay of Release of Peace Officer's Personal Information #136 filed by Plaintiffs Leobardo Trujillo, Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Petersen, Gregory)
August 4, 2009 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Stay of Release of Peace Officer's Personal Information #136 filed by Plaintiffs Leobardo Trujillo, Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Petersen, Gregory)
August 4, 2009 Filing 142 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene for the Purpose of Opposing Court's Order Requiring Release of Names and Home Addresses of ALADS Members filed by Intervener ALADS.(Gibbons, Elizabeth)
August 4, 2009 Filing 141 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Ex Parte Notices Regarding Court Order #137 , #138 . Docket entry text does not match caption of attached document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
August 4, 2009 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in support of Non-Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Stay of Release of Peace Officer's Personal Information #136 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
August 4, 2009 Filing 139 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Stay of Release of Peace Officer's Personal Information #136 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
August 3, 2009 Filing 138 NOTICE filed by Interested Party Michael Ascolese. (Goyette, Gary)
August 3, 2009 Filing 137 NOTICE filed by Interested Party Bruce Vallerand. (Goyette, Gary)
July 31, 2009 Filing 136 EX PARTE APPLICATION for an Emergency Order Staying the Release of Peace Officer's Personal Information.(ir)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTES: At the end of the day on Friday, July 31, 2009 the Court received an ex parte request to stay the release of personal information of peace officers involved and/or related to this action. The Court hereby FILES the ex parte request.1 The Court hereby STAYS the release of any personal and/or identifying information of peace officers putatively part of this action. The parties are ORDERED to respond to the ex parte request by no later than close of business on Tuesday, August 4, 2009 IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (ir)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: GRANTING Request to Substitute Attorney Gregory G Petersen for Leobardo Trujillo in place and stead of Leonard Trujillo, Pro Per #129 . (ir)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: GRANTING Request to Substitute Attorney Gregory G Petersen for Gail Scorza in place and stead of Gail Scorza, Pro Per #128 . (ir)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: GRANTING Request to Substitute Attorney Gregory G Petersen for Angela Lockhart in place and stead of Angela Lockhart, Pro Per #127 . (ir)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: GRANTING Request to Substitute Attorney Gregory G Petersen for Patrick Gomez in place and stead of Patrick Gomez, Pro Per #126 . (ir)
July 13, 2009 Filing 130 MINUTES of Status Conference Following Withdrawal of Counsel of Record held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Discovery cut-off 3/1/2010. Motions due by 3/22/2010. Opposition due: 04/12/10; Reply due: 04/26/10; Hearing on motion to be set: 05/10/10 at 10:00 a.m. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2010 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/27/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. Parties have selected Settlement Procedure No. 1 before the Magistrate. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (mg)
July 10, 2009 Filing 129 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory G. Petersen in place of attorney Leobardo Trujillo filed by Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney (re: Leobardo Trujillo))(Petersen, Gregory)
July 10, 2009 Filing 128 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory G. Petersen in place of attorney Gail Scorza filed by Plaintiff Gail Scorza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney (Re: Gail Scorza))(Petersen, Gregory)
July 10, 2009 Filing 127 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory G. Petersen in place of attorney Angela Lockhart, in pro per filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney (re: Angela Lockhart))(Petersen, Gregory)
July 10, 2009 Filing 126 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory G. Petersen in place of attorney Patrick Gomez, in pro per filed by Plaintiff Patrick Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney (re: Patrick Gomez))(Petersen, Gregory)
July 8, 2009 Filing 125 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Court's June 1, 2009 Civil Minute Order filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in Support of Joint Status Report)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 8, 2009 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gregory G Petersen on behalf of Plaintiffs Leobardo Trujillo, Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
June 2, 2009 Filing 121 NOTICE of Entry of Ruling filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Malik, M)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Jackson DeMarc Tidus and Peckenpaugh's Motion to be relieved as counsel for plaintiff #117 is GRANTED. (ir)
June 1, 2009 Filing 122 MINUTES: Plaintiff's Motion of Demarco Tidue and Pechenpugh (Jackson DeMarco) to be relieved as counsel of record #117 ; Matter called. Court and counsel confer regarding document titled class representative conditions consent to the withdrawal of Jackson Demarco, etc., which was e-filed this morning. Court informs counsel that we have not received the mandatory courtesy copies. Court receives copy in open Court. Court and counsel confer regarding document e-filed on June 01, 2009, the Court having heard from counsel does not accept the late filing document. Plaintiffs motion to be relieved as counsel is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs have 30 days in which to seek and retain new counsel. Status conference set for July 13, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel to e-file a joint status report by July 08, 2009 with respect to status of case and proposed dates. Court and counsel confer regarding related cases. The Court having heard from counsel, informs counsel that a notice of related case has not been e-filed in this matter. Counsel to meet and confer regarding consolidated cases IT IS SO ORDERED by Audrey B. Collins.Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (ir)
June 1, 2009 Filing 120 Class Representatives Conditioned Consent to the Withdrawal of Jackson DeMarco as a Result of Attorney Misconduct and Self Dealing as Class Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Petersen, Gregory)
May 22, 2009 Filing 119 REPLY in support MOTION of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Withdraw as Attorney /To Be Relieved As Counsel #117 filed by Plaintiffs Leobardo Trujillo, Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Certificate of Service)(Malik, M)
May 18, 2009 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Withdraw as Attorney /To Be Relieved As Counsel #117 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 24, 2009 Filing 117 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Withdraw as Attorney /To Be Relieved As Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Alim Malik, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Malik, M)
