James Foti et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: James Foti, James Aiken, Mark Davison, Mark Palmer, Amir S Arif, Jason Abbate, Norman Aaro, Patricia Ackerman, Glen Adams, Guadalupe Aguayo, Mumtaz Ahmed, Carlos Aldana, Robert Allen, Galo Almeida, Jose Amancio Ortiz, Sondra Ames, Allyson Ames, Daniel Anderson, Melanie Anderson, Dawn Amora, Rolande Andrade, Judith Arias, Denice Arango, Nora Arroyo, LeeAnn Atkins, Darryl Avery, Armando Balvanera, Genaro Barba, Maylo Barnuevo, Alexandru Bauer, Ronald Beauvoir, Andres Benavidez, Sherry Bilodeau, Aida Bolanos Herrera, Javier Bolanos Herrera, Albert Bonilla, Robert Booth, Patricia Boyce, John Boylan, Agnes Braxton, Tracy Briles, Fernando Brodrick, Dianne Brown, Georgia Brown, Cynthia Brown, Linda Brueckner Ward, Brent Buckley, Al Burdich, William Burke, Burnett Margo, Steven Campanelli, Douglas Carlton, Kenneth Caron, Lance Cassino, Alex Castellanos, Juan Francisco Alas Castro, Ruth Castro, Melody Chacker, Anita Chacko, Thomas Chalmers, Tomas Chavez, Eugene Chavez, Bradley Clark, Gail Clark, Dexter Clay, Sharon Clotfelter, Dorothy Coletta, Harold Coe, Arturo Concha, Cedric Cooper, John Cuddeback, Ronnie Curteman, David Cunningham, Mark Dahl, Daniel Norbert, Deborah Davenport, Brian Davis, Harry Brian, Harry Davis, Margina Davis, Lawrence Day, Jason Floyd, Scott Fredricey, Ozstar De Jourday, Lena De Jourday, Mario Del Rosario, Eleno Dela Cruz, Esteban De La Paz, Ignacio Delgado, George Delgado, Nicola Demichino, John Dohoney, Daniel Dorado, Karen Douglas, Jesus Duran, Marie Durocher, William Dynek, Jr, Zuzzette Echeverria, Carlos Flores Carrillo, Steve Ehlers, Abelardo Elenes, Carlos Esquibel, Richard Evans, Don Farr, Louis Fisi, Victoria Fitzgerald, Antonio Fontes, Nicole Francis, Lori Frank, Robert Frank, Enid Futterman, Wayne Furr, Rolando Gallegos, Patrick Gannon, Luis Garcia, Oscar Garcia, Pedro Garcia, Aleyamma George, Paola Giaquinto, Michele Goldman, Eleanor Gomez, Silvestre Gonzales, Edgart Gonzales, Armando Granados, Randy Graves, Ari Gronich, George Grover, Douglas Gustafson, Stephan Haah, Millicent Haik, Terry Harner, Carole Harris, Thomas Hart, Barbara Henderson, Ingrid Henderson, Henry Glendon, Marisa Herrera, Eugene Hester, Jeannine Hester, Geoffrey Hinnen, Carol Holmes, Dizon Honorio, John Houston, Tracy Hua, Pu Huang, Roman Huber, Terri Hudson, Gilbert Inguez, Eric Iverson, Sandra Jackson, Rose Jacques, Darrell James, George Jarzombek, Kimball Johnson, Lucas Johnson, Stephan Jones, Ira Jones, Robert Jones, Maria Luisa Jovel, Peter Kachur, Gary Kalus, David Keech, Jesse Keiser, Jerome Kern, Randy Kerr, Wayne Kizziar, John Klemencic, Kim Klopcic, Debra Kottke, Robert Kozlowski, Janice Kressin, Christine Kwapnoski, Thomas Kyte, Deborah Lamb, Carmelita Laoyan, Jose Lara, Kim Lee, Argelina Leiva, Joel Liebke, Phillip Lindquist, Derrick Little, John Lockhart, Myriam Lonaker, Maria Lopez Sanchez, Holly Macintyre, Victoria Macklin, Annette Maddox, Martin Mandujano, Randall Manning, Pierre Marcotte, Marcelline Marin, David Martinez, Genevieve Martinez, Juan Maya, Suzanne M McCullough, Mohammed Izadi, Dane McDonald, Lorie McDonald, Grady McNeal, Aaron Meneses, Gilda Metzger, Alain Michael, Hattie Miles, Ilona Miller, Juan Montano, William Montez, Ralph Moody, Ralph Morgan, Jerry Lee Morris, Susan Mota, Rodney Mott, Saeed Movehead, Miguel Munguia, Rory Muniz, Connor Murray, Kelly Musselman, Chris Nagel, Paul Nance, James Nardi, Remigio Navarette, Leo Newton, Dat Thanh Ngo, Kom Chris Ngoy, Anhtuyet Nguyen, Tiffanie Nguyen, Michael Nierhake, Gery Noel, Parker Noel, Dan Nowak, Karen Nussbaumer, Juan Ocampo, Peter Oh, Teresita Orcini, Jose Ortiz Hodges, Manuel Pacheco, Lily Park, Ken Parker, Paul Parks, Elizabeth Pasion, Gerald Paul, Raymond Payne, Earl Pedford, Miguel Peralta, Ernesto Perezalonso, John Perry, Gerald Peterson, Sizelda Peirce, Jon Peterson, Kathy Peterson, Wanda Petlock, Kenneth Petticolas, Carolyn D Phillips, Dean Pickard, Ronald Piconke, Maria Pitagora, Rosa Pliego, Chauncey Pope, Anne Prescott, Thomas Prewitt, William Protzmann, Theresa Quinones, Ronan Rahaman, Mirna Rahman, Ronald Rau, Margaret Reckley, Christopher Reid, George Renz, Carl Reynolds, William Ribas, Daniel Richard, Alice Ritson, Danette Roberts, William Robledo, Albino Rodriguez, Asencion Rodriguez, Luis Rodriguez, Fanny Rodriguez, Guy Rogers, Romeo Roldan, Robert Rotstan, Salvatore Russo, Victor Sabino and Jesus Salas
Case Number: 2:2011cv03487
