Courthouse News Service v. Michael Planet Featured Case

Plaintiff: Courthouse News Service
Defendant: Michael Planet
Amicus Curiae: The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al
Case Number: 2:2011cv08083
Filed: September 29, 2011
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
1 Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 231 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 16-55977, 16-56714. Courthouse News Service v. Yamasaki, No. 17-56331 is consolidated with Courthouse News Service v. Planet, No. 16-55977, for purposes of oral argument before this panel. An order scheduling oral argument will issue at a later date. In view of the foregoing, Courthouse News Services motion to expedite the proceedings in No. 16-55977 is DENIED as moot. (car)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 230 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal #225 filed by Michael Planet, Notice of Appeal #218 filed by Courthouse News Service, and Notice of Appeal #201 filed by Michael Planet. CCA # 16-55977, 16-56862 and 16-56714. Pursuant to the stipulation filed by the parties (Docket Entry No. 20), appeal No. 16-56862 is voluntarily dismissed. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court as to No. 16-56862 only. (mat)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 229 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF FEE ORDER PENDING RESOLUTION OF CONSOLIDATED NINTH CIRCUIT APPEALS #228 by Judge S. James Otero: 1. CNS shall stay any enforcement of the Fee Order pending full and final resolution of the consolidated appeals now before the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit (which includes any petitions seeking rehearing or review by the United States Supreme Court), in exchange for VSC having secured an appropriate bond covering the amount awarded in the Fee Order. 2. VSC shall dismiss its cross-appeal of the Fee Order (Appeal No. 16-56862) within 5 court days of the date of this Order being filed. (lc)
March 29, 2017 228 STIPULATION for Order Approving Stipulation to Stay Enforcement of Fee Order Pending Resolution of Consolidated Ninth Circuit Appeals filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Stay Enforcement of Fee Order Pending Resolution of Consolidated Ninth Circuit Appeals)(Reilley, Erica)
January 24, 2017 227 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Related Case(s): 8:17-CV-126 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
December 19, 2016 226 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 16-56862 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #225 as to Defendant Michael Planet. (car)
December 16, 2016 225 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Michael Planet. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, #212 , Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #219 , Order on Request for Order, #223 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19070945.) (Reilley, Erica)
November 29, 2016 224 First AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #218 Filed On: November 15, 2016; Entered On: November 16, 2016; (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order 223 ORDER CORRECTING CLERICAL ERROR OR MISTAKE IN ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION #221 by Judge S. James Otero: The Reconsideration Order is hereby corrected to reflect that CNS, as the prevailing party in this action, is awarded reasonable attorneys fees in the amount of $2,065,752.80 and costs in the amount of $52,893.98, for a total amount of $2,118,647, rounded to the nearest dollar. (lc)
November 21, 2016 222 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document, #221 . pdf was a request to correct clerical error on an order. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Request: Order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 21, 2016 221 REQUEST UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 60(a) TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR OR MISTAKE IN ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, #212 #213 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) Modified on 11/23/2016 (lc).
