Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Jose Natividad Marin et al

Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Jose Natividad Marin, Ceiba Restaurant, Inc. and Jose Alvarado
Petitioner: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Case Number: 2:2019cv04447
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Terry J Hatter
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant Jose Alvarado served on 6/29/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant Jose Natividad Marin served on 6/29/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See order for further details. (shb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jose Natividad Marin. (shb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jose Alvarado. (shb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ceiba Restaurant, Inc.. (shb)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 , Subpoena Request (AO 88),, Summons Request, #6 , Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. Fields for the required information are missing. The summonses must be completed with the required information. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 19-03, all related Innovative Sports Management, Inc. cases have been assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Related Group Control Number is CV 11-7395 TJH (PLAx. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (esa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media., Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Riley, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23785657 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media(pty:bkmov))(Riley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Jose Natividad Marin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Natividad Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceiba Restaurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?