Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Barbara L. Bruce et al
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: C.B., a minor, through his general guardian, Teresa W. Bruce, B.B., a minor, through her general guardian, Teresa W. Bruce, Barbara L. Bruce, B. B. and C. B.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02096
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad)
December 26, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Barbara L. Bruce.(Parascandola, Anthony)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. upon C. B. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Joseph Fogel, attorney. (Johna, Ophir)
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. upon B. B. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Joseph Fogel, attorney. (Johna, Ophir)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Micheal J. Hoover APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Barbara L. Bruce, Defendant, designating Anthony J. Parascandola as local counsel; Granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Micheal J. Hoover APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Barbara L. Bruce, Defendant, designating Anthony J. Parascandola as local counsel. (twdb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Hoover to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Barbara L. Bruce (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 11/19/2019, Receipt No. 26LKH27H) filed by Defendant Barbara L. Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Parascandola, Anthony)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Hoover to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Barbara L. Bruce (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24809164) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (lt)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Hoover to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Barbara L. Bruce (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24809164) filed by Defendant Barbara L. Bruce. (Attorney Anthony J Parascandola added to party Barbara L. Bruce(pty:dft)) (Parascandola, Anthony)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael Hoover. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (twdb)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. upon Barbara L. Bruce waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Barbara Bruce. (Johna, Ophir)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $505,987.10 into the registry of the Court from Primerica Life Insurance Company. Re: Order on Motion to Deposit Funds #10 . Receipt number LA198243. (dd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST to Deposit Funds filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Johna, Ophir)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #9 APPLICATION for Leave to Deposit Funds into Court Registry by Plaintiff In Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johna, Ophir)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants B. B., C. B., Barbara L. Bruce. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Johna, Ophir)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company, identifying Primerica Life Insurance Company (plaintiff-in-interpleader); Barbara L. Bruce (defendant-in-interpleader); C.B. (minor defendant-in-interpleader); B.B. (minor defendant-in-interpleader); Teresa W. Bruce (general guardian of minor defendants C.B. and B.B). (Johna, Ophir)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company identifying Primerica, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Johna, Ophir)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Johna, Ophir)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24714282 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Ophir Johna added to party Primerica Life Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Johna, Ophir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Barbara L. Bruce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ophir Johna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.B., a minor, through his general guardian, Teresa W. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.B., a minor, through her general guardian, Teresa W. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara L. Bruce
Represented By: Michael J Hoover
Represented By: Anthony J Parascandola
Represented By: Leslie Natalie Morales
Represented By: Michael Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?