Ariana Serna Maggiore v. MGM Resorts International et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore sued Defendants MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., MGM Resorts Festival grounds LLC, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Live Nation Group d/b/a OneNationGroup, LLC, Contemporary Services Corp. and the Estate of Stephen Paddock for injuries she sustained when Paddock fired into the crowd from his Mandalay Bay hotel suite during the Route 91 Harvest Festival at Las Vegas Village.

Plaintiff: Arianna Serna Maggiore
Defendant: MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, Live Nation Entertainment Inc, Estate of Stephen Paddock, Live Nation Worldwide, Inc. (erroneously sued as Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. and Live Nation Group d/b/a OneNationGroup, LLC), Does 1 through 100, inclusive, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., Contemporary Services Corporation, Live Nation Group, DOES 1-10, Mandalay Bay, LLC, Mandalay Resort Group and Live Nation Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05640
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
2 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
3 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by defendants MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Bay, LLC, Mandalay Resort Group. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Doyen, #2 Exhibit A) (Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party Mandalay Bay, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party Mandalay Resort Group(pty:dft)) (Doyen, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin R Boyle in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (Boyle, Kevin)
August 20, 2018 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT Regarding Motion to Transfer and Centralize Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407 filed by Defendants MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Bay, LLC, Mandalay Resort Group. (Kristovich, Bethany)
August 17, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(i) as to Live Nation Entertainment Inc, Live Nation Group, Live Nation Worldwide, Inc.. (Boyle, Kevin)
August 17, 2018 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin Richard Boyle counsel for Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. Adding Kevin R Boyle as counsel of record for Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. (Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Arianna Serna Maggiore(pty:pla))(Boyle, Kevin)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE (DKT. 40, 41) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting Non-Resident Attorney Bradford Klager APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore, designating Geral Singleton as local counsel. Arianna (bp)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE (DKT. 27, 30, 36, 38) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, having determined whether the required fee has been paid, and having reviewed the Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice filed by Marion, M. Reilly on behalf of Arianna Serna Maggiore, Plaintiff and designating as Local Counsel Gerald Singleton. (bp)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE APPLICATIONS OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY MARION M. REILLY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (DKT. #27 , #30 , #36 , #38 ); AND APPLICATIONS OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY BRADFORD KLAGER TO APEAR PRO HAC VICE (DKT. #40 , #41 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the Applications, which have been amended, for Marion M. Reilly and Bradford Klager to appear pro hac vice. Local counsel Gerald Singleton submitted a declaration which states that he maintains an office at 857 E. Main Street in Ventura California, which is within this judicial district. Based on that representation, the Applications are GRANTED. (ake)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MAKING MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #28 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the Stipulation is GRANTED #50 . (2) any motions to dismiss the First Amended Complaint shall be filed by August 24, 2018, any oppositions shall be filed by September 14, 2018, and any replies shall be filed by September 28, 2018; (3) oppositions to the motion to remand shall be filed by August 27, 2018, and replies shall be filed by September 28, 2018; and (4) any motions to dismiss the First Amended Complaint may be noticed for hearing on October 29, 2018, and the motion to remand also is set for hearing on October 29, 2018. (5) in light of the foregoing, the Motion to Dismiss the Complaint is MOOT #28 . IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
July 30, 2018 Filing 50 STIPULATION to Reschedule Briefing Schedule filed by Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gildersleeve, John)
July 26, 2018 Filing 48 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff Live Nation Entertainment Inc, Live Nation Group, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., Mandalay Resort Group, Live Nation Worldwide, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore(Singleton, Gerald)
July 26, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Singleton, Gerald)
July 26, 2018 Filing 46 STIPULATION to Reschedule Briefing Schedule filed by Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gildersleeve, John)
July 25, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE Notice of Pendency of Motion to Transfer and Centralize Before United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants MGM Resorts International. (Attachments: #1 MGM's Motion to Transfer and Centralize Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407)(Kristovich, Bethany)
July 24, 2018 Filing 44 21 DAY Summons Issued on Notice of Removal #1 as to MANDALAY CORP., a Nevada Corporation; MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS LLC, a Nevada Limited- Liability Company; LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC., a California Corporation;LIVE NATION GROUP d/b/a ONENATIONGROUP, LLC, a Nevada Domestic Limited-Liability Company; ESTATE OF STEPHEN PADDOCK, a Nevada Resident; and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, (yl)
July 23, 2018 Filing 43 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons #42 filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. (Singleton, Gerald)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The scheduling conference is held jointly with this matter and the related cases.1 The Court has reviewedthe parties Joint Report. Dkt. 35. The Court discloses that it has a personal relationship with the husband of Bethany Kristovich. It does not believe that it is a basis to recuse itself. The Court grants MGMs request and CONTINUES the Motion to October 29, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. The Court defers setting dates in this action until the MDL Panel makes a determination on Defendants anticipated motion to consolidate the actions in an MDL proceeding. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to October 29, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
July 17, 2018 Filing 41 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bradford Klager to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/17/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22102126) filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Singleton, Gerald)
July 17, 2018 Filing 40 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bradford Klager to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22102126) filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Singleton, Gerald)
July 16, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: Wrong judge's initials on the document. Summons is not directed to any defendant in the "To" section. (yl)
July 16, 2018 Filing 39 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. (Singleton, Gerald)
July 13, 2018 Filing 38 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marion M. Reilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/6/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22050580) filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Singleton, Gerald)
July 11, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marion M. Reilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/6/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22050580) #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note, that electronic, image or stamp signature is not allowed.. (lt)
July 11, 2018 Filing 36 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marion M. Reilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/6/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22050580) filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Singleton, Gerald)
