Michael Gonzales et al v. Charter Communications, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Ralston, Ronald Flores, Norbeto Alarcon, Everardo Villa, Gerald Llorence, Ricardo Ramos, Raul Romero, Julio Hernandez, Raymond Ulmer, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Sergio Rocha, Craig Bowlan and Carlos Serpas
Defendant: Sting Funez, Charter Communications, Inc., Artur Kosinski and Charter Communications, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv08299
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
2 Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 69 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court advances the time of the Scheduling Conference hearing set for 11/9/2020 from 10:30 AM to 08:30 AM to be heard remotely before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The clerk shall provide counsel with the contact information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 2, 2020 Filing 68 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Worksheet)(Romero, Abigail)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF FLSA COLLECTIVE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr, re Stipulation to Continue, #65 :The Court, finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS: 1. The Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective (the "FLSA Motion") is continued from 8:30 a.m. November 20, 2020 to 8:30 a.m. on December 4, 2020. 2. Defendant must file its response in opposition to the FLSA Motion on or before November 13, 2020. 3. Plaintiffs must file their reply in support of the FLSA Motion on or before November 20, 2020. 4. The statute of limitations applicable to the collective's FLSA claims is tolled for the time period of October 30, 2020 through December 4, 2020. (bm)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION (DKT.NO. 22) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: For the foregoing reasons, Charter's Motion is GRANTED. The Arbitration Plaintiffs are ORDERED to arbitrate their claims on an individual basis as set forth in the Agreement. Because the Arbitration Plaintiffs' claims are subject to arbitration in their entirety, and the resolution of those claims will have no impact on the three remaining Plaintiffs, the Court DISMISSES the Arbitration Plaintiffs from this action without prejudice. (see document for further details) (bm)
October 26, 2020 Filing 65 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification from Nov. 20, 2020 to Dec. 4, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective #58 filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of A. Romero, #2 Proposed Order)(Romero, Abigail)
October 26, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/16/20 9:19 am re Transcript #63 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Elizabeth) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 26, 2020 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/16/20 9:19 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number ktbdx@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2021. (Thibodeaux, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2020 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Charter Communications, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Bonnie Westenberger at bwestenberger@kcozlaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Ozmer, Joseph)
October 16, 2020 Filing 61 MINUTES OF MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Dkt. No. 22) Hearing held before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Hearing held. Counsel present argument. The Court takes the matter under submission. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (bm)
October 15, 2020 Filing 60 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael A Velthoen counsel for Plaintiff Michael Gonzales. Adding Michael A. Velthoen as counsel of record for Michael Gonzales, Sergio Rocha, Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Sting Funez, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Artur Kosinski, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Michael Gonzales, et al.. (Attorney Michael A Velthoen added to party Michael Gonzales(pty:pla))(Velthoen, Michael)
October 14, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Max R Engelhardt on behalf of Plaintiffs Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa (Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Norbeto Alarcon (pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Alberto Arena (pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Felipe Becerra(pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Craig Bowlan(pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Ronald Flores (pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Michael Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Dennis Harmon (pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Julio Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Gerald Llorence (pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Michael Ralston (pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Ricardo Ramos (pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Sergio Rocha(pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Raul Romero (pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Carlos Serpas(pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Raymond Ulmer (pty:pla), Attorney Max R Engelhardt added to party Everardo Villa(pty:pla))(Engelhardt, Max)
October 13, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective filed by Plaintiffs Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos ISO Motion for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective, #3 Exhibit "A" ISO Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos, #4 Exhibit "B" ISO Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos, #5 Exhibit "C" ISO Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos, #6 Exhibit "D" ISO Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos, #7 Exhibit "E" ISO Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos, #8 Exhibit "F" ISO Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos, #9 Exhibit "G" ISO Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos, #10 Exhibit "H" ISO Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos, #11 Declaration of Michael Gonzales ISO Motion for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective, #12 Exhibit "A' ISO Declaration of Michael Gonzales, #13 Exhibit "B" ISO Declaration of Michael Gonzales, #14 Declaration of Felipe Becerra ISO Motion for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective, #15 Declaration of Carlos Serpas ISO Motion for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective, #16 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective) (Karakalos, Aris)
October 1, 2020 Filing 57 CORRECTED SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: The Court continues the hearing re MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (ECF No. 22) filed by Charter Communications, LLC. from October 5, 2020 to Friday, October 16, 2020 @ 9:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 1, 2020 Filing 56 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr re: The Court continues the hearing re MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (ECF No. 22) filed by Defendants Dropil Inc. etc., from October 5, 2020 to Friday, October 16, 2020 @ 9:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 20-128) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08299-SB-ASx. (aco)
September 17, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re #22 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration)(Ozmer, Joseph)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. On August 24, 2020, this action was transferred from the Northern District of California. (Dkt. 45.) There is a pending Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration that was referred to this Court for resolution. (Id. at 7.) It appears that the motion has been fully briefed. (See Dkts. 22 (Motion), 31 (Opposition), 36 (Reply).) Accordingly, the Court hereby sets a hearing date for October 5, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. (mrgo)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (See Order for further detailss) (yl)
September 15, 2020 Filing 51 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL by Judge Percy Anderson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Percy Anderson. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the court as well. The Scheduling Conference has been set for 11/9/2020 at 10:30 AM (See order for further details) (yl)
September 15, 2020 Filing 50 [Proposed] Order Denying Defendant Charter Communications, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration re #22 filed by Plaintiffs Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa. (Karakalos, Aris)
