Alida Adamyan et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mariam Rumelyan, Galane Gevorkian, Marieta Matevosyan, Ozhen Guymjyan, Heghine Ghukasyan, Kreda Atoyan, Asmik Adetyan, Arpik Babakhani, Ovsanna Chalaganyan, Gaynee Varderessian, Orjen Vartanian, Nara Ohanyan, Lusin Minasian, Violet Tatooskhoygani, Karine Israelyan, Alida Adamyan, Karine Nalbandyan, Mehri Shahmoradian, Dora Bagdasaryan, Khatun Doganyan, Astkhik Khodagholian, Rosie Babikian, Jocelyn Clemente Salvo, Lark Lewis, Shirley McGinnis, Sharon Hill-Howard, Dorothy Jones, Roxie Edwards, Jeffrey M Cross, Joyce Franklin, Janice Michalowski, Jennette McDonald, Loraine Cantrell, Doris Cheek, Sheryl Cummings, Deborah Bertermann, Angela Vanzandt, Cathy Verhalen, Betty Strohm, Paulette Dibibar, Sylvia Garza, Tecolia Harrington, Lillie Smith, Louvenia Turner, Wanda McKinney, Robin Harvey, Thomas Mock, Charlotte Stover, Donald Olsen, Debbie Huffman, Beverly Reyes, Rose Sinclair, Bernadette Sirocka, Margaret Francis, Charlene Tate, Mabel King, Carol Stephens, Pamela Donaldson, Gloria K Wesley, Johnathan Hankins, Brenda Dowd, Peggy Wilson, Arletha Clifton, Teresa Hatcher, Brenda Elizabeth Lainhart, Sandra Hunter, Frances Gilbreth Brown, Harry B. Litton, Jr., Gloria Freeman, Steven M Bailey, Zelda Guss, Mildred Hensley, Nhien Wolf, Karen Brown, Dorothy Trujilo, Cappie McKinest, Carolyn Phelps-Munson, Loretta Anthony, Debra Fleak, Naomi Ellison, Deana Moran, Sharon Cheney, Margarita Esquivel, Sheila Williams, Gertrude Lias, Peggy Teeples, John Robinson, Jr., Angela Douglas, Linda Lewis, Anne Marie Isbell, Debra Lablance, Ohonoray Epps, Shirley Massop, Felicia Landon, Debra Garris, Deborah Jamerson, Mary Alice Williams, Rochelle Brown-Malone, Sandra Grafton, Rene Martin, Lauretta George, Patriccia Oglesby, Arlene Beard, Vera Taylor, Cynthia Dewitt, Brenda Taylor, Rosa Brown, Willie Mae Davis-Williams, Carrie Tyson, Christine Johnson, Tanya Poe, Geraldine Senior, Deniece Barrett, Patricia Spencer, Theresa Pratt, Rosa Zepeda, Marolyn Spence, Mary Helen Navarro, Michael Hogan, Salley Davis, Linda Oatis, Evanetta Evans, Shirley Garner, Steven Crysler, Danelle Jannazzo, Tammy Edwards, Brenda J Maise, Deborah Gugino, Lavern Frazier, Phyllis Bouldin, Lou Jones, Patricia Delair, Gayle Roby, Omega Bell, Deetta Morrison, Roy Haskins, Diane Watkins, Jeanna Alford-Horne, Shelia Baker, Michelle Wooden, Diana Lynn Powers, Cornelia Williams, Viola Vinyard, Priscilla Lagoy, Gabriela Constantino, Lottie Tucker, Martha Greene, Vira Morgan, Audrey Freeman, Ruth Decker, Diane Hayden, Sharlene Memmott, Edna Kuykendall, Kelsey Caroline Sims, Rosalie Woods, Mary Laureson, Natalie Willesden, Vothress Young, Sondra Smith, Christine Farnsworth, Lorita Adams, Maria Dillard, Lula Scott, Shirley Lawhorn, Dorris Morrow, Linda Badger, Elaine Crysler, Sylvia Weaver, Gloria Brown, Thelma Osborn, Jacquelyn Coogler, Frances Talbert, Patsy Miles, Marilyn Thilges, Clarissa Coleman, Clara Lee, Betty Baker, Joan Smith, Sheila Green, Teresa Wright, Valerie Adams, Dianna Walker, Barbara Driggers, Renee Koelle, Vivia Artz, Cheri Snyder, Lucille Flowers, Elizabeth Vanover, Donna Hesson, Ruth Mothershed, Mary Heaney, Olga Silva, Jerry Sain, Anna Powell, Jancie Wilson, Sandra Benham, Melinda Williams, Loretta Foster, Patricia High, Adeline Biel, Maria Thomas-Lee, Michael L Eaddy, Kathy Goins, Zeina Ghandour, Rula Curtis, Wylene Clemons, Joyce Ortaliz Geronca, Evelyn Martin, Donna Davis, Cathy Litton, Patricia Wilson, Elsie Richards, Linda Porter, Pamela Stewart, Renee Wilson, Roxanne Lazore, Tasha Finley-Crawford, Carolyn Ryant, Wendy Roberts, Peggy Harnish, Maria Colon, Julia Sterling, Doris Wilson, Miriam Mikolajewski, Mildred Hall, Pinta Simanungkalit, Deeya Quentina Adam, Felicitas Corbell, Debra Bennice Scott, Allan Campbell, Glenda Koenig, Alberta Jones, Anita Gay, Jeanette Brammer, Kassandra Anderson, Linda Clemons, Dorothy Autry, Barbara Nadolski, Lita Haman, Virginia Fields, Michelle Teague, Sharon Olson, Estela Tucker, Lois Laboy, Pearlie Stewart, Robbie Littleberry, Vickie Graybeal Hanks, Maggie Livingston, Peggy Miller, Claudette Howard, Julia Felder, Yvonne Basden, Maria MacArthur, Wanda McLendon, Cynthia Short, Francis Jefferson, Sheila Martin, Elaine Scott, Charlotte Hammer, Jacqueline Mullikin, Lorraine Skerski, Franklin Howard Brown, Joan Alston, Mattie Sotelo, Karen Fetherolf, Willie Shahraki-Heard, Mary Bohannon, Deloris Smith, Toni Boone, Donna Dickerson, Amber Ferguson, Mary Neal, Gail S Johnson, Sofia Shterenberg, Betty Page, Janet Todd, Amy Deberry, Vicki Florio, Romona Stutz, Gloria V. Taylor, Jeanette Pyle, Mary McCawley, Howard Banks, Patricia Tyler, Debra Triplett, Mary E Leach, Letitia Richardson, Christuine Thomas, Cheryl Walters, Consuella Branch, Ozzie Bidar, Susie Alcoser, Marguerite Poole, Roberta Smith, Andrea Joiner, Sharon Bradley, Aldyne English, Mignon Callaway, Charlene Christy, Karen Sullivan, Dawn Chamberlin, Kathleen Karmis, Michael L Smith, Barbara McNeil, Delphine Newsome, Luther Daniel, Mollie Corns, Violeta Bermudez, Carol Broussard, Virgie Benson, Norma Grant, Mary Melching, Addie McFarland, Coleen Mitchell, Tammy Ann Muscarella, Susan Kester, Irene Bartley, Annie Smoot, Leona Grierson, Artinia Pappineau, Alice Lundstrom, Imelda Diaz, Formeka Harris, Edward H. Pavis, Jovita Montoya, Gary Hardin, Sharon L. Schuster, Joanne Ellis-Steinmetz, Linda Carter, Octavia Thomas, Margaret Bruno, Debra Dirks, Phyllis Tipphy, Mary Wehner, Judy Hammond, Sandra Lawrence, Dorothy Johnson, Mary Lott, Margaret Silecchia, Jenell Smith, Virginia Bopp, Merline O Sandvand, Brenda Ennis, Sandra Dalan, Rosa Rodriguez, Cheryl Normandin-Hill, Brenda Buss, Savannah Roberson, Bobbie Thomas, Cynthia Buxie, Marcella Burke, Betty Steffen, Donna Gentry, Nancy McCarthy, Vonda Floyd, Yolanda Simon, Shirley Jeffries, Deborah Gibson, Barbara Benson, Alethia Thackerson, Glee Bright, Cecil Woodard, Mary E. Smith, Tona Moore, Leslie Dillard, Diane Neville, Linda Rogers, Lonnie Clark, Mel Strockman, Sylvia Olmstead, Celia Rivera, Lettie White, Josephine Sam, Barbara Davidson, Patty Montpetit, Connie Williams, Deborah Tolliver, Nora Reynolds, Carol Steiniger, Elbert Lee Testerman, Emma Wanicki, Daniel B. Huey, Margaret Cassidy, Barbara Weintraub, Bill E Banks, Claudia Svihl, Janet Henderson, Willie Thomas, Sally Marlar, Jamie Campbell, Suzanne Johnson, Wilhelmia Franklin, Ruth Ann Rich, Tonia Stacey, Delia Parages-Gregor, Sundra Ironshield, Sallie Holmes, Nancy Poisson, Barbara Beckett, Dorothy Green, Carolyn Terry, Linda Williams, Russell Glen McReavy, Donna Lewis, Saundra Brown, William Wilkins, Cynthia McRae, Marion Constant, Crystal Clark, William Brakhage, Dawn Williams, Nancy Espinoza, Ziza Zijadic, Anne Seaton, Mary Weaver, Annie Anglin, Mary Merriman, Sarah Townsend, Nandy Jacobs, Judith Hilliard, Edith Headen, Ezraline Cochran, Marie Kempel, Patty Pearce, Barbara Green, Lillie Phillips, Deborah Maclin, Alice McAloon, Peggy Wood, Theresa Gregory, Willette Thomas, Florence Cousineau, Karen West, Ella Tilley, Catherine Jones, Myrtis Mack, Kim Allen, Rebel Lee Guertin, Clara Brewington, Carol Fuentes, Linda Wilson, Sheryl Wilcox, Letitia Griffin, Susan Bouwens, Andrea Paul, Phyllis Brent, Dorothy Williams, Rita Russell, Nanci Price, Linda Pechan-Lake, Judith Jerger, Regina Ferberdino, Sharon Henry, Shirley Spurlock, Antonia Batista, Judy Partee, Joann Seabolt, Valerie Thomas, Vickie Carl, Betty Howard, Janice Sterling, Mary Willis-Mackey, Debra Ligon, Alice Sifuentes, Ella Robinson, Zoe Daniel, Joe L. Sampson, Christine Baldwin, Lawanna Faulkner, Cynthia Villegas, Kathy McKee-Minard, Ida Pizzi, Martha Bachtel, Loretta Broderick, Diane Black, Mary Jean Holt, Patricia Burdiss, Marie Sykes, Cheri L. Layton, Shirl Bietry, Ruth Simpson, Cathy Garner, Daisy L Cullens, Viviana Forrest, Angela Hicks-Hickman, Debra Taylor, Jacqueline Polonio, Annika Kohler, Nancy Smith, Linda Langdon, Carmella Rokes, Taryn Powell, Linda Meyer, Joyce Bryant, Norma Bahr, La'Shawnda Lee, Sandra Wright-Freitas, Karen Walters, Voncile Baker, Carmen Romero, Edit Demeter, Brenda Bernier, Elizabeth Dingle, Donna Schaeffer, Dianne B Murray, Mamie Coleman, Mary Smart, Michelena Parker, Leandro Lopez, Jr., Martha Walker, Judith Lee, Lavera George, Betty Catchings, Cathy Owens, Marilyn Ladson, Shirley Hammock, Charlene Stafford, Eddie Jean Bradley, Wanda Pryor-Jones, Regina Oliver, Terri Lindholm, Betty Cha pel, Bertha Byrd, Dolores Wiest, Suzanne Bieniewicz, Kathy Banks, Rosemary Allen, Maria C Perez, Cherline Lanning, Thelma Walker, Leroy Collins, Shirley J. Leggate, Dorothy McKinstry, Margarette Olsen, Frances Gour, Sharon Spivey, Darlene Chittick, Mary Meale, Laurie Sydow, Donna Washington, Lola Dixon, Glenda Simpson, Marilyn Parker, Yvonne Campbell, Kathy Stevens, Diana James, Mary Jones, Anna Commiskey, Maria Cotto, Michael E. Holliman, Jr., Cheryl Baker, Rosalie Gaudiello, Gloria Myers, Patricia Lee, Joan Patti, Shirley Adams, Keith L. Lloyd, Brenda Smith, Melanie Randles, Marguerite Cook, Barbara Hanna, Julie Felder, Mildred Chamberlain, Rosetta Martin-Baker, Gerald B Snyder, Jeraldine Kenan, Mildred Brown, Scott Dittrich, Sandra Hambeck, Jeffrey Nahra, Mary Youngblood, Segalilt Siegel and Gwendolyn Reed
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Kaiser Permanente International, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50, Greenstone LLC and Kaiser Permanente Downey Pharmacy
Case Number: 2:2018cv01725
Filed: March 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Filing 62 Receipt of acknowledgment from Los Angeles County Superior Court regarding Letter of Remand. (lwag)
May 11, 2018 Filing 61 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (jp)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #56 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court. Case Remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, JCCP4761. Because the state courts orders coordinating the cases in this action are not a proposal for a joint trial, the Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction under CAFA. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion to remand is GRANTED. (twdb)
May 7, 2018 Filing 59 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #56 filed by Plaintiff Alida Adamyan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles G. Orr in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Remand)(Orr, Charles)
April 30, 2018 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #56 Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit B to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit C to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Horton, Joey)
April 19, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER:HG14714753 ] filed by Plaintiffs Brenda Anderson, Stella Batten, Retha Biggs, Pauline Bloodworth, Carol Broussard, Elma Burbridge, Patricia Burdiss, Shirley Chisler, Dessie Christopherson, Patricia Cook, Pearl Davis, Gloria Dickerson, Mary Dotson, Barbara Dumas, Deborah Dykes, Mercedes Esparza, Lora Fawkes, Illene Felder, Judith Gaskamp, Charlotte Hammer, Carol Hardwick, Loretta Little, Bernardette Harper, Dorothy Harris, Filemona Heotis, Ida Hodge, Hilda Holland, Barbara Huerena, Debbie Janssen, Margaret McCants, Renice McCowan, Mable Moye, Lillie Napier, Dana Nixon, Kathryn North, Barbara Pargament, Inez Presto, Camille Rivers, Marilyn Roberson, Jeanne Romans, Debra Russell,Georgia Sanderson, Theresa Skaggs, Dovie Skinner, Violet Sperry, Margaret Staats, Margaret Strucker, Melody Struthers, Catterria Tatum, Carol Tjarks, Kristy Tobias, Kim Tucker, Rose Watkins, Ebtisam Wilkins, Beatrice Wilson and Mary Eileen Wimmer against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/18/2013 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 4 OF EXHIBIT 157 TO NOTICE OF ERRATA #57 ]. (et) Modified on 5/8/2018 (et).
April 19, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER:BC558396 ] filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Bradley, Paul Brown, Rosa Brown, Christine Ferguson, Mary Ford, Barbara Golden, Karen Jacobs, William A Jacobs, Annie Nash, Kathy Pinnell, Cynthia Ryals, Willie Shahraki-Heard, Dianne Taylor, Wayne E. Heard, Laura Newton, Ethel Osby, Claire Mattison, Wayne Mattison, Gladys Nelson, James W. Nelson, Patty Scott, Terry Lee Scott and Mignon Callaway against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/22/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 3 OF EXHIBITS B-83 TO B-85] TO NOTICE OF ERRATA AS ATTACHMENT TO EXHIBIT B-85] #57 ]. (et) Modified on 5/7/2018 (et).
April 19, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER:BC537143] filed by Plaintiff Martha Bowser. against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 3 OF EXHIBITS B-83-B-85] TO NOTICE OF ERRATA ATTACH TO EXHIBIT B-84 #57 ] (et)
April 19, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC537848] filed by Plaintiffs Delsie Adams, Mary Allen, Patricia Allen, Susan Allison, Pearline Anderson, Sarah Arft, Constance Aroma, Reva Atkins, Gloria Averett, Christine Baczynski, Lottie Bagley, Carla Banks, Jonelle Barbee, Margaret Beck, Eva Jean Belle, Sandra Benham, Denise Bennett, Maizy Benons, Linda Bentley, Hertha Berry, Marion Binion, Marsha Blair, Delina Blankship, Francis Boose, Kathy Borton, Loreta Broderick, Saundra Brown, Vange Brown, Melvina Landry, Diana Auger, Donna Callaghan, Janet Murray, Gloria Myers, Jean Myrup, Royalette Nelson, Uyen Nguyen, Joan O Conner-Braun, Belinda O Neal, Priscilla Overby, Alecia Palmer, Sharon Parmenter, Adaline Parrish, Mary Patterson, Mary Pearson, Dolores Pekar, James Pickens, Sonya Plessinger, Nancy Poisson, Evelyn Rosemary Polite and Maribel Ponceagainst Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 3 EXHIBIT B83-B-85 TO NOTICE OF ERRATA AS ATTACH TO EXHIBIT B-83 #57 ]. (Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Patricia Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Rex Grady added to party Patricia Allen(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Patricia Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Sarah Arft(pty:pla), Attorney Rex Grady added to party Sarah Arft(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Sarah Arft(pty:pla)) (et) Modified on 5/7/2018 (et). Modified on 5/7/2018 (et).
April 19, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER:BC537645] filed by Plaintiffs Patricia Banks, Betty Becker, Charlotte Hicks, Diane Young. against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 2 OF EXHIBIT B-80 TO NOTICE OF ERRATA #57 ] (et)
April 19, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Greenstone LLC. correcting Declaration,,, #2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiffs List, #2 Exhibit B 80 - 82, #3 Exhibit B 83 - 85, #4 Exhibit 157)(Horton, Joey)
April 16, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Alida Adamyan. Motion set for hearing on 5/21/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles G. Orr, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V) (Orr, Charles)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney granting #40 Non-Resident Attorney Charles G. Orr APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs, designating Eric W. Gruenwald as local counsel. (dro)
April 6, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #47 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAW OF ATTORNEY by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel #47 . Donald S. Edgar substituted instead of Rachel M. Dollar, Smith Dollar PC; Attorney Rachel M Dollar terminated. (twdb)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, GRANTING #50 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Raizner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s), designating Ari Friedman as local counsel. (es)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #48 Non-Resident Attorney Mark S. Cheffo APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pfizer Inc., Greenstone LLC, designating J.D. Horton as local counsel. (dro)
April 4, 2018 Filing 50 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Raizner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lorita Adams, Betty Atkins, Denelle Bailey, Omega Bell, Nandini Bellara, Cynthia Bienemy, Josephine Brown, Angela Byrd, Susan Craycraft, Mable Donald, Diane Draper, Bonnie Fultz, Donna Gentry, Shirley Halle, Gwendolyn Holder, Deborah Jamerson, Jacqualynn Murphy, Kasum Patel, Marjorie Ramirez, Barbara Tadlock, Rosalie Woods (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 3/23/2018, Receipt No. 0973-21464278) filed by Plaintiff Lorita Adams, Betty Atkins, Denelle Bailey, Omega Bell, Nandini Bellara, Cynthia Bienemy, Josephine Brown, Angela Byrd, Susan Craycraft, Mable Donald, Diane Draper, Bonnie Fultz, Donna Gentry, Shirley Halle, Gwendolyn Holder, Deborah Jamerson, Jacqualynn Murphy, Kasum Patel, Marjorie Ramirez, Barbara Tadlock, Rosalie Woods. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Shirley Halle(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Shirley Halle(pty:pla)) (Friedman, Ari)
April 4, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Second APPLICATION to AMEND Pro Hac Vice Application #45 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Pleading states there is an Exhibit A regarding parties represented, but no Exhibit A attached. (lt)
April 4, 2018 Filing 48 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark S. Cheffo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21527888) filed by defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hort on, Joey)
April 4, 2018 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rachel M Dollar counsel for Plaintiff Jocelyn Clemente Salvo. Rachel M. Dollar is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jocelyn Clemente Salvo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Jocelyn Clemente Salvo(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Jocelyn Clemente Salvo(pty:pla))(Dollar, Rachel)
April 4, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Plaintiff Jocelyn Clemente Salvo. (Dollar, Rachel)
April 3, 2018 Filing 45 Second APPLICATION to AMEND Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Plaintiff Lorita Adams, Betty Atkins, Denelle Bailey, Omega Bell, Nandini Bellara, Cynthia Bienemy, Josephine Brown, Angela Byrd, Susan Craycraft, Mable Donald, Diane Draper, Bonnie Fultz, Donna Gentry, Shirley Hale, Gwendolyn Holder, Deborah Jamerson, Carolyn Nash Jones, Jacqualynn Murphy, Kasum Patel, Marjorie Ramirez, Barbara Tadlock, Rosalie Woods. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Lorita Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Lorita Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Betty Atkins(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Betty Atkins(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Denelle Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Denelle Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Omega Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Omega Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Nandini Bellara(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Nandini Bellara(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Cynthia Bienemy(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Cynthia Bienemy(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Josephine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Josephine Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Angela Byrd(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Angela Byrd(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Susan Craycraft(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Susan Craycraft(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Mable Donald(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Mable Donald(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Diane Draper(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Diane Draper(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Bonnie Fultz(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Bonnie Fultz(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Donna Gentry(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Donna Gentry(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Shirley Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Shirley Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Gwendolyn Holder(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Gwendolyn Holder(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Deborah Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Deborah Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Carolyn Nash Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Carolyn Nash Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Jacqualynn Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Jacqualynn Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Kasum Patel(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Kasum Patel(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Marjorie Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Marjorie Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Barbara Tadlock(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Barbara Tadlock(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Rosalie Woods(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Rosalie Woods(pty:pla)) (Friedman, Ari)
April 2, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John J. Driscoll. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (RE DOCUMENT 2-2, STATE COURT COMPLAINT BC537845, VOL 30 OF EXH'S B-105 - B-107) (twdb)
April 2, 2018 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Garrison, Emma)
April 2, 2018 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emma E Garrison counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Adding Emma E. Garrison as counsel of record for McKesson Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attorney Emma E Garrison added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Emma E Garrison added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft))(Garrison, Emma)
March 28, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Trevor Bruce Rockstad on behalf of Plaintiff Phyllis Armstrong, et al. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney is a licensed California attorney, admitted to this Court on 8/31/11, is currently Active and in good standing. (lt)
March 28, 2018 Filing 40 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles G. Orr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Juanita Banks, Loretta Curley, Ruth English, Emma Frields, Zurita Gray, Tomie Isrel, Darlene Jordon, Sharon Parker, Shirley Reynolds, Deberah Rivington, Candacy Roberts-Anderson, Linda Roy, Segalilt Siegel, Robyn Whitney, Marilyn Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21491214) filed by plaintiffs Juanita Banks, Loretta Curley, Ruth English, Emma Frields, Zurita Gray, Tomi e Isrel, Darlene Jordon, Sharon Parker, Shirley Reynolds, Deberah Rivington, Candacy Roberts-Anderson, Linda Roy, Segalilt Siegel, Robyn Whitney, Marilyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Juanita Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Juanita Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Loretta Curley(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Loretta Curley(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Ruth English(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Ruth English(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Emma Frields(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Emma Frields(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Zurita Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Zurita Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Tomie Isrel(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Tomie Isrel(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Darlene Jordon(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Darlene Jordon(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Sharon Parker(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Sharon Parker(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Shirley Reynolds(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Shirley Reynolds(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Deberah Rivington(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Deberah Rivington(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Candacy Roberts-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Candacy Roberts-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Linda Roy(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Linda Roy(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Segalilt Siegel(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Segalilt Siegel(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Robyn Whitney(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Robyn Whitney(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Marilyn Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Charles G Orr added to party Marilyn Williams(pty:pla)) (Orr, Charles)
March 26, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Raizner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alida Adamyan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21464278) #36 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by April 2, 2018. Counsel shall consult the error(s) noted in the Notice of Deficiency #38 and re-file no later than April 2, 2018. (dv)
March 26, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Raizner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alida Adamyan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21464278) #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
March 23, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ari Scott Friedman counsel for Plaintiff Alida Adamyan. Changing Raizner Slania LLP to 2402 Dunlavy St Houston, TX 77006. Changing 713-554-9098 to 713-554-9098. Filed by Plaintiff Ari Friedman. (Friedman, Ari)
March 23, 2018 Filing 36 ***STRICKEN per docket entry #39 ***First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Raizner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alida Adamyan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21464278) filed by Plaintiff Alida Adamyan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order as to Pro Hac Vice Application) (Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Alida Adamyan(pty:pla), Attorney Ari Scott Friedman added to party Alida Adamyan(pty:pla)) (Friedman, Ari) Modified on 3/26/2018 (dv).