April 23, 2009 Filing 116 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Court's April 17, 2009 Civil Minute Order filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTES OF (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Re Status of Case by Judge Audrey B. Collins. The parties have not filed a stipulation of dismissal or otherwise informed the Court of the status of the settlement agreement. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to submit either a joint status report or dismissal papers pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 no later than April 23, 2009. (sch)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Stay Case, #113 : The Court hereby grants the Application of Plaintiffs and Defendants to stay the litigation in this matter. Accordingly, the trial and all pre-trial days are stayed for 60 days so the parties can potentially resolve this matter by settlement. (bm)
February 12, 2009 Filing 113 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application to Stay Litigation Pending Settlement)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Reset, #111 : The Court hereby grants the Application (Stipulation) to set dates: The Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2009 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins; Jury Trial set for 5/26/2009 08:30 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. IT IS SO ORDERED. (da)
December 19, 2008 Filing 111 Joint STIPULATION to Reset filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application to Set Final Pre-Trial Conference and Trial Dates)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
December 16, 2008 Filing 110 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gregory G Petersen counsel for Plaintiff Angela Lockhart.Gregory G. Petersen is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart, et al. (Petersen, Gregory)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #106 , Plaintiff Frank Deogracias is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (ir)
December 11, 2008 Filing 108 MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: The Court issues a tentative decision and hears argument from counsel. Counsel have worked out a tentative resolution of the issues and have agreed to try to work through them. For that reason, the Court will not issue its decision in this case, unless the parties are unable to resolve their discovery disputes. Plaintiffs counsel is ordered to telephone Defendants counsel by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, December 12, 2008, after meeting with his clients and inform Defendants counsel whether Plaintiffs have any documents that are responsive to Defendants production requests. No later than December 29, 2008, Plaintiffs must serve Defendants counsel by email with supplemental interrogatories and amended responses to document production requests. Beginning on January 5, 2009, Plaintiffs must make themselves available for depositions. All depositions must be completed by the discovery cut-off date, January 15, 2009. Assuming that there are no problems with discovery, the Court will not issue its tentative order and will not sanction Plaintiffs counsel for discovery lapses. Court Smart: 12/11/08. (im)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins grants the Application to Continue #105 , Discovery cut-off is continued to 1/15/2009; Cut-off date for Motion to be filed is contiued to 2/17/2009. Pretrial Conference date of 3/9/09 and the Jury Trial date of 3/24/09 are VACATED, as they are no longer feasible given a date of 3/16/09 at the earliest. Parties are to stipulate to new Pretrial and Jury Trial dates within ten (10) days of this order. (ir)
December 10, 2008 Filing 106 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Frank Deogracias filed by plaintiff Frank Deogracias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Frank Deogracias)(Colella, Steve)
December 9, 2008 Filing 105 Joint STIPULATION to Continue the Discovery Cut-off and Motion Cut-off Dates from December 19, 2008 and January 26, 2009, respectively to January 15, 2009 and February 17, 2009, respectively filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application to Continue the Discovery Cut-off and Motion Cut-off Dates)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 104 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #89 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 103 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo #88 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 102 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Gail Scorza to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Gail Scorza to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Gail Scorza to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #87 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 101 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Gail Scorza #86 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Angela Lockhart #76 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Gail Scorza to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Gail Scorza to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Gail Scorza to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #87 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Richard Orosco to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Richard Orosco to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Richard Orosco to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #85 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Angela Lockhart to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Angela Lockhart to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Angela Lockhart to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #77 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Paul Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Paul Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Paul Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #83 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #89 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Richard Orosco #84 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Cynthia Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Cynthia Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Cynthia Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #81 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo #88 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Cynthia Lombardo #80 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Patrick Gomez to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Patrick Gomez to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Patrick Gomez to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #79 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Paul Lombardo #82 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Patrick Gomez #78 Plaintiffs' Consolidated Supplemental Briefing In Response To Defendants' Motion To Compel Further Discovery Responses filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Nissen, Christopher)