Filed: April 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2013 Filing 77 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re Order #76 served on 05/31/2013. (Gless, Bryan)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING JPMORGAN CHASE BANKS MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS by Judge George H. Wu, #73 (pj)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Attached hereto, is the Courts Ruling on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens, filed on April 25, 2013 #73 . Defendants motion is GRANTED. Court signs the order. The hearing calendared for May 30, 2013 is hereby VACATED and the matter is taken off-calendar. (Attachments: #1 RULING) (jag)
May 22, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Set Aside (Expunge) Lis Pendens #73 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Gless, Bryan)
April 25, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside (Expunge) Lis Pendens filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 5/30/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Gless, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Gless, Bryan)
April 16, 2013 Filing 72 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re Order on Request to Substitute Attorney, #71 served on April 16, 2013. (Gless, Bryan)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge George H. Wu: granting #70 Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. Request to Substitute Attorney David D. Piper and Bryan A. Gless as attorney of record instead of Attorney Shannon Z Petersen; Norma V Garcia and Susan Miller Overbey terminated (pj)
April 12, 2013 Filing 70 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Bryan A. Gless & David D. Piper in place of attorney Susan Miller Overbey, Shannon Z. Petersen & Norma V. Garcia filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gless, Bryan)
June 28, 2012 Filing 69 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing #60 held before Judge George H Wu. For reasons stated on the record, Defendant JPMorgan Chase Banks motion is GRANTED. Court signs the proposed order. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (kti)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS #60 by Judge George H Wu: (pj)
June 25, 2012 Filing 67 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order re MOTION to Set Aside Lis Pendens Notice #59 (Expunge) MOTION to Set Aside Lis Pendens Notice #59 (Expunge) #60 (Garcia, Norma)
June 22, 2012 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re MOTION to Set Aside Lis Pendens Notice #59 (Expunge) MOTION to Set Aside Lis Pendens Notice #59 (Expunge) #60 served on June 1, 2012. (Garcia, Norma)
May 31, 2012 Filing 65 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing #60 held before Judge George H Wu. Court and counsel confer re motion to expunge. Counsel will serve individual plaintiffs forthwith. Any objections by the plaintiffs will be filed by June 22, 2012. Proofs of service and a proposed order expunging lis pendens will be filed by noon on June 26, 2012. The motion is continued to June 28, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by June 26, 2012. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (kti)
May 24, 2012 Filing 64 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA AND CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS #60 held before Judge George H Wu: The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Hearing is continued to May 31, 2012, at 8:30 am. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (jre)
May 17, 2012 Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re Non-Opposition to Motion, #62 served on 05/17/2012. (Garcia, Norma)
May 17, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Set Aside Lis Pendens Notice #59 (Expunge) MOTION to Set Aside Lis Pendens Notice #59 (Expunge) #60 filed by Defendants California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Garcia, Norma)
April 19, 2012 Filing 61 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Set Aside Lis Pendens Notice #59 (Expunge) MOTION to Set Aside Lis Pendens Notice #59 (Expunge) #60 filed by Defendants California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Garcia, Norma)
April 19, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Lis Pendens Notice #59 (Expunge) filed by Defendants California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 5/24/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Garcia, Norma)
April 19, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Defendants California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Garcia, Norma)