November 16, 2016 220 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 16-56714 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #218 as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (mat)
November 16, 2016 219 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION #213 . The Court AWARDS Courthouse News Service an additional $160,729.63 in attorneys' fees, for a total award of attorneys' fees and costs of $2,065,753.00 rounded to the nearest dollar. (lc)
November 15, 2016 218 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, #212 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18892122.) (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
November 14, 2016 217 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, #212 #213 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
November 7, 2016 216 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, #212 #213 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Reilley, Erica)
October 31, 2016 215 NOTICE of Change of address by Rachel E Matteo-Boehm attorney for Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Changing attorneys address to 3 Embarcadero Center, 7th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. Filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
October 31, 2016 214 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, #212 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Correcting Clerical Error or Mistake in Order Granting in Part Motion of Plaintiff to Set Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
October 31, 2016 213 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, #212 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Motion set for hearing on 11/28/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Motion for Reconsideration in Part of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Set Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #2 Declaration of Jonathan G. Fetterly ISO Motion for Reconsideration in Part of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Set Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion of Plaintiff for Reconsideration in Part of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Set Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs) (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order 212 MINUTES(in chambers): ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET AMOUNT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Judge S. James Otero. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS IN PART Plaintiff Courthouse News Service's Motion to Set Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs. The Court AWARDS Courthouse News Service, as the prevailing party in this action, reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $1,905,023.17 and costs in the amount of $2,370.01, for a total amount of $1,907,393.18. Defendant Michael Planet, in his official capacity as Court Executive Officer and Clerk of theVentura County Superior Court, shall pay that sum to CNS no later than thirty (30) days after entry of this order. Plaintiff Courthouse News Service shall file a proposed judgment consistent with this Order that addresses the claims in this action within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
October 10, 2016 211 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. correcting Declaration (Motion related), #207 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Fetterly, Jonathan)
October 10, 2016 210 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees (to Set Amount of Fees and Costs) #206 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Matteo-Boehm, #2 Declaration of Jonathan F. Fetterly, #3 Declaration of Richard M. Pearl, #4 Declaration of Julianna Krolak, #5 Response to Def's Objections to Evid ISO Pl's Mot to Set Amt of Atty Fees and Costs, #6 Objections of Pl to Evidence Submitted by Def IOT Pl's Mot to Set Amt of Atty Fees and Costs, #7 Proposed Order on Objections of Pl to Evid Submitted by Def IOT Pl's Mot to Set Amt of Atty Fees and Costs)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
September 26, 2016 209 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees (to Set Amount of Fees and Costs) #206 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Reilley Decl., #2 Stiefel Decl., #3 Evidentiary Objections, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service)(Reilley, Erica)
September 12, 2016 208 EXHIBIT 32-2 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees (to Set Amount of Fees and Costs) #206 to Declaration of Rachel Matteo-Boehm #207 in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
September 12, 2016 207 DECLARATION of Rachel Matteo-Boehm in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees (to Set Amount of Fees and Costs) #206 and Exhibits 1 - 32-1 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 - 31, #2 Exhibit 32-1)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
September 12, 2016 206 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees (to Set Amount of Fees and Costs) filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of W. Girdner, #3 Declaration of J. Ewert, #4 Declaration of J. Fetterly, #5 Declaration of R. Pearl, #6 Proposed Order) (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order 205 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES MOTION HEARING DATE, BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS #203 by Judge S. James Otero. The Court orders as follows: 1. The hearing on CNS' Motion for Attorneys' Fees ("Motion") shall be October 24, 2016, at 10:00 a.m.; 2. The Motion shall be filed on or before September 12, 2016; 3. Any opposition papers shall be filed on or before September 26, 2016; 4. Any reply papers shall be filed on or before October 10, 2016; 5. Opening and opposing memoranda shall not exceed 25 pages in length. Reply memoranda shall not exceed 10 pages in length. (lom)
August 2, 2016 204 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in the amount of $20,730.81 in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant Michael Planet #200 (nl)
August 1, 2016 203 STIPULATION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fetterly, Jonathan)
July 8, 2016 202 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-55977, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #201 as to defendant Michael Planet. (mat)
July 8, 2016 201 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Michael Planet. Appeal of Judgment, #199 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18154284.) (Reilley, Erica)
June 27, 2016 200 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant Michael Planet filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Knox, Leila)
June 14, 2016 199 JUDGMENT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFCOURTHOUSE NEWS SERVICE AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL PLANET AND AWARD COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS) by Judge S. James Otero. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc)
June 13, 2016 198 RESPONSE TO DEF'S OBJECTIONS TO PL'S [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF COURTHOUSE NEWS SERVICE AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL PLANET re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
