Socorro Pacheco Arciga et al v. Cyprus Amax Minerals Company et al
Plaintiff: Socorro Arciga, Kimberly Ann Adams, Amy Gilmore, Nayeli Sarahi Diaz Pacheco and Socorro Pacheco Arciga
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, United Talc Company, Metropolitan Talc Company, Inc., American Talc Company, Sierra Talc Company, Charles Mathieu Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, Does 1-450, Johnson and Johnson, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., Longs Drug Stores, L.L.C. and Cyprus Amax Minerals Company (sued individually, doing business as, and as successor to American Talc Company, Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company) doing business as American Talc Compan
Petitioner: Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Estate Plaintiff: John Currie
Case Number: 2:2019cv03700
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. JCCP 4674/ BC677102, acknowledged on 5/28/2019. (iv)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court for the State of California. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court for the State of California. (mailed 5/22/19 - Roybal) (lom)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The remaining 108 removed talc actions before the Court are hereby REMANDED to state court. Any motions or ex parte applications to remand that are pending in those actions are DENIED AS MOOT, and the hearings vacated. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (rrey)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Ann Adams, Socorro Pacheco Arciga, Amy Gilmore, Nayeli Sarahi Diaz Pacheco. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE REMAND TO STATE COURT, #2 Declaration OF MARISSA LANGHOFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE REMAND TO STATE COURT, #3 Proposed Order) (Langhoff, Marissa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Movant Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s), #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 served on May 1, 2019. (Romano, Julia)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-03036 CJC (JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03700 CJC (JCx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (esa)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Remand Orders filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Ann Adams, Socorro Pacheco Arciga, Amy Gilmore, Nayeli Sarahi Diaz Pacheco. (Langhoff, Marissa)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03700 RSWL(KSx). (rn)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Pendency of Other Proceedings [L.R. 83-1.4] filed by Movant Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Romano, Julia)
May 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
May 1, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NUMBER JCCP No. 4674/BC677102 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2)(lh)
May 1, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Does, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., Longs Drug Stores, L.L.C., Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, filed by Plaintiffs Amy Gilmore, Kimberly Ann Adams, Socorro Pacheco Arciga, Nayeli Sarahi Diaz Pacheco. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NUMBER JCCP NO. 4674/BC677102 ON 3/20/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 )(lh)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. , Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings [L.R. 83-1.4] and Request for Stay of Proceedings Related Case(s): Case Nos. 2:19-10289-LSS; 1:19-mc-00103-UNA (Calfo, Alexander)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., (Calfo, Alexander)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent. (Calfo, Alexander)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Calfo, Alexander)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number JCCP 4674 / BC677102 Receipt No: 0973-23653579 - Fee: $400, filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Part 1, #4 Exhibit C - Part 2, #5 Exhibit C - Part 3, #6 Exhibit C - Part 4, #7 Exhibit C - Part 5, #8 Exhibit C - Part 6, #9 Exhibit D - Docket Sheet) (Attorney Alexander G Calfo added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:mov), Attorney Alexander G Calfo added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:mov))(Calfo, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Socorro Pacheco Arciga et al v. Cyprus Amax Minerals Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socorro Arciga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ann Adams
Represented By: Marissa C Langhoff
Represented By: John M Caron
Represented By: Jennifer L Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Gilmore
Represented By: Marissa C Langhoff
Represented By: John M Caron
Represented By: Jennifer L Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nayeli Sarahi Diaz Pacheco
Represented By: Marissa C Langhoff
Represented By: John M Caron
Represented By: Jennifer L Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socorro Pacheco Arciga
Represented By: Marissa C Langhoff
Represented By: John M Caron
Represented By: Jennifer L Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Talc Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Talc Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Talc Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Talc Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Mathieu Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeant Pharmaceuticals International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-450
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Amy Zumsteg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Amy Zumsteg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longs Drug Stores, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company (sued individually, doing business as, and as successor to American Talc Company, Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company) doing business as American Talc Compan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: John Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?