March 23, 2018 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew A Young counsel for Plaintiffs Josephine Abrams, Ada Acain, Deeya Quentina Adam. MATTHEW A. YOUNG is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attorney Matthew A Young added to party Josephine Abrams(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew A Young added to party Josephine Abrams(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew A Young added to party Ada Acain(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew A Young added to party Ada Acain(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew A Young added to party Deeya Quentina Adam(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew A Young added to party Deeya Quentina Adam(pty:pla))(Young, Matthew)
March 19, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) #27 : Form issued in error. Please disregard. (ad)
March 16, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ellen A. Presby. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (twdb)
March 15, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Patrick M Dennis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
March 15, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey Raizner. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
March 15, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael Patrick Doyle. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
March 15, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bill Robbins III. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (Attachments: #1 G-64, #2 G-64 Order) (ad)
March 15, 2018 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc., Dkts. 13, 19, 24 served on 3/9/2018 & 3/14/2018. (Horton, Joey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kaiser Permanente International, identifying Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Hosn, Sally)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including 4/16/18, to file their motion to remand. Pfizer shall have up to and including 4/30/18, to file its opposition to remand; Plaintiffs shall have up to and including 5/7/18, to file their reply in support of remand; and The Court sets a hearing for this motion on 5/21/18 at 1:30 p.m. The Court hereby ORDERS attorney for Defendant Pfizer, Inc., Joey Dean Horton, to serve a copy of this order all ALL Plaintiffs' counsel. (twdb)
March 13, 2018 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Greenstone LLC identifying Pfizer Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Horton, Joey)
March 12, 2018 Filing 22 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel M Dollar on behalf of Plaintiffs Bobbie Smith, Regina Webb, Brenda Whitaker, Rita Wilson, Carolyn Wortman (Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Bobbie Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Bobbie Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Regina Webb(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Regina Webb(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Brenda Whitaker(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Brenda Whitaker(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Rita Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Rita Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Carolyn Wortman(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Carolyn Wortman(pty:pla))(Dollar, Rachel)
March 9, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Trevor B. Rockstad. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (twdb)
March 9, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Order briefing schedule filed by defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horton, Joey)
March 9, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sally Hosn counsel for Defendant Kaiser Permanente International. Adding Sally Hosn as counsel of record for Kaiser Permanente International for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kaiser Permanente International. (Attorney Sally Hosn added to party Kaiser Permanente International(pty:dft), Attorney Sally Hosn added to party Kaiser Permanente International(pty:dft))(Hosn, Sally)
March 9, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Pfizer Inc., re Notice of Removal served on March 1, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horton, Joey)
March 9, 2018 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Pfizer Inc., Dkts 8-12 served on March 7, 2018. (Horton, Joey)
March 9, 2018 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Pfizer Inc., Dkts 1-7 served on March 1, 2018. (Horton, Joey)
March 9, 2018 Filing 14 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel M Dollar on behalf of Plaintiffs Gladys Anderson, Donna Armitage, Margaret Baldwin, Waynette Brandon, Leone Bravard, Lorraine Buckley, Peony Chua, Helen Clark, Helen Clark, Jaleen Clark, Jean Colletti, Beverly Copeland, Debra Edgley, Yvonne Ford, Juana Garcia, Maria Garcia, Dale Gorski, Diane Hackett, Claudine Hawkins, Sharon Leopold, Linda Lucier, Linda Morton, Kate Odunze, Janice Pankratz, Saralee Pearl, Rita Perkins, Gilmer Pruitt, Deloris Richard, Jocelyn Salvo, Doris Sherman, Denise Shirley, Annie Smoot, Dorothy Staples (Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Gladys Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Gladys Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Donna Armitage(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Donna Armitage(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Margaret Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Margaret Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Waynette Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Waynette Brandon(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Leone Bravard(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Leone Bravard(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Lorraine Buckley(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Lorraine Buckley(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Peony Chua(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Peony Chua(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Helen Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Helen Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Helen Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Helen Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Jaleen Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Jaleen Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Jean Colletti(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Jean Colletti(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Beverly Copeland(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Beverly Copeland(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Debra Edgley(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Debra Edgley(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Yvonne Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Yvonne Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Juana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Juana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Maria Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Maria Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Dale Gorski(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Dale Gorski(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Diane Hackett(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Diane Hackett(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Claudine Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Claudine Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Sharon Leopold(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Sharon Leopold(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Linda Lucier(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Linda Lucier(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Linda Morton(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Linda Morton(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Kate Odunze(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Kate Odunze(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Janice Pankratz(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Janice Pankratz(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Saralee Pearl(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Saralee Pearl(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Rita Perkins(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Rita Perkins(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Gilmer Pruitt(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Gilmer Pruitt(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Deloris Richard(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Deloris Richard(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Jocelyn Salvo(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Jocelyn Salvo(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Doris Sherman(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Doris Sherman(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Denise Shirley(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Denise Shirley(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Annie Smoot(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Annie Smoot(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Dorothy Staples(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel M Dollar added to party Dorothy Staples(pty:pla))(Dollar, Rachel)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT PFIZER INC. TO FILE A NEW STIPULATION by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Because the Court may not rule on a stipulation affecting the parties until all of the Plaintiffs are before the Court, Pfizer is DIRECTED to file a new joint stipulation when it has completed its process of adding Plaintiffs. In that stipulation, Pfizer shall indicate that all of the Plaintiffs have been added to the docket, and the parties shall propose a briefing schedule for Plaintiffs motion to remand. (Refer to document for further details) (es)
March 7, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Order briefing schedule filed by Defendants Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horton, Joey)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:13-cv-01250 CJC(JPRx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-01725 CJC(JPRx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn)
March 6, 2018 Filing 10 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Notice of Removal filed on March 1, 2018 #1 . Counsel for Defendant Pfizer, Inc., Joey Dean Horton, has not completed adding all the plaintiffs named in this action to the docket sheet. The clerk will not delay issuing documents routinely docketed at the time of case opening to wait for counsel to add all the parties to the docket. Counsel for Defendant Pfizer, Inc., Joey Dean Horton, is reminded of his responsibility to serve all documents issued by the court at the time of case opening, including the Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) #8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #9 and this notice on all the parties named in this action. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (csi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC604980) filed by plaintiffs Janet Anderson, James Anthony, Loretta Anthony, Gregg M Aylward, Hillary Aylward, Bonnie Dunlap, Dorothy Eldridge, Marion Epps, Ohonoray Epps, Ruvi Ioffe, Charles P Isaacs, Jackline Isaacs, Marilyn Robinson, Randy Smith, Roberta Smith, Lisa Vowels, William J Vowels, John C. Walruff, Sandra Walruff, Elizabeth West, H. L. West, Emilya Yudson against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/21/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 15 (Vol. 43 of Exhibits B-152 B-155) TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC580553) filed by plaintiffs Sandra Bertini, Gertrude Carlson, James E. Cihura, Linnea Cihura, Dawn Cirrito, Vince L. Cirrito, Gerald Hofacker, II, Janice Hofacker, Angela Mulichak, Steven A. Mulichak, Vanetta Pittman, Ira Taylor, Vera Taylor, Rebecca Wilkins, William Wilkins, Gloria Wilson, Lyn Wilson, Odessa Mitchell, Judy Albietz, Karla Hopkins, Randal Hopkins, Shirley Marstaller, Linda Courtney, Sheila Harris, James D Harris, Connie Haywood, Hope Hare, Ronald G Hare, Ruby Johnson, Patricia Woods, Samuel Woods III, Helen Davis, Lavern Frazier, Yvonne Smith, Cecilia Rodriguez, Efrain Rodriguez, Frances Bennett, Hugh Bennett against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/30/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 15 (Vol. 43 of Exhibits B-152 B-155)) TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp) Modified on 5/8/2018 (jp).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC537849 ] filed by Plaintiffs Edna Kuykendall, Marilyn Ladson, Diana Lambert, Idella Lee, Dorothy Lewis, Candace Lizana, June Lowrimore, Yolanda Luckett, Patricia Mabey, Jeannine Maggio, Patricia Marburger, Alice Marrone, Debra Martin, Wanda Martin, Rosetta Martin-Baker, Linda Mathena, Lee Mattern, Karen Mattingly, Evelyn McAbee, Debbie McAllister, Queen McIntyre, Cappie McKinest, Lillie McKinney, Kim Mitchell, Joy Zullo, Judy McNeese, Sheila Merritt, Patsy Miles, Linda Miller, Linda Montgomery, Ernestine Wilson, Rosalinda Avenido, Emma Castle, Edit Demeter, Yolanda Pulk, Michele Washington, Diane Watkins, Lilshirley Welch, Catherine Wells, Rachel White-Doncontel, Edna Whylie, JoAnn Williams, Doris Wilson, Geraldine Winfield, Debbie Winkler, Phyllis Wolford, Shirley Wright, Darlene Youker, Bettie Young, Cnythia Rathbone, Florance Steele and Donna Strozier against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 16 OF VOLUME 42 (EXHIBIT B156-E) OF EXHIBIT B-156 TO DECLARATION #2 ] (Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Edna Kuykendall(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Marilyn Ladson(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Diana Lambert(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Idella Lee(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Dorothy Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Candace Lizana(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party June Lowrimore(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Yolanda Luckett(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Patricia Mabey(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Jeannine Maggio(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Patricia Marburger(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Debra Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Wanda Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Rex Grady added to party Wanda Martin(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Wanda Martin(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Rosetta Martin-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Linda Mathena(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Lee Mattern(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Karen Mattingly(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Evelyn McAbee(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Debbie McAllister(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Queen McIntyre(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Cappie McKinest(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Lillie McKinney(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Kim Mitchell(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Joy Zullo(pty:pla)) (et) Modified on 5/7/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC573918 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Marilyn Anderson, Willie D. Anderson, Billy Bailey, Lavetta Brown, Leroy Decker, Roberta Decker, Theresa Delaney, Patricia Furst, Carol Garlick, Myrtle Gayler, Barbara Gillis, Michelle Gonzales, Barney Graham, Belinda Graham, Daphne Graham, Naydean Hamilton, Donna Hill, Earl C. Hook, Lola Hook, Linda Hoover, Donald Remus Ille, Wanda Imhoff, Catherine Jones, Edward Henry Jones, Jr, Olivia Jones(an individual), Inez Kelley, Sylvia McCauley, Russell Glen McReavy, Rebecca Moore, Avis Nix, Thelma Osborn, Kimberly Puente, Katherine Saldivar, Marta Schoemberger, Ralph T. Schoemberger, Mary Schutz, Karla Stofflet, Karen Tassone, Paul S. Tassone, Marion Turner, Ada Vaughn, Cynthia Woodrick, Donna Zefcin, Paul Zefcin, Jr., Julie Williams, Marilyn Smith, Melanie Smith. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2015, SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO 2-14 (VOL. 42 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-151) TO DECLARATION #2) (Attorney Amorina Patrice Lopez added to party Lavetta Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon R Lopez added to party Marta Schoemberger(pty:pla)) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER:BC599866] filed by Plaintiffs Deborah Ann Cross, Leonard L Cross, Emma Larry, Janice Sterling, Betty Stevens, John B Stevens, Cynthia Wong. against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/02/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 13 (Vol. 41 of Exhibits B-141-B-146 TO DECLARATION TO ATTACHMENT NO. 146 #2 ] (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537140) filed by plaintiff Donna Willis against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 15 (Vol. 43 of Exhibits B-152 B-155) TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp) Modified on 5/8/2018 (jp).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), (CIVDS1312865) filed by defendant Pfizer Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/20/2013, SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO 2-14 (VOL. 42 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-150) TO DECLARATION #2)(Attorney Marshall M Searcy, III added to party Pfizer Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Marshall M Searcy, III added to party Pfizer Inc.(pty:dft))(mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: RG14719217] filed by Plaintiff Patricia Stark against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 13 (Vol. 41 of Exhibits B-141-B-146 TO DECLARATION TO ATTACHMENT NO. 145 #2 ] (Attorney Rex Grady added to party Patricia Stark(pty:pla)) (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: CIVDS1312865) filed by Chasa Williams against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/22/2013, SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO 2-14 (VOL. 42 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-150) TO DECLARATION #2) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC627979) filed by plaintiffs Roseann Avena, Lillie Bates, Margaret Berry, Iris Brown, Linda Buckley, Allan Campbell, Marianne Campbell, Douglas W. Carden, Sr, Teresa Carden, Lucy Carter, Mary Clinton, Opal Collier, Suzanne Donnelly-Yingling, Angela Douglas, Annie Evans, Marilyn Ewing, Vonda Floyd, Bonnie Frazier, Darlene Frick, Katherine Hall, Mary Harrell, Linda Harrelson, Wanda Harris, Wendell Harrison, Viola Hawkins, Flora Hunter, Rosie Jackson, Denise Kelly, Linda Kinney, Lovie Mae Lamar, La'Shawnda Lee, Brenda Leopold, Carmen Marchese, Marcia McCullough, Darline Michaelis, Sarah Moody, Jacqueline Mullikin, Stella Ouellette, Deborah Richardson, Frances Sanford, Billie Scheets, Dana Shilling, Ellen Slaney, Mattie Spencer, Cheryl Spitzer, Michael Spitzer, Roxanne Stampley, Bernice Sutphen, Debra Tift, Danna Tucker, Patricia Williams, Linda Wilson, Carolyn Wright against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/22/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 15 (Vol. 43 of Exhibits B-152 B-155)) TO DECLARATION #2 ). Modified on 5/8/2018 (jp).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT (BC536163) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc..(Filing fee $ 400) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Bobbie J. Smith, Brenda Tippins, Tina Trinh, Terrie Waldon, Raquel A. Wallace, Regina Webb, Lori Ann Weisman, Brenda Whitaker, Rita Wilson, Carolyn Wortman. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/13/2014, SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO 2-14 (VOL. 42 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-149) TO DECLARATION #2) (Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Rita Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Rex Grady added to party Rita Wilson(pty:pla)) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: FCS043259) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Sylvia Weaver. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/27/2014, SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO 2-14 (VOL. 42 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-148) TO DECLARATION #2) (Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Sylvia Weaver(pty:pla), Attorney Rex Grady added to party Sylvia Weaver(pty:pla)) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC589684] filed by Plaintiffs Antonio Aguayo, Martha Aguayo, Carolyn Bluitt, Thomas Bluitt, Angela Davis, Leona Garcia, Johnny Glispy, Mary Ann Glispy, Alleen Krewatch, William V. Krewatch, Emma Player, Janet Ranfeld, Robert Ranfeld, Alta Reives, Donna Shertzer, Douglas G. Shertzer, Sr., Pauline St. Jean, Myrna Sullivan, Dennis Webb, Sharon Webb, Dorothy Zibkowski, Manuela Trevizo, Lorenzo Trevizo, Gayle Meadors, Diane Hayden, Jane Paige, Shirley Adams, James E. Adams, Brenda Rohn, Linda Ambrose, Ganelle Roberts, Clyde Ballard, Vicki Ring, David Lee Ring, Nancy Pullam, John E. Pullam, Mary Beckam, Annie Willrich, Evelyn Mendenhall, Marian Mayle and Sharon Camp against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/31/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 13 (Vol. 41 of Exhibits B-141-B-146 TO DECLARATION TO ATTACHMENT NO B-144 #2 ] (et) Modified on 5/4/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 NON CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT CIVRS1306724 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Alma Richards. STATE COURT COPY DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHED TO #10 PAGE 270 OF 332. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC553501) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Linda Bond, Delta G. Fish, Sandra Fish, Ruth Jacobs, Leamon Jacobs Jr, Carol Novak, Judy Pantall, Mildred Walker, Linda Watson, William Watson. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/1/2014, SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO 2-14 (VOL. 42 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-147) TO DECLARATION #2) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC576975) filed by plaintiffs A.M. Ainsworth, Linda Ainsworth, John L. Applegate, Ramona Applegate, Esther Berryman, Linda Brewer, Terry R. Brewer, Sr., Delia Briseno, Margaret Bruno, Alvarao Chan, Marian Chromcak, Ethel Collins, Richard Columbo, Sandra Columbo, J.E. Crews, Myrtie Crews, Earnestine De La Rosa, Jimmy Dickerson, Shirley Dickerson, Rose Duncan, Pamala Ford, George Furness, Mary Furness, Gwendolyn Garner, Larry W. Gates, Vicki Gates, Tracy George, Lorena Gilbert, Dianna Goodling, Randy L. Goodling, Donna Hardin, Barbara Hoerner, George T. Hoerner, Patricia Holland, Darlene Lazear, Ronald Lazear, Howard Lisitza, Nancy Lisitza, Cerenia Littles, Kathryn Marion, Jimmy McGee, Kimberly McGee, Andrea McKee, Alan Dale Moore, Craig Stephen Moore, Diann Moore, Margaret M. Moore, Sonia Morgan, Mary Overstreet-Smith, Ronald K. Parker, Tammy Parker, Debra Perry, Lennie Pfaffenhauser, Raymond Pfaffenhauser, Jane Remer, Stella L. Reynolds, Carmen Samuels, Magda Santiago, Devona Self, Bertha Smith, Willie Smith, Patricia Stevens, Estela Tucker, Claudia Turner, Ronald Franlin Turner against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/27/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 12 (Vol. 40 of Exhibits B-136-B-140) TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp) Modified on 5/4/2018 (jp).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT 13CE-CG-02977 against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Maria Alanis, Carla Gilliam, Andrea Joiner, Elizabeth Martinez.FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/24/13 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT #10 PAGE 250 OF 332. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC521947, against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Danielle Bradshaw, Penny Hughes, Janet Johnson. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/20/13 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT 10, PAGE 234 OF 332. (Attorney Trevor Bruce Rockstad added to party Danielle Bradshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Trevor Bruce Rockstad added to party Penny Hughes(pty:pla)) (twdb) Modified on 5/4/2018 (twdb).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC594196], filed by Plaintiffs Jacqueline Bass, Velma Coffman, Bettye Davis, Denise Gauthier, Ana Gomez, Rebecca Guajardo, Lita Haman, Cathy Jarreau, Priscilla Jones, Patricia Moseley, Hannah Mossberg, Marsha Nolan, Evan Pagan, Harriet Penney, Pauline Reincke, Paula Savage, Susan Williams, Cathy Wingo,Carmel Hopkins, Helen Clark, Nechelle Nichols, Julia Canty, Juan Brown-Harris, Sandra Bulbes, Linda Bradford, Ida Eden, Patricia Herrera, Judy Bellamy, Bonnie Pruitt, Ema Cerda, Judy Thurmond, Alice Treadway, Sarah Murray, Cindy Horan, Carolyn Allen, Debra Lawrence, Deborah Tindle-Matthews, Shirley Jones, Teanggeow Loretta, Carmen Romero, Carolyn Allen, Darlene Stewart, Linda Stevens, Francine Jones, Sondra Goins, Ida Gray, Brenda Taylor, Sandra Sibley, Janet Mason, Diana Guthrie, Cathy Owens, Angela Johnson, Sharon Spivey, Kathleen Register, Kathy Slaton, Lillie Vaughn, Huda Gatia, Milgros Robles, Donna Rhyneer, Mildred Welch, Wilma Rockingham, Brenda Clontz, Mahin Sadegholghol, Velma Gates, Marisol Ramos, Erma Cook, Donna Addy, Melba Richarson, Rhonda Shields, Nancy Curtis, Norman Aponte, Nadine Smith, Carolyn Jones-Hedgepeth against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/11/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 13 (Vol. 41 of Exhibits B-141-B-146 TO DECLARATION TO ATTACHMENT NO 143 #2 (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC518223 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Edith Wakabayashi. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/15/13 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT #10 PAGE 192 OF 332. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER BC537845) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Debbie Elswick, Alicia Epps, Wyoma Estes, Bobbie Evans, Jannie Evans, Amber Ferguson, Carolyn Fielder, Janice Filer, Jessie Floyd, Gail Fontenot, Darlene Franklin, Betty Fries, Brenda Fuller, Gloria Garcia-Ceja, Delorise Garvin, Jamie Gooslin, Mary Gordon(an individual), Elizabeth Grant, Dorothy Green, Loraine Greenhaw, Aurora Guevara, Lillie Haddock, Brenda Hall, Camelia Hall, Judy Hammond, Gladys Hampton, Paulette Hampton, Connie Hanes, Jessie Hill, Priscilla Lagoy, Pearlie Leigh, Othell Scarso, Cynthia Seaver, Colleen Serio, Mary Shamburger, Martha Shaw, Shelby Shelton, Sofia Shterenberg, Billie Simmons, Gertrude Simpson, Mary Slade, Susan Slagle, Sheila Smith, Vanessa Smith, Wendy Stevens, Shirley Stokes, Stephanie Stout, Monte Strickland, Ann Swigart, Iva Taylor, Glenda Smith. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2014, SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO 2-2 (VOL. 29 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-107) TO DECLARATION #2) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC568284) filed by plaintiffs Hortense Abtiow, Larry Anderson, Maggie Anderson-Yoakum, Bunnie Ault, Catherine Bodley, Frances Boula, William Boula, Josephine Bristow, Ethel Chisum, Peggy Clark, Cathy Collins, Walter R. Collins, Herb Darsee, Kim Darsee, Dedra Davis, Rick Davis, Mary Decker, Sunantha Dharmasaroja, Deborah Gibson, Joel Gibson, Antoinette Grimes, Gladys Holland, Mozell Holland, Daniel B. Huey, Jewel Huey, Julie Jurancich, Catherine Kremenik, Patricia Mays, Joyce McEwen, Clara McIntosh, Audrey McKinney, Bernice Johnson, Rosa McLean, Alford McMillian, Karen McMillian, Max Mekus, Sandra Mekus, Ruth Norris, Steve Overstake, Vicki Overstake, Carol Peebles, Donald Post, Leslie Post, Linda Rainey, Verbia Ryan, Ann Sanchez, Phil Sanchez, Lula Scott, Ermia Thompson against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/30/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 12 (Vol. 40 of Exhibits B-136-B-140) TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC518531 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Sylvia Alvarado. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/15/13 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT 10 PAGE 172 OF 332. (Attorney Lowell W Finson added to party Sylvia Alvarado(pty:pla)) (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT 13-CV-8470 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Cheri Lubenko. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/15/13, ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT # 10 PAGE 152 OF 332. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC537470] filed by Plaintiffs Lucy Allen, Lorene Boswell, Mary Butler, Dorothy Campbell, Doris Collins, Vivian Ditkowich, Barbara Fuccille, Marta Gaines, Deborah Holloway, Dolores Jaszczak, Santia Johnson, Erma Laster, Rose Peacock, Thelma Polite, Mavis Prisco, Rosalie Simeti, Willie Sims-Lewis, Marlene Sterner, Laurie Sydow, Altha Taylor, Constance Taylor, Kimberly Kemp, Barbara Spradlin, Wanda King, Maxine Sexton, Shelley Alexander, Diane Babcock, Anne Campbell, Audrey Carter, Darleen Diebold, Judith Harris, Nancy Harris, Sharon Harvey, Lydia Hebert, Domonica Johnson, Della Klumpp, Tatina Kyles, Marilyn Leeks, Dessie March, Valerie McLaughlin, Ada Modica, Dawna Parker, Carolyn Phelps-Munson, Ruth Pilcher, Effie Ponce and Sally Lamorgese against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/26/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 13 (Vol. 41 of Exhibits B-141-B-146 TO DECLARATION TO ATTACHMENT NO B-142 #2 ] (et) Modified on 5/4/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT CIVDS1311371 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Regina Anderson, Sylvia Carrillo, Patricia Flynn, Barbara Girard, Katherine Mills, Sharon Parker, Sylvia Silva, Catherine Tobia, Madeleine Winn. FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO STATE COURT ON 9/17/13 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT #10 PAGE 96 OF 332. (Attorney Jennifer Nolte Williams added to party Sylvia Silva(pty:pla)) (twdb) Modified on 5/4/2018 (twdb).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC556545] filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Blackwell, Sandra Blackwell, Barbara Campbell, Glenn J Campbell, Joanne Carter, Mary DeRossett, Cindy Giles, Timothy Giles, Julia Hall, Juliet Lucas, Janet Odom, Richard R Odom, Imogene Renner, Elaine Scott. against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 09/02/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 13 (Vol. 41 of Exhibits B-141-B-146 TO DECLARATION ATTACHMENT NO B-141 #2 ] (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: CGC 14-537608)filed by plaintiff Marilyn Rouda against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 12 (Vol. 40 of Exhibits B-136-B-140) TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536358) filed by plaintiffs Donna Armitage, Eva Crocker, Texanna Fernandez, Carlotta Harvey, Judie Hines, Minnie Johnson, Deborah Perkins, Peggy Porter, Janice Robinson, Judith Santiago, Annie Smoot, Thelma Walker against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/13/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 12 (Vol. 40 of Exhibits B-136-B-140) TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC535854 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Josephine Abrams, Voncile Baker, Margaret Baldwin, Waynette Brandon, Leone Bravard, Lorraine Buckley, Regina Sue Caparros, Jaleen Clark, Shahla Owhady, Stella Yatar. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/10/14 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT 11 PAGE 16 OF 332. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT 11 PAGE 278 OR 279. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC537045] filed by Plaintiffs Frances Allen, Suzanne Balknight, Mary L. Beckett, Lucile Bell, Maria Bickford, Adeline Biel, Kathleen R. Bornemann, Marilyn Bounds, Annette Briggs-Whitsett, Dorothy Caldwell, Deloris Chalmers, Oristine Clark, Gloria Danzwith, Lorretto Diaz, Theresa Eckhard, Bonnie Eggleston, September Fohrenkam, Maria Garza, Helen Harris, Adelheid Harvey, Barbara Henson. against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 8 (Vol. 36 of Exhibits B-123-B-125 TO DECLARATION ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B-125 #2 ]. (Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Frances Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Suzanne Balknight(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Mary L. Beckett(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Lucile Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Maria Bickford(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Adeline Biel(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Kathleen R. Bornemann(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Marilyn Bounds(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Annette Briggs-Whitsett(pty:pla), Attorney Lowell W Finson added to party Dorothy Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Dorothy Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Deloris Chalmers(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Oristine Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Gloria Danzwith(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Lorretto Diaz(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Theresa Eckhard(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Bonnie Eggleston(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party September Fohrenkam(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Maria Garza(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Helen Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Adelheid Harvey(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Barbara Henson(pty:pla)) (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC535893) filed by plaintiffs Mary Curley, Debra Edgley, Debra Farve, Maria Garcia, Sandra Gilbert, Dale Gorski, Diane Hackett, Rebecca Lynn Harris, Loretta Johnson-Walker, Linda Lucier, Deloris Ann Richard against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/10/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 12 (Vol. 40 of Exhibits B-136-B-140) TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC666508, against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Kay Quillin, Robin Sharp. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/27/17, ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT 11, PAGE 205 OF 279. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC611182, against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Pamela Brakhage, William Brakhage, Margie Jackson, Carolyn Morris, Patricia Parker, Aleene M. Queen, William F Queen, Cheryl Reese, Dorothy Schenck, Ellen Sheets, Sarah Catherine Stallworth, Betty J. Wilson, Leavern Wilson. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/22/16, ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2, ATTACHMENT 11 PAGE 138 OF 279. (Attorney Ramon R Lopez added to party Sarah Catherine Stallworth(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ramon Lopez added to party Sarah Catherine Stallworth(pty:pla), Attorney Amorina Patrice Lopez added to party Sarah Catherine Stallworth(pty:pla)) (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC537141 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Deann Pierce. FILED IN STATE COURT DOCUMENT 2 ATTACHMENT #11 PAGE 76 OF 279. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER:BC537314] filed by Plaintiffs Ozzie Bidar, Diane Franzoia, Daisy Macon, Princess Mannie, Dorothy Mathis, Alberta McCullough, Stephanie McGrew, Lillie McKellar, Pamela McKinnon, Judy McKnight, Rosemarie McMaster, Theresa Medina, Georgia Michael, Annie Middleton, Susan Mika, Jane Miller, Janet Miller, Linda Miller, Patricia Miller, Lucy Modery, Mary Mohammad, Janet Moody, Phyllis Moody, Florence Moore, Irma Moore, Mary T. Moore, Vira Morgan, Cynthia Morris, Frances Mott, Katherine Musolf, Clarice Nash, Delphine Newsome, Mattie Sue Newton, Joanne Nordenstrom-Buck, Cheryl Normandin-Hill, Virginia O Banion, Deana Olsen, Innis Osborne, Cecilia Pasqua, Theodora Pellini, Marceita Penick, Maria C. Perez, Karen Perkins, Sue Phillips, Rosalyn Pierce, Cristina Pimental, Teresa Portlock, Virginia Postle and Marlene Sue Proulx against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 8 (Vol. 36 of Exhibits B-123-B-125 TO DECLARATION TO EXHIBIT B-124 #2 ] (et) Modified on 5/4/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT CGC-14-537609 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Joan Pfeffer Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Annette Peters. FILED IN SF SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/21/14 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT 11, PAGE 45 OF 279. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537002) filed by plaintiff Clara Owens against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 9 (Vol. 37 of Exhibits B-126-B-128) TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC592059 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Joe David Allums, Sr, Melba Allums, Nina Astashinsky, Erma Barco, Marilyn Benjamin, Joyce Boyd, Clell D. Catron, Shirley Catron, Sally Cole, Sheilan Cong, Charlotte Cox, Roger Lee Ismeal Cox, Sr, Maria Dillard, June Dixon, Kevin Dixon, David Duke, Judith Duke, Donna Evans, Marie Fletcher, Patricia Gipe, Erma Grant, Jessie Hale, Walter Hale, Sr, Roy Haskins, Ruth Haskins, Karlem Hoossen, Sabhera Hoossen, Texanna Howard, Norma Hudgins, Mildred Maddron, Anita Perlhefter, Pat Poppinger, Shirley Rodgers, Maria Sierra, George A. Snider, Conseatta Stewart, Alice Varnado, James G. Wally, Vonnie Dee Wally, Rebecca Watford Dunmore, Doris Wilson, Frank Richard Wilson. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/20/15 DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT #11, PAGE 5 OF 279.
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536974) filed by plaintiffs Nancy Botner, Inez Briggs, Mary Lee Brown, Linda Christine Fleeger, Edna Haines, Doris Johnson, Lark Lewis, Nina Obuch, Carolyn Lois Organ, Ida E. Pack, Jan Ellen Reddick, Mary E. Strange against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/19/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 9 (Vol. 37 of Exhibits B-126-B-128) TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC537271] filed by Plaintiffs Shirley Allen, Josephine Berry, Effat Bolourchi, Catherine Burns, Joyce Formica, Marcela Franklin, Patricia A Hall, Mildred Holbert, Janie Jelks, Annika Kohler, Carolyn Langston, Pamela McKenzie, Thelma Neal, Nicki Padilla, Mary A Ragan, Linda Shaw, Nita Toy, Linda Williams. against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/25/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 8 (Vol. 36 of Exhibits B-123-B-125 TO DECLARATION #2 ) (Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Shirley Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Josephine Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Effat Bolourchi(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Catherine Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Joyce Formica(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Marcela Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Patricia A Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Mildred Holbert(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Janie Jelks(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Annika Kohler(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Carolyn Langston(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Pamela McKenzie(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Thelma Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Nicki Padilla(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Mary A Ragan(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Linda Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Nita Toy(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Linda Williams(pty:pla)) (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536855) filed by plaintiffs Paulette Johnson, Patricia Mabey, Nancy McCarthy, Judy Miller against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/19/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 9 (Vol. 37 of Exhibits B-126-B-128) TO DECLARATION #2 ).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC537313, against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Beverly Abrolat, Maria Acuna, Valerie Adams, Myra Adkins, Bonnie Albin, Norma Alvarado, Kim Anderson, Lora Anderson, Francine Andrews, Geraldine Bailey, Betty Baker, Shirley Baker, Velma Baker, Elizabeth A. Banks, Jamara A. Bankston, Barbara J. Barnett, Frances Barrows, Tina Beavers, Barbara Beckett, Shirley Bessette, Mary Bethel, Shirl Bietry, Ida Birmingham, Barbara Blair, Mary Bledsaw, Virginia Bopp, Michele Boullt, Katherine Bradley, Mary N. Brady, Jeanette Brammer, Pennie Branz, Rosa Brooker, Jane Brosius, Beulah M. Brown, Doris L. Brown, Karen Brown, Marie Brown, Sondra Brown, Ada Builes, Eddie Burr, Betty Burts, Amarilys Caballero, Mary Alice Cabral, Eleanor Campbell, Margaret Campbell, Vicki Carey, Ardis Carmichael, Deborah McClain. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/14 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #2 AS ATTACHMENT 7 PAGE 142 OF 249. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537346) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Mary Boone, Tammy English, Louise Harris, Nettie Hymowitz.(FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/2014, SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO 2-2 (VOL. 29 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-106) TO DECLARATION #2) (Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Mary Boone(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Tammy English(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Louise Harris(pty:pla), Attorney John J Driscoll added to party Nettie Hymowitz(pty:pla)) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), (BC674644) filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (FILED IN STATE COURT, SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO 2-2 (VOL. 29 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-105) TO DECLARATION #2)(mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT (CASE BC674644) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Dorthy Byrd Harris, Linda McMurray. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/1/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 2-2 (VOL. 29 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-105) TO DECLARATION #2) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [STATE COURT COMPLAINT BC652140] filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/20/2017 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 VOL. 34 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-119 Pg 164) TO DECLARATION #2)(car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537847) filed by plaintiffs Dorothy Anderson, Carmoletta Baldock, Bertha Belding, Peggy Best, Roberta A. Bickford, Clara Brewington, Ana Cardillo, Dawn Chamberlin, Laveria Clark, Clara Cobb, Linda Curry, Frances Davis, Wanda Davis, Rosalyn Deloatch, Judith Deniso, Diane Ewing, Marianne Ferri, Betty Franzen, Addie Gainey, Estelita Gallero, Flo Garlandton, Donna Gaudette, Frieda Genauer, Deborah Gugino, Josephine Harper, Dora Harrison, Jeri Hollis, Shirley Jennings, Barbara Kieifer-Milenki, Mattie King, Deborah Kulpa, Bobbie Lemos, Myrtis Mack, Lorraine Martin, Bernice McCray, Delia Molina, Donna Pharo, Janina Ramsey, Lynniece Scott, Bernice Smith, Maurina Smith, Robin Smith, Marcelina Aguilar, Susan Summers, Lovey Taylor, Marsha Tiano, Maple J. Travis, Virginia Verrilli, Rhonda E. Wilber,Christine Williams, Beverly Wilson, Cremaya Wilson, Jeannie Wright, Vothress Young against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 5 (Vol. 33 of Exhibits B-114-B-116 TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT [STATE COURT CASE NUMBER BC652140] against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Jane E. Abbey, Hiawatha Barksdale, Margaret Beech, Debora Broich, Thomas Broich, Blenda Buie, Lori Dawson, Barry Erdely, Elaine Erdely, Lorene M. Eriksen, Michelle J. Glover, Thomas Glover, Kim Holliman, Nancy Kaiser, Rachel Lessem, Brenda Lewis, James Lewis, Debra Lise, Vivian Lumpkin, Betty Ripp, Grace Session, Shirley Widmer, Catherine Worthen, Jacqueline Jones. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2017 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 VOL. 34 OF EXHIBITS (Ex. B-119) TO DECLARATION #2) (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537298) filed by plaintiffs Barbara Ann Andrews, Gearldean Couch, Diane Forman, Deborah Diane Foster, Shirley Ann Garcia, Bonnie Kessner, Alice Smith Marrone, Francine Peregoy, Millicent Penny Oline Zimmerman against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 5 (Vol. 33 of Exhibits B-114-B-116 TO DECLARATION #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537074) filed by plaintiffs Rosalind Cruz, Jeri Kessler, Donna Patterson, Velvety Williams against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/20/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 5 (Vol. 33 of Exhibits B-114-B-116 TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537297) filed by plaintiffs Kelly Foster, Connie French, Nahid Goldstein, Susan Kelley, Frances Summers, Frances Talbert, Angela Tartt, Arlene Taylor, Carole Taylor, Darlene Taylor, Gloria V. Taylor, Lenor Teixeira, Christuine Thomas, Valerie Thomas, Donna Thompson, Sarah Thornburg, Charlesa Thornton, Rudy Trujillo, Marisol Tutt, Tanya Upshaw, Diana Valdez, Deborah Vance, Stacey Vanloozen, Carol Vaughn, Frances Verner, Bessie Vernon, Rachel Videau, Cindy Wages, Shirley Wallace, Joanetta Waller-Davis, Mary Wann, Sandra Washington, Judith Watson, Benitta Wesco, Gloria K Wesley, Barbara L. Wiley, Maudrena Williams, Peggy Williams, Sonjia Williams, Anita Williamson, Marcia Williamson, Maureen Williamson, Evelyn Wills, Donna Witek, Martha Womack, Lucretia Woodburn, Rosalie Yokel, Ruth W. Zimmerman against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 4 (Vol. 32 of Exhibits B-112-B-113 TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC537410, against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Joyce Lubniewski. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/14 DOCUMENT #2, ATTACHMENT #7 PAGE 85 OF 249. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint BC677995 filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. FILED IN STATE COURT 11/2/17, ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT PAGE 50 OF 249(twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC677995 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Dorothy Guilliams, Susan Lorentzen, Sandra Wright-Freitas. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/2/17 DOCUMENT #2 ATTACHMENT 7, PAGE 4 OF 249. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER (CASE NUMBER: BC645186) to Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/17/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 4 (Vol. 32 of Exhibits B-112-B-113 TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC645186) filed by plaintiffs Ramona J. Beckett, Bette J. Carroll, Luis Carroll, Marguerite Cook, Ronald Cook, Charlene Culbreath, Annie Davis, Cynthia De Saeger, Gratien F De Saeger, Janice Ferganchick, Wilhelmia Franklin, Carol Fuentes, Cathy Garner, James S Hall, Shirley M. Hall, Amal Jones, Robert Jones, Johnnie Johnson, Kathleen Kinsman, Linda Langdon, Deborah J Lill, Leslie Lill, Patricia Marion, Leslie McHenry, Rita Miley, Dianne B Murray, Mildred Newby, Doris Owens, Jesteen Raines, Olivia Renteria-Komura, Charles Roby, Jr, Gayle Roby, Linda Rodgers, Lerlene Taylor, The Estate of Gena Cranford, Geraldine Tilkens, Elroy F Tilkens, Judith Wojnovich, Shirley Young, Ellen Zucker, Stanley Zucker against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/30/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 4 (Vol. 32 of Exhibits B-112-B-113 TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) (CASE NUMBER BC627824), filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/10/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 2-1 (VOL. 29 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-104) TO DECLARATION #2)(mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STAT COURT COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC627824) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Virginia Almeida, Donald Bergeron, Gayle Bergeron, Rita M Blanchard, Eddie Jean Bradley, Ronald Bradley, Alice Cain, Lee Cain, Pamela Combs, Deborah Croy, Mary Emely, Arva Fields, Barbara Gibson, Clorinda Gonzales, Ennis Graham, Gerry Graham, Frazine Hogan, Michael Hogan, Edith T. Javius, Betty Jennings, Charles Koenig, Glenda Koenig, Karen Leblanc, Blanch Lemon, Sheila Maginsky, Patricia Ann Moore, Aretta S Rife, Clara Robinson, Kevin Robinson, Lillian Robinson, Linda Rodgers, Lucina Silva, Brinda Holloway, Slaughter, Sandra Strother, Rachel Williams, Frank Williams. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/21/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 2-1 (VOL. 29 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-104) TO DECLARATION #2) (Attorney Keith L Altman added to party Sheila Maginsky(pty:pla), Attorney Keith L Altman added to party Linda Rodgers(pty:pla)) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC537600] filed by Plaintiffs Mazal Azzam, Helen Clark, Beverly Copeland, Cherry Goode, Claudine Hawkins, Vicky Hornbeck, Sharon Leopold, Caren Levine-Prince, Flora Padilla, Janice Pankratz, Anita Patel, Saralee Pearl, Margaret Perez, Rita Perkins, Shirley Stevens, Linda Faye Vaughn, Mary Ann Roberts-Gartin, Susan Cynthia Smith, DOrothy Staples, Bettina Toohey, Sharon Hill-Howard, Jacqueline Polonio, Jean Colletti, Yvonne Ford and Doris Morrow against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 21 OF VOLUME 20 (EXHIBIT B75 - B-77) OF EXHIBIT B-77 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Helen Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Rex Grady added to party Helen Clark(pty:pla)) (et) Modified on 5/3/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STAT COURT COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC593065) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Angela Dance, Curtis R. Dance, Abby Gaber, Priscilla Garcia, Donald T. Habel, Sylvia Habel, Benita Jarrett, Alice Jones, Arthur R. Jones, Irene Lugenbeel, Erma Marrs, Grace Mick, Paul G. Mick, Michael O. Mitchell, Sherry Mitchell, Joyce Mock, Thomas Mock, Mary Muse, Edith Parcell, Ralph Parcell, Antonette Phillips, Paul R. Phillips, Sheila Pridgen, Johnnie H. Pridgen, Christine Questell, Kathy P. Roll, Cecil Woodard, Diep Woodard, Abdulla Zilbar, Merrilyn Zilbar, Alberta Johnson, Alfred A. Johnson, Darlene Williams. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/31/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 2-1 (VOL. 29 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-103) TO DECLARATION #2) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC537532] Ruth Doyle, Tomader Ezzeldin, Sandra Hambeck, Vickie Faye Hammontree, Ethel Hankins, Fannie Harris, Kathy Hayes, Michelle Jackson, Nan Jackson, Linda Jacobson, Claretha Jess, Sandy Jewell, Regina Madison Johnson, Maria Keeffe, Mary Lee, Wanda Machalek, Mary Maxwell, Janice P. Moore, Carol Laverne Nichols, Debra K. Peoples, Clarice Reynolds, Ella Mae Robinson, Dorothy Seawright, Clara Shoemaker, Edna Stafford, Lynda Marie Wilson-Hudson, Lora Nell Womack, Sharon Ann Prody and Dana J. Schmih against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. filed by Plaintiffs Sue Ashley, Vicky Avila, Diana Berry, Francelle Brandon, [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/25/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 21 OF VOLUME 20 (EXHIBIT B75 - B-77) OF EXHIBIT B-76 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (et) Modified on 5/3/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT [STATE COURT CASE NUMBER BC537292] against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Darlene Anderson, Girtha Ashford, Irene Bartley, Penny Boyd, Gail Marie Breedlove, Joyce Bryant, Opal Buford, Marilynn Bunnell, Sally Bunton, Molli Caulder, Ruby Chambers, Consuela Cooke, Betty Cornin, Sherry Dufrane, Debra Duke, Roxie Edwards, Ann Fell, Charlotte Fields, Patricia Fields, Luella Forbis, Phyllis Frazier, Sondra Goldfarb, Deah Haley, Mary Harris, Ora Ann Hayes, Linda Hobson, Betty Howard, Carolyn Hurst, Sylvia Johnson, Rhonda Kent, Donna Kruenegel, Fredida Lach, Cathy Martin, Martha Meadows, Linda Merritt, Dianna Miller, Karen Miller, Joyce Mills, Vivian Nettles, Susan Nielsen, Yvonne Owens, Maxzima Pagan, Tonia Pelletier, Dale Peters, Monique Rae, Barbara Ramm, Nancy Reece, Louise Royal, Kathy Ruble, Lenora Sanrantos, Mary Scott, Olga Scullen, Randalene Sheets, Lorraine Skerski, Beverly Summers, Joann Syracuse, Harriett Terrell, Janet Timbrell, Doris Turner, Tracy Verdun, Viola Walters, Vickie Warner, Barbara Wiggins, Dorothy Winchester and Rebecca Wunder [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/2014 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 VOL 34 EXHIBIT B-118 TO DECLARATION OF J.D. HORTON #2 (Attorney Jennifer Nolte Williams added to party Fredida Lach(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Nolte Williams added to party Cathy Martin(pty:pla)) (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC560896) filed by plaintiffs May Cabil, Marie Carpentier, Joseph Cassaro, Linda Cassaro, Velma Clevelle, Shirley Eagle, Terrell Hagey, Susan Hanson, Stephanie Hardin, Edward Hayes, Virginia Hayes, Joan Hazelwood, Donald J High, Patricia High, Flora Hinton, Earnestean Holloway, Samuel Holloway, Lennel Hurt, Gloria Jackson, Shirley Jenkins, Granieta Johnson-Wilson, Markeyta Jones, Leandro Lopez, Jr, Victoria Lopez, Connie Mickens, Tannis Miller, Joanne Mosley, Delber Oates, Mercie Prevose, Marilyn Ralson, Bonita Williams, Dorothy Robinson, John Robinson, Jr, Addline Spann, Zilpah Weeks, Byron Wilson against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/16/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 3 (Vol. 31 of Exhibits B-108-B-111 TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537046) filed by plaintiffs Brenda Johnson, Pearl V Johnson, Gloria Larkin, Maggie Lingston, Brenda J Maise, Pamela May, Denise Meeks, Patricia Mercer, Mary Merriman, Janet Milliron, Jovita Montoya, Linda L Nyman, Lois Pauly, Betty Reed, Alta Risk, Patricia Rohrig, Marian Scott, Ethel Stanley, Amonzie Tillman, Pearl Torres, Grace Johnson, Mazie Wallace, Eileen Whisenant, Jesselyne Williams against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 3 (Vol. 31 of Exhibits B-108-B-111 TO DECLARATION #2 ). (Attorney Lowell W Finson added to party Maggie Lingston(pty:pla), Attorney Lowell W Finson added to party Marian Scott(pty:pla)) (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC605794) filed by plaintiffs Betty Banks, Howard Banks, Paul Brosz, Ritz Brosz, Franklin Howard Brown, Patricia Brown, Ethel Calhoun, Linda Clark, Lynda Cleveland, Coble, Roslalind Coble, Avis Courteaux, Robert Allen Courteaux, Carri M Cross, Jeffrey M Cross, Alto Daniels, Jacqueline Daniels, Leslie Dillard, Barbara Drabant, Paul Drabant, Debra Fabiano, Mario Fabiano, Glenda Fairley, Corinne Fisher, Joseph Flack, Yudora Flack, Juanita Iris Flores, Rodolfo Flores, Shirely Floyd, Ellawese Hampton, Jackson, Margaret Jackson, Pari Jamshidi, Max Katzenbach, Merle Katzenbach, Michelle Kelly, Judith Litton, Donna Mahanna, William G Mahanna, Michael Minor, Tammy Minor, Gwendolyn Mosely, Donald Olsen, Nancy Olsen, Eddie Peterson, Tom Peterson, Cindy Rice, Timmy Rice, Doreen Rockehad, Edward Silecchia, Margaret Silecchia, Janet Vannoy, Robert Vannoy, Cathy Walker, Robert Walker, Penelope Wertz against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/31/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 3 (Vol. 31 of Exhibits B-108-B-111 TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT [STATE COURT NUMBER BC564968]against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Debbie Ballinger, Johnny E Beavers, Mitt Beavers, June Beldaio, Arleta Bright, Evelyn Broadrick, Kenneth Broadrick, Alan Buntyn, Tuanchai Buntyn, Marion Cousin, Sydney L Cousin, Brenda Dehlinger, Paul Dehlinger, Mable Eaddy, Michael L Eaddy, Sandra Farthing, Jessie Hamblin, John Hopwood, Sr, Forrestine Jones, Judy Kloss, Gussie Miller, Bruce Neilson, Rose Neilson, Jewel Newman, Michael S Newman, Virginia Roddy, Pamela Rushing, Diane Skerlak, Francis Skerlak, Patricia Head, Vadas E. Head, Irene Jackson, Evelyn McCoy, Elisa Orta, Gloria Richardson, Bette Schroer, Alice Testerman, Elbert Lee Testerman, Barbara Meineke, Anita Paterra, Joseph Paterra, Dianne Evans, Ella Woodson, Taylor Woodson, Jr., Ollie Peters, Jessie Thompson, Tracey Corley, Jenell Smith [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/25/2014 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 OF VOLUME 34 EXHIBIT B-117 TO DECLARATION OF J.D. HORTON #2 (Attorney Ramon R Lopez added to party Alan Buntyn(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ramon Lopez added to party Alan Buntyn(pty:pla), Attorney Amorina Patrice Lopez added to party Alan Buntyn(pty:pla)) (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537348) filed by plaintiff Rose Hodges against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50 Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 3 (Vol. 31 of Exhibits B-108-B-111 TO DECLARATION #2 ). (jp) Modified on 5/2/2018 (jp).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537846) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Juana Garcia, Jeanne Harding, Patria Heard, Madline Hendrixson, Judy Henemyre, Mildred Hensley, Gwendolyn Herod, Mildred Hicks, Desiree Hobson, Anica Holliday, Bernice Holmes, Paula Hope, Thelma Hubbard, Debbie Huffman, Norma Hurst, Nadine Jackson-Lowe, Delores Johnson(an individual), Jeanne Johnson, Julie Jonas, Margarite Jones, Peggy Jones, Anne Kates, Karen Kathriner, Nona Keith, Sandra Kendrick, Donna Keye, Bernice King, Gloria Kingsby, Jean Krausert, Louise McQueen, Joan Patti, Sonya Stevens, Wendelin Thibodeaux, Marilyn Thilges, Octavia Thomas, Barbara Townes, Marcella Traylor, Althea Turner, June Turner, Monique Tyler, Margie Valdez, Louella Valenti, Penny Vanarsdale, Joanna Vaughan, Rosina Vera, Annabelle Walden, Donnah Wallace, Dawn Warren, Linda Washington(an individual). Gennett Jones, (an individual), Joyce Jones, (an individual), Diana Villarreal, (an individual), Eleanor VanAlstyne, (an individual). (Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Juana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Rex Grady added to party Juana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Jeanne Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Rex Grady added to party Jeanne Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Penny Vanarsdale(pty:pla), Attorney Rex Grady added to party Penny Vanarsdale(pty:pla), Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Annabelle Walden(pty:pla), Attorney Rex Grady added to party Annabelle Walden(pty:pla))(FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2014 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 VOL. 29 OF EXHIBITS (Exs. B-102) TO DECLARATION #2) (mrgo)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT [STATE COURT NUMBER BC537770] against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Phyllis Beima, Mary Belden, Macy Chaeng, Felicitas Corbell, Salley Davis, Wanda Fellion, Viviana Forrest, Rose-Ann Garcia, Sherry Graham, Shar'ron Johnson-Wilkins, Irma Losey, Bertha Noble, Virginia Oakley, Pamela Payne, Rose Pinkney, Mary Poppell, Kathleen Tello, Patricia Thomas, Cynthia Villegas, Mary Warren, Ellen Wise, Nhien Wolf. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2014 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 23 OF VOL 22 EXHIBIT B-82 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO [STATE COURT COMPLAINT NUMBER BC669583] filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/31/2017 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 23 OF VOL 22 EXHIBIT B-81 PG 51 RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT [STATE COURT COMPLAINT NUMBER BC669583] against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Antonia Batista. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/21/2017 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 23 OF VOL 22 EXHIBIT B-81 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537531) filed by plaintiffs Ada Acain, Eliza Addison, Joanne Beck, Mary Brattain, Linda Bubert, Janet Sue Cable, Norma Jean Cauthen, Jennie Daniels, Bernadette Fernandez, Ann Fivecoate, Clyretha R. Grayson, Barbara Green, Roberta Hansen, Janice Harden, Charlene Holmes, Rosalind Iervolino, Sandra Kerr, Janice Krivak, Brenda Elizabeth Lainhart, Shirley Mae Landers, Mary Laureson, Leanne Layne, Toni Love, Toni Mitchell, Patty Montpetit, Catherine Muna, Nancy Ozuna, Sharon Ann Priddy, Ida Reid, Vikkilee Reynoldson, Ricki Rogers, Janet Saylor, Anne Seaton, Juana Jean Spight, Betty C. Stanford, Dolores Tafoya, Brenda Vann, Keary Lea Watkins, Dawn Williams, Susan Wilson, Toni Wright against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/25/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 29 (Vol. 28 of Exhibits B-99-B-101 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL [STATE COURT NUMBER BC655821] filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/13/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 21 OF VOLUME 20 (EXHIBIT B75 - B-77) OF EXHIBIT B-75 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint BC635991, filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/3/16 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #1 ATTACHMENT #22 PAGE 123 OF 225. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC533634) filed by plaintiffs Ravyne Dow, Cherri Fishlowitz, Virginia Robinson against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/17/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 29 (Vol. 28 of Exhibits B-99-B-101 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537248) filed by plaintiffs Norberdina Barnes, Virginia Blanton, Imelda Diaz, Sundra Ironshield, Andrea Moore, Jeanette Pyle, Betty J Reed, Mary Regins, Myrthala Richardson, Ruth Richardson, Juanita Rodriguez, Sandra Rodville, Vickie Roseman, Laurella Runkle, Dorothy Rutledge, Mildred Rutledge, Tammy Sanders, Lila Sanehi, Jae Santa Anna, Gloria Saucedo, Luella Scarpitta, Marilyn Schaum, Sallyann Scuorzo, Bonnie Semmelmann, Renee Shackelford, Cynthia Sherman, Ivy Shorts, Nancy Simonich, Margaret A Simons, Ruth Simpson, Opal Slaughter, Cherryl Smith, Kimberly Smith, Carrie Smith, Frances Smith, Ina Smith, Jayne C Smith, Jeanne M Smith, Sondra Smith, Christine Snow, Gerald Snyder, Sheila Soares, Jackie Spires, Angela Spratt, Ruby Stafford, Courtney Staley, Leora Stewart, Mary Stillman, Kathleen Stormer, Juanita Stovall, Bobbie Stricklin, Mel Strockman, Ellen Strohl, Karen Sullivan. against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 29 (Vol. 28 of Exhibits B-99-B-101 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC635991, against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Ruth Allen, Avila, Linda Avila, Martha Baez, Tonya Baker, Marilyn Black, Joan Butcher, Darla Cloud, Maritza Colon, Dan Constantino, Lauren Evans, Vickie Gammons, Wanda Paynter, Cynthia Quaife, Darrel Quaife, Benita Rush, Ernest R. Schulten, Marianne Schulten, Dennis Smart, Mary Smart, Taylor, Melody Taylor, Clarence Terry, Patricia Terry, Brenda K. Turney, Yolanda Williams. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/3/16 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #1 ATTACHMENT #22 PAGE 123 OF PAGE 225. (Attorney Keith L Altman added to party Lauren Evans(pty:pla)) (twdb) Modified on 5/2/2018 (twdb).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC655821] filed by Plaintiffs Anita Affeldt, Carole Antonelli, Rosemarie Arbolino, Shirley Arrington, Sarah Austin, Debbie Bacote, Deborah Bailey, Steven M Bailey, Norma Batastini, Colleen Berke, Connie Bradley, Ramona Casarez, Javonne Childs, Essie Cochran, Lana Coker, Patricia Conyers, Rosemary Davis, Rita Derosier, Lana Dittrich, Scott Dittrich, Jo Ann Ford, Anne Fountain, Keith L. Lloyd, Christine Gorman, John J. Gorman Mary T. Green, Ernest I. Green, Valerie Hawthorne, Barbara Hopkins, Elizabeth Hunt, Evangelina Huntington, Tom E. Huntington, Annette Jaremko, Costa Johnson, Costa Johnson, Darlene Johnson, Margaret Johnson, Yvonne Johnson, Barbara Jones, Lou Jones, Rosilyn Jones, Cheryl Krumm, Michael S. Krumm, Mardelle Leas, Mattie Letsinger, Jeffrey Letsinger, Dena McFall, Myra McGriff, Shirley Ann Miller, Lula Moffett, Johnny L. MOffett, Deana Moran, Clifford Moran, Donna Nahra, Jeffrey Nahra, Loretta Newby, Elaine Nienaber, Dwayne W. Nienaber, Sharon Olson, Elnar Olson, Gayle Pelella, Elizabeth Richardson, Cora Ripley, Shirley Sanders, Martha Secharan, Deborah Skinner, Stephanie Smith, Beverly Stewart, Paula Strom-Sell, Donald Sell, Loreli Thagon Murray, Elizabeth Virola, Kim Waldrop, Mickey Watlington, Jacqueline Weeks, Catherine Whittleton, Dale Whittleton and Thomasena Williams against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/30/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 21 OF VOLUME 20 (EXHIBIT B75 - B-77) OF EXHIBIT B-75 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (et) Modified on 5/2/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536754) filed by plaintiffs Wanda Dearmore, Virginia Gomez, Gayle Jewell, Sheila Maginsky, Juanita Reed, Peggy Teeples, Virginia Wodkowski against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/18/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 28 (Vol. 27 of Exhibits B-95-B-98 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC586171) filed by plaintiffs John R. Athey, Kathleen Athey, Evelyn Buffins, Gary Butler, Kathleen Butler, Dale Chittick, Darlene Chittick, Gladys Cooper, Christi Crawford, Ann Davis, Michelle Davis, Paulette Dibibar, Charlie English, Doris English, Margaret Francis, Maria Gomez, Catherine Hannon, Karen Hollowell, Cristene Howard, Grace Johnson, Faye Jordan, Emma King, Billy R King, Shirley Lawhorn, Charlene Lemn, Benjamin, Rosalyn Mardis, Brenda Mathis, Gary L Mathis, Sr., Linda McDowell, Bobby W Barbee, Joann Montgomery, Milton Montgomery, Leota Shelton, Beverly Shaw, Gloria Silva, Emily Sorio-Harris, Danny F Harris, Marie G. Steele, Jimmy Steele, Carol Stephens, James L Stephens, Deborah Tolliver, Linda Vitale Betty Walker, Janice Winge, James E Winge, Debra Louise Wiseman against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 06/30/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 28 (Vol. 27 of Exhibits B-95-B-98 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: CGC-14-537611) filed by plaintiff Kathleen Davis against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 28 (Vol. 27 of Exhibits B-95-B-98 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537142) filed by plaintiff Marion Constant against Defendant McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 28 (Vol. 27 of Exhibits B-95-B-98 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Charlotte Landers, Sandra Lawrence, Annie L Lay, Mary E Leach, Angela Licavoli, Peggy Little, Maggie Livingston, Jennifer Lockett, Sharon Love, Helen Lumbo, Gisela Lusa. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/14 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #1 ATTACHMENT #22 PAGE 5 OF 225. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC552092) filed by plaintiffs Lawrence Beaty, Margaret Beaty, Ollie Bradshaw, Kim Collins, Nellie Davis, Rose Donahue, Johnny Ray Hale, Wanda Hale, Beverly Legg, Russell J Legg, Pamela Marshall, Paul William Marshall, Inell Melton, Althea Newbern, Robert Newbern, Cindy Phetteplace, Ray Phetteplace, Maria Punches, Jackie Scales, Sandra Sharp, Lorene Smith, Raleigh Smith, Sandra Taylor, Edison Taylor, Jr., Dorothy Ann Tolliver, Gary R Tolliver, Cleta Witt, Walter T Witt against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 07/18/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 27 (Vol. 26 of Exhibits B-92-B-94 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536162) filed by plaintiffs Barbro Merikan, Kate Chio Odunze, Debera Penman, Mary Pizana, Gilmer Pruitt, Jocelyn Clemente Salvo, Margaret Segal, Doris Sherman, Denise Shirley, Alice Sifuentes, Bobbie Smith against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 27 (Vol. 26 of Exhibits B-92-B-94 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537844) filed by plaintiffs Mary Browning, Mary Ellen Brue, Carol Burghardt, Bertha Calhoun, Ann Cantone, Diane Cantone, Carolyn Capaniro, Susan Carey, Ruth Carter, Marilyn Chisholm, Rosie Chittom, Doris Choate,Loretta Muller, Barbara Chrismer, Marie Christian, Judy Cline, Ezraline Cochran, Sheila Comegys, Gail Conner, Carie Craigen, Maria Cruz, Teresa Davenport, Lavonia Davis, Robbie Dean, Janet Decker, Donna Dickerson, Charlotte Dixon, Lola Dixon, Ellen Dorsey, Brenda Dowd, Amalia Duckwall, Wanda Egbert, Joanne Englerth, Rose Jenkins, Linda Long, Lauren Ortega, Theresa Pratt, Marie Helen Preciado, Tammy Ratcliff, Sally Raya, Mary Rebar, Amanda Riggins, Emily Riley, Doris Robinson, Peggy Riley, Lisa Ritchie, Lucky Rives, Carolean Roberson, Patricia Roe, June Russ, Denise Sanchez, Mary Ellen Sanchez, Jolene Sartori, Patricia Saunders against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 27 (Vol. 26 of Exhibits B-92-B-94 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC629051) filed by plaintiffs Judith Adkins, Ruby Allen, Sandra Alligood, Mary Alvarez, Crystal Block, Phyllis Bouldin, Virginia Brown, Marga Brown-Champion, Cynthia Buxie, Gloria Candido, Cynthia Carpenter, Elaine Celona, Vicky Chaffee, Maria Champion, Gwendolyn Clemons, James Collins, Lella Collins, Sylvia Collins, Divinia Cordero, Donna Cruea, Vivian Crum, Donna Cunningham, Patricia Curtis, Lucille Daly, William J Daly, Mary Davis, Dolores Dickerson, Eva Dixon, Shirley Dobbs, Sheila Dunn, Rosemary Dupre, Emma Evans, Anna Fedo, Barbara Ferguson, Gilda Fletcher, Nina Foree, Brenda Freeman, Kimberly Gammage, Ima Garner, Anthony Genovese, Leavinia Genovese, Beverly Gribble, Paulette Hardy, Rosemary Hasler, Elizabeth Hendree, Archie L. Hughes, Mary Hughes, Mary Ingram, Chelton Jeffers, Pricilla Jeffers, Ingrid Kelly, Shirley Kizzie, James Krier, Noreen Krier, Donna Lugg, Roberta Major, Karen McKernan, Susan Moore, Katie O'Neal, Quintana Onubogu, Edward H. Pavis, Theresa Pavis, Angle Pitts, Charles E. Reed, Susan Reed, Dorothy Scott, Lois Short, Mary Simmons, Yolanda Simon, Emma Smith, Lue Smith, Sandra Stallings, Esther Steckman, Joan Thompson, Sara Trepanier, Joan Trosper, Carrie Tyson, Kim Tyson, Bonnie Utynek, Janet Vinson, Michael Welch, Tony Welch, Kathryn Whited, Shacretta Williams, Gertrude Zdanowicz against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/15/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 26 (Vol. 25 of Exhibits B-89-B-91 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC582062) filed by plaintiffs Peter Becker, Amy Caro, Orlando Caro, Patricia Connelly, Vera Copeland, Robert Goodey, Valerie Goodey, Geraldine Heine, Jack L. Heine, Frances Inserra, Michael F. Inserra, Charles P. Larkin, Donna Larkin, Maria MacArthur, Earl McDaniel, Kim McDaniel, Roger W. McNeil, Barbara McNutt, Peggy Miller, Joyce Phillips, Charlotte Poley, Robert Poley, Bertha Sills, Susan P. Smith, Bobbie Talton, Linda L. Taylor, Treka Townsend, Johnella Washington, Mary Waters, Bettie Weaver, Carolyn Wilcher, John L. Wilcher, Claudine Woodberry against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/15/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 26 (Vol. 25 of Exhibits B-89-B-91 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 ONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537652) filed by plaintiffs Willetta Allman, Susan Bouwens, Adelle Calabretta, Charlene Campbell, Susan Carroll, Vivian Cleveland, Rhonda Durden, Helen Jones, Peggy Handley, Anita Honore, Joan Keppler, Arlene Levenson, Jamesie McEntyre, Brenda Phifer, Betty Powell, Cathy Roberts, Juanita Rothweiler, Lila Rusek, Vivian Sabey, Lori Shaffer, Betty Smiley, Debra Smitherman, Betty Strohm, Cindy Taylor, Lizzie Thompson, Phyllis Tipphy, Ana Iris Torres, Tina Trotter, Rose Ann Tuttle, Jacquelyn Uhlman, Joan Voorhees, Elisa Walker, Vanessa Walton, Michelle Wasserman, Sharen White, Earline Winfield against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 26 (Vol. 25 of Exhibits B-89-B-91 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536012) filed by plaintiffs Prudence Boyland, Frankie Brown, Peony Chua, Mary Coe, Mary Alice Coleman, Betta Elarms, Jacquelynne George, Linda Morton, Caterina Zatorski against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/13/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 25 (Vol. 24 of Exhibits B-86-B-88 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER (CASE NUMBER: BC667266) to Complaint filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/06/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 25 (Vol. 24 of Exhibits B-86-B-88 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC667266) filed by plaintiffs Kassandra Anderson, Dorothy Arney, Walter Arney, Angela Brown, Barbara Hawkins, Don A. Hawkins, Dorothy Patterson against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/30/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 25 (Vol. 24 of Exhibits B-86-B-88 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC619090) filed by plaintiffs Shelia Baker, Linda Barnes, Marita Berry, Patricia Bilbrey, Gloria Bolden, Teresa Brooks, Bennie Carmon, Fran Carr, David Carr, Judith Colbert, Payton K. Collins, Yvonne Collins, Bettie Dixon, Robert L Dixon, Miriam Evans, Oire George, Robin Graham, Josephine Holliman, Michael E. Holliman, Jr, Dasie Mae Howard, Annette Jackson, Cheryl Jackson, Dorothy Jackson, Annie Johnson, Jerelene Johnson, Linda Johnson, JoAnn J. Jones, Juanita L. Jones, Jessie Lewis, Linda Lewis, Carolyn Lott, Bonnie McCallum, Eugenia McClay, J F McDonald, Jennette McDonald, Brenda Medley, Saverna Moody, Donna Morris, Lisa Nethery, Rowena Ozanne, Artinia Pappineau, Linda Perry, Nancy Powell, Katherine Primrose, Miriam Ramirez, Joseph W Richey, Judith Richey, Frances Roberts, Andres B Sanchez, Maria Del Carmen Sanchez, Jewel Scott, Bobbie Shields, Glenda Smith, Karen R Smith, Shirley Smith, Mary Springer, Sharon Sweeney, Thomas Sweeney, Joyce Thalacker, Earlene Thompson, Mae Thornton, Louvenia Turner, Bernita Walker, Roosevelt Walker, Rose Walker, Gail Washington, Judith Welch, Callie Williams, Otis Williams, Cornelia Williams, Fellicia Williams, Sheilah Wyatt against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 09/24/2013 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 25 (Vol. 24 of Exhibits B-86-B-88 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537393) filed by plaintiffs Maye Alberstone, Jackie Caldwell, Paula Carrick, Fleta Collins, Marilyn Dennis, Betty Dooley, Madeline Evans-Brown, Katie Farmer, Caroline Franklin, Freda Goff, Deborah Heflin, Rhonda Henson, Polly Herrington, Donna Hesson, Judith Hill, Linda Hoskins, Mary Hughes, Lillia Hurtado, Roberta M Jackson, Gwen Jefferson, Shirley Jeffries, Sabree Johnson, Peggy Jones, Mary Kloke, Patricia Lee, Joyce A Linnville, Debra Looker, Betty Manns, Bernice B Marcus, Donna Maxwell, Josephine McCall, Maria McGlothlin, Artha Nelson, Agnes Reed, Letitia Richardson, Gloria Robinson, Margie Rogers, Wanda Rubin, Faenza Rudolph, Glenna Salinas, Betty S Shepherd, Sally Sherwood, Michelle Spencer, Patricia Spencer, Rae Stanco, Kim Thomas, Maxine Turner, Vickey Watkins, Ruby Williams against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 19 (Vol. 18 of Exhibits B-70-B-71 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT [STATE COURT NUMBER BC640576] against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Reeshemah Adams, Sarah Bales, Bessie Barringer, Mary Bishop, Patricia Blockus, Leora Bowers, Linda Bowman, Hugh Boyd, Rosa Boyd, Peter Cauchy, Sharon Cauchy, Charlene Christy, Melody Cole, Florida Coleman, Elizabeth Costlow, Cyrel Dudley, Joan Elby, Wanda Fike, Carol Gorrell, Vivian Grant, Virginia Green, Alma Hamm, Beverly Hartman, Mary Heaney, Nancy Holguin, Peggy Horton, Wanda Hughes, Marilyn Lucas, Bertha Marshall, Addie McFarland, Sally Miller, Twinkle Morrozoff, Patricia O'Dell, Edna Olivas, Shirley Parker, Kathleen Pavlosky, Janice Pereira, Beatrice Perez, Lillie Phillips, Freda Ragusi, Edita Relos, Kathleen Sainato, Charlene Stafford, Janie Stokes, Sheran Stump, Sonya Taylor, Bobbie Thomas, Susan Tilley, Revonia Truby, Anita Weld, Eloise Wright, Emily Zboyovsky. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/14/2016 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 EXHIBIT B-14 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 (Attorney Ramon R Lopez added to party Wanda Hughes(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ramon Lopez added to party Wanda Hughes(pty:pla), Attorney Amorina Patrice Lopez added to party Wanda Hughes(pty:pla)) (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc., with JURY DEMAND. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/6/2013 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 19 (Vol. 18 of Exhibits B-70 - B-71 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: 13-CE-CG-02977) filed by plaintiffs Maria Alanis, Carla Gilliam, Andrea Joiner, Elizabeth Martinez against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 09/24/2013 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 19 (Vol. 18 of Exhibits B-70-B-71 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537296) filed by plaintiffs Mary Adamian, Soraya Azzad, Linda Baraz, Ardena Carpenter, Diane Carr, Doris Cheek, Pamela Cheek, Sharon Cheney, Elizabeth Chepkauskas, Carlyn Clairbourn, Lisa Clark, Glenda Clayton, Mae Cochran, Mary Coleman, Debra Collins, Rose Coots, Gertrude Cornish, Rhonda Couch, Pauline Crawford, Jane L. Craze, Sheryl Cummings, Celia Cuyler, Helen Davidson, Mary L. Davidson, Deborah Day, Vertie Dean, Mattie R. Dennis, Maureen Dennis, Cynthia Dewitt, Nancy L. Dietrich, Barbara Dorris, Marlene Easterling, Theresa Eckhard, Deborah Edwards, Penelope Eichelberger, Caryn Eisenberg, Deborah Ellington, Juanita Evans, Lisa Everage-Scott, Carolyn Everidge, Madeleiene Fenner, Dorothy L. Ferguson, Aileen Fine, Glenda Fletcher, Ana Garcia, Rosalie Gaudiello, Cynthia Shortagainst Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 18 (Vol. 17 of Exhibits B-66-B-69 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC537635] filed by Plaintiffs Deeya Quentina Adam, Dorothy Andres, Helen Arnett, Linda Beck, Consuella Branch, Annette Clayton, Bonnie Cochran, Susan Deluney, Grace Dyal, Audrey Fletcher, Judy Williams Fowler, Myrna Grose, Ingrid Harper, Bertha Herrera, Diana Jordan, Kathy LaFortune, Anna LaGambina, Cherline Lanning, Tammie Kay Mangan, Vivian McKinsey, Janice Michalowski, Coleen Mitchell, Julia Morris, Vicki Earl Morris, Diantha Nicholson, Margie Oden, Annie Lois Phillips, Oretha Tate Reese, Marcy Tuttle Schlensinger, Katherine Seibert, Debra Simmons, Donna Kaye Townsend, Rosemary Trujillo, Jimmie N. Vassar, Annabelle Walden, Robin R. Wiese, Alice Wilkes and Debra June Wilson against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 20 OF VOLUME 19 (EXHIBIT B72 - B-74) OF EXHIBIT B-74 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (et) Modified on 5/2/2018 (et). Modified on 5/2/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC593129) filed by plaintiffs Barbara Brice, Evelyn Carlson, Sharon Grose, Sherry Hamrick, Bonnie James, Pearl Jones, Terri Lagrippo, Patricia Moore, Mary Mugan, Norma Muraviov, Karen Nicholson, Betty Page, Mary Starling, Helen Taylor, Sandra Tysor, Peggy Vail, Valerie Van Zile, Barbara Warfield, Ruth Yaker against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 08/31/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 18 (Vol. 17 of Exhibits B-66-B-69 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER:BC538088] filed by Plaintiffs Gladys Anderson, Sandra Baker, Nancy Banks, Carnettia Blackwell, LaTanya Burns, Betty Dockery, Linda Glasper, Linda Hall against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [From State Court Complaint BC536930]), Jenny Lamb, Joan Menna, Mary Vega. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 20 OF VOLUME 19 (EXHIBIT B72 - B-74) OF EXHIBIT B-73 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (Attorney Donald S Edgar added to party Linda Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Robins, III added to party Linda Hall(pty:pla)) (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC647065) filed by plaintiffs Helen Bragg, Jerry Brelish, Michael Brelish, Mamie Coleman, Leroy Collins, Willie Collins, Donna Duval, Thomas Duval, Denise Dye, Gordon Giannotti, Lori Giannotti, Evelyn Hardin, Gary Hardin, Shirley Holland, Ella Holyfield, Sylvia Majanja, Ruth Mothershed, Phyllis Perkins, Wanda Pryor-Jones, Madine Randolph, Linda Staats, Sonia Tucker, Janice Warren, Maria Xochrhuaagainst Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 01/17/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 18 (Vol. 17 of Exhibits B-66-B-69 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC537893] filed by Plaintiff Trudy Alex, Luretta Alexander-Jackson, Shirley Leasock, Dora Johnson Vernell Merisett, Jameelah Shabazz against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 20 OF VOLUME 19 (EXHIBIT B72 - B-74) OF EXHIBIT B-72 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (Attorney Matthew Ramon Lopez added to party Luretta Alexander-Jackson(pty:pla)) (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC652781) filed by plaintiffs Nora Demay, Marcia Goodman, Deborah Harrington, Geneva Holmes, Deborah Keutzer, Jennette McDonald, Maureen McGuire, Ruby Muench, Yvonne Tolman, Constance Wise, Patsy Wood against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 03/06/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 18 (Vol. 17 of Exhibits B-66-B-69 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537852) filed by plaintiffs Louise Acheson, Rebecca Baker, Gerladine Birch, Toni Boone, Minzetta Borden, Mary Bradshaw, Mildred Brown, Brenda Bryant, Tanya Carter, Beatrice Johnson, Gloria Cooper, Josett Cottman, Ada Cruz, Sonya Dennis, Bernice Dorneson, Annie Douglas, Barbara Driggers, Anna Evans, Monique Felton, Lilymirna Ferrer, Beverly Ford, Loretta Foster, Mildred Foster, Sandra Gibbeny, Janet Gregory, Patricia Hadley, Onita Johnson, Cydene Joiner, Jessie Love, Lynda Matthys, Gail McGee, Joy Mello, Dorothy Mitchell, Laura Northrup, Corina Olvera, Myra Partee, Jessie Powell, Sybil Reed, Yvonne Rice, Terri Smitherman, Christine Sommerfeld, Tamia Sparks, Rena Stanley, Fannie Stevenson, Alice Tyson, Sara Urbina, Melba Vanderwyk, Donna Washington, Romanethia Watts, Rose Williams against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 17 (Vol. 16 of Exhibits B-60-B-65 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC538131] filed by Plaintiffs Holly Gideon, Rhonda Lovett, Elizabeth Ann Watts against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/03/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 16 OF VOLUME 15 (EXHIBIT B54 - B-59) OF EXHIBIT B-59 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC536942 against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Anna Gardner, Eddie Kilgore, Kathy McKee-Minard, Jerry Nally. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/14 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #1 ATTACHMENT #13, PAGE 233 OF 285. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC518223] filed by Plaintiff Edith Wakabayashi against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/15/2013 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 16 OF VOLUME 15 (EXHIBIT B54 - B-59) OF EXHIBIT B-58 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536935) filed by plaintiffs Marilyn Williams, Janice Johnson, Janet M Becraft, Katherine Boyer, Karen Bruggman, Uronda Burrell, Judith Cole, Deborah Davis, Sharon Dawson, Atelia Elliott, Virginia Fields, Annette Foster, Veronica Francis, Debra Garris, Charlene Gibbs, Janice Graves, Diane Jeffers, Debbie Kashima, Elizabeth Keene, Martha McCain, Shirley McMurray, Rhonda McQueen, Sharlene Memmott, Irma Mendoza, Barbara Miles, Nadine Miller, Patricia Miller, Karen Morgan, Lavinia Mullins, Rebecca Murphy, Raana Nawaz, Masooda Naz, Carol Ann Nelson, Lori Oliphant, Teresa Ortega, Beverley Parie, Dorothy Patterson, Jacqueline Pendleton, Joan Pfeffer, Bessie Pierce, Kathleen Porter, Raelene Postma, Arlene Proctor, Regina Pyle, Sylvia Ramirez, Linda Randall, Melanie Randles, Sharon Renfro, Beverly Reyes, Calvin Riley, Beverly Ross, Barbara Rubel, Ida Russell, Sue Sandifer, Viola Sauceda, Elsie Sims, Christina Slater, Viola Smith, Fannie Sostand, Marquita Sozio, Evelyn Stafford, Galynda Swoape, Charlita Taylor, Virginia Thonges, Sharon Thorne, Jessie Tisdale, Joann Trippodo, Alice Vela, Karen Wafer, Linda Walker, Freda Waller, Sharon Ward, Judy Washington, Tammy Watson, Betty Webb, Debra Weinstein, Teri J. Wells, Debra Wesley, Tami Whiting, Joyce Whittaker, Brenda Wilburn, Margie Wiles, Natalie Willesden, Barbara Williams, Erma Williams, Frances Williams, Melba Williams, Karma Wooton, Brenda York, Rosa Zepeda against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 17 (Vol. 16 of Exhibits B-60-B-65 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC537052] filed by Plaintiffs Adelina Aleman, Emma Alexander, Maria Alvino, Delores Antoine, Charlene Culbreath(an individual (from State Court Complaint BC537052)), Raquel Figureroa, Valerie Goheen, Tammy Hinshaw, Janet Luckett, Elzie Pipkins, Denise Reynolds, Delores Speset, Gloria Spivey, Yolanda Tahod, D'Audra Thompson, Patsy Townsend, Ouida Valentine, Debbie Watts, Sylvia Wilson, Tracy Witherspoon, Thelma Thomas, Carmen Correa, Eleanor Whalen, Darlene Fossett, Daisy Henderson, Linda Washington, Janice Wilson, Genre Brogue, Teresa Molner, Amira Wadud, Rosemary Allen, Judy White, Janet Too, Mattie Sotelo, Sonja Belmont, Inish Collins, Gloria Gonzalez, Janet Kelley and Latonya Westbrook against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 16 OF VOLUME 15 (EXHIBIT B54 - B-59) OF EXHIBIT B-57 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Adelina Aleman(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Emma Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Maria Alvino(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Delores Antoine(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Charlene Culbreath(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Raquel Figureroa(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Valerie Goheen(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Tammy Hinshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Janet Luckett(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Elzie Pipkins(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Denise Reynolds(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Delores Speset(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Gloria Spivey(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Yolanda Tahod(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party D'Audra Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Patsy Townsend(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Ouida Valentine(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Debbie Watts(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Sylvia Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Tracy Witherspoon(pty:pla)) (et) Modified on 5/1/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC539180) filed by plaintiffs Jewel Williams, Toni Love against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/12/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 17 (Vol. 16 of Exhibits B-60-B-65 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC645478] filed by Plaintiffs Tammy Conley, Nancy Cotton, Kimberly Cremeans, Adele Dorsey, Harold S. Dorsey, Sr., Mary Eckerson, Marilyn Horn, Roxanne Lazore, Nancy Littleton, Denis Lomax, Susan Lomax, Nancy McKissick, Laura Mundigler, Regina Oliver, Savannah Roberson, Marline Tillery, Clauda Webb-Elmore against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/30/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 15 OF VOLUME 15 (EXHIBIT B54 - B-59) OF EXHIBIT B-56 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536934) filed by plaintiffs Fiette Williams, Jarrica Austin, Sylvia Barlow, Leona Belcher, Theresa Beltran, Donna Blackman, Gloria Bordelon, Gloria Brown, Dianna Browning, Martha Brunson, Lora Bryson, Alline Burley, Bertha Campbell, Marjorie Carey, Judy Conley, Diane Couch, Eileen Deaton, Virginia Desalvo, Carolyn Dewbre, Donna Duffy, Peggy Embrell, Maria Estrada, Deborah Ewers, Judith Fondren, Maria Fordham, Mindee Gibson, Pearlie Glover, Irma Gonzales, Equella Goodall, Delphine Gordon, April Guidicotti, Zelda Guss, Charolette Hall, Shirley Hammock, Delois Harvey, Sheila Hastings, Linda Hayes, Reatha Haynes, Doyless Head, Pamalyn Holbrook, Cherrie Holton, Sonja Hrobowski, Doris Ibarra, Jearline Jackson, Marilyn Jackson, Marian Jarrad, Gwendolyn Jenkins, Pam Jenkins, Rachel Jessen, Christine Johnson, Eva Johnson, Darlene Johnson-Adams, Gloria Jones, Carolyn Jones-Bradford, Sherry Kerr, April Lake, Judith Lane, Sheila Lee, Carrie Lennon-Johnson, Elizabeth Loredo, Margaret Lucas, Ophelia Lucio, Sharon Mazyck, Christine McAnany, Janet McCantis, Nita Mitchell, Judy Moore, Nicy Nash, Mary Neal, Teresa Newman, Carrie Nichols, Mary Norman, Patriccia Oglesby, Wilma Partain, Sonya Phillips, Cheryl Porter, Betty Ray, Mary Ann Richards, Virginia Rivers, Brenda Roberts, Helen Roberts, Deborah Sander, Dianne Taylor, Lorine Thomas-Dendy, Miriam Trezevant, Janette Williamson, Sherry Jo Williamson, Patricia Wilson against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 17 (Vol. 16 of Exhibits B-60-B-65 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC537946 against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. jury demand, filed by plaintiffs Sheli Allen, Cathie Anderson, Idndir Balraj, Rebecca Beard, Corrinne Behrenbrinker, Bertha Boone, Cora Brown, Sharon Brown, Annie Brumfield, Vickie Carl, Betty Chambers, Helene Davis, Lisa Esquivel, Thelma Evans, Shirley Garner, Dondie Gordon, Barbara Hanna, Lisa Hennessy, Mable Hickman, Patricia Holtsberry, Patricia Johnson, Loretta Jones, Lula Jones, Sharon Jones, Annette Kravitz, Yolanda Lai-Fook, Terrell Lewis-Bey, Rene Martin, Guillermina Martinez, Alzenia Matthews, Barbara McNutt, Rachael Montoya, Brenda Perkins, Joserie Preston, Mary Reed, Sherry Reid, Shirley Reynolds, Sonya Spencer, Shirley Spurlock, Susan Strickland, Ella Tilley, Goldie Walker, Wanda Weaver, Dawn Wells, Leatrice West, Barbara Wilson, Elaine Wilson, Rosalinda Woods, Marian Wright, Mary Youngblood. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/14 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #1, ATTACHMENT 13 PAGE 163.
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC573889) filed by plaintiffs Cathie Anderson, Ryndall Blackshire, Deloris Bridges, Glee Bright, Annie Brumfield, Mildred Chamberlain, Lillian Clark, Dorothy Cole, Myrtle Culpepper, Charlotte Dailey, Gloria De Rogatis, Mae Edgar, Lisa Esquivel, Debra Furney, Rose Garrity, Wanda George, Claryce Gibbons, Auga Glore, Delorse Gunter, Mable Hickman, Vicki Hines, Judith Jerger, Marie Johnson, Karen Kerley, Demetria McCuiston, Sharon Olivarez, Jean Pardee, Patricia Rodriguez, Josephine Sam, Bertie Smith, Margaret Snyder, Amy Spence, Carol Stier, Dianne Watkins, Leatrice West, Robyn Whitney against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/27/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 17 (Vol. 16 of Exhibits B-60-B-65 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp) Modified on 5/1/2018 (jp).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537924) filed by plaintiffs Martha Bachtel, Lisa Brei, Brenda Christian, Carolyn Gansz, Mayzelle Haynes, Renee Heavyrunner, Belinda Hefner, Shirley McGinnis, Cynthia McGraw, Mabel Ocana, Inez Parker, Shirley Parker, Nicole Payne, Ronda Pickney, Catherine Pippel, Sabrina Reillo, Nancy Roberson, Lena Rogers, Francine Seidita, Ethel Shelton, Debbie Tice, Martha Villalba, Candace Warnes, Linda Watts, Lena Whitaker, Deborah Wood against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/27/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 17 (Vol. 16 of Exhibits B-60-B-65 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: 37-2018-0067338-CU-PL-CTL] filed by Plaintiffs Susan Hadland, Charlene Tate, DeOttis Vallet, Mercedes Yaghazarian against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/18/2013 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 16 OF VOLUME 15 (EXHIBIT B54 - B-59) OF EXHIBIT B-55 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC585392) filed by plaintiffs Darryl Austin, Pearl Grice Austin, Beatrice Aviles, Brian Lynn Beckett, Vicki Beckett, Bonnie Good, Carol Jennings, Audrey Johns, Norman Johns, Marjorie Metcalf, Alvera Phillips, Romeld Phillips, Barbara Pratt, Jerry W Ream, Lynn Ream, Joni Scherting, Orlando Slowley, Patricia Slowley, Shary Stegall, Mary Stephens, Randall Lee Stephens, Ruth M. Valentine, Alberta Williams, Cliff Williams against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 06/16/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 15 (Vol. 14 of Exhibits B-50-B-53 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC617993) filed by plaintiffs Lawana Smith, Henry Smith, Clinton Jay Boggs, Karen Boggs, Luther Daniel, Norma Daniel, Shirley Farthing, Brenda Hankins, Johnathan Hankins, Mary Lyles, Virgile Lyles, Mary Ann Maxwell, Lola Miller, Patricia Ann Moore, Herbert Myers, Miriam M. Myers, Yurris McClendon, Verna Lea Nash, Dolores Pacheco, Alice Parks, Robert Parks, Bonnie Paul, Carl B. Paul, Kenneth Russell, Patricia Russell, Barbara Talbert, Glenford Talbert, Evelyn Thomas against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 04/22/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 15 (Vol. 14 of Exhibits B-50-B-53 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC595160 filed by Plaintiffs Tammy Clayton, Jane E. Goss, Leon Goss, Lloyd Hammock, Sue Hammock, Sandra Kendrick, Elizabeth Miller, Marlon D Miller, Juanita Moore, Folson Pitts, Joan Pitts, Patricia A. Rattay, Peter Rattay, John Shannon, Sally Shannon, Mixdalia Taime, Celina Sutton, Mark Sutton, Lottie Tucker, Anna Walker, Judy Weeks, James D. Weeks, Helen Wells, Richard Wells, Cheryl Dafford, Robert G. Dafford, Katrina Fulmore, Joe Fulmore, Peggy Wood, Jeff A. Wood, against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/1/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 16 OF VOLUME 15 (EXHIBIT B54 - B-59) OF EXHIBIT B-54 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et) Modified on 5/1/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC571105) filed by plaintiffs Dovie Abshire, Joseph Abshire, Arlene Beard, Ripple Belk, Sandra Bush, Linda Cole, Robert Cole, Jr, Fred Debock, Mary Debock, Connie Douglas, Alberta Finlay, Patricia Fritz, Raymond Fritz, Elizabeth Fulmore, James C Fulmore, Leona Grierson, Emma Guarr, Stephen F Guarr, Sheldon Harris, Patricia Harvey, Agnes Dale, Wanda Headrick, Terri Hillard, Eva Hollowell, Gary Steven Hollowell, Joann Jones, Richard L Jones, Janis Judd, Elizabeth Kwiatek, Mark J Kwiatek, Linda Layade, Alicia Martinez, Delaphine Miller, Allie Moore, Betty Moss, Betty Orris, Carolyn Ray, Yvonne Sarafan, Gary Joseph Schweitzer, Tracy Schweitzer, Judith Smalley, Thomas G Smalley, Marjorie Tobin, William J. Tobin, III, Charlotte Vasseur, Roberta Williams against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/06/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 15 (Vol. 14 of Exhibits B-50-B-53 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT [STATE COURT CASE NUMBER BC536936] against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Ramona Adame, Annette Adams, Belinda Adams, Joanna Adkins, Angela Aguilar-Garcia, Brenda Airey, Jeanna Alford-Horne, Betty Allen, Terry Alsayed, Barbara Alston, Mary Alsup, Tammy Amzil, Ethel Anderson, Michelle Anderson, Nancy Anderson, April Angle, Annie Anglin, Eunice Appleberry, Frances Archie, Meo Arnold, Susan Ashley, Marjorie Askey, Juanita Atha, Lucy Atkins, Dorothy Autry, Beverly Ayers, Linda Badger, Norma Bahr, Elizabeth Bailey, Cheryl Baker, Regina Balka, Juanita Banks, Patricia Barbeau, Zenith Barker, Dorris Barnes, Nancy Barnett, Catherine Battiste, Helen Beatty, Shirley Bedwell, June Bell, Arthuree Bennett, Esperanza Benson, Brenda Bernier, Bonnie Berry, Pamela Berryhill, Brenda Blackwell, Peggy Blalock-Spears, Joann Powell, Tracy Bliss, Marsha Blueshield, Gladys Booker, Cheryl Bosworth, Cecelia Bowden, Charlotte Bowen, Joanne Branch, Makibra Brewer, Joyce Bridschge, Aleda Brooks, Darlein Brothers, Barbara Brown, Mildred Buchanan, Flora Buckingham, Kathryn Buckner, Jacquelyn Burnett, Katie Burrows, Patricia J. Card, Jacki Claus, Christine Close, Stephanie Cohen, Katie Cole, Flora Collier, Patricia Cooper, Florence Cousineau, Rosemary Crouse, Rula Curtis, Denise Cyr, Linda Dakos, Carol Dendinger, Debra Dirks, Sharon Dupuy, Joyce Eldridge, Joyce Elliott, Ann Emmons, Kathleen Ferry, Bonnie Flyte, Lynnette Forthman, Cheri House, Barbara Lane, Helen Olson, Gloria Padilla. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2014 SUBMITTED AS EXHIBIT B-13 TO ATTACHMENT 6 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC625835] filed by Plaintiffs Vernell Davis, Johnnie Mae Dorsey, Penny Franklin, Wanda Frasier, Marietta Haugh, Vera Hayes, Betty Hoyt, Sandra Hunter, Silvia Kornhauser, Felicia Landon, Patricia Madden, Barbara Marshall, Emily Matthews, Marietta Moore, Claudette Morris, Mary Nye-Matthews, Rosie Owens, Florine Rodgers, Sharal Scully, Terrie Simmons, Charlotte Smith, Vonda Sterling, Julia Stewart, Pamela Stewart, Vinita Stewart, Deborah Taylor, Yolanda Walker, Gloria Watson and Gloria Williamson against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/01/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 14 OF VOLUME 13 (EXHIBIT B46 - B-49) OF EXHIBIT B-49 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1] ] (et) Modified on 4/30/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536940) filed by Plaintiffs Arlene Beckwith, Suzanne Bieniewicz, Gudfridur Bisbee, Sandra Burnett, Jean Casey, Bernice Cassidy, Josephine Chestnut, Mary Clark, Annie Coleman, Delores Congrove, Rose Conley, Mollie Corns, Maria Cotto, Shari Dann, Maria Diaz, Carol Ebert, Bernita Elko, Lessie Elza, Donna Emerson, Luz Escalera, Lelia Ferguson, Karen Fetherolf, Yolanda R Flanagan, Deborah Gibson, Janet Hansen, Linda Roy, Theresa Flowers, Vickie Foresman, Cynthia Fortson, Anna Gresko, Gladys Guadalupe, Jessie Hamilton, Sandra Haun, Kimberlea Haynes, Martha Hicks, Emma Hickson, Shirley Hudson, Carmella Jackson, Rhodella Jones, Jeanie Jurgeit, Carol Kelley, Susan Kennedy, Robin Labertagavadin, Marlene Lavango, Lori Lawrence, Donna Lawson, Donna Lewis, Sandra Lewis, Mary Lott, Margaret Martin, Mary McKnight, Dougletha McNeal, Linda S. Moran, Judith Morgan, Linda MOrton, Lyvonne Moss, Lena March, Anita Operario, Michelena Parker, Virginia Petak, Carol Peters, Nina Porter, Emma Pratt, Minette Price, Patti Reeder, Nora Reynolds, Elizabeth Rhoads, Anna Rider, Lachelle Rogers, Lois Rosenhahn, Poonia Samuel, Linda Saurer, Christine Shafer, Bernadette Sirocka, Ella Smith, Tonia Smith, Patricia Soskin, Terry Springer, Cheryl Starcher, Carol Steiniger, Janice Stewart, Laura Stewart, Beatrice Tucker, Kathie Van Epps, Gila Van Valkenburg, Carolyn Wahl, Barbara Weintraub, Dolores Wiest and Barbara Williams against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 14 OF VOLUME 13 (EXHIBIT B46 - B-49) OF EXHIBIT B-48 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ] ( (et) Modified on 4/30/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536933) filed by plaintiff Glennie Bligen, Mary Bradley, Mary Brooks, Bonnie Burns, Helen Calton, Rose Carnes, Mary Caskey, Eva Coddington, Jozette Davis, Elizabeth Dingle, Mary Dover, Pamala Fain, Virginia Fairnot, Josephine Foster, Marie Gahr, Joan Gallegly, Maureen George, Florence Gillis, Linda Girtz, Martha Greene, Kim Grimm, Christine Grubbs, Teresa Gunby, Abram Haberle, Patricia A Hall, Anita Hallmark, Peggy Harnish, Lori Harris, Jacqueline Harrison, Anita Hatcher, Laurel Herring, Cynthia Hipp, Sara Holloway, Bonita Howard, Patricia Hughes, Mavis Jacob, Collen Jenkins, Patti Kahl, Annie Kennedy, Sharon Knoepfler, Judith Kulp, Linda Lacey, Deborah Liboski, Alice Lundstrom, Tatyana Malenkovich, Ethel Marcus, Carol Mayfield, Joann McCauley, Eileen McElwee, Cynthia McRae, Khatereh Moldovan, Lolita Moreland, Terry Newcomb, Vida Nikolic, Christine Oliveri, Gayle Patla, Norleen Pearson, Mary Pollard, Kimberly Price, Linda Roberts, Merline O Sandvand, Kaye Schaller, Cynthia Seawright, Adrienne Seropian, Segalilt Siegel, Sandy Skasko, Bertha Smith, Ina Spencer, Charlotte Stover, Susan Hernandez, Almira Swygert, Becky Thomas, Maria Thomas-Lee, Dorothy Thompson, Linda Thompson, Karen Valvano, Laura Walker, Margie Walton, Judith Weltman, Ruth West, Lola White, Sherry Williamson, Bernice Winston, Jeannette Woods, Linda Woodward, Teresa Wright, Margaret Zapotoski against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/30/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 15 (Vol. 14 of Exhibits B-50-B-53 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536941) filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Barnes, Toby Barnes, Linda Black, Sharon Brown, Carolyn Bruner, Willie Byers, Joann Casey, Melinda Clinard, Darlene Combs, Ethel Cooper, Wanda Correia, Margaret Covert, Linda Gibson Cribb, Florence Dapo, Mary Ellen Davis, Patricia Davis, Carol Denton, Virginia Dunford, Patricia Easterling, Cheryl Faulkner, Rose Flores, Patricia Orr, Candacy Roberts-Anderson, Rebecca Edwards, Helen Einspahr, Nancy Espinoza, Beverly Flagg, Mary Garcia, Carla Gaskins, Robert Hansel, Wanda Hatchet, Rhonda Hopkins, Irene Jernigan, Mae Johnson, Odessa Johnson, Sharon, Johnson, Catherine Jones, Peggy, Joyce, Jeraldine Kenan, Alice Key, Quinette Keyes, Debbie Kridler, Ethel Lynch, Bonnie McDaniel, Barbara McKoy, Glynis McLendon, Sanra Middleton, Eugenia Monday, Lagha Mozoon, Annie Nixon, Pamela Norris, Linda Overcash, Brenda Pettigrew, Jeanette Podwinski, Janet Price, Robin Pruitt-Bowman, Annie Quick, Teresa Rhodes, Mary Sherrod, Sharron Siler, Glenda Simpson, Carolyn G. Smith, Mary Smith, Barbara Sullivan, Ellen Sunkel, Portia Tant, Rose May Taylor, Vidy Taylor, Paula Teague, Willette Thomas, Linda Thompson, Carlene Truax, Judy Vanlandingham, Elaine Vaughan, Martha Walker, Beatrice Wall, Bertha Walls, Dolores Waters, Teresa Wilkins-Blue, Mary Alice Williams, Priscilla Williamson, Estella Willis, Susie F. Willis, Barbara Wright, Margaret Wynn and Kathy Youmans against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 14 OF VOLUME 13 (EXHIBIT B46 - B-49) OF EXHIBIT B-47 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (et) Modified on 4/30/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 NON CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT CIVRS1306724, against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., filed by plaintiff Alma Richards. ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #1 ATTACHMENT 13, PAGE 212 OR 285. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: 13-CVC-8470) filed by plaintiff Cheri Lubenko against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/13/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 12 (Vol. 11 of Exhibits B-35-B-39 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC535923) filed by plaintiffs Aline Anthony, Martha Atkinson, Beverly Bailey, Patricia Black, Anita Bowles, Clara Boyd, Carmela Ciampa, Arletha Clifton, Sylvia Craft, Evelyn Johnson, Marlene Smith, Georgia Davis, Sheila Deitz, Shelly Downing, Lucille Flowers, Laura George, Mary E. Gonzalez, Deborah Herring, Rogee Jackson, Madeline Jones, Patricia Lewis, Ruth Majovsky, Reta Manthe, Sally Marlar, Elaine McCann, Dorothy Parks, Fannie Peeples, Janice Reeves, Carolyn Ruffin, Carolyn Ryant, Genny Shambaugh, Linda Siddell, Mary Simmons, Terri Simmons, Mildred Spears, Lynette Spencer, Terri Starkey, Karen Walters, Shirlie Winters, Alicia Woods against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/11/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 12 (Vol. 11 of Exhibits B-35-B-39 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC609198) filed by Plaintiffs Judy Anderson, Kathy Breaux, Darrell Faulkner, Samuel Gabriel, Elizabeth Gonsoulin, Elton Gonsoulin, Walter Jones, Rosetti Rhodes, Jonna Roberts, Marilyn Rome, Victor Rome, Marilyn A. Seeber-Scisco, Doris Shrader, Virgie Simmons, Donna Strunk, Cheryl Webster, Rickey Webster, Karen Yandle. against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1.50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 14 OF VOLUME 13 (EXHIBIT B46 - B-49) OF EXHIBIT B-46 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (Attorney Keith L Altman added to party Donna Strunk(pty:pla)) (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC537850 against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Joan Anteau, Wilma Arnold, Kathy Banks, Deborah Bartley, Sherri Biggs, Roberta Black, Carolyn Blanchard, Dorothy Boykins, Bettye Bradley, Linda Britton, Margaret Campbell, Arlene Cardenas, Sharon Cleveland, Connie Franklin, Sandra Gaines, Letitia Griffin, Mary Halbert, Robbie Halmon, Ida Jackson, Nancy Jacobs, Jeanette Lymas, Brenda McClinton, Cathy McGhee, Gloria Moore(an individual), Warrine Moore, Willie Mae Neal, Glenda Pettigrew, Susie Pritchett, Claudia Svihl, Audrey Walker, Betty Watkins, Betty Gibson, Donna Howard, Donna Keller, Jacquelyn Coogler, Donna Hutto, Barbara jackson, Ani Jackson, Easter Miller, Juanita Smith, Annie Williams, Virginua Harris, JoAnn Laslea, :amela Riley. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/14 ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #1 ATTACHMENT #13 PAGE 117 OR 285. (Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Joan Anteau(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Wilma Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Kathy Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Deborah Bartley(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Sherri Biggs(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Roberta Black(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Carolyn Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Dorothy Boykins(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Bettye Bradley(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Linda Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Margaret Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Arlene Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Sharon Cleveland(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Connie Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Sandra Gaines(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Letitia Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Mary Halbert(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Robbie Halmon(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Ida Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Nandy Jacobs(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Jeanette Lymas(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Brenda McClinton(pty:pla), Attorney Raymond Paul Boucher added to party Cathy McGhee(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Cathy McGhee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul R Kiesel added to party Gloria Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Helen E Zukin added to party Gloria Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Raymond Paul Boucher added to party Gloria Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Baharak Dejban added to party Gloria Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Gloria Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Warrine Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Willie Mae Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Glenda Pettigrew(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Susie Pritchett(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Claudia Svihl(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Audrey Walker(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Betty Watkins(pty:pla)) (twdb) Modified on 4/30/2018 (twdb).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536930) filed by plaintiffs Mary Armstrong, Wilihmena Arnold, Mable Beamon, Virgie Benson, Deborah Bertermann, Judy Brandy, Diana Brodie, Trudea Brooks, Carolyn Browning, Michelle Buchanan, Judy Burnham, Sheila Carter, Betty Catchings, Margaret Childs, Dorothy Clark, Clarissa Coleman, Kathy Connolly, Kimberly Crider, Amy Deberry, Helen Doerner, Musu Draper, Barbara Eilers, Yvonne Esquivel, Delia Evans, Evanetta Evans, Mary Ann Evans, Viola Faria, Atreine Finn, Vicki Florio, Dorothy Ford, Patricia Fraser, Maria Freyre, Elizabeth Gary, Marilyn Gerdes, Mary Gordon, Debra Graham, Gannie Hailey, Linda Hall(an individual), Stephanie Hardin, Arlene Harpestad, Mary Ann Harvey, Pam Howell, Glenda Huskey, Francis Jefferson, Annie Johnson, Victoria Johnson, Darlene Jordan, Betty Keene, Sheryl Kennedy, Reba Kessler, Maude Kimble, Sonya Lewis, Margaret Lindenfelser, Janet Lowery, Sharon Markham, Minnie L Martin, Mary McBride, Charleeta McFarland-Pete, Dorothy McKinstry, Belinda McLeod, Karen Miller, Mary Mitchell, Ida Nelson, Linda Oatis, Deborah Pederson, Ruby Pittman, Cassandra Powell, Dawn Pulliam, Wendy Roberts, Victoria Robertson, Theola Robinson, Anna Schaffer, Jacquelyn Schlessman, Sharon L. Schuster, Phyllis Scott, Lisa Seller, Donna Short, Patricia Simmons, Deloris Smith, Doris Smith, Beverly Thomas, Beverly VanRuden, Eunice Varner, Viola Vinyard, Pansy Voss, Kimberly Waltner, Kathleen Weber, Irene Wedl, Judy Whipple. against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 12 (Vol. 11 of Exhibits B-35-B-39 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC620308 against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Sharon Adams, Diane Beringer(an individual (From State Court Complaint, Case Number: BC620308)), Mary Ann Bracey, Courtney Bragg, Bernice Broadnax-Jolly, Linda Brown, Rosemary Caringella, Kathleen Evans, Lousetta Foley, Laura Ingram, Tula Jordan, Alma Kozack, Tina Lester, Debra Ligon, Genevieve Monreal, Diane Moon, Evelena Poole-Johnson, Thelma Price, Rose Rowe, Donna Sestak, Vera Smith, Margaret Thomas, Ruby Vigne, Bertine Walls. FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/12/16 ATTACHED to Document #1 attachment 13, filed on 3/1/18. page 59 of 285. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC537851 against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Essie Allen, Beryl Anderson, Belinda Annable, Candace Avery, Bea Bilek, Mamie Boyd, Sheila Brown, Vanna Brown, Delores Bryant, Trina Butler, Michelle Calhoun, Diana Carrington, Annie Carter, Sheila Clouser, Priscilla Cook, Amy Cortes, Lynn Craig, Marretta Van Dunk, Violet Estrada, Ethel Faulk, Mary Ann Ferrell, Neta Few, Constance Hudson, Mary Isbell, Renee Johnson, Eva Jump, Celestine Loveless, Marie Marino, Myrtle Mayes, Blanca Mejia, Minnie Moore, Patrice Murphy, Juanita Randall, Janice Reed, Vivian Satchel, Michelle Teague, Phillis Tolson-Williams, Rose Williams, Blanche Woodley. filed in state court on 2/27/14 attached to Document #1 attachment 13, page 15. (Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Candace Avery(pty:pla), Attorney Baharak Dejban added to party Bea Bilek(pty:pla), Attorney Baharak Dejban added to party Vivian Satchel(pty:pla), Attorney Shahin F Khorrami added to party Phillis Tolson-Williams(pty:pla)) (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC645186) filed by plaintiffs Ramona J. Beckett, Bette J. Carroll, Luis Carroll, Marguerite Cook, Ronald Cook, Charlene Culbreath(an individual (from State Court Complaint BC537052)), Annie Davis, Cynthia De Saeger, Gratien F De Saeger, Janice Ferganchick, Wilhelmia Franklin, Carol Fuentes, Cathy Garner, James S Hall, Shirley M. Hall, Amal Jones, Robert Jones, Kathleen Kinsman, Linda Langdon, Deborah J Lill, Leslie Lill, Patricia Marion, Leslie McHenry, Dianne B Murray, Mildred Newby, Doris Owens, Jesteen Raines, Olivia Renteria-Komura, Charles Roby, Jr, Gayle Roby, Geraldine Tilkens, Elroy F Tilkens, Gail S Johnson, Johnnie Johnson, Linda Rogers, Lerlene Taylor, The Estate of Gena Cranford, Judith Wojnovich, Rita Miley, Shirley Young, Ellen Zucker, Stanley Zucker against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/30/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 12 (Vol. 11 of Exhibits B-35-B-39 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536931) filed by Plaintiffs Paula Blue, Tammy Brooks, Flora Burnett, Alberta Carleton, Donna Carr, Joyce Cary, Markell Caton, Gwendolyn Chandler, Geraldine Chapman, Evelyn Copeland, Margaret Daniels, Kathleen Dewey, Jeanette Dodson, Gwendolyn Donnelly, Denise Elliott, Naomi Ellison, Iola Finch, Alta Freeman, Julia Gardner, Susan Gerry, Theresa Gomes, Dianne Guentner, Tabathy Guillot, Tomie Isrel, Gwendolyn Rainey, Marion B. Hanson, Barbara Harvey, Debbie Hash, Clara Hazelton, Lisa Henderson, Shirley Heppler, Wanda Hull, Constance Hummer, Dorothea Intinarelli, Robbin Irish, Anne Marie Isbell, Evalina Johnson, Lucille Jolly, Renee Jones, Paulette Kennedy, Constance Kenny, Beverly King, Viriginia Knauff, Lula Ann M. Lee, Cynthia Lemay, Josephine Leonard, Violet Lofton, Sandra Malbrough, Kimberly D. Martin, Linda Massarelli, Delores McGee, Helen McNabb, Angela Michalski, Grace Miller, Golden Morgan, Kathleen Morgan, Virigi Morgan, Vernita Oliver, Patty Pearce, Donna Phillips, Patricia Prince, Nova Rachal,Linda Reeves, Chanel Richard, Cheryl Robinson, Shelia Sacks, Kimberly Sanchez, Cherie Schaffer, Judy Smarch, Barbara Smith, Virginia Spaulding, Marolyn Spence, Hattie Spencer, Suzanne c. Stephens, Kathy Stevens, Wanda Stone, Irma Thorn, Debra Trevino, Angela Vanzandt, Victoria Vaughan, Rosetta Walker, Marilyn Warren, Dorothy Weathers, Ruby White, Kathy Wigginton, Erma Williams, Evelyn Williams, Lisa Williams, Vientiane Wilson and Tammy Wolf against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 11 OF VOLUME 10 (EXHIBIT B31 - B-34) OF EXHIBIT B-34 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ] (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC622449), filed by plaintiffs Yvonne Alexander, Karen Allen, Nina Bell, May Blake, Ina Brown, Mildred Ann Brown, Linda Buckley, Beulah Carter, Mamie Cayson, Paulette Crawford, Phyllis Dober, Margaret Everts, Patricia Fortune, Darlene Franklin, Sharon Fulton, Marcia Genatowski, Sima Hamedi, Peggy Hart, Charlotte Hines, Rosina Howard, Myrle Jackson, Deborah Jenkins, Kimberlyn Jones, Linda Jones, Sharon Karroll, Louise Kendrick, Renee Koelle, Gracie Moore, Tillie Olson, Jeanette Paulin, Lujuana Peterson, Vera Reeder, Beverly Rule, Doretha Sampson, Joe L. Sampson, Dana Shilling, Gloria Sickman, Christine Sutton, Rudy Trujillo, Theresa Trujillo, Cathy Verhalen, Dorothy Walker, Taneshia Worthean against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/03/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO 12 (Vol. 11 of Exhibits B-35-B-39 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC664367 against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Venicia Avila, Linda Jeffers. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/1/18 SUBMITTED WITH VOLUME 3 EXHIBIT B-7 - B-9. PAGE 114. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC537836) filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Bernard, Mamie Durio, Josephine Falzon, Brenda Gamble, Patricia Goodrich, Bernita Hall, Vergie Hall, Susan McFarland, Bertha Nelams, Charlene Peden, Mildred Sluder, Sharon Turner, Maryline Valenti, Eva Hundson, Glorius Keys, Una Mae Carson, Barbara Cole, Annie Dunn, Tecolia Harrington, Stella Lipori, Deborah Maclin, Denise Manning, Gay-Maria Tirado, Robert A. Green, Lucretia Stephnes, Chevorilynne Dunbar, Jewel Miller, Sara Mullens, Martha Robinson, Elouise Scott, Angela Lewis, Barbara Lewis, Cynthia Lucky, Tammie McBride, Melba Davis, Brenda Best, Darlene Johnson, Mary Kirk, Mary Manson and Patricia Thrasher against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded., [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 11 OF VOLUME 10 (EXHIBIT B31 - B-34) OF EXHIBIT B-33 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (et) Modified on 4/30/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC538104) filed by plaintiffs Deborah Adams, Louella Andrews, Barbara Bishop, Vertis Blevins, Margaret Brockway, Rochelle Brown-Malone, Brigitte Bush, Brenda Buss, Maria Carroll, Sandra Dalan, Doris Dalton, Jami Delliquadri, Isabel Diaz, Juanita Douglas, Faye Enriquez, Linda Franzone, Staci Freeland, Carol Gibson, Catherine Graham, Cindy Lindloff, Kathy Long, Shirley Massop, Theresa Mitchell, Paula Mushol, Teresa Neely, Trina Pinegar, Christine Pittman, Helen Puffer, Rita Russell, Carla Sampson, Laverne Samuel, Sheila Seltzer, Montressa Smith, Carmen Soler, Margaret Stewart, Patricia Tyler, Tonya Tyler, Eva Villanueva, Betty Welcome, Annie Willis, Georgia Woodson, Chansonnette Parnell, Jennie Selim, Sharon Taylor, Cynthia Mitchell, Mary Metcalf, Irene Young, Mary Youngblood against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 10 (Vol. 9 of Exhibits B-25-B-30) TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC538066) filed by plaintiffs Ozella Bailey, Andrea Buckner, Sandra Cheeseboro, Susan Chenault, Betty Clay, Zoe Daniel, Julia Felder, Regina Ferberdino, Norma Grant, Wynell Griffin, Deana Hoffman, Ruth Jackson, Mattie Johnson, Sylvia Johnson, Mary Lasonde, Ollia Marcum, Natasha Marshall, Brigitte Milligan, Gloria Mitchell, Cherry Morton, Joanne Nacoste, Patricia Pittman, Clarissa Robinson, Teresa Schultz, Cindy Vandenburg, Gloria Vargas, Denise Warren, Jannie Wilson, Vera Wilson, Ollia Fay Marcum, Deborah McCloud, Gail Milsap, Debra Rideout, Mary Stimpson, Cynthia Strickland, Virginia Styron, Debra Taylor, Donna Foster, Karen West, Gertrude Lias, Virginia Huffman, Anna Melendez, Mary Lowman, Carrie Tisdale, Mary Puckett, Deetta Morrison, Betty Omspaush, Gloria Pease, Alberta Perkins, Carole Perry against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 10 (Vol. 9 of Exhibits B-25-B-30)) TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536938), filed by Plaintiffs Nita Baker, Wanda Bingham, Znobbie Bishop, Jewel Bohanon, Ada Brooks, Tiffany Broussard, Elizabeth Brown, Jacqueline Bryant, Lena Burnette, Jamie Campbell, Eva Cates, Teri Chisolm, Joyce Clark(From State Court Complaint BC536938), Nona Cleaver, Felicia Colbert, Janice Coleman, Ruby Connell, Betty Coon, Rosalyn Cotton, Stephanie Cotton, Carrie Couch, Brenda Daniels, Ruth Decker, Patricia Delair, Judi Diffey, Zurita Gray, Pauline Orozco, Clara Donnett, Margaret Dukes, Audra K. Duplessis, Judith Frost, Oda Fay Fugate, Lavera George, Pamela Girladi, Gertrude Goodie, Martha Granado, Jean Grayson, Delores Green, Karen Guthrie, Rita Habegger, Linda Harrell, Jessie Harris, Carol Hatton Kimberly Helton, Carolyn Henderson, Margaret Henson, Dorothy Higgs, Patsy Hines, Deb Hoffman, Jeannette Holtz, Susan Honchell, Peggy Jenkins, Vernaline Jenkins, Darla Johnson, Robecca Jones, Lois Laboy, Carol Lindsey, Michelle Little, Sherre Long, Rachel McDonald, Judy McKenna, Teresa Miller, Michelle Miracle, Tona Moore, Deborah Mullins, Minerva Music, Donna J. Patch, Naomi Patton, Shelly Probst, Erica Radford, Margie Rogers, Nancy Rogers, Ethel Salisbury, Lori Schnarr, Patricia Scott, Sharon Setters, Connie Sidebottom, Marcia Sledge, Kathy K. Smith, Mitzi Smith, Lynnae Sommers, Dorothy SOrg, Ammanda Taylor, Cynthia Taylor, Luquetia Taylor, Anna Tingler, Debra Tinkle, Elizabeth Vanover, Mary Wehner and Melinda Williams against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 11 OF VOLUME 10 (EXHIBIT B31 - B-34) OF EXHIBIT B-32 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ] (et) Modified on 4/30/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536932), filed by Plaintiffs Marlene Bailey, Katherine Barzar, Yvonne Basden, Jeanette Campbell, Pamela Campbell, Abisac Clark, Gwendolyn Clark, Alicia Considine, Nettie Craig-Shrout, Cynthia Demaree, Gayle Dirksen, Catrina Eimer, Barbara Ells, Janet Fick, Emma Frields, Mary Galason, Idella Gale, Anita Gay, Lauretta George, Penny Lynn Guevara, Georgia Haddock, Marilyn Ham, Kimberly Hardy, Ella Harris, Marilyn Meehan,Donna Edmond, Susan Garrett, Pinkie Hill-Robinson, Delores Howard, Linda Huisel, Gail James, Dorothy Johnson, Carmen Jones, Hiron Jones, Mariel Killiebrew, Lois Kratzner, Jacqueline Kusch, Hazel Law, Clara Lee, Jeanette Levisee, Eular Lyons, Nettie Mackey, Kathie Maples, Emma McClenaghan, Nancy McGee, Roberta McGovern, Cathy Mitchell, Cheryl Mixon, Evabelle Muilenburg, Cindy Parsons, Beverly Pegg, Betty Piersel, Patricia Pinyan, Billie Poole, Edna Posey, Wanda Redell-Banta, Rosa M. Rodriguez, Aida Rosario, Valerie Sanders, Jean Sauer, Angela Schilling, Dorothy Schmidt,Sonya Scott, Joan Scott-Tabb, Joan Seabolt, Letitia Shoemake, Ronda Shoemaker, Joan Smith, Kathleen Smithhenry, Carolyn Stewart, Racheal Stinson, Louise Styles, Linda Taylor, Carolyn Terry, Sarah Thomas, Rosetta Underwood, Rosemary Van Den Broecke, Beth Vanderhorn, Rachel Vasquez, Myra Veentier, Doris Wall, Debra Warren, Beverly Whisenton, Marie White, Sheryl Wilcox, Eartha Williams, Ellen Williams, Loraine Williams, Wendy Wintjen, Edna Woodard against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/14/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 11 OF VOLUME 10 (EXHIBIT B31 - B-34) OF EXHIBIT B-31 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ] (et) Modified on 4/30/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536937) filed by plaintiffs Arpik Babakhani, Pearl Brantley, Pauline Brown, Sheila Brunson, Bertha Byrd, Aline Chatman, Leola Christful, Mattie Clark, Wylene Clemons, Yolanda Cornelious, Daisy L Cullens, Carolyn Cummins, Rebecca Davis, Lucile Deloach, Gina Dockery, Tara Engram, Donna Evans, Brenda Flynt, Jaqueline Funk, Gail Fussell, Wanda Galloway, Jackie Gordon, Karen Gordon, Mary Gore, Karen Gwyn, Janice L Haberman, Shirley Hardmon, Darla Harmon, Helen Harris, Teresa Hatcher, Katherine Hicks, Charlotte Hill, Tess Hinton, Carol Hooper, Priscilla Hunter, Candace Hurley, Diana James, Marsha Jenkins, Carol Jewell, Dorothy Jones, Margarett Jones, Jane Key, Earnestine Lucky, Cynthia Lutin, Susan Lyndsley, Cheryl McPherson, Laura Millwood, Carol Moore, Nettie Moore, Glenda Moxley, Lily Noles, Gloria Odom, Myra Parsons, Judy Partee, Margaret Perkins, Dorothy Peterson, Patricia Ray Phillips, Edna Pierce, Anna Powell, Clara Randle, Glenda Reid, Waltraud Risley, Marie Rutledge, Mary Rayan, Clara Seay, Lucynda Smith, Nancy Smith, Barbara Steele, Larvonne Strong, Christine Tanner, Margaret Taylor, Alethia Thackerson, Shirley Thomas, Devonia Tiner, Nancy Tu, Gladys Tucker, Jeri Turner, Wearnee Tyson, Barbara Ulmer, Wilma Vann, Agnes Watkins, Carolyn Whatley, Dorothy Whitener, Brenda Whitzell, Beverly Willingham, Diane Wolf, Candy Wright against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/27/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 10 (Vol. 9 of Exhibits B-25-B-30)) TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC554988) filed by plaintiffs Jean Casper, Stephen Casper, Crystal Clark, Lonnie Clark, Steven Crysler, Lillie Davis, Helen Elliott, Pamela Foster, Debra Hopkins, Sadie Kyles, Debbie Leblang, Harry B. Litton, Jr, Olga Rosario, Brenda Smith, Lynn Smith, Josephine Warren, Bernard Wittman, Carol Wittman against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/27/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 10 (Vol. 9 of Exhibits B-25-B-30)) TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC620597) filed by plaintiffs Diane Bell, Diane Beringer(an individual (From State Court Complaint, Case Number: BC620308)), Elizabeth Debay, Jane Doane, Linda Ellis, Debra Harris, Sallie Holmes, Valerie Knight, Terri Lindholm, Janice McNeil, Debra Morrison-Hackman, Linda Porter, Michele Sharp, Josie Sterling, Patricia Storey, Marie Sykes, Theresa Young against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/27/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO.10 (Vol. 9 of Exhibits B-25-B-30)) TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )). (jp) Modified on 4/27/2018 (jp).