June 13, 2016 197 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging, #196 Proposed Judgment filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Reilley, Erica)
June 6, 2016 196 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #195 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment for Declaratory Relief and Permanent Injunction in Favor of Plaintiff Courthouse News Service and Against Defendant Michael Planet)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order 195 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #119 ; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #163 by Judge S. James Otero: Plaintiff Courthouse News Service shall file a proposed judgment consistent with this Order that addresses the claims in this action within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this Order.(SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (vv)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order 194 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES ARE VACATED IN LIGHT OF PENDING CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #193 by Judge S. James Otero (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS). (lc)
April 22, 2016 193 STIPULATION for Court Trial, Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Trial Date And Deadlines In Light Of Pending Cross MSJ filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fetterly, Jonathan)
April 13, 2016 192 The Court finds the following motions suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. #119 and the MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Michael Planet. #163 , set for hearing on April 18, 2016. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 11, 2016 191 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 Defendant's Response to Objections of Plaintiff to Reply Evidence Submitted by Defendant in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Reilley, Erica)
April 11, 2016 190 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 Defendant's Responses to Objections of Plaintiff Courthouse News Service to the Evidence Submitted by Defendant in Opposition to CNS's Motion for SummaryJudgment filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Reilley, Erica)
April 7, 2016 189 Objection in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 Reply Evidence Submitted By Def filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
April 7, 2016 188 Response in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
April 6, 2016 187 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: The Court convened a settlement conference in this matter. The parties did not reach a settlement. (jm)
April 6, 2016 186 Objection re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 Re Def's Response To Pl's Stmt Of Genuine Disputes Of Fact And Disputed Conclusions Of Law filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
April 4, 2016 185 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Opp to CNS's Evidentiary Objections ISO MSJ, #2 Opp to CNS's Statement of Additional Material Facts, #3 Evidentiary Objections to CNS's Evidence Submitted in Opposition to Motion, #4 Compendium of Exhibits (W-X) and Decls., #5 Reply to CNS's Response to SUF, #6 Proposed Order Granting VSC's MSJ, #7 Denying CNS's MSJ)(Reilley, Erica)
April 4, 2016 184 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. correcting Reply (Motion related),, #183 Objs. to Def's Evidence Submitted [183-6] (Attachments: #1 Pl's Objs. to Def's Evidence Submitted, #2 Proposed Order on Objections to Def's Evidence Submitted)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
April 4, 2016 183 REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Willliam Girdner, #2 Reply Declaration of Julianna Krolak, #3 Reply Declaration of Milton Policzer, #4 Reply Declaration of Jonathan Fetterly, #5 Reply Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Objections to Def's Evidence Submitted, #7 Proposed Order on Objections to Def's Evidence Submitted, #8 Pl's Response to Def's Objs. to Evidence Submitted)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 28, 2016 182 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Decls. and Exs. ISO Opp. to Pl.'s MSJ, #2 Opposition to Pl.'s SUF, #3 Evidentiary Objections)(Reilley, Erica)
March 28, 2016 181 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order Denying Defendant's re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 28, 2016 180 DECLARATION of Jonathan G. Fetterly in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 28, 2016 179 DECLARATION of Julianna Krolak in Support of Opposition to Defendant's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 with Exhibits 1-4 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-30)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 28, 2016 178 OBJECTIONS to the Evidence Submitted by Defendant in Support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 28, 2016 177 STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Fact and Disputed Conclusions of Law In Support of Opposition to Defendant's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 28, 2016 176 STATEMENT of Additional Material Facts Submitted in Opposition to Defendant's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 28, 2016 175 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order 174 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: The Court is in receipt of (1) Plaintiff Courthouse News Service's ("CNS") Objection to Defendant Michael Planet, in his official capacity as Court Executive Officer/Clerk of the Ventura County Superior Court late filing of VSC's motion for summary judgment ; (2) VSC's opposition and response thereto ; and (3) CNS's reply in support of the Objection. Given the lack of prejudice indicated by CNS and the importance of the parties' summary judgment motions to their respective cases, the Court will not strike Planet's motion. The Court likewise declines VSC's invitation in its Response to extend the opposition, reply, and hearing dates for the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. Any opposition briefs must be filed by no later than 4:00pm today, March 28, 2016, and any reply briefs must be filed by no later than 4:00pm Monday, April 4, 2016. (lc)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order 173 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF THE REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS AND 12 OTHER NEWS MEDIA ORGANIZATIONS TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF #171 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
March 21, 2016 172 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief #171 . The following error(s) was found: It is unclear as to how many parties are represented. Attorney did not specify the entire group of parties for whom the motion to file amicus brief was filed, only names one and the remainder as "et al". or "12 other media organizations". The 12 organizations are named on page 2, paragraph 1. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 21, 2016 171 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Unredacted Document Proposed amicus brief) (Attorney KatieLynn Townsend added to party The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al(pty:am)) (Townsend, KatieLynn)
