Election Integrity Project California, Inc. et al v. Alex Padilla et al
Plaintiff: Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Mark Reed, Alison Hayden, James P. Bradley, Kevin Cookingham, Mike Cargile, Aja Smith, Eric Early and Jeffrey Gorman
Defendant: Dean Logan, Deborah R. Cooper, Joe Paul Gonzalez, Ventura County Clerk Mark A. Lunn, Brandi Orth, Xavier Becerra, Rebecca Spencer, Alex Padilla, Gavin Newsom, Tim Dupuis, Gail L. Pellerin, Claudio Valenzuela, Courtney Bailey-Kanelo, Bob Page, Neal Kelley, Shannon Bushey, Mark A. Lunn and Dr Shirley Weber
Case Number: 2:2021cv00032
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 67 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Dean Logan served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shalia T., Human Resources in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Claudio Valenzuela served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Fernando Osorio, Security in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 65 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Rebecca Spencer served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca Spencer, Registrar of Voters for Riverside County of the State of California in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 64 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Gail L. Pellerin served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tricia Webber, Registrar in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Bob Page served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bob Page, Registrar of Voters for San Bernardino County in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 62 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Alex Padilla served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriella Santiago, Executive Assistant in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Brandi Orth served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sherrie Evans, Deputy Clerk to the Board of Supervisors in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Gavin Newsom served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon SERVICEOFPROCESS@GOV.CA.GOV in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 59 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Neal Kelley served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tiffany Nevarez, Voter Assistant in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 58 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Joe Paul Gonzalez served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ana de Castro Maquiz, Senior Deputy in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 57 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Tim Dupuis served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Janet Payne, Assistant in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 56 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Deborah R. Cooper served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tyler Stull, Administrative Analyst in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 55 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Shannon Bushey served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Delfino Isais, Election Specialist in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 54 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Xavier Becerra served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JP Sattler, Officer #44 in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 53 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Courtney Bailey-Kanelo served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Laura Harvey, Office Technician in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 25, 2021 Filing 52 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden, upon Defendant Mark A. Lunn served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brenden Vlahakis, Clerk of the Board in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kroot, Joshua)
February 22, 2021 Filing 51 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Courtney Bailey-Kanelo, Shannon Bushey, Deborah R. Cooper, Tim Dupuis, Joe Paul Gonzalez, Neal Kelley, Dean Logan, Mark A. Lunn, Brandi Orth, Bob Page, Gail L. Pellerin, Rebecca Spencer, re Notice of Motion,, #50 served on 2/22/2021. (Spiegel, Julia)
February 22, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of County Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint #43 Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Courtney Bailey-Kanelo, Shannon Bushey, Deborah R. Cooper, Tim Dupuis, Joe Paul Gonzalez, Neal Kelley, Dean Logan, Mark A. Lunn, Brandi Orth, Bob Page, Gail L. Pellerin, Rebecca Spencer. Motion set for hearing on 4/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Spiegel, Julia)
February 17, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of County Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint #43 . The following error(s) was/were found: he docket reflects that this Motion is filed on behalf of Shannon Bushey (Registrar of Voters for the County of Santa Clara), only. It is actually filed on behalf of Defendants Rebecca Spencer, Riverside County Registrar of Voters; Dean C. Logan, Los Angeles County Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk; Mark A. Lunn, Ventura County Registrar of Voters; Bob Page, San Bernardino County Registrar of Voters; Courtney Bailey- Kanelos, Sacramento County Registrar of Voters; Tim Dupuis, Registrar of Voters for the County of Alameda; Deborah Cooper, Contra Costa County Registrar of Voters; Shannon Bushey, Registrar of Voters for the County of Santa Clara; Joe Paul Gonzalez, San Benito County Clerk-Auditor-Recorder- Registrar of Voters; Gail Pellerin, Santa Cruz County Registrar of Voters; Brandi L. Orth, County Clerk/Register of Voters for the County of Fresno; and Neal Kelley, Registrar of Voters for the County of Orange. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