September 11, 2020 Filing 46 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #25 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 8/13/2020 re #22 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Charter Communications, LLC, #25 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Charter Communications, LLC ; taking under submission #22 Motion to Dismiss; #25 Motion to Transfer Case. Total Time in Court: 46 Minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorneys: Max Englehart, Aris Karakalos. Defendant Attorneys: Joseph Ozmer II, Abigail Romero. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 43 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION HEARINGS AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM HEARING. Motion hearings re: #22 Motion to Dismiss, #25 Motion to Transfer and Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants will enter as attendees, thereafter promoted to panelists and are to arrive at least 5 minutes prior to start of hearing time.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619911861?pwd=TjVma1lnMlJlNHR3ZE9QMkFjNkFndz09Meeting ID: 161 991 1861Password: 912881Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. #25 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404; Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #22 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points & Authorities. Initial Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 42 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Romero, Abigail) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Sting Funez, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Artur Kosinski, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE: Regarding #39 Motion to Appear by Telephone, the Court will conduct hearing by Zoom Webinar videoconference. Counsel are to familiarize themselves with the Zoom platform and appear accordingly. Instructions for meeting ID and password will be forthcoming. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Sting Funez, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Artur Kosinski, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa. (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 8/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points & Authorities. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Court reverses its decision in Docket No. 35 . The Court will hear oral argument for both Defendants motions (Docket Nos. 22, 25) on August 13, 2020 at 1:30 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY (re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404; Memorandum of Points & Authorities ) filed byCharter Communications, LLC. (Ozmer, Joseph) (Filed on 7/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points & Authorities ) filed byCharter Communications, LLC. (Ozmer, Joseph) (Filed on 7/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 35 (DISREGARD. SEE 38 ) CLERK'S NOTICE. The Court temporarily vacates the hearing on #22 Defendant's motion to dismiss and compel arbitration so that the Court may first address #25 Defendant's motion to transfer venue. The hearing on the motion to transfer shall remain on August 13, 2020. The Court shall set a hearing on the arbitration motion if it denies the motion to transfer. The briefing schedule on the arbitration motion shall remain the same. Initial Case Management Conference also reset for 8/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/28/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 34 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ozmer, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Plaintiffs (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 7/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 32 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points & Authorities ) filed byNorbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Sting Funez, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Artur Kosinski, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Gonzales ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit "A" ISO Declaration of Michael Gonzales, #3 Exhibit "B" ISO Declaration of Michael Gonzales, #4 Exhibit "C" ISO Declaration of Michael Gonzales, #5 Declaration of Max R. Engelhardt ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 7/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 30 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404; Memorandum of Points & Authorities ) filed byNorbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Sting Funez, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Artur Kosinski, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit "A" ISO Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos, #3 Exhibit "B" ISO Declaration of Aris E. Karakalos)(Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 7/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Charter Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Charter Communications, Inc, Other Affiliate Liberty Broadband Corporation, Other Affiliate Kabat Chapman & Ozmer LLP for Charter Communications, LLC. (Romero, Abigail) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Ozmer as Counsel for Defendant (Ozmer, Joseph) (Filed on 7/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 27 Declaration of A. Romero in Support of #25 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byCharter Communications, LLC. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Romero, Abigail) (Filed on 7/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 26 Declaration of S. Lee in Support of #25 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byCharter Communications, LLC. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Romero, Abigail) (Filed on 7/2/2020)[Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Charter Communications, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/16/2020. Replies due by 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romero, Abigail) (Filed on 7/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 24 Declaration of A. Romero in Support of #22 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byCharter Communications, LLC. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Romero, Abigail) (Filed on 7/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of J. Fries in Support of #22 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byCharter Communications, LLC. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Romero, Abigail) (Filed on 7/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Charter Communications, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/16/2020. Replies due by 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romero, Abigail) (Filed on 7/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCharter Communications, LLC. (Romero, Abigail) (Filed on 7/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #19 Stipulation. Answer due 7/2/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #17 Amended Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to FAC to July 2, 2020 filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Romero, Abigail) (Filed on 6/17/2020) Modified on 6/24/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Sting Funez, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Artur Kosinski, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa Re: Consent Filings (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 6/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) filed by Plaintiffs against Charter Communications, LLC. Filed byMichael Ralston, Ronald Flores, Sergio Rocha, Michael Gonzales, Everardo Villa, Raul Romero, Craig Bowlan, Norbeto Alarcon, Gerald Llorence, Ricardo Ramos, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Dennis Harmon, Alberto Arena, Julio Hernandez, Felipe Becerra, Sting Funez, Artur Kosinski. (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 6/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Stipulation. Answer due 6/22/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint to June 22, 2020 filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC. (Stecker, Abigail) (Filed on 6/1/2020) Modified on 6/4/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa for Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Strauss, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa for Defendant Charter Communications, LLC (Strauss, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Michael Ralston Re: Consent Filing (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 4/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa Re: Consent Filings (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 4/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Edward M. Chen. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 2/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa.. (Strauss, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/15/ 2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Strauss, Michael) (Filed on 4/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY against Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14387111.). Filed byMichael Ralston, Ronald Flores, Sergio Rocha, Michael Gonzales, Everardo Villa, Raul Romero, Craig Bowlan, Norbeto Alarcon, Gerald Llorence, Ricardo Ramos, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Dennis Harmon, Alberto Arena, Julio Hernandez, Felipe Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 4/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Gonzales et al v. Charter Communications, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ralston
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Flores
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norbeto Alarcon
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everardo Villa
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Llorence
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Ramos
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Romero
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Hernandez
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Ulmer
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Arena
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Becerra
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gonzales
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Michael A Velthoen
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Harmon
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Rocha
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Bowlan
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Serpas
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Represented By: Max R Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sting Funez
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Abigail Stecker Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artur Kosinski
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Abigail Stecker Romero
Represented By: Joseph W Ozmer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?