Benny Carranza v. Ralph Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Benny Carranza
Defendant: Anthony Carter, Kenneth J. Pogue, Ralph Diaz, Chelsea Armenta, Warden Jeffrey Macomber, P. Birdsong and Steven Escobar
Case Number: 5:2021cv00056
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 Blank Notice of Election, #2 Blank Civil Rights Complaint) (nbo)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/11/2021 TRANSFERRING this matter to the USDC for the Central District of California. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/13/2021.]
January 12, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Benny Carranza. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/13/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Tupolo, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/13/2021.]
December 3, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Benny Carranza. (Tupolo, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/13/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Benny Carranza. (Tupolo, A) Modified on 12/4/2020 (Plummer, M). [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/13/2021.] Modified on 1/13/2021 (et).
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Benny Carranza.(Tupolo, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/13/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benny Carranza v. Ralph Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth J. Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jeffrey Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?