November 26, 2008 Filing 100 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Gail Scorza #86 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 99 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Richard Orosco to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Richard Orosco to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Richard Orosco to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #85 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 98 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Richard Orosco #84 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 97 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Paul Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Paul Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Paul Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #83 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 96 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Paul Lombardo #82 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 95 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Cynthia Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Cynthia Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Cynthia Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #81 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 94 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Cynthia Lombardo #80 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 93 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Patrick Gomez to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Patrick Gomez to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Patrick Gomez to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #79 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 92 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Patrick Gomez #78 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 91 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Angela Lockhart to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Angela Lockhart to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Angela Lockhart to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) #77 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 90 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Angela Lockhart #76 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #3 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 88 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Leobardo Trujillo filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #3 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 87 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Gail Scorza to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Part 1 Pages 1-55, #2 Joint Stipulation Part 2 Pages 56-110, #3 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #4 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 86 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Gail Scorza filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #3 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 85 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Richard Orosco to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #3 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 84 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Richard Orosco filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #3 Declaration Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 83 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Paul Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Part 1 Pages 1-50, #2 Joint Stipulation Part 2 Pages 51-97, #3 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #4 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 82 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Paul Lombardo filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #3 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 81 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Cynthia Lombardo to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Part 1 Pages 1-50, #2 Joint Stipulation Part 2 Pages 51-98, #3 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #4 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 80 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Cynthia Lombardo filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #3 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 79 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Patrick Gomez to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Part 1 Page 1-55, #2 Joint Stipulation Part 2 Pages 56-110, #3 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #4 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 78 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Patrick Gomez filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #3 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Angela Lockhart to Provide Further Amended Responses to the County's Requests for Production of Documents (Set One) filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Part 1 Pages 1-55, #2 Joint Stipulation Part 2 Pages 56-111, #3 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce, #4 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2008 Filing 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Angela Lockhart filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Regarding Motion to Compel Plaintiff Lockhart to provide Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth T. Arce in support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories, #3 Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen)(Arce, Elizabeth)
September 30, 2008 Filing 75 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error was found: Incorrect event used. Document shall be filed in the traditional manner at the Civil Intake Window. RE: Joinder (non-motion) #74 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (ir)
September 25, 2008 Filing 74 JOINDER (Malik, M)
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins that the Joint Stipulation regarding Approval of Notice to Class regarding Preliminary Certification of this matter as a collective action #72 is GRANTED as follows: The Proposed Notice to Class, attached hereto as Exhibit 1, is APPROVED as to form. The Parties shall meet and confer within 15 days and select a Third Party Administrator to distribute the Notice to Class to the putative class members. Per prior order of the Court, costs of the Third Party Administrator are to be sharedequally by both sides. (ir)
August 5, 2008 Filing 72 Joint STIPULATION for Order Approving Notice to Class Regarding Preliminary Certification of Matter as a Collective Action filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation Re Approval of Notice to Class Re Preliminary Certification of this Matter as a Collective Action)(Nissen, Christopher)
July 29, 2008 Filing 71 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Audrey B. Collins re Electronic Filing, Submission of Courtesy Copies, and E-mailing Proposed Documents (see document for further details). (rrey)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Emergency APPLICATION for Order for Joint Motion to Approve Proposed Notice to Class #68 , for the following reasons: hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely; docket indictes the document is a motion thus it must be scheduled for hearing; notice of hearing is missing; stipulation lacking a propoesd order; (rrey)
July 28, 2008 Filing 69 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: RE: Emergency APPLICATION for Order for Joint Motion to Approve Proposed Notice to Class #68 . Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other: Document submitted is entitled Stipulated Joint Motion to Approve Notice to Class Regarding Preliminary Certification of this Matter as a Collective Action; and [Proposed] Notice. This does not match the text of the docket entry. Proposed order regarding this motion not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
July 24, 2008 Filing 68 [STRICKEN] Emergency APPLICATION for Order for Joint Motion to Approve Proposed Notice to Class filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nissen, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2008 (rrey).
