Tucson Medical Center et al v. Xavier Becerra
Plaintiff: Tucson Medical Center, Alton Memorial Hospital, Abbeville General Hospital, Avoyelles Hospital, Auxilio Mutuo Hospital, Anmed Health Anderson, Avera McKennan Hospital, Anaheim Memorial Medical Center, Alhambra Hospital, Arizona Regional Medical Center, Baptist St. Anthony's Hospital, Bristol Hospital, Beverly Hospital, Baylor Scott White Hospital Llano, Bellflower Medical Center, Brunswick Novant Medical Center, Baylor University Medical Center at Irving, Betsy Johnson Healthcare System (Betsy Johnson Regional Hospital), Baylor University Medical Center at Wazhachie, Covenant Medical Center, Cox Medical Center, Christian Hospital Northeast, Cape Fear Valley Medical Center, Central Washington Hospital, Covenant Medical Center (St. Mary Hospital of the Plains), Charlotte Hungerford Hospital, Community Hospital of San Buenaventura, Danbury Hospital, DCH Regional Medical Center, Doctor's Center Bayamon, Frisbie Memorial Hospital, Doctor's Center Hospital Manati, DCH Northport Medical Center, Dameron Hospital, Denver Health Medical Center, Deaconess Medical Center, Garfield Medical Center, Frederick Ferris Thompson Hospital, Floyd Medical Center, Greater El Monte Community Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Hamilton Medical Center, Harrison Memorial Hospital, Hartford Hospital, Halifax Hospital Medical Center, Heart Hospital of Bakersfield, Hollywood Presbyterian Medical Center, Holmes Regional Medical Center, Hospital San Lucas II, Indian River, Larkin Community Hospital, John Dempsey Hospital, Hospital Episcopal Cristo Redentor, Hospital Buen Samaritano, Houston Methodist St. John Hospital, John D. Archibold Memorial Hospital, Lake Charles Memorial Hospital, Kentuckiana Medical Center, Kadlec Medical Center, Lawrence & Memorial Hospital, Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Loma Linda University Hospital, Longmont United Hospital, Mercy Hospital Fort Smith (St. Edwards), Mad River Community Hospital, Methodist Hospital West Houston, Methodist Hospital Southern California, Monterey Park Hospital, Middlesex Hospital, Medcenter One, Inc., Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Medical Park Hospital, Mercy Hospital Oklahoma City, Mercy Memorial Health Center, Monongahela Valley Hospital, Mother Frances Hospital, Methodist Sugar Land Hospital, Methodist Willowbrook Hospital, Medical College of Georgia, Memorial Hospital, Mercy Hospital Washington, Norwalk Hospital, New Britain General Hospital, Naples Community Hospital, Novant-Thomasville Community, Novant-Presbyterian Hospital Matthews, Novant-Forsyth Memorial Hospital, Novant-Presbyterian Hospital, Natchitoches Regional Medical Center, Nebraska Health Systems, New York Downtown Hospital, Opelousas General Hospital, Oakdale Community Hospital, Oaklawn Hospital, Ozarks Medical Center, Olympic Medical Center, Pacifica Hospital of the Valley, Parkland Health Center, Parkview Medical Center, St. Alexius Medical Center, St. Cloud Hospital, St. Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, San Gabriel Valley Medical Center, St. Francis Hospital & Medical Center, Saint Mary's Hospital, San Jacinto Methodist Hospital, Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, The Stamford Hospital, The Methodist Hospital, Salem Hospital, St. Vincent Health Center, Sioux Valley Hospital, Scott & White Memorial Hospital, University Hospital, Union General Hospital, University of Kansas, University of South Alabama Medical, University Medical Center Texas, University of Utah Hospital, University Hospital Oshu, Unicoi County Memorial Hospital, Via Christi Hospital in Pittsburg (Mt. Carmel RMC), Wuesthoff Memorial Hospital, Whittier Hospital Medical Center, Wilkes Regional Medical Center, Waterbury Hospital, William W. Backus Hospital, Winter Haven Hospital, Wheaton Fransiscan Healthcare, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital, Encino Hospital Medical Center, D C H Regional Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, Fayette Medical Center, Glendora Oaks Behavioral Health Hospital, Garden Grove Hospital & Medical Center, Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, Marin General Hospital, West Anaheim Medical Center, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Chino Valley Medical Center, Desert Valley Hospital, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Alvarado Hospital Medical Center, Montclaim Hospital Medical Center, Baptist St. Anthonys Hospital, Betsy Johnson Healthcare System, Doctors Center Bayamon, Doctors Center Hospital Manati, Lawrence and Memorial Hospital, Mercy Hospital Fort Smith, St. Lukes Hospital of Kansas City, St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center, Saint Marys Hospital, Scott and White Memorial Hospital, Via Christi Hospital in Pittsburg Mt. Carmel RMC, Yavapai Regional Medical Center - West, Garden Grove Hospital and Medical Center, Prince William Hospital, Providence Skagit Valley Hospital, Rowan Regional Medical Center, Robinson Memorial, Rogue Valley Medical Center, Rapid City Regional Hospital, Stevens Memorial Hospital, St. Francis Hospital, St. Josephs Regional Medical Center, Stormont Vail Regional Health Center, Shasta Regional Medical Center, Rockville General Hospital, Manchester Memorial Hospital, The Queens Medical Center, LSU Health Bogalusa Medical Center, Lafayette General Medical Center, Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans, University Hospital and Clinics, Huey P. Long Medical Center, EA Conway Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center LLC, Acadia General Hospital, Our Lady of the Lake Regional Medical Center, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, LSU Health Sciences Center - Shreveport, Our Lady of Lourdes Regional Medical Center, Inc., Willis Knighton Medical Center, Earl K. Long Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Womans Hospital, W O Moss Regional Medical Center, Leonard J. Chabert Medical Center, Willis Knighton Bossier Health Center, Our Lady of the Lake Ascension, Community Hospital - St. Elizabeth Hospital, Central Maine Medical Center, Garden City Hospital, Saint Marys Regional Medical Center, Saint Marys General Hospital, Saint Michaels Medical Center, Inc., Lima Memorial Health System, Akron General Medical Center, St. Vincent Charity Medical Center, Metrohealth Medical Center, Mercy Medical Center, UH Regional Hospitals, UH Portage Medical Center, St. Lukes Hospital, UH Bedford Medical Center, UH Cleveland Medical Center, UH Elyria Medical Center, Suburban Community Hospital, Lower Bucks Hospital, Roxborough Memorial Hospital, Landmark Medical Center, Providence Hospitals, Pampa Regional Medical Center, Knapp Medical Center, LLC, Dallas Medical Center, Shannon Medical Center, Harlingen Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Yavapai Regional Medical Center - East, St. Rose Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, North Hawaii Community Hospital, Providence Medical Center, Saint John Hospital, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, UH Geauga Medical Center, Stringfellow Memorial Hospital, Riverview Regional Medical Center, Summit Medical Center, Southwest Regional Medical Center, Sparks Regional Medical Center, Charlotte Regional Medical Center, Highlands Regional Medical Center, Brookville Regional Hospital, Peace River Regional Medical Center, Shands Lakeshore, Lehigh Regional Medical Center, Bartow Regional Medical Center, Santa Rosa Medical Center, Heart of Florida Regional Medical Center, Lower Keys Medical Center, Pasco Regional Medical Center, Seven Rivers Regional Medical Center, Physicians Regional Medical Center - Pine Ridge, Wuesthoff Medical Center - Melbourne, St. Cloud Regional Medical Center, East Georgia Regional Medical Center, Metro East Services, Inc., Biloxi Regional Medical Center, Gilmore Memorial Regional Medical Center, Madison River Oaks Hospital, Northwest Mississippi Medical Center, Central Mississippi Medical Center, Riley Hospital, Rankin Medical Center, Natchez Community Hospital, Womens Hospital, River Oaks Hospital, Twin Rivers Regional Medical Center, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Boone Hospital Center, Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center, CMC-Northeast Medical Center, Scotland Memorial Hospital, Harris Regional Hospital, Inc., Cleveland County Healthcare System, Haywood Regional Medical Center, Kings Mountain Hospital, Valdese General Hospital, Inc., Grace Hospital, Inc., Anson Healthcare, Mercy Hospital, Inc., Sandhills Regional Medical Center, Carolinas Medical Center, Stanly Regional Medical Center, Lake Norman Regional Medical Center, Union Memorial Regional Medical Center, Davis Regional Medical Center, CMS-Lincoln, Murphy Medical Center, CMC-University, Alliance Health Durant, Alliance Health Clinton, Blackwell Regional Hospital, Alliance Health Midwest aka Midwest Regional Medical Center, Alliance Health Seminole, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Carlisle Regional Medical Center, Lancaster Regional Medical Center, Community Hospital Lancaster, Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center, Chester Regional Medical Center, Bon Secours St. Francis Xavier, Roper Hospital, Inc., Lafollette Medical Center, Jefferson Memorial Hospital, Jamestown Regional Medical Center, Physicians Regional Medical Center St. Mary's, Harton Regional Medical Center, Tennova Healthcare Newport Medical Center, University Medical Center, Mesquite Community Hospital, Yakima Regional Medical Center, Toppenish Community Hospital, Tacoma General Allenmore Hospital, Williamson Memorial Hospital, Christian Hospital, Progress West Hospital and Novant Health Huntersville Medical Center
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Petitioner: Bethesda Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 2:2022cv00989
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint, #13 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra. (shb)
April 8, 2022 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #13 filed by Plaintiff Novant-Forsyth Memorial Hospital, Abbeville General Hospital, Acadia General Hospital, Akron General Medical Center, Alhambra Hospital, Alliance Health Clinton, Alliance Health Durant, Alliance Health Midwest aka Midwest Regional Medical Center, Alliance Health Seminole, Alton Memorial Hospital, Alvarado Hospital Medical Center, Anaheim Memorial Medical Center, Anmed Health Anderson, Anson Healthcare, Arizona Regional Medical Center, Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Auxilio Mutuo Hospital, Avera McKennan Hospital, Avoyelles Hospital, Baptist St. Anthonys Hospital, Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Bartow Regional Medical Center, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Baylor Scott White Hospital Llano, Baylor University Medical Center at Irving, Baylor University Medical Center at Wazhachie, Bellflower Medical Center, Bethesda Memorial Hospital, Betsy Johnson Healthcare System, Beverly Hospital, Biloxi Regional Medical Center, Blackwell Regional Hospital, Bon Secours St. Francis Xavier, Boone Hospital Center, Bristol Hospital, Brookville Regional Hospital, Brunswick Novant Medical Center, CMC-Northeast Medical Center, CMC-University, CMS-Lincoln, Cape Fear Valley Medical Center, Carlisle Regional Medical Center, Carolina Pines Regional Medical Center, Carolinas Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Central Maine Medical Center, Central Mississippi Medical Center, Central Washington Hospital, Charlotte Hungerford Hospital, Charlotte Regional Medical Center, Chester Regional Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Christian Hospital, Christian Hospital Northeast, Cleveland County Healthcare System, Community Hospital - St. Elizabeth Hospital, Community Hospital Lancaster, Community Hospital of San Buenaventura, Covenant Medical Center, Covenant Medical Center, Cox Medical Center, D C H Regional Medical Center, DCH Northport Medical Center, DCH Regional Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, Dameron Hospital, Danbury Hospital, Davis Regional Medical Center, Deaconess Medical Center, Denver Health Medical Center, Desert Valley Hospital, Doctors Center Bayamon, Doctors Center Hospital Manati, EA Conway Medical Center, Earl K. Long Medical Center, East Georgia Regional Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Fayette Medical Center, Floyd Medical Center, Frederick Ferris Thompson Hospital, Frisbie Memorial Hospital, Garden City Hospital, Garden Grove Hospital and Medical Center, Garfield Medical Center, Gilmore Memorial Regional Medical Center, Glendora Oaks Behavioral