Dwight Jobe, Jr. v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Dwight Jobe, Jr.
Defendant: Harris, Grajeda, Jones, Garcia and Hanson
Case Number: 5:2022cv02276
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Garcia, Grajeda, Hanson, Harris, Jones, identifying County of Riverside. (Roggeveen, Nicole)
February 27, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Garcia, Grajeda, Hanson, Harris, Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and COL, #3 Proposed Order) (Roggeveen, Nicole)
February 21, 2023 Filing 20 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Harris served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023, served by personal service, by Federal statute, upon Shainin, Board Assistant. Remarks: REC'D USMS LOS ANGELES JAN 11'23 am 7:47. (es)
February 21, 2023 Filing 19 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Hanson served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023, served by personal service, by Federal statute, upon Shainin, Board Assistant. Remarks: REC'D USMS C/CA - CIVIL JAN 11'23 am 7:47. (es)
February 21, 2023 Filing 18 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Grajeda served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023, served by personal service, by Federal statute, upon Shainin, Board Assistant. Remarks: REC'D USMS LOS ANGELES JAN 11'23 am 7:47. (es)
February 21, 2023 Filing 17 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Garcia served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023, served by personal service, by Federal statute, upon Shainin, Board Assistant. Remarks: REC'D USMS C/CA - CIVIL JAN 11'23 am 7:47. (es)
February 21, 2023 Filing 16 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Jones served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023, served by personal service, by Federal statute, upon Shainin, Board Assistant. Remarks: REC'D USMS LOS ANGELES JAN 11'23 am 7:47. (es)
February 6, 2023 Filing 15 Letter Re Grievance filed by Dwight Jobe, Jr (es)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A PRE-ANSWER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING AFTER RULING ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: Granting #12 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Sergeant Harris, Sergeant Grajeda, Corporal Jones, Corporal Garcia, and Deputy Sheriff Hanson ("Defendants") are granted leave to file a pre-Answer Motion for Summary Judgment based on Plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies, which shall be filed within forty-five (45) days after the Court issues its ruling on Defendants' ex parte Application. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Defendants' response to Plaintiff's operative Complaint shall not be due until thirty (30) days after the Court issues its ruling on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, if such response is still required. (es)
January 31, 2023 Filing 12 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Pre-Answer Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Garcia, Grajeda, Hanson, Harris, Jones. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Attorney Nicole Rene Roggeveen added to party Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Rene Roggeveen added to party Grajeda(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Rene Roggeveen added to party Hanson(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Rene Roggeveen added to party Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Rene Roggeveen added to party Jones(pty:dft)) (Roggeveen, Nicole)
January 30, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of address Changing plaintiffs address to John Benoit Detention Center P O Box 1748 Indio CA 92201. Filed by Plaintiff Dwight Jobe, Jr. (es)
January 11, 2023 Filing 11 Text Only Entry Order #6 mailed to The Legal Department at Larry D. Smith Correctional Facility at 1627 S. Hargrave St., Banning, California 92220. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ev) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 10, 2023 Filing 10 Text Only Entry re Order #6 mailed to The Legal Department at Larry D. Smith Correctional Facility at 1627 S. Hargrave St., Banning, California 92220 #6 .THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ev) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 10, 2023 Filing 9 Text Only Entry Emailed the following documents to USM: (1) Complaint (2) Order re Service of Process (3) Order Directing Service of Process by the United States Marshal; (4) Summons' (5) Five USM-285 forms (not on docket). Text Only Entry THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ev) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 10, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 as to Defendant Garcia, Grajeda, Hanson, Harris, Jones. (es)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, [See Order for details.] (es)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 [See document for details.] (es)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Plaintiff is advised that the Court has screened the Complaint in this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The Court has determined the Complaint is fit for service. Instructions for service will be provided in a separate order. [See Order for further details.] (es)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES (PRISONER NON-HABEAS CASE) #2 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. In the interim, the Court GRANTS the IFP application and will order the Defendants, via Minute Order, to provide a copy of his trust account in order to ascertain an appropriate payment schedule. (rolm)
January 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (car)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Dwight Jobe, Jr. (car)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, filed by Plaintiff Dwight Jobe, Jr. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwight Jobe, Jr. v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Jobe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Represented By: Nicole Rene Roggeveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grajeda
Represented By: Nicole Rene Roggeveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Represented By: Nicole Rene Roggeveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Represented By: Nicole Rene Roggeveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson
Represented By: Nicole Rene Roggeveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?