July 14, 2008 Filing 67 MINUTES OF Plaintiff's motion for preliminary certification as a collective action held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Motion granted. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Collective Action pursuant to 29 USC 216(b) by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's 216(b) Motion #59 and conditionally certifies the proposed collective action for purposes of notifying proposed class members of the pendency of the suit. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and file a revised proposed order consistent with this Order within ten (10) days. (ir)
July 9, 2008 Filing 65 PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF GREGORY P. NELSON, NEAL B. TYLER, WILLIAM J. MCSWEENEY, ROBERTA ABNER, SUZANNE COUSINS, JOHN E. RADELEFF, DENNIS H. BURNS, RICHARD BARRANTES, AND WILLIE J. MILLER FILED IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION re MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION #59 filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Nissen, Christopher)
July 3, 2008 Filing 64 REPLY in support of motion MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION #59 PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Malik, M)
June 20, 2008 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION #59 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Division Chief Richard Barrantes in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Division Chief Willie J. Miller in Opposition, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Declaration Division Chief Dennis H. Burns in Opposition, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Declaration Division Chief John E. Radeleff in Opposition, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Declaration Lieutenant Gregory P. Nelson in Opposition, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Declaration Susanne Cousins in Opposition, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Declaration Dvision Chief Roberta Abner in Opposition, #23 Declaration Division Chief William J. McSweeney in Opposition, #24 Declaration Division Chief Neal B. Tyler in Opposition)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 20, 2008 Filing 62 OBJECTIONS to Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen in Support of Opposition to re: MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION #59 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 20, 2008 Filing 61 OBJECTIONS to Declaration of Putative Plaintiff Angela Lockhart in Support of Opposition to re: MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION #59 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 20, 2008 Filing 60 OBJECTIONS Defendants' Objections to Declaration of Putative Plaintiff Gail Scorza in Support of Opposition to re: MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION #59 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
June 6, 2008 Filing 59 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart. Motion set for hearing on 7/14/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Putative Plaintiff Angela Lockhart in Support of Motion for Preliminary Certification of Collective Action, #2 Declaration Declaration of Putative Plaintiff Gail Scorza in Support of Motion for Preliminary Certification of Collective Action, #3 Declaration Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen in Support of Motion for Preliminary Certification of Collective Action (Part One - Exhs. A - I), #4 Exhibit (Part Two) - Exhibits J - U to Declaration of Christopher D. Nissen, #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Certifying Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. section 216(b), #6 Certificate of Service)(Nissen, Christopher)
June 6, 2008 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher David Nissen on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Lockhart (Nissen, Christopher)
May 27, 2008 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Brian P Walter counsel for Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca. Adding Geoffrey S. Sheldon as attorney as counsel of record for Defendants County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca (Walter, Brian)
May 22, 2008 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher David Nissen on behalf of Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (Nissen, Christopher)
May 22, 2008 Filing 55 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by Plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Cynthia M. Lombardo, Leobardo Trujillo, Richard J. Orosco, Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (Nissen, Christopher)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 APPLICATION ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby grants the Joint Stipulation of the parties to allow Plaintiffs until Friday, 6/6/08 to file a motion for preliminary injunction of this case as a collective action. The Court further grants the Joint Stipulation to allow Defendants until 6/20/0 to file an opposition to Plaintiffs motion for preliminary certification and to allow Plaintiffs until 7/3/08 to file a reply to Defendants opposition. The Hearing on Plaintiffs motion for preliminary certification of this case as a collective action is scheduled for 7/14/08 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 680 located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. (ir)
March 17, 2008 Filing 53 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Date By Which Plaintiffs Must File A Motion For Preliminary Certification of This Matter As A Collective Action from 3/28/08 to 6/6/08 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palagi, Jennifer)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TOFILE MOTION FOR COLLECTIVE ACTION PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(b) from February 29, 2008 to March 28, 2008 #50 (es)
February 28, 2008 Filing 51 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion for Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) from February 29, 2008 to March 28, 2008 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion for Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) from February 29, 2008 to March 28, 2008 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion for Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) from February 29, 2008 to March 28, 2008 #50 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Elizabeth T. Arce#2 Exhibit Exhibit A#3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Arce, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2008 Filing 50 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion for Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) from February 29, 2008 to March 28, 2008 filed by Plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bradley R. Mathews in Support of Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Deadline for Fiilng Motion for Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b)#2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Continuing Deadline for Plaintiff to File Motion for Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b))(Mathews, Bradley)
