D.C. v. Canyon View School et al
Plaintiff: D.C.
Defendant: West Covina Unified School District, East San Gabriel Special Education Local Planning Area, Canyon View School, McKinley Children's Center, Inc. and Does 1-9
Case Number: 2:2019cv07363
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to East San Gabriel Special Education Local Planning Area answer now due 11/27/2019, filed by Defendant East San Gabriel Special Education Local Planning Area.(Attorney S Daniel Harbottle added to party East San Gabriel Special Education Local Planning Area(pty:dft))(Harbottle, S)
October 21, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff D.C., upon Defendant East San Gabriel Special Education Local Planning Area acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Sydney J. Blaauw, Attorney. (Loyer, Kathleen)
October 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff D.C., upon Defendant McKinley Children's Center, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Courtney L. Hylton, Attorney. (Loyer, Kathleen)
October 21, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff D.C., upon Defendant Canyon View School acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Courtney L. Hylton, Attorney. (Loyer, Kathleen)
October 21, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to McKinley Children's Center, Inc. answer now due 11/22/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant McKinley Children's Center, Inc..(Attorney Courtney Lynn Hylton added to party McKinley Children's Center, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hylton, Courtney)
October 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number reads CV 19-7363-CAS-E, but should read CV 19-7363-JFW-E. See Order Reassigning filed 8/28/2019 (Dkt. 11). Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMANDDEFENDANT WEST COVINA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (1) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND (2) CROSS CLAIM AGAINST CANYON VIEW SCHOOL AND THE MCKINELY CHILDRENS CENTER INC., Cross CROSSCLAIM against Canyon View School filed by DEFENDANT West Covina Unified School District.(Attorney Nancy Prapion Doumanian added to party West Covina Unified School District(pty:dft))(Doumanian, Nancy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant East San Gabriel Special Education Local Planning Area. (iv)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant West Covina Unified School District. (iv)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant McKinley Children's Center, Inc. (iv)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Canyon View School. (iv)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY D.C.. (Loyer, Kathleen)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (See order for further details) (yl)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Appointing Guardian Ad Litem by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, #2 . Oliva Chambers is appointed as guardian ad litem for Plaintiff D.C. for the purpose of the current Minor's Complaint and any Compromise Petition that may occur. (sp)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07363 JFW(Ex). (rn)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff D.C., identifying Canyon View School, McKinley Children's Center, Inc., West Covina USD, East San Gabriel SELPA. (Loyer, Kathleen)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Application/Motion/Request. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so.. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY D.C.. (Loyer, Kathleen)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Appointment of GAL filed by Plaintiff D.C. re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Loyer, Kathleen)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24321000 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY D.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Kathleen Muraco Loyer added to party D.C.(pty:pla))(Loyer, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.C. v. Canyon View School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Covina Unified School District
Represented By: Nancy Prapion Doumanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East San Gabriel Special Education Local Planning Area
Represented By: S Daniel Harbottle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon View School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinley Children's Center, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Lynn Hylton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.C.
Represented By: Kathleen Muraco Loyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?