In re: Toyota Motor Corp. Unintended Acceleration Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Vilsaint Georges, Willette Riley, Narcisso Pimentel, Brian Caya, Sharrolyn Jimerson, Dennis Snider, Sean Beard, Robert Booher, Demetra Christopher, Johnny St. Jean, Mostfa Fahmy, Stefanie Bradley, Myrna Miller, Daniel Hamilton, Cindy Groves, Sandra Valdez, Alexandre Louis, Faruk Xhakli, Rose M Augustine, Rhea Rodgers, Jim O'Rourke, Dana Clark Weller, Beverly Yip, Anita Jorge, Charles E. Pittman, Timothy Helmick, Donald Graham, Julie Beard, Gregory Slocum, Kristopher Gaspar, Victor Levey, G&M Motors, Inc., Melba M. Mitchell, Melati Indrayani, Frederick Greisiger, Jose E. Novoa, Pazir Mohammad and Nahyatt Mohammad, Laurie Chambers, Mary Pat Hauck, Paul Rosenfeld, Ron Ellis, Carole R. Young, Joseph R Graybeal, Yilong Liu, MICHAEL DUBE, Jenny Devereaux, Alexsandra Del Real, Roslyn Patterson Nelson, NANCY BOEHM, Dot-Marie Gallardo-Browning, Anthony Crespo, Maria Helmick, Ryan Scharrel, Randee Romaner, Saundra Hill Scott, Douglas Guilbert, Tetti Suriati, Jeremy Beale, Carolyn Ford, Patricia Scott, Dennis J. Waugh, David Rosenberg, Robert Ruf, Susan Rifken Ltd, Maxine Rosenfeld, Joseph Chant, Robert W. Keller, Amelia A. Welch, Gayle R Barrett, Alex Farrugia, Adeniyi Toriola, Rosalyn Hessler, Elwanda Fontenot, Luis Fernandez, Charlene Tran, Jude Anheluk, Margaret Gonzales, Timothy P. Farrelly, Robert Elmes, Daniel D Lee, Walter Scott Tarter, Kim Brimage, Joseph Buccier, Connie Kamphaus, Veronica Troup, Robert Navarro, Joyce Ann Atnip, Elizabeth Van Zyl, John Flook, Robert Kogen, Thomas Mayton, MITCHELL P. GEDID, Steven Boughner, Beverly Ann Martell, Gladys Appolon, Nellie Yazitchyan, Javene Lobaugh, Aaron Austin, Lorrie Krieger, Donna Hanna, Chairul Lubis, Michelle Stowe Caya, Marie Joelle Placide, William Huston, Kai Shemsu, Walt Crigler, Lucy Barker, Mohammad Kazim Jalalyar, Jean Achille, Suzanne Riegel Breit, S. Firgon, Christopher J. Andersen, Etienne Eva, Charles Turner, Jacquelyn Donoghue, Frank Visconi, Hatice Hulya Yigit, Sandy Carmichael, Alyson L. Oliver, Un Jin Choi, Janet K. Black, Dawn De Vincenzi, Brenda Shonfield, Tully Seymour, Janice Feaster, Yva Audelin, John Jeremy Robson, Stuart Plush, Martha Siregar, John Moscicki, Ronald A. Longo, Camille McCormick, Xiaobin Wang, Suzette L. Farrelly, Hal Farrington, Harry Williams, Edward Siff, Joshua Iyesi, Tiffany Jones, Luis Lopez Sierra, Linda Tang, James E. Humphrey, Michael Kenneth Hollis, Michael Roberge, Richard Weinberger, Austin Branch, Catherine Roe, Lurline Slocum, Christopher W. Andersen, Veronica Anderson, Ada Morales, Lakenya Riley, Penny Thompson, Gabriel Zieme-Diedrich, Yonet Gardiner, David Hulsen, Fitzroy James, George C Weyer, Debra Poynter, Jo Anna Viviano, Joseph Christian, Terasita Ramos, Joel Barker, Robert Smyser, Sunil P. George, Ira Savoy, Judy Veitz, Jennifer Wendy Burke, Kathleen Allen, Priscilla Manarino-Leggett, Kevin Funez, Selena Michelle Hines-Muhammad, Omar Alexander Montes, Saintil Petit Frere, Halen Kerendian, Mikhail Beyn, Ludger Charles, Robin Friedman, Fran Preedom, Lynda F. Gill, Ebony Brown, Christine Carr, Sisiliana Ridwan, Sheydalis Casul-De Jesus, Tom Kunce, Aza Srourian, Gary Brown, Howard Sportsman, Merredieu Pollas, Gary LeMay, Clayton Q Aukland, Larry Boudoin, Diane Andersen, Rosetta Rehder, Similarly Situated John and Jane Does, Patricia Carol Gardner, Viviane Stoller, William Kleinfeldt, Ernest Cornell, Mark Adkinson, Gary Gustin, Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Erica Thomas, Edward Skillman, Marie Isaac, Reinaldo Felipe Hernandez, Dumery Thervil, Catherine Donohue, Cheryl Abken, Lydia Olavarria-Vargas, Dylan Cruikshank, Benjamin L Carriere, Kevin P Fogarty, Michael McDaniel, Melanie Bonacci, Brunel Hilaire, Catherine Nguyen, Guicai Liu, Karen Bickel, Marie Michelle Glemaud, MORTON REICHEK, Jean C. Louis, Steven Prade, Lacey Laudicina, Willy Jacques, Millie Charlottie Hartgrove, Jessie Guillory, REGINA H. DARCY, Samuel Calixte, Ruth Shechter, Sandra P Hollis, John Laidlaw, Charley Alton Jones, Seong Bae Choi, MIN CHUN, Brenda E. Burack, Ed Izenstark, Edward Kline, John Covert, Bridie Doino, Teresa B. Myers, Krystal Eggerding, Shirley Ward, Allan L Weller, Susan Chambers, Robert L. Samuels, Dunois obain, T Leigh Beard, Meetesh Shah, Sosima Pimentel, Lucero Davidson, Jonathan Santana, Jimmy Laine Belotte, Roy Williams, Helen Mubarak-Assad, K. R., Sylvia Godfrey, Harold D. Messinger, Sandra Reech, Jason Kaufmann, Sonya Gray, Richard Benjamin, Darrell P. Quintana, Beatrice Jackson, Lorma Victor, Isabella Jones, Ernestine Montgomery, ELIZABETH GROSMAN, Matthew Reese, Edith Schantz, Patricia Milton Steinfort, Brenda Bishop, Sam Goldberger, Dana Clark, Jan Bowling, John Sukola, Ziva Goldstein, Frank Whiddon, JON J. DARCY, Lori A Miles, SOON O. JEONG, Romanus Akamike, Tanya Ross, Sang Seok Na, Jerry Baker Auto Sales, LLC, ALFREDO DA SILVA, Bureau Chief Laura Green, Diane Devlin, Ted M. Wedul, Wilma Lentz, Susan Ong, Mary Jo Crank, Alma Coe Bingman, Grace Jackson, Frances Hines, Judith M Enderle, Dora Argueta, Joseph R Hernandez, Stephanie Cedillo, Barry C. Broden, Suzanne L. Keller, Chris Chan Park, Daniel Weimer, Jr., Steven Slocum, Amanda Laird, Linda Summerville, Lori Cangelosi, Albert A. Pena, III, Cornelia Neely, Green Spot Motors Co, Frank Palomares, Tina Preedom, William Curtis Grasty, Jr, Belva Simmons, Fay W. Humphrey, Cameron Van Alfen, Dawei Li, Robyn Horn, Mitchell Friedman, Malina Salvador, Catherine Lebson, Joel Grunkemeyer, Jeanne Epstein, Debra Young, Jerome Cangelosi, Dale Baldisseri, James P Griffin, Deanna Riley, Natalia Komarova, Daniel Murtha, Linda Alford Wooten, Casey Van Alfen, Fernando Lopez-Llanos, Sean Maxwell, Kirk Crank, Charmayne Bennett, DEISY F TOLEDO, Steven McDaniel, Jr, Fred Miller, Rocco Doino, Gayle Gagliano, Dru Colin Lee, Elen Edilyan, Lena Gally, Janette Seymour, Charles Saba, Sylvia Pena, Hu Jin, Carol Hatzman, Michael Jermakian, Amy S Reichek, Karen Pedigo, Mary Ann Parker, Marie Thi Mentor, Barbara Iglesias, Quaid McIver, Galatia D Johnson, Marvin Jackson, Wanda Bosse, Darshak Shah, Michael Miranda, Geraldine Haddad, Bianca Prade, David Works, Jacqueline West, Kelly Covert, Christine Schara, Barbara Saunders, Kelley W. Dion, Behrouz Benyaminpour, Perry Lewis Weed, Jeremy Henson, Elise Kuhner, Gloria Haynes, Latasha Burge, Steve Clemons, Leopoldo Portillo, Jimmy Brown, Margaret Sportsman, Gerald Dale Mason, Bryon Hawes, Grace Shigematsu, Marta Velasco, Kimberly R. Robinson, Roney Moses, Lucille Fox, James Schreckengost, Sr., Janice Markowitz, Thelma Reid, Miguel E. Cordero, Lisa Creighton, William C. Myers, Louis Pera, Jr., Allie R Rockforte, Maureen Colaberdino, Lu Li, Jennifer Lee Glardon, Adilia Aviles, Robert O Leary, Michelle Lynch, Boniface Sylvestre, Marie Mathurin, Laurence K. Johnston, Lloyd Howard Lucas, Bonnie Shansky, LOUISE GORDON, Dale Roberts, Elza Dzhivalegyan, David Beardsley, Kiersten Hawes, Zachary B Strouts, Gabriel Jean Foix, Jennifer Rose Carriere, Thomas Davis, Thomas Downey Sr, James Michael Bell, Emilio Mogollon Quintanar, Colleen Krause, Elizabeth Seu, Sharlene Cohen-Goldberg, Shamsulhayat Jalalyar, Darlene Kleinfeldt, Linda Landfair, Diane Gumble, Judith Weinberger, Peggie Perkin, Nancy Montemerlo, Ann Fleming-Weaver, John Strigle, Justin Joseph, Sharon Wilson, Dwayne Rhooms, Cloricia Lissaint, Pamela M Cox, Arlene Caylor, Joseph J. Boppre, Colby Wenck, Edward Isao Funasaki, Serge Derival, Patricia B Graybeal, Walter McKinney, Troy Menssen, Richard Swalm, Makenna Lloyd, Glaneuse Baptiste, Peter Wisner, Susan Gonzalez, Hope Willard, Judy Warren, Thomas E. Gudmundson, Muje Balidemaj, Ira Lee Dadisman, Syzana Xhakli, J. D., Marc H. Oracia, Miriam Ramirez, Linda Slocum Price, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, David Lagakos, Amanda J. Noble, Curtis McCleskey, May Zhang, Charles Henry, Richard Wolfe, George Radmall, Robyn Saba, Lynda Bisseger, Melanie Berlieb, Cathy Miller, Ena Noelina Iyesi, Kyle Briggs, Gerald Murphy, Joanne Lermar, Lawrence W Huffman, David Corbitt, Barry Karlin, Christina Ochs, Svetlana Abajyan, Roz Schwartz, Bertam Srourian, Germain Dazile, Denese Rhooms, Bridgette Scott, Mandy Dacosta Pierre, Jessica M. Kramer, Wilma Larue Lauderdale and James Lauderdale, Karine Mazmanyan, E. Brandon Bowron, Michael Daly, Suzanne Andersen, Amelfis Rojas, Mary Ferrara, Deshawna Carter, Jonathan Scillian, Gene Peay Darrah, Nancy Seamons, Ann Keller, Roy Nelson, Elaine Byrnes, David Hanna, Elita Hilaire, Joseph A Cadet, Virginia Lawson, Sylvia Fernandez, Paul Richard Knighton, Merna Siff, Gustavo Lopez, Meredith Heller, Jordan M Carriere, Joel Bond, Lana K. Pittman, Mark Roundy, Michael C Graves, Kristopher Gaspos, Sylvia Gausch, Eliza Esquivel Lozano, Moliere Jinoel, Christopher Carlson, Michael Lackey, Ann Snider, Greg King, Christine Hotaling, Gloria Park, Douglas W Weller, Leonard J. Stavish, H. W. Fanning, Karen S. Crozier, Dorothy Gaspard, Wei Guo, David Caylor, Lee Shonfield, Dwayne Watkins, Jr., Steven P. Strouts, Suzzane McCoy, Lesley Scillian, Allstate Insurance Company, Bonnie Jackson, Carolina Salvador, FRANCINE GUOKAS, Humberto Rivas-Vigil, Judy Barzare, Kristie Williams, Peter Phaneuf, Ralph Wetherington, Todd Allen, Robert Stephen McKinney, Herbert Sihite, Al Viviano, Sheldon Kogen, Joseph Hauter, Phillip Finkel, Hrayr Okkasian, Rena M Ridenour, Christopher Lenney, Omar Roberts, Amy Smith Roth, Michael Miller, Joseph Schantz, Ron Poynter, Enrique Moreno, Deborah Mayton, Vuin Edward Epps, Ovidio Aguirre Vela, Estelle Gottesman, Hilda Carro-Hernandez, Mirna Argueta, Dorothy Fisher Weed, Julie Rainwater, Kyler Lloyd, Carole Fisher, Lisa A. Labar, Donald Pritchett, Stephen I. Burack, Mark Davidson, Lawrence Nelson, CESARE COSLOP, IV, Suru Okpa Iyesi, Jeff Mullins, Joan Skillman, Christopher L. Leaverton, Mary Patricia Ryan, Max L. Lieberman, Solomon Harbor, Anthony Georges-Pierre, Maria Getzler, Yvonne Branch, Akop Galadzhyan, Doug V. Goodwin, Shaida Tavakoli, Orusmond Florestal, Margaret Daly, Michael Riley, Claudia H. Taylor, SYBIL REICHECK, Milagros Rodriguez-Cruz, Michael Choi, Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury /Wrongful Death Plaintiffs, Amanda R Maillho, Jennifer Porter, Elvira Gesell, William Givens, II, Wanda Dowell, Dr. Fred Sander, Joyce D Richard, Karen Gibbens, Michael Yastrab, Cathy Cisetti, Ani Gazaryan, Mike Martell, Richard Immerman, Roland Pippin, Betty Tomlin, Nancy Leach Rookard, Joel Allen, Cindy L. Bencsik, Henri Gattereau, Emebet Bekele, Bernadine Carter, Rosalina Diaz, Jim Heidenreich, Wanda M. Lee, Willy Saint Hilaire, Jean Isaac, Christine Fogh, CHRISTINE L. PERSONS, David Ross, Kathy Boyask, Aaron Green, Nani Indriyastuti, Ellyn J. Broden, Benjamin Hughes, Betsy Havens, Alfred Shepard, Tahiry Ramos, Augusto Panez, Shirley Laprarie, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Histha Henry, Carol Gureski, GENE KINKADE, Hugo Jean, Alfredo Hernandez Barranco, David Ramirez, Jill Bond, Carol Ann Henderson, Jeannette Klein, Mona Cayemille, Nanci Buckley, Patricia Schreckengost, Victoria Karlin, Cathy Whitaker, SPP Inc, Gary Ratliff, Edgardo Vargas-Guzman, Titsa Pelzman, Katherine Musgrave, Micah Maryn, Bruce Alan Harkey, Miriam Profiro, Ida Starr St John, Burnell Meeks, Phyllis C. Lieberman, Janet Corbitt, John Geddis, Cheng Li Zhang, Laurie Rood, Holly Sue Knighton, Jane Saint Drake, Travis Van Alfen, Kishin Khilnani, Laurence F. Siegel, Rhonda Talbot and Gary T Brock
Defendant: Doe Trucking Company, New United Motor Manufacturing Inc, Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Indiana, Inc., Toyota de Puerto Rico Corp., Scion of Las Vegas, Lakeside Imports, Inc., Toyota Industries Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & America, Inc., James Hodge, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales Corporation, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering, Lexus Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Indiana, Inc., GK Nevada LLC, Angela Brandrod, Toyota Motor Sales USA Torrance, CA, Toyota Motor Manufacturing West Virginia, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Mario A Guerrero, Toyota Motor Manufacturing California, Inc., Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., Clayton Motors, Inc., M.F. Salta Company, Inc., Courtesy Automotive Group, Friedkin Companies, Inc., Regional General Contracting, LLC, Akio Toyoda, Hino Motors, Ltd., Morse Operations, Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Aisan Industry Co., Ltd., Herrin-Gear Imports, Inc., CTS Corporation, Beechmont Toyota, Inc., LeBlanc Automobiles Inc., L.L.C., General Motors, LLC., Classic Classics, LLC, Toyota Motor Insurance Services, Inc., Toyota Lease Trust, John Does, Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Stewart Agency, Inc., John Doe Company, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., Lexus of Cerritos, Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Asian Industry Co Ltd, Denso Manufacturing Tennessee Inc, Tony Divino Toyota, Toyota Motor Credit Corp, John Doe Company #2, Toyota Industries North America Inc, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Joseph T of D, Co. d/b/a Joseph Airport Toyota, XYZ Insurance Company, Lexus of Las Vegas, Denso International America, Inc.,, Rene Quevedo, Lexus, Hino Motors Manufacturing U.S.A. Inc., Toyota Financial Services Americas Corp, Hino Motors Sales U.S.A. Inc., Kings Toyota, Inc., Daisy W. Fry, Toyota Technical Center USA, KW Real Estate Akron Co., LLC, Clyde Dyson, Auto Butler, Inc., Old Mill Toyota and Brad Hughes Toyota
Petitioner: Estate of Estelle Gottesman and Cassandra McNair-Stepney
Special Master: John K Trotter, Patrick A Juneau and Steven Stone
Not Classified By Court: Brenda Kaycee Howell Nimota, Housan Huang, Margaret Strohlein, Falls Auto Gallery, LLC, Robert Bandas, J. V. Patel, Laura Cozby, Gary Guerriero, David L Carpenter, Rebecca Guerriero, Allen Roger Snyder, Amelia Ranieri, Green Taxi, Candice Collins, Victor C Serafino, Lin T Ly, Betty J Piazza, Erich Neumann, Stephen R Piazza, Jill Piazza and Clarence Morrison
Interested Party: Betsy Benjaminson, Brevard County Board of County Commissioners and Denso Corporation
3Rd Party Defendant: Michael Barr and Larry W. Jenkins
Intervenor Plaintiff: Ohio Bureau of Workers Compensation
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Sean Kane
Case Number: 8:2010ml02151
Filed: April 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: fernando m olguin
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 5767 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5766 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)) #5763 by Judge James V. Selna. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. (es)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5763 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiffs/defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kliebenstein, Neil)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5765 Mail Returned (RTS unable to forward) addressed to Steven J Stone RetHonorable JAMS Inc 500 North State College Boulevard 14th Floor Orange, CA 92868 re Status Conference - optional html form, Set/Reset Hearing, #5761 (es)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5764 Mail Returned (RTS not deliverable as addressed) addressed to H Franklin Hostetler III Gordon and Rees LLP 2211 Michelson Drive Suite 900 Irvine, CA 92612 re Status Conference - optional html form, Set/Reset Hearing, #5761 (es)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5762 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan Seth Malc counsel for Movant BAILA SEGAL. Adding Ryan S. Malc, Esq. as counsel of record for Baila Segal for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Baila Segal. (Attorney Ryan Seth Malc added to party BAILA SEGAL(pty:bkmov), Attorney Ryan Seth Malc added to party BAILA SEGAL(pty:bkmov))(Malc, Ryan)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5761 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) and Case Management Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and cases certified for trial or under case management orders. The Court orders the portions of the transcript related to the Labar defendants sealed, not to be transcribed without further court order. The Court sets a further Status Conference for January 22, 2021 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lom)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5760 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conferenceset for 9/21/2020 at 8:30 am will be heard the same date, 9/21/2020 but at 9:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 14, 2020 Filing 5759 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hooper, John)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5758 SEALED ORDER APPROVING PETITION TO APPROVE THE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION by Judge James V. Selna. (es)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5757 SEALED ORDER APPROVING PETITION TO APPROVE THE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION by Judge James V. Selna (es)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5756 ORDER APPROVING APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Judge James V. Selna. UPON THE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS, GOOD CAUSE APPEARING: LISA LABAR is appointed Guardian ad litem of Aubrey Labar and Gavin Labar. (es)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5755 ORDER APPROVING APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Judge James V. Selna. UPON THE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS, GOOD CAUSE APPEARING: LISA LABAR is appointed Guardian ad litem of Aubrey Labar and Gavin Labar. (es)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5754 SEALED DOCUMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #5753 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document, #4 Unredacted Document, #5 Unredacted Document, #6 Unredacted Document, #7 Unredacted Document, #8 Unredacted Document, #9 Unredacted Document, #10 Unredacted Document, #11 Unredacted Document)(Kliebenstein, Neil)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5753 ORDER GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION TO FILE PETITION TO APPROVE THE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION AND RELATED DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #5751 by Judge James V. Selna. (es)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5752 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF First APPLICATION to file document under seal #5751 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document, #4 Unredacted Document, #5 Unredacted Document, #6 Unredacted Document, #7 Unredacted Document, #8 Unredacted Document, #9 Unredacted Document, #10 Unredacted Document, #11 Unredacted Document, #12 Unredacted Document)(Kliebenstein, Neil)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5751 First APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Redacted Document, #5 Redacted Document, #6 Redacted Document, #7 Redacted Document, #8 Redacted Document, #9 Redacted Document, #10 Redacted Document, #11 Redacted Document, #12 Redacted Document, #13 Redacted Document)(Attorney Neil M. Kliebenstein added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Neil M. Kliebenstein added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Kliebenstein, Neil)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5750 STATUS REPORT Joint Notice of Filing Regarding Remaining Cases in the Intensive Settlement Process filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5749 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, and with the agreement of counsel, the Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 8:30 am is continued to 9/21/2020 at 8:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file a joint report by 9/14/2020.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 7/16/2020 (lb).