September 26, 2011 Filing 57 MINUTES OF Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank Bank N.A and Chase Home Finance LLC's Motion to dismiss third amended complaint filed 8/26/2011 #54 ; Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: Defendants motion to dismiss third amended complaint is GRANTED. The action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (pj)
September 23, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A's Notice of Non-Opposition to Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC. (Garcia, Norma)
September 19, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE OF CESSATION OF LAW PRACTICE OF PHILIP A KRAMER DBA LAW OFFICES OF KRAMER AND KASLOW filed by Plaintiffs (pj)
August 26, 2011 Filing 55 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint #54 filed by Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC. (Garcia, Norma)
August 26, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/26/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan Miller Overbey, #2 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Norma)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants, Chase Home Finance LLC, JPMorgan Chase, N.A. Have two additional weeks to respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint as of the date of the filing the Joint Stipulation between counsel for Plaintiffs' Thomas S. Feher and counsel for Defendants' Susan Overbey, Plaintiffs' will manually file and serve their Third Amended Complaint upon this granting of this Order by Judge George H Wu, (bp)
August 15, 2011 Filing 52 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #51 filed by Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC. (Garcia, Norma)
August 15, 2011 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Norma)
August 12, 2011 Filing 50 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND filed by plaintiff James Foti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order granting Defendants additional time to respond to TAC, #2 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint)(Kramer, Philip)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) by Judge George H Wu,, (bp)
August 5, 2011 Filing 48 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in its own capacity and as an acquirer of certain assets adn liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank, Chase Home Finance, LLC, and Does 1 through 1000, inclusive; Party Henry Glendon, Jeannine Hester, Stephan Jones, Paul Parks, Dondi Stephens, Harry Brian and California Reconveyance Company terminated; amending First Amended Complaint #1 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs. (gk) (pj).
August 4, 2011 Filing 46 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. The document is stricken. Counsel will have 24 hours from the date of entry of this response to manually file the Second Amended Complaint. RE: Amended Document (Non-Motion) #42 (pj)
August 4, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: (Second Amended Complaint) Amended Document (Non-Motion) #42 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s): Pursuant General Order 10-07 Initiating documents * are NOT to be e-filed, but Manually filed with Civil Intake Section and e-mail a conformed copy to(CivilIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov).. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj)
August 3, 2011 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendants Casas and Hipotecas, Long Beach Mortgage Company without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a) filed by plaintiff James Foti. (Kramer, Philip)
August 3, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Dismiss defendant California Reconveyance Company without prejudice purusant to FRCP 41(a) filed by plaintiff James Foti. (Kramer, Philip)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS LONG BEACH MORTGAGE COMPANY AND CASAS AND HIPOTECAS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULEOF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)by Judge George H Wu: The following defendants ONLY are voluntarily dismissed without prejudice by Plaintiffs: 1. Long Beach Mortgage Company, a California Corporation 2. Casas and Hipotecas, a California Corporation. This dismissal is made pursuant to F.R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Neither of the above-mentioned Defendants has made an appearance, filed an answer or summary judgment. (yl)
August 1, 2011 Filing 42 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff James Foti. Second Amended Complaint (Kramer, Philip) ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RESPONSE BY THE COURT FILED ON 8/4/20/11*** Modified on 8/5/2011 (pj).