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT [CASE NUMBER: BC631285] filed by Plaintiffs Barbara J Adams, Terry M. Anders, Karla D. Auld, Lynda D. Barnett, Kris Renee Butler, Sonja Chupik, Lorie Ann Coates, Debra Shay Coleman, Maggie R. Collier, Ramona Darice Craycraft, Cynthia Faye Davis, June E. Dewitt, Nadine Alese Downing, Faye Duncan, Janet Sue Elenbaas, Patricia Ann Faddis, Violet J. Flynn, Arrie Theresa Gehan, Joyce Ortaliz Geronca, Trina Marie Gibson, Helen Faye Golden, Sheila Green, Carolyn Ruth Harvel, Cheryl Hayes, Melissa E. Hayne, Ninfa Cevallos Hinojosa, Brenda C. Hobbs, Pamela Holloway, Mary Jean Holt, Karen Sue Hornick, Carol Huntowski, Shirley A. Jackson, Sharon A. Elaine Jacobsen, Corrine Penelope Jeffers, Delores Johnson,Peggy Kaiser, Geraldine Kopczenski, Vicki A. Laytart, Cheri L. Layton, Antonia Lopez, Mary Ann Lucas, Kathy Lynn Lukenbill, Mary MacDowell, Tina Marie Marsh, Wanda McKinney, Dorothy McMurray, Rosario Mendex-Meza, Yvonne Mitchell, Ronda L. Morez, Brenda L. Murphy, Mary Helen Navarro, Brenda Palmer, Diana Lynn Powers, Joyce Pride, Linda G. Privett, Sherry Ellen Mae Ratliff, Laura Lee Reynolds, Vicky Reynolds, Ruth Ann Rich, Novalee RObbins, Betty J. Robinson, Janice Elaine Roque, Frankie G. Rose, Judith Ann Ruf, April G. Salinas, Kyucha Samara, Debra Bennice Scott, Mary M. Smith, Nancy A. Smith, Lisa Jane Soape, Darlene Toledo, Wanda Kay Walter, Emma Wanicki, Ann Louise Waskiewicz, Alice B. Wells, Tammy White, Mary C. Whitfield, Janet Higgins Wilding, Jennie A. Williams, Mary E. Williams, Kathy Lynn Wood, Sharon A. Wright against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50 Jury Demanded., [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/22/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 9 OF VOLUME 8 (EXHIBIT B21 - B-24) OF EXHIBIT B-24 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ] (et) Modified on 4/26/2018 (et). Modified on 4/27/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ORIGINAL COMPLAINT [BC648688], filed by Plaintiffs Corine Alford, Laura Aponte, Jeanette Bland, Gloria Bozeman, Mary Covault, Carolyn Davis, Margarita Esquivel, Jane Gekker, Anita Hudson-Meadows, Wanda Johnson, Deborah Kaker, Connie Lee, Bess MacConnell, Gertrude Orlando, Jamie Pendergraft,Betty Ragan, Tommy Ragan, Gloria Randle, Gwendolyn Robinson, Carolyn Roddy, Christopher Roddy, Betty Smith, Gladys Stokeley, Louise Webber, Shirley Wellman, Myra Williams, Kelly Wilson-Butler against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/30/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 9 OF VOLUME 8 (EXHIBIT B21 - B-24) OF EXHIBIT B-23 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ] (et) Modified on 4/26/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: 34-2013-00151922) filed by plaintiff Valerie Davisagainst Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/24/2013 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 10 OF VOLUME 9 (EXHIBITS B-25-B-30 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC536939) filed by Plaintiffs Janet Anglin, Ruby Barnes, Ira Bennett, Susan Berry, Vera Black, Patricia Blackwell, Rebecca Blackwood, Debora Boles, Ann Marie Boyle, Arlene Braxton, Chantia Brown, Lilly Brown, Sherry Bruner, Loraine/Willie Cantrell, Barbara Carlton, Delores Caruthers, Portia Chamberlin, Ann Childs, Evelyn Chisholm, Sharon Clark, Carol Cooper, Loretta Curley, Andrea Paul, Bonnie Cribbs, Geneta Daly, Anabella L. Darnell Barbara Davision, Sharon Dearing, Mary Dicus, Judy Dollins, Margarita Domingues, Claudia Dorf, Patricia N. Doyle, Arlene Fields, Dolneice-Foster, Jacqueline Fowler, Carol Gagnon, Agnes Garrick, Helen Gatti, Antoinete Gross, Lavergne Hale, Karen Harrison, Deanna Heath, Jeanette Henry, Voronica Hood, Lawrence Jessop, Judy Lalone, Rosemarie Lehman, Bobbi Limburg, Barbara Logan, Martha Luera, Shirley Madole, Camila Mattyas, Josephine McGowan, Mary Meale, Anna Mergaugey, Rosemary Moore, Derri Morgan, Doris Oberhardt, Dolores Pacheco, Marilyn Paduano, Delia Parages-Gregor, Judy Patillo, Kathleen Pemberton, Marguerite Poole, Sonia Quinones, Eileen Raslowsky, Elizabeth Revelle, Joanne Rhoden, Maria Rich, Anne Richards, Luz M. Rosario, Nellie Ross, Patricia Rowland, Billie Jean Schrum, Kellie Selvage, Carole Simmons-Decort, Linda Simpson, Bonnie Slay, Tonia Stacey, Anne Tammaro, Delores Tinsley, Jeanette Torres, Cecelia Vargas, Olga Vasquez, Mona Waddell, Debra Waltz, Eva Will, Yvonne Woodberry, Judy Zabala against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does1-50. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/14/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 9 OF VOLUME 8 (EXHIBIT B21 - B-24) OF EXHIBIT B-22 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ] (Attorney Eric William Gruenwald added to party Loraine/Willie Cantrell(pty:pla)) (et) Modified on 4/25/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC632342) filed by plaintiffs Neberta Ackron, Joni Boles, Julia Bowman, Phyllis Brent, Judith Brooks-Ware, Jimella Brown, Richard Brown, Verlean Brown, Victoria Butenhoff, Josie Calhoun, Ruthie Chatman, Valerie Clem, Billie Combs, Raji Donat, Betty Dooley, Ramona Ellis, Jean Elson, Lena Esquivel, Phyllis Faller, Michele Finney, Jeanette Gant, Guadalupe Garcia, Zeina Ghandour, Celestine Gibbs, Millie Grant, Ruthie Griffin, Denise Harrell, Josie Harrell, Shirley Harris, Farah Hodges, Polly Holmes, Gale Hutchinson, Rabihah Issa, Joann Johnson, Aline Jones, Glenda Knight, Vickie Lawler, Beth Lawn, Wendy Lynch, Yvette Madsen, Sonya Manigo, Minnie May, Verda Miller, Betty Mitchell, Iola Mitchell, Barbara Moorehead, Mary Moten, Dixie Murray, Barbara Nadolski, Debra Newman, Marisol Nunez, Linda Owens, Robin Petit, Taryn Powell, Gale Shemwell, Edna Mae Silvester, Laverne Simmons, Esther Skrine, Theresa Smith-Allen, Betty Steffen, Romma stepetin, Romma Stepetin, Nancy Tedesco, Rosyna Toure, Magda Trager, Jodi Veer, Minverva Velazquez, Sabrina Whitaker, Angela Williams, Jan Marie Williams, Rose Williams, Rosetta Wills, Renee Wilson, Melody Windom, Jacqueline Wunder against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/31/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 7 OF VOLUME 6 (EXHIBIT B-15-B-17 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp) Modified on 4/25/2018 (jp).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC631286), filed by Plaintiffs Teresa A. Blair, Denise Boucher, Nemesia Pascual Brown, Rose Mary Burroughs, Sherry Burton, Rose A. Carpenter, Kathryn Loy Cooper-Shorter, Dorothy Marie Crabtree, Hope S. Crabtree, Debbie J. Davis, Ronda Leigh Dobson, Christine Mary Drazkowski, Phyllis Ann Flinchpaugh, Martha Diana Gay, Teresa Marie Gildersleeve, Rebel Lee Guertin, Darlene Carnley Havard, Lyzette M. Colon Nieves, Molly Kathleen Hirschfield, Karen M. Hudson, Lavone Hutchinson, Ellen Suzanne Johnson, Linda M. Lavin, Jeanette Leary, Shirley J. Leggate, Elizabeth A. Leonard, Loretta M. Locklear, Tammy Ann Muscarella, Dawna K. Parker, Elizabeth Louise Parrish, Catherine Porter, Margarita Y. Quintana, Joanna Mary Reyes-Rivera, Christina Lynn Robertson, Milda Jangar Robles, Revelon Schmidt, Glenda Nell Scott, Donna Sue-Sebastian, Bonnie Lee Selby, Kelsey Caroline Sims, Mary E. Smith, Nicole Spain, Joan C. Splendido, Victor Rae Sylvester, Victoria Janna Taylor, Bonnie L. Wantz, Ethel R. Williams against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Does 1-50,. Jury Demanded. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/14/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 9 OF VOLUME 8 (EXHIBIT B21 - B-24) OF EXHIBIT B-21 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ] (et) Modified on 4/25/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC538103) filed by Plaintiffs Viola Allen, Linda Asberry, Colleen Bloodsaw, Everlean Cage, Maria Carbajal, Katrenna Casey, Mildred Champion, Rosalind Clarke, Eula Collins, Verna Curtis, Doris, Williams, Willie Dell Gardner, Ann Givan, Barbra Grant, Peggy Hammond, Johilda Harris, Leola Hawkins, Linda Hyde, Nina Mozee, Willie Mae Thomas, Leslie Wilson, Maryann Jones, Mary Warren, Rachel Pepples, Anita Berry, Lurena Charelston, Elizabeth Greer, Gloria Hunt, Toyea Knazze, Juanita Knowles, Patricia Martin, Margaret Murry, Debra Olson, Gwendolyn Purnell, Faye Stokes, Essie Mae Harris, Leta Watson, Judy Knott, Velma Whiting, Pamela Couch against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 8 OF VOLUME 7 (EXHIBIT B18 - B-20) OF EXHIBIT B-20 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ), (et)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC643523) filed by plaintiffs Dena Blackmore, Margene Bowman, Mary Brewer, Palma Bruno, Sheila Davis, Josephine Dollarhide, Wanda Fitzpatrick, Mary Gorie, Janet Hansen, Kimberly Himes, Lizzie Hughes, Ivy Hutzler, Peggy Jenkins, Kalyphall Kivq, Anita Losoya, Barbara Luke, Loretta Manners, Arthleen McDowell, Kathleen McFarlin, Regina McGill, Mary Melching, Linda Miller, Vianna Moore, Janine Patat, Patricia Phillips, Rosa Rodriguez, Patricia Romagnoli, Jessie Russell, Linda Shelley, Gloria Small, Debra Stewart, Gloria Veazie against Defendants Myrtis Mack, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/14/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 7 OF VOLUME 6 (EXHIBIT B-15-B-17 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC623414), filed by Plaintiffs Sharon Bradley, Sharon Campbell, Yvonne Campbell, Gloria Clark, Jeanette Coleman, Maggie Combs, Dorothy Connolley, Debra Cornish, Arnetta Curry, Barbara Cutcher, Chris Erickson, Helene Fowler, Geraldine Hayes, Janet Henderson, Della Hutchinson, Irma Johnson, Joretha Kellum, Bertha Leonetti, Patsy Lowery, Judy Mackey, Marie Martinez, Margie Montgomery, Gabrielle Nardone, Jane oden, Christine Oliver, Angelea Panos, Joan Picha, Ann Poague, Genese Pugh-Williams, Elsie Ricahrds, Terry Roby, Kelly Ross, Geraldine Senior, Beverly Simpson, Pearl Stokes, Evelyn Thomas, Alberta Thompson, Sandra Thon, Carmen Villalobos, Denise VItal, Jacqueline Winston, Teresa Wright against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/10/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 8 OF VOLUME 7 (EXHIBIT B18 - B-20) OF EXHIBIT B-19 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ) (et) Modified on 4/25/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC583448) filed by plaintiffs John Beneda, Shari Beneda, Doris Cater, Sharlene Chapman, Barbara Clifton, Chuck R. Dobson, Marci Dobson, Gloria Donovan, Alva Doty, Linda Ennis, Shirley Felty, Nadine Fisher, James D Goins, Kathy Goins, Fannie Harper, Michael R Miller, Jo Ann Hughes, William Frank Hughes III, Patricia A Hull, Barbara A Kanedy, David Lee Kandey, Harriett Kelly, Jomarie Klipatrick, Trina Love, Charles M tucker, Georgina Mettler, Robert E Mettler, Sandra Newell, Norma Potter, Patricia Seaman, Anne Snipes, Dona Trorp, Rosemary Toelcke-Smith, Michael L Smith, Nancy Watters, Delores Wright Goss, Irma Davenport, Wallace Wayne Davenport, Barbara Miller, Walter Miller, Mary Sain, Jerry Sain, Murlena Williams, Lisa Dews, Ronald Dews, Hattie McIntosh, Jackson McIntosh, Ann Reigler, Joyce Davis, Jacqueline R White, Jacoby B White, Lois Voiles, Richard Voiles, Josephine Perry, Robin Dean, Lance E Dean against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/29/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 7 OF VOLUME 6 (EXHIBIT B-15-B-17 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC627217) filed by Plaintiffs Ellanor Akers, Louella Andrews, Joy Balderrama, Deniece Barrett, Mary Lou Botteron, Linda Brandau, Barbara Bray, Mildred Brown, Annie Burgess, Barbara Butler, Grace Caiazza, Christine Calloway, Linda Carter, Linda Collie, Peggy Cosby, Carolyn Crawford, Frances D'Alessio, Shirley Daniel-Rundberg, Susie Deal, Fannie Eames, Shirley Evans, Ruth Fields, Carol Fisher, Martha Bright Jordan, Jean Fletcher, Hope Gallegos, Teresa Garrison, Paulette Gipson, Linda Glenn, Betty Gorelick, Theresa Gregory, Theresa Gregory, Diana Harp, Harold Henry III, Judith Hilliard, Ronald W. Holt, Shirley Howard, Sushma Jain, Danelle Jannazo, Christina Johnson, Stephanie Johnson, Lola Jones, Bettie Junkin, Annette Kincaid, Geraldine Kirk, Eileen Leeth, Kathleen Lickiss, Gladys Mathews, Annette McClaren, Paula McGee, Miriam Mikolajewski, Anita Miller-Maxwell,Naomi Oden, Helenore Owens, Saundra Patterson, Vivian Penaflor, Susan Patterson, Carla Porterfield, Lillie Powell, Jolene Quinn, Arlice Randolph, Jacquelyn Reese, Paul Renfroe, Cathy Roberts, Janet Rose, William T. Rowlands, Reday Samy, Shirley Sanders, Donna Schaeffer, Beulah Seal, Susan Shafer, Ester Spencer, Juatassa Stephens, Ellen Stern, Jill Stuart, Marcella Sy-Smith, Linda Walker, Margaret Walker, Delois Walton, Monica Washington, Margie Williams, Michelle Wooden, Eula Wooten, Sherry York, Judy Zippi against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/14/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 8 OF VOLUME 7 (EXHIBIT B18 - B-20) OF EXHIBIT B-18 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1 ) (et). Modified on 4/25/2018 (et).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT CASE NUMBER BC642382 against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Mary Baker, Cynthia Baldwin, Lori Barnett, Diane Black, Mary Bohannon, Janice Boyle-Coulter, Louise Braddock, Carmen Brantley, Helen Chandler, Earlene Crews, Mary Crowe, Sandra Dotson, Dorothy Dunlap, Brenda Ennis, Dora Flores, Marianne Folise, Sylvia Garza, Barbara Goodman, Barbara Halvorson-Magee, Jennifer Harvey, Robin Harvey, Margaret Heri, Deborah Holley, Cheryl Holquist, Betty Hurst, Elizabeth Isom, Carolyn Jefferson, Debra Jibri, Cynthia Johnson, Judy C. Johnson, Veronica Johnson, Nancy Katz, Betty Kersey, Susan Kester, Janice Krattiger, Linda Lacey, Judy Lane, Brenda Lotts, Penny Love, Elda Lunsford, Yolanda Mares, Diana Matte, Mary McCawley, Linda McKannan, Michelle Meggie, Margaret Ann Melton, Connie Michels, Yolanda Monday, Ellie Moore, Ella Mops, Catherine Morris, Glenda Oden, Sylvia Olmstead, Uwaiye Omorogieva, Kathleen Planitzer, Kim Provitt, Helen Reed, Joanne Roesler, Jirri Sanders, Jeryl Scott, Belinda Shepard, Franchetta Starnes, Donna Tiner, Dorothy Trujillo, Glenda Turner, Stephanie D. Walker, Vickie Welch, Joyce Wheeler-Thornton, Betty Whitten, Patricia Wilcox, Barbara Williams, Peggy Wilson. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/30/2016 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 OF VOLUME 5 EXHIBIT B-12 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC 537407) filed by plaintiffs Lorita Adams, Betty Atkins, Denelle Bailey, Omega Bell, Nandini Bellara, Cynthia Bienemy, Josephine Brown, Angela Byrd, Susan Craycraft, Mable Donald, Diane Draper, Bonnie Fultz, Carolyn Nash Jones, Donna Gentry, Shirley Hale, Gwendolyn Holder, Deborah Jamerson, Jacqualynn Murphy, Kasum Patel, Marjorie Ramirez, Barbara Tadlock, Rosalie Woods against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/24/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 5 OF VOLUME 4 (EXHIBIT B10 - B-11) TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC 615571) filed by plaintiffs Phyllis Armstrong, Theresa Bagliere, Janice Baker-Dibella, Bill E Banks, Shirley Banks, Herberg Benjamin, Jr, Theresa Benjamin, Celia Berglund, Dawn Birkinbine, Karen Bosch, Gertrude Brandon, Gary A Bredice, Rita Bredice, Willie Browder, Barbara J Brown, Margaret Christison, Linda Clemons, Truman A Clemons, Patience Cole, Edna Collins, Linda Coombs, Catherine Del Prete, Savatore Del Prete, Jacquelyn Diamond, Myrna Egbufoama, Donna Evans, Sheliah Evans-Williams, Diane Faulcon, Diane Ford, Leila Futrell, Vickie Garrison, Nellie Glenn, Linda Good, Mildred Hall, Sedell Hall, Bernice Hannon, Sharon Henry, Lorene Honorable, Virginia Hubbs, Susan Isham-Crisman, Mary Jones, Olivia Jones(as an individual from State Court Complaint BC73918 ), Shirley Jones(an individual), Kevin Keleher, Linda Keleher, Jamila Khayoumi, Mary Knight, Debra Lablance, Jennevie Lofton, Robert Earl Mackey, Lenora Mairidith, Alice McAloon, Saverna Moody, Debra Morgan, Martha Ollison, Margarette Olsen, Magdeline Payton, Woodrow Payton, Michelle Pine, Joel Rabinowitz, Meryl Rabinowitz, Peggy Ramos, Marjorie Ray, Cynthia Rice, David Rice, Yolanda Richardson, Elfrida Roberts, Melissa Robinette, Rodger D. Robinette, Jr, Donna Royer, Ronald Royer, Betty Smith, Evelyn Sterling, Leandrew Swan, Cheryl Taylor, Ernestine Terry, Timothy A Tieken, Charles Lee Townsend, Sarah Townsend, Olga Trujillo, Dorothy Vowell, Judith Wagner, Lizzie Walker, Lula Williams, Mary Willis-Mackey against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., DOES 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/1/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 5 OF VOLUME 4 (EXHIBIT B10 - B-11) TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC 615571) filed by plaintiffs Phyllis Armstrong, Theresa Bagliere, Janice Baker-Dibella, Bill E Banks, Shirley Banks, Herberg Benjamin, Jr, Theresa Benjamin, Celia Berglund, Dawn Birkinbine, Karen Bosch, Gertrude Brandon, Gary A Bredice, Rita Bredice, Willie Browder, Barbara J Brown, Margaret Christison, Linda Clemons, Truman A Clemons, Patience Cole, Edna Collins, Linda Coombs, Catherine Del Prete, Savatore Del Prete, Jacquelyn Diamond, Myrna Egbufoama, Donna Evans, Sheliah Evans-Williams, Diane Faulcon, Diane Ford, Leila Futrell, Vickie Garrison, Nellie Glenn, Linda Good, Mildred Hall, Sedell Hall, Bernice Hannon, Sharon Henry, Lorene Honorable, Virginia Hubbs, Susan Isham-Crisman, Mary Jones, Olivia Jones(as an individual from State Court Complaint BC73918 ), Shirley Jones(an individual), Kevin Keleher, Linda Keleher, Jamila Khayoumi, Mary Knight, Debra Lablance, Jennevie Lofton, Robert Earl Mackey, Lenora Mairidith, Alice McAloon, Saverna Moody, Debra Morgan, Martha Ollison, Margarette Olsen, Magdeline Payton, Woodrow Payton, Michelle Pine, Joel Rabinowitz, Meryl Rabinowitz, Peggy Ramos, Marjorie Ray, Cynthia Rice, David Rice, Yolanda Richardson, Elfrida Roberts, Melissa Robinette, Rodger D. Robinette, Jr, Donna Royer, Ronald Royer, Betty Smith, Evelyn Sterling, Leandrew Swan, Cheryl Taylor, Ernestine Terry, Timothy A Tieken, Charles Lee Townsend, Sarah Townsend, Olga Trujillo, Dorothy Vowell, Judith Wagner, Lizzie Walker, Lula Williams, Mary Willis-Mackey against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., DOES 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/1/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 5 OF VOLUME 4 (EXHIBIT B10 - B-11) TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT CASE NUMBER BC659589 against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiffs Patricia Alexander, Pamela Berry, Virtis Blevins, Minnie Burcham, Marcella Burke, Angel Colon, Maria Colon, Lola Davis, Barbara DeForest, Alex Greenwood, Dollie Greenwood, Raylene Gull, Cynthia Jackson, Freddie Jackson, Cynthia King, Patricia Little, Dawn Lowseth-Dana, Madelene McCaul, Linda Meyer, Patricia Murphee, Gwen Penson, Debbra Powell, Elaine Sidberry, Carol Skief, Juanita Tamez, Barbara Twitty, Myrna Wedemeier, Sandra Winkelspecht. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/13/2017 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 OF VOLUME 1 EXHIBIT B-3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 (car)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT (CASE NO. BC597288) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/8/15, ATTACHED TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL EXHIBIT B-8, DOCUMENT 1-4, PAGE 61 OF 149), filed by plaintiffs Gloria Ashley, Pamela Blalock-Carter, Sheila Johnson, Nanci Price, Chenetta Robinson. (twdb)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT CASE NO BC637353 against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc..(Filing fee $ 400) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Norma Adatan, Kim Allen, Maria Guerrero Anthony, Eliza Ballard, Violeta Bermudez, Rachel Bouret, Shirley Brumfield, Earnestine Bryant, Eva Burney, Clarisa Byrd, Blanca Calderon, Kymberly Cancilla, Tammie Carden, Jan Clark, Kathleen Doner, Maridee Earl, Virginia Mae Edington, Tammy Edwards, Joanne Ellis-Steinmetz, Linda Fisher, Debra Fleak, Alfaye Gowans-Taylor, Sandra Greer, Herminia Guillen, Lesta Hemstreet, Claudette Howard, Shirl Howard, Bertha Hughes, Tracy Ignazzitto, Alberta Jones, Alice Jones, Kathleen Karmis, Connie Kelley, alice Kemp, Shavonda Kidd, Veronica Laurent-Callihan, Teresita Leonguerrero, Clara M. Lewis, Denise Lewis, Pat Loper Wiget, Marianela Luna, Linda Manley, Jeri Martinez, Annette Matney, Jamie McClenan, Susan McCoy, Judy Meeks, Carol Miller, Mary Miller, Barbara Mosley, Mary Kay Moss, Lora Napier, Marion Nicholson, Ida Pancioli, Marilyn Parker, Linda Pechan-Lake, Becky Pekar, Carmen Perez, Linda Reed, Deon Revis, Laverene Robinson, Carmella Rokes, Jean Rose, Olga Salazar, Sheila Sanford, Susan Schlenker, Lori Schnabel, Henrietta Seamster, Sandra Slaton, Sherry Smith, Elberta Stewart, Linda Strickland, Charlesetta Taylor, Altena Thomas, Barbara Vajda, Lupe Vasquez Rodriguez, Cheryl Walters, Mary Kathryn Warren, Janet Wilburn, Jennie Williams, Lillian Winslow, Terri Wolf, Deborah Woods, Donna Zuar. Filed in State Court on 10/14/2016. SUBMITTED WITH EXHIBIT B-2 ATTACHMENT 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 (car) Modified on 4/20/2018 (car).