D. Diaz v. Michel Rey Moore et al
Plaintiff: D. DIAZ
Defendant: MICHEL REY MOORE, RICHARD ALARCON, RICHARD ALATORRE, LAURA CHICK, RUTH GALANTER, MIKE HERNANDEZ, MARK RIDLEY-THOMAS, JOEL WACHS, MICHAEL WOO, ZEV YAROLSLAVSKY, GERALD CHALEFF, ROCHELLE DE LA ROCHA, DEAN HANSELL, DEIRDRE HUGHES HILL, THEODORE WARREN JACKSON, ENRIQUE HERNANDEZ, BARBARA LINDEMANN, REVA TOOLEY, MICHAEL YAMAKI, STEPHEN YSLAS, WILLIAM EAGLESON, JUAN PARGA, JOSE RAMIREZ, ARMANDO RODRIGUEZ, Mark Ridley Thomas, Unknown Named Defendants Nos. 1 to 10 Who Are Either Policymakers or City Council Members or Los Angeles Board of Police Commission Members, LAPD Officers and Former Officers and Unknown Named Defendants Nos 101 to 200 Who Are Members or Employees or Officers of The Los Angeles Police Department Both Past and Present
Case Number: 2:2023cv10018
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 47 RESPONSE TO DOC. 46, re: Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 46 (Yagman, Stephen)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Court is in receipt of the Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiff at ECF No. 43, as well as Plaintiff's Request for Clarification filed at ECF No. 45. The Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference requires the parties to complete the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet jointly. The parties must make every effort to agree on all pretrial and trial dates. If the parties do not file a jointly-completed Worksheet by February 1, 2024, the Court will choose dates on the parties' behalf, taking into consideration scheduling conflicts identified by the parties in their Joint Rule 26(f) Report. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 25, 2024 Filing 45 REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION WHEN PARTIES DO NOT AGREE UPON DATES FOR SCHEDULING WORKSHEET, filed by Plaintiff D. Diaz , re: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #43 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 44 (Yagman, Stephen)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DEFICIENCY NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiff at ECF No. 43 does not comply with the Courts Order Setting Scheduling Conference as it fails to include the required jointly-completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet. The parties must complete the Worksheet jointly and file it by February 1, 2024. See Judge Garnetts Procedures and Schedules for Worksheet template. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 24, 2024 Filing 43 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan , no agreement on dates, so that separate schedules are included ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Plaintiff D. Diaz.. (Yagman, Stephen)
January 24, 2024 Filing 42 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Kevin Gilbert in place of attorney Hydee Feldstein Soto, Denise Mills, Scott Marcus, Cory Brente, and Surekha Shepherd filed by Defendant Juan Parga. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kevin E Gilbert added to party Juan Parga(pty:dft)) (Gilbert, Kevin)
January 24, 2024 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant William Eagleson, (Gilbert, Kevin)
January 24, 2024 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant William Eagleson.(Attorney Kevin E Gilbert added to party William Eagleson(pty:dft))(Gilbert, Kevin)
January 8, 2024 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Juan Parga, (Shepherd, Surekha)
January 8, 2024 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT Juan Parga.(Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Juan Parga(pty:dft))(Shepherd, Surekha)
January 8, 2024 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Deirdre Hughes Hill, (Shepherd, Surekha)
January 8, 2024 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT Deirdre Hughes Hill.(Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Deirdre Hughes Hill(pty:dft))(Shepherd, Surekha)
January 8, 2024 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANTS Laura Chick, Joel Wachs, (Shepherd, Surekha)
January 8, 2024 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANTS Laura Chick, Joel Wachs.(Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Laura Chick(pty:dft), Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Joel Wachs(pty:dft))(Shepherd, Surekha)
January 5, 2024 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Michel Rey Moore, (Shepherd, Surekha)
January 5, 2024 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT Michel Rey Moore.(Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Michel Rey Moore(pty:dft))(Shepherd, Surekha)
January 5, 2024 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Dean Hansell, (Shepherd, Surekha)
January 5, 2024 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT Dean Hansell.(Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Dean Hansell(pty:dft))(Shepherd, Surekha)
January 4, 2024 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Barbara Lindemann, (Shepherd, Surekha)
January 4, 2024 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT Barbara Lindemann.(Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Barbara Lindemann(pty:dft))(Shepherd, Surekha)
January 3, 2024 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Ruth Galanter, (Shepherd, Surekha)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/24/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
January 3, 2024 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT Ruth Galanter.(Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Ruth Galanter(pty:dft))(Shepherd, Surekha)
January 3, 2024 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Gerald Chaleff, (Shepherd, Surekha)
January 3, 2024 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT Gerald Chaleff.(Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Gerald Chaleff(pty:dft))(Shepherd, Surekha)
January 2, 2024 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Zev Yarolslavsky, (Shepherd, Surekha)
January 2, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT Zev Yarolslavsky.(Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Zev Yarolslavsky(pty:dft))(Shepherd, Surekha)
December 8, 2023 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to All Defendants. (iv)
December 8, 2023 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF D. Diaz. (Yagman, Stephen)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE TRANSFER to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:03-cv-08378 DDP(JTL) (rn)
December 6, 2023 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF D. Diaz. (Yagman, Stephen)
December 6, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #15 . The following error(s) was found: Summons must be made clear and provide 2 attachments. Attachment 1 should list the caption correctly. Attachment 2 should clearly state defendants to be served. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
December 5, 2023 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF D. Diaz. (Reichmann, Joseph)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #13 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendant's name must appear in the "To:"section of the summons. The "To" section states see attached however only one attachment has been added. There should be two attachments as caption also states see attachment. Summons must be made clear. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF D. Diaz. (Reichmann, Joseph)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (iv)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #10 filed by PLAINTIFF D. Diaz. (Yagman, Stephen)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by PLAINTIFF D. DIAZ. Related Case(s): Diaz v. Alameida, 2:03-08378-DDP and Diaz v. Schwarzenegger, 2:06931-DDP (Reichmann, Joseph)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF D. DIAZ. (Reichmann, Joseph)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff D. DIAZ. (Reichmann, Joseph)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Notice INTERESTED PARTIES filed by PLAINTIFF D. DIAZ. (Reichmann, Joseph)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by PLAINTIFF D. DIAZ. Related Case(s): Diaz v. Alameida, 2:03-08378-DDP and Diaz v. Schwarzenegger, 2:06931-DDP (Reichmann, Joseph)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36478194 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF D. DIAZ. (Attorney Stephen Yagman added to party D. DIAZ(pty:pla))(Reichmann, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D. Diaz v. Michel Rey Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. DIAZ
Represented By: Stephen Yagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHEL REY MOORE
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ALARCON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ALATORRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA CHICK
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUTH GALANTER
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK RIDLEY-THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL WACHS
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL WOO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZEV YAROLSLAVSKY
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD CHALEFF
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCHELLE DE LA ROCHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEAN HANSELL
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEIRDRE HUGHES HILL
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEODORE WARREN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENRIQUE HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA LINDEMANN
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVA TOOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL YAMAKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN YSLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM EAGLESON
Represented By: Carolyn M Aguilar
Represented By: Kevin E Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN PARGA
Represented By: Kevin E Gilbert
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE RAMIREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMANDO RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ridley Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named Defendants Nos. 1 to 10 Who Are Either Policymakers or City Council Members or Los Angeles Board of Police Commission Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPD Officers and Former Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named Defendants Nos 101 to 200 Who Are Members or Employees or Officers of The Los Angeles Police Department Both Past and Present
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?