Health Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Grace Hospital, Inc., Greater El Monte Community Hospital, Halifax Hospital Medical Center, Hamilton Medical Center, Harlingen Medical Center, Harris Regional Hospital, Inc., Harrison Memorial Hospital, Hartford Hospital, Harton Regional Medical Center, Haywood Regional Medical Center, Heart Hospital of Bakersfield, Heart of Florida Regional Medical Center, Highlands Regional Medical Center, Hollywood Presbyterian Medical Center, Holmes Regional Medical Center, Hospital Buen Samaritano, Hospital Episcopal Cristo Redentor, Hospital San Lucas II, Houston Methodist St. John Hospital, Huey P. Long Medical Center, Huntington Beach Hospital, Indian River, Jamestown Regional Medical Center, Jefferson Memorial Hospital, John D. Archibold Memorial Hospital, John Dempsey Hospital, Kadlec Medical Center, Kentuckiana Medical Center, Kings Mountain Hospital, Knapp Medical Center, LLC, LSU Health Bogalusa Medical Center, LSU Health Sciences Center - Shreveport, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafollette Medical Center, Lake Charles Memorial Hospital, Lake Norman Regional Medical Center, Lancaster Regional Medical Center, Landmark Medical Center, Larkin Community Hospital, Lawrence and Memorial Hospital, Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Lehigh Regional Medical Center, Leonard J. Chabert Medical Center, Lima Memorial Health System, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Loma Linda University Hospital, Longmont United Hospital, Lower Bucks Hospital, Lower Keys Medical Center, Mad River Community Hospital, Madison River Oaks Hospital, Manchester Memorial Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Medcenter One, Inc., Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans, Medical College of Georgia, Medical Park Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Mercy Hospital Fort Smith, Mercy Hospital Oklahoma City, Mercy Hospital Washington, Mercy Hospital, Inc., Mercy Medical Center, Mercy Memorial Health Center, Mesquite Community Hospital, Methodist Hospital Southern California, Methodist Hospital West Houston, Methodist Sugar Land Hospital, Methodist Willowbrook Hospital, Metro East Services, Inc., Metrohealth Medical Center, Middlesex Hospital, Monongahela Valley Hospital, Montclaim Hospital Medical Center, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, Monterey Park Hospital, Mother Frances Hospital, Murphy Medical Center, Naples Community Hospital, Natchez Community Hospital, Natchitoches Regional Medical Center, Nebraska Health Systems, New Britain General Hospital, New York Downtown Hospital, North Hawaii Community Hospital, North Oaks Medical Center LLC, Northwest Mississippi Medical Center, Norwalk Hospital, Novant Health Huntersville Medical Center, Novant-Presbyterian Hospital, Novant-Presbyterian Hospital Matthews, Novant-Thomasville Community, Oakdale Community Hospital, Oaklawn Hospital, Olympic Medical Center, Opelousas General Hospital, Our Lady of Lourdes Regional Medical Center, Inc., Our Lady of the Lake Ascension, Our Lady of the Lake Regional Medical Center, Ozarks Medical Center, Pacifica Hospital of the Valley, Pampa Regional Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Parkland Health Center, Parkview Medical Center, Pasco Regional Medical Center, Peace River Regional Medical Center, Physicians Regional Medical Center - Pine Ridge, Physicians Regional Medical Center St. Mary's, Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center, Prince William Hospital, Progress West Hospital, Providence Hospitals, Providence Medical Center, Providence Skagit Valley Hospital, Rankin Medical Center, Rapid City Regional Hospital, Riley Hospital, River Oaks Hospital, Riverview Regional Medical Center, Robinson Memorial, Rockville General Hospital, Rogue Valley Medical Center, Roper Hospital, Inc., Rowan Regional Medical Center, Roxborough Memorial Hospital, Saint John Hospital, Saint Marys General Hospital, Saint Marys Hospital, Saint Marys Regional Medical Center, Saint Michaels Medical Center, Inc., Salem Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, San Gabriel Valley Medical Center, San Jacinto Methodist Hospital, Sandhills Regional Medical Center, Santa Rosa Medical Center, Scotland Memorial Hospital, Scott and White Memorial Hospital, Seven Rivers Regional Medical Center, Shands Lakeshore, Shannon Medical Center, Shasta Regional Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sioux Valley Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, Southwest Regional Medical Center, Sparks Regional Medical Center, St. Alexius Medical Center, St. Cloud Hospital, St. Cloud Regional Medical Center, St. Francis Hospital, St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Josephs Regional Medical Center, St. Lukes Hospital, St. Lukes Hospital of Kansas City, St. Rose Hospital, St. Vincent Charity Medical Center, St. Vincent Health Center, Stanly Regional Medical Center, Stevens Memorial Hospital, Stormont Vail Regional Health Center, Stringfellow Memorial Hospital, Suburban Community Hospital, Summit Medical Center, Tacoma General Allenmore Hospital, Tennova Healthcare Newport Medical Center, The Methodist Hospital, The Queens Medical Center, The Stamford Hospital, Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Toppenish Community Hospital, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, Tucson Medical Center, Twin Rivers Regional Medical Center, UH Bedford Medical Center, UH Cleveland Medical Center, UH Elyria Medical Center, UH Geauga Medical Center, UH Portage Medical Center, UH Regional Hospitals, Unicoi County Memorial Hospital, Union General Hospital, Union Memorial Regional Medical Center, University Hospital, University Hospital Oshu, University Hospital and Clinics, University Medical Center, University Medical Center Texas, University of Kansas, University of South Alabama Medical, University of Utah Hospital, Valdese General Hospital, Inc., Via Christi Hospital in Pittsburg Mt. Carmel RMC, W O Moss Regional Medical Center, Waterbury Hospital, West Anaheim Medical Center, Wheaton Fransiscan Healthcare, Whittier Hospital Medical Center, Wilkes Regional Medical Center, William W. Backus Hospital, Williamson Memorial Hospital, Willis Knighton Bossier Health Center, Willis Knighton Medical Center, Winter Haven Hospital, Womans Hospital, Womens Hospital, Wuesthoff Medical Center - Melbourne, Wuesthoff Memorial Hospital, Yakima Regional Medical Center, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital, Yavapai Regional Medical Center - East, Yavapai Regional Medical Center - West. (Disbrow, Matthew)
