Constantino Basile v. The Los Angeles Film School, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Constantino Basile
Defendant: Lana Wachowski, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Blake Lively, Gold Coast Cab Company, Los Angeles Superior Court-Van Nuys, U.S. District Court-Central District of California Western Division, Andrew Wachowski, Amblin Entertainment, Inc., TMZ, Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, Legendary Pictures, Las Vegas Metro Police Department, Rio All-Suites Hotel and Casino- Caesars Entertainment Corporation, John and Jane Does, NBC Universal, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Beverly Hills Police Department, The Los Angeles Film School, LLC, Sony Pictures Television, Nancy Pelosi, Kripke Enterprises, Oxnard Police Department, Dr. Robert Leark, Scott Free Films, LLC, Michelle Obama, Onza Partners SL, Onza Entertainment, Jonathon Nolan, Christopher Nolan, Jams, Inc., Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger, Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Ford Harrison, LLP, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Southwest Airlines, Co., Caldwell, Leslie & Proctor, Alston & Bird LLP, NBCUniversal Media, LLC (erroneously sued as NBCUniversal) and Southwest Airlines Co.
Petitioner: City of Beverly Hills, a public entity, erroneously sued and served herein as Beverly Hills Police Department
Case Number: 2:2018cv08604
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
2 Judge: John E McDermott
3 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 118 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Janice Marla Michaels counsel for Defendant Rio All-Suites Hotel and Casino- Caesars Entertainment Corporation. Adding Janice M. Michaels as counsel of record for Defendant, Rio Properties, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Rio Properties, LLC. (Attorney Janice Marla Michaels added to party Rio All-Suites Hotel and Casino- Caesars Entertainment Corporation(pty:dft))(Michaels, Janice)
December 3, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Jonathon Nolan, Andrew Wachowski, Lana Wachowski, (Viglietta, Emily)
December 3, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Jonathon Nolan. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Emily B Viglietta added to party Jonathon Nolan(pty:dft)) (Viglietta, Emily)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; (2) SCHEDULING ALL PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AND (3) STAYING ALL DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #60 is GRANTED IN PART. In the interests of judicial economy, all sixteen motions to dismiss #28 , #34 , #36 , #40 , #45 , #46 , #50 , #51 , #52 , #57 , #61 , #85 , #91 , #101 , #105 , #107 . are hereby set for hearing on January 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Autumn D. Spaeth in Courtroom 9B of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, 9th Floor, Santa Ana, California 92701. Plaintiffs Opposition to the motions to dismiss shall be filed by no later than December 19, 2018. Any Reply shall be filed by no later than December 26, 2018, and shall address only new matters raised in Plaintiff's Opposition. The parties may file a request to appear telephonically at the hearing, explaining why good cause exists for this request, by no later than January 2, 2019. For the purposes of the Opposition only, the Court will waive Local Rule 11-6 and allow Plaintiff to file a single Opposition that may exceed 25 pages in length, but shall not exceed 50 pages in length. All discovery in this case is stayed pending further order of the Court. (kh)
November 30, 2018 Filing 114 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Michelle Obama served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JANE DOE (REFUSED NAME) - SECURITY in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (hr)
November 30, 2018 Filing 113 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant The Los Angeles Film School, LLC served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon MARK DEBACCO -AGENT FOR SERVICE in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr)
November 30, 2018 Filing 112 DECLARATION of Constantino Basile filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. (hr)
November 30, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #107 , Request for Judicial Notice #108 filed by Defendant Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Hollins, Byron)
November 30, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Byron S Hollins counsel for Defendant Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger. Changing email to byron@hollins.legal. Filed by Defendant Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger. (Hollins, Byron)
November 29, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC (erroneously sued as NBCUniversal), identifying Comcast Corp.. (Silberberg, Carol)
November 29, 2018 Filing 108 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #107 filed by Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC (erroneously sued as NBCUniversal). (Silberberg, Carol)
November 29, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC (erroneously sued as NBCUniversal). Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Carol M Silberberg added to party NBCUniversal Media, LLC (erroneously sued as NBCUniversal)(pty:dft)) (Silberberg, Carol)
November 29, 2018 Filing 106 SCHEDULING NOTICE RE-SETTING MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANT LAS VEGAS METRO POLICE DEPARTMENT by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Motion to Dismiss to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Las Vegas Metro Police Department #85 , presently noticed for hearing on January 14, 2019 before Judge Carney is RE-SET to January 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth in Courtroom 6B of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, 6th Floor, Santa Ana, California 92701. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 28, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Alston & Bird LLP. Motion set for hearing on 1/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ. Proc. 12(B)(6), #2 Request For Judicial Notice In Support of Defendant Alston & Bird LLP's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ. Proc. 12(B)(6), #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement For Defendant Alston & Bird LLP, #4 Declaration Of Evan W. Woolley In Support Of Defendant Alston & Bird LLP's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ. Proc. 12(B)(6), #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Alston & Bird LLP's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(B)(6)) (Attorney Evan William Woolley added to party Alston & Bird LLP(pty:dft)) (Woolley, Evan)
