David Williams v. Lompoc Federal Corrections Complex et al
Plaintiff: David Williams
Defendant: Lompoc Federal Corrections Complex and Wardens
Case Number: 2:2022cv00236
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Cormac J Carney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams: Granting #19 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Answer Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended up to and including April 5, 2022. (es)
March 4, 2022 Filing 19 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 4/5/2022 re Amended Complaint, #11 filed by Defendants Lompoc Federal Corrections Complex, Wardens. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanne S. Osinoff, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party Lompoc Federal Corrections Complex (pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party Wardens(pty:dft)) (Osinoff, Joanne)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915, the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the total filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $100.00 must be paid within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed. Failure to remit the initial partial filing fee may result in dismissal of the case. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). #12 #17 (ch)
February 18, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff David Williams. (es)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams: 1. Plaintiff Williams is an inmate at U.S.P. Lompoc. On January 31, 2022, he filed a "Complaint for Administrative Remedy Review" seeking his compassionate release from custody under the First Step Act. (Complaint at 33, 35, 41). Although plaintiff has now submitted an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. 12), he did not submit a certified copy of his prison trust fund account for the last six months, or his authorization for prison officials to collect the filing fee from his trust account over time. See 28 U.S.C. section 1915. Should plaintiff desire to proceed with this action, he must submit that documentation no later than February 25, 2022. 2. The Court directs the Clerk to serve the Complaint and accompanying papers on the United States Attorney's Office. The government is directed to file a response to the Complaint no later than February 25, 2022. 3. After the Court reviews the government's submission, it will determine whether to solicit further briefing from the parties or to take the matter under submission. re: Amended Complaint #11 , APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #12 . (Attachments: #1 Attachment. First Amended Complaint, #2 Attachment.Application, #3 Attachment.Request 1, #4 Attachment.Request 2, #5 Attachment.Certificate of Service) (es)
January 31, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff David Williams, re Request for Judicial Notice #13 , Amended Complaint, #11 , APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #12 , Request for Judicial Notice #14 served on 1/24/2022. (es)
January 31, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE: BUREAU OF PRISONS MEDICAL RECORD (Fed. Evid. R. 201(c)(2)) filed by Plaintiff David Williams. (es)
January 31, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE: BOP ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDY FORMS(Fed. Evid. R. 201(c)(2)) filed by Plaintiff David Williams. (es)
January 31, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff David Williams. (es)
January 31, 2022 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDY PROCEDURE REVIEW OF LOMPOC FEDERAL CORRECTIONS COMPLEX AND WARDENS against defendant(s) Lompoc Federal Corrections Complex, Wardens amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 , filed by plaintiff David Williams(es)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CLOSING CASE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 Letter from plaintiff David Williams. (ch)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: DENYING #4 Notice of Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93). DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 CORRECTED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Notice of Assignment #5 was docketed with the wrong Magistrate Judge. Douglas F. McCormick is not assigned to this case. Docket item 5 should be disregarded. A corrected Notice will be issued. (car)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 1/14/2022, SEE ITEM 6]NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) Modified on 1/14/2022 (car).
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) (car)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff David Williams, re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 , Request for Judicial Notice #2 , Certificate of Service served on 1/5/2022. (car)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff David Williams. (car)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams, filed by Plaintiff David Williams. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Williams v. Lompoc Federal Corrections Complex et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lompoc Federal Corrections Complex
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wardens
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?