February 26, 2008 Filing 49 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Elizabeth Tom Arce counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles, et al. Defendant, County of Los Angeles, et al. (Arce, Elizabeth)
February 21, 2008 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event type selected. Correct event: Notice-Change of Attorney Informaiton (G-06): RE Miscellaneous Document #47 (es)
February 7, 2008 Filing 47 Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca re: Elizabeth T. Arce (Arce, Elizabeth)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, Continuing Deadline for Plaintiff to File Motion for Collective Action Pursuant to 29 USC 216(d) #44 The Court finds that good causes exists for continuing the deadline from February 1, 2008 to February 29, 2008. The Court sets March 14, 2008 as the deadline for Defendant to file an opposition to the motion, and March 28, 2008 for Plaintiffs to file a reply brief. The hearing on the motion will be rescheduled for April 11, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (es)
January 31, 2008 Filing 45 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue continue deadline for filing motion for collective action from February 1, 2008 to February 29, 2008 #44 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca. (Palagi, Jennifer)
January 30, 2008 Filing 44 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue continue deadline for filing motion for collective action from February 1, 2008 to February 29, 2008 filed by plaintiff Angela Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bradley R. Mathews in Support of Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Deadline for Filing Motion for Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b)#2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Continuing Deadline for Plaintiff to File Motion for Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b))(Mathews, Bradley)
December 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AND JOINT STIPULATION by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby grants the joint stipulation of the parties to allow Plaintiffs until Friday, 2/1/08 to file a motion for preliminary certification of this case as a collective action. The Court further grants the joint stipulation to allow Defendants until 2/15/08 to file an opposition to Plaintiffs motion for preliminary certification and to allow Plaintiffs until 2/29/08 to file a reply to Defendants opposition. The hearing on Plaintiffs motion for preliminary certification of this case as a collective action is scheduled for 3/17/08 at 10:00 in Courtroom 680 located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. (ir)
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins Approved the NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp1) (es)
December 12, 2007 Filing 41 NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp1); parties request to Appear Before Magistrate Judge for settlement proceedings.(bp)
December 3, 2007 Filing 40 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Scheduling Conference held. The Court sets the following dates: Add Claims/Parties Cut-Off: February 4, 2008; Hearing on 216(b) motion: March 3, 2008, at 10:00am; Discovery Cut-Off: December 19, 2008; Law & Motion Cut-Off: January 26, 2009; Final Pre Trial Conference: March 9, 2009, at 10:00AM; Trial counsel must be present; Jury Trial: March 24, 2009, at 8:30AM. Counsel are reminded of the requirements of Local Rule 16-14. Counsel shall submit their notice of settlement selection within 10 days. The Court directs counsel to meet and confer within 10 days re: discovery dispute over timing of disclosures of additional plaintiffs. (es)
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CIVIL JURY TRIAL ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins. The Court orders the following dates: Cut-off date for filing to joint and amending th epleadings is 2/4/2008; Discovery cut-off is 12/19/08; cut-off dae for motons is Monday, 1/29/2009; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2009 at 10:00 AM; Trial is set for 3/24/2009 at 8:30 AM. (es)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Court hereby grants the joint stipulation of the parties to allow Plaintiff until Friday, 1/18/08 to file a motion for a preliminary certification of this case as a collective action. (ir)
November 15, 2007 Filing 38 JOINT REPORT pursuant to FRCP 26(f); estimated length of trial unable to estimate, filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza.(ir)
November 6, 2007 Filing 36 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint 10 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, and Sheriff Lee Baca.(ir)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins GRANTING MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint, and GRANTING MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint, WITH PREJUDICE 10 13 . The Court also GRANTS Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiff's prayer for punitive damages.(da)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins GRANTS Plaintiffs Ex Parte for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants Reply Brief 30 . Court will consider Plaintiffs Surreply brief in ruling on Defendants motion to dismiss. (ir)
September 24, 2007 Filing 31 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Reply to Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 30 , filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (bho)
September 21, 2007 Filing 34 DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EXPARTE APPLICATION TO FILE SURREPLY TO DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply Brief 30 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca. (mgra)
September 21, 2007 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorneys Brian P Walter, and Jennifer K Palagi on behalf of Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca (ir)
