Diane Benton et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Dianne Benton and David Benton
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv09830
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation answer now due 1/23/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Attorney Derrick Lam added to party National Railroad Passenger Corporation(pty:dft))(Lam, Derrick)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Dianne Benton, David Benton, upon Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Adams, Thomas)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (lh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (McCallion, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs David Benton, Dianne Benton. (McCallion, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs David Benton, Dianne Benton. (McCallion, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24793351 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Dianne Benton, David Benton. (Attorney James McCallion added to party David Benton(pty:pla), Attorney James McCallion added to party Dianne Benton(pty:pla))(McCallion, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diane Benton et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Derrick Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Benton
Represented By: James McCallion
Represented By: Thomas Gregory Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Benton
Represented By: James McCallion
Represented By: Thomas Gregory Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?