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC645073) filed by plaintiffs Sylvia Alvardo, Betty Berry, Teresa Bishop, Brenda Bottorf, Susan Byrne, Kathleen Clark, Carla Como, Lynn Craig, Victoria Deane, Margaret Ditty, Paula Estrada, Tasha Finley-Crawford, Dorothy Fowler, Florence Friendy, Wanda Funderburk, Lynn Furutani, Dora Hodge, Birdie Jackson, Ethel Jarrett, Patricia Jenkins, Charlotte Lawson, Graciela Lovera, Evelyn Martin, Lois McGinty, Amanda Metcalf, Cynthia Milam, Estelle Moore, Monica Newman, Gloria Oakwood, Marti Palmer, Laura Peters, Ann Rook, Jacqueline Schmidt, Dronda Scott, Patricia Smith, Doris Spetsas, Dana Underwood, Gloria Vasek against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/27/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 3 OF VOLUME 2 (EXHIBIT B4 - B-6) OF EXHIBIT B-6 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER BC635793) against defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Marilyn Alexander, Cathy Anderson, Marcia Anderson, Zimely Andrus, Vivia Artz, Joan Baker, Barbara Benson, Gail Blanchard, Frances Gilbreth Brown, Martha P Brown, LaTanya Burns(an individual), Pearle Cameron, Helen Campbell, Clementine Carson, Randa Catchings, Deborah Cokley, Janet Collins, Christine Conner, Patricia Cooper, Tammy Crews, Beverly Denney, Melinda Estep, Christine Farnsworth, Selma Finley, Joyce Finney, Helen Freeney, Pauline Garcia, Lurlia Glaze, Brandee Goldsmith, Sandra Grafton, Denise Grant, Vicky Graybeal, Mammie Grice, Sherry Hall, Fay Harless, Deborah Harrell, Mark Shoop, Gloria Harris, Tena Hebert, Linda Hernandez, Angela Hicks-Hickman, Sharyell Highland, Darrell Highland, Lillie Holliday, Richard Hoover as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jane Hazel Hoover, Leslie Isaacs, Catherine Jackanic, Mary Jackson, Martha Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Marie Kempel, Sulema Klumpe, Nancy Lacey, Julia Lamey, Phylliss Larsen Frances Licata, Merlinda Martinez, Cherian McCartney, Rhonda McConnell, Sharon Morgan Charmaine Odom, Gwendolyn Parker, Anne Powell, Carol Rector, Celia Rivera, Brenda Robinson, Carolyn Rose, Glenda Roseburrow, Violet Sadaka, Martha Sahnow, Donna Shelamn, Katherine Shyne, Olga Silva, Pinta Simanungkalit, Sheila Young Strawther, Vanessa Thomas, Altressa Townsel, Elizabeth Travers, Sheila Trigg, Naomi Walker, Sandra Walker, Eleanor Ward Lewis E. Ward, Susan Warman, Patricia Weeks, Susana Weltz Medina, Karla White, Lettie White, Hyla Wilson, Ronwyn Woo, Margaret Woodruff, Myrtle Slava, Shirley Zimmer, Gina Zuniga . (FILED IN STATE COURT ATTACHED TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL 1-4, PAGE 7 OR 149.) (Attorney Ramon R Lopez added to party Deborah Cokley(pty:pla), Attorney Ramon R Lopez added to party Janet Collins(pty:pla)) (twdb) Modified on 4/20/2018 (twdb).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC630499) filed by plaintiffs Joan Alston, Myrna Anderson, Shirley Ayers, Annie Bah, Tracy Bascom, Victoria Beck, Alice Bell, Phyllis Bryer, Belinda Calton, Maria Campos, Linda Carlson, Margaret Cassidy, Lucila Castro, Anna Commiskey, Edna Crook, Sophia Dashab, Deborah Davis, Eula Davis, Pamela Donaldson, Helen Douglas, Kathie Drummond, Cecilia Durham, Audrey Dyess, Aldyne English, Audrey Freeman, Ella Fullerton, Linda Gatton, Nancy Gendron, Charles Wesley Graham, Louanne Graham, Vicky Graybeal, Patricia Guillory, Elvita Harris, Mary Heis, Jerrylene Holman, Diann Johnson, Patricia Kelley, Melissa Koroma, Lynda Kramer, kathleen Labenz, Cynthia Latimer, Linda Learn, Diana Lewis, Charlene Lloyd, Kelly Lee Long, Mary Lott, Irene McAlister, Esther Medina, Janet Moody, Gloria Moore, Gail Novak, Virgina Parra, Formeka Harris, Hazel Roberts, Linda Robertson, Lilly Saenz, Linda Simmons, Sharon Stockwell, Carol Stout, Annete Sue, Njoyce Williams, Patricia Wolfe, Jack Wolfe against Defendants McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/16/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 3 OF VOLUME 2 (EXHIBIT B4 - B-6) OF EXHIBIT B-5 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT BC638755 against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Josefina Allison, Loretta Bush, Dorothy Caldwell, Lori Canorro, Sandra Cardinal, Judith Caskey, Patti Lee Caudle, Dora Sabedra Chavira, Caroline Cole, Carolyn Coon, Deloris Davis, Willie Mae Davis-Williams, Anna Dixon, Carolyn Dixon, Debbie Dunn, Brenda Edwards, Benedicta Espanol, Aurora Estrella, Teresa Ford, Joyce Fuller, Maria Garcia, Gladys Jeanette Garner, Patricia Garrett, Linda Gray, Sharon Grover, Teressa Haines, Lisa Hegazy, Jackie Hill, Marilyn Hill, Christine Hinkle, Margaret Hocker, Barbara Hopes, Barbara Lee Hughes, Jo Hughes, Sabrina Sue Johnson, Melissa Jones, Barbara Kalember, Elaine Key, Aliscina Leach, Betty Leyba, Linda Linan, Sheila Martin, Katie Maye, Edna Merrill, Karen Mize, Mary Ann Moore, Adrena Muhammad, Andrea Newton, Marilyn Oyler, Rhoda Padilla, Pushpa Patel, Elizabeth Paxton, Deborah Pena, Doris Perry, Kristin Petzold, Ida Pizzi, Gwendolyn Reed, Mary Seabaugh, Ora Sherrell, Joyce Shields, Ophelia Shillingford, Gloria Siess, Rose Sinclair, Nancy Smith, Mary Tolentino, Brenda Votta, Roberta Washington, Linda White, Tressia Wilkerson, Linda Wooley, Shayne Zepeda. Filed in State Court on 10/28/16 Submitted with Notice of removal, Exh B-4, Doc 1-3 page 7 of 142. (twdb) Modified on 4/20/2018 (twdb).
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT (CASE NUMBER: BC638755) filed by plaintiffs Josefina Allison, Loretta Bush, Dorothy Caldwell, Lori Canorro, Sandra Cardinal, Judith Caskey, Patti Lee Caudle, Caroline Cole, Carolyn Coon, Deloris Davis, Donna Davis, Willie Mae Davis-Williams, Anna Dixon, Debbie Dunn, Brenda Edwards, Benedicta Espanol, Aurora Estrella, Teresa Ford, Joyce Fuller, Maria Garcia, Gladys Jeanette Garner, Patricia Garrett, Linda Gray, Sharon Grover, Teressa Haines, Lisa Hegazy, Jackie Hill, Marilyn Hill, Christine Hinkle, Margaret Hocker, Barbara Hopes, Barbara Lee Hughes, Jo Hughes, Sabrina Sue Johnson, Melissa Jones, Barbara Kalember, Elaine Key, Aliscina Leach, Betty Leyba, Linda Linan, Sheila Martin, Katie Maye, Edna Merrill, Karen Mize, Mary Ann Moore, Adrena Muhammad, Andrea Newton, Marilyn Oyler, Rhoda Padilla, Pushpa Patel, Elizabeth Paxton, Deborah Pena, Doris Perry, Kristin Petzold, Ida Pizzi, Gwendolyn Reed, Mary Seabaugh, Ora Sherrell, Joyce Shields, Ophelia Shillingford, Gloria Siess, Rose Sinclair, Nancy Smith, Mary Tolentino, Patricia Trotman, Brenda Votta, Roberta Washington, Linda White, Tressia Wilkerson, Linda Wooley, Shayne Zepeda against Defendants Does, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/28/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 3 OF VOLUME 2 (EXHIBIT B4 - B-6) TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
March 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT CASE NUMBER BC538067 against Defendants Does 1-50, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Alida Adamyan, Asmik Adetyan, Kreda Atoyan, Arpik Babakhani, Rosie Babikian, Dora Bagdasaryan, Ovsanna Chalaganyan, Lucia Danielyan, Khatun Doganyan, Narmine Gevondian, Galane Gevorkian, Heghine Ghukasyan, Ozhen Guymjyan, Karine Israelyan, Anait Keioglian, Astkhik Khodagholian, Ovsanna Malyan, Marieta Matevosyan, Lusin Minasian, Lida Mkrtchyan, Karine Nalbandyan, Nara Ohanyan, Mariam Rumelyan, Mehri Shahmoradian, Anahit Shekherdemian, Violet Tatooskhoygani, Arevik Torosyan, Marine Tovmasian, Gaynee Varderessian, Orjen Vartanian, Seda Voskanian, Susanna Yeghiazaryan, Mariya Zatikyan. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2014 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 OF VOLUME 1 EXHIBIT B-1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 (car) Modified on 4/20/2018 (car).
March 1, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Related Case(s): See Appendix A (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Horton, Joey)
March 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc., (Horton, Joey)
March 1, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Horton, Joey)
March 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. Related Case(s): 14-cv-1899, 14-cv-1818, 17-cv-123, and others (Horton, Joey)
March 1, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Horton, Joey)
March 1, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of J.D. Horton re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 Attaching Exhibits B-102-I filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Vol. 29 of Exhibits (Exs. B-102-B-104), #2 Vol. 30 of Exhibits (Exs. B-105-B-107), #3 Vol. 31 of Exhibits (Exs. B-108-B-111), #4 Vol. 32 of Exhibits (Exs. B-112-B-113), #5 Vol. 33 of Exhibits (Exs. B-114-B-116), #6 Vol. 34 of Exhibits (Exs. B-117-B-119), #7 Vol. 35 of Exhibits (Exs. B-120-B-122), #8 Vol. 36 of Exhibits (Exs. B-123-B-125), #9 Vol. 37 of Exhibits (Exs. B-126-B-128), #10 Vol. 38 of Exhibits (Exs. B-129-B-130), #11 Vol. 39 of Exhibits (Exs. B-131-B-135), #12 Vol. 40 of Exhibits (Exs. B-136-B-140), #13 Vol. 41 of Exhibits (Exs. B-141-B-146), #14 Vol. 42 of Exhibits (Exs. B-147-B-151), #15 Vol. 43 of Exhibits (Exs. B-152-B-155), #16 Vol. 44 of Exhibits (Exs. B-156-E), #17 Vol. 45 of Exhibits (Exs. F-I))(Horton, Joey)
March 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number JCCP4761 Receipt No: 0973-21336358 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J.D. Horton in Support of Removal Attaching Exhibits A-B-101, #2 Vol. 1 of Exhibits (Exs. A-B-3), #3 Vol. 2 of Exhibits (Exs. B-4-B-6), #4 Vol. 3 of Exhibits (Exs. B-7-B-9), #5 Vol. 4 of Exhibits (Exs. B-10-B-11), #6 Vol. 5 of Exhibits (Exs. B-12-B-14), #7 Vol. 6 of Exhibits (Exs. B-15-B-17), #8 Vol. 7 of Exhibits (Exs. B-18-B-20), #9 Vol. 8 of Exhibits (Exs. B-21-B-24), #10 Vol. 9 of Exhibits (Exs. B-25-B-30), #11 Vol. 10 of Exhibits (Exs. B-31-B-34), #12 Vol. 11 of Exhibits (Exs. B-35-B-39), #13 Vol. 12 of Exhibits (Exs. B-40-B-45), #14 Vol. 13 of Exhibits (Exs. B-46-B-49), #15 Vol. 14 of Exhibits (Exs. B-50-B-53), #16 Vol. 15 of Exhibits (Exs. B-54-B-59), #17 Vol. 16 of Exhibits (Exs. B-60-B-65), #18 Vol. 17 of Exhibits (Exs. B-66-B-69), #19 Vol. 18 of Exhibits (Exs. B-70-B-71), #20 Vol. 19 of Exhibits (Exs. B-72-B-74), #21 Vol. 20 of Exhibits (Exs. B-75-B-77), #22 Vol. 21 of Exhibits (Exs. B-78-B-80), #23 Vol. 22 of Exhibits (Exs. B-81-B-82), #24 Vol. 23 of Exhibits (Exs. B-83-B-85), #25 Vol. 24 of Exhibits (Exs. B-86-B-88), #26 Vol. 25 of Exhibits (Exs. B-89-B-91), #27 Vol. 26 of Exhibits (Exs. B-92-B-94), #28 Vol. 27 of Exhibits (Exs. B-95-B-98), #29 Vol. 28 of Exhibits (Exs. B-99-B-101)) (Attorney Joey Dean Horton added to party Pfizer Inc.(pty:dft))(Horton, Joey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alida Adamyan et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariam Rumelyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galane Gevorkian
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marieta Matevosyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozhen Guymjyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heghine Ghukasyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kreda Atoyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asmik Adetyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arpik Babakhani
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ovsanna Chalaganyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaynee Varderessian
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orjen Vartanian
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nara Ohanyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lusin Minasian
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Tatooskhoygani
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karine Israelyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alida Adamyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Ari Scott Friedman
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karine Nalbandyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehri Shahmoradian
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Bagdasaryan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khatun Doganyan
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astkhik Khodagholian
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Babikian
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Gary Karbis Daglian
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Clemente Salvo
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Rachel M Dollar
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lark Lewis
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Thomas M Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley McGinnis
Represented By: Ellen A Presby
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Hill-Howard
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Jones
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxie Edwards
Represented By: Jennifer Nolte Williams
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M Cross
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Franklin
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Michalowski
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Thomas M Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennette McDonald
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Trevor Bruce Rockstad
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loraine Cantrell
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Cheek
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Cummings
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bertermann
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Vanzandt
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Verhalen
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Strohm
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Dibibar
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Garza
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tecolia Harrington
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Smith
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Shahin F Khorrami
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louvenia Turner
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Trevor Bruce Rockstad
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda McKinney
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Harvey
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Mock
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Stover
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Olsen
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Huffman
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Reyes
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Sinclair
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Sirocka
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Francis
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Tate
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mabel King
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Stephens
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Donaldson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria K Wesley
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Hankins
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Dowd
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Wilson
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arletha Clifton
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Hatcher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Elizabeth Lainhart
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Thomas M Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Hunter
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Gilbreth Brown
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry B. Litton, Jr.
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Freeman
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Bailey
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zelda Guss
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Hensley
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nhien Wolf
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Crystal Gayle Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Brown
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Trujilo
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cappie McKinest
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Phelps-Munson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Anthony
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Fleak
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Ellison
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana Moran
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Cheney
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Esquivel
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Williams
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gertrude Lias
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Shahin F Khorrami
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Teeples
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Douglas
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Trevor Bruce Rockstad
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lewis
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Trevor Bruce Rockstad
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Marie Isbell
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Lablance
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Trevor Bruce Rockstad
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohonoray Epps
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Massop
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Landon
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Garris
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Jamerson
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Jeffrey l Raizner
Represented By: Ari Scott Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Alice Williams
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Brown-Malone
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Grafton
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Martin
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauretta George
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriccia Oglesby
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Beard
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Taylor
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Dewitt
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Taylor
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Baird A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Brown
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Davis-Williams
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Tyson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Johnson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Poe
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Senior
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deniece Barrett
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Spencer
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Pratt
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Zepeda
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marolyn Spence
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Helen Navarro
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hogan
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salley Davis
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Crystal Gayle Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Oatis
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanetta Evans
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Garner
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Crysler
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danelle Jannazzo
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Edwards
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda J Maise
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Gugino
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavern Frazier
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Bouldin
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Jones
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Delair
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Roby
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omega Bell
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Jeffrey l Raizner
Represented By: Ari Scott Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deetta Morrison
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Shahin F Khorrami
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Haskins
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Watkins
Represented By: Rex Grady
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanna Alford-Horne
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Baker
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Trevor Bruce Rockstad
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Wooden
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Lynn Powers
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelia Williams
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viola Vinyard
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Lagoy
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriela Constantino
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lottie Tucker
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Greene
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vira Morgan
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Freeman
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Decker
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hayden
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharlene Memmott
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Kuykendall
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: John J Driscoll
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Caroline Sims
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Woods
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Jeffrey l Raizner
Represented By: Ari Scott Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Laureson
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Thomas M Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Willesden
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vothress Young
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondra Smith
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Farnsworth
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorita Adams
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Jeffrey l Raizner
Represented By: Ari Scott Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Dillard
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Scott
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Lawhorn
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorris Morrow
Represented By: Rex Grady
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Badger
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Crysler
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Weaver
Represented By: Rex Grady
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Brown
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Osborn
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Coogler
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Talbert
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Miles
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Thilges
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Donald S Edgar
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarissa Coleman
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Lee
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Baker
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Smith
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Green
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Wright
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Adams
Represented By: Lowell W Finson
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna Walker
Represented By: Eric William Gruenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Driggers
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Represented By: Baharak Dejban
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Koelle
Represented By: Charles G Orr
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Ramon R Lopez
Search News [