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AS TO DEFENDANT WESTERN NATIONAL APPRAISALS by Judge George H Wu, re Joint Stipulation #38 . GOOD CAUSE appearing therefore, that the above-captioned action is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Capital Valley r/e Consultants, Inc. dba Western National Appraisals, only. (jp)
July 11, 2011 Filing 40 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed 05/05/11); PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR REMAND (filed OS/24/11); DEFENDANT CAPITAL VALLEY WE CONSULTANTS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) (filed 05/05/11); SCHEDULING CONFERENCE before Judge George H Wu: Court hears oral argument. The tentative circulated and attached hereto, is attached as the Court's final ruling. Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, is granted with leave to amend. Plaintiffs will have until 8/1/2011, to manually file the Second Amended Complaint. Defendant Capital Valley R/E Consultants, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP l2(b)(6) is deemed moot pursuant to the stipulation to dismiss filed on 7/7/2011. Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Remand, is denied without prejudice. The Scheduling Conference is vacated and taken off-calendar. Court Reporter: Mary Rickey. (jp)
July 11, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE of Entry of Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand Denied, Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss granted with leave to amend, Motion to Dismiss Western National Appraisals granted without prejudice filed by plaintiff James Foti. (Kramer, Philip)
July 7, 2011 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Western National Appraisals filed by plaintiff James Foti. Motion set for hearing on 7/12/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and stipulation)(Kramer, Philip)
June 30, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fontes. (Kramer, Philip)
June 30, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff Rory Muniz. (Kramer, Philip)
June 28, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 , MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint( Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu.) filed by defendant Western National Appraisals. (Sayer, Michael)
June 27, 2011 Filing 34 REPLY SUPPORT MOTION to AMEND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 #21 , MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Plaintiff James Foti. (Kramer, Philip)
June 27, 2011 Filing 33 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Garcia, Norma)
June 24, 2011 Filing 32 REQUEST to Dismiss plaintiff Aida Bolanos Herrera, Javier Bolanos Herrera, Millicent Haik, Ingrid Henderson, Christine Kwapnoski, David Wallace, John Wiley, Mary Zesiewicz filed by Plaintiff James Foti. (Kramer, Philip)
June 14, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Pendency of Action filed by Plaintiff John Dohoney. (Kramer, Philip)
June 14, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Pendency of Action filed by Plaintiff James Foti. (Kramer, Philip)
June 13, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE filed by defendant Western National Appraisals. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sayer, Michael)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: The Court, on its own motion, continues the following motions to July 11, 2011 at 8:30 a.m.: Defendant Capital Valley R/E Consultants, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #13 ; Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #15 ; and Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Remand #18 . Additionally, the Scheduling Conference, set for June 9, 2011, is continued to July 11, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. (jag)
June 6, 2011 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Garcia, Norma)
June 6, 2011 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Garcia, Norma)
May 31, 2011 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 #17 filed by Plaintiff James Foti. (Kramer, Philip)
May 26, 2011 Filing 24 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #13 filed by Plaintiff James Foti. (Kramer, Philip)
May 26, 2011 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT of Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiff James Foti. (Kramer, Philip)
May 26, 2011 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Defendant California Reconveyance Companyto Objections - non-motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #19 re Non-Monetary Status (Petersen, Shannon)
May 24, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Plaintiff James Foti. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Kramer, Philip)
