Michael Dobson v. Darren Crawford et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dobson
Defendant: Darren Crawford and Christopher Walker
Case Number: 2:2022cv07372
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration #13 and DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #31 . This action is STAYED and placed on inactive status pending the completion of arbitration proceedings. The parties shall notify the Court within 10 days after the conclusion of arbitration or receipt of an arbitral ruling, whichever is later, and inform the Court whether there is any reason why this case should be reopened. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
January 13, 2023 Filing 48 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Dolly M. Gee RE: Motion for Preliminary Injunction #31 . The Court invites counsel to respond to the tentative ruling. The Court hears from Plaintiff. Defendants submit on the papers. The Court advises counsel that the motion shall be taken under submission and a written order will issue. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (gk)
January 11, 2023 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson, re Response in Support of Motion, #46 served on January 11, 2023. (Jung, Robin)
January 11, 2023 Filing 46 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re partnership dispute #31 Plaintiff Michael Dobson's Response to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections To Michael Dobson's Supplemental Declaration In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson. (Jung, Robin)
January 6, 2023 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker, served on 01/06/2023. (Cohen, Noel)
January 6, 2023 Filing 44 OBJECTIONS TO MICHAEL DOBSONS SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker. (Cohen, Noel)
December 30, 2022 Filing 43 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re partnership dispute #31 filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Dec. of Michael Dobson ISO Reply Re Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Index of Documentary Evidence ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction Reply, #3 Evidentiary Objections to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Response to Defs' Evidentiary Objections)(Jung, Robin)
December 30, 2022 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #40 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #41 (Cohen, Noel)
December 30, 2022 Filing 41 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Christopher Walker answer now due 1/19/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Christopher Walker.(Cohen, Noel)
December 30, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Darren Crawford answer now due 1/19/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Darren Crawford.(Cohen, Noel)
December 27, 2022 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson, upon Defendant Darren Crawford served on 12/16/2022, answer due 1/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Darren Crawford Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jung, Robin)
December 27, 2022 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson, upon Defendant Christopher Walker served on 12/14/2022, answer due 1/4/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christopher Walker Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jung, Robin)
December 23, 2022 Filing 37 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re partnership dispute #31 filed by Defendant Christopher Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Schwade In Support of Defendants' Joint Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Albert S. Watkins In Support of Defendants' Joint Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Darren Crawford In Support of Defendants' Joint Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of Christopher Walker In Support of Defendants' Joint Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Declaration of Michael J. Prost In Support of Defendants' Joint Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Certificate of Service)(Cohen, Noel)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the Court's Initial Standing Order #8 , the hearing date on motion for preliminary injunction must be reserved with the Clerk. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #31 on January 13, 2023 is hereby continued from 9:30 a.m to 3:00 p.m. Further non-compliance with the Court's procedures and Local Rules may result in sanctions. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 16, 2022 Filing 35 EXHIBIT A through J to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re partnership dispute #31 Index of Documentary Evidence In Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson. (Jung, Robin)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Albert S. Watkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Darren Crawford and Christopher Walker, designating Noel S. Cohen as local counsel #14 , #25 , #29 . (gk)
December 16, 2022 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson, re Reference Index (Re: Privacy Act) #32 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re partnership dispute #31 served on December 16, 2022. (Jung, Robin)
December 16, 2022 Filing 32 REFERENCE INDEX Michael Dobson. Index of Documentary Evidence In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction (Jung, Robin)
December 16, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re partnership dispute filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Dobson In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Jason A. Engel In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #3 Proposed Order Re: Motion For Preliminary Injunction) (Jung, Robin)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings #13 presently scheduled for hearing on December 16, 2022, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2022 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Albert S. Watkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/18/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34352870) filed by Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cohen, Noel)
December 2, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #13 filed by Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Watkins ISO Reply to MTC Arbitration, #2 Supplement Declaration of Noel S. Cohen ISO Reply to MTC Arbitrationto MTC in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #3 Declaration of C. Walker ISO Reply to MTC Arbitration, #4 Declaration of D. Crawford ISO Reply to MTC Arbitration, #5 Certificate of Service)(Cohen, Noel)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER IN RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Albert S. Watkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/18/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34352870) #25 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Defendants shall file an amended Application within 14 days of this order. Failure to comply will result in the application being denied and the fees returned by the Clerk. (rolm)
