Nathan Hill v. Governor Gavin Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Hill
Defendant: Gavin Newsom, State of California, Jeff Macomber, Los Angeles County Court House Corporation, Pasadena Police Department, Glendale Police Department, Inmate Welfare Fund, Bank of America, Brian Moynthan, The County of each Plaintiff (too numerous to list), Every Governor for the last 30 years, Every Secretary of CDCR for the last 30 years and Arresting Agency of each Plaintiff
Case Number: 2:2023cv09670
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR REMAND by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court sent a warning letter to Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) advising that failure to correct this deficiency within THIRTY DAYS from the date of the warning letter would result in dismissal or remand of this case. More than THIRTY DAYS have now passed, and the deficiency has not been corrected. Accordingly, this case is HEREBY ORDERED DISMISSED without prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rolm)
December 12, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Appeal to 9th Circuit and IFP Clarification filed by Plaintiff Nathan Hill.(es)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:23-cv-09670 DSF(DFM). (rn)
November 17, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
November 17, 2023 Filing 12 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
November 15, 2023 Filing 14 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. (lh)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 13, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Pre-Approval of Various Legal Team Positions filed by Nathan Hill. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Laptop & Printer, ADA Accomodation filed by Nathan Hill. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION Establishing Class Certification filed by Nathan Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 7 Letter dated 9/19/2023 from Nathan Hill. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nathan Hill (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]
April 25, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nathan Hill. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]
April 25, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/2/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]
April 25, 2023 Filing 3 Attachments re #2 Affidavit, #1 Complaint, by Nathan Hill. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2023) Modified on 4/27/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]
April 25, 2023 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, by Nathan Hill. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2023) Modified on 4/25/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]
April 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank Of America, Glendale Police Department, Inmate Welfare Fund, Los Angeles County Court House Corporation, Jeff Macomber, Brian Moynthan, Gavin Newsom, Pasadena Police Department, State of California. Filed by Nathan Hill. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Envelope) (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/17/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nathan Hill v. Governor Gavin Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Court House Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasadena Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate Welfare Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Moynthan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of each Plaintiff (too numerous to list)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Every Governor for the last 30 years
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Every Secretary of CDCR for the last 30 years
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arresting Agency of each Plaintiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?