Aaron Alan Falls v. Alyssa Vernal
Plaintiff: Aaron Alan Falls
Defendant: Perez, Alyssa Vernal, Maria C. Cudal, Conn and Barrows
Case Number: 5:2019cv02311
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Aaron Alan Falls. (hr)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 is hereby DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for the following reasons: (1) Missing Certificate of Authorized Officer. (2) Plaintiff may send a new, complete application with completed Certificate of Authorized Officer. The Clerk is directed to provide Plaintiff with a blank CV-60P. (jp)
December 12, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #2 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(kh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Aaron Alan Falls, served on 11/26/2019. (jtil)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Aaron Alan Falls. (jtil)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Aaron Alan Falls against Defendants Barrows, Conn, Maria C. Cudal, Perez, Alyssa Vernal pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron Alan Falls v. Alyssa Vernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa Vernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria C. Cudal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Alan Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?