September 20, 2007 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE of: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply Brief 30 ; MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 31 , served on 9/20/07 filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza, re (bho)
September 20, 2007 Filing 30 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. Lodged Proposed Orders.(bho)
September 20, 2007 Filing 26 IN CHAMBERS MINUTES OF Judge Audrey B. Collins RE: MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint, 10 , due to congestion in the Court's calendar, the Court hereby VACATES the current September 24, 2007 hearing date and CONTINUES the hearing on the motion to Monday, October 22, 2007, at 10:00AM.Court Reporter: not reported.(da)
September 17, 2007 Filing 29 Defendants' REPLY to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Strike Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint, 10 13 ; MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities, filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca, Lee Baca. (bho)
September 17, 2007 Filing 28 Defendants' REQUEST for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint 10 ; MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint 10 ; MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint 10 13 , filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). (bho)
September 17, 2007 Filing 25 NOTICE OF LODGING Non-Federal Authorities in support of Reply to Plaintiffs oppostion to Motion to dismiss filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca.; Lodged Reply to Plaintiffs oppositino to defendants motion to dismiss Second Amended Complaint (ir)
September 11, 2007 Filing 24 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY-PLAINTIFF-RICHARD J. OROSCO in Complaint 1 , filed by plaintiffs Paul Lombardo, Angela Lockhart. (ca)
September 11, 2007 Filing 23 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY-PLAINTIFF-LEOBARDO TRUJILLO in Complaint 1 , filed by plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Gail Scorza. (ca)
September 11, 2007 Filing 22 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF CYNTHIA M. LOMBARDO in Complaint 1 , filed by plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Gail Scorza. (ca)
September 11, 2007 Filing 21 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY-PLAINTIFF- PAUL LOMBARDO in Complaint 1 , filed by plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Gail Scorza. (ca)
September 10, 2007 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza, re Response in Opposition to Motion, 17 , Response in Opposition to Motion, 19 , Request for Judicial Notice,, Request for Relief,,, 18 served on September 10, 2007. (vm)
September 10, 2007 Filing 19 QUALIFIED OPPOSITION to defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in support of their MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint, 10 13 filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (vm)
September 10, 2007 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of their Opposition to MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint, 10 13 filed by plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (vm)
September 10, 2007 Filing 17 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case re Amended Complaint, 10 13 ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (vm)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: This matter is set for Pretrial/Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins.(bp)
August 16, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE of appearance of Gregory G. Petersen, esq., M. Alim Malik, esq., and Bradley R. Mathews, esq., filed by plaintiffs' Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez. (bp)
August 16, 2007 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bradley R Mathews attorney for Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza, changing name and address to 2030 Main Street, Ste 1200, Irvine, CA 92614. Filed by plaintiffs' Angela Lockhart (bp)
August 14, 2007 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in support of MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike portions of plaintiffs' second amended complaint 10 13 [Notice of Motion, Request for Judicial Notice and [proposed] Order filed concurrently herewith] (ear)
August 14, 2007 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike portions of plaintiffs' second amended complaint 10 13 ; [Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of MOTION to Dismiss and [proposed] Order filed concurrently herewith]; filed by defendants County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca (ear)
August 14, 2007 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION to dismiss and MOTION to Strike portions of plaintiffs' second amended complaint 10 ; filed by defendants, County of Los Angeles and Lee Baca; Motion set for hearing on 9/24/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins; Lodged proposed Order (ear)
July 25, 2007 Summons Issued re Second Amended Complaint, 10 as to County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Does. (bp)
July 25, 2007 Filing 10 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants' County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Does amending Amended Complaint, 8 ,filed by plaintiff Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza (bp)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFIS TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS THEIR STATUTORY TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE PLEADING AND ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: THE PARTIES HEREBY STIPULATE, through their respective counsel of record and pursuant to Local Rule 8.3 of the Central District of California, that Plaintiffs will have until 7/25/2007 to file and serve a Second Amended Complaint in this action. FURTHER STIPULATE that defendnats will have their statutory 20 days to file a responsive pleading to the second amended complaint. This Stipulation is made without prejudice to any party seeking any further extensions of time from the court. (et)
May 25, 2007 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants' County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Does amending Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs' Angela Lockhart, Gail Scorza (bp)
May 16, 2007 Filing 7 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to County of Los Angeles answer now due 6/14/2007; Lee Baca(individually) answer now due 6/14/2007; Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County) answer now due 6/14/2007, filed by defendants' County of Los Angeles; Lee Baca(individually); Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County).(bp, )
