Manuel Figueroa v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: MANUEL FIGUEROA
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv07397
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue #13 . (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/23/2021. Scheduling Conference continued to 12/30/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from November 1, 2021 to December 30, 2021 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for November 1, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than October 25, 2021. (iv)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #9 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #8 served on 9/20/2021. (Lambert, Sarah)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
September 15, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/8/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT L)(ghap)
September 15, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Manuel Figueroa, upon Defendant Ford Motor Company served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amanda Garcia, authorized agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/18/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT K) (ghap)
September 15, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Manuel Figueroa. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/15/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, identifying State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the Ford defined contribution plans), Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plan), Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates; The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV26088 Receipt No: ACACDC-31989967 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of SCL iso Removal, #2 Exhibit A to SCL Decl iso Removal, #3 Exhibit B to SCL Decl iso Removal, #4 Exhibit C to SCL Decl iso Removal, #5 Exhibit D to SCL Decl iso Removal, #6 Exhibit E to SCL Decl iso Removal, #7 Exhibit F to SCL Decl iso Removal, #8 Exhibit G to SCL Decl iso Removal, #9 Exhibit H to SCL Decl iso Removal, #10 Exhibit I to SCL Decl iso Removal, #11 Exhibit J to SCL Decl iso Removal, #12 Exhibit K to SCL Decl iso Removal, #13 Exhibit L to SCL Decl iso Removal, #14 Exhibit M to SCL Decl iso Removal, #15 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Lambert, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuel Figueroa v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL FIGUEROA
Represented By: David N Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Eric D Sentlinger
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?