Ronnie Shahar v. United States Department of the Treasury et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Shahar
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Bureau of the Mint, United States Department of the Treasury, United States of America, Chad F. Wolf, Mark A. Morgan, Steven Mnuchin, United States Bureau of Customs and Border Protection Service and Patrick Hernandez
Case Number: 2:2020cv03003
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar, upon Defendant United States of America served on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Tonia Robing, title unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Tonia Robing. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Tonia Robing on behalf of Karl A. Racine Attorney General of the United States. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gersh, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2020 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar, upon Defendant United States Bureau of Customs and Border Protection Service served on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to United States Bureau of Customs & Border Protection Service, signed for by Agent Clark. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gersh, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar, upon Defendant Chad F. Wolf served on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Chad F. Wolf, Office of the General Counsel, US. Dept of Homeland Security, Signed for by Helen Smith. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gersh, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar, upon Defendant United States Bureau of the Mint served on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to United States Bureau of the Mint, Office of Chief Counsel, signed by J.Schorn. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gersh, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Chad F. Wolf Office of General Counsel, US Dept. of Homeland Security, signed for by Helen Smith. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gersh, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar, upon Defendant Patrick Hernandez served on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Patrick Hernandez, Director of US Mint. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gersh, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M. Eilender to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar, designating Jeffrey F. Gersh as local counsel #14 . (gk)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica R. Caterina to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar, designating Jeffrey F. Gersh as local counsel #13 . (gk)
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey Eilender to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25938397) filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar Ronnie Shahar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Gersh, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Caterina to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25938266) filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar Ronnie Shahar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Gersh, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants United States Department of the Treasury, United States Bureau of the Mint, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Bureau of Customs and Border Protection Service, Steven Mnuchin, Secretary of the Department of the Treasury, Patrick Hernandez, Deputy Director of the United States Mint, Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Mark A. Morgan, Commissioner of United States Customs and Border Protection, and United States of America. (gk)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar Ronnie Shahar. (Gersh, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Caterina. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M Eilender. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar Ronnie Shahar. (Gersh, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar Ronnie Shahar, identifying Defendants: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY; UNITED STATES BUREAU OF THE MINT; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY; UNITED STATES BUREAU OF CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION SERVICE; STEVEN MNUCHIN, Secretary of the Department of the Treasury; PATRICK HERNANDEZ, Deputy Director of the United States Mint; CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security; MARK A. MORGAN, Commissioner of United States Customs and Border Protection; and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Gersh, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Shahar. (Gersh, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25915091 - Fee: $400, filed by Ronnie Shahar Ronnie Shahar. (Attorney Jeffrey F Gersh added to party Ronnie Shahar(pty:pla))(Gersh, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronnie Shahar v. United States Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of the Mint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Customs and Border Protection Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Shahar
Represented By: Jeffrey F Gersh
Represented By: Jessica Caterina
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eilender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?