March 18, 2016 170 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #167 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Errata. To find the correct efiling event, use the search feature for: Errata. Any request must be submitted as a separate document, with a [Prop] Order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
March 15, 2016 169 REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S LATE-FILED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 15, 2016 168 OPPOSITION Response to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service's Objection to Defendant's Late-Filed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Reilley, Erica)
March 15, 2016 167 NOTICE of ERRATA filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. re Docket Entries Nos. 140 and 141 (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 15, 2016 166 OBJECTION Defendant's late-filing re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 165 EXHIBIT M to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M part 1, #2 Exhibit M part 2, #3 Exhibit M part 3, #4 Exhibit M part 4, #5 Exhibit M part 5, #6 Exhibit M part 6, #7 Exhibit M part 7)(Naeve, Robert)
March 14, 2016 164 EXHIBIT A-L to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #163 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Declarations and Exhibits A-B, #2 Exhibit C-E, #3 Exhibit F-I, #4 Exhibit J-L)(Naeve, Robert)
March 14, 2016 163 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Michael Planet. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Proposed Order) (Naeve, Robert)
March 14, 2016 162 EXHIBIT 16-21 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 to Declaration of Jonathan Fetterly filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 161 EXHIBIT 11-15 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 to Declaration of Jonathan Fetterly filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 160 EXHIBIT 6-10 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 to Declaration of Jonathan Fetterly filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 159 DECLARATION of Jonathan Fetterly in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 158 INDEX OF DECLARATIONS FILED re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 157 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 156 DECLARATION of Ryan Abbott in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 155 DECLARATION of Tracey Walsh in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 154 DECLARATION of Theodore Wheeler in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 153 DECLARATION of Sergio Frez in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 152 DECLARATION of Sabrina Canfield in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 151 DECLARATION of Rebekah Kearn in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 150 DECLARATION of Patrick Pemberton in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 149 DECLARATION of Nick Divito in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 148 DECLARATION of Nick Cahill in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 147 DECLARATION of Molly Willms in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 146 DECLARATION of Milton Policzer in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 145 DECLARATION of Christina "Madison" Venza in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 144 DECLARATION of Kevin Lessmiller in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 143 DECLARATION of Karina Brown in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 142 DECLARATION of June Williams in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 141 DECLARATION of Jamie Ross in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 140 DECLARATION of Jamie Ross in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 139 DECLARATION of Jacqueline Holness in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 138 DECLARATION of Gina Carrano in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 137 DECLARATION of David Tartre in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 136 DECLARATION of David Lee in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 135 DECLARATION of Christine Stuart in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 134 DECLARATION of Cameron Langford in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 133 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Warmerdam in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 132 DECLARATION of Andrew Olesko in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 131 DECLARATION of Adam Angione in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 130 EXHIBIT 14-32 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 to Declaration of Julianna Krolak in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 18-24, #2 Exhibits 25-32)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 129 EXHIBIT 7-13 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 to Declaration of Julianna Krolak in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 10-13)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 128 DECLARATION of Julianna Krolak in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 6-6)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 127 DECLARATION of Christopher Marshall in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 126 EXHIBIT 19-22 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 to Declaration of William Girdner in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 20-22)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 125 EXHIBIT 13-18 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 to Declaration of William Girdner in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 14-17, #2 Exhibit 18)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 124 DECLARATION of William Girdner in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 4-10, #2 Exhibits 11-12)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 123 DECLARATION of Pamela MacLean in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 122 DECLARATION of Skip Rimer in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 121 DECLARATION of Jeff Sturgeon in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 120 DECLARATION of Robert Drechsel in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction #119 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 3-8)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 14, 2016 119 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to declaratory relief and permanent injunction filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Judgment, #5 Declaration of Roger Myers re L.R. 7-3 Conference) (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order 118 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for settlement proceedings. A Settlement Conference will be held on April 6, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. No later than (one week prior to settlement conference day), each party shall submit a Confidential Settlement Conference Statement directly to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Mumm. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mz)