July 10, 2018 Filing 35 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 weeks / 8-10 weeks, filed by Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brian, Brad)
July 10, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marion M. Reilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/6/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22050580) #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
July 10, 2018 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bethany W Kristovich counsel for Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. Adding Bethany W. Kristovich as counsel of record for MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp. and MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp. and MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC. (Kristovich, Bethany)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT (DKT. #28 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Motion from October 22, 2018 to October 1, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 10, 2018 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bethany W Kristovich counsel for Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. Adding Brad Dennis Brian as counsel of record for MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp. and MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp. and MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC. (Attorney Bethany W Kristovich added to party MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Bethany W Kristovich added to party MGM Resorts International (pty:dft), Attorney Bethany W Kristovich added to party Mandalay Corp.(pty:dft))(Kristovich, Bethany)
July 10, 2018 Filing 30 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marion M. Reilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/6/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22050580) filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Singleton, Gerald)
July 9, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marion M. Reilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22050580) #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note, that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
July 9, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 10/22/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Doyen, Michael)
July 6, 2018 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marion M. Reilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22050580) filed by Plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. (Attorney Brody McBride added to party Arianna Serna Maggiore(pty:pla)) (McBride, Brody)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Joint Report due by 7/10/2018., Status Conference set for 7/17/2018 01:30 PM (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING DOES 11-100 by Judge John A. Kronstadt:Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as Doe Defendants 11 through 100. (bp)
July 5, 2018 Filing 24 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: LA CV18-05640 JAK (FFMx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials SVW on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. #22 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:17-cv-08332 JAK(FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-05640 JAK(FFMx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
June 28, 2018 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on June 28, 2018. (Doyen, Michael)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 16-05 (identical case) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-05640 SVW(PLAx). (rn)
June 27, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal of Action with State Court by Defendants MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., and MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC filed by defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doyen, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Refiling of Action filed by defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. (Doyen, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Filing 16 JOINDER filed by Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Doyen, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. (Doyen, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-05237-SVWPLA, 2-18-cv-5570, 2-18-cv-5564, 18-cv-05647, 7-cv-08332-JAK-FFM, (Doyen, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., (Doyen, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp. identifying MGM Resorts International as Corporate Parent. (Doyen, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Live Nation Worldwide, Inc. (erroneously sued as Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. and Live Nation Group d/b/a OneNationGroup, LLC) identifying Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Perez, Geronimo)
June 26, 2018 Filing 10 JOINDER filed by Defendant Live Nation Worldwide, Inc. (erroneously sued as Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. and Live Nation Group d/b/a OneNationGroup, LLC) joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Perez, Geronimo)
June 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bradford Klager. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Marion M. Reilly. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert C. Hillard. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
June 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Contemporary Services Corporation, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Estate of Stephen Paddock, Live Nation Entertainment Inc, Live Nation Group, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Arianna Serna Maggiore. (Filed in state court 6/18/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Michael R. Doyen re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Doyen, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp.. (Doyen, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the County of Los Angeles, case number BC710346 Receipt No: 0973-21993614 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Mandalay Corp., MGM Resorts International, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party MGM Resorts International (pty:dft), Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party Mandalay Corp.(pty:dft))(Doyen, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the County of Los Angeles, case number BC710346 Receipt No: 0973-21993614 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Mandalay Corp., MGM Resorts International, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party MGM Resorts International (pty:dft), Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party Mandalay Corp.(pty:dft))(Doyen, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariana Serna Maggiore v. MGM Resorts International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Levin
Represented By: Michael Robert Doyen
Represented By: John Michael Gildersleeve
Represented By: Brad Dennis Brian
Represented By: Bethany W Kristovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Geronimo Perez
Represented By: Dana Alden Fox
Represented By: Paul R Fine
Represented By: Mary Rebecca Fersch
Represented By: Michael N Schonbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Stephen Paddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Worldwide, Inc. (erroneously sued as Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. and Live Nation Group d/b/a OneNationGroup, LLC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts International
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Levin
Represented By: Michael Robert Doyen
Represented By: John Michael Gildersleeve
Represented By: Brad Dennis Brian
Represented By: Bethany W Kristovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandalay Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Levin
Represented By: Michael Robert Doyen
Represented By: John Michael Gildersleeve
Represented By: Brad Dennis Brian
Represented By: Bethany W Kristovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contemporary Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Group
Represented By: Geronimo Perez
Represented By: Dana Alden Fox
Represented By: Paul R Fine
Represented By: Mary Rebecca Fersch
Represented By: Michael N Schonbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandalay Bay, LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Doyen
Represented By: Bethany W Kristovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandalay Resort Group
Represented By: Michael Robert Doyen
Represented By: Bethany W Kristovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianna Serna Maggiore
Represented By: Gerald Blaine Singleton
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Pinedo
Represented By: Bradford Klager
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Brody McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?