May 23, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff James Foti. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Philip A. Kramer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Kramer, Philip)
May 23, 2011 Filing 19 OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS filed by Plaintiffs Norman Aaro, Jason Abbate, Patricia Ackerman, Glen Adams, Guadalupe Aguayo, Mumtaz Ahmed, James Aiken, Juan Francisco Alas Castro, Carlos Aldana, Robert Allen, Galo Almeida, Jose Amancio Ortiz, Allyson Ames, Sondra Ames, Dawn Amora, Daniel Anderson, Melanie Anderson, Rolande Andrade, Denice Arango, Judith Arias, Amir S Arif, Nora Arroyo, LeeAnn Atkins, Darryl Avery, Armando Balvanera, Genaro Barba, Maylo Barnuevo, Alexandru Bauer, Ronald Beauvoir, Andres Benavidez, Sherry Bilodeau, Aida Bolanos Herrera, Javier Bolanos Herrera, Albert Bonilla, Robert Booth, Patricia Boyce, John Boylan, Agnes Braxton, Harry Brian, Tracy Briles, Fernando Brodrick, Cynthia Brown, Dianne Brown, Georgia Brown, Linda Brueckner Ward, Brent Buckley, Al Burdich, William Burke, Steven Campanelli, Douglas Carlton, Kenneth Caron, Carlos Flores Carrillo, Lance Cassino, Alex Castellanos, Ruth Castro, Melody Chacker, Anita Chacko, Thomas Chalmers, Eugene Chavez, Tomas Chavez, Bradley Clark, Gail Clark, Dexter Clay, Sharon Clotfelter, Harold Coe, Dorothy Coletta, Arturo Concha, Cedric Cooper, John Cuddeback, David Cunningham, Ronnie Curteman, Mark Dahl, Deborah Davenport, Brian Davis, Harry Davis, Margina Davis, Mark Davison, Lawrence Day, Ozstar De Jourday, Lena De Jourday, Esteban De La Paz, Mario Del Rosario, Eleno Dela Cruz, George Delgado, Ignacio Delgado, Nicola Demichino, John Dohoney, Daniel Dorado, Karen Douglas, Jesus Duran, Marie Durocher, William Dynek, Jr, Zuzzette Echeverria, Steve Ehlers, Abelardo Elenes, Carlos Esquibel, Richard Evans, Don Farr, Louis Fisi, Victoria Fitzgerald, Jason Floyd, Antonio Fontes, James Foti, Nicole Francis, Lori Frank, Robert Frank, Scott Fredricey, Wayne Furr, Enid Futterman, Rolando Gallegos, Patrick Gannon, Luis Garcia, Oscar Garcia, Pedro Garcia, Aleyamma George, Paola Giaquinto, Henry Glendon, Michele Goldman, Eleanor Gomez, Edgart Gonzales, Silvestre Gonzales, Armando Granados, Randy Graves, Ari Gronich, George Grover, Douglas Gustafson, Stephan Haah, Millicent Haik, Terry Harner, Carole Harris, Thomas Hart, Barbara Henderson, Ingrid Henderson, Marisa Herrera, Eugene Hester, Jeannine Hester, Geoffrey Hinnen, Carol Holmes, Dizon Honorio, John Houston, Tracy Hua, Pu Huang, Roman Huber, Terri Hudson, Gilbert Inguez, Eric Iverson, Mohammed Izadi, Sandra Jackson, Rose Jacques, Darrell James, George Jarzombek, Kimball Johnson, Lucas Johnson, Ira Jones, Robert Jones, Stephan Jones, Stephan Jones, Maria Luisa Jovel, Peter Kachur, Gary Kalus, David Keech, Jesse Keiser, Jerome Kern, Randy Kerr, Wayne Kizziar, John Klemencic, Kim Klopcic, Debra Kottke, Robert Kozlowski, Janice Kressin, Christine Kwapnoski, Thomas Kyte, Deborah Lamb, Carmelita Laoyan, Jose Lara, Kim Lee, Argelina Leiva, Joel Liebke, Phillip Lindquist, Derrick Little, John Lockhart, Myriam Lonaker, Maria Lopez Sanchez, Holly Macintyre, Victoria Macklin, Annette Maddox, Martin Mandujano, Randall Manning, Pierre Marcotte, Burnett Margo, Marcelline Marin, David Martinez, Genevieve Martinez, Juan Maya, Suzanne M McCullough, Dane McDonald, Lorie McDonald, Grady McNeal, Aaron Meneses, Gilda Metzger, Alain Michael, Hattie Miles, Ilona Miller, Juan Montano, William Montez, Ralph Moody, Ralph Morgan, Jerry Lee Morris, Susan Mota, Rodney Mott, Saeed Movehead, Miguel Munguia, Rory Muniz, Connor Murray, Kelly Musselman, Chris Nagel, Paul Nance, James Nardi, Remigio Navarette, Leo Newton, Dat Thanh Ngo, Kom Chris Ngoy, Anhtuyet Nguyen, Tiffanie Nguyen, Michael Nierhake, Gery Noel, Parker Noel, Daniel Norbert, Dan Nowak, Karen Nussbaumer, Juan Ocampo, Peter Oh, Teresita Orcini, Jose Ortiz Hodges, Manuel Pacheco, Mark Palmer, Lily Park, Ken Parker, Paul Parks, Elizabeth Pasion, Gerald Paul, Raymond Payne, Earl Pedford, Sizelda Peirce, Miguel Peralta, Ernesto Perezalonso, John Perry, Gerald Peterson, Jon Peterson, Kathy Peterson, Wanda Petlock, Kenneth Petticolas, Carolyn D Phillips, Dean Pickard, Ronald Piconke, Maria Pitagora, Rosa Pliego, Chauncey Pope, Anne Prescott, Thomas Prewitt, William Protzmann, Theresa Quinones, Ronan Rahaman, Mirna Rahman, Ronald Rau, Margaret Reckley, Christopher Reid, George Renz, Carl Reynolds, William Ribas, Daniel Richard, Alice Ritson, Danette Roberts, William Robledo, Albino Rodriguez, Asencion Rodriguez, Fanny Rodriguez, Luis Rodriguez, Roes, Guy Rogers, Romeo Roldan, Robert Rotstan, Salvatore Russo, Victor Sabino, Jesus Salas, Mario Saldana, Sergio