Henry C. Hayes v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Henry C. Hayes
Defendant: R. Clemons, Alan W. Cox, D. Ulstad, C/O Kauffman, R. Franklin, CDCR Criminal Intelligence Task Force Digital Forensic Team, P. Jacobsma, E. Jordan, California State Prison Los Angeles County, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, A. Lugo, M. Stratman, T. Ramos, B. Sullivan and Francisco Arellano
Case Number: 2:2019cv09885
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
November 1, 2019 The United States District Court for the Central District of California shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re #11 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This suit is transferred to the Central District of California. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Response to #8 Order to Show Cause ; byHenry C. Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 34611144728. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Re #6 Complaint [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 10/14/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; filed by Henry C. Hayes. Re #3 Clerk's Notice (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT UNDER THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT, 42 U.S.C. 1983; (NO PROCESS); (Fee Paid, Receipt Number 34611144728 See Docket Number #9 ) against Francisco Arellano, CDCR Criminal Intelligence Task Force Digital Forensic Team, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Prison Los Angeles County, R. Clemons, Alan W. Cox, R. Franklin, P. Jacobsma, E. Jordan, Kauffman, A. Lugo, T. Ramos, M. Stratman, B. Sullivan, D. Ulstad. Filed byHenry C. Hayes. Re #4 Clerk's Notice (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Letter dated 08/07/19; from Henry C. Hayes re Complaint Form. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 9/9/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/23/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Letter dated 7/10/19 from Henry C. Hayes. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Francisco Arellano, CDCR Criminal Intelligence Task Force Digital Forensic Team, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Prison Los Angeles County, R. Clemons, Alan W. Cox, R. Franklin, P. Jacobsma, E. Jordan, Kauffman, A. Lugo, T. Ramos, M. Stratman, B. Sullivan, D. Ulstad (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Henry C Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry C. Hayes v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Ulstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR Criminal Intelligence Task Force Digital Forensic Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Jacobsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Prison Los Angeles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stratman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry C. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?