Triller, Inc. v. Filmdaily.com et al
Plaintiff: Triller, Inc. and Triller Fight Club II LLC
Defendant: Online2livestream.us, Mike, My-sports.club, Crackstreamslive.com, Filmdaily.com, Itslilbrandon, Your Extra, Trendy Clips, Accesstvpro.co, Sports-today.club, Eclipt Gaming, DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive,, Bilasport.com, H3H3 Productions, The H3 Podcast and DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv03502
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) re ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson re: #24 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court therefore denies Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application without prejudice to its being filed as a regularly-noticed motion. The Court additionally concludes that Defendants are misjoined. Because the Proposed 2nd AC does not cure the misjoinder problem identified by the Court, the Court denies Plaintiff's request for leave to file the Proposed 2nd AC without prejudice to any efforts to seek amendment in a manner consistent with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21, misjoinder of parties "is not a ground for dismissing an action." Instead, "[o]n motion or on its own, the court may at any time, on just terms, add or drop a party." Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. Where there is a misjoinder, "the court can generally dismiss all but the first named [defendant] without prejudice to the institution of new, separate lawsuits [against] the dropped [defendants]." Coughlin, 130 F.3d at 1350. Accordingly, the Court thus drops all Defendants except Filmdaily.com. This order does not limit Plaintiff's ability to refile its claims against the remaining Defendants in separate actions. (See document for details) (mrgo)
May 6, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Triller Fight Club II LLC. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Discovery #24 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to O'Brien Decl.-Subpoena to Google LLC, #2 Exhibit B to O'Brien Decl.-Subpoena to Youtube LLC)(Novian, Farhad)
May 5, 2021 Filing 24 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiff Triller Fight Club II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY) (Novian, Farhad)
May 5, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Triller Fight Club II LLC TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED APRIL 28, 2021 (Novian, Farhad)
April 29, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Triller Fight Club II LLC, identifying TRILLER FIGHT CLUB II LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company; FILMDAILY.COM, an unknown business entity; ACCESSTVPRO.CO, an unknown business entity; ONLINE2LIVESTREAM.US, an unknown business entity; CRACKSTREAMSLIVE.COM, an unknown business entity; SPORTS-TODAY.CLUB, an unknown business entity; MY-SPORTS.CLUB, an unknown business entity; BILASPORT.COM, an unknown business entity; TRENDY CLIPS, an unknown business entity; MIKE, an unknown business entity; YOUR EXTRA, an unknown business entity; ECLIPT GAMING, an unknown business entity; ITSLILBRANDON, an unknown business entity; the H3 PODCAST, an unknown business entity; H3H3 PRODUCTIONS, an unknown business entity. (Novian, Farhad)
April 29, 2021 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against re All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Triller Fight Club II LLC(Attorney Farhad Novian added to party Triller Fight Club II LLC(pty:pla))(Novian, Farhad)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff alleges that it "is informed and believes, and thereon alleges, that the actions and omissions that serve as the basis for this complaint were undertaken jointly and with the consent, conspiracy, cooperation, and joint participation of all defendants." (Compl. 21.) The Complaint also alleges, on information and belief, "that at all times mentioned herein, each defendant was the agent, joint venture, and/or employee of each and every other defendant, and in doing the things alleged in this complaint, each defendant was acting within the course and scope of such agency, joint venture, and/or employment and with the permission and consent of each of the other defendants." (Id. at 22.) Other than these conclusory allegations, the Complaint does not contain any well-pleaded facts that plausibly support even an inference that Defendants acted jointly. (See document for full details). For these reasons, the Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than May 10, 2021, why one or more of the Defendants should not be dropped from this case for improper joinder. (See document for details) (mrgo)
April 28, 2021 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Accesstvpro.co, Bilasport.com, Crackstreamslive.com, Eclipt Gaming, Filmdaily.com, Itslilbrandon, Mike, My-sports.club, Online2livestream.us, Sports- today.club, Trendy Clips, Your Extra. (Attachments: #1 FilmDaily, #2 Online2Livestream, #3 Crackstreamslive, #4 SportsToday, #5 MySports, #6 Bilasport, #7 Trendy Clips, #8 Mike, #9 Your Extra, #10 Eclipt, #11 Itslilbrandon) (jtil)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
April 27, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 27, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
April 23, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc., identifying TRILLER, INC.; FILMDAILY.COM; ACCESSTVPRO.CO; ONLINE2LIVESTREAM.US; CRACKSTREAMSLIVE.COM; SPORTS-TODAY.CLUB; MY-SPORTS.CLUB; BILASPORT.COM; TRENDY CLIPS; MIKE; YOUR EXTRA; ECLIPT GAMING; ITSLILBRANDON. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31177301 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Triller, Inc.. (Attorney Farhad Novian added to party Triller, Inc.(pty:pla))(Novian, Farhad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triller, Inc. v. Filmdaily.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Online2livestream.us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My-sports.club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crackstreamslive.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filmdaily.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itslilbrandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Your Extra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trendy Clips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accesstvpro.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sports-today.club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eclipt Gaming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilasport.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H3H3 Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The H3 Podcast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triller, Inc.
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Michael Jason O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triller Fight Club II LLC
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?