February 15, 2016 Opinion or Order 117 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS HEARING DATE,BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS #114 by Judge S. James Otero: The hearing on the parties cross motions for summary judgment shall be April 18, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. The Motions shall be filed on or before March 14, 2016. Any opposition papers shall be filed on or before March 28, 2016. Any reply papers shall be filed on or before April 4, 2016. Opening and opposing memoranda shall not exceed 25 pages in length. Reply memoranda shall not exceed 10 pages in length. (lc)
February 11, 2016 116 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: plaintiffs Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #115 . The following error(s) was found: Title page and its LR 11-3.8 required information is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 10, 2016 115 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, re Stipulation for Hearing #114 re Summary Judgment Motions served on 2/10/2016. (Fetterly, Jonathan)
February 10, 2016 114 STIPULATION for Hearing re Summary Judgment Motions filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fetterly, Jonathan)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order 113 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm re Stipulation for Protective Order #112 : (see attached) (jm)
January 21, 2016 112 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Courthouse News Service Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order)(Fetterly, Jonathan)
December 7, 2015 111 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Frederick B Hayes counsel for Defendant Michael Planet. Changing Address & Firm Name to Hayes Law Office 2447 Pacific Coast Highway, 2nd Floor, Hermosa Beach, CA 90254. Changing email & Fax to Fred.Hayes@hayeslawoffice.net (310) 388-0310. Filed by Defendant Michael Plant. (Hayes, Frederick)
October 24, 2015 110 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed. RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant Michael Planet #96 (nl)
October 22, 2015 109 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as CV11-08083 SJO (FFMx). (mg)
October 8, 2015 108 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/21/15 8:39 a.m. re Transcript #107 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Zurborg, Carol) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 8, 2015 107 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/21/15 8:39 a.m. Court Reporter: Carol Jean Zurborg, phone number (213) 894-3539. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2016. (Zurborg, Carol)
September 24, 2015 106 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff, Courthouse News Service Courthouse News Service Court Reporter. Court will contact Jonathan Fetterly at jon.fetterly@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Request Scheduling Conference Held on 9/21/15. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Fetterly, Jonathan)
September 21, 2015 105 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge S. James Otero : The Court sets the following schedule: last date to amended: 10/21/15; discovery cutoff: 3/21/16 ; motion hearing cutoff: 4/25/16 10:00 AM; pretrial conference: 6/6/16 9:00 AM; Court trial: 6/21/16 9:00 AM. The Court limits each side to four motions in limine. Settlement is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings. All discovery dispute to be brought before the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case; parties reminded of requirements of FRCP 26-1(a); counsel are advised all pretrial documents (as listed) must be filed in compliance with Courts Initial Standing order. Court Reporter: Carol Zuborg. (lc)
September 18, 2015 104 Plaintiff's Completed Schedule Form filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
September 4, 2015 103 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before Hon. Margaret A. Nagle for settlement proceedings. Filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service.(Fetterly, Jonathan)
September 4, 2015 102 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14 days, filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service.. (Fetterly, Jonathan)
August 28, 2015 101 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #100 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
August 28, 2015 100 ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by defendant Michael Planet.(Naeve, Robert)
August 12, 2015 99 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, Defendant's Answer shall be filed by Friday, 8/28/2015. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 10, 2015 98 NOTICE of Association of Counsel Filed by Defendant Michael Planet (Attorney Frederick B Hayes added to party Michael Planet(pty:dft))(Hayes, Frederick)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order 97 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero. This case having been returned on a mandate from the 9th CCA, reversing and remanding the Courts decision, the Court Orders this matter statistically reopened. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (lom)
August 4, 2015 96 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant Michael Planet filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Knox, Leila)
July 24, 2015 95 NOTICE filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Notice of Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order 94 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/7/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
July 23, 2015 93 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #92 Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge S. James Otero (re-assigned) served on 07/23/2015. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order 92 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
July 23, 2015 91 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE upon Receipt of Mandate filed. This case having been returned on a mandate from the 9th CCA, reversing and remanding the decision of Judge Manuel L. Real and requiring judicial action, this case has been reassigned to Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Case number will now read CV11-08083 SJO (MANx). (mg)
July 21, 2015 90 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #83 , CCA # 14-56444. The judgment of this Court, entered June 23, 2015, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellee in the amount of $865.80. (car)
June 23, 2015 89 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #83 filed by Courthouse News Service. CCA # 14-56444. REVERSED and REMANDED with instructions to the Clerk to assignto a different district court judge. (mat)
