A.M. v. County of Los Angeles, et al
Plaintiff: A. M.
Defendant: Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services, Nancy Ramirez, Marcia Thompson, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and County of Los Angeles
Case Number: 2:2019cv02100
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Cormac J Carney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on August 1, 2019. (gga)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services, Nancy Ramirez, Marcia Thompson.(Attorney Katherine McClain added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine McClain added to party Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine McClain added to party Nancy Ramirez(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine McClain added to party Marcia Thompson(pty:dft))(McClain, Katherine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff A. M., upon Defendant Nancy Ramirez served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Travis Webb, Person in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bandlow, Jennifer)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff A. M., upon Defendant Marcia Thompson served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Travis Webb, Employee, Person in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bandlow, Jennifer)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff A. M., upon Defendant Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ruben Khosdikian, Deputy County Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bandlow, Jennifer)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff A. M., upon Defendant County of Los Angeles served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ruben Khosdikian, Deputy County Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bandlow, Jennifer)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams: granting #5 APPLICATION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing Candice Wadley as Guardian ad Litem for A.M. (sbou)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services, Nancy Ramirez, Marcia Thompson. (lh)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION for Appointment of Candice Wadley as Guardian ad Litem for A.M. filed by Plaintiff A. M.. (Bandlow, Jennifer)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE/ NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff A. M., (Bandlow, Jennifer)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff A. M.. (Bandlow, Jennifer)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff A. M.. (Bandlow, Jennifer)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23414818 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff A. M.. (Attorney Jennifer A Bandlow added to party A. M.(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.M. v. County of Los Angeles, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M.
Represented By: Jennifer A Bandlow
Represented By: Nicholas C Calabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services
Represented By: Katherine McClain
Represented By: David Jay Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Ramirez
Represented By: Katherine McClain
Represented By: David Jay Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Thompson
Represented By: Katherine McClain
Represented By: David Jay Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Katherine McClain
Represented By: David Jay Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?