Simon Velasquez Francisco v. Walgreen Co. et al
Plaintiff: Simon Velasquez Francisco
Defendant: Walgreen Co. and DOES 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv01938
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Defendant Walgreen Co... (Helmer, Leslie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. attaching conformed copy of Answer to Complaint as Exhibit 7 as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Helmer, Leslie)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Simon Velasquez Francisco, (Stratos, Jesse)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Simon Velasquez Francisco.. (Stratos, Jesse)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jesse Steven Stratos counsel for Plaintiff Simon Velasquez Francisco. Adding Jesse S. Stratos as counsel of record for SIMON VELASQUEZ FRANCISCO for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff SIMON VELASQUEZ FRANCISCO. (Attorney Jesse Steven Stratos added to party Simon Velasquez Francisco(pty:pla))(Stratos, Jesse)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Paul Brandes counsel for Plaintiff Simon Velasquez Francisco. Adding Christopher P. Brandes as counsel of record for SIMON VELASQUEZ FRANCISCO for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff SIMON VELASQUEZ FRANCISCO. (Attorney Christopher Paul Brandes added to party Simon Velasquez Francisco(pty:pla))(Brandes, Christopher)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Walgreen Co., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form, #6 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 served on September 21, 2020. (Helmer, Leslie)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Josephine L. Staton. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-01938 JLS (SPx). (esa)
September 17, 2020 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Walgreen Co. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 7)(esa)
September 17, 2020 COPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff Simon Velasquez Francisco, upon Defendant Walgreen Co. served on 8/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 5) (esa)
September 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Walgreen Co. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Simon Velasquez Francisco. (filed in state court 7/14/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Walgreen Co. identifying Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Helmer, Leslie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Walgreen Co.. Related Case(s): None (Helmer, Leslie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walgreen Co., identifying Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Helmer, Leslie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Helmer, Leslie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS2014638 Receipt No: ACACDC-28133812 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 - Answer to Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Joseph B. Amsbary, Jr., #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Alicia Musgrove, #10 Exhibit 10) (Attorney Leslie Hecht Helmer added to party Walgreen Co.(pty:dft))(Helmer, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon Velasquez Francisco v. Walgreen Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Leslie Hecht Helmer
Represented By: Kristin N Kovacich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Velasquez Francisco
Represented By: Christopher Paul Brandes
Represented By: Timothy J Gonzales
Represented By: Jesse Steven Stratos
Represented By: Donald James Aaron Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?