February 17, 2021 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom, Alex Padilla, Shirley Weber, re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #45 Complaint served on 02/17/2021. (Hanley, Ryan)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 10:00 AM. See order for further details. (jre)
February 16, 2021 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Alan Smith counsel for Defendant Mark A. Lunn. Adding Matthew A. Smith as counsel of record for Ventura County Registrar of Voters Mark A. Lunn for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Ventura County Registrar of Voters Mark A. Lunn. (Attorney Matthew Alan Smith added to party Mark A. Lunn(pty:dft))(Smith, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Filing 45 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom, Alex Padilla. Motion set for hearing on 4/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO State Defs.' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice ISO State Defs.' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate of Service) (Hanley, Ryan)
February 12, 2021 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Shannon Bushey, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of County Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint #43 served on 2/12/2021. (Spiegel, Julia)
February 12, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of County Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Defendant Shannon Bushey. Motion set for hearing on 4/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting County Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Without Leave to Amend; Judgment of Dismissal) (Spiegel, Julia)
February 2, 2021 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Wells Ellinwood counsel for Defendant Joe Paul Gonzalez. Adding Joseph Wells Ellinwood as counsel of record for Joe Paul Gonzalez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Joe Paul Gonzalez. (Attorney Joseph Wells Ellinwood added to party Joe Paul Gonzalez(pty:dft))(Ellinwood, Joseph)
January 29, 2021 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Suzanne Esther Shoai counsel for Defendant Neal Kelley. Adding Suzanne E. Shoai as counsel of record for Neal Kelly, Registrar of Voters for the County of Orange for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Neal Kelley, Registrar of Voters for the County of Orange. (Attorney Suzanne Esther Shoai added to party Neal Kelley(pty:dft))(Shoai, Suzanne)
January 28, 2021 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert P Parrish counsel for Defendant Courtney Bailey-Kanelo. Adding Robert P. Parrish as counsel of record for Courtney Bailey-Kanelo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Courtney Bailey-Kanelo. (Attorney Robert P Parrish added to party Courtney Bailey-Kanelo(pty:dft))(Parrish, Robert)
January 27, 2021 Filing 39 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Xavier Becerra answer now due 2/12/2021; Alex Padilla answer now due 2/12/2021; Gavin Newsom answer now due 2/12/2021, filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra; Alex Padilla; Gavin Newsom.(Attorney Ryan Andrew Hanley added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Andrew Hanley added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Andrew Hanley added to party Alex Padilla(pty:dft))(Hanley, Ryan)
January 25, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 22, 2021 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kim Ha Hara counsel for Defendant Shannon Bushey. Adding Kim H. Hara as counsel of record for Shannon Bushey for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Shannon Bushey. (Attorney Kim Ha Hara added to party Shannon Bushey(pty:dft))(Hara, Kim)
January 22, 2021 Filing 36 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by Mail)(Attorney Mary Elizabeth Hanna-Weir added to party Shannon Bushey(pty:dft))(Hanna-Weir, Mary)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE #21 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
January 11, 2021 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Shannon Bushey, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #33 Proof of Service by Mail served on 1/11/2021. (Spiegel, Julia)
January 9, 2021 Filing 33 OPPOSITION re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #21 Specially Appearing Defendant County of Santa Clara Registrar of Voters Shannon Busheys Opposition to Plaintiffs Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue filed by Defendant Shannon Bushey. (Attorney Julia Blau Spiegel added to party Shannon Bushey(pty:dft))(Spiegel, Julia)
January 8, 2021 Filing 32 Opposition to Application for TRO Opposition re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #21 by Plaintiff Election Integrity Project filed by Objector Brandi Orth. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Kus)(Attorney Daniel Carl Cederborg added to party Brandi Orth(pty:obj))(Cederborg, Daniel)
January 7, 2021 Filing 31 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #21 filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom, Alex Padilla. (Attorney Jonathan Michael Eisenberg added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Michael Eisenberg added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Michael Eisenberg added to party Alex Padilla(pty:dft))(Eisenberg, Jonathan)
January 7, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rebecca Spencer, (Patel, Ronak)