May 3, 2007 Filing 6 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint. County of Los Angeles answer due 5/18/2007; Lee Baca(individually) answer due 5/18/2007; Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County) answer due 5/18/2007. filed by defendants' County of Los Angeles; Lee Baca(individually); Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County). (bp, )
March 13, 2007 Filing 5 CONSENT TO JOIN OF PATRICK GOMEZ in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Patrick Gomez, Gail Scorza. (et)
March 13, 2007 Filing 4 CONSENT TO JOIN OF ANGELA LOCKHART in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Gail Scorza (et)
March 13, 2007 Filing 3 CONSENT TO JOIN OF GAIL SCORZA in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Gail Scorza (et)
March 13, 2007 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Gail Scorza. (et)
March 13, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca (individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Does 1 through 10 inclusive. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded. , filed by plaintiffs Angela Lockhart, Gail Scorza.(et)
March 13, 2007 20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to County of Los Angeles, Lee Baca(individually), Lee Baca(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Los Angeles County), Does 1 through 10, inclusive. (et)
March 13, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Elizabeth A Barker, Bradley R Mathews, Gregory G Petersen, Pamela Ann Wilson is 949-417-5610. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angela Lockhart et al v. County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faustino Del Valle
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Mickle
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Cabrera
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Roldan
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Haney
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald F. Surber
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan W Leach
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Carillo
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank G Castro
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vince Edward Wilson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia R. Price
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Lubina
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar D Manalang
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Bolander
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Makorow
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Michael Schell
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Moser
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Cross
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Rodriguez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Rodela
Represented By: Russell J Thomas, Jr
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shapiro
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Valencia
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest T. Griffin
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Ramirez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Espinosa
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose De La Cruz
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F. Galarneau
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Gomez
Represented By: Katherine J Odenbreit
Represented By: M. Alim Malik
Represented By: Christopher David Nissen
Represented By: Bradley R Mathews
Represented By: Russell J Thomas, Jr
Represented By: Pamela Ann Wilson
Represented By: Rene L Barge
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Steve J Colella
Represented By: Elizabeth A Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua C. Morris
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce V. Haar
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L Ruiz
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel J. Petersen
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura M. Teel
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Slate
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Thompson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Martinez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carnakis
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Edwards
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John O Houchens, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarlath J. Dedario
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Forne
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Macias
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia L. Serpan
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence E. Zimmerman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Atencio
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Maas
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack J. Keath, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Loomis
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Triay
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Taylor
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah D. Nava
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ty M. Sylvester
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Asplin
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C. Wagner
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David G Ramirez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Buckallen
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fields
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davy Todd Clark
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidy Villasenor
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Prado
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hudson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makini M. Sims
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A. Stroble, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise T. Steuer
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco E. Juarez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Nathan
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Goodrich, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Maas
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Kaser
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Lopez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazaro Olmos
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seigen Roberts
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Son Bui
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |