Ron A. Rosen Janfaza et al v. City of Glendale et al
Plaintiff: Ron A. Rosen Janfaza
Defendant: Officer Christopher Spencer, City of Glendale, City of Glendale Police Department, Officer Eric Meyer, Eric Meyer, Christopher Spencer and DOES 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv01312
Filed: February 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than March 4, 2024. (smo)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2024 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 5/28/2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. See document for additional pretrial dates and deadlines. (smo)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on April 24, 2023 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
April 11, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carl Bernard Arias counsel for Defendants City of Glendale, City of Glendale Police Department, Eric Meyer, Christopher Spencer. Adding Carl B. Arias as counsel of record for Defendants, City of Glendale, Officers Eric Meyer, Christopher Spencer and Glendale Police Department for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Glendale, et al.. (Attorney Carl Bernard Arias added to party City of Glendale(pty:dft), Attorney Carl Bernard Arias added to party City of Glendale Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Carl Bernard Arias added to party Eric Meyer(pty:dft), Attorney Carl Bernard Arias added to party Christopher Spencer(pty:dft))(Arias, Carl)
April 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Report #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 10, 2023 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of RULE 26 filed by Defendants City of Glendale, City of Glendale Police Department, Eric Meyer, Christopher Spencer. (Arias, Carl)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
February 28, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants City of Glendale, City of Glendale Police Department, Eric Meyer, Christopher Spencer.(Kang, Edward)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
February 24, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
February 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
February 22, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Ron A. Rosen Janfaza in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/4/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
February 22, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Attorney Edward B Kang added to party Officer Christopher Spencer(pty:dft))(Kang, Edward)
February 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants City of Glendale, City of Glendale Police Department, Officer Eric Meyer, Officer Christopher Spencer. (Kang, Edward)
February 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV04414 Receipt No: ACACDC-34834106 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Officer Eric Meyer, City of Glendale Police Department, City of Glendale, Officer Christopher Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons Served on Defendants, #3 Exhibit Notice of Ruling - OSC re Default and TSC, #4 Exhibit Defendants' Response to OSC re Entry of Default, #5 Exhibit Motion to Quash Service of Summons, #6 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion to Quash, #7 Exhibit Notice of Ruling re TSC, #8 Exhibit Summons & Complaint Served on City of Glendale) (Attorney Edward B Kang added to party City of Glendale(pty:dft), Attorney Edward B Kang added to party City of Glendale Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Edward B Kang added to party Officer Eric Meyer(pty:dft), Attorney Edward B Kang added to party Officer Christopher Spencer(pty:bkmov))(Kang, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ron A. Rosen Janfaza et al v. City of Glendale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron A. Rosen Janfaza
Represented By: Jerry Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Christopher Spencer
Represented By: Edward B Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Glendale
Represented By: Edward B Kang
Represented By: Carl Bernard Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Glendale Police Department
Represented By: Edward B Kang
Represented By: Carl Bernard Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eric Meyer
Represented By: Edward B Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Meyer
Represented By: Carl Bernard Arias
Represented By: Edward B Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Spencer
Represented By: Carl Bernard Arias
Represented By: Edward B Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?