October 20, 2014 87 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/18/2014 10am re Transcript #86 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Kleeger, Sheri) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 20, 2014 86 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/18/2014 10am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SHERI KLEEGER, phone number 213-894-6604. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2015. (Kleeger, Sheri)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order 88 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #83 filed by Courthouse News Service, CCA # 14-56444. This panel will accept this appeal, and the motion is granted. Further, appellant's motion to expedite the appeal is granted. Brief schedules have been set. Order received in this district on 10/17/14. [See document for details] (mat)
September 15, 2014 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service Court Reporter. Court will contact Leila Knox at leila.knox@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - August 18, 2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Knox, Leila)
September 4, 2014 84 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 14-56444, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #83 as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (mat)
September 4, 2014 83 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Appeal of Order, #82 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14395413 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Order Granting MTD-08-28-14, #2 Exhibit 2-Representation Statement)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court hereby GRANTS VSC's motion to dismiss CNS's Amended Complaint in its entirety with prejudice. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (bp)
August 27, 2014 81 OBJECTION in opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #61 to Defendant's [Proposed] Memorandum and Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #80 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
August 26, 2014 80 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT re Order on Motion to Dismiss, Motion Hearing,, #78 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order /MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Naeve, Robert)
August 21, 2014 79 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Michael Planet Court Reporter. Court will contact Susan Ballard at sballard@jonesday.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motion Hearing. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Reilley, Erica)
August 18, 2014 78 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: RE Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint #61 .The Court GRANTS Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for reasons as stated on the record. Counsel shall lodge the proposed order consistent with this Courts ruling.Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger.(MD JS-6. Case Terminated (lc)
August 8, 2014 77 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Updated Proposed] Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint re MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #61 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-[Updated Proposed] Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
August 8, 2014 76 REPLY in Support of Request for Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
August 8, 2014 75 Objection in opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #61 Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
August 8, 2014 74 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #61 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2 Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit 1-2 Part 2 of 2)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
August 6, 2014 73 NOTICE OF FILING OF UPDATED PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Naeve, Robert)
August 4, 2014 72 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #61 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to RJN)(Naeve, Robert)
August 4, 2014 71 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Michael Planetto Request for Judicial Notice #67 (Naeve, Robert)
August 4, 2014 70 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #61 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Naeve, Robert)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order 69 ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that this action is hereby placed on calendar for FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on NOVEMBER 24, 2014 AT 11:00 A.M. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before NOVEMBER 3, 2014, which date will also serve as the discovery cut-off date in this action. There is no Motion Cut-Off Date set. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER shall be lodged with this Court on or before NOVEMBER 17, 2014. JURY TRIAL DATE is set as DECEMBER 16, 2014 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch)
July 21, 2014 68 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #66 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
July 21, 2014 67 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-20, #3 Exhibit 21-30, #4 Exhibit 31-41)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
July 21, 2014 66 Opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #61 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
July 17, 2014 65 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel E Matteo-Boehm on behalf of Plaintiff Courthouse News Service (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order 64 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MOTION HEARING DATE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Manuel L. Real, re Stipulation for Hearing, #63 , The June 30, 2014 Stipulation to Continue Motion Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule is approved. As such, it is hereby ORDERED that the hearing onDefendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Dkt. 61) is continued to August 18, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Any opposition to the Motion to Dismiss AmendedComplaint shall be due on or before July 21, 2014, and any reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint shall be due on or before August 4, 2014.PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. (pj)
June 30, 2014 63 STIPULATION for Hearing re MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #61 filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Motion Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule)(Fetterly, Jonathan)
June 30, 2014 62 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Michael Planet. correcting MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #61 with attached Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Naeve, Robert)
June 24, 2014 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by defendant Michael Planet. Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss)(Naeve, Robert)
June 19, 2014 60 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14 days, filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service.. (Fetterly, Jonathan)
June 5, 2014 59 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 467.00 in favor of Court house News Services and against Michael Planet. RE: #51 (mb)
