Mohamed Amine Rahmani v. Michael Paul et al
Plaintiff: Mohamed Amine Rahmani
Defendant: Michael Paul, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv07808
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 20 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Nicola T Hanna. (jp)
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Summons Request, #14 filed by Plaintiff Mohamed Amine Rahmani. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Drucker, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant William Barr. (jp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kevin McAleenan. (jp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II. (jp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Michael Paul. (jp)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mohamed Amine Rahmani. (Attachments: #1 Cover Page Attachment, #2 Summons Request, #3 Cover Page Attachment, #4 Summons Request, #5 Cover Page Attachment, #6 Summons Request, #7 Cover Page Attachment)(Drucker, Richard)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #12 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mohamed Amine Rahmani. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request, #2 Summons Request, #3 Summons Request)(Drucker, Richard)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Richard Drucker to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 on behalf of Mohamed Annine Rahmani, designating Alan Diamante as local counsel. (jp)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION PRO HAC VICE Receipt No: 0973-24477263 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mohamed Amine Rahmani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Application Proposed Order)(Diamante, Alan)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge George H. Wu, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:10-cv-04952 GW (AJWx) (esa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 by Clerk of Court to Judge Dale S. Fischer. The document is stricken. (jp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(c) $400 fee not paid. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Cannot confirm payment of PHV fees. PAY.GOV only has complaint fees listed. (lt)
September 12, 2019 Attorney Richard Drucker deleted for non payment of Pro Hac Vice fees pursuant to local rule 83-2.1.2.2. (lt)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mohamed Amine Rahmani. (Diamante, Alan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 09/13/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #8 ] - APPLICATION PRO HAC VICE with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 09/10/2019, receipt number 26K3Q9MK), filed by Plaintiff Mohamed Amine Rahmani.(Diamante, Alan) Modified on 9/10/2019 (esa). Modified on 9/16/2019 (jp).
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mohamed Amine Rahmani, (Diamante, Alan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24409442 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mohamed Amine Rahmani. (Attorney Alan R Diamante added to party Mohamed Amine Rahmani(pty:pla))(Diamante, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamed Amine Rahmani v. Michael Paul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Paul
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Amine Rahmani
Represented By: Alan R Diamante
Represented By: Richard Drucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?