November 28, 2018 Filing 104 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #101 Joinder filed by Defendant Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger. (Hollins, Byron)
November 28, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amblin Entertainment, Inc., identifying N/A. (Silberberg, Carol)
November 28, 2018 Filing 102 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #101 filed by Defendant Amblin Entertainment, Inc.. (Silberberg, Carol)
November 28, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Amblin Entertainment, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Carol M Silberberg added to party Amblin Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Silberberg, Carol)
November 28, 2018 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Robert Leark, (Trimble, Joan)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth ORDERING Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss submitted by Defendant Gold Coast Cab Company received on November 16, 2018 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (kh)
November 27, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Las Vegas Metro Police Department. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Chermela, Jason)
November 27, 2018 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Las Vegas Metro Police Department, (Attorney Jason R Chermela added to party Las Vegas Metro Police Department(pty:dft))(Chermela, Jason)
November 27, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order) (Attorney Byron S Hollins added to party Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger(pty:dft)) (Hollins, Byron)
November 26, 2018 Filing 99 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Southwest Airlines, Co. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LAQUINTA HOLMAN -GENERAL COUNSEL AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 98 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Alston & Bird LLP served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BARBARA HERNANDEZ -RECEPTIONIST AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.(hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 97 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Caldwell, Leslie & Proctor served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JOHN DOE -GUARD AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.(hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 96 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Rio All-Suites Hotel and Casino- Caesars Entertainment Corporation served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FRANCES GUTIERREZ -AGENT AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 95 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Las Vegas Metro Police Department served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon VICK DOE -AGENT AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 94 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Onza Partners SL, Onza Entertainment served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon SAMANTHA TANNER -RECEPTIONIST AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 93 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Sony Pictures Television served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DEBORAH AHN -LEGAL DEPARTMENT AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 90 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Andrew Wachowski served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 89 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant NBC Universal served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon GABRIELA SANCHEZ -SOP INTAKE SPECIALIST AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.(hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 88 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Lana Wachowski served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ANDREW WACHOWSKI in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 87 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Amblin Entertainment, Inc. served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon MEG KRUSZNIS -SECRETARY AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.(hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 86 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Jonathon Nolan served on 11/11/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (et)
November 26, 2018 Filing 83 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant U.S. District Court-Central District of California Western Division served on 11/9/2018, answer due 01/08/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon GENOVEVA ORTEGA-LEGAL ASSISTANT AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICES OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (et) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 82 PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant TMZ served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon GINGER L. TIPTON-MANAGER LEGAL SERVICES AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (et) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 81 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals served on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DIANA TELUCCI-CLERK AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (et) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 80 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Ford Harrison, LLP served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JOHN DOE-GUARD AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (et) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 79 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon GREG SCHULMAN-PARTNER AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (et) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 78 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Scott Free Films, LLC served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BRYAN C. -FRONT DESK AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 77 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DEBORAH AHN - LEGAL DEPARTMENT AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 76 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Legendary Pictures served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JOHN DOE - MAILROOM MANAGER AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 75 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Los Angeles Superior Court-Van Nuys served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon PHYLLIS ARNOLD -SECRETARY AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.(hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 74 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Robert Leark served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FEBE CUEVAS -CLERK, CMRA in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. (hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 73 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon GINGER TIPTON -MANAGER LEGAL SERVICES AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 72 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Jams, Inc. served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon SARA ANDERSON -RECEPTIONIST AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 71 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Beverly Hills Police Department, upon Defendant Beverly Hills Police Department served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon SYLVIA GELSMAN -SUB CLERK AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.(hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 70 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Gold Coast Cab Company served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jim Carmona - Owner Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 69 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jonthan Starr - Staff Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.(hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 68 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Nancy Pelosi served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jose Ambriz - Legal Correspondent and Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached.(hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 67 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Kripke Enterprises served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Julie Taylor - Receptionist Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Blake Lively served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Specht - Co-Worker in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. (hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 65 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Oxnard Police Department served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alex Arnett - Sergeant Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.(hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 64 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Person in Charge Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (hr) Modified on 11/27/2018 (hr).
November 26, 2018 Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte - SOP Intake Specialist Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 62 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile, upon Defendant Christopher Nolan served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kimiko Whitted - Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. (hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 59 OPPOSITION to Defendant City of Beverly Hills' MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #36 filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order)(hr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 58 OPPOSITION to Defendants Mitchell, Silberberg & Knupp's MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #28 filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order)(hr)
November 21, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Rio All-Suites Hotel and Casino- Caesars Entertainment Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice and Joinder) (Attorney Katherine Jeanine Brinson added to party Rio All-Suites Hotel and Casino- Caesars Entertainment Corporation(pty:dft)) (Brinson, Katherine)
November 21, 2018 Filing 56 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #36 filed by Defendants Kripke Enterprises, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sony Pictures Television. (Silberberg, Carol)
November 21, 2018 Filing 55 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #28 filed by Defendants Kripke Enterprises, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sony Pictures Television. (Silberberg, Carol)
November 21, 2018 Filing 54 SCHEDULING NOTICE RE MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Los Angeles Superior Court-Van Nuys #52 , presently noticed for hearing on January 2, 2019 is RE-SET to January 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth in Courtroom 6B of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, 6th Floor, Santa Ana, California 92701.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 20, 2018 Filing 53 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim for Relief #52 filed by Defendant Los Angeles Superior Court-Van Nuys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McCormick, Kevin)
November 20, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim for Relief filed by defendant Los Angeles Superior Court-Van Nuys. Motion set for hearing on 1/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin M. McCormick in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin M. McCormick in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Kevin M McCormick added to party Los Angeles Superior Court-Van Nuys(pty:dft)) (McCormick, Kevin)
November 20, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Robert Leark. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit) (Attorney Joan E Trimble added to party Robert Leark(pty:dft)) (Trimble, Joan)
November 19, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Service and Dismiss Complaint filed by defendant Oxnard Police Department. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Sgt. Arnett) (Attorney Jennie M Kelly added to party Oxnard Police Department(pty:dft)) (Kelly, Jennie)
November 19, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jams, Inc. #40 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant JAMS, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and 12(b)(6))(MacGregor, Jessica)
November 19, 2018 Filing 48 SCHEDULING NOTICE RE MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANT JAMS by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant JAMS #40 , presently noticed for hearing on January 7, 2019 before Judge Carney is RE-SET to January 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth in Courtroom 6B of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, 6th Floor, Santa Ana, California 92701.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 16, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Gold Coast Cab Company. (kh)
November 16, 2018 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Scott Free Films, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, identifying Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.. (Woolley, Evan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Scott Free Films, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Declaration of Evan W, Woolley ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Attorney Evan William Woolley added to party Scott Free Films, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan William Woolley added to party Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(pty:dft)) (Woolley, Evan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Legendary Pictures, TMZ, Andrew Wachowski, Lana Wachowski, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Viglietta, Emily)
November 16, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Legendary Pictures, TMZ, Andrew Wachowski, Lana Wachowski, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., (Attorney Emily B Viglietta added to party Legendary Pictures(pty:dft), Attorney Emily B Viglietta added to party TMZ(pty:dft), Attorney Emily B Viglietta added to party Andrew Wachowski(pty:dft), Attorney Emily B Viglietta added to party Lana Wachowski(pty:dft), Attorney Emily B Viglietta added to party Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Viglietta, Emily)
November 16, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #42 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #36 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jams, Inc. #40 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1. Dockets 36, 40, and 42: The case number has the incorrect Magistrate Judge's initials and should read 2:18- cv-08604 CJC(ADS). (See Docket No. 32, Order Returning Case for Reassignment Upon Recusal). 2. Docket 40: Hearing information is incorrect. The motion hearing should be set before the Magistrate Judge. The hearing is vacated and taken off Judge Carney's calendar. The Motion is also missing a Proposed Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jams, Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jams, Inc. #40 served on November 15, 2018. (MacGregor, Jessica)
November 15, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp, identifying (1) Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP; and (2) Attorneys Liability Assurance Society (ALAS). (Sheldon, Richard)
November 15, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jams, Inc. filed by Defendant Jams, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/7/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Defendant JAMS, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Defendant JAMS, Inc.'s Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Complaint, #3 Exhibit RJN Exhibits Part 1, #4 Exhibit RJN Exhibits Part 2, #5 Exhibit RJN Exhibits Part 3) (Attorney Jessica Rudin MacGregor added to party Jams, Inc.(pty:dft)) (MacGregor, Jessica)
November 15, 2018 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel K Spradlin counsel for Movant City of Beverly Hills, a public entity, erroneously sued and served herein as Beverly Hills Police Department. Adding Daniel K. Spradlin as counsel of record for City of Beverly Hills, a public entity, erroneously sued and served herin as Beverly Hills Police Department for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant City of Beverly Hills. (Attorney Daniel K Spradlin added to party City of Beverly Hills, a public entity, erroneously sued and served herein as Beverly Hills Police Department(pty:bkmov))(Spradlin, Daniel)
November 15, 2018 Filing 38 SCHEDULING NOTICE RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp #28 , presently noticed for hearing on December 10, 2018 before Judge Carney is RE-SET to December 19, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant City of Beverly Hills #36 , presently set for hearing on December 19, 2018 before Judge Wilner, shall now be held on December 19, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Judge Spaeth is located in Courtroom 6B of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, 6th Floor, Santa Ana, California 92701.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 14, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eliyahu Ness on behalf of Defendant Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp (Attorney Eliyahu Ness added to party Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp(pty:dft))(Ness, Eliyahu)
