Mark Migdal v. Federal Bureau of Prisons

Plaintiff: Mark Migdal
Defendant: Federal Bureau Of Prisons
Case Number: 2:2019cv00214
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING PRE-TRIAL & TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that this action is hereby placed on calendar for FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on FEBRUARY 24, 2020 AT 11:00 A.M. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before FEBRUARY 3, 2020, which date will also serve as the discovery cut-off date in this action. There is no Motion Cut-Off Date set. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER shall be lodged with this Court on or before FEBRUARY 17, 2020. JURY TRIAL DATE is set as MARCH 24, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch)
May 15, 2019 APPEAL FEE PAID: as to Plaintiff Mark Migdal; Receipt Number: LA188961 in the amount of $505. (rsm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 34 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 Days, filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisons.. (Jacobs, Jennifer)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #30 filed by Mark Migdal. CCA # 19-55516. The appeal filed 5/6/2019 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within seven calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. See document for further details. (gk)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #30 filed by Mark Migdal. CCA # 19-55516. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will automatically stay the briefing schedule under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-11. See document for further details. (gk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 31 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-55516 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #30 as to Plaintiff Mark Migdal. (gk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Mark Migdal. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #28 . (Appeal Fee - Previously Paid.) (Sample, Brandon)
April 29, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisons. Motion set for hearing on 7/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jacobs, Jennifer)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (Dkt. No. 19). (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) #19 (yl)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, The Court has determined that Motion for Preliminary Injunction re Transfer of Plaintiff to an RRC filed by Attorney For Mark Migdal #19 set for hearing on April 15, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of April 15, 2019 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Transfer of Plaintiff to an RRC . Motion #19 filed by Plaintiff Mark Migdal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Sample)(Sample, Brandon)
March 25, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Federal Bureau of Prisons answer now due 4/29/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisons.(Jacobs, Jennifer)
March 18, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Transfer of Plaintiff to an RRC . Motion #19 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cory Clark with exhibits, #2 Declaration of Ivan Garrastazu with exhibits)(Jacobs, Jennifer)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Stipulation #22 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the briefing schedule will be governed by the hearing date of 4/8/2019. Any opposition shall be due on or before 3/18/2019. Any reply shall be due on or before 3/25/2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #19 shall be continued to 4/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (gk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction from April 1, 2019 to April 8, 2019 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Jennifer)
March 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Attorney for Mark Migdal, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #15 served on 3-4-19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sample, Brandon)
February 28, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer R Jacobs counsel for Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisons. Adding Jennifer R Jacobs as counsel of record for Bureau of Prisons for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bureau of Prisons. (Attorney Jennifer R Jacobs added to party Federal Bureau of Prisons (pty:dft))(Jacobs, Jennifer)
February 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Transfer of Plaintiff to an RRC . Motion filed by Attorney For Mark Migdal. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Migdal, #2 Proposed Order) (Sample, Brandon)
February 24, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Attorney for Mark Migdal, upon Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisons served on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. DeLaRosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to E. Hase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unintelligible Signature. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Sample, Brandon)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Brandon C. Sample to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mark Migdal, designating Caroline V. Tucker as local counsel #16 . (gk)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brandon C. Sample to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mark Migdal, Miscellaneous Caroline Tucker (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 1/29/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23118577) filed by Local Counsel Mark Migdal, Caroline Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Caroline V Tucker added to party Mark Migdal(pty:pla)) (Tucker, Caroline)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00214 R(RAOx). (rn)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00214 CAS(RAOx). (rn)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for Mark Migdal, identifying Mark Migdal, Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Hanlon, Stuart)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisons. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisons. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Prisons. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney for Mark Migdal. (Hanlon, Stuart)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney for Mark Migdal. (Hanlon, Stuart)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney for Mark Migdal. (Hanlon, Stuart)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mark Migdal. (Hanlon, Stuart)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23019440 - Fee: $400, filed by Attorney for Mark Migdal Mark Migdal. (Attorney Stuart Hanlon added to party Mark Migdal(pty:pla))(Hanlon, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark Migdal v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau Of Prisons
Represented By: Jennifer R Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Migdal
Represented By: Stuart Hanlon
Represented By: Brandon C Sample
Represented By: Caroline V Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?