November 30, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Albert S. Watkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/18/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34352870) #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 10/11/22, Dkt. 4. Other error(s) with document(s): GSC for DC missing. Date of DC admission and application do not match. (lt)
November 29, 2022 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Albert S. Watkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/18/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34352870) filed by Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Cohen, Noel)
November 25, 2022 Filing 24 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #13 filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Dobson ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #2 Declaration Declaration of Eric Kennedy ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-J)(Jung, Robin)
November 23, 2022 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Christopher Walker. (shb)
November 23, 2022 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Darren Crawford. (shb)
November 21, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear filed 11/18/2022 #14 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Defendants shall file an amended Application within 14 days of this order. Failure to comply will result in the application being denied and the fees returned by the Clerk. (gk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson. (Jung, Robin)
November 21, 2022 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson. (Jung, Robin)
November 21, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Albert S. Watkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34352870) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed, as to local counsel. (sbou)
November 21, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Allegra Angelina Gorchynski counsel for Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker. Changing Polsinelli LLP to 2049 Century Park East, Suite 2900, Los Angeles, California 90067. Changing email to agorchynski@polsinelli.com. Filed by Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker. (Gorchynski, Allegra)
November 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Allegra Angelina Gorchynski on behalf of Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker (Attorney Allegra Angelina Gorchynski added to party Darren Crawford(pty:dft), Attorney Allegra Angelina Gorchynski added to party Christopher Walker(pty:dft))(Gorchynski, Allegra)
November 18, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Noel Scott Cohen counsel for Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker. Adding Albert S. Watkins as counsel of record for Darren Crawford and Christopher Walker for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Darren Crawford and Christopher Walker. (Cohen, Noel)
November 18, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Albert S. Watkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34352870) filed by Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker. (Cohen, Noel)
November 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #2 Declaration of Noel S. Cohen in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #3 Declaration of Albert S. Watkins in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #4 Proposed Order re Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings) (Cohen, Noel)
November 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker, identifying Michael J. Dobson, The Better Foundation, LLC, UMZU, LLC. (Cohen, Noel)
November 18, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Noel Scott Cohen counsel for Defendants Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker. Adding Noel Scott Cohen as counsel of record for Darren Crawford and Christopher Walker for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Darren Crawford and Christopher Walker. (Attorney Noel Scott Cohen added to party Darren Crawford(pty:dft), Attorney Noel Scott Cohen added to party Christopher Walker(pty:dft))(Cohen, Noel)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Plaintiff has failed to show that concrete, imminent, "extreme or very serious" harm will occur without a TRO, and thus does not meet the high bar to obtain the relief he seeks, including a waiver of notice under Local Rule 7-19. Plaintiff's application #3 is therefore DENIED, without prejudice to refiling as a regularly-noticed motion for a preliminary injunction, if appropriate. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
October 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson, identifying Darren Crawford, Christopher Walker, The Better Foundation, LLC and UMZU, LLC. (Jung, Robin)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
October 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Although this case includes an Ex Parte Application for TRO. This case was not flagged as a TRO in the opening stage. The Clerk has now added the TRO flag. (car)
October 11, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car)
October 11, 2022 Filing 3 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendants Darren Crawford and Christopher Walker filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Eric Kennedy In Support Of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael Dobson In Support Of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Michael Dobson Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Michael Dobson Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Michael Dobson Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Michael Dobson Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Michael Dobson Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Michael Dobson Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Michael Dobson Declaration, #10 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re: Temporary Restraining Order) (Jung, Robin)
October 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson. (Jung, Robin)
October 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34126469 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Michael Dobson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint) (Attorney Robin H Jung added to party Michael Dobson(pty:pla))(Jung, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Dobson v. Darren Crawford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dobson
Represented By: Eric M Kennedy
Represented By: Robin H Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Crawford
Represented By: Noel Scott Cohen
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Represented By: Allegra Angelina Gorchynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Walker
Represented By: Noel Scott Cohen
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Represented By: Allegra Angelina Gorchynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?