Zions Bancorporation, N.A. et al v. Robert Perry et al
Plaintiff: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. doing business as Californai Bank & Trust, Successor By Name Change to Z.B., National Association
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Miguel Guerrero, Internal Revenue Service, American Express Bank, FSB, Hawarden Summit, Inc., RIV IV Central Ave., LLC, National Lending Services LLC, DOES 1 through 100 inclusive and United States of America
Counter Claimant: Robert Perry and Monica Perry
Counter Defendant: Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2023cv01926
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Filing 26 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Riverside Superior Court, Riverside Historic Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Riverside Superior Court, Riverside Historic Courthouse. (gk)
November 8, 2023 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Hawarden Summit, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Zions Bancorporation, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Melissa Robbins Coutts in Support of Application for Entry of Default Against Defendant Hawarden Summit, Inc., #2 Proof of Service) (Coutts, Melissa)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REMANDING CASE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Having received the parties' Joint Stipulation to remand the case to state court #23 , the Court remands the case to the Superior Court of California, Riverside County, Case Number CVRI2303974. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk)
November 3, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Zions Bancorporation, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Approving Stipulation and Remanding Case, #2 Proof of Service)(Coutts, Melissa)
November 1, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) (RE: related doc(s) #1 ) filed by Defendant United States of America.(Gill, Angela)
October 30, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint, #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 11/17/2023, are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order based on an evaluation of the complexity of the case. Jury Trial set for 6/17/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 5/31/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 11/17/2023. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 2/23/2024. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 2/23/2024. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 3/8/2024. Settlement Conference Deadline 3/22/2024. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 4/5/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report due by 3/29/2024. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 5/3/2024. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 5/17/2024. See document for further details. (gk)
October 27, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTES OF Mandatory Scheduling Conference held before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court hears from the parties about the contents of their Joint Rule 26(f) report and their anticipated stipulation concerning the priority of liens. The parties shall file the stipulation no later than 11/3/2023. The Court anticipates remanding this case to state court upon receiving the stipulation dismissing the government because the removal is based on the government's participation as a defendant. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (gk)
October 25, 2023 (DUPLICATE ENTRY) COUNTERCLAIM against Counterdefendant Zions Bancorporation, N.A. dba California Bank and Trust, successor by name change to Z.B., National Association; with Jury Demand filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Robert Perry and Monica Perry. (Answer and Counterclaim filed as one document, seedocument number 16). (gk)
October 25, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND. Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim filed by Defendants Monica Perry, Robert Perry.(Attorney Gary S. Saunders, Sr added to party Monica Perry(pty:dft), Attorney Gary S. Saunders, Sr added to party Robert Perry(pty:dft))(Saunders, Gary)
October 18, 2023 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zions Bancorporation, N.A., upon Defendant Hawarden Summit, Inc. served on 10/3/2023, answer due 10/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jim McCarthy, agent for service for Defendant Hawarden Summit - Substitute Service by serving Kina Mundy, CFO of WSR Real Estate Sales & Management, realty company for Defendant Hawarden Summit. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service for Additional Court Documentation)(Coutts, Melissa)
October 17, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States of America answer now due 11/20/2023, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant United States of America.(Gill, Angela)
October 17, 2023 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1-2 days, filed by Defendant United States of America.. (Gill, Angela)
October 5, 2023 Filing 12 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Wells Fargo Bank, National Association; Miguel Guerrero; American Express Bank, FSB, a Federal Savings Bank; RIF IV Central Ave, LLC; and National Lending Services LLC. (gk)
October 3, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant American Express Bank, FSB, Miguel Guerrero, National Lending Services LLC, RIV IV Central Ave., LLC, Wells Fargo Bank filed by Plaintiff Zions Bancorporation, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Melissa Robbins Coutts in Support of Application for Entry of Default, #2 Affidavit Proof of Service) (Coutts, Melissa)
October 3, 2023 Filing 10 Notice OF FILING OFFICIAL RECORD OF A STATE COURT PROCEEDING filed by Defendant United States of America. (Gill, Angela)
September 21, 2023 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States of America, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form, #3 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form,, #4 served on September 21, 2023. (Gill, Angela)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on October 27, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by October 17, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-01926 SB (SPx). (jtil)
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Sheri Pym. New Case Number 5:23-cv-1926 SB (SPx). (jtil)
September 19, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Zions Bancorporation, N.A. in Riverside Superior Court on 8/1/2023, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Gill, Angela)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2303974 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2)) (Attorney Angela Gill added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:dft))(Gill, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. et al v. Robert Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. doing business as Californai Bank & Trust, Successor By Name Change to Z.B., National Association
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Robert Perry
Represented By: Gary S. Saunders, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Monica Perry
Represented By: Gary S. Saunders, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Angela Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawarden Summit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIV IV Central Ave., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Lending Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Angela Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?