R.S.M et al v. Chad F. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: M.R.M and R.S.M
Defendant: CHAD F WOLF, William Connor, Director Michael Paul, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Tracy Renaud, Michael Paul, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 2:2020cv02568
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. (shb)
March 31, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff R.S.M, M.R.M, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Dolly M. Gee, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-10759 DMG(MRWx) (rn)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: for Order #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Docket item 4 was e-filed under the wrong event. The clerk has modified the docket entry to reflect this is a pending motion. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant William Connor. (car)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Michael Paul. (car)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tracy Renaud. (car)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II. (car)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Chad F. Wolf. (car)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs M.R.M, R.S.M. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs M.R.M, R.S.M. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs M.R.M, R.S.M. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs M.R.M, R.S.M. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs M.R.M, R.S.M. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion and Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by Plaintiffs M.R.M, R.S.M. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Sohbatian, Nareeneh) Modified on 3/19/2020 (car).
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs M.R.M, R.S.M, (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs M.R.M, R.S.M. (Sohbatian, Nareeneh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: CACDC-25776598 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs R.S.M, M.R.M. (Attorney Nareeneh Sohbatian added to party M.R.M(pty:pla), Attorney Nareeneh Sohbatian added to party R.S.M(pty:pla))(Sohbatian, Nareeneh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.S.M et al v. Chad F. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Connor
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Michael Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Paul
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.R.M
Represented By: Nareeneh Sohbatian
Represented By: Akiko Krystina Nishino
Represented By: Eimeric Reig-Plessis
Represented By: Lena Silver
Represented By: Tzung-Lin Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.S.M
Represented By: Nareeneh Sohbatian
Represented By: Akiko Krystina Nishino
Represented By: Eimeric Reig-Plessis
Represented By: Lena Silver
Represented By: Tzung-Lin Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?