Jonathan VanLoan et al v. The Nation of Islam et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan VanLoan
Defendant: Samuel Lee, Steve Soboroff, Gleam Davis, Aurelio Mattucci, The City of Culver City, CA, The Nation of Islam, Ryan Thompson, Michael VanHook, Thomas Small, Kimberly Turner, Tim Goodrich, Tyrone Gribben, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance, Kevin McKeown, Sean Fowler, Mir Nawaz Karim, Providence Health and Services, Patrick Furey, Meghan Sahli-Wells, Southern California Hospital, American Youth Hostels, Inc., Goran Erikkson, Sue Himmelrich, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Michael Klepin, Richard Glimp, Louis Farrakhan, Garry Olney, Geoff Rizzzo, The City of Torrance, CA, Scott Bixby, Ted Winterer, Tolwin Psychiatric Medical Group, Inc., Hostelling International, Tony Vazquez, Patrick Sullivan, Marat Shpolyansky, Brian McGee, Eve Irvine, Prospect Medical Group, Rodney F. Hochman, Tony Muhammad, Mike Griffiths, James Gladden, Jonathan Reitman, Lisa Kahn, The City of Santa Monica, CA, Kenneth Semko, Terry O Day, George Chen, Steven Armenta, Leonard Green and Partners, Jason Driver, Milton Herring and Michael Tolwin
Case Number: 2:2020cv00127
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 63 Letter to Court filed by Plaintiff Jonathan VanLoan Letter to Court Re: Problem with Defendants Engaging in A Conspiracy of Silence And Evading Service of Process (VanLoan, Jonathan)
February 6, 2020 Filing 62 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Brian McGee. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 61 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Garry Olney. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 60 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant The City of Torrance, CA. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 59 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant The City of Santa Monica, CA. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 58 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Brian McGee. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 57 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant The City of Culver City, CA. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 56 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Aurelio Mattucci. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 55 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant American Youth Hostels, Inc.. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 54 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Kimberly Turner. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 53 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Tyrone Gribben. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 52 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Richard Glimp. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 51 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Tony Vazquez. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 50 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Tony Muhammad. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 49 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Tolwin Psychiatric Medical Group, Inc. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 48 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Sue Himmelrich. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 47 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Tim Goodrich. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 46 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant The Nation of Islam. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 45 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Terry O Day. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 44 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Ted Winterer. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 43 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Steven Armenta. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 42 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Rodney F. Hochman. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 41 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Goran Erikkson. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 40 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Hostelling International. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 39 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant James Gladden. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 38 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Jonathan Reitman. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 37 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Kevin McKeown. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 36 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Jason Driver. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 35 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Louis Farrakhan. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 34 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Michael Klepin. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 33 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Michael Tolwin. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 32 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Michael VanHook. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 31 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Milton Herring. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 30 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Providence Health and Services. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 28 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 27 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Mike Griffiths. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Scott Bixby. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Prospect Medical Group. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Meghan Sahli-Wells. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Marat Shpolyansky. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Leonard Green and Partners. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Eve Irvine. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Patrick Sullivan. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Patrick Furey. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Mir Nawaz Karim. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Gleam Davis. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Geoff Rizzzo. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant George Chen. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Kenneth Semko. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Samuel Lee. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Steve Soboroff, Individual and Official Capacities. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Lisa Kahn. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Thomas Small. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Ryan Thompson. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Southern California Hospital. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued as to Defendant Sean Fowler. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (vm)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. IT IS ORDERED that the Application for Permission for Electronic Filing by Jonathan VanLoan is hereby GRANTED. #5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (vm)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Jonathan VanLoan. (vm)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO PRO SE LITIGANT REGARDING PROCEDURES INCIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), service of the summons and complaint must be accomplished on each named Defendant (there are more than 55 individuals and entities in the complaint) within 90 days after the filing of the complaint. The 90-day period will expire on April 6, 2020. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Jonathan VanLoan. (esa)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against defendants American Youth Hostels, Inc., Steven Armenta, Scott Bixby, George Chen, Gleam Davis, Jason Driver, Goran Erikkson, Louis Farrakhan, Sean Fowler, Patrick Furey, James Gladden, Richard Glimp, Tim Goodrich, Tyrone Gribben, Mike Griffiths, Milton Herring, Sue Himmelrich, Rodney F. Hochman, Hostelling International, Eve Irvine, Lisa Kahn, Mir Nawaz Karim, Michael Klepin, Samuel Lee, Leonard Green and Partners, Aurelio Mattucci, Brian McGee, Kevin McKeown, Tony Muhammad, Terry O Day, Garry Olney, Prospect Medical Group, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Providence Health and Services, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance, Jonathan Reitman, Geoff Rizzzo, Meghan Sahli-Wells, Kenneth Semko, Marat Shpolyansky, Thomas Small, Steve Soboroff, Southern California Hospital, Patrick Sullivan, The City of Culver City, CA, The City of Santa Monica, CA, The City of Torrance, CA, The Nation of Islam, Ryan Thompson, Michael Tolwin, Tolwin Psychiatric Medical Group, Inc., Kimberly Turner, Michael VanHook, Tony Vazquez, Ted Winterer Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner,(Filing fee$400 paid), filed by plaintiff Jonathan VanLoan. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jonathan VanLoan et al v. The Nation of Islam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Soboroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gleam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelio Mattucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Culver City, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nation of Islam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael VanHook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Gribben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mir Nawaz Karim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health and Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Furey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan Sahli-Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Youth Hostels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goran Erikkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Himmelrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Klepin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Glimp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Farrakhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Olney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoff Rizzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Torrance, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bixby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Winterer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tolwin Psychiatric Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hostelling International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marat Shpolyansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eve Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney F. Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Griffiths
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Reitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Santa Monica, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Semko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry O Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Green and Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tolwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan VanLoan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?