November 14, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant City of Beverly Hills, a public entity, erroneously sued and served herein as Beverly Hills Police Department. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2018 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Chelsea M Desmond added to party City of Beverly Hills, a public entity, erroneously sued and served herein as Beverly Hills Police Department(pty:bkmov)) (Desmond, Chelsea)
November 14, 2018 Filing 35 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #34 filed by Defendants Kripke Enterprises, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sony Pictures Television. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carol M. Silberberg, #2 Exhibit A-H to the Declaration of Carol M. Silberberg, #3 Exhibits I-M to the Declaration of Carol M. Silberberg)(Silberberg, Carol)
November 14, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Kripke Enterprises, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sony Pictures Television. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Silberberg, Carol)
November 14, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Kripke Enterprises, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sony Pictures Television of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carol M. Silberberg in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, which are commercially available DVDs of Season 1 of the TV Series Timeless and; Exhibit B to the Declaration of Carol M. Silberberg in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, which are commercially available DVDs of Season 2 of the TV Series Timeless. (Silberberg, Carol)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment General Order 05-07 referral pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08604 CJC(ADS). (rn)
November 14, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kripke Enterprises, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sony Pictures Television, identifying Sony Corporation. (Attorney Carol M Silberberg added to party Kripke Enterprises(pty:dft), Attorney Carol M Silberberg added to party Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Carol M Silberberg added to party Sony Pictures Television(pty:dft))(Silberberg, Carol)
November 14, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #28 . The following error found: Hearing information is incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): The motion to dismiss will be considered by the Magistrate Judge. The motion hearing should be set before the Magistrate Judge. The hearing is vacated and taken off Judge Carney's calendar.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (vm)
November 13, 2018 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #28 filed by Defendant Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp. (Sheldon, Richard)
November 13, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLPs Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Richard B Sheldon, Jr added to party Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp(pty:dft)) (Sheldon, Richard)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-08604 CJC(MRW). (rn)
October 23, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Upon further review, a determination has been made that this case was incorrectly assigned by the clerk. Due to the nature of the claims, this complaint is appropriate for review and issuance of a report and recommendation by a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 05-07. All future filings should be directed to the attention of Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Case now reads as 2:18-cv-08604 DMG(MRW). (rn)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:14-cv-00412 DMG(MRWx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08604 DMG(MRWx). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (rn)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (iv)
October 9, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. correcting Complaint - (Discovery) #1 . (ghap)
October 9, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS VOLUME VI filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. correcting Exhibit (non-trial), #7 (ghap)
October 9, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. (ghap)
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, U.S. District Court-Central District of California Western Division. (ghap)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants Amblin Entertainment, Inc., Beverly Hills Police Department, Ford Harrison, LLP, Gold Coast Cab Company, Jams, Inc., Kripke Enterprises, Las Vegas Metro Police Department, Robert Leark, Legendary Pictures, Blake Lively, Los Angeles Superior Court-Van Nuys, Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp, NBC Universal, Christopher Nolan, Jonathon Nolan, Michelle Obama, Onza Partners SL, Onza Entertainment, Oxnard Police Department, Nancy Pelosi, Rio All-Suites Hotel and Casino- Caesars Entertainment Corporation, Scott Free Films, LLC, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sony Pictures Television, TMZ, The Los Angeles Film School, LLC, Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Andrew Wachowski, Lana Wachowski, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Constantino Basile. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile of Complaint, Non-Papers Exhibits on Dvds Volume VI. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile of Complaint, Non-Papers Exhibits on Dvds and Thumbdrives Volume V. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile of Complaint, Non-Papers Exhibits on Dvds Volume IV. (ghap) Modified on 10/11/2018 (ghap).
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile of Complaint, Non-Papers Exhibits on Dvds Volume III. (ghap) Modified on 10/11/2018 (ghap).
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile of Complaint, Non-Papers Exhibits on Dvds Volume II. (ghap) Modified on 10/11/2018 (ghap).
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile of Complaint, Non-Papers Exhibits on Dvds Volume I. (ghap) Modified on 10/11/2018 (ghap).
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile of Complaint, Exhibits 4,7 and 21 on Dvds. (ghap) Modified on 10/11/2018 (ghap).