January 7, 2021 Filing 29 OPPOSITION re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #21 filed by Defendant Rebecca Spencer. (Attorney Ronak N Patel added to party Rebecca Spencer(pty:dft))(Patel, Ronak)
January 7, 2021 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #21 SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY REGISTRAR OF VOTERS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE filed by Defendant Bob Page. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of San Bernardino County Registrar of Voters Bob Page In Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order)(Attorney Laura Lynn Crane added to party Bob Page(pty:dft))(Crane, Laura)
January 7, 2021 Filing 27 Opposition re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #21 filed by Defendant Neal Kelley. (Attorney Rebecca Sorgen Leeds added to party Neal Kelley(pty:dft))(Leeds, Rebecca)
January 6, 2021 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith, of Temporary Restraining Order Application and Related Documents served on January 6, 2021. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 6, 2021 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Courtney Bailey-Kanelo, Xavier Becerra, Shannon Bushey, Deborah R. Cooper, Tim Dupuis, Joe Paul Gonzalez, Neal Kelley, Dean Logan, Mark A. Lunn, Gavin Newsom, Brandi Orth, Alex Padilla, Bob Page, Gail L. Pellerin, Rebecca Spencer and Claudio Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 XBecerra, #2 SBushey, #3 DCooper, #4 TDupuis, #5 JPGonzalez, #6 NKelley, #7 DLogan, #8 MLunn, #9 GNewsome, #10 BOrth, #11 APadilla, #12 BPage, #13 GPellerin, #14 RSpencer, #15 CValenzuela) (jtil)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
January 6, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 6, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
January 5, 2021 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ruth Weiss, #2 Declaration of Ellen Swensen, #3 Declaration of Mary Gallegos, #4 Declaration of Joshua Kroot, #5 Proposed Order re Temporary Restraining Order, #6 Proposed Order re Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction) (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Election Integrity Project California, Inc. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs James P. Bradley, Mike Cargile, Kevin Cookingham, Eric Early, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Alison Hayden, Buzz Patterson, Greg Raths, Mark Reed, Aja Smith. (Kroot, Joshua)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29852775 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Greg Raths, Mark Reed, James P. Bradley, Election Integrity Project California, Inc., Jeffrey Gorman, Aja Smith, Mike Cargile, Buzz Patterson, Eric Early, Kevin Cookingham, Alison Hayden. (Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party James P. Bradley(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party Mike Cargile(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party Kevin Cookingham(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party Eric Early(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party Election Integrity Project California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party Jeffrey Gorman(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party Alison Hayden(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party Buzz Patterson(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party Greg Raths(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party Mark Reed(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D Kroot added to party Aja Smith(pty:pla))(Kroot, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Election Integrity Project California, Inc. et al v. Alex Padilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Paul Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph Wells Ellinwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura County Clerk Mark A. Lunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Orth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Spencer
Represented By: Ronak N Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Padilla
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Dupuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail L. Pellerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudio Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Bailey-Kanelo
Represented By: Robert P Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Page
Represented By: Laura Lynn Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Kelley
Represented By: Suzanne Esther Shoai
Represented By: Rebecca Sorgen Leeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Bushey
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Hanna-Weir
Represented By: Julia Blau Spiegel
Represented By: Kim Ha Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Lunn
Represented By: Matthew Alan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Shirley Weber
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buzz Patterson
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Raths
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Election Integrity Project California, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Reed
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Hayden
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Bradley
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Cookingham
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Cargile
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aja Smith
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Early
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Gorman
Represented By: Joshua D Kroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?