July 13, 2020 Filing 5748 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hooper, John)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5747 ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF SUPPLEMENTAL ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSES RELATING TO ESCHEATMENT by Judge James V. Selna. At this time, the Court approves a supplemental payment of $25,000.00 from existing residual settlement funds to Class Action Settlement Administrator, Gilardi & Co. Future annual supplemental payments from then-existing residual settlement funds may be invoiced and reported to the Court for approval in future administrative reports scheduled to be filed with the Court each June until the escheatment process in this settlement is completed. (es)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5746 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Declaration filed by Economic Loss Plaintiffs Kathleen Atwater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Laura Jarjoura Regarding Status of Distribution), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order))(Berman, Steve)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5745 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, and with the agreement of counsel, the Telephonic Status Conference previously set for 6/15/2020 at 8:00 am is continued to 7/20/2020 08:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file a status report by 7/13/2020.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 1, 2020 Filing 5744 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hooper, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5743 Mail Returned addressed to Steven J Stone re MDL - Order, #5742 (lc)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5742 Conditional Transfer Order - (CTO-98) received from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 04/09/2010 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:20-01472 from U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 8:10-ml-2151-JVS-Ex. (jp)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5741 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna. The next Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than June 8, 2020, and the Joint Notice of Filing shall be filed between July 10 and July 20, 2020. #5740 (es)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5740 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report and Joint Notice of Filing filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hooper, John)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5739 STATUS REPORT Joint Notice of Filing Regarding Remaining Cases in the Intensive Settlement Process filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5738 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) and Case Management held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances in court and telephonically. The Ifergen case has been dismissed. Rhooms, Rodriguez-Marrero, Scott, Carter, Dere, Jacson, Cross, Labar actions continue settlement discussions. The Court sets a further Interim Status Conference for Monday, June 15, 2020 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5737 Conditional Transfer Order - 97 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (es)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5736 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hooper, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5735 Mail Returned (return to sender insufficient address) addressed to Suzanne Green Meredith Bowman & Brook LLP 2501 North Haskell Avenue Suite 1700 Dallas, TX 75201 re MDL - Order, #5728 (es)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5734 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(a California corporation / a foreign corporation, 19001 South Western Avenue, Torrance, California 90501 ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5733 ORDER On Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #5732 defendant Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales, USA., Inc. Request to Substitute Attorney Eric F Gladbach as attorney of record instead of Bridget M. Ahmann. (es)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5732 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Bridget Ahmann as counsel of record , REQUEST of Bridget Ahmann to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gladbach, Eric)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5731 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hooper, John)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5730 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #5729 by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #5729 Request to Substitute Attorney Eric F Gladbach for Toyota Motor Corporation, Eric F Gladbach for Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., as attorney of record instead of Ross W. Johnson. (es)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5729 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Ross Johnson as counsel of record filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft)) (Gladbach, Eric)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5728 Conditional Transfer Order - 96 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 8:10-ml-2151 JVS (FMOx), In Re: Toyota Motor Corp. Unintended Acceleration Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for the purpose of pretrial proceedings.
December 10, 2019 Filing 5727 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Declaration filed by Economic Loss Plaintiffs Kathleen Atwater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Laura Jarjoura Regarding Status of Distribution))(Berman, Steve)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5726 STATUS REPORT Joint Notice of Filing Regarding Remaining Cases in the Intensive Settlement Process filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5725 STATUS REPORT Joint Notice of Filing Regarding Remaining Cases in the Intensive Settlement Process filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5724 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Special Master Patrick Juneau also present telephonically. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and cases certified for trial or under case management orders. The Rodriguez, Scott, Deere and Cross actions continue settlement discussions. The Linares, Peterson and Ifergen actions have settled and they are waiting for the executed settlement documents.The Court sets a further Interim Status Conference for Monday, February 18, 2020 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5723 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hooper, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5722 STATUS REPORT Joint Notice of Filing Regarding Remaining Cases in the Intensive Settlement Process filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5721 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ben Barnow counsel for Plaintiff Julie Rainwater. Ben Barnow will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Heather A. Lane, Julie Rainwater, Angela Boles, Wayne S. Harris. (Barnow, Ben)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5720 STATUS REPORT Joint Notice of Filing Regarding Remaining Cases in the Intensive Settlement Process filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5719 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5717 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all of plaintiffs claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants.Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorneys fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposed of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5718 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5717 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5716 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/10/2017, 8:00 a.m. re Transcript #5715 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Parker, Deborah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 26, 2019 Filing 5715 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/10/2017, 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2019. (Parker, Deborah)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5714 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5713 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties settlement agreement. (lwag)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5713 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5712 STATUS REPORT Joint Notice of Filing Regarding Remaining Cases in the Intensive Settlement Process filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5711 ORDER Approving Payment of Supplemental Administrative Expenses Relating to Escheatment #5710 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court GRANTS the Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Approving the Payment of Supplemental Administrative Expenses Relating to Escheatment processing. At this time, the Court approves a supplemental payment of $400,000.00 from existing residual settlement funds to Class Action Settlement Administrator, Gilardi & Co. Future annual supplemental payments from then-existing residual settlement funds may be invoiced and reported to the Court for approval in future administrative reports scheduled to be filed with the Court each June until the escheatment process in this settlement is completed. (lwag)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5710 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Declaration and Plaintiffs' Motion to Approve Payment of Supplemental Administrative Expenses Related to Escheatment filed by Economic Loss Plaintiffs Kathleen Atwater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Laura Jarjoura Regarding Status of Distribution), #2 Exhibit B ([Proposed] Order Approving Payment of Supplemental Administrative Expenses Relating to Escheatment))(Berman, Steve)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5709 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and cases certified for trial or under case management orders.Counsel in the Labar action continue settlement discussions. Counsel in the Ifergen action state this matter has settled and they are waiting for the executed settlement documents. The Court sets a further Interim Status Conference for Monday, October 7, 2019 at 8:00 a.m. Status Reports may be filed every 90 days as opposed to 30 days if counsel wish. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5707 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hooper, John)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5708 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge James V. Selna, ORDERING Letter from R. Martin Palmer received on 5/1/2019 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 83-2.5 No letters to the judge. (lwag) (lwag)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5706 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Dismissing for Failure to Prosecute by Judge James V. Selna: On January 27, 2014, the Court ordered Plaintiff Adeniyi Toriola (Toriola) to show cause why the Court should not dismiss the present action based on his failure to seek exemption of the present claims in his bankruptcy. (Docket No. 20.) Toriolas written response to the Order to Show Cause was due no later than February 14, 2014. The Court advised Toriola, Failure file a written response in a timely manner will result in dismissal of the present action. (Id.) Toriola failed to respond by the required date, and despite the passage of time has still not responded. The case is dismissed for failure to prosecute. (lwag)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5705 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5704 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5703 SEALED ORDER ON PETITION TO APPROVE THE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION (es)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5702 Notice of Electronic Filing re Sealed Document #5701 e-mailed to Bruce S. Terlep, bterlep@smbtrials.com bounced due to 4.3.0 - Other mail system problem 451-'4.7.0 Temporary server error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 8, 2019 Filing 5701 SEALED DOCUMENT Petition to Approve Minor Compromise re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #5691 filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Talbot. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Christina, Salvadore)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5700 ORDER Granting Application to Have Document Stricken #5699 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint stipulation for dismissal filed on February 22, 2019 as Docket Number 5697 is stricken and the docket entry shall so note as it is a duplicative of Docket Number 5696. (lwag)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5699 APPLICATION to Strike docket #5697 for being a duplicate submission Stipulation to Dismiss Case, #5697 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hooper, John)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5698 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5697 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice as to all Plaintiffs claims, actions and causes of action asserted against Defendant due to lack of prosecution of this action. Each party is to bear his or its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorneys fees and expert fees. Upon the recommendation of the Settlement Special Master, Plaintiff shall be given 90 days leave to refile his action. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order for the purposes ofoverseeing the action, if it is refiled by Plaintiff. (lwag)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5697 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY #5700] Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Hooper, John) Modified on 2/28/2019 (lwag).
February 22, 2019 Filing 5696 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Hooper, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5695 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5694 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5693 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5693 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5692 SEALED PETITION for Approval of MInor Settlement re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #5691 filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Talbot. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Christina, Salvadore)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5691 ORDER Granting Leave to File Petition to Approve the Compromise of Pending Action Under Seal #5689 by Judge James V. Selna: The Joint Application to File Petition to Approve the Compromise of Pending Action Under Seal is GRANTED. See document for further information. (lwag)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5690 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF Joint APPLICATION to file document under seal #5689 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5689 Joint APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Redacted Document)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5688 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Salvadore Christina, Jr counsel for Plaintiff Rhonda Talbot. Daniel E. Becnel Jr. is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Salvadore Christina, Jr.. (Christina, Salvadore)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5687 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Salvadore Christina, Jr counsel for Plaintiff Rhonda Talbot. Adding Salvadore Christina, jr as counsel of record for Rhonda Talbot, Audrey Vega for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Salvadore Christina, Jr.. (Christina, Salvadore)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5686 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5685 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and cases certified for trial or under case management orders. Counsel in the Labar action continue to work toward resolution of the lien matter. Counsel in the Ifergen action are going to mediation. The Court sets a further Interim Status Conference for Wednesday, May 15, 2019 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5684 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 59 in SACV 11-415; Docket 5674 in MDL 10-2151) by Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel for defendants make their appearances via telephone. The Court's tentative ruling is issued. The Court and counsel confer. The Court GRANTS the defendants' motion and rules in accordance with the tentative ruling. See document for further information. (lwag)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5683 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Declaration filed by Plaintiffs Kathleen Atwater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Laura Jarjoura Regarding Status of Distribution))(Berman, Steve)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5682 ORDER #5679 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that Defendants as well as plaintiffs may participate in the December 10, 2018 hearing by telephone. Counsel shall forward (via e-mail to Karla_Tunis@cacd.uscourts.gov) the phone number where they may be reached on Monday, December 10, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (lwag)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5681 Letter from Lavergne Short (lwag)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5680 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hooper, John)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5679 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Participate in Hearing by Telephone filed by defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Exhibit B) (Bodin, Mark)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5678 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order to Show Cause,,, #5677 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5677 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: WHY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly D'Auria, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Hooper, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5676 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5675 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5644 by Judge James V. Selna: The case is dismissed with prejudice under Rule 41(b) for failure to prosecute and under Rule 37 for failure to give discovery and obey this Court's Orders. See document for further information. (lwag)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5674 NOTICE of Motion and Motion for Order to Show Cause why Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Should Not be Granted filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bodin, Mark)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5673 Defs 6-20-18 svc ltr to PL with discovery requests and medical authorizations (Ayers, David)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5672 MINUTES RE: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 145 in SACV16-1059 JVS and Docket No. 5644 in 8:10ML02151JVS)held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel for defendants states his appearance for the record. The Court notes that there is no appearance on behalf of plaintiff, nor has she contacted the Clerk to arrange for an alternate appearance method, as previously done. The Courts tentative ruling was posted on the Judges Procedures and Schedules page on Friday, November 2, 2018. Counsel makes his arguments regarding the motion. The Court GRANTS the defendants motion. The Court will issue a detailed writtenruling after making corrections as indicated on the record. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag) Modified on 11/5/2018 (lwag).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5671 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: The parties are ordered to arrange for a further mediation session with the Special Master Patrick Juneau within 120 days. Counsel for the Ifergen parties are reminded that the Local Rules bar direct communication with the District Judge, including letters. (Local Rule 83-2.5.) (lwag)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5670 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT PART II filed by Plaintiff Joyce D Richard re: Miscellaneous Document #5669 (Richard, Joyce)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5669 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT PART I filed by Plaintiff Joyce D Richard (Richard, Joyce)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5668 OBJECTIONS Toyota's to Jack Dweck's Letter Request for Remand filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Galvin, Vincent)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5667 JOINT REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: The parties agree that a Revised Case Management Order is necessary and respectfully request the Court enter this Joint Revised Case Management Order: Trial is set for May 25, 2020; Pretrial Conference, hearing Motions in Limine is set for April 24, 2020 and Pretrial Conference filing per Local Rules is set for April 17, 2020. See document for further information and dates. (lwag)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5666 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Plaintiff's Request for Continuance #5660 by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiff Joyce Richard's request for a 120-days continuance of the hearing on Toyota's pending Motion to Dismiss is without merit. (See Docket No. 146.) The request is denied. (lwag)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5665 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Order, #5587 filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5664 NOTICE DEATH OF PLAINTIFF BEVERLY IFERGAN filed by defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(a California corporation / a foreign corporation, 19001 South Western Avenue, Torrance, California 90501 ). (Galvin, Vincent)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5663 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cari K Dawson counsel for Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Craig Carpenito is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Dawson, Cari)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5662 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Compel #5642 by Judge James V. Selna: Pursuant to Rules 16 and 37(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's inherent powers, the Court grants the following relief: Each Plaintiff shall respond without objections to the interrogatories within twenty days: Each Plaintiff shall respond without objections to the requests for production within twenty days and shall make the identified documents available for inspection within thirty days. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78 and Local Rule 7-15, the Court deems the matter submitted without oral argument, and removes the October 22, 208 hearing from it's calendar. See document for further information. (lwag)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5661 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #5644 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5660 NOTICE NOTICE AND AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE AND/OR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5659 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna re: #5657 Motion for Leave to Participate in Hearing by Telephone. The Court finds the Motion to be well-taken, and it is therefore granted. It is therefore ordered that all parties may participate in the October 22, 2018 hearing by telephone. Counsel for defendant shall forward to the Clerk and all parties a conference call number, and any password needed for use in conducting the hearing on October 22, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. See document for Clerk name and email information. (ts)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5658 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5657 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Participate in Hearing by Telephone filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/22/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Attorney David L Ayers added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David L Ayers added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Ayers, David)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5656 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5655 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5655 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5654 OBJECTIONS to Order on Application for Order,, #4595 , Order on Request to Substitute Attorney, #187 , Order, #1824 , Order,, #485 , Status Conference - optional html form,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, #3717 , Order,, #3934 , Order on Motion to Seal Document #2682 , Order,,, #4762 , Order,, #5048 , Motion Hearing,, #5565 , Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #1442 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #2718 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, #1213 , Order,,, #4742 , Order on Motion to Seal Document, #854 , Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #3990 , Order, Add and Terminate Parties #5234 , Order on Motion to Continue, #5115 , Order #4943 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Document Sealed,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #3454 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #4035 , Order,, #4865 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #4874 , Order, #1660 , Order,, #3276 , Order,, #2427 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #238 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #3329 , Order,, #5459 , Order, #3829 , Order on Ex Parte Application to Remand Case to State Court, #2659 , Order,, #5060 , Order #875 , Order, #1238 , Order,, #762 , Order,, #1976 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #4833 , Order #413 , Order #5416 , Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #2358 , Order on Application to Seal (document), #2753 , Order, #5587 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 5451 , Substitution of Attorney - Granted #4994 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, #550 , Notice (Other) #1561 , Order #4817 , Order on Application to Seal (document), #2596 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #1952 , Order on Ex Parte Application for Settlement, #3344 , Notice of Under Seal Filing #4897 , Order,, #3735 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #1654 , Order #261 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #433 , Order,, #5088 , Order, #1237 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #5504 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, #1680 , Order,, #5039 , Order, #2524 , Protective Order #276 , Motion Hearing,,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,, #3787 , Order,, #5174 , Order on Motion for Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O,, #5255 , Order,, #5320 , Order on Motion to Vacate,, #5126 , Order,, #2326 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #2160 , Order #4816 , Sealed Document #5406 , Order,,,, #806 , Order,,,, #2539 , Order #4015 , Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #1323 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #5529 , Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4396 , Order,, #1667 , (TERMED) Text Only Scheduling Notice, Order,, #5067 , Order,, #5068 , Order,, #2891 , Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #3715 , Order on Application to Seal (document),, #4365 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #2998 , Order on Request for Leave to Appear,, #3738 , Order, #4755 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #5287 , Order, #5482 , Order #4809 , Order,, #4955 , Order,, #4945 , Order on Motion for Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O,, #5193 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #5624 , Motion Hearing, #1361 , Order on Motion for Order #5468 , Order, #1727 , Order,, #3802 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #5640 , (TERMED) Text Only Scheduling Notice, 4144 , Notice (Other), #2 , Amended Minutes,, #2395 , Order #4812 , Order on Application to Seal (document),,, #4399 , Order #1623 , Order on Request to Substitute Attorney, #2154 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #3012 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #2859 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #146 , Order #243 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #322 , Order,, #5524 , Order,,, #3085 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #482 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #5618 , Order #4892 , Order,, #5078 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #4147 , Order, #3203 , Order on Ex Parte Application for Appointment of Counsel, #4700 , Order,, #4754 , Order,,, #4688 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, #1757 , Order, #823 , Order on Motion to Seal Document #1178 , Order on Application to Seal (document), #2087 , Order,, #4756 , Order on Application to Seal (document),, #4327 , Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion to Dismiss, #2004 , Order #5395 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #5 , Order,, Set/Reset Hearing, #836 , Order,, #4653 , Order,, #3023 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #2643 , Order on Motion to Seal Document #631 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion to Continue,,, #3030 , Order,, #5049 , Order,, #5069 , Order #5325 , Order #2576 , Order #5240 , Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #541 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #4505 , Order,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, #523 , Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #1322 , Order on Motion to Strike,, #3218 , Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #654 , Order,,, #1850 , Order,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,, #3310 , Order #4160 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #4509 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,,, #2016 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #2765 , Order on Ex Parte Application to Strike #1413 , Order, #5275 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,,, Terminate Hearings,, #5377 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #2584 , Order,, #3804 , Order #4844 , Order #3323 , Order on Application to Substitute Attorney, #3111 , Order #4840 , Order #4857 , Order,, #5031 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #2844 , Order #2033 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #2306 , Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #253 , Order,,,, #604 , Order #629 , Order,,, #1852 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #259 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #2962 , Order,, #5619 , Order,, #2080 , Order,, #5120 , Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss #510 , Order on Ex Parte Application for Order #4623 , Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #4450 , Order,, #5202 , (TERMED) Text Only Scheduling Notice, 5363 , Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Motion Hearing, #2202 , Order,, #4964 , Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File #5545 , Order,, #5226 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #193 , Order,,,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,, #2057 , Order on Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File a Document,, #4878 , Order on Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Attorney,, #4873 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Add and Terminate Attorneys, #4701 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,, #2892 , Order on Motion to Take Deposition, #2954 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #3009 , Order,, #4714 , Order #4815 , Order,,, #5207 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #2075 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #27 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #1342 , Order,,,,, #1330 , Order #1720 , Order on Request to Certify, #4369 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #5633 , Order, #5382 , Order on Motion to Exclude,,,,, #5387 , Order #3364 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #2806 , Order,,, #4692 , MDL - Order #299 , Order,, #4967 , Status Conference - optional html form, #1492 , Protective Order #627 , Order on Application to Seal (document), #3123 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #2476 , Order #4277 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #1431 , Motion Hearing,,, #5470 , Order,,, #4939 , Order, #1428 , Order on Motion to Dismiss, #2324 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #4538 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #2975 , Order #4981 , Order, #3688 , Order #3399 , Order,, #5066 , Order,,, #4658 , Order #4864 , Order #4862 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #4620 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines #1732 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #4368 , Order on Motion to Strike #1479 , Order,, #4387 , Order on Application to Seal (document), #2944 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #830 , Order on Motion to Seal Document,,, #1979 , Order #5425 , Order,, #4659 , Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #2323 , Order, #2620 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #3059 , Order #4846 , Order #292 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, #75 , Order,, #4770 , Order #4853 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #2929 , Order on Application to Seal (document), #2038 , Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Strike, #1414 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #464 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,, #904 , Order #3 , Order #637 , Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #297 , Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File #5260 , Order on Application to Seal (document) #2687 , Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis, #3350 , Order,,, #4691 , Order on Application to Seal (document),, #2729 , Order on Request to Substitute Attorney, #3898 , Order, #1655 , Order #1212 , Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,, Motion
September 20, 2018 Filing 5653 NOTICE Notice of Correction Part VII: Exhibit 1 - J.D.R. Declaration (Part V) filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5652 NOTICE Notice of Correction Part VI: Exhibit 1 - J.D.R. Declaration (Part IV) filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5651 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Notice (Other) #5650 served on 09/20/2018. (Richard, Joyce)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5650 NOTICE Notice of Correction Part V: Exhibit 1 - J.D.R. Declaration (Part III) filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5649 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Notice (Other) #5648 served on 09/20/2018. (Richard, Joyce)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5648 NOTICE Notice of Correction Part IV: Exhibit 1 - J.D.R. Declaration (Part II) filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5647 NOTICE Notice of Correction Part III: Exhibit 1 - J.D.R. Declaration (Part I) filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5646 NOTICE Notice of Correction Part II: Exhibit 1 - A.P.R. Declaration filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5645 NOTICE NOTICE Notice of Correction, Public V. Notice, Ex. 1 Tab, Ex Parte Application with Memorandum filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5644 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Attorney David L Ayers added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David L Ayers added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David L Ayers added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David L Ayers added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David L Ayers added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David L Ayers added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft)) (Ayers, David)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5643 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5642 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and to Appear for Depositions or Alternatively Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/22/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Attorney Mark N Bodin added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark N Bodin added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark N Bodin added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark N Bodin added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark N Bodin added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark N Bodin added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Bodin, Mark)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5641 NOTICE of Change of address by Steve W Berman attorney for Plaintiff Kathleen Atwater. Changing attorneys address to 1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000, Seattle, WA 98101. Filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Atwater. (Berman, Steve)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5640 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Plaintiff's Request for Further Extension by Judge James V. Selna: In response to the Court's Order of August 20, 2018 setting certain deadlines (Docket No. 131), plaintiff Joyce Richard ("Richard") has filed an affidavit requesting a 15-day extension. Richard shall provide Toyota with a written authorization to obtain her medical records no later than September 19, 2018. Richard shall provide Toyota with three dates she is available to give her depositin no later than September 19, 2018. These tasks require minimal effort other than to communicate with counsel for Toyota and can be performed from anywhere. THE COURT ADMONISHES RICHARD IN THE STRONGEST TERMS THAT FAILURE TO COMPLY WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. (lwag)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5639 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.to Notice (Other) #5638 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Affidavit (Ayers, David)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5638 NOTICE Family Emergency & Temporary Internet Access Impediment filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5637 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5636 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all Plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against all Defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5636 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing California, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Stipulation of Dismissal)(Attorney J Randolph Bibb, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney J Randolph Bibb, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney J Randolph Bibb, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J Randolph Bibb, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J Randolph Bibb, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Manufacturing California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J Randolph Bibb, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Manufacturing California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J Randolph Bibb, Jr added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J Randolph Bibb, Jr added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J Randolph Bibb, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney J Randolph Bibb, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Bibb, J)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5634 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5631 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to haveappeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees andexpert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties settlement agreement. (lwag)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5633 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Final Order re Plaintiff's Request for Extension by Judge James V. Selna: The Court now orders as follows: Within fifteen days, Richard shall provide Toyota with a written authorization to obtain her medical records; Within fifteen days, Richard shall provide Toyota with three dates she isavailable to give her deposition. The deposition shall take place in Indianapolis. The deposition shall take place within forty-five days; Seven days prior to her deposition, Richard shall (1) provide her responses to all outstanding document discovery and shall make production, and (2) provide her responses to all outstanding interrogatories. The Court cautions Richard as it did in its earlier order: Substantial time has already passed to meet [her discovery] obligations. If she fails to comply, the Court will likely dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b).) See document for further information. (lwag)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5632 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5630 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposed of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5631 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by plaintiffs/defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(a California corporation / a foreign corporation, 19001 South Western Avenue, Torrance, California 90501 ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5630 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by plaintiffs/defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5629 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.to Miscellaneous Document, #5627 "Plaintiff's Affidavit, Pursuant to Venue Filing Dated August 7, 2018 Due to Medical Treatments for Illness" (Ayers, David)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5635 Mail Returned addressed to Wade Tomlinson re Status Conference #5621 . (iv)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5628 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge James V. Selna: Case should have been closed on entry dated 9/22/2017, Docket #24. (lwag)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5627 PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT, PURSUANT TO VENUE FILING DATED AUGUST 7, 2018 (ECF NO. 128/MDL 2151 ECF NO. 5624), DUE TO MEDICAL TREATMENTS FOR ILLNESS filed by Plaintiff Joyce D Richard re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #5624 (Richard, Joyce)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5626 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Amendment to Status Report #5625 REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5625 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5624 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Further Order re Plaintiff's Request for Extension by Judge James V. Selna: The Court again directs Richard to provide medical evidence in support of her claim that she is not medically able to meet her obligations in this case within seven days. The Court does not wish to invade Richards privacy and any document containing or reflecting a medical opinion concerning Richards condition may be filed under seal without further order of the Court. Absent medical proof, the Court will unilaterally set dates for her to respond to written discovery and requests for production and to give her deposition. Substantial time has already passed to meet these obligations. If she fails to comply, the Court will likely dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. (Fed.R.Civ.P.41(b)). (lwag)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5623 NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT, PURSUANT TO ORDER OF JULY 26, 2018 (ECF NO. 126/MDL 2151 ECF NO. 5618), DUE TO MEDICAL TREATMENTS filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5622 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5571 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5621 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and cases certified for trial or under case management orders.Counsel in the Labar action continue to work toward resolution of the lien matter and will be contacting the special master for any assistance he may provide. The Court directs the parties to provide a list (by name) of the remaining cases in the MDL in the next status report. The Court sets a further Interim Status Conference for Wednesday, December 12, 2018 at 8:00 a.m.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5620 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5619 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5617 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to haveappeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees andexpert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties settlement agreement. (lwag)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5618 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Plaintiff's Request for Extension #5615 by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiff Joyce Richard (Richard) has advised the Court of her present health difficulties, and requests an extension of ninety days to meet any presently outstanding obligations. (Docket No. 124.)1 Toyota has filed a response. (Docket No. 125.) Richard provides no medical evidence to support her contentions. She is ordered to provide medical evidence in support of her claim that she is not medically able to meet her obligations in this case within seven days. The Court holds her request in abeyance until she responds. (lwag)
July 25, 2018 Filing 5617 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by plaintiffs/defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Galvin, Vincent)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5616 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.to Notice (Other) #5615 (To Plaintiff's Notice of Request for an Extension to Make Responses, Due to Medical Treatment) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defs Case-Specific RFP to PL, #2 Exhibit B - Def Case-Specific ROGs to PL, #3 Exhibit C - 2018-06-22 Email & Ltr to PL, #4 Exhibit D - 2018-07-01 DLA email to PL re depo date, #5 Exhibit E (Cumulative) - Defs Email & NOD to PL)(Ayers, David)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5615 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO MAKE RESPONSES, DUE TO MEDICAL TREATMENT filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5614 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
July 10, 2018 Filing 5613 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Joyce Richard [Plf] on August 24, 2018 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
June 26, 2018 Filing 5612 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #5123 , CCA # 16-55327. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered June 04, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum #5611 AFFIRMED.] (mat)
June 14, 2018 Filing 5610 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales Corporation, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
June 11, 2018 Filing 5609 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Declaration filed by Economic Loss Plaintiffs Kathleen Atwater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Laura Jarjoura))(Berman, Steve)
June 7, 2018 Filing 5608 Conditional Transfer Order - 94 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (es)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5607 DEFENDANTS' CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Re: SACV16-1059 JVS (Ex) by Judge James V. Selna. This case has been certified by the Special Master as having completed the ISP process ordered on December 12, 2013 [Dkt. No. 4490]. In an effort to comply with the Court's Order [Dkt. No. 105 SACV 16-1059 JVS (FMOx), the defendants have attempted to arrange a meet and confer session with plaintiff without success, and therefore submit this Proposed Case Management Order. (see document for details). (dro)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5606 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Order Granting Defendants Motion for Case Management Order and Vacating Proceedings Regarding Plaintiffs Affidavit of Errata etc. by Judge James V. Selna. This case is very old which works to the disadvantage of all the parties. There must be a schedule that moves toward resolution by trial or otherwise. For that reason, the Court is granting Toyota's motion by separate order and entering a CMO. However, the entry is without prejudice to Richard seeking relief from any specific deadline, upon a showing of good cause. (see document for details). (dro)
June 4, 2018 Filing 5611 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #5123 filed by Cassandra McNair-Stepney. CCA # 16-55327. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (mat)
June 4, 2018 Filing 5605 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Entry of Case Management Order and Response to Notice filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/25/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Ayers, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 5604 NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ILLNESS (3) filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5603 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5550 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the partiessettlement agreement. (lwag)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5602 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: This case has been certified by the Special Master as having completed the ISP process ordered on December 12, 2013 [Dkt. No. 4490] (all Docket Numbers are in Case 8:10-ml-02151-JVS-FMO). In compliance with the Courts Order [Dkt. No. 5589), Defendants submit this Proposed Case Management Order (CMO). See document for further information. (lwag)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5601 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Entry of Case Management Order by Judge James V. Selna: Toyota proposes a schedule of deadlines through the hearing of Daubert motions. The Court finds the schedule reasonable, and adopts it. The motion is granted. The Court further finds that oral argument would not be helpful on this matter and vacates the June 18, 2018 hearing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. (lwag)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5600 ORDER ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AS DISCOVERY SANCTION #5580 by Judge James V. Selna (Re: SACV11-01073 JVS (FMOx). The hearing on the Toyota defendants' Motion to Dismissal came on for regular hearing on May 21, 2018. After considering the motion and argument made thereon, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED and plaintiff's claims, actions, and causes of action asserted against defendants, and the entire action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. (dro)
May 21, 2018 Filing 5599 MINUTES OF Hearing Re: Defendants Motion for Sanctions #5580 held before Judge James V. Selna (Re: SACV11-01073 JVS (FMOx). The Motion is granted. The case is dismissed with prejudice. (see document for details). Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5597 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Further Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond and for Parties to Submit Case Management Order by Judge James V. Selna. Plaintiff Joyce Richard ("Richard") has advised the Court the need foradditional time to meet certain obligations in light of her heath problems. (Docket No. 117.) The Court takes the following action: The Court extends the time for submitting a joint proposed Case Management Order ("CMO") to June 1, 2018. The Court previously set a hearing on Richard's Affidavit of Errata etc. ("Affidavit") seeking certain relief for April 25, 2018, which was subsequently vacated. (Docket No. 104.) The Court extends Richard's time for a reply to June 1, 2018. The Court will determine the need for a hearing upon review of the last brief. (dro)
May 16, 2018 Filing 5598 Letter from plaintiffs (Re: SACV11-00415 JVS (FMOx). (dro)
May 16, 2018 Filing 5596 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Entry of Case Management Order filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 4/30/18 Letter to Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Ayers, David)
May 14, 2018 Filing 5595 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
May 11, 2018 Filing 5594 NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ILLNESS (2) filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5593 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5592 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
May 9, 2018 Filing 5592 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5591 ORDER Granting Toyota Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Vacate the Case Management Order #5590 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Toyota Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Vacate the August 9, 2017 Case Management Order is GRANTED. (lwag)
May 2, 2018 Filing 5590 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Order on Motion for Order #5442 Revised CMO filed by defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Galvin, Vincent)
April 25, 2018 Filing 5589 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of theIntensive Settlement Processes and cases certified for trial. Counsel in the Labar action continue to work toward resolution of the matter and will contact the Court if needed. The Court ORDERS the parties in SACV 11-00415 JVS(FMOx): Lavergne Short, et al. V. Toyota Motor Corporation, et al. to file a proposed Case Management Plan and Proposed Order within forty-five (45) days. TheCourt GRANTS the defendants permission to submit a unilateral Case Management Plan and Proposed Order, if they have not had a response from the plaintiffs within twenty (20) days. The Court sets a further Telephonic Status Conference for Tuesday, July 31, 2018 at 8:00 a.m.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
April 24, 2018 Filing 5588 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit K to Toyota Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Discovery Sanction re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #5585 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc..(Galvin, Vincent)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5587 JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #5583 by Judge James V. Selna: In compliance with the Courts January 17, 2018 and March 7, 2018 Orders [Dkt. Nos. 32 and34], Counsel for the parties met and conferred and submitted a Joint Proposed Case Management Order. See document for further information and dates. (lwag)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5585 ORDER Granting Toyota's Application to Seal Exhibit K to Galvin Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss as Discovery Sanction #5581 by Judge James V. Selna: The Application to file the following under seal is GRANTED: For Exhibit K to Motion and Stipulation Regarding Toyota's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Discovery Sanction. (lwag)
April 20, 2018 Filing 5586 CERTIFICATE Re: ISP re SACV11-1415 filed by Settlement Special Master. (lwag)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5584 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Extending the Time for Plaintiff to Respond and for Parties to Submit Case Management Order by Judge James V. Selna. The Court had directed the parties to submit a joint proposed Case Management Order ("CMO") not later than April 18, 2018. (Docket No. 104.) Toyota was unable to secure the participation of plaintiff Joyce Richard ("Richard"), and has submitted a motion for the entry of a CMO. (Docket No. 113.) In view of Ms. Richard's recent health problems (see Docket No. 114), the Court extended the time for submission of the CMO until May 25, 2018. The Court removes Toyota's motion from the April 25, 1018 calendar. Ms. Richard is directed to respond to the motion no later than May 11, 2018. No rebuttal is required unless requested by the Court. The matter will be deemed submitted upon the receipt of Ms. Richard's response, or the lapse of the time for her response. (dro)
April 20, 2018 Filing 5583 Joint STIPULATION for Consideration of Joint Case Management Order filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
April 18, 2018 Filing 5582 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit K to Toyota's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Discovery Sanction under seal #5581 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Galvin, Vincent)
April 18, 2018 Filing 5581 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit K to Toyota's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Discovery Sanction under seal filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document)(Galvin, Vincent)