June 3, 2014 58 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Planet, in his capacity as Court executive Officer/Clerk of the Ventura County Superior Court Michael Planet amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order 57 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #56 . IT ISORDERED that Plaintiff Courthouse News Services Amended Complaint ForDeclaratory and Injunctive Relief shall be filed in this action. Plaintiff Courthouse News Service SHALL FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE CLERKS OFFICE FILING PROCEDURES forthwith. Any answer orresponsive pleading shall be due on or before twenty-one days from the filing of theAmended Complaint. (pj)
May 28, 2014 56 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Amended Complaint), #2 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order 55 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) PURSUANT TO U.S.C.A. 9TH CIRCUIT MANDATE by Judge Manuel L. Real. Pursuant to the Mandate of the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is reopened, and the action shall proceed pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and this Court's Order Re: Notice to Counsel. Any answer or responsive pleading shall be due on or before twenty-one (21) days from the date of this minute order. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (cch)
May 12, 2014 54 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan G Fetterly counsel for Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Adding Jonathan G. Fetterly as attorney as counsel of record for Courthouse News Service for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Courthouse New Service. (Fetterly, Jonathan)
May 12, 2014 53 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan G Fetterly counsel for Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. David Allen Greene is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attorney Jonathan G Fetterly added to party Courthouse News Service(pty:pla))(Fetterly, Jonathan)
May 2, 2014 51 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against defendant Michael Planet filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Application set for hearing on 5/22/2014 at 11:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
April 30, 2014 52 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #40 , CCA # 11-57187. The Judgement of the District Court is REVERSED and REMANDED so that the First Amendment issues presented by this case may be adjudicated on the merits in federal court, where they belong. Mandate received in this district on 4/30/14. (mat)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order 50 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #40 filed by Courthouse News Service, CCA # 11-57187. This case is submitted as of the date of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Order received in this district on 4/7/14. (mat)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order 49 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #40 filed by Courthouse News Service, CCA # 11-57187. This appeal is referred to the Ninth Circuit Mediation Program to explore a possible resolution of the appeal through mediation. Submission is vacated until further order of this court. The mediator shall report to the court every thirty (30) days as to the status of the mediation. The mediation unit shall contact the parties directly to confer. IT IS SO ORDERED. Order received in this district on 5/13/13. (mat)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order 48 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #40 filed by Courthouse News Service CCA # 11-57187. Courthouse News Services Request for Judicial Notice is granted. Order received in this district on 5/7/2013. (dmap)
January 9, 2012 47 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 11/28/2011 to 11/28/2011 re: Court of Appeal case number 11-57187, as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service Court Reporter Theresa Lanza. Civil Appeal, Court will contact Leila Knox at leila.knox@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 11/28/2011 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss/Preliminary Injunction. Civil case appeal. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
January 9, 2012 46 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 11/28/2011; Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza; Court of Appeals Case Number: 11-57187; Re: #40 (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
January 4, 2012 45 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Monday, 11-28-11; 10:59 AM (Lanza, Theresa)
January 4, 2012 44 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, 11-28-11; 10:59 AM. Court Reporter Theresa Lanza, phone number www.theresalanza.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2012. (Lanza, Theresa)
January 3, 2012 43 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #40 as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service; Receipt Number: LA0033328 in the amount of $455. (dmap)
January 3, 2012 42 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Rachel E Matteo-Boehm counsel for Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Changing firm name to Bryan Cave LLP. Filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
December 15, 2011 41 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 11-57187 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #40 as to Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (dmap)
December 15, 2011 40 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case #38 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order 38 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND ABSTAIN by Judge Manuel L. Real: #21 ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (pj)
November 28, 2011 39 MINUTES OF motion for preliminary injunction #3 and motion to dismiss and to abstain #21 . Motion Hearing held before Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court DENIES plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction, and GRANTS defendants motion to dismiss and to abstain, for reasons as stated on the record Defendant shall submit a proposed order. Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza. (kti)
November 28, 2011 37 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain #21 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilley, Erica)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Manuel L. Real: re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 and MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain #21 previously scheduled for November 21, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. is hereby continued to NOVEMBER 28, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. for hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kti)
November 14, 2011 35 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 Defendant's Responses to Courthouse News Service's Objections to the Declarations of J. Camacho, C. Kanatzar, R. Sherman, and K. Dalton-Koch Submitted by Defendant in Opposition to Courthouse News' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Reilley, Erica)
November 8, 2011 34 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Michael Planet. correcting Reply (Motion related) #33 , MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain #21 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corrected Reply In Support Of Motion to Dismiss and Abstain)(Naeve, Robert)
