Gregory R. Miranda et al v. Robert Guzman Luna et al
Plaintiff: Gregory R. Miranda and Joanna Padilla
Defendant: Does 1-5, Robert Guzman Luna, Joseph Lawrence Gludt, Jeffrey Douglas Kruger, John C. Jacobs, Mary Kathleen Farretta, Jeffrey C. Jacobs, Gavin Newsom, John Patrick Garry and Brandon Christopher Sears
Case Number: 2:2020cv09004
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant Mary Kathleen Farretta, John Patrick Garry, Joseph Lawrence Gludt, Jeffrey C. Jacobs, John C. Jacobs, Jeffrey Douglas Kruger, Robert Guzman Luna, Gavin Newsom, Brandon Christopher Sears. (es)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Plaintiff shall file two (2) copies of the proof of service showing compliance with this order within sixty (60) days of filing the complaint, i.e., no later than December 28, 2020. [See order for details.] (es)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED Plaintiff has not provided complete responses to Question 1(b) in the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperi. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall resubmit amended IFP form within 30 days or this action will be dismissed. (et)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: denying #2 ] REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED Plaintiff's response to Question 5 in the Request to Proceed In In Forma Pauperis ("not sure") is insufficient. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall resubmit amended IFP form within 30 days or this action will be dismissed. (et)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Gregory R. Miranda, Joanna Padilla, (ghap)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Gregory R. Miranda. (ghap)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Joanna Padilla. (ghap)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Does 1-5, Mary Kathleen Farretta, John Patrick Garry, Joseph Lawrence Gludt, Jeffrey C. Jacobs, John C. Jacobs, Jeffrey Douglas Kruger, Robert Guzman Luna, Gavin Newsom, Brandon Christopher Sears Case assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L Abrams., filed by plaintiffs Joanna Padilla, Gregory R. Miranda. (Attachments: #1 CV-71, #2 Summons) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory R. Miranda et al v. Robert Guzman Luna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Guzman Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lawrence Gludt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Douglas Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kathleen Farretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey C. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Patrick Garry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Christopher Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory R. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?