April 18, 2018 Filing 5580 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions plaintiff Sang Seok Na filed by defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/21/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through L)(Galvin, Vincent)
April 18, 2018 Filing 5577 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Entry of Case Management Order filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/25/2018 at 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 3/22/18 Letter to PL, #2 Exhibit B - Follow-up Emails to PL, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Case Management Order) (Ayers, David)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5579 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Extending the Time for Plaintiff to Respond and for Parties to Submit Case Management Order by Judge James V. Selna: The Court previously set a hearing on Richard's Affidavit of Errata etc. ("Affidavit") seeking certain relief for April 25, 2018. (Docket No. 104.) Richard has not responded to Toyota's submission. The Court vacates the hearing and extends Richard's time for a reply to May 25, 2018. The Court will determine the need for a hearing upon review of the last brief. The Court has also directed the parties to meet and confer and to submit a proposed case management order ("CMO") no later than April 18, 2018. (Id.) The time for that submission is extended to May 25, 2018. (lwag)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5578 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Defendants' Request for Contents of Record to be Remanded by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having reviewed the Defendants' Suggestion and Request for the Contents of the Record to be Remanded (Docket No. 76 in SACV13-00916 and Docket No. 5572 in 8:10-ML-02151 JVS), hereby GRANTS the Defendants' request. The Court ORDERS the Clerk's Office to Remand the Contents of the Record in case number SACV13-00916 JVS(Ex) to the United States District Court for Puerto Rico. (lwag)
April 16, 2018 Filing 5576 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2151, that the actions listed on the attached schedule be remanded to their respective transferor courts. Case Number 3:13-cv-01067 remanded to USDC, District of Puerto Rico MDL ORDER (lwag)
April 16, 2018 Filing 5575 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
April 16, 2018 Filing 5574 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Notice (Other) #5573 served on April 16, 2018. (Richard, Joyce)
April 16, 2018 Filing 5573 NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Illness filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Richard, Joyce)
April 13, 2018 Filing 5572 SUGGESTION AND REQUEST BY DEFENDANTS FOR STIPULATION OF THE CONTENTS OF THE RECORD TO BE REMANDED filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Ayers, David)
April 10, 2018 Filing 5571 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
April 5, 2018 Filing 5570 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order #5568 (Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion Requesting to Vacate Order Issued on March 21, 2018 and to Grant Additional Time to Comply) filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5567 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Reopening Action by Judge James V. Selna: The Court hereby ORDERS this action returned to the active case load. MAKE JS-5. (lwag)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5569 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion #5568 by Judge James V. Selna: Today the Court received from Plaintiff Fernando Lopez-Llanos (Lopez-Llanos) an Emergency Motion Requesting to Vacate Order Issued on March 21st, 2018 and to Grant Additional Time to Comply. Following the telephonic hearing on April 3, 2018, the Court issued a Suggestion of Remand. (SACV 13-916, Docket No. 70.) Among other things, the Court stayed paragraph 2 of its March 21, 2018 Order. The Court believes that the Courts partial stay is sufficient to allow the parties to confer concerning Lopez-Llanos renewed efforts at compliance. The Court takes no other action at this time. Any further relief should be sought from the transferor court in light of developments. (lwag)
April 3, 2018 Filing 5568 EMERGENCY MOTION Requesting to Vacate Order Issued on March 21st, 2018 and to Grant Additional Time to Comply filed by Plaintiff Fernando Lopez Llanos. (lwag)
April 3, 2018 Filing 5566 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) SUGGESTION OF REMAND by Judge James V. Selna. For all the foregoing reasons, the Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407(1). (see document for details). (dro)
April 3, 2018 Filing 5565 MINUTES OF Defendants Motion for Contempt Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and counsel for defendants makes his appearance via telephone. The Court notes that there is no appearance on behalf of plaintiff, nor has plaintiff contacted the Clerk to make a telephonic appearance. The Court and counsel confer regarding documents submitted to counsel from plaintiff. The Court stays paragraph two of the March 21st Order and will issue the Suggestion of Remand as discussed on the record. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
March 28, 2018 Filing 5564 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.to Request for Judicial Notice,,,,, #5449 , Affidavit,,,, #5447 (IN OPPOSITION) (Ayers, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5563 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. (Ayers, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5562 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Ayers, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5561 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation (Ayers, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5560 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Ayers, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5559 NOTICE - (ANSWER [and Jury Demand] to Plaintiffs Dolores Petersen and Thomas Petersen's Complaint filed in case 8:18-cv-00364) filed by Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Ayers, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5558 NOTICE - (ANSWER [and Jury Demand] to Plaintiffs Dolores Petersen and Thomas Petersen's Complaint filed in case 8:18-cv-00364) filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Ayers, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5557 NOTICE - (ANSWER [and Jury Demand] to Plaintiffs Dolores Petersen and Thomas Petersen's Complaint filed in case 8:18-cv-00364) filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5556 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation (Ayers, David)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5555 NOTICE - (ANSWER [with Jury Demand] to Plaintiff Joyce Richard's Complaint filed in case 8:16-cv-01059) filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Ayers, David)
March 22, 2018 Filing 5554 NOTICE Appellees' List of Additional Portions of Reporter's Transcript Deemed Necessary to Appeal filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
March 21, 2018 Filing 5553 MINUTES OF Hearing Re: Defendants' Motion for Contempt #5523 Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and counsel for defendants makes his appearance. The Court notes that there is no appearance on behalf of plaintiff, nor has plaintiff contacted the Clerk to make a telephonic appearance. The Court's tentative ruling was previously posted on the Court's website. The Court and counsel confer. The Court GRANTS the defendant's motion and rules in accordance with the tentative ruling as follows: (see document for details). Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5552 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation of Dismissal #5550 (re: SACV16-01180 JVS (Ex). (see document for details). (dro)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5551 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation of Dismissal #5549 ( Re SACV17-01054 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
March 16, 2018 Filing 5550 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
March 16, 2018 Filing 5549 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
March 16, 2018 Filing 5548 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5547 AMENDED MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Defendants Motion to Confirm Termination of Stay and for Entry of a Case Management Order by Judge James V. Selna. (AMENDED to Add TIME of Hearing Only). The Court will hear Richard's Affidavit at the April 25, 2018 status conference, at 8:00 a.m. Toyota's response is due March 30, 2018. Richard may file a reply no later than April 13, 2018. (see document for details). (dro)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5546 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Confirm Termination of Stay and for Entry of a Case Management Order #5531 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court will hear Richards Affidavit at the April 25, 2018 status conference.Toyotas response is due March 30, 2018. Richard may file a reply no later than April 13, 2018. The parties are directed to meet and confer and to submit a proposed CMO no later than April 18, 2018. The parties are cautioned that participation is not optional: The parties shall work cooperatively to develop and present a CMO. Any party who fails to do so may be subject to sanctions including dismissal of the action, striking of the answer and/or monetary sanctions. In assessing any short comings, the Court will consider thepartys past diligence. See document for further information. (lwag)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5545 ORDER Granting Joint Request to Extend Time to Submit Case Management Order #5544 by Judge James V. Selna: The parties shall meet and confer and file a proposed Case Management Order within 45 days of this Order. (lwag)
March 6, 2018 Filing 5544 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Proposed CMO filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Galvin, Vincent)
March 5, 2018 Filing 5543 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-93) - from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. MDL ORDER 2151 (twdb)
March 1, 2018 Filing 5541 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.to Notice (Other) #5538 to Plaintiff's Notice of Unilateral Objection (Ayers, David)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5542 (SEALED DOCUMENT) ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT (Re: SACV15-01045 JVS (Ex), by Judge James V. Selna. (dro)
February 28, 2018 Filing 5540 SEALED DOCUMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #5529 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
February 27, 2018 Filing 5539 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Notice (Other) #5538 served on February 26, 2018. (Attachments: #1 5538-NEF)(Richard, Joyce)
February 26, 2018 Filing 5538 NOTICE UNILATERAL OBJECTION filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Attachments: #1 1 Stat. 109 (1790) Excerpt, #2 16 Stat. 198 (1870) Excerpt)(Richard, Joyce)
February 21, 2018 Filing 5537 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to Docket entry #5535 and #5536 were linked to the incorrect document. The correct Notice of Appeal document is #5477 .The docket will be modified. (mat)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5536 ORDER from Federal Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #5477 filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. CCA # 2018-1096 and 2018-1086 8:10-ml-02151-JVS-FMO. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED THAT: The above-captioned matters and all filings are transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. ISSUED AS A MANDATE: February 21, 2018(mat) Modified on 2/26/2018 (mat).
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5535 ORDER from Federal Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #5477 filed byplaintiff Joyce D Richard. CCA # 2018-1086 and 2018-1096 on case 8:16-cv-01059-JVS-E. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED THAT: The above-captioned matters and all filings are transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. ISSUED AS A MANDATE: February 21, 2018(mat) Modified on 2/26/2018 (mat).
February 15, 2018 Filing 5534 REQUEST for Removal of E-Mail CM/ECF Notifications. filed by Third Party Sean Kane. (Markowitz, Juliet)
February 15, 2018 Filing 5532 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5533 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal (FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)) #5530 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
February 14, 2018 Filing 5531 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay (Formally Confirm Termination of Stay and for Entry of a Case Management Order) filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/19/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DLA's 1/12/18 Email to PL, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ayers, David)
February 12, 2018 Filing 5530 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5529 ORDER Granting Toyota's Application to FIle Plaintiff Maria Getzler's Petition for Approval of Settlement Under Seal #5526 by Judge James V. Selna: The Application to file the following under seal is GRANTED: For plaintiff's Petition for approval of confidential settlement: p. 3:7, which contains the confidential settlement amount. See document for further information. (lwag)
January 22, 2018 Filing 5528 Toyota's Proof of Service of Civil Minutes-General re: Status Conference - optional html form,,, #5525 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Ayers, David)
January 19, 2018 Filing 5527 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Petition to Approve Settlement under seal #5526 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 19, 2018 Filing 5526 APPLICATION to file document Petition to Approve Settlement under seal filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Redacted Document)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 17, 2018 Filing 5525 MINUTES RE: Telephonic Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and any issues, as well as remaining cases certified for trial. The Court ORDERS counsel/parties in the SACV 10-01543: Beverly Ifergan v. Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., et al. to meet, confer and submit, within 45 days, a case management order. The Court and counsel confer regarding SACV13-00916: Fernando Lopez-Llanos v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al. and the defendants Motion for Contempt filed on January 16, 2018 at Docket No. 65.The Court ORDERS the motion hearing continued from March 12, 2018 to March 21, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. The Court sets a further Telephonic Status Conference for Wednesday, April 25, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5524 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal (FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #5522 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
January 16, 2018 Filing 5523 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Contempt against Plaintiff filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/12/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A - 12-15-17 Letter to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Don Marshall, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ayers, David)
January 12, 2018 Filing 5522 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 11, 2018 Filing 5521 CERTIFICATION re ISP filed by Settlement Special Master. (lwag)
January 10, 2018 Filing 5520 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5519 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Order to Show Cause and Remedies by Judge James V. Selna: The Court orders Lopez-Llanos to show cause in writing within twenty dayswhy he should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with the Courts Order of January 17, 2017. Within ten days, Toyota shall file a memorandum of points and authorities regarding proposed remedies. In his response to the Order to Show Cause, Lopez-Llanos may address the proposed remedies. See document for further information. (lwag)
January 2, 2018 Filing 5518 NOTICE of Decision: by Other Court Relating to Status of Bankruptcy filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Order Granting Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay, #2 Exhibit B - Opinion and Order, Bankruptcy Case Dkt No 167)(Ayers, David)
December 13, 2017 Filing 5517 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5516 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal (FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #5515 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudiceas to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms o the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
December 12, 2017 Filing 5515 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 1(a)(1)(A)(ii)) filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5514 ORDER Granting Toyota Defendants' Motion to Compel #5487 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff shall provide written responses and responsive documents to the Toyota Defendants' written discovery demands (see Dckt. No. 5505, Galvin Declaration, Exs. E,f) on or before January 12, 2018; and Within 10 days, Plaintiff shall provide dates when he can be available for his deposition in the next 90 days and appear for his deposition on or before March 2, 2018. See document for further dates and information. (lwag)
December 11, 2017 Filing 5513 MINUTES RE: Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Discovery Obligations (Fld 10-30-17) held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel for defendants makes his appearance. The Court notes that plaintiff did not file a response to the motion, nor does he make and appearance today.The Court GRANTS the defendants motion and rules in accordance with the tentative ruling which is delineated in a separate signed order of the Court. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
December 8, 2017 Filing 5512 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (G-120),, #5511 . The following error(s) was found: INCORRECT FORM FILED. PLEASE USE THE G-120 (TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM), FOUND ON COURTS WEBSITE WWW.CACD.USCOURTS.GOV You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2017 Filing 5511 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 18-1086, as to Appellees Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact David L. Ayers at dayers@watkinseager.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Ayers, David)
December 8, 2017 Filing 5510 NOTICE Of Filing of Administrative Declaration filed by Economic Loss Plaintiffs Kathleen Atwater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Lara Jarjoura Regarding Status of Distribution))(Berman, Steve)
December 7, 2017 Filing 5509 SEALED DOCUMENT: Order. (lwag)
December 7, 2017 Filing 5508 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9-18-17 1:37 p.m re Transcript #5507 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Seffens, Sharon) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 7, 2017 Filing 5507 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9-18-17 1:37 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number sseffens@earthlink.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2018. (Seffens, Sharon)
December 1, 2017 Filing 5506 SEALED DOCUMENT Petition for Approval of Settlement re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #5503 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
December 1, 2017 Filing 5505 DECLARATION of Vincent Galvin in support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Discovery Obligations #5487 to Comply with November 28, 2017 Minute Order and Proposed Order filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5504 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Requesting Further Data Regarding Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery #5487 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court requests that Toyota provide the following as expeditiously as possible: (see document for details). (dro)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5503 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting #5500 APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal. (see document for details). (dro)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5502 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5499 (re SACV12-00123 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
November 17, 2017 Filing 5501 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #5500 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document)(Galvin, Vincent)
November 17, 2017 Filing 5500 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Redacted Document)(Galvin, Vincent)
November 17, 2017 Filing 5499 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
November 15, 2017 Filing 5498 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
November 13, 2017 Filing 5497 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Appellees Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. re #5477 (Ayers, David)
November 7, 2017 Filing 5496 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Remand Record #5467 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PR Docket)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
November 6, 2017 Filing 5495 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Robert A Brundage attorney for Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Changing firm name to Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP and address to One Market Street, Spear Street Tower, San Francisco, CA 94105. Filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Brundage, Robert)
November 4, 2017 Filing 5494 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Notice of Appearance #5493 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Notice of Appearance and Certificate of Interest served on November 4, 2017. (Richard, Joyce)
November 4, 2017 Filing 5493 NOTICE of Appearance (Richard, Joyce)
October 31, 2017 Filing 5492 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Notice (Other), #5491 served on 10/31/2017. (Richard, Joyce)
October 31, 2017 Filing 5491 NOTICE Form 22. Transcript Purchase Order filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Attachments: #1 Signed Application Fed. Cir. case "18-1096" Form 22 copies, #2 Signed Application Fed. Cir. case "18-1086" Form 22 copies)(Richard, Joyce)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5489 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal (FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #5486 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudiceas to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties settlement agreement. (lwag)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5488 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal (FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #5485 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties settlement agreement. (lwag)
October 30, 2017 Filing 5487 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Discovery Obligations filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Galvin, Vincent)
October 30, 2017 Filing 5486 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by plaintiffs/defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
October 30, 2017 Filing 5485 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by plaintiff/defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
October 26, 2017 Filing 5484 NOTIFICATION from Federal Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-1086 assigned to Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals #5477 as to Plaintiff Joyce D Richard. [Appeal Number was open for this MDL case.] (mat)
October 25, 2017 Filing 5483 NOTIFICATION from Federal Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-1096 assigned to Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals #5477 . (mat)
October 23, 2017 Filing 5490 CORRECTED NOTIFICATION from Federal Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-1086 assigned to Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals #5477 as to plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (mat)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5482 ORDER on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis #5477 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has considered the motion and the motion is DENIED. The court certifies that the proposed appeal is not taken in good faith under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) and is frivolous, without merit and does not present a substantial question within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 753(f). (lwag)
October 23, 2017 Filing 5481 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Ryder Wentz counsel for Defendant KW Real Estate Akron Co., LLC. Amy Ryder Wentz is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants KW Real Estate, Akron Co., LLC and Friedkin Companies, Inc. Amy Ryder Wentz. (Wentz, Amy)
October 23, 2017 Filing 5480 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bonita L. Kristan counsel for Defendant KW Real Estate Akron Co., LLC. Bonita L. Kristan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney for KW Real Estate, Akron Co.,LLC and Friedkin Companies, Inc. Bonita L. Kristan. (Kristan, Bonita)
October 19, 2017 Filing 5479 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anna L Knafo counsel for Plaintiff Patricia Carol Gardner. Anna Lisa Knafo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Patricia Carol Gardner. (Knafo, Anna)
October 19, 2017 TRANSMISSION of the Notice of Appeal, Certificate of Service, Docket Sheet, Judgment and or order e-mailed to the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re: Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals #5477 (mat)
October 18, 2017 Filing 5478 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals #5477 served on 10/18/2017. (Richard, Joyce)
October 18, 2017 Filing 5477 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. Appeal of Motion Hearing,,, #5470 . (Appeal Fee - In forma pauperis status granted on 12/10/2015). (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Richard, Joyce)
October 10, 2017 Filing 5476 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (SIP) held before Judge James V. Selna: Case Management Conference on Cases Certified for Trial SACV 10-01375: Lisa A. Labar v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al; SACV 11-01073: Sang Seok Na v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al; and SACV 11-00415 JVS: Lavergne Short, et al. v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc., et al. Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and any issues, as well as remaining cases certified for trial. The Court sets a further Telephonic Status Conference for Wednesday, January 17, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (lwag)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5475 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #2388 filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. CCA # 12-55659. Appellants unopposed motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. The parties shall each bear its own fees and costs on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as the mandate of this court. (shb)
October 3, 2017 Filing 5474 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
September 28, 2017 Filing 5473 STATUS REPORT OF THE RICHARD CASE IN THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
September 27, 2017 Filing 5472 CERTIFICATE OF ISP COMPLETION (Re: SACV10-01543 JVS (FMOx). (dro)
September 22, 2017 Filing 5471 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Enforce Settlement. Defendants Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., and Toyota Motor Corporation (collectively "Toyota") move to enforce its settlement agreement with pro se Plaintiff Sunil George. Docket No. 20. The motion is unopposed. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Toyota's motion to enforce. Additionally, the Court vacates the hearing on the motion scheduled for September 25, 2017 re #5460 . (mba)
September 20, 2017 Filing 5469 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5468 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna denying as moot #5467 MOTION to Remand. (see document for details). (dro) Modified on 9/19/2017 (dro).
September 18, 2017 Filing 5470 MINUTES OF Plaintiff Joyce Richard's Affidavit of Errata and Correction of Court Record and Request for Judicial Notice Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and parties make their appearances. The Court's tentative ruling has been issued. The Court reviews the tentative with Ms. Richard. The parties state their positions. The Court STAYS the consideration of the Plaintiff's Affidavit until completion of the Intensive Settlement Process ("ISP") and rules in accordance with the tentative ruling as follows. The Court further notes that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint is also stayed until completion of the ISP. Accordingly, the Court stays consideration of Richards Affidavit of Errata and RJN until the Settlement Special Master certifies that the parties have completed the requirements of the ISP. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (mba)
September 18, 2017 Filing 5467 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Remand Record filed by plaintiff Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
September 11, 2017 Filing 5466 REPLY FURTHER SUPPORT SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #5458 #5460 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
September 7, 2017 Filing 5465 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard S Johnson counsel for Plaintiffs Sylvia Gausch, Wilma Herrera, Carolina Salvador and Edgardo Soliman. Richard S. Johnson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Wilma Herrera, et al. (lt)
September 1, 2017 Filing 5464 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Reply,,,, #5463 served on 09/01/2017. (Richard, Joyce)
September 1, 2017 Filing 5463 REPLY filed by Plaintiff Joyce D Richard to Request for Judicial Notice,,,,, #5449 , Affidavit,,,, #5447 Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Affidavit of Errata & Correction and Request for Judicial Notice that are due Pursuant to ECF No. 74/MDL ECF No. 5451 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Rough Proposed Order Allowing Affidavit & Granting Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Court Dpty 08/31/2017 email directing Plaintiff to file extension request in CM/ECF; Plaintiffs 08/31/2017 Reply extension emailed request to Court Dpty; 08/15/2017 copied email of court reviewing Defendants email to Court Dpty for an extension; Defendants 08/15/2017 email to Court Dpty saying Affidavit and Request for Judicial Notice filings were one motion to allow Defendants hearing, response, and an extension for response; Courts granted hearing, response, and extension for the Defendants without their filing in CM/ECF (Case); Courts granted hearing, response, and extension for the Defendants without their filing in CM/ECF (MDL))(Richard, Joyce)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5462 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal (FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #5461 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties settlement agreement. (lwag)
August 31, 2017 Filing 5461 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
August 25, 2017 Filing 5460 SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #5458 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5459 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal (FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #5453 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5458 ORDER Granting Toyota's Application to File Motion to Enfoce Settlement and Release and Related Documetns Under Seal #5454 by Judge James V. Selna: The application to file the following documents under seal is GRANTED: For Toyota's Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Release ("Motion to Enforce"); a. Pg. 2: 18 to 3:1; For Declaration Of Kelly DAuria in Support of Toyota's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Release ("Declaration"); Settlement Agreement and Release sent to Plaintiffs counsel on February 10, 2016; and For any opposition or reply memoranda: Any direct references or quotations of the terms of the Settlement Agreement and Release. (lwag)
August 22, 2017 Filing 5457 Proof of service re: Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #5455 , APPLICATION to file document Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement under seal #5454 (Galvin, Vincent)
August 22, 2017 Filing 5456 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales Corporation, U.S.A., Inc.to Request for Judicial Notice,,,,, #5449 , Affidavit,,,, #5447 (Ayers, David)
August 22, 2017 Filing 5455 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement under seal #5454 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document)(Galvin, Vincent)
August 22, 2017 Filing 5454 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement under seal filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Redacted Document)(Galvin, Vincent)
August 22, 2017 Filing 5453 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
August 15, 2017 Filing 5452 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by David C Wright attorney for Plaintiffs Phillip R. King, Phillip R. King. Changing firm name to McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP and address to 3281 East Guasti Road, Suite 100, Ontario, California 91761. Filed by Plaintiffs Phillip R. King, Phillip R. King. (Wright, David)
August 15, 2017 Filing 5451 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court hereby sets a hearing on Plaintiff Joyce Richard's Affidavit of Errata and Correction of Court Record #5447 and Request for Judicial Notice #5449 for MONDAY, 9/18/2017 at 1:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. Defendants' shall file any opposition not later than 8/22/2017. Plaintiff shall file any reply to the defendants' opposition by 9/1/2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 11, 2017 Filing 5450 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Request for Judicial Notice,,,,, #5449 served on 04/11/2017. (Richard, Joyce)
August 11, 2017 Filing 5449 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION OF COURT RECORD PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a), FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT, AND PRIVACY ACT (MDL 2151 ECF NO. 5447) filed by Plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected G-92, as manually submitted to the Clerk with corrected CDROM for the item referenced on line 10 of ECF 61, #2 Exhibit Certified Judgment with Opinion Excerpt (Paice v. Toyota Case 2:04-cv-211, E.D.TX Aug. 2006), Certified Federal Circuit ruling excerpt (Paice v. Toyota, 504 F.3d 1293 (2007)), denied writ of certiorari (Paice v. Toyota, 533 U.S. 1032, 171 L.Ed.2d 230, U.S. International Trade Commission Order No. 6 and Order No. 12 excerpts (In the Matter of Certain Hybrid Electric Vehicles and Components thereof Inv. No. 337-TA-688), #3 Exhibit 10/01/2002 Trademark Official Gazette Page 204, 05/25/2004 dated Principal Register Trademark Reg. No. 2,846,052, 05/25/2004 dated Principal Register Trademark Reg. No. 2,846,150, subject 2009 Prius images, documentation, registration, identification plate, #4 Exhibit "counterfeit" definition from Webster's New World College Dictionary (1999), page 332)(Richard, Joyce)
August 11, 2017 Filing 5448 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Affidavit,,,, #5447 served on 04/11/2017. (Richard, Joyce)
August 11, 2017 Filing 5447 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Joyce D Richard re Motion Related Document, #5353 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06),, #5438 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED #5330 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06),, #5439 , Notice (Other) #5361 PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION OF COURT RECORD PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a), FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT, AND PRIVACY ACT filed by Plaintiff Joyce D Richard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Stipulation, "filed" CDROM clarification email, #2 Exhibit ECF 63, Plaintiff's CM/ECF Log, CM/ECF Tutorial Page, filed Forms (2) CV-005, NEFs (2) of orders granting CM/ECF Application, Forms (2) G-80, #3 Exhibit Form G-123 page 2, MDL 2151 NEF for ECF 5332 showing Plaintiff's USPS address for service, Plaintiff's 04/05/2017 dated email about Defendants' lack of service and two responses, filings to MDL 2151 on 03/02/2017, #4 Exhibit JPML Transfer Order for this case as filed on 06/02/2017 in MDL 2151)(Richard, Joyce)
August 11, 2017 Filing 5446 Joint STIPULATION for Order JOINT STIPULATION OF THE CONTENTS OF THE RECORD TO BE REMANDED filed by plaintiff Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership.(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
August 10, 2017 Filing 5445 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Sylvia Godfrey, upon Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/4/2017; Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/4/2017; Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/4/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Walburg, Todd)
August 10, 2017 Filing 5444 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Stefanie Bradley, re Notice of Change of Address #5443 served on 08/10/2017. (Carpenter, Todd)
August 10, 2017 Filing 5443 NOTICE of Change of address by Todd D Carpenter attorney for Plaintiff Stefanie Bradley. Changing attorneys address to 1350 Columbia Street, Ste. 603, San Diego, CA 92101. Filed by Plaintiff Stefanie Bradley. (Carpenter, Todd)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5442 JOINT REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge James V. Selna re: #5441 REQUEST for Order (SACV11-01073 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
August 8, 2017 Filing 5441 Joint REQUEST for Order for Joint Proposed Revised Case Management Order filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Galvin, Vincent)
August 8, 2017 Filing 5440 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
July 28, 2017 Filing 5439 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Eric F Gladbach counsel for Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Changing Firm and Address to King & Spalding LLP, 1185 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10036. Changing email and fax number to egladbach@kslaw.com and fax. no. 212-556-2222. Filed by Defendant Toyota Defendants. (Gladbach, Eric)
July 28, 2017 Filing 5438 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney John P Hooper counsel for Defendants Akio Toyoda, Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Changing Firm and Address to King & Spalding LLP, 1185 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10036. Changing email and fax number to jhopper@kslaw.com and fax. no. 212-556-2222. Filed by defendants Toyota Defendants. (Hooper, John)
July 21, 2017 Filing 5437 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation (Ayers, David)
July 21, 2017 Filing 5436 AFFIDAVIT ANSWER AND DEFENSES [Individual No. 8:17-cv-1054] filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation (Ayers, David)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5435 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal (FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #5434 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties settlement agreement. (lwag)
July 18, 2017 Filing 5434 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
July 14, 2017 Filing 5433 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
July 12, 2017 Filing 5432 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Laurie Rood, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Ayers, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blair, Robin)
July 12, 2017 Filing 5431 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lynda F. Gill, upon Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation served on 7/12/2017, answer due 8/2/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Ayers, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blair, Robin)
July 12, 2017 Filing 5430 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Lawrence Ayers on behalf of Defendants Gulf States Toyota, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Attorney David Lawrence Ayers added to party Gulf States Toyota, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Lawrence Ayers added to party Gulf States Toyota, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ayers, David)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5429 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5428 by Judge James V. Selna (Re: SACV16-01650 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
July 11, 2017 Filing 5428 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by Defendant/Plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
June 26, 2017 Filing 5427 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error case was closed. The case has been corrected and re-opened Re: Transferring MDL Case #5426 (twdb)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5425 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation of Dismissal #5424 ( Re: SACV10-01991 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
June 22, 2017 Filing 5424 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
June 19, 2017 Filing 5421 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2151, that the actions listed on the attached schedule be remanded to their respective transferor courts. Case Number 3:11-cv-01478 remanded to USDC, District of Puerto Rico. (dro)
June 16, 2017 Filing 5426 Conditional Transfer Order - 92 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2151, transferring case to USDC, Central District of California and assigned to Honorable James V. Selna. Modified on 6/26/2017 (twdb).
June 16, 2017 Filing 5422 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2151, that the actions listed on the attached schedule be remanded to their respective transferor courts. Case Number 5:12-cv-01175 remanded to USDC, Northern District of Ohio. (dro)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5420 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation of Dismissal #5419 (Re: SACV13-00901 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
June 15, 2017 Filing 5419 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by plaintiffs/defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
June 13, 2017 Filing 5423 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and any issues. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of cases Certified for Trial: SACV 10-01375 JVS: Lisa A. Labar v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al - The Court GRANTS counsels request that this case be placed back in the ISP process. SACV 11-01073 JVS: Sang Seok Na v. Toyota - Discovery is proceeding as provided for in the case management order. SACV 11-00415 JVS: Lavergne Short, et al. v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc., et al. - Counselthat this case is proceeding in the ISP process. The Court VACATES the Status Conference Regarding Production of Documents set for June 19, 2017. The Court sets a further Status Conference for Tuesday, October 10, 2017 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5418 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation of Dismissal #5413 (Re: CV17-03428 JVS (Ex) (see document for details). (dro)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5417 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation of Dismissal #5414 . (Re: CV17-03433 JVS (Ex) (see document for details). (dro)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5416 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation of Dismissal #5412 (Re: CV17-03434 JVS (Ex). (see document for details). (dro)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5415 ORDER Allowing for Removal of Source Code and Source Code Related Material From the Secure Facility by Judge James V. Selna, re Stipulation for Order #5408 . (see document for details). (dro)
June 12, 2017 Filing 5414 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
June 12, 2017 Filing 5413 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
June 12, 2017 Filing 5412 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
June 12, 2017 Filing 5411 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ISP filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
June 9, 2017 Filing 5410 NOTICE JOINT NOTICE OF PROCEEDING IN ISP Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
June 9, 2017 Filing 5409 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Declaration filed by Economic Loss Plaintiffs Kathleen Atwater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Lara Jarjoura Regarding Status of Distribution))(Berman, Steve)
June 8, 2017 Filing 5408 Joint STIPULATION for Order Allowing for Removal of Source Code and Source Code Related Material From the Secure Facility filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
June 7, 2017 Filing 5407 SEALED DOCUMENT: ORDER Approving Petition to Approve the Compromise of Pending Action filed by Plaintiff X.V. (lwag)
June 7, 2017 Filing 5406 SEALED DOCUMENT: ORDER Approving Petition to Approve the Compromise of Pending Action filed by Plaintiff K.I. (lwag)
June 7, 2017 Filing 5405 SEALED DOCUMENT: ORDER Approving Petition to Approve the Compromise of Pending Action filed by Plaintiff J.D. (lwag)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5404 (SEALED DOCUMENT) - ORDER APPROVING INITIAL DISBURSEMENT FROM THE MDL PERSONAL INJURY/WRONGFUL DEATH COMMON BENEFIT FUND - UNDER SEAL by Judge James V. Selna. (dro)
June 6, 2017 Filing 5403 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) SUGGESTION FOR REMAND (Re: SACV11-1094 JVS (FMOx) by Judge James V. Selna. The Court finds that there are no remaining matters which would benefit from this Court's management of the case or subject matter expertise (e.g., Daubert and summary judgment motions). The parties have previously agreed that the transferor court should conduct the Rule 16 Pretrial Conference. Therefore, the Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico. (see document for details). (dro)
June 6, 2017 Filing 5402 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5401 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting #5346 for Summary Judgment. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Toyota's motion, but allows it to withdraw the portion of the motion directed to the design default claim. IT IS SO ORDERED. (see document for details). (dro)
May 26, 2017 Filing 5400 NOTICE ALVAREZ-CABRERAS SUBMITTAL OF CERTIFIED TRANSLATION OF CASE CITATION IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO TOYOTAS MOTION FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION filed by Plaintiff Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translation)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
May 25, 2017 Filing 5399 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Documents for In Camera Review Pursuant to the Court's May 1, 2017 Order Regarding the Personal Injury/Wrongful Death Common Benefit Fund and Plan for Interim Disbursement re Status Conference, #5385 (Snyder, Eric)
May 22, 2017 Filing 5398 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Toyota's Motion for Partial Withdrawal of MSJ filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5397 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION TO FILE PETITIONTO APPROVE THE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION AND RELATED DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (Re: CV17-03438 JVS (Ex). (see document for details). (dro)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5396 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION TO FILE PETITIONTO APPROVE THE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION AND RELATED DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (Re: CV17-03433 JVS (Ex). (see document for details). (dro) Modified on 5/18/2017 (dro).
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5395 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION TO FILE PETITIONTO APPROVE THE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION AND RELATED DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (Re: CV17-03434 JVS (Ex). (see document for details). (dro) Modified on 5/18/2017 (dro).
May 17, 2017 Filing 5394 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
May 15, 2017 Filing 5393 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Toyota Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. regarding Partial Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment on Design Defect Claims (Ayers, David)
May 15, 2017 Filing 5392 MINUTES OF Hearing on Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiffs Claims Should not be Dismissed held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and parties listed above make their appearances. The Court and parties confer. The Court continues the telephonic hearing on the Order to Show Cause referenced above to Monday, June 19, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
May 15, 2017 Filing 5391 NOTICE OF STATUS OF COMPLIANCE WITH INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROGRAM filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Gladbach, Eric)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5390 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on the Joint Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Deadlines and Trial #5389 . By agreement of the parties, and good cause having been shown, the Court orders as follows: 1. All pretrial deadlines are hereby continued, to be reset by the trial judge; and, 2. The August 21, 2017, trial is continued, to be reset by the trial judge. (dro)
May 12, 2017 Filing 5389 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines and Trial filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Ayers, David)
May 9, 2017 Filing 5388 PLAINTIFFS SUBMITTAL OF COMPLETE CITATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All of Plaintiffs' Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support #5346 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
May 9, 2017 Filing 5385 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Common Benefit Fund and Interim Proposed Plan of Distribution held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances telephonically. Court and counsel confer. The Court orders the time for submitting backup for fee requests and expenses will be extended by 15 days. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5387 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Daubert Motions #5344 #5345 by Judge James V. Selna: The Motion is granted to the extent that Shaker opines on the basis of the presence of lactate and low levels of hematocrit and hemoglobin In all other respects, the Motion is denied. The Court reiterates the Ninth Circuits cautionary view because it is particularly apt here: Shaky but admissible evidence is to be attacked by cross examination, contrary evidence,and attention to the burden of proof, not exclusion. Primiano, 598 F.3d at 564. See document for further information. (lwag)
May 8, 2017 Filing 5386 MINUTES RE: Motion to Exclude #5344 ; Motion to Exclude #5345 and Motion for Summary Judgment #5346 held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Courts tentative ruling is issued. Court and counsel confer regarding the Motion for Summary Judgment. Counsel to provideappropriate law allowing the withdrawal of the motion within 7 days. Counsel argue the motions to exclude. Motions taken under submission. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
May 8, 2017 Filing 5384 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: WHY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED #5341 FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S APRIL 19, 2017 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly D'Auria, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration)(Hooper, John)
May 2, 2017 Filing 5383 Letter from Laverne Short (lwag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2017: #1 Under Seal Exhibit) (lwag).
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5382 ORDER Re: Personal Injury / Wrongful Death Common Benefit Fund and Plan For Interim Disbursement by Judge James V. Selna: The Court will hold a hearing on the interim proposed plan of distribution on June 13, 2017 at 8:00 a.m. See document for further information. (lwag)
April 28, 2017 Filing 5381 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All of Plaintiffs' Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support #5346 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gonzalez Depo, #2 Exhibit B - Vega Gonzalez Depo, #3 Exhibit C - NHTSA & NTSB papers)(Ayers, David)
April 28, 2017 Filing 5380 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Adel Shaker ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support #5345 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Shaker Depo, #2 Exhibit B - 6-18-10 Lab Inquiry Report, #3 Exhibit C - Marco Vega Gonzalez Depo)(Ayers, David)
April 28, 2017 Filing 5379 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Otto R. Gonzalez-Blanco ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support #5344 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NHTSA & NTSB papers)(Ayers, David)
April 25, 2017 Filing 5378 MINUTES OF Status Conference re the Common Benefit Fund held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court directs counsel to file an Amended/Updated Order regarding the Common Benefit Fund. The Court sets a further Status Conference regarding the Common Benefit Fund issues on 5/9/2017 at 8:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (kt)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5377 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Extending Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause and Continuing Hearing on Order to Show Cause by Judge James V. Selna. The Court is cognizant that although they originally had counsel, the plaintiffs are now proceeding in pro per. For that reason, the Court extends the time for plaintiffs to file a response to the Order to Show Cause and/or supply a demand and completes negotiations materials to May 1, 2017. Toyota may reply no later than May 8, 2017. The hearing is continued to May 15, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. The Court strongly admonishes the plaintiffs that if they fail tp respond and/or comply with the requirements of the ISP, THE CASE WILL BE DISMISSED. (see document for details). (dro)
April 18, 2017 Filing 5376 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Joel Allen. correcting Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #5375 (Snyder, Eric)
April 18, 2017 Filing 5375 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Joel Allen (Snyder, Eric)
April 18, 2017 Filing 5374 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Response, #5373 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 59 in case 8:16-cv-01059-JVS-E) served on April 18, 2017. (Richard, Joyce)
April 18, 2017 Filing 5373 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Joyce D Richardto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #5356 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 59 in case 8:16-cv-01059-JVS-E)) (Attachments: #1 Counsels (ECF Nos. 52 and 53) email autoresponse, #2 Special Master and Counsels ISP Delivery Confirmation(s))(Richard, Joyce)
April 18, 2017 Filing 5372 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: WHY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED #5341 FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S MARCH 29, 2017 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly D'Auria)(Hooper, John)
April 14, 2017 Filing 5371 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Adel Shaker ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support #5345 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
April 14, 2017 Filing 5370 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All of Plaintiffs' Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support #5346 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1 App I, #3 Exhibit 1 App I pt 2, #4 Exhibit 1 App II, #5 Exhibit 1 App II pt 2, #6 Exhibit 1 App II pt 3, #7 Exhibit 1 App II pt 4, #8 Exhibit 1 App III, #9 Exhibit 1 App III pt 2, #10 Exhibit 1 App III pt 3, #11 Exhibit 1 App IV, #12 Exhibit 1 App IV pt 2, #13 Exhibit 2, #14 Exhibit 3, #15 Exhibit 4, #16 Exhibit 5, #17 Exhibit 6, #18 Exhibit 7, #19 Exhibit 8, #20 Exhibit 9, #21 Exhibit 10, #22 Exhibit 11, #23 Exhibit 12)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
April 14, 2017 Filing 5369 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All of Plaintiffs' Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support #5346 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
April 12, 2017 Filing 5368 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, having considered the plaintiffs request for an extension of time #5362 , the defendants response #5364 and the plaintiffs reply #5365 , hereby GRANTS the plaintiffs request for an extension of time, to 4/14/17, to file oppositions to the defendants Daubert motions and motion for summary judgment. The defendants time to file a reply is extended commiserately.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 11, 2017 Filing 5367 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Otto R. Gonzalez-Blanco ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support #5344 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Appendix I, #5 Appendix I pt 2, #6 Appendix II, #7 Appendix II pt 2, #8 Appendix II pt 3, #9 Appendix II pt 4, #10 Appendix III, #11 Appendix III pt 2, #12 Appendix III pt 3, #13 Appendix IV, #14 Appendix IV pt 2, #15 Exhibit 4, #16 Exhibit 5)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
April 11, 2017 Filing 5366 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Opposition filed by plaintiff Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. Motion set for hearing on 5/8/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
April 11, 2017 Filing 5365 REPLY in opposition filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
April 11, 2017 Filing 5364 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions #5362 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Exchanges)(Ayers, David)
April 11, 2017 Filing 5363 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, having reviewed the Plaintiff Luis Alvarez Cabreras' MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions #5362 filed on 4/10/2017 at approximately 6:20 PM, hereby DEEMS the Motion an Ex Parte Application and ORDERS that any opposition to the application be filed not later than 24 hours from service of the motion/ex parte application. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 10, 2017 Filing 5362 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions filed by Plaintiff Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. Motion set for hearing on 5/8/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
April 7, 2017 Filing 5361 NOTICE OF TOYOTA DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEYS INVOLVED IN THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
March 31, 2017 Filing 5357 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Suggestion of Remand by Judge James V. Selna. The Court finds: 1. All claims against Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation (collectively "Toyota") have been resolved, and by virtue of the Court's finding that the settlement with Toyota was made in good faith under California Code of Civil Procedure Code 877.6 (SACV 13-306, Docket No. 158), no further claims on any nature may be asserted against Toyota. 2. The resolution of the remaining claims would not benefit from this Court's management of the case, and could be more appropriately be handled by the transferor court. Therefore, the Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the case be remanded to the United States District Court for the Norther District of Ohio, Eastern Division. (see document for details). (dro)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5356 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Re: Order to Show Cause by Judge James V. Selna. The Court extends the time for Richard to comply with the ISP until April 18, 2017. Specifically, she shall submit to the Special Master her ISP Submission, Confidentiality Statement, Completed Negotiation Spreadsheet, and Demand. FAILURE TO COMPLY WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THE CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Separately, the Court denies without prejudice Richards ex parte application which she tendered for filing prior to the filing of her response. (see document for details). (dro)
March 30, 2017 Filing 5354 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 30, 2017 Filing 5353 REPLY OF TOYOTA DEFENDANTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S "EX PARTE APPLICATION" re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED #5330 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5355 AMENDED ORDER (as to Date of hearing only) by Judge James V. Selna. Plaintiffs shall respond to this Order on or before April 10, 2017, and Defendants may file a reply on or before April 17, 2017. The Court will conduct a hearing on May 1, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiffs are cautioned that should they fail to respond, the case will likely be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b), 37(b)(2)(C) and 16(f). IT IS SO ORDERED. (see document for details). (dro)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5352 ORDER #5341 by Judge James V. Selna: For the reasons stated in Defendants Memorandum in Support, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Order to Show Cause why Plaintiffs claims should not be dismissed is hereby GRANTED.Plaintiffs shall respond to this Order on or before April 10, 2017, andDefendants may file a reply on or before April 17, 2017. The Court will conduct a hearing on April 29, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiffs are cautioned that should they fail to respond, the case will likely be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 41(b), 37(b)(2)(C) and 16(f). (lwag)
March 27, 2017 Filing 5351 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard, re Response,, #5350 served on March 24, 2017. (Richard, Joyce)
March 24, 2017 Filing 5350 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Joyce D Richardto Order on Motion for Order,, #5339 The Court Ordered Special Settlement Master never sent the Plaintiff an "initial informational package on the ISP." (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 12/14/2016 Dated email of ISP Negotiation Materials from Jessica K. Shook of Reed Smith, #3 Exhibit 03/20/2017 Dated USPS Receipt/Estimated Delivery Time, Tracking, and Delivery Information, #4 Exhibit 01/23/2017 Dated Louisiana Letterhead Correspondence inside a 01/24/2017 New York Postmarked Envelope, #5 Proposed Order Proposes to Discharge Order (ECF No. 5339) to Dismiss this Case and Grant 30-days Extension of Time)(Richard, Joyce)
March 22, 2017 Filing 5360 (SEALED DOCUMENT ) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief From Stay and Formatting filed by plaintiff Joyce D Richard. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Proposed Order) (dro) Modified on 4/3/2017 (dro).
March 22, 2017 Filing 5359 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Joyce D Richard of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application Re: Stay Formatting. (see document for details). (dro) (Main Document 5359 replaced on 4/10/2017) (dro).
March 22, 2017 Filing 5358 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Joyce D Richard of Digital Video Disc (DVD). (see document for details). (dro) (Main Document 5358 replaced on 4/3/2017) (dro).
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5349 UNDER SEAL DOCUMENT: ORDER Re: Personal Injury/Wrongful Death Common Benefit Fund and Plan for Interim Disbursement by Judge James V. Selna. (lwag)
March 20, 2017 Filing 5347 STATEMENT Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All of Plaintiffs' Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support #5346 . (Ayers, David)
March 20, 2017 Filing 5346 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All of Plaintiffs' Claims ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/8/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Depo of Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, #2 Exhibit B - Police Accident Report, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Depo of Gonzalez-Blanco, #5 Exhibit E - Report of Gonzalez-Blanco, #6 Exhibit F - Lab Specimen Inquiry Report, #7 Exhibit G - Rebuttal Report of Simmons, #8 Exhibit H - Dept. of Health Tox Analysis Report, #9 Exhibit I - Depo of Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, #10 Exhibit J - Depo of Sandra Perez-Mendez, #11 Exhibit K - Plaintiffs' Amended Expert Disclosures, #12 Exhibit L - NASA Report, #13 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ayers, David)
March 20, 2017 Filing 5345 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Adel Shaker ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/8/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Depo of Tatiana Alvarez Perez, #2 Exhibit B - Police Accident Report, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Lab Specimen Inquiry Report, #5 Exhibit E - Simmons Report, #6 Exhibit F - Dept of Health Toxicology Report, #7 Exhibit G - Shaker Report, #8 Exhibit H - Depo of Shaker, #9 Exhibit I - Ethanol testing, #10 Exhibit J - Depo of Gilberto Cruz, #11 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ayers, David)
March 20, 2017 Filing 5344 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Otto R. Gonzalez-Blanco ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of David L. Ayers in Support filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/8/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Police Accident Report, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Lab Reports, #4 Exhibit D - Depo of Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, #5 Exhibit E - Depo of Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, #6 Exhibit F - Depo of Sandra Perez-Mendez, #7 Exhibit G - Report of Gonzalez-Blanco, #8 Exhibit H - Paper of Gonzalez-Blanco, #9 Exhibit I - Depo of Gonzalez-Blanco, #10 Exhibit J - NASA Report, #11 Exhibit K - Breen Report, #12 Exhibit L - Livernois Report, #13 Exhibit M - Walker Report, #14 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ayers, David)
March 20, 2017 Filing 5343 DISCLOSURE of Rule 26(a)(2)(A) Rebuttal Expert filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Ayers, David)
March 17, 2017 Filing 5348 UNDER SEAL DOCUMENT: REPORT on Status of the Personal Injury/Wrongful Death Common Benefit Fund and Plan for Interim Disbursement. (lwag)
March 17, 2017 Filing 5342 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING filed by Plaintiff Joel Allen. (Snyder, Eric)
March 16, 2017 Filing 5341 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: WHY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/17/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly D'Auria, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration, #19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration, #20 Exhibit 19 to Declaration, #21 Exhibit 20 to Declaration, #22 Proposed Order) (Hooper, John)
March 15, 2017 Filing 5340 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary Leah Miller counsel for Plaintiffs Tammy Huston, William Huston. Mary Leah Miller will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Mary Leah Miller is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff William and Tammy Huston. (Miller, Mary)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5339 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting #5330 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. For the reasons stated in Defendants' Memorandum in Support, it is herebyORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Order to Show Cause why Plaintiff's claimsshould not be dismissed is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to respond to this Order in writing on or before March 27,2017. Any response by Defendants shall be filed no later than April 3, 2017.Plaintiff is cautionded that if plaintiff fails to respond, the case will likely be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b), 37(b)(2)(C) and 16(f). IT IS SO ORDERED. (see document for details). (dro)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5337 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Suggestion of Remand by Judge James V. Selna. Upon stipulation, the Court has dismissed the claims of plaintiff-in-intervention Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation and the claims of plaintiff Quaid McIver against Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation. The Court believes that it should now transmit to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation a suggestion that this action be remanded to the transferor court for all further proceedings. All remaining parties are ordered to show cause in writing within fifteen days why the Court should not issue a suggestion of remand. (dro)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5336 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation of Dismissal #5334 . The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the claims for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5335 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation of Dismissal #5333 ., The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all plaintiff-in-intervention Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the claims for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
March 7, 2017 Filing 5338 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court sets a further Status Conference for Tuesday, June 13, 2017 at 8:00 a.m. (see document for details). Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
March 7, 2017 Filing 5334 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
March 7, 2017 Filing 5333 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Corporation of U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5332 ORDER Granting Application to Vacate Order #5328 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the signed order on dismissal filed on February 27, 2017 as Docket Numbers 186 (8:13-CV-00306) and 5234 (8:10ML02151) is vacated and stricken. The docket entry shall so note and shall block the document from public view. (lwag)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5331 ORDER Granting Application to Vacate Order #5329 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the signed order on dismissal filed on February 27, 2017 as Docket Numbers 185 (8:13-CV-00306) and 5235 (8:10ML02151) is vacated and stricken. The docket entry shall so note and the document shall be blocked from public view. (lwag)
March 2, 2017 Filing 5330 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/3/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of K. D'Auria, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hooper, John)
March 1, 2017 Filing 5329 APPLICATION to Vacate Order #5326 filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Galvin, Vincent)
March 1, 2017 Filing 5328 Joint APPLICATION to Vacate Order #5325 filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Galvin, Vincent)
February 28, 2017 Filing 5327 STATUS REPORT for the March 7, 2017, Case Status Conference filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12-7-16 proposed joint motion)(Ayers, David)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5326 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5323 . (see document for details). (dro)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5325 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5322 . (see document for details). (dro)
February 27, 2017 Filing 5324 STATUS REPORT Toyota PLUA- MDL Joint Status Report March 2017 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Toyota PLUA Status of ISP Chart-For JSR, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Toyota PLUA Litigation Breakdown of Remaining MDL JCCP Unresolved Cases)(Hooper, John)
February 23, 2017 Filing 5323 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
February 23, 2017 Filing 5322 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendant/plaintiff Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
February 17, 2017 Filing 5321 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Adel Shaker, MD on February 27, 2017 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5320 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna on Joint Stipulation to Continue Daubert and Dispositive Motion Deadlines #5318 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, having shown good cause, the Daubert and dispositive motion deadlines are continued as follows: Deadline to file Daubert and dispositive motions: March 20, 2017; Deadline to file oppositions to Daubert and dispositive motions: April 10, 2017; Deadline to file replies for Daubert and dispositive motions: April 24, 2017. All other deadlines in the Joint Proposed Case Management Order #34 still remain in effect. (ig)
February 16, 2017 Filing 5319 STATUS REPORT Toyota PLUA-MDL Joint Status Report February 2017 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Toyota Status of ISP Chart- For JSR- JCCP MDL)(Hooper, John)
February 15, 2017 Filing 5318 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Daubert and Dispositive Motion Deadlines filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Ayers, David)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5317 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Ayers, David)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5316 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation (Ayers, David)
February 7, 2017 Filing 5315 Conditional Transfer Order - 91 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (lwag)
February 3, 2017 Filing 5314 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Adel Shaker, MD on February 20, 2017 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
February 2, 2017 Filing 5313 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, having received, read and considered the defendant's Notice of Execution of Release and Request to Adjourn Continued Hearing #5312 , hereby DENIES Toyota Motor Corp.'s Motion to Enforce Settlement #5288 regarding plaintiff Quaid McIver and vacates the hearing set for 2/6/2017. The Court DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause to plaintiff's counsel regarding the payment of fees and costs for the defendant's appearance at the 1/23/2017 hearing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 2, 2017 Filing 5312 NOTICE filed by defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. NOTICE OF EXECUTION OF RELEASE AND REQUEST TO ADJOURN CONTINUED HEARING (Hooper, John)
February 1, 2017 Filing 5311 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Dr. Jaime Grodzinski Schwartz on February 24, 2017 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
January 24, 2017 Filing 5310 SHORT REPLY to "Toyota's Memorandum" filed by Plaintiff Fernando Lopez-Llanos (dro)
January 23, 2017 Filing 5309 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding appearances via telephone. The Court's tentative ruling is issued. The Court and counsel confer. The Court continues the hearing on this matter to February 6, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. to allow the parties to meet, confer and submit there proposal for enforcing the Letter Agreement. If a hearing is necessary on February 6, 2017, plaintiffs counsel is ordered to appear, in person, on that date at 1:30 p.m. for the hearing and to Show Cause why plaintiff's counsel should not be Ordered to pay the costs and fees of the appearance by Toyota defendant's counsel for appearing on January 23, 2017. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
January 20, 2017 Filing 5308 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5307 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting #5290 MOTION to Enforce. (see document for details). (dro)
January 17, 2017 Filing 5306 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric M Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership, Sandra Perez-Mendez (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5305 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting in part and denying in part #5277 Motion to Strike. For the reason noted above, the Court declines to strike the Shaker and Grodzinski-Schwartz designations, and orders the limited relief outlined in Section III.H. (see document for details). (dro)
January 9, 2017 Filing 5304 SHORT REPLY MOTION to MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement #5290 filed by Plaintiff Fernando Lopez-Llanos. (dro)
January 9, 2017 Filing 5303 EXHIBIT A to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement #5290 Exhibit A to Toyota's Reply Memorandum filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Galvin, Vincent)
January 9, 2017 Filing 5302 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement #5290 filed by Defendant Toyota Industries Corporation. (Attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr added to party Toyota Industries Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr added to party Toyota Industries Corporation(pty:dft))(Galvin, Vincent)
January 9, 2017 Filing 5301 SEALED REPLY RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement #5290 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #5287 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of service)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 9, 2017 Filing 5300 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement #5288 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Galvin, Vincent)
January 9, 2017 Filing 5299 SEALED REPLY RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement #5288 , Order on Motion for Leave #5286 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of service)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 5, 2017 Filing 5298 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #5294 , Notice of Appearance #5295 , Notice of Appearance #5296 , Notice of Appearance #5297 . The following error(s) was found: See 2nd Page of Notice of Appearance form. You must select a box under section II or III. Section II is to add an attorney and Section III is to remove an attorney from the case. Also, not all the forms appear to be signed and dated by the attorney. The form(s) must be signed and dated by the attorney. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
January 4, 2017 Filing 5297 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Todd A Walburg on behalf of Plaintiff Sally A. Longo (Attorney Todd A Walburg added to party Sally A. Longo(pty:pla), Attorney Todd A Walburg added to party Sally A. Longo(pty:pla))(Walburg, Todd)
January 4, 2017 Filing 5296 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Todd A Walburg on behalf of Plaintiff Joel Allen (Attorney Todd A Walburg added to party Joel Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Todd A Walburg added to party Joel Allen(pty:pla))(Walburg, Todd)
January 4, 2017 Filing 5295 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney C Brooks Cutter on behalf of Plaintiff Sally A. Longo (Attorney C Brooks Cutter added to party Sally A. Longo(pty:pla), Attorney C Brooks Cutter added to party Sally A. Longo(pty:pla))(Cutter, C)
January 4, 2017 Filing 5294 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney C Brooks Cutter on behalf of Plaintiff Joel Allen (Attorney C Brooks Cutter added to party Joel Allen(pty:pla), Attorney C Brooks Cutter added to party Joel Allen(pty:pla))(Cutter, C)
January 3, 2017 Filing 5293 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Strike Notice (Other) #5249 Plaintiffs' Untimely Expert Designation of Adel Shaker and Jaime Grodzinski Schwartz #5277 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
December 21, 2016 Filing 5292 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Notice (Other) #5249 Plaintiffs' Untimely Expert Designation of Adel Shaker and Jaime Grodzinski Schwartz #5277 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership, Michael Daly, Sandra Perez-Mendez. (Attorney Eric M Quetglas-Jordan added to party Michael Daly(pty:pla), Attorney Eric M Quetglas-Jordan added to party Michael Daly(pty:pla))(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
December 19, 2016 Filing 5291 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement #5290 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #5287 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Affidavit proof of service)(Galvin, Vincent)
December 19, 2016 Filing 5290 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order) (Galvin, Vincent)
December 19, 2016 Filing 5289 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement #5288 , Order on Motion for Leave #5286 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Galvin, Vincent)
December 19, 2016 Filing 5288 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order) (Galvin, Vincent)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5287 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting #5283 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (see document for details). (dro)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5286 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting #5280 APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal. (see document for details). (dro)
December 16, 2016 Filing 5285 DISCLOSURE of Rebuttal Expert filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Ayers, David)
December 15, 2016 Filing 5284 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Enforce Settlement under seal #5283 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Motion to enforce settlement, #2 Unredacted Document Dec of Gnocchi-Franco, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibits to D'Auria Dec, #4 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Galvin, Vincent)
December 15, 2016 Filing 5283 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Enforce Settlement under seal filed by Defendant Toyota Corporation of U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document Motion to enforce, #4 Redacted Document Dec of Gnocchi-Franco, #5 Redacted Document Exhibits to D'Auria Dec)(Galvin, Vincent)
December 15, 2016 Filing 5282 REQUEST to Withdraw NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #5261 filed by Plaintiff Christopher W. Andersen, Christopher J. Andersen, Diane Andersen, Suzanne Andersen. (Higley, Christopher)
December 15, 2016 Filing 5281 Declaration in Support of APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Dec of E. Gladbach, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibits to Gladbach Dec, #3 Unredacted Document Dec of K. D'Auria, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibits to D'Auria Dec, #5 Affidavit Proof of service)(Galvin, Vincent) Modified on 12/16/2016 (kt).
December 15, 2016 Filing 5280 APPLICATION to To file documents under seal filed by defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Memorandum, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit, #7 Declaration, #8 Exhibit) (Galvin, Vincent)
December 14, 2016 Filing 5279 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, on its own motion and to comply with Local and Federal Rule Notice Requirements, CONTINUES the Toyota Defendants' Motion to Strike #5249 Plaintiffs' Untimely Expert Designation of Adel Shaker and Jaime Grodzinski Schwartz #5277 , previously scheduled for 1/9/2017 at 1:30 PM, to TUESDAY, 1/17/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Any Opposition to the motion shall be filed not later than 12/23/2016 and any Reply shall be filed by 1/3/2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 14, 2016 Filing 5278 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Strike Notice (Other) #5249 Plaintiffs' Untimely Expert Designation of Adel Shaker and Jaime Grodzinski Schwartz #5277 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed CMO, #2 Exhibit B - Joint Stipulation to Continue, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File)(Ayers, David)
December 14, 2016 Filing 5277 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Notice (Other) #5249 Plaintiffs' Untimely Expert Designation of Adel Shaker and Jaime Grodzinski Schwartz filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ayers, David)
December 12, 2016 Filing 5276 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Otto R. Gonzalez-Blanco on (beginning) January 19, 2017 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5275 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: The Phase 1 [Dkt. No. 249], Phase 2 [Dkt. No. 1655], and Phase 3 [Dkt. No. 1726] Discovery Orders apply to this case and where appropriate scheduling reflected in those orders will be adjusted for this case since this case was not a Bellwether and some of the scheduling in those orders did not originally apply to this matter. See document for further dates and information. (lwag)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5274 SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge James V. Selna re Notice of Lodging, #5269 . Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the terms and conditions of the Protective Order and SCPO shall not exclude the Ontario action but instead shall govern the exchange of confidential and highly confidential materials and source code and source code related materials, as defined in the Protective Order and SCPO, in the Ontario action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (see document for details). (dro)
December 8, 2016 Filing 5272 NOTICE Of Filing of Administrative Declaration filed by Plaintiffs Kathleen Atwater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Lara McDermott Regarding Status of Distibution))(Berman, Steve)
December 8, 2016 Filing 5271 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Ayers, David)
December 8, 2016 Filing 5270 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales Corporation, U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
December 7, 2016 Filing 5269 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation for Protective Order #1980 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order Governing the Exchange and Handling of Confidential and Highly Confidential Materials and Source Code and Source Code Related Material)(Cabraser, Elizabeth)
December 6, 2016 Filing 5273 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and any issues. The Court directs that counsel to request Orders to Show Cause regarding the four cases that have thus far not requested conferences under the ISP, if they have not done so by the next status conference in March 2017. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of cases Certified for Trial: SACV 11-01073 JVS: Sang Seok Na v. Toyota - Case management order approved SACV 11-01094 JVS: Alvarez-Cabrera v. Toyota - Counsel to submit formal request for Judge Selna to preside (if that is their request) by the end of the first quarter of 2017. SACV 13-00306 JVS: Quaid McIver v Toyota - Case management order approved SACV 13-00367 JVS: Diane Andersen v. Toyota - Counsel report that a further settlement conference is set for December 15, 2016 and they will report to the Court on December 16, 2016 the outcome of the conference. The Court sets a further Status Conference for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (dro)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5268 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: See document for further dates and information. (lwag)
December 2, 2016 Filing 5267 JOINT REPORT ON CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REPORT filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Galvin, Vincent)
November 29, 2016 Filing 5266 STATUS REPORT for the December 6, 2016, Case Status Conference filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
November 29, 2016 Filing 5265 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
November 28, 2016 Filing 5264 OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #5261 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
November 21, 2016 Filing 5262 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court hereby sets the Plaintiffs Christopher W. Andersen, Christopher J. Andersen, Diane Andersen and Suzanne Andersen's MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #5261 for hearing on 12/19/2016 at 1:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 18, 2016 Filing 5261 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) filed by Plaintiffs Christopher W. Andersen, Christopher J. Andersen, Diane Andersen, Suzanne Andersen. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of PLs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Counsel, #3 Exhibit B - ISP Certificate, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gilchrist, Robert)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5260 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting #5256 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File. The requested extension is GRANTED. The Proposed Joint Case Management Order shall be filed by December 2, 2016. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
November 18, 2016 Filing 5259 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeff M Sbaih counsel for Plaintiffs Christopher W. Andersen, Christopher J. Andersen, Diane Andersen, Suzanne Andersen. Adding Christopher P. Higley as counsel of record for Diane, Suzanne, Christpher W, Christopher J, and Teylor for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Diane Andersen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form G-123)(Sbaih, Jeff)
November 18, 2016 Filing 5258 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zach T Bowles counsel for Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. Zach T. Bowles is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (lt)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5257 ORDER on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney by Judge James V. Selna, (re: SACV13-00306 JVS (Ex). The Court hereby orders that the request of plaintiff Quaid McIver to substitute Stanley P. Aronson and Theordore F. Scribner who are retained counsel, as attorneys of record instead of Brian R. Strange and Morvareed Z. Salehpour, is GRANTED. (dro)
November 17, 2016 Filing 5256 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Case Management Order filed by defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kliebenstein, Neil)
November 15, 2016 Filing 5263 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna (re: SACV13-00306 JVS (Ex). Cause called and counsel appear via telephone. The Court and counsel confer. The Court directs the parties to prepare and submit a stipulation setting forth the case management dates in this matter within 10 days. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5253 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5255 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: granting #5254 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (dro) (Main Document 5255 replaced on 11/15/2016) (dro).
November 9, 2016 Filing 5254 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Sang Seok Na. (SACV11-01073 JVS (FMOx). (dro)
November 9, 2016 Filing 5252 NOTICE PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE; AND AMENDED RULE 26(A)(2)(A) F.R.C.P. EXPERT DISCLOSURES filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership, Sandra Perez-Mendez. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
November 9, 2016 Filing 5249 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. Initial Expert Disclosure (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5251 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna on Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5248 , (Re: SACV16-00690 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5250 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna on Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5247 (Re: SACV12-01755 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
November 8, 2016 Filing 5248 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
November 8, 2016 Filing 5247 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5246 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna on the Joint Stipulation to Continue the Non-Expert Discovery Deadline #5244 , (SACV11-1094 JVS (FMOx). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, having shown good cause, the deadline for the completion of non-expert discovery is continued from November 11, 2016, to December 12, 2016. All other deadlines in the Joint Proposed Case Management Order [Doc. 34] still remain in effect. (dro)
November 4, 2016 Filing 5245 DISCLOSURE of Experts filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Ayers, David)
November 4, 2016 Filing 5244 Joint STIPULATION to Continue The Non-Expert Discovery Deadline from November 11, 2016 to December 12, 2016 Re: Order, #5151 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Ayers, David)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5243 ORDER to Application to Vacate Order by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the signed order on dismissal filed on October 11, 2016 as Docket Numbers 32 (8:13-CV-00901) and 5234 (8:10ML02151) is vacated and the docket entry shall so note. (lwag)
October 27, 2016 Filing 5242 Application to Vacate Order and Remove From the Court's Docket as it was Submitted in Error filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5241 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal by Judge James V. Selna (re: SACV13-00901 JVS (Ex). (see document for details). (dro)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5240 ORDER Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney #5239 by Judge James V. Selna: See document for further information. (lwag)
October 23, 2016 Filing 5239 Signed Form G-01 with unsigned Order filed by Plaintiff Sang Seok Na requesting that Robert G. Leino be relieved as attorney for plaintiff (Leino, Robert)
October 20, 2016 Filing 5238 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc... (Hooper, John)
October 20, 2016 Filing 5237 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
October 11, 2016 Filing 5236 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and counsel make their appearances via telephone. The Court and counsel confer. The Court sets a further telephonic Status Conference for November 15, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5235 **VACATED AND STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY #5331** ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5232 , Re: SACV10-00999 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro) Modified on 3/3/2017 (lwag). Modified on 3/3/2017 (lwag).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5234 **VACATED PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #5243** ORDER by Judge James V. Selna on Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5233 Re: SACV13-00901 JVS (Ex). (see document for details). (dro) Modified on 10/28/2016 (lwag).
October 10, 2016 Filing 5233 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
October 10, 2016 Filing 5232 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
October 6, 2016 Filing 5231 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Wilbert Benjamin Markovits counsel for Plaintiffs Holly Boyd, Kyle Briggs, Honorable Paul Turner, Shalini Ignatenkov, Connie Kamphaus, Brenda Shonfield, Lee Shonfield, Erica Thomas, Lori S Trahan, Thomas A Trahan, Allan L Weller. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Wilbert Benjamin Markovits. (Markovits, Wilbert)
October 6, 2016 Filing 5230 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Wilbert Benjamin Markovits counsel for Plaintiffs Charles Gibbens, Karen Gibbens, Thomas Kamphaus, Al Viviano, Jo Anna Viviano. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Wilbert Benjamin Markovits. (Markovits, Wilbert)
October 5, 2016 Filing 5229 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, with the agreement of counsel, sets the next Interim Status/Scheduling Conference for TUESDAY, 12/6/2016 at 8:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 20, 2016 Filing 5228 **AMENDED 9/26/16 as to Defense Counsel Only** Minutes of Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process(ISP) and Case Management Conference on cases Certified for Trial held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and any issues. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of cases Certified for Trial: SACV 11-01073 JVS: Sang Seok Na v. Toyota - Counsel to submit schedule within 30 days; SACV 11-01094 JVS: Alvarez-Cabrera v. Toyota - Counsel to submit formal request for Judge Selna to preside(if that is their request) by the end of the first quarter of 2017; SACV 13-00306 JVS: Quaid McIver v Toyota - The Court sets a Telephone Status Conference for October 11,2016 at 8:00 a.m.; SACV 13-00367 JVS: Diane Andersen v. Toyota - Counsel report that this case has been returned to the ISP process. The Court directs counsel to meet, confer and contact the Courtroom Deputy with a date and time for a Further Status Conference during the first two weeks in December. Counsel shall file a joint status report not later 7 days prior to the date set for the conference (lwag)
September 20, 2016 Filing 5227 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) and Case Management Conference on Cases Certified for Trial held before Judge James V. Selna. (see document for details). Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5226 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5223 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendant. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
September 16, 2016 Filing 5225 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric F Gladbach on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric F Gladbach added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Gladbach, Eric)
September 15, 2016 Filing 5223 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
September 15, 2016 Filing 5222 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
September 13, 2016 Filing 5221 STATUS REPORT for the September 20, 2016, Case Status Conference filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8/17/16 & 8/23/16 Letters to Plaintiffs' counsel)(Ayers, David)
September 7, 2016 Filing 5224 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-89). (dro) (Main Document 5224 replaced on 9/16/2016) (dro).
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5220 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal by Judge James V. Selna, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5219 (Re SACV10-00748 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
August 30, 2016 Filing 5219 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
August 15, 2016 Filing 5218 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Status Report)(Hooper, John)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5217 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna on Stipulation of Dismissal #5215 (Re; SACV11-00842 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
August 11, 2016 Filing 5216 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Joseph Ecuyer counsel for Plaintiffs Robert Stephen McKinney, Robert L. Samuels. Michael J. Ecuyer will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Michael J. Ecuyer is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Ecuyer. (lt)
August 10, 2016 Filing 5215 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
August 9, 2016 Filing 5214 NOTICE of Certification Re: Intensive Settlement Process. (lwag)
August 8, 2016 Filing 5213 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Marisol Rodriguez Marrero, et al.'s Second Amended Complaint (lower court number 8:16-cv-01377) filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation.(Ayers, David)
August 3, 2016 Filing 5212 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory M Bokota counsel for Intervenor Wolverine Insurance Company. Gregory M. Bokota will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor Wolverine Insurance Company. (Bokota, Gregory)
August 3, 2016 Filing 5211 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Suggestion of Remand (MDL cases only), #5210 filed by Defendants KW Real Estate Akron Co., LLC. (Kristan, Bonita)
July 29, 2016 Filing 5210 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) filed by Defendants KW Real Estate Akron Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion for Recommendation of Remand to the Northern District of Ohio) (Kristan, Bonita)
July 26, 2016 Filing 5209 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr counsel for Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Kendra N. Beckwith is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Galvin, Vincent)
July 19, 2016 Filing 5208 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, with the agreement of counsel, sets the next Interim Status/Scheduling Conference for TUESDAY, 9/20/2016 at 8:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5207 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna on Stipulation Regarding Good Faith Settlement of Defendant Toyota Corporation #5204 , (SACV13-003006 JVS (Ex). Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing, the Court hereby adopts the stipulation. Accordingly, the Court finds that the good faith settlement complies with California Code of Civil Procedure 877.6, and therefore any and all claims for indemnity or contribution relating to the claims released by and between the parties are hereby dismissed with prejudice and forever barred by Co-Defendants KW Real Estate Akron Co., LLC; Friedkin Companies, Inc.; Regional General Contracting, LLC and Auto Butler, Inc., also known as Broadway Equipment Co. as against Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5206 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
July 13, 2016 Filing 5204 Joint STIPULATION for Settlement REGARDING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hooper, John)
July 12, 2016 Filing 5205 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Attorney Chad Cameron Lucas of Kuhlman Law Firm, LLC, removed as attorney of record for various plaintiffs, as the represented parties have been dismissed from the case. (see document for details). (dro)
July 11, 2016 Filing 5203 ANSWER regarding Case No. 8:16-cv-01180 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation.(Shepard, Anneke)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5202 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna on Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5200 . (CV10-03899 JVS (FMOx). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
July 7, 2016 Filing 5201 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Terrence E McCartney counsel for Plaintiffs Maria Getzler, Maria Getzler. Changing firm name and address to Reiner, Slaughter & McCartney LLP, 411 Theodore Fremd Ave, Ste. 206 South, Rye, NY 10580. Changing email and fax number to tmccartney@reinerslaughter.com Fax No. 914-925-3434. Filed by plaintiff Maria Getzler. (McCartney, Terrence)
July 6, 2016 Filing 5200 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
July 5, 2016 Filing 5198 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neil M. Kliebenstein counsel for Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Lawrence C. Mann is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Kliebenstein, Neil)
July 5, 2016 Filing 5197 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neil M. Kliebenstein counsel for Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Paul T. O'Neill is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Kliebenstein, Neil)
July 5, 2016 Filing 5196 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Neil M. Kliebenstein on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Attorney Neil M. Kliebenstein added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Neil M. Kliebenstein added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Neil M. Kliebenstein added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Neil M. Kliebenstein added to party Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Kliebenstein, Neil)
July 5, 2016 Filing 5195 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney J Karl Viehman counsel for Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Adding James Karl Viehman as counsel of record for Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Viehman, J)
June 29, 2016 Filing 5199 MINUTES OF Interim Status Conference. The Court and counsel confer regarding status of Intensive Settlement Process and cases preparing for future proceedings. The Court and counsel confer regarding date of next Status Conference. Counsel shall meet, confer and contact the Courtroom Deputy with dates for next Status Conference to be held before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (kt)
June 24, 2016 Filing 5194 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Interim Status Conference, previously scheduled for 6/28/2016 at 8:00 AM, to WEDNESDAY, 6/29/2016 at 2:00 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5191 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause by Judge James V. Selna (SACV15-1088 JVS (Ex). (see document for details). (dro)
June 23, 2016 Filing 5190 Letter to Judge Selna requesting further settlement conference filed by Plaintiff Sang Seok Na (Leino, Robert)
June 23, 2016 Filing 5189 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Leino counsel for Plaintiff Sang Seok Na. Adding Robert G. Leino as counsel of record for Sang Seok Na for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sang Seok Na. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Attorney Robert Leino added to party Sang Seok Na(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Leino added to party Sang Seok Na(pty:pla))(Leino, Robert)
June 23, 2016 Filing 5188 Letter to Judge Selna requesting further settlement conference filed by Plaintiff Sang Seok Na (Leino, Robert)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5193 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: granting #5192 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (see document for details). (SACV16-01059 JVS )Ex). (dro)
June 22, 2016 Filing 5187 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S NON-COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S FEBRUARY 4, 2016 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AND MARCH 3, 2016 AND MAY 5, 2016 ORDERS ALLOWING FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
June 21, 2016 Filing 5192 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Joyce Richard. (SACV16-01059 JVS Ex) (dro)
June 21, 2016 Filing 5186 STATUS REPORT by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation for the June 28, 2016, Case Status Conference filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
June 20, 2016 Filing 5185 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Quaid McIver. (Salehpour, Morvareed)
June 17, 2016 Filing 5182 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) #4355 filed by defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc..(Galvin, Vincent)
June 17, 2016 Filing 5181 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) #4355 filed by defendant Toyota Motor Corporation.(Galvin, Vincent)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5184 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna denying Quaid McIver's Motion to Strike. The Court denies as moot Plaintiff Quaid McIver's motion to strike prospective intervenor ADA Architects Inc.'s response filed in support of its motion to intervene (docket 147) in light of the Court's June 15, 2016 order denying ADA Architects Inc.'s motion to intervene. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5183 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting in part and denying in part #5164 EX PARTE APPLICATION ; granting in part and denying in part #5166 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order. (see document for details). (dro)
June 15, 2016 Filing 5180 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edith M Kallas counsel for Plaintiffs Renita Cipriani, John Harding. Edith M. Kallas will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Edith M. Kallas is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Renita Cipriani; John Harding. (Kallas, Edith)
June 15, 2016 Filing 5179 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edith M Kallas counsel for Plaintiff Renita Cipriani. Shujah A. Awan will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Shujah A. Awan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Renita Cipriani. (Kallas, Edith)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5178 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Denying ADA Architects, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene by Judge James V. Selna. (re: SACV13-00306 JVS (Ex). (see document for details). (dro)
June 15, 2016 Filing 5177 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
June 10, 2016 Filing 5176 NOTICE Of Filing of Administrative Declaration filed by Economic Loss Plaintiffs Kathleen Atwater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Jarjoura Declaration))(Berman, Steve)
June 9, 2016 Filing 5175 REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF SEALED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,, #5163 #5164 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5174 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5168 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to haveappeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties settlement agreement. (lwag)
June 8, 2016 Filing 5173 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Juan Figueroa Perez on June 16, 2016 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Subpoena Issued. (Ayers, David)
June 8, 2016 Filing 5172 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Marco Antonio Vega Gonzalez on June 16, 2016 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Subpoena Issued. (Ayers, David)
June 8, 2016 Filing 5171 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Sandra Perez Mendez on June 15, 2016 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
June 8, 2016 Filing 5170 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Luis Alvarez Cabrera on June 15, 2016 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
June 8, 2016 Filing 5169 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Tatiana Alvarez Perez on June 14, 2016 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
June 7, 2016 Filing 5168 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
June 1, 2016 Filing 5167 STATUS REPORT INDICATING THE STATUS OF THE FERNANDO LOPEZ-LLANOS CASE IN THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
May 31, 2016 Filing 5166 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Show Cause REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Redacted Document Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Redacted Document Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause) (Hooper, John)
May 31, 2016 Filing 5165 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Toyota Defendants re SEALED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,, #5163 #5164 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Toyota Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause)(Hooper, John)
May 31, 2016 Filing 5164 SEALED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,, #5163 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration)(Hooper, John)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5163 ORDER Granting Toyota Defendants' Application to File Under Seal #5162 by Judge James V. Selna: After considering the pleadings, papers and accompanying documents, the arguments of counsel, all other matters represented to the Court, and good causing appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following documents are filed under seal: The Toyota Defendants' Ex Parte Application For An Order to Show Cause directing Plaintiff San Seok Na to refrain from using abusive and threatening language in communications with the Toyota Defendants counsel, to participate in settlement discussions in good faith, and to meet and confer with the Toyota Defendants counsel within 30 days to discuss a joint case management order; and Declaration of Kelly D'Auria in support thereof. Good cause exists for filing these documents under seal because they refer to and discuss correspondence containing confidential settlement negotiations between the parties. A redacted public version of each document shall be filed within seven days. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lwag)
May 26, 2016 Filing 5162 APPLICATION to file document EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE under seal filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal with Exhibits, #2 Unredacted Document Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause, #3 Redacted Document Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause, #4 Unredacted Document Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause, #5 Redacted Document Declaration in Spport of Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hooper, John) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/27/2016) (rrp). (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/27/2016) (rrp). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/27/2016) (rrp). (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/27/2016) (rrp).
May 25, 2016 Filing 5161 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Mark A. Friel filed by plaintiff Timothy John Vanagas. (Friel, Mark)
May 20, 2016 Filing 5160 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John W Barrett counsel for Plaintiff Julie Rainwater. John W. Barrett will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. John W. Barrett is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff John W. Barrett. (Barrett, John)
May 20, 2016 Filing 5159 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Proposed Order #5153 filed by Plaintiff's Christopher W. Andersen, Christopher J. Andersen, Diane Andersen, Suzanne Andersen. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Sbaih, Jeff)
May 18, 2016 Filing 5158 RULE 41 Dismissal of Action. (lwag)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5157 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order for Status Report by Judge James V. Selna: The Court directs Ms. Cabraser and Mr. Hooper to file, within fourteen (14) days, areport indicating the status of this case in the Intensive Settlement Process. (lwag)
May 17, 2016 Filing 5156 REQUEST for Referral filed by Plaintiff Fernando Lopez-Llanos. (lwag)
May 16, 2016 Filing 5155 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Status Report)(Hooper, John)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5154 ORDER re Enlargement of Time by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiff Patricia Scott (Scott) seeks enlargement of time to comply with the Courts Order to Show Cause dated February 4, 2016. (Docket No. 39.) The Court previously indicated that it would hold the Order to Show Cause in abeyance for thirty days to allow Scott to comply. (Docket No. 43.) Scotts response should have been made on or before April 4, 2016. Without explanation for the delay, on May 3, 2016, Scott applied for an enlargement of time to comply with the Order to Show Cause.The Court will hold the Order to Show Cause in abeyance until June 1, 2016. The Court will grant no further continuances. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LIKELY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THE CASE. (lwag)
May 3, 2016 Filing 5153 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff Christopher W. Andersen, Christopher J. Andersen, Diane Andersen, Suzanne Andersen. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order to Amend Complaint) (Sbaih, Jeff)
May 3, 2016 Filing 5152 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S NON-COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S FEBRUARY 4, 2016 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AND MARCH 3, 2016 ORDER ALLOWING FOR AN EXTENSION filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5151 JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: This case has been certified by the Special Master as having completed the ISP process ordered on December 12, 2013 (Dkt. NO. 4490). The parties have met and conferred with the Special Master pursuant to the Court's order establishing the Intensive Settlement Process and submit this proposed Case Management Order. See document for further information. (lwag)
April 7, 2016 Filing 5150 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP); Case Management Conference on Cases Certified for Trial, held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and any issues. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of cases Certified for Trial. The Court sets a Further Status Conference regarding these issues for Tuesday, June 28, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. Counsel shall file a joint status report not later than June 21, 2016. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
April 7, 2016 Filing 5149 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna granting #5137 MOTION Regarding Request to Remand. Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court's tentative ruling is issued. The Court and counsel confer. The Court GRANTS the motion and rules in accordance with the tentative ruling as follows: (see document for details). Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (dro)
April 5, 2016 Filing 5148 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin R Budner counsel for Plaintiff Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury /Wrongful Death Plaintiffs. Adding Kevin R. Budner as counsel of record for Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury/Wrongful Death Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury/Wrongful Death Plaintiffs. (Attorney Kevin R Budner added to party Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury /Wrongful Death Plaintiffs(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin R Budner added to party Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury /Wrongful Death Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Budner, Kevin)
April 4, 2016 Filing 5147 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
March 31, 2016 Filing 5146 STATUS REPORT FOR THE APRIL 7, 2016, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Joint Proposed CMO, #2 Exhibit "B" Vehicle Correspondence)(Ayers, David)
March 30, 2016 Filing 5145 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1-25-16 8:07 a.m re Transcript #5144 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Seffens, Sharon) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 30, 2016 Filing 5144 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1-25-16 8:07 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number sseffens@earthlink.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2016. (Seffens, Sharon)
March 25, 2016 Filing 5142 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Intervenor Cassandra McNair-Stepney re #5123 (Bromberg, Brian)
March 25, 2016 Filing 5141 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Intervenor Cassandra McNair-Stepney for Court Reporter. Court will contact Dmitry Feofanov at Feofanov@ChicagoLemonLaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Bromberg, Brian)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5143 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5140 (Re: SACV11-00098 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
March 24, 2016 Filing 5140 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq. filed by plaintiffs/defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
March 17, 2016 Filing 5139 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Regarding Remand #5137 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
March 15, 2016 Filing 5138 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 10, 2016 Filing 5137 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Regarding Remand filed by Plaintiff Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. Motion set for hearing on 4/7/2016 at 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
March 9, 2016 Filing 5136 Notice of Electronic Filing re 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice #5135 e-mailed to Todd David Carpenter at todd@carpenterlawyers.com bounced due to invalid email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to tcarpenter@carlsonlynch.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 3, 2016 Filing 5135 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-55327, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #5123 as to Appellant Cassandra McNair-Stepney. (mat)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5134 ORDER Re OSC by Judge James V. Selna: The Court having issued an Order to Show Cause on February 4, 2016 as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's Order of March 30, 2015 (docket #4939), and plaintiff having file a reply indicating her willingness to comply with the Court's March 30, 2015 Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause shall be held in abeyance for 30 days and shall be discharged upon plaintiff's filing a certificate of compliance with the Order of March 30, 2015 within said 30 days. (lwag)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5133 ORDER on Stipulation to Continue the Further Status Conference #5127 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, having shown good cause, the date of the Further Status Conference is continued from March 22, 2016 at 8:00 A.M. in Courtroom 10C to April 7, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10C. (lwag)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5132 ORDER of Dismissal by Judge James V. Selna: The Court having issues an Order to Show Cause on February 4, 2016 as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's Order of March 30, 2015 (docket #4939), with a written response due on February 26, 2016 and no response having been made. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), 37(b)(2)(C) and 16(f). (lwag)
March 2, 2016 Filing 5131 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. Refiling of Motion (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
March 2, 2016 Filing 5130 OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership, Ananda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Attorney Eric M Quetglas-Jordan added to party Ananda(pty:pla), Attorney Eric M Quetglas-Jordan added to party Ananda(pty:pla))(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
March 2, 2016 Filing 5129 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Status Conference from March 22, 2016 #5113 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit II)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
March 2, 2016 Filing 5128 REPLY filed by Defendants Akio Toyoda, Toyota Motor Corporation to Order,, #5120 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED (Hooper, John)
March 2, 2016 Filing 5127 STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from March 22, 2016 to April 7, 2016 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Hooper, John)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5126 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting #5125 MOTION to Vacate. Defendants Toyota Motor North America, Inc.; Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.; Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.; and Toyota Motor Corporation (collectively "Defendants") and Plaintiff Paola Bituin ("Plaintiff") (collectively, "the Parties") have filed a Joint Motion to Vacate Order to Show Cause (MDL docket # 5125) in the above-captioned matter. For the reasons stated in the Parties' motion papers, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Order to Show Cause is hereby GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
February 26, 2016 Filing 5125 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order,, #5118 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Hooper, John)
February 25, 2016 Filing 5124 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS, filed by Patrick A. Juneau, Settlement Special Master. (dro)
February 23, 2016 Filing 5123 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Intervenor-Class Member Seeking Exclusion from the Class Action and the Settlement Cassandra McNair-Stepney. Appeal of Order on Motion to Intervene,, Order on Motion to Alter Judgment,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion to Vacate,, Motion Hearing, #5116 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17329288.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Order Appealed From, ECF Document No. 5116, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Bromberg, Brian)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5122 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna on Stipulation of Dismissal #5121 (Re: SACV10-01921 JVS (FMOx). (see document for details). (dro)
February 16, 2016 Filing 5121 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by plaintiff/defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5120 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: For the reasons stated in Defendant's Memorandum in Support, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Order to Show Cause why Plaintiff's claims should not be dismissed is hereby GRANTED. If Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order on or before February 26, 2016, Plaintiff's case will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(b), 37(b)(2)(C) ande 16(f). If Plaintiff responds, Defendants may file a response within seven days. (lwag)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5119 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: For the reasons stated in Defendant's Memorandum in Support, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Order to Show Cause why Plaintiff's claims should not be dismissed is hereby GRANTED. If Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order on or before February 26, 2016, Plaintiff's case will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(b), 37(b)(2)(C) and 16(f). If Plaintiff responds, Defendants may file a response within seven days. (lwag)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5118 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: For the reasons stated in Defendant's Memorandum in Support, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiff's claims should not be dismissed is hereby GRANTED. If Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order on or before February 26, 2016, Plaintiff's case will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(b), 37(b)(2)(C) and 16(f). If Plaintiff responds, Defendants may file a response within seven days. (lwag)
February 2, 2016 Filing 5117 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
January 25, 2016 Filing 5116 MINUTES RE: Cassandra McNair-Stepney's Motoin to Intervene and Allow Class Member to Exclude Herself from and Opt-Out of the Class Action Settlement #5097 held before Judge James V. Selna: For all of the foregoing reasons, McNair-Stepney's motion is denied. See document for further information.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5115 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Excuse Counsel from March Status Conference by Judge James V. Selna: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' Motion #5113 to Excuse David L. Ayers from the Case Management Status Conference on March 22, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. (lwag)
January 23, 2016 Filing 5114 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Status Conference from March 22, 2016 #5113 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
January 22, 2016 Filing 5113 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Status Conference from March 22, 2016 filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Ayers, David)
January 13, 2016 Filing 5111 REQUEST to Withdraw NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) #5105 filed by Plaintiffs Christopher W. Andersen, Christopher J. Andersen, Diane Andersen, Suzanne Andersen. Request set for hearing on 2/8/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Sbaih, Jeff)
January 12, 2016 Filing 5112 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process (ISP) held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and any issues. The Court sets a Further Status Conference regarding the (ISP) for Tuesday, March 22, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. The Conference on March 22, 2016 shall also be a Case Management Conference for those cases proceeding to trial. The Court ORDERS all counsel in the cases proceeding to trial to be present on Tuesday, March 22, 2016 at 8:00 a.m.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
January 8, 2016 Filing 5110 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order,,, Terminated Case,, #3935 , Order #3928 , Order, #3933 . NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Order,,, Terminated Case,, #3935 , Order #3928 , Order, #3933 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order,,, Terminated Case,, #3935 , Order #3928 , Order, #3933 #5097 (Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Intervene and Allow Class Member Cassandra McNair-Stepney to Exclude Herself and Opt-Out of the Class Action Settlement) filed by Movant Cassandra McNair-Stepney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Reply Declaration of Dmitry Feofanov in Further Support of Motion to Intervene and Allow Class Member Cassandra McNair-Stepney to Exclude Herself from and Opt-Out of the Class Action Settlement), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration Certificate of Service)(Bromberg, Brian)
January 8, 2016 Filing 5109 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5108 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5106 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
January 6, 2016 Filing 5106 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation of Dismissal)(Galvin, Vincent)
January 5, 2016 Filing 5105 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for a Suggestion of Remand (Pursuant to 28:1407) filed by Plaintiff Christopher W. Andersen, Christopher J. Andersen, Diane Andersen, Suzanne Andersen. Motion set for hearing on 2/8/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points of Authority, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Sbaih, Jeff)
December 28, 2015 Filing 5104 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Hooper, #2 Exhibit 1 of Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 of Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 of Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 of Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 of Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 of Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 of Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 of Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 of Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 of Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 of Declaration, #13 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Hooper added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Hooper, John)
December 28, 2015 Filing 5103 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED filed by Defendants Akio Toyoda, Toyota Motor Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Hooper, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney John P Hooper added to party Akio Toyoda(pty:dft), Attorney John P Hooper added to party Akio Toyoda(pty:dft)) (Hooper, John)
December 28, 2015 Filing 5102 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John Hooper, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #8 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hooper, John)
December 22, 2015 Filing 5107 NOTICE of Certification re Intensive Settlement Process. (lwag)
December 22, 2015 Filing 5101 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order,,, Terminated Case,, #3935 , Order #3928 , Order, #3933 . NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Order,,, Terminated Case,, #3935 , Order #3928 , Order, #3933 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order,,, Terminated Case,, #3935 , Order #3928 , Order, #3933 #5097 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bruce Terlep, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Declaration B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration)(Hooper, John)
December 17, 2015 Filing 5100 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
December 10, 2015 Filing 5099 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Declaration filed by Plaintiffs Kathleen Atwater. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Lara Jarjoura Regarding Status of Distribution))(Berman, Steve)
December 9, 2015 Filing 5098 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court hereby sets a hearing on Cassandra McNair-Stepney's MOTION to Intervene; to Alter Judgment re Order Terminated Case #3935 , #3928 , #3933 ; MOTION to Vacate Order to Terminated Case #3935 , #3928 , #3933 , #5097 for MONDAY, 1/25/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. Any opposition to the motion shall be filed not later than 12/23/15 and any reply to a filed opposition shall be filed by 1/8/16. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2015 Filing 5097 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order,,, Terminated Case,, #3935 , Order #3928 , Order, #3933 . , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Order,,, Terminated Case,, #3935 , Order #3928 , Order, #3933 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order,,, Terminated Case,, #3935 , Order #3928 , Order, #3933 filed by Intervenor, requesting exclusion from class and from class-action settlement Cassandra McNair-Stepney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum (Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene and Allow Class Member Cassandra McNair-Stepney to Exclude Herself from and Opt-Out of the Class Action Settlement), #2 Declaration (Declaration of Dmitry Feofanov in Support of Motion to Intervene and Allow Class Member Cassandra McNair-Stepney to Exclude Herself from and Opt-Out of the C1ass Action Settlement), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15) (Attorney Brian Lewis Bromberg added to party Cassandra McNair-Stepney(pty:bkmov), Attorney Brian Lewis Bromberg added to party Cassandra McNair-Stepney(pty:bkmov)) (Bromberg, Brian)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5096 SEALED DOCUMENT RE: ORDER Approving Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Distribution of Confidential Settlement Proceeds by Judge James V. Selna. (lwag)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5095 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Approving Distribution of Confidential Settlement Proceeds #5080 #5086 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court APPROVES the proposed distribution of confidential settlement proceeds. The Court further finds that oral argument would not be helpful on this matter, and vacates the December 7, 2015 hearing. See document for further information. (lwag)
November 19, 2015 Filing 5094 NOTICE of Certification re Intensive Settlement. (lwag)
November 17, 2015 Filing 5093 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
November 17, 2015 Filing 5092 Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #5082 e-mailed to jelias@lchb.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-"5.1.1 The email account that you tried to reach does not exist. Please try\n5.1.1 double-checking the recipient's email address for typos or\n5.1.1 unnecessary spaces. Learn more at\n5.1.1 https://support.google.com/mail/answer/6596 e127si6484869qkb.26 - gsmtp" (delivery attempts: 0). Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to je@girardgibbs.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5091 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5090 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
November 16, 2015 Filing 5090 STIPULATION for Order Dismissal filed by Defendants Lexus of Las Vegas, Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation for voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (filed))(Tanner, Bradley)
November 12, 2015 Filing 5089 NOTICE of Compliance with ISP filed by Settlement Special Master. (lwag)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5088 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5082 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
November 11, 2015 Filing 5083 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Lexus of Las Vegas, Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc..(Tanner, Bradley)
November 10, 2015 Filing 5082 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
November 9, 2015 Filing 5087 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Scott J. Strouts in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Approval of Distribution of Confidential Settlement Proceeds #5086 filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Strouts. (nbo)
November 9, 2015 Filing 5086 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Strouts. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (nbo)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5085 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Granting #5084 APPLICATION to Seal Motion for Approval of Distribution of Confidential Settlement Proceeds. (nbo)
November 9, 2015 Filing 5084 JOINT APPLICATION to file Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Distribution of Confidential Settlement Proceeds Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Strouts. (nbo)
November 6, 2015 Filing 5081 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. of Motion for Approval of Distribution of Confidential Settlement Proceeds. (Galvin, Vincent)
November 6, 2015 Filing 5080 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds settlement filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Galvin, Vincent)
November 4, 2015 Filing 5079 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-83 (lwag)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5078 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5077 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
November 2, 2015 Filing 5077 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
October 26, 2015 Filing 5076 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-82. (lwag)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5075 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5074 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
October 21, 2015 Filing 5074 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
October 13, 2015 Filing 5073 MINUTES OF Status Conference Regarding Intensive Settlement Process held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the Intensive Settlement Processes and any issues. The Court sets a Further Status Conference for Tuesday, January 12, 2016 at 8:00 a.m.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag)
October 12, 2015 Filing 5072 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5071 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5070 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
October 6, 2015 Filing 5070 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5069 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5065 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal field by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, but not limited, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5068 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5064 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5067 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5063 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5066 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5062 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
September 29, 2015 Filing 5065 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
September 29, 2015 Filing 5064 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
September 29, 2015 Filing 5063 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
September 29, 2015 Filing 5062 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5061 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5059 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiffs' claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5060 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice #5058 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
September 16, 2015 Filing 5059 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiffs Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
September 16, 2015 Filing 5058 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
September 14, 2015 Filing 5057 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hooper, John)
September 11, 2015 Filing 5056 REPLY Moot NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Scheduling #5053 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
September 3, 2015 Filing 5055 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Scheduling #5053 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF JACQUELINE K. SEIDEL AND DAVID L. AYERS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John)
September 2, 2015 Filing 5054 DISMISSAL by Judge James V. Selna: Toyota Motor Corp. et al's moved for an Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiff's Claims Should Not Be Dismissed. (MDL Docket No. 5027.) The Court granted the Order to Show Cause, and directed plaintiffs Lydia Olavarria-Vargas et al. to show cause in writing no later than August 28, 2015 why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with this Court's Order of March 30, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 5041.) The Plaintiffs failed to respond. Accordingly, the action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order regarding settlement procedures. (lwag)
September 1, 2015 Filing 5053 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Scheduling filed by Plaintiffs Luis Alvarez-Cabrera, Tatiana Alvarez-Perez, Alvarez-Perez Conjugal Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5052 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #5051 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having read the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all parties to have appeared in this action, and finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to all plaintiff's claims, actions and causes of action asserted against defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees and expert fees. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the action for 90 days following the entry of this Order (unless extended) for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. (lwag)
August 24, 2015 Filing 5051 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) et seq filed by defendants/plaintiff Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvin, Vincent)
August 20, 2015 Filing 5050 STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE INTENSIVE SETTLEMENT PROCESS filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5049