March 31, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Tucson Medical Center. correcting Amended Complaint/Petition, #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L, #2 Exhibit M)(Sedley, Alan)
March 30, 2022 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Xavier Becerra amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiff Tucson Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit List)(Sedley, Alan)
March 16, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at:yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. COUNSEL: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-03410-TJH-JPRx. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00989-TJH (JPRx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (et)
February 22, 2022 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Xavier Becerra. (shb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Tucson Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
February 17, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tucson Medical Center, (Disbrow, Matthew)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Tucson Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tucson Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: CCACDC-32785299 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Anmed Health Anderson, Arizona Regional Medical Center, Abbeville General Hospital, Avera McKennan Hospital, Alhambra Hospital, Alton Memorial Hospital, Anaheim Memorial Medical Center, Tucson Medical Center, Avoyelles Hospital, Auxilio Mutuo Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 1/18/2022 Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 1/28/2022 Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 1/24/2022 Letter) (Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Abbeville General Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Alhambra Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Alton Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Anaheim Memorial Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Anmed Health Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Arizona Regional Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Auxilio Mutuo Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Avera McKennan Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Avoyelles Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Tucson Medical Center(pty:pla))(Disbrow, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucson Medical Center et al v. Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tucson Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbeville General Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avoyelles Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auxilio Mutuo Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anmed Health Anderson
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avera McKennan Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anaheim Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alhambra Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist St. Anthony's Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baylor Scott White Hospital Llano
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellflower Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunswick Novant Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baylor University Medical Center at Irving
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Johnson Healthcare System (Betsy Johnson Regional Hospital)
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baylor University Medical Center at Wazhachie
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Covenant Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Hospital Northeast
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cape Fear Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Washington Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Covenant Medical Center (St. Mary Hospital of the Plains)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Hungerford Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Hospital of San Buenaventura
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danbury Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCH Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctor's Center Bayamon
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frisbie Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctor's Center Hospital Manati
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCH Northport Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameron Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Health Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deaconess Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garfield Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Ferris Thompson Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater El Monte Community Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Samaritan Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamilton Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halifax Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heart Hospital of Bakersfield
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollywood Presbyterian Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holmes Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospital San Lucas II
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indian River
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larkin Community Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dempsey Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospital Episcopal Cristo Redentor
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospital Buen Samaritano
