Damon Earl Franklin v. Jim McDonnell et al
Plaintiff: |
Damon Earl Franklin |
Defendant: |
John Doe 1 and Sheriff Jim McDonnell |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv01192 |
Filed: |
February 22, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Alicia G. Rosenberg |
Presiding Judge: |
Christina A. Snyder |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 9, 2019 |
Filing
109
JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations, 108 . IT IS ADJUDGED that Defendants motion for summary judgment is granted and the entire action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust remedies. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
|
June 28, 2017 |
Filing
49
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting in part and denying in part 33 MOTION to Dismiss Case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636, the Court has reviewed the complaint, re cords on file, the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge ("Report"), Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice and Objections, and Plaintiff's Objection to the Request for Judicial Notice. Further, the Cour t has engaged in a de novo review of those portions of the Report to which Defendant has objected. The Court accepts the findings and recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that Sheriff McDonnell's motion to dismiss is granted in part with respect to the Eighth Amendment claims and is otherwise denied. (See Order for details.) (mp)
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing
19
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Plaintiff's 90-day period for accomplishing service of process began to run when his complaint was filed on February 22, 2016 and expired months ago. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERE D that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing, on or before November 7,2016, why John Doe 1 should not be dismissed from this action without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). Plaintiff should provide all information he has about John Doe 1 so that Doe, by his true name, can be substituted as a defendant and served with process at a valid address. (See Order for details.) (mp)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?