Salgado, Mohamed Ayub Samidon, Gerardo Sanchez, Julio Sanchez, Reginald Santiago, Dominique Sauveur Exume, Virignia Schneider, Robert Schoenfeld, Christopher Schroeder, Roy Schuler, George Seeley, Dinesh Shah, Kennith Shue, Marguerite Simms, Dawn Simpson, John Simpson, Sharon Simpson, Joseph Skogen, Teri Sloan, Tyler Smithson, Armando Solares, Olga Sorokin, Karen Splain, Thomas Stamatis, Robert Stanton, Jonathan Startz, Joseph Steiber, Dondi Stephens, James Stephens, William Stocker, Erin Stokes, Angela Storm, Donna Streier, Tanya Styron, S. Francisco Tacoaman, Jackie Tan, Oswaldo Tapia, Delane Tarra, Daniel Taylor, Eva Thielk, Kerry Torres, Daniel Trejo, Manuel Trejo, Thuan Bich Truong, Van Truong, Shokoh Vakhshourpour, Art Valentine, Jose Vargas, Abel Vazquez, Rodrigo Venegas, James Verga, David Verlinden, Roland Violette, Paul Vohariwatt, Raymond Walker, Thomas Walker, David Wallace, Kristy Wallace, Mallory Warren, Stephen Wayne, Roy G Weatherup, Wendy G Weatherup, Lucy Webster, John Wiley, Lynette Williams, Marlo Williamson, Thomas Williamson, Richard Wilson, Sheryl Wilson, Melvern Wiltz, Monique Winters, Norman Wolf, Gordon Woody, Kathleen Woody, John Worley, Rodney Wright, Bart Wrobel, Mary Zesiewicz, Vidmantas Zinkevicius, Greg Zuchowski, Jose Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Philip A. Kramer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kramer, Philip)
May 23, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff James Foti. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Philip A. Kramer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties)(Kramer, Philip)
May 11, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant California Reconveyance Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Petersen, Shannon)
May 11, 2011 Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H Wu: ORDER RE PROCEDURAL DEFECT-BASED REMAND MOTION (see document for details) (jag)
May 10, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan Miller Overbey, #2 Exhibit 1 to Overbey Decl., #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Shannon)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: granting #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Susan Miller Overbey on behalf of Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC and California Reconveyance Company, designating Norma V. Garcia as local counsel. (lt)
May 5, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Western National Appraisals. Motion set for hearing on 6/16/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Sayer, Michael)
May 4, 2011 Filing 12 APPLICATION for attorney Susan Miller Overbey to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-8601072 paid.) filed by DEFENDANTS California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Norma)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for June 9, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report and a Notice of Settlement Procedure Selection Form ADR-1 shall be filed with the Court not later than May 26, 2011. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to all parties that have appeared in this action, and is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (pj)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (Refer to attached document for details). (lom)
April 28, 2011 Filing 9 Certification of Interested Parties filed by defendant Western National Appraisals, (Sayer, Michael)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 08-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV11-03487 GW (JCx). (at)
April 22, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Susan Overbey for Defendants California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-ResidentAttorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (car)
April 22, 2011 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Home Finance, LLC, re Notice of Removal, #1 , California Reconveyance Company's Joinder #4 , Western National Appraisal's Joinder #5 , Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #2 , Civil Cover Sheet served on 4/22/11. (car) (mg).
April 22, 2011 Filing 5 Western National Appraisal's Joinder and Consent to Notice of Removal, #1 (car) (mg).
April 22, 2011 Filing 4 California Reconveyance Company's Joinder and Consent to Notice of Removal, #1 (car) Modified on 4/27/2011 (car). (mg).
April 22, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed.(car)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase and Co., Other Affiliate Chase Home Finance, Inc. for Chase Home Finance, LLC; Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase and Co. for California Reconveyance Company, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (car) (mg).