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Methodist St. John Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Archibold Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Charles Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentuckiana Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kadlec Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence & Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leesburg Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loma Linda University Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longmont United Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercy Hospital Fort Smith (St. Edwards)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mad River Community Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Methodist Hospital West Houston
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Methodist Hospital Southern California
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey Park Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Middlesex Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medcenter One, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Park Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercy Hospital Oklahoma City
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercy Memorial Health Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monongahela Valley Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mother Frances Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Methodist Sugar Land Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Methodist Willowbrook Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical College of Georgia
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercy Hospital Washington
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norwalk Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Britain General Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naples Community Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novant-Thomasville Community
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novant-Presbyterian Hospital Matthews
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novant-Forsyth Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novant-Presbyterian Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natchitoches Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska Health Systems
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Downtown Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Opelousas General Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakdale Community Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oaklawn Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozarks Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olympic Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacifica Hospital of the Valley
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parkland Health Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parkview Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Alexius Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Cloud Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Luke's Hospital of Kansas City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Gabriel Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Francis Hospital & Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Mary's Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Jacinto Methodist Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thibodaux Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Stamford Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Methodist Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salem Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Vincent Health Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sioux Valley Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott & White Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union General Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Kansas
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of South Alabama Medical
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Medical Center Texas
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Utah Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Hospital Oshu
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicoi County Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Via Christi Hospital in Pittsburg (Mt. Carmel RMC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wuesthoff Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whittier Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilkes Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterbury Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William W. Backus Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winter Haven Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wheaton Fransiscan Healthcare
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Encino Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D C H Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yavapai Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paradise Valley Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonoma Valley Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayette Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glendora Oaks Behavioral Health Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden Grove Hospital & Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrowhead Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrance Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marin General Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Anaheim Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntington Beach Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Palma Intercommunity Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chino Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Valley Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centinela Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Oaks Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvarado Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montclaim Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist St. Anthonys Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Johnson Healthcare System
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctors Center Bayamon
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctors Center Hospital Manati
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence and Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercy Hospital Fort Smith
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Lukes Hospital of Kansas City
