A.C.C.S. et al v. Kirstjen M. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A., M.G.B.C. and A.C.C.S.
Defendant: William Connor, Michael Paul, Donald Neufeld, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 2:2018cv10759
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by A.C.C.S.; M.G.B.C.; M.T.E.C.; AND N.P.V.A. A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A., re Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #27 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #28 served on 01/17/2019. (Fu, Tzung-Lin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by A.C.C.S.; M.G.B.C.; M.T.E.C.; AND N.P.V.A. A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A., re Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #25 served on 01/17/2019. (Fu, Tzung-Lin)
January 16, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A., Supplemental Certificate of Service served on 1/16/2019. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 30 SEALED DOCUMENT Certification and Notice of Interested Parties re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #29 filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A..(Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Plaintiffs' Application for Leave to File Under Seal #23 is GRANTED. Consistent with this Order, Plaintiffs shall e-file the Notice of Interested Parties pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.2.2(c) no later than 1/17/2019. (gk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daisy Ocampo Felt counsel for Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. Daisy Ocampo Felt is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Daisy Felt. (Felt, Daisy)
January 14, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Daisy Ocampo Felt counsel for Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. Changing Firm Name to Legal Aid Society of Orange County. Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Daisy Felt. (Felt, Daisy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A., re Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #25 served on 01/11/2019. (Fu, Tzung-Lin)
January 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Tzung-Lin Fu counsel for Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. Changing Address and Firm name to Neighborhood Legal Services of Los Angeles County; 3629 Santa Anita Avenue, Suite 109, El Monte, CA 91731. Changing e-mail and fax number to linfu@nlsla.org; (626) 307-3650. Filed by plaintiff A.C.C.S.; M.G.B.C.; M.T.E.C.; AND N.P.V.A.. (Fu, Tzung-Lin)
January 11, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Certification and Notice of Interested Parties under seal #23 filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION to file document Certification and Notice of Interested Parties under seal filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
January 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: SEALED Notice #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice is blank. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lt)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Plaintiffs' Motion #9 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted leave to proceed in this litigation under pseudonyms A.C.C.S.; M.G.B.C.; M.T.E.C.; and N.P.V.A., without prejudice to Defendants' ability to seek reconsideration of this Order after they make their appearance in this action. Plaintiffs must be referred to by all parties in all public filings, including the Complaint, as A.C.C.S.; M.G.B.C.; M.T.E.C.; and N.P.V.A. Within seven days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file under seal a Notice of Interested Parties that includes their full names and will publicly file a redacted version of the Notice of Interested Parties in accordance with this Order. (gk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A., re Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #19 served on 1/4/19. (Fu, Tzung-Lin)
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Tzung-Lin Fu counsel for Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. Changing address and firm name to Neighborhood Legal Services of Los Angeles County, 3629 Santa Anita Avenue, Suite 109, El Monte, CA 91731. Changing e-mail and fax number to LinFu@nlsla.org, (626) 307-3650. Filed by Plaintiff A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. (Fu, Tzung-Lin)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGN OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassignment Pursuant to General Order 16-05 filed on 1/3/2019. The case number will now read CV 18-10759-DMG (MRWx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-10759 DMG(MRWx). (rn)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant William Connor. (et)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Michael Paul. (et)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Donald Neufeld. (et)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kirstjen M. Nielsen. (et)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant L. Francis Cissna. (et)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonyms; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A., (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs A.C.C.S., M.G.B.C., M.T.E.C., N.P.V.A.. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22969954 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs M.T.E.C., M.G.B.C., A.C.C.S., N.P.V.A.. (Attorney Nareeneh Sohbatian added to party A.C.C.S.(pty:pla), Attorney Nareeneh Sohbatian added to party M.G.B.C.(pty:pla), Attorney Nareeneh Sohbatian added to party M.T.E.C.(pty:pla), Attorney Nareeneh Sohbatian added to party N.P.V.A.(pty:pla))(Sohbatian, Nareeneh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.C.C.S. et al v. Kirstjen M. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.T.E.C.
Represented By: Nareeneh Sohbatian
Represented By: Stephen R Smerek
Represented By: Akiko Krystina Nishino
Represented By: Tzung-Lin Fu
Represented By: Daisy Ocampo Felt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.P.V.A.
Represented By: Nareeneh Sohbatian
Represented By: Stephen R Smerek
Represented By: Akiko Krystina Nishino
Represented By: Tzung-Lin Fu
Represented By: Daisy Ocampo Felt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.G.B.C.
Represented By: Nareeneh Sohbatian
Represented By: Stephen R Smerek
Represented By: Akiko Krystina Nishino
Represented By: Tzung-Lin Fu
Represented By: Daisy Ocampo Felt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.C.C.S.
Represented By: Nareeneh Sohbatian
Represented By: Stephen R Smerek
Represented By: Akiko Krystina Nishino
Represented By: Tzung-Lin Fu
Represented By: Daisy Ocampo Felt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Connor
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Paul
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?