April 22, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court State of CA County of Los Angeles, case number BC 455629 with Unconformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID), filed by Defendants California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (car) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2011: #1 Exhibit 1 PART 1, #2 Exhibit 1 PART 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Foti et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Foti
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Aiken
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Davison
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Palmer
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir S Arif
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Abbate
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Aaro
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ackerman
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Adams
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Aguayo
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mumtaz Ahmed
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Aldana
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Allen
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galo Almeida
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Amancio Ortiz
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondra Ames
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyson Ames
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Anderson
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Anderson
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Amora
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolande Andrade
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Arias
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denice Arango
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Arroyo
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeeAnn Atkins
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Avery
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Balvanera
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genaro Barba
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maylo Barnuevo
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandru Bauer
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Beauvoir
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Benavidez
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Bilodeau
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aida Bolanos Herrera
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Bolanos Herrera
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Bonilla
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Booth
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Boyce
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Boylan
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Braxton
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Briles
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Brodrick
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Brown
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Brown
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Brown
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Brueckner Ward
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Buckley
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Burdich
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Burke
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burnett Margo
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Campanelli
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Carlton
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Caron
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Cassino
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Castellanos
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Francisco Alas Castro
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Castro
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Chacker
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Chacko
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Chalmers
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Chavez
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Chavez
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Clark
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Clark
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Clay
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Clotfelter
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Coletta
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Coe
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Concha
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Cooper
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cuddeback
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Curteman
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cunningham
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Dahl
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Norbert
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Davenport
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Davis
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Brian
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Davis
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margina Davis
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Day
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Floyd
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Fredricey
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozstar De Jourday
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena De Jourday
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Del Rosario
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleno Dela Cruz
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban De La Paz
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Delgado
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Delgado
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicola Demichino
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dohoney
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dorado
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Douglas
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Duran
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Durocher
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dynek, Jr
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuzzette Echeverria
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Flores Carrillo
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Ehlers
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abelardo Elenes
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Esquibel
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Evans
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Farr
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Fisi
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Fitzgerald
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fontes
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Francis
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Frank
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Frank
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enid Futterman
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Furr
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Gallegos
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Gannon
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Garcia
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Garcia
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Garcia
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleyamma George
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Giaquinto
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Goldman
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Gomez
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvestre Gonzales
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgart Gonzales
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Granados
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Graves
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ari Gronich
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Grover
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Gustafson
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Haah
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millicent Haik
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Harner
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Harris
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hart
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Henderson
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Henderson
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Glendon
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa Herrera
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Hester
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannine Hester
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Hinnen
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Holmes
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dizon Honorio
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Houston
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Hua
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pu Huang
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Huber
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Hudson
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Inguez
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Iverson
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Jackson
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Jacques
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell James
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jarzombek
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimball Johnson
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Johnson
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Jones
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Jones
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jones
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Luisa Jovel
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Kachur
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Kalus
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Keech
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Keiser
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Kern
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Kerr
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Kizziar
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Klemencic
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Klopcic
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Kottke
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kozlowski
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Kressin
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Kwapnoski
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kyte
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lamb
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelita Laoyan
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lara
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Lee
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argelina Leiva
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Liebke
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Lindquist
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Little
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lockhart
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myriam Lonaker
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lopez Sanchez
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Macintyre
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Macklin
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Maddox
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Mandujano
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Manning
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Marcotte
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelline Marin
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Martinez
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Martinez
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Maya
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne M McCullough
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Izadi
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane McDonald
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorie McDonald
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grady McNeal
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Meneses
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilda Metzger
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alain Michael
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie Miles
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilona Miller
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Montano
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Montez
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Moody
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Morgan
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Morris
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Mota
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Mott
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saeed Movehead
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Munguia
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory Muniz
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Murray
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Musselman
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Nagel
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Nance
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nardi
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remigio Navarette
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Newton
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dat Thanh Ngo
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kom Chris Ngoy
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anhtuyet Nguyen
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffanie Nguyen
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nierhake
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gery Noel
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker Noel
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Nowak
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Nussbaumer
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ocampo
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Oh
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresita Orcini
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ortiz Hodges
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Pacheco
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lily Park
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Parker
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Parks
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Pasion
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Paul
Represented By: Philip Allen Kramer
Represented By: Thomas S Feher
Represented By: Blithe C Leece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [