Monjaras and Wismeyer Group, Inc. v. Rachel Shaw
Plaintiff: Monjaras & Wismeyer Group, Inc. and Monjaras and Wismeyer Group, Inc.
Defendant: Rachel Shaw, DOES 1-10, inclusive and Shaw HR Consulting, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv06171
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Rachel Shaw, Shaw HR Consulting, Inc, identifying Axis Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Fagelbaum, Jerold)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Shaw HR Consulting, Inc answer now due 9/25/2019; Rachel Shaw answer now due 9/25/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Shaw HR Consulting, Inc; Rachel Shaw.(Attorney Jerold Fagelbaum added to party Rachel Shaw(pty:dft), Attorney Jerold Fagelbaum added to party Shaw HR Consulting, Inc(pty:dft))(Fagelbaum, Jerold)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Rachel Shaw, Shaw HR Consulting, Inc. (jp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Monjaras and Wismeyer Group, Inc.. (Demirjian, Kris)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Monjaras and Wismeyer Group, Inc.. (Demirjian, Kris)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the "To:" section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Monjaras and Wismeyer Group, Inc.. (Demirjian, Kris)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Monjaras and Wismeyer Group, Inc., identifying Steve Monjaras. (Demirjian, Kris)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The Civil Cover Sheet should have been filed under a separate event, not as an attachment to the Complaint: Civil Events>Other Filings>Miscellaneous Filings>Civil Cover Sheet CV-71. No action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24102418 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Monjaras & Wismeyer Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Kris Demirjian added to party Monjaras & Wismeyer Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(Demirjian, Kris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monjaras and Wismeyer Group, Inc. v. Rachel Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monjaras & Wismeyer Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kris Demirjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monjaras and Wismeyer Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kris Demirjian
Represented By: Heleni E Suydam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Shaw
Represented By: Jerold Fagelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw HR Consulting, Inc
Represented By: Jerold Fagelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?