The Boards of Trustees of the Southern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Health and Welfare Trust v. QOL Corp.

Plaintiff: THE BOARDS OF TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GLAZIERS, ARCHITECTURAL METAL AND GLASS WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, AND SOUTHERN NEVADA GLAZIERS, ARCHIT, Southern California Glass and Glazing Industry Trust Fund, Southern California Glazing and Architectural Metal Industry Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Local Union No. 636, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Finishing Trades Institute of District Council 36 Joint Apprenticeship Training Trust Fund, The Boards of Trustees of the Southern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Health and Welfare Trust, Finishing Trades Institute and Political Action Together Fund
Defendant: QOL CORP., a California corporation doing business as CUSTOM ENGINEERED OPENINGS and QOL Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02143
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to QOL Corp. answer now due 6/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Finishing Trades Institute; Southern California Glass and Glazing Industry Trust Fund; Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative ; Political Action Together Fund; Finishing Trades Institute of District Council 36 Joint Apprenticeship Training Trust Fund; Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Local Union No. 636; International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund.(Attorney Elizabeth Rosenfeld added to party Finishing Trades Institute(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Rosenfeld added to party Finishing Trades Institute of District Council 36 Joint Apprenticeship Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Rosenfeld added to party Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Local Union No. 636(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Rosenfeld added to party International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Rosenfeld added to party Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative (pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Rosenfeld added to party Political Action Together Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Rosenfeld added to party Southern California Glass and Glazing Industry Trust Fund(pty:pla))(Rosenfeld, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Finishing Trades Institute, Southern California Glass and Glazing Industry Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern California Glazing and Architectural Metal Industry Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Political Action Together Fund, The Boards of Trustees of the Southern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Health and Welfare Trust, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Finishing Trades Institute of District Council 36 Joint Apprenticeship Training Trust Fund, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Local Union No. 636, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, upon Defendant QOL Corp. served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steven Roger Landry, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rosenfeld, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant QOL Corp. (ghap)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant QOL Corp. (ghap)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff THE BOARDS OF TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GLAZIERS, ARCHITECTURAL METAL AND GLASS WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, AND SOUTHERN NEVADA GLAZIERS, ARCHIT, (Rosenfeld, Elizabeth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff THE BOARDS OF TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GLAZIERS, ARCHITECTURAL METAL AND GLASS WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, AND SOUTHERN NEVADA GLAZIERS, ARCHIT. (Rosenfeld, Elizabeth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF THE BOARDS OF TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GLAZIERS, ARCHITECTURAL METAL AND GLASS WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, AND SOUTHERN NEVADA GLAZIERS, ARCHIT. (Rosenfeld, Elizabeth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23420682 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF THE BOARDS OF TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GLAZIERS, ARCHITECTURAL METAL AND GLASS WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, AND SOUTHERN NEVADA GLAZIERS, ARCHIT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Elizabeth Rosenfeld added to party THE BOARDS OF TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GLAZIERS, ARCHITECTURAL METAL AND GLASS WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, AND SOUTHERN NEVADA GLAZIERS, ARCHIT(pty:pla))(Rosenfeld, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Boards of Trustees of the Southern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Health and Welfare Trust v. QOL Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BOARDS OF TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GLAZIERS, ARCHITECTURAL METAL AND GLASS WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, AND SOUTHERN NEVADA GLAZIERS, ARCHIT
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Glass and Glazing Industry Trust Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Glazing and Architectural Metal Industry Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Local Union No. 636
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finishing Trades Institute of District Council 36 Joint Apprenticeship Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Boards of Trustees of the Southern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Health and Welfare Trust
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finishing Trades Institute
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Political Action Together Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QOL CORP., a California corporation doing business as CUSTOM ENGINEERED OPENINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QOL Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?