Verdell Kegler v. R. C. Johnson
Petitioner: Verdell Kegler
Respondent: R. C. Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv01433
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Lodged Document ("LD") Numbered LD-1 through LD-6 re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Memorandum of Points and Authorities #9 (Attachments: #1 LD-1, #2 LD-2, #3 LD-3, #4 LD-4, #5 LD-5, #6 LD-6)(Estaville, Toni)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Respondent R. C. Johnson. (Estaville, Toni)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to the Court's order re filing fee #4 filed by Petitioner Verdell Kegler (es)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Toni R Johns Estaville on behalf of Respondent R. C. Johnson (Attorney Toni R Johns Estaville added to party R. C. Johnson(pty:res))(Estaville, Toni)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION (28 U.S.C. 2254) by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Respondent may file and serve an Answer to the Petition within forty-five (45) days after the date of this Order. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Respondent may file a Motion to Dismiss within thirty (30) days after the date of this Order. (Attachments: #1 Attach.Petition) (es)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from Verdell Kegler. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 . Receipt number LA218836. (jo)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (In Chambers): Order re: Filing Fee or Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: Petitioner is ORDERED to submit, by no later than March 24, 2021, either (1) the filing fee of $5 or (2) a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis with the required supporting documentation. A form Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is attached to this Order. (see document for details.) (Attachments: #1 Attach) (es)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111 Notice re discrepancies with IFP Request) (et)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Verdell Kegler. The Petitioner does not consent. (et)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE.), filed by Petitioner Verdell Kegler. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verdell Kegler v. R. C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Verdell Kegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. C. Johnson
Represented By: Toni R Johns Estaville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?