November 7, 2011 33 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain #21 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Reilley, Erica)
November 7, 2011 32 Objections in support re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
November 7, 2011 31 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Serviceto Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #26 (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
November 7, 2011 30 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
November 7, 2011 29 DECLARATION of Julianna Krolak in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
November 7, 2011 28 DECLARATION of William Girdner in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
November 7, 2011 27 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
October 31, 2011 26 Objections to Evidence in opposition to re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilley, Erica)
October 31, 2011 25 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration)(Reilley, Erica)
October 31, 2011 24 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain #21 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
October 25, 2011 23 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service, served on Order re Notice to Counsel. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
October 20, 2011 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain #21 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reilley, Erica)
October 20, 2011 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Abstain filed by Defendant Michael Planet. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Reilley, Erica)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, re Stipulation to Continue, #19 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's motion for Preliminary Injunction 10/31/2011; Reply on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 11/7/2011; Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.) (pj)
October 14, 2011 19 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from November 7, 2011 to November 21, 2011 Re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FROM NOVEMBER 7, 2011 TO NOVEMBER 21, 2011)(Reilley, Erica)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order 18 ORDER DENYING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Manuel L. Real: denying #12 Ex Parte Application to Continue. (bp)
October 12, 2011 17 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Erica Lynn Reilley counsel for Defendant Michael Planet. Adding Erica L. Reilley as attorney as counsel of record for Defendant Michael Planet for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Michael Planet (Reilley, Erica)
October 11, 2011 16 SUPPLEMENT to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from November 7, 2011 to January 17, 2012 #12 Declaration of Erica L. Reilley filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Naeve, Robert)
October 11, 2011 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, upon Defendant Michael Planet served on 10/4/2011, answer due 10/25/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Planet, in his Official Capacity as Court Executive Officer/Clerk of the Ventura County Superior Court in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
October 11, 2011 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, upon Attorney General's Office on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Planet, in his Official Capacity as Court Executive Officer/Clerk of the Ventura County Superior Court Michael Planet served on 9/29/2011, answer due 10/20/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Yolanda Sagarminaga in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
October 11, 2011 13 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from November 7, 2011 to January 17, 2012 #12 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
October 10, 2011 12 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from November 7, 2011 to January 17, 2012 filed by Defendant Michael Planet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Naeve, Robert)
October 6, 2011 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service, re Memorandum in Support of Motion #4 , Declaration (Motion related) #8 , Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 , Summons Issued, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Declaration (Motion related) #7 , Declaration (Motion related) #6 , Declaration (Motion related) #5 , Order #9 Michael D. Planet served on 10/04/11. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
September 29, 2011 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, re Memorandum in Support of Motion #4 , Declaration of Christopher Marshall #8 , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 , Declaration of William Girner #7 , Declaration of Julianna Krolak #6 , Declaration of Karen Covel #5 served on 9/29/11. (et) (amar).
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Judge Manuel L. Real, (pj)
September 29, 2011 8 DECLARATION of CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar).
September 29, 2011 7 DECLARATION of WILLIAM GIRNER in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar).
September 29, 2011 6 DECLARATION of JULIANNA KROLAK in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar).
September 29, 2011 5 DECLARATION of KAREN COVEL in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar).
September 29, 2011 4 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar).
September 29, 2011 3 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. Motion set for hearing on 11/7/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (et) (mg).
September 29, 2011 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service, identifying Other Affiliate William Girdner, President, Courthouse News Service for Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar).
September 29, 2011 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant Michael Planet. (et)
September 29, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Michael Planet. Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle.(Filing fee $ 350 Paid.), filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar).
September 29, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Michael Planet. Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle.(Filing fee $ 350 Paid.), filed by Plaintiff Courthouse News Service. (et) (amar).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Courthouse News Service v. Michael Planet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courthouse News Service
Represented By: Roger R Myers
Represented By: David Allen Greene
Represented By: Jonathan G Fetterly
Represented By: Leila Christine Knox
Represented By: Rachel E Matteo-Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Planet
Represented By: Nathaniel P Garrett
Represented By: Robert A Naeve
Represented By: Erica Lynn Reilley
Represented By: Frederick B Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al
Represented By: KatieLynn Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?