CRVQ et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: SGJ, SJ, TGR, MAMR, JAPV, DMRM, OOM, SRM, RMG, LRZ and CRVQ
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, William Connor, Field Office Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Nebraska Service Center, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Acting Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin McAleenan, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, Michael Paul, Acting Deputy Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Vermont Service Center, Donald Neufeld, Associate Director of Service Center Operations for the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS), United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kenneth Cuccinelli, William Connor, Michael Paul, Donald Neufeld and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv08566
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #28 , Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89), #27 served on 10/22/2019. (Norris, Austin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MAMR, LRZ, OOM, CRVQ, SRM, JAPV, DMRM, RMG, SGJ, TGR, SJ, upon Defendant William Connor served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Kevin McAleenan served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Donald Neufeld served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Michael Paul served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Norris, Austin)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The matter before the Court is Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms (Dkt No. 13). The notice of motion listed the hearing date as "TBD". The Court shall set a hearing date and briefing schedule on the motion after plaintiff files proofs of service of the Summons and Complaint. (shb)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08566 CBM(AGRx). (rn)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Dolly M. Gee, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-10759 DMG(MRWx) (rn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 25 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 24 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 23 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Kevin McAleenan. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Kenneth Cuccinelli. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Donald Neufeld. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Michael Paul. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant William Connor. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless counsel for Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. Adding Christopher M. Lawless as counsel of record for CRVQ, OOM and JAPV; SGJ & SJ; SRM; LRZ; RMG; DMRM, TGR, and MAMR for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, OOM and JAPV; SGJ & SJ; SRM; LRZ; RMG; DMRM, TGR, and MAMR. (Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party CRVQ(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party DMRM(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party JAPV(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party LRZ(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party MAMR(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party OOM(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party RMG(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party SGJ(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party SJ(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party SRM(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless added to party TGR(pty:pla))(Lawless, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi counsel for Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. Adding Sharre Lotfollahi as counsel of record for CRVQ, OOM and JAPV; SGJ & SJ; SRM; LRZ; RMG; DMRM, TGR, and MAMR for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, OOM and JAPV; SGJ & SJ; SRM; LRZ; RMG; DMRM, TGR, and MAMR. (Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party CRVQ(pty:pla), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party DMRM(pty:pla), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party JAPV(pty:pla), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party LRZ(pty:pla), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party MAMR(pty:pla), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party OOM(pty:pla), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party RMG(pty:pla), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party SGJ(pty:pla), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party SJ(pty:pla), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party SRM(pty:pla), Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party TGR(pty:pla))(Lotfollahi, Sharre)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael E Baumann counsel for Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. Adding Michael E. Baumann as counsel of record for CRVQ, OOM and JAPV; SGJ & SJ; SRM; LRZ; RMG; DMRM, TGR, and MAMR for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, OOM and JAPV; SGJ & SJ; SRM; LRZ; RMG; DMRM, TGR, and MAMR. (Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party CRVQ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party DMRM(pty:pla), Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party JAPV(pty:pla), Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party LRZ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party MAMR(pty:pla), Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party OOM(pty:pla), Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party RMG(pty:pla), Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party SGJ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party SJ(pty:pla), Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party SRM(pty:pla), Attorney Michael E Baumann added to party TGR(pty:pla))(Baumann, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Austin C Norris counsel for Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. Adding Austin Norris as counsel of record for CRVQ, OOM and JAPV; SGJ & SJ; SRM; LRZ; RMG; DMRM, TGR, and MAMR for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, OOM and JAPV; SGJ & SJ; SRM; LRZ; RMG; DMRM, TGR, and MAMR. (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to To Proceed Under Pseudonyms with Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms) (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-10759-DMG-MRW (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR, (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs CRVQ, DMRM, JAPV, LRZ, MAMR, OOM, RMG, SGJ, SJ, SRM, TGR. (Norris, Austin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24553307 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs SRM, MAMR, JAPV, LRZ, DMRM, OOM, RMG, CRVQ, SGJ, TGR, SJ. (Attorney Austin C Norris added to party CRVQ(pty:pla), Attorney Austin C Norris added to party DMRM(pty:pla), Attorney Austin C Norris added to party JAPV(pty:pla), Attorney Austin C Norris added to party LRZ(pty:pla), Attorney Austin C Norris added to party MAMR(pty:pla), Attorney Austin C Norris added to party OOM(pty:pla), Attorney Austin C Norris added to party RMG(pty:pla), Attorney Austin C Norris added to party SGJ(pty:pla), Attorney Austin C Norris added to party SJ(pty:pla), Attorney Austin C Norris added to party SRM(pty:pla), Attorney Austin C Norris added to party TGR(pty:pla))(Norris, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRVQ et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGJ
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJ
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TGR
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAMR
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAPV
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DMRM
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OOM
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRM
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMG
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LRZ
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRVQ
Represented By: Austin C Norris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Clinton Lawless
Represented By: Michael E Baumann
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Carey
Represented By: Brigit Greeson Alvarez
Represented By: Carmen Elena McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Connor, Field Office Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Nebraska Service Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli, Acting Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Paul, Acting Deputy Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Vermont Service Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld, Associate Director of Service Center Operations for the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?