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Marys Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott and White Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Via Christi Hospital in Pittsburg Mt. Carmel RMC
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yavapai Regional Medical Center - West
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden Grove Hospital and Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince William Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Skagit Valley Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowan Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinson Memorial
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogue Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rapid City Regional Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevens Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Francis Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Josephs Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormont Vail Regional Health Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shasta Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockville General Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manchester Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Queens Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LSU Health Bogalusa Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafayette General Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Hospital and Clinics
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huey P. Long Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EA Conway Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Oaks Medical Center LLC
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acadia General Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Our Lady of the Lake Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baton Rouge General Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LSU Health Sciences Center - Shreveport
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Our Lady of Lourdes Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Knighton Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl K. Long Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Francis Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Womans Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W O Moss Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard J. Chabert Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Knighton Bossier Health Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Our Lady of the Lake Ascension
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Hospital - St. Elizabeth Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Maine Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden City Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Marys Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Marys General Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Michaels Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lima Memorial Health System
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akron General Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Vincent Charity Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metrohealth Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercy Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UH Regional Hospitals
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UH Portage Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Lukes Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UH Bedford Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UH Cleveland Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UH Elyria Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suburban Community Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lower Bucks Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxborough Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Hospitals
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pampa Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knapp Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlingen Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspirus Wausau Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yavapai Regional Medical Center - East
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Rose Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodi Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Dimas Community Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Hawaii Community Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Alan J Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint John Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montclair Hospital Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UH Geauga Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stringfellow Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverview Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sparks Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highlands Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookville Regional Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peace River Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shands Lakeshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lehigh Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartow Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Rosa Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heart of Florida Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lower Keys Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasco Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seven Rivers Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Physicians Regional Medical Center - Pine Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wuesthoff Medical Center - Melbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Cloud Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Georgia Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro East Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biloxi Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilmore Memorial Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison River Oaks Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Mississippi Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Mississippi Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rankin Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [