Cory Taylor v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Cory Taylor
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv08810
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-8810 MAA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Paul H. Sachelari added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cory Taylor, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of service SF, #2 Exhibit proof of service WA, #3 Exhibit proof of service LA)(Davis, Kamaria)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. [See order for details.] (Attachments: #1 Attach.1) (es)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (es)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration. (es)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Cory Taylor. (Davis, Kamaria)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Cory Taylor, (Davis, Kamaria)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by plaintiff Cory Taylor. (Davis, Kamaria)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cory Taylor. (Davis, Kamaria)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Cory Taylor. (Davis, Kamaria)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Cory Taylor. (Attorney Kamaria Yaminah Davis added to party Cory Taylor(pty:pla))(Davis, Kamaria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cory Taylor v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Taylor
Represented By: Kamaria Yaminah Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Paul H. Sachelari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?