BKK Working Group et al v. Albertsons Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rohr, Inc., Univar USA Inc., Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, HP Inc. (formerly known as Hewlett-Packard Company), Rockwell Automation, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Quemetco, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, General Dynamics Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., United States Steel Corporation, Smith International, Inc., California Resources Corporation, Essex Chemical Corporation, Southern California Edison Company, United Technologies Corporation, Stauffer Management Company LLC, San Diego Gas & Electric Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Atlantic Richfield Company, The Boeing Company, The Proctor & Gamble Manufacturing Company, Union Carbide Corporation, -, Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Chevron Environmental Management Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Chevron Marine Products LLC, Mars, Inc. (formerly known as Kal Kan Foods Inc.), Gemini Industries, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation, Rohm & Haas Company, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, Crosby & Overton, Inc., Union Pacific Railroad / Southern Pacific Transportation Company, Southern California Gas Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Ashland LLC, Huntington Beach Company, Bayer Cropscience Inc., BKK Working Group, The Dow Chemical Company, ConocoPhillips Company, American Honda Motor Co., Inc., BHPI Service LLC, Rohm and Haas Company, Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Mars, Inc., HP Inc., Crosby and Overton, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Company and Kal Kan Foods Inc.
Defendant: Ciba Geigy Corp., Ford Aerospace and Communications Corp., Friction Inc., Carlton Forge Works, North American Environmental, Beaulieu of America, Inc., MRC Holdings, Inc., Hollytex Carpet Mills, Inc., Albertsons Companies, Inc., Sumitomo Life Realty, Jeffries Bank Notes Co., Global Tube Corporation, Cooper Industries, Inc., Coty, Inc., Thorpe Insulation Co., Federal-Mogul LLC, Barry Wright Controls, Max Factor Co., Ardagh Group S.A., Browning Ferris Industries, Aurum Industries, Inc., Federal Reserve Bank, Joslyn Manufacturing & Supply Co., Friction Materials Corp., Vought Aircraft Industries Inc., American Can Company, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Hill Brothers Chemical Co., Republic Services, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Alco Industries, Inc., Desoto Inc., Birtcher Pacific, Carol Cable Co., Federal-Mogul Corp., Smith & Co., Don Knott Ford, Structural Composite Industries, Byron Jackson Pumps, Inc., BFI XV Realty Fund Ltd., Price Pfister nka Pfister, Fasson Corp., Northrop Pacific, Sika Corp., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., TTM Technologies, Inc., General Mills, Inc., Anco Metal Improvement Co., Durex Inc., Emhart Industries, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Crowley Inc., Shuwa Investments Corp., Houghton International Inc., Stanley Works, Thompson Industries, Sierracin, Dresser Industries, Inc., Synthane Taylor, Sanmina-SCI Corp., FMC Corporation, Paramount Pictures Corp., Johnson Controls Inc. (PRP ID No. 27963), Electrofilm Inc., Foster-Forbes Glass Co., GWB (US), Inc., Long Beach Terminal Company, Glass Containers Corp., Pillsbury Co., Argo Petroleum Corp., Genstar Building Materials Co., Columbia Pictures, Technicolor, Inc., Sandia Metal Process, Inc., Hi-Shear Corp., Sequa Corporation, Cleveland Wrecking Co., Mercury Aerospace Inc., Rio Tinto Alcan Inc., Genstar Roofing Products Company, Ampex Corp., SPS Technologies, Inc., GKN Aerospace Chem-Tronics Inc., Mercury Aerospace Fasteners, Lisi Aerospace North America, Inc., Smith and Co., Johnson Controls Inc., Does 1-10, Stanley Black and Decker, Inc., Paramount Petroleum Corporation, Joslyn Manufacturing and Supply Co., Price Pfister Inc and Price Pfister
Case Number: 2:2018cv05836
Filed: July 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
2 Judge: Charles F Eick
3 Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 56 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 13, 2020 Filing 55 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' THIRD MOTION TO STAY AND EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS #53 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This case shall be stayed until July 20, 2021 for all matters except voluntary dismissals of certain named Defendants by Plaintiffs. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iv)
May 6, 2020 Filing 53 Third NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case and Extend Time to Serve Defendants filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Douglas Gravelle, #2 Declaration Declaration of James Potter, #3 Declaration Declaration of Richard Hume, #4 Proposed Order) (Gravelle, Douglas)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-05810 MWF (PLAx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-05836 MWF (PLAx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (esa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas)
January 13, 2020 Filing 50 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas)
October 14, 2019 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Twenty-Sixth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Stanley Works (Gravelle, Douglas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Twenty-Fifth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Sanmina-SCI Corp. (Gravelle, Douglas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Twenty-Fourth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Paramount Pictures Corp. (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Twenty-Third] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Byron Jackson Pumps, Inc. (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Twenty-Second] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Alco Industries, Inc. and Synthane Taylor (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 43 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Twenty-First] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Fasson Corp. (Gravelle, Douglas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Twentieth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Carlton Forge Works and SPS Technologies, Inc. (Gravelle, Douglas)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION TO STAY AND EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby orders that Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Stay and Extend Time to Serve Defendants #35 is GRANTED as follows: This case shall be stayed until 7/20/2020 for all matters except voluntary dismissals of certain named Defendants by Plaintiffs. The time for Plaintiffs to serve the First Amended Complaint on all remaining Defendants is extended until 7/20/2020. Plaintiffs shall continue to file status reports every 90 days, with the next report due 7/15/2019. (gk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Nineteenth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Browning Ferris Industries and Republic Services, Inc. (Gravelle, Douglas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Eighteenth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Ciba Geigy Corp. (Gravelle, Douglas)
May 2, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Seventeenth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Jeffries Bank Notes Co. (Gravelle, Douglas)
April 22, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Sixteenth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Sumitomo Life Realty (Gravelle, Douglas)
April 19, 2019 Filing 35 Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case and Extend Time to Serve Defendants filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/17/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Gravelle Declaration, #2 Declaration Potter Declaration, #3 Declaration Malinowski Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gravelle, Douglas)
April 15, 2019 Filing 34 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas)
March 5, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Fifteenth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Sika Corp. (Gravelle, Douglas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Fourteenth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Columbia Pictures (Gravelle, Douglas)
January 29, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Thirteenth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Sierracin (Gravelle, Douglas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Twelfth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Carol Cable Co. (Gravelle, Douglas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT of Status filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Eleventh] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Barry Wright Controls (Gravelle, Douglas)
December 17, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Tenth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Gravelle, Douglas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Ninth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Paramount Petroleum Corp. (Gravelle, Douglas)
December 6, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Eighth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Federal-Mogul Corp. and Federal-Mogul LLC (Gravelle, Douglas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Seventh] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Cooper Industries, Inc. (Gravelle, Douglas)
November 15, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Sixth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Long Beach Terminal Company and BFI XV Realty Fund Ltd. (Gravelle, Douglas)
October 15, 2018 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Fifth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Beaulieu of America, Inc. (Gravelle, Douglas)
September 21, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Fourth] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Technicolor, Inc. (Gravelle, Douglas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Third] Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Dismissing GKN Aerospace Chem-Tronics Inc.) (Gravelle, Douglas)
August 10, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [Second] Notice of Dismissals filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. dismissing Albertsons Companies, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Sequa Corporation, and TTM Technologies, Inc. (Gravelle, Douglas)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION TO STAY AND EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby orders that Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Stay and Extend Time to Serve Defendants #13 is GRANTED as follows: This case shall be stayed until 7/19/2019 for all matters except voluntary dismissals of certain named Defendants by Plaintiffs. The time for Plaintiffs to serve the Complaint on all remaining Defendants is extended until 7/19/2019. Plaintiffs shall file a status report commencing 10/15/2018, and continuing every 90 days thereafter without further order of the Court. (gk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE Plaintiffs' [First] Notice of Dismissals filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 23, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (First Amended) filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc. identifying Adding Ameron International Corporation and its parent National Oilwell Varco to Corporate Disclosure as Corporate Parent. (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 23, 2018 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs The Boeing Company, Quemetco, Inc., Chevron Marine Products LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, Thums Long Beach Company, HP Inc., Univar USA Inc., BHPI Service LLC, San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Southern California Gas Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Rohm and Haas Company, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, Morton International, Inc., Stauffer Management Company LLC, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Essex Chemical Corporation, Smith International, Inc., Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Ashland LLC, Southern California Edison Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohr, Inc., Mars, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., United States Steel Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, Mortell Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Gemini Industries, Inc., Oxy USA, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, BKK Working Group, United Technologies Corporation, Bayer Cropscience Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Huntington Beach Company, California Resources Corporation, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Ameron International Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Parcel Map), #2 Exhibit B (ISE Order), #3 Exhibit C (Amended Consent Decree), #4 Exhibit D (Second Consent Decree), #5 Exhibit E (Third Partial Consent Decree), #6 Exhibit F (First Amended Third Partial Consent Decree))(Attorney Douglas Arthur Gravelle added to party Ameron International Corporation(pty:pla))(Gravelle, Douglas)
July 19, 2018 Filing 13 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending To July 19, 2019 filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas Gravelle ISO Amended Motion to Stay, #2 Proposed Order) (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-05836 AB(Ex). (rn)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:05-cv-07746 DDP(AJWx) (rn)
July 10, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay #7 by Clerk. The document is stricken. Counsel may file an amended or corrected document. (lom)
July 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Until July 3, 2019 for all matters except voluntary dismissals of certain named defendants by Plaintiffs , and extending time for Plaintiffs to serve Complaint on remaining defendants until July 3, #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Motion lacks a formally noticed hearing date, Local Rules 6-1 and 7-4. Judge Birotte hears civil motions on Fridays at 10:00 AM. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (smo)
July 6, 2018 Filing 7 STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 10 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Until July 3, 2019 for all matters except voluntary dismissals of certain named defendants by Plaintiffs , and extending time for Plaintiffs to serve Complaint on remaining defendants until July 3, 2019, filed by Plaintiffs National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Douglas A. Gravelle in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion) (Gravelle, Douglas) Modified on 7/10/2018 (lom).
July 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
July 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff BKK Working Group. Related Case(s): 18-05810; 16-08127; 05-07746; 10-03378; 14-09178; 15-00729; and 14-09085 (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 3, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES PURSUANT TO L.R. 7.1-1 (BY ALL PLAINTIFFS) filed by Plaintiff BKK Working Group (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BKK Working Group. (Gravelle, Douglas)
July 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22032020 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BKK Working Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Map), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (ISE Order), #3 Exhibit Exhibit C (First Consent Decree), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D (Second Consent Decree), #5 Exhibit Exhibit E (Third Consent Decree), #6 Exhibit Exhibit F (Amended Third Partial Consent Decree)) (Attorney Douglas Arthur Gravelle added to party BKK Working Group(pty:pla))(Gravelle, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BKK Working Group et al v. Albertsons Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rohr, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Univar USA Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HP Inc. (formerly known as Hewlett-Packard Company)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quemetco, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montrose Chemical Corporation of California
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mortell Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oxy USA, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith International, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Resources Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essex Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Edison Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stauffer Management Company LLC
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Gas & Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thums Long Beach Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Proctor & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Carbide Corporation, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevron Environmental Management Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevron Marine Products LLC
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mars, Inc. (formerly known as Kal Kan Foods Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gemini Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rohm & Haas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Latex and Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crosby & Overton, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad / Southern Pacific Transportation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Gas Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morton International, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashland LLC
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntington Beach Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer Cropscience Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BKK Working Group
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BHPI Service LLC
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rohm and Haas Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameron International Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mars, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HP Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crosby and Overton, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kal Kan Foods Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Arthur Gravelle
Represented By: K Eric Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciba Geigy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Aerospace and Communications Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton Forge Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Environmental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaulieu of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRC Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollytex Carpet Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Life Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffries Bank Notes Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Tube Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thorpe Insulation Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Wright Controls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Factor Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardagh Group S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Browning Ferris Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurum Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joslyn Manufacturing & Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friction Materials Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vought Aircraft Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Can Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alco Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desoto Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birtcher Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Cable Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Knott Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structural Composite Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Jackson Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFI XV Realty Fund Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Pfister nka Pfister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fasson Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sika Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTM Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Metal Improvement Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durex Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emhart Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shuwa Investments Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houghton International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierracin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthane Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanmina-SCI Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc. (PRP ID No. 27963)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrofilm Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster-Forbes Glass Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GWB (US), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Beach Terminal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glass Containers Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pillsbury Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argo Petroleum Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genstar Building Materials Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Pictures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technicolor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandia Metal Process, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Shear Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequa Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Wrecking Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Aerospace Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Tinto Alcan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genstar Roofing Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ampex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPS Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GKN Aerospace Chem-Tronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Aerospace Fasteners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisi Aerospace North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith and Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black and Decker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joslyn Manufacturing and Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Pfister Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Pfister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?