Fred Dorton v. Daisy Lee Sterkel et al
Plaintiff: Fred Dorton
Defendant: Daisy Lee Sterkel, J. Fernandez, D. Moranville, S. Gee, J. St. John, M. Reynoso, D. Samuel and Kathleen Allison
Case Number: 2:2024cv03603
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, Granting Plaintiff's Extension Request (Dkt. 7).The Request (Dkt. 7) is GRANTED to the extent it seeks additional time to comply with the Order. Plaintiff shall have until July 23, 2024, to comply with the Order. All other provisions of the Order remain in effect. #7 (mba)
June 13, 2024 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File First Amended Verified Complaint filed by plaintiff Fred Dorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (rolm)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES #2 by Judge John F. Walter. The Request is POSTPONED for 30 days so that Plaintiff has the opportunity to provide the missing information. (iv)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #1 by Judge John F. Walter. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Request. (iv)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. As described above, Plaintiff's claims appear subject to dismissal. Accordingly, the Court provides Plaintiff with several options regarding how to proceed. Within thirty (30) days of this Order, Plaintiff must choose one of the following options and file the document required by that option. (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Blank Notice of Dismissal) (mba)
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Fred Dorton. (ghap)
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Kathleen Allison(Secretary of Prisons), Kathleen Allison(individual), J. Fernandez, S. Gee, D. Moranville, M. Reynoso, D. Samuel(individual), D. Samuel(Warden, official capacity), J. St. John, Daisy Lee Sterkel pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early., filed by plaintiff Fred Dorton. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fred Dorton v. Daisy Lee Sterkel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Dorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Lee Sterkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Moranville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Reynoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?