Better Housing for Long Beach et al v. City of Long Beach et al
Plaintiff: Better Housing for Long Beach and Joani Weir
Defendant: City of Long Beach and Gavin Newsom
Case Number: 2:2019cv08861
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion To Strike Answer filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beard, Paul)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Long Beach, identifying City of Long Beach. (Russell, Howard)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant City of Long Beach.(Attorney Howard Darryl Russell added to party City of Long Beach(pty:dft))(Russell, Howard)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plainitffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Gavin Newsom. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Wise, R)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER #10 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. December 6, 2019: Defendants to file any motions to dismiss. January 10, 2020: Plaintiffs to file opposition to any motions to dismiss. January 22, 2020: Defendants to file replies in support of any motions to dismiss. February 10, 2020: Hearing on any motions to dismiss. (iv)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Gavin Newsom answer now due 12/6/2019, filed by defendant Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney R Matthew Wise added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft))(Wise, R)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Gavin Newsom. (esa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant City of Long Beach. (esa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir, (Attorney Paul J Beard, II added to party Joani Weir(pty:pla))(Beard, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir. (Beard, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir. (Beard, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir. (Beard, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24608759 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach. (Attorney Paul J Beard, II added to party Better Housing for Long Beach(pty:pla))(Beard, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Better Housing for Long Beach et al v. City of Long Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Better Housing for Long Beach
Represented By: Paul J Beard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joani Weir
Represented By: Paul J Beard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Long Beach
Represented By: Howard Darryl Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: R Matthew Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?