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING Complaint, Exhibit 22, 3 Original Booklets-Petitions for Writ of Certiorari filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS VOLUME VI filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. as to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Part 1 Complaint, Exhibits Volume VI, #2 Part 2 Complaint, Exhibits Volume VI, #3 Part 3 Complaint, Exhibits Volume VI, #4 Part 4 Complaint, Exhibits Volume VI, #5 Part 5 Complaint, Exhibits Volume VI, #6 Part 6 Complaint, Exhibits Volume VI)(ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS VOLUME V filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. as to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Part 1 Complaint, Exhibits Volume V, #2 Part 2 Complaint, Exhibits Volume V, #3 Part 3 Complaint, Exhibits Volume V, #4 Part 4 Complaint, Exhibits Volume V, #5 Part 5 Complaint, Exhibits Volume V, #6 Part 6 Complaint, Exhibits Volume V)(ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS VOLUME IV filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. as to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Part 1 Complaint, Exhibits Volume IV, #2 Part 2 Complaint, Exhibits Volume IV, #3 Part 3 Complaint, Exhibits Volume IV)(ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS VOLUME III filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. as to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Part 1 Complaint, Exhibits Volume III, #2 Part 2 Complaint, Exhibits Volume III, #3 Part 3 Complaint, Exhibits Volume III, #4 Part 4 Complaint, Exhibits Volume III, #5 Part 5 Complaint, Exhibits Volume III)(ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT, EXHIBIT VOLUME II filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. as to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Part 1 Complaint, Exhibits Volume II, #2 Part 2 Complaint, Exhibits Volume II, #3 Part 3 Complaint, Exhibits Volume II, #4 Part 4 Complaint, Exhibits Volume II, #5 Part 5 Complaint, Exhibits Volume II)(ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT, EXHIBIT VOLUME I filed by Plaintiff Constantino Basile. as to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Part 1 Complaint, Exhibits Volume I, #2 Part 2 Complaint, Exhibits Volume I, #3 Part 3 Complaint, Exhibits Volume I, #4 Part 4 Complaint, Exhibits Volume I, #5 Part 5 Complaint, Exhibits Volume I, #6 Part 6 Complaint, Exhibits Volume I)(ghap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Amblin Entertainment, Inc., Beverly Hills Police Department, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Ford Harrison, LLP, Gold Coast Cab Company, Jams, Inc., John and Jane Does, Kripke Enterprises, Las Vegas Metro Police Department, Robert Leark, Legendary Pictures, Blake Lively, Los Angeles Superior Court-Van Nuys, Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp, NBC Universal, Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, Christopher Nolan, Jonathon Nolan, Michelle Obama, Onza Partners SL, Onza Entertainment, Oxnard Police Department, Nancy Pelosi, Rio All-Suites Hotel and Casino- Caesars Entertainment Corporation, Scott Free Films, LLC, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sony Pictures Television, TMZ, The Los Angeles Film School, LLC, Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, U.S. District Court-Central District of California Western Division, Andrew Wachowski, Lana Wachowski, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc..Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott.(Filing fee $ 400: PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Constantino Basile. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 Complaint, #2 Part 2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Constantino Basile v. The Los Angeles Film School, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lana Wachowski
Represented By: Emily B Viglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Emily B Viglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Lively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Coast Cab Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Superior Court-Van Nuys
Represented By: Kevin M McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. District Court-Central District of California Western Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wachowski
Represented By: Emily B Viglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amblin Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Carol M Silberberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMZ
Represented By: Emily B Viglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legendary Pictures
Represented By: Emily B Viglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metro Police Department
Represented By: Jason R Chermela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio All-Suites Hotel and Casino- Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Janice Marla Michaels
Represented By: Katherine Jeanine Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Universal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Carol M Silberberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Hills Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Los Angeles Film School, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Television
Represented By: Carol M Silberberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kripke Enterprises
Represented By: Carol M Silberberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxnard Police Department
Represented By: Jennie M Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robert Leark
Represented By: Joan E Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Free Films, LLC
Represented By: Evan William Woolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onza Partners SL, Onza Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon Nolan
Represented By: Emily B Viglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jams, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Rudin MacGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger
Represented By: Byron S Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp
Represented By: Richard B Sheldon, Jr
Represented By: Eliyahu Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Represented By: Evan William Woolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Harrison, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caldwell, Leslie & Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alston & Bird LLP
Represented By: Evan William Woolley
Represented By: Casondra K Ruga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC (erroneously sued as NBCUniversal)
Represented By: Carol M Silberberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constantino Basile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Beverly Hills, a public entity, erroneously sued and served herein as Beverly Hills Police Department
Represented By: